Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Davis, Christine      
Daniel Christoper Kohn - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Doran, Christopher   Fisk  CR2015-133030-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Daniel Christoper Kohn  13-3506.01A (F4)  OBSCENE MATL TRANSMIT/MINOR  12/13/2012  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  7/27/2015 
Daniel Christoper Kohn  13-3506.01A (F4)  OBSCENE MATL TRANSMIT/MINOR  12/15/2012  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  7/27/2015 
Daniel Christoper Kohn  13-3506.01A (F4)  OBSCENE MATL TRANSMIT/MINOR  12/25/2012  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  7/27/2015 
Daniel Christoper Kohn  13-3623 (F6)  CHILD/VULNERABLE ADULT ABUSE  12/13/2012  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  1/20/2017 
Daniel Christoper Kohn  13-3623 (F6)  CHILD/VULNERABLE ADULT ABUSE  12/15/2012  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  1/20/2017 
Daniel Christoper Kohn  13-3506.01A (F4)  OBSCENE MATL TRANSMIT/MINOR  12/25/2012  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/20/2017 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
8/26/2019  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/26/2019   
8/5/2019  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  8/5/2019   
7/23/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/23/2019   
7/17/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/18/2019   
NOTE: MOTION TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TO ATTEND GRANDFATHERS FUNERAL  
7/6/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/8/2019   
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY TERMS OF PROBATION  
10/3/2018  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  10/4/2018   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
10/2/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/2/2018   
10/1/2018  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)  10/4/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
10/1/2018  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)  10/4/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
9/7/2018  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  9/11/2018  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION TO THE COURT 
7/31/2018  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  7/31/2018   
7/3/2018  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  7/5/2018  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MODIFICATION TERMS OF PROBATION 
12/26/2017  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  12/26/2017   
12/6/2017  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  12/7/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw 
11/27/2017  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  11/27/2017   
11/17/2017  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)  11/21/2017   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
10/11/2017  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  10/11/2017   
10/4/2017  REL - Reply - Party (001)  10/4/2017   
NOTE: Reply to Probation Departments Response to Defense Motion to Modify Terms of Probation 
8/29/2017  906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)  8/29/2017   
8/13/2017  ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  8/14/2017   
NOTE: Order Regarding Counsel 
8/12/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/14/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Modify Terms of Probation 
7/17/2017  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  7/18/2017   
5/12/2017  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  5/12/2017   
5/10/2017  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  5/10/2017   
NOTE: Terms and Conditions of Probation 
5/10/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  5/10/2017   
NOTE: Notice Of Appearance 
5/10/2017  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  5/11/2017   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
5/10/2017  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  5/11/2017   
NOTE: Terms and Conditions of Probation/AMENDED 
5/10/2017  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  5/10/2017   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
4/4/2017  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  4/4/2017   
3/28/2017  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  3/28/2017   
NOTE: Terms and Conditions of Probation 
3/28/2017  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)  3/28/2017   
NOTE: Bond Exoneration 
3/28/2017  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)  3/28/2017   
NOTE: Order of Confinement Jail 
3/28/2017  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  3/28/2017   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
3/28/2017  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  3/28/2017   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
3/28/2017  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  3/28/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review 
1/24/2017  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  1/24/2017   
1/20/2017  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  1/24/2017   
12/12/2016  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  12/12/2016   
12/8/2016  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)  12/8/2016   
12/6/2016  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  12/6/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE 
11/21/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/21/2016   
11/15/2016  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  11/15/2016   
11/3/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  11/3/2016   
10/31/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/31/2016   
NOTE: Motion To Modify Release Conditions 
10/31/2016  ACS - Acceptance Of Service - Party (001)  11/1/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO ADMIT DEFENDANT’S OTHER ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(B) AND (C) 
10/25/2016  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  10/25/2016   
10/21/2016  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  10/25/2016   
NOTE: OF SEXUAL MOTIVATION 
10/21/2016  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/26/2016   
NOTE: TRIAL BEYOND LAST DAY 
10/18/2016  331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)  10/18/2016   
10/10/2016  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  10/10/2016   
10/5/2016  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/11/2016   
10/5/2016  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  10/5/2016   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
9/9/2016  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)  9/9/2016   
8/29/2016  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)  8/29/2016   
8/24/2016  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  8/24/2016   
8/24/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  8/24/2016   
8/8/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/8/2016   
NOTE: Motion To Modify Release Conditions 
7/13/2016  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  7/13/2016   
5/11/2016  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  5/11/2016   
5/3/2016  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  5/11/2016   
NOTE: TRIAL 
3/10/2016  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  3/10/2016   
3/3/2016  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  3/9/2016   
1/6/2016  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  1/6/2016   
1/5/2016  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  1/5/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
1/4/2016  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  1/5/2016   
NOTE: TRIAL 
12/15/2015  BON - Bond - Party (001)  12/17/2015   
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY $50,000 SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY 
10/20/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/20/2015   
10/15/2015  STA - Statement - Party (001)  10/16/2015   
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 
10/5/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/5/2015   
NOTE: Motion To Modify Release Conditions 
9/25/2015  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  9/25/2015   
9/18/2015  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/24/2015   
9/11/2015  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  9/16/2015   
9/11/2015  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/16/2015   
9/11/2015  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/16/2015   
9/3/2015  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  9/3/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
9/3/2015  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)  9/3/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704 
8/11/2015  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  8/12/2015   
8/3/2015  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  8/3/2015   
7/31/2015  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  7/31/2015   
NOTE: Release Order 
7/31/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  8/5/2015   
7/30/2015  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  7/30/2015   
7/24/2015  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  7/27/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
7/24/2015  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  7/27/2015   
7/24/2015  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  7/27/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
7/24/2015  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  7/27/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
7/24/2015  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/27/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM 
7/22/2015  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  7/22/2015   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
7/22/2015  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  7/22/2015   
NOTE: IA Packet 
7/21/2015  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  7/21/2015   
7/21/2015  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  7/22/2015   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
7/21/2015  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  7/22/2015   
NOTE: IA Packet 
7/21/2015  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/22/2015   
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMTION FORM 
7/21/2015  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  7/22/2015   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
7/17/2015  14:00   Initial Appearance 
7/23/2015  8:30   Status Conference 
7/27/2015  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
7/31/2015  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
9/15/2015  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
10/15/2015  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
1/4/2016  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/11/2016  8:00   Trial 
3/3/2016  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/10/2016  8:00   Trial 
5/3/2016  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/10/2016  8:00   Trial 
7/7/2016  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/14/2016  8:00   Trial 
8/25/2016  8:30   Status Conference 
10/5/2016  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/12/2016  8:00   Trial 
10/14/2016  9:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/14/2016  9:30   Settlement Conference 
10/21/2016  11:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/24/2016  8:00   Trial 
11/8/2016  8:30   Status Conference 
12/7/2016  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
12/14/2016  8:00   Trial 
1/20/2017  11:00   Settlement Conference 
1/25/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
2/8/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/15/2017  8:00   Trial 
3/28/2017  8:30   Sentencing 
11/17/2017  13:30   Hearing Pending Motion 
8/16/2019  13:30   Hearing Pending Motion