« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Southeast  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   COUNTY ATTORNEY CRIMINAL -SE,      
Thomas Mario Costanzo - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Public Defender-, Ccc   Clarke  CR2015-030527-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Thomas Mario Costanzo  13-3415 (F6)  DRUG PARAPHERNALIA VIOLATION  4/9/2014  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/14/2015 
Thomas Mario Costanzo  13-3405 (M1)  MARIJUANA VIOLATION  4/9/2014  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  11/30/2015 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/11/2017  DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)  4/12/2017   
4/7/2017  ODM - Order of Discharge from Probation - Misdemeanor Designation - Party (001)  4/11/2017   
NOTE: COUNT 1
3/7/2017  PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)  3/8/2017   
NOTE: COUNT 1
9/12/2016  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)  9/15/2016   
NOTE: COUNT 1
6/28/2016  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)  6/30/2016   
NOTE: COUNT 1
1/7/2016  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
12/31/2015  NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)  12/31/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Release of Deposit$1800 PAID TO MARY VARNAS
12/31/2015  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  1/4/2016   
12/31/2015  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)  1/4/2016   
12/31/2015  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  1/4/2016   
12/24/2015  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  12/29/2015   
12/22/2015  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  12/22/2015   
12/14/2015  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
12/3/2015  102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)  12/3/2015   
11/30/2015  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)  12/1/2015   
NOTE: $1,800
11/30/2015  WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)  12/4/2015   
11/30/2015  INF - Information - Party (001)  12/3/2015   
11/25/2015  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  12/3/2015   
9/14/2015  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  9/14/2015   
9/10/2015  IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001)  9/10/2015   
8/21/2015  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)  8/21/2015   
8/11/2015  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  8/11/2015   
8/11/2015  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  8/11/2015   
8/11/2015  SUM - Summons - Party (001)  8/12/2015   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/9/2015  8:29   Initial Appearance 
11/19/2015  17:00   Initial Appearance 
11/30/2015  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
11/30/2015  8:31   Original Arraignment Hearing 
12/14/2015  8:15   Sentencing 
click here for Law Library Resource Center