« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 1 Vehicular Crimes
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Kasana Tracey Oslin Querta - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Public Defender-, Ccc
Judge
Gantz
Case #
CR2015-115983-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2015-115983-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2015-115983-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Kasana Tracey Oslin Querta
Crime Date
4/7/2015
Date
6/10/2015
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Kasana Tracey Oslin Querta
Crime Date
4/7/2015
Date
6/10/2015
Description
HIT AND RUN/DAMAGE ATTEND VEH
ARSCode
28-662 (M2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Kasana Tracey Oslin Querta
Crime Date
4/7/2015
Date
5/13/2015
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Kasana Tracey Oslin Querta
Crime Date
4/7/2015
Date
5/13/2015
Description
AGG DUI-PASSENGER UNDER 15
ARSCode
28-1383A3 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2019
Description
DHI - Dispo: Revoke/prison - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DHI - Disposition Order - Imprisonment
Filing Date
3/8/2019
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2019
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
probation violation
Filing Date
3/7/2019
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
3/7/2019
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
3/7/2019
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
3/5/2019
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
02/28/19/PV WARRANT
Filing Date
3/1/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/1/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/9/2018
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2018-10-09
Filing Date
10/8/2018
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1:2 No bond per rule 7.2 (c), Rules of Criminal Procedure.
Filing Date
12/13/2017
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2
Filing Date
12/13/2017
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
8/15/2017
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2017
Description
580 - ME: Dispo Reinst-Rev Arr/Hrg - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2017
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2017
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2017
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2017
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2017
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2017
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/03/2017
Filing Date
8/4/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
8/4/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
4/13/2017
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTS 1 & 2/$1800
Filing Date
4/13/2017
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2017-04-13
Filing Date
12/19/2016
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
10/26/2016
Description
114 - ME: Dispo-Reinstate - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2016
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2016
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2016
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2016
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 9/30/16 PV WARRANT
Filing Date
9/30/2016
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
9/30/2016
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
4/13/2016
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2016
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1 & 2 /$3600
Filing Date
3/30/2016
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2016-03-30
Filing Date
7/1/2015
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines and /or Other Fees
Filing Date
7/1/2015
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2015
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2015
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2015
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2015
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2015
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2015
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2015
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2015
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2015
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2015
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2015
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2015
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2015
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2015
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2015
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
4/22/2015
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
$3000
Filing Date
4/16/2015
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/8/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/15/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/17/2015
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/22/2015
Time
8:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/29/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/6/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/6/2015
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/12/2015
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/13/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/13/2015
Time
8:31
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/18/2015
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/10/2015
Time
8:15
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt
Date
9/30/2016
Time
20:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
10/7/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/25/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
8/3/2017
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
8/10/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/10/2017
Time
10:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
2/28/2019
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/7/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/7/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing