« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, P T D - Diversion
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Public Defender-, Ccc
Judge
Gantz
Case #
CR2015-105369-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2015-105369-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
2/2/2015
Date
2/10/2015
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3415 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2016
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2016
Description
115 - ME: Dispo-Revoke/Prison (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2016
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2016
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2016
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2016
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2016
Description
PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
5/6/2016
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/6/2016
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
9/22/2015
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2015
Description
580 - ME: Dispo Reinst-Rev Arr/Hrg - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2015
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2015
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2015
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2015
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2015
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/2015
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/24/15
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
8/21/2015
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1/Appearance Bond (Secured) SET at $900.00
Filing Date
8/21/2015
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2015-08-21
Filing Date
8/5/2015
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2015
Description
580 - ME: Dispo Reinst-Rev Arr/Hrg - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2015
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/21/15
Filing Date
7/28/2015
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2015
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2015
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2015
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2015
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
7/22/2015
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
5/5/2015
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1/Appearance Bond (Secured) SET at $1,800.00
Filing Date
5/5/2015
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2015-05-05
Filing Date
3/9/2015
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2015
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2015
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED
Filing Date
2/25/2015
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2015
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2015
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2015
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2015
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2015
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2015
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2015
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
2/4/2015
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/3/2015
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
2/10/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/10/2015
Time
8:31
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/25/2015
Time
8:15
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/21/2015
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
7/28/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/28/2015
Time
10:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
8/25/2015
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
9/1/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/14/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
9/14/2015
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
5/6/2016
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/12/2016
Time
10:00
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/12/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/31/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
5/31/2016
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing