Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Brown, Jacob      
Fernando Contreras Ramos - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Public Defender-, Ccc   Master Calendar  CR2015-140092-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Fernando Contreras Ramos  13-1204A2 (F3)  AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST  8/26/2015  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  9/4/2015 
Fernando Contreras Ramos  13-1204A2 (F3)  AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST  8/26/2015  Pled No Contest  Pled No Contest  12/2/2015 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
1/15/2016  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  1/19/2016   
1/14/2016  193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)  1/14/2016   
1/12/2016  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  1/12/2016   
NOTE: Order of Confinement 
1/12/2016  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  1/12/2016   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
1/12/2016  OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)  1/12/2016   
NOTE: Monetary Orders 
1/12/2016  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  1/12/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review 
12/4/2015  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  12/4/2015   
12/2/2015  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  12/4/2015   
12/2/2015  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)  12/3/2015   
11/9/2015  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/9/2015   
10/27/2015  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  10/27/2015   
10/26/2015  ORD - Order - Party (001)  11/4/2015   
NOTE: SUBMIT TO THE TAKING OF FINGERPRINTS PHOTOS 
10/26/2015  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  10/26/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS 
10/26/2015  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  10/26/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
10/26/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/26/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER 
10/26/2015  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  10/26/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
10/19/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/19/2015   
9/23/2015  REQ - Request - Party (001)  9/23/2015   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1 (a), (b), (d), (e) 
9/23/2015  REQ - Request - Party (001)  9/23/2015   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR EXPEDITIOUS DISCLOSURE OF 911 TAPES, VIDEOS OR AUDIO SURVEILLANCE TAPES AND/OR RADIO BROADCASTS 
9/23/2015  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/23/2015   
NOTE: INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS 
9/23/2015  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/23/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE 
9/23/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/23/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.1 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY 
9/21/2015  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  9/21/2015   
9/17/2015  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  9/17/2015   
9/9/2015  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  9/9/2015   
9/3/2015  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  9/4/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
9/3/2015  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  9/4/2015   
9/3/2015  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  9/4/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
9/3/2015  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  9/4/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
8/31/2015  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  8/31/2015   
8/31/2015  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  9/1/2015   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
8/31/2015  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  9/1/2015   
NOTE: IA Packet 
8/31/2015  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  9/2/2015   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
8/27/2015  11:00   Initial Appearance 
9/2/2015  8:30   Status Conference 
9/4/2015  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
9/10/2015  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
10/26/2015  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
12/2/2015  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
12/17/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/7/2016  8:00   Trial 
1/12/2016  8:30   Sentencing