« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Waters, Joseph
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Stephen Douglas Gore - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Derrick, Clark
Judge
Kreamer
Case #
CR2015-005246-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2015-005246-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Stephen Douglas Gore
Crime Date
1/1/2010
Date
10/7/2015
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2020
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party ()
Docket Date
11/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2019
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
10/23/2019
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2017
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2016
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
4/1/2016
Description
CCR - Confidential Criminal Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2016
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PERMITTING THE LOCAL BOARD TO USE CERTAIN PHOTOGRAPHIC DOCUMENTS IN ITS POSSESSION
Filing Date
3/1/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR AUTHORIZATION OF LIMITED USE OF MATERIALS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
12/16/2015
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2015
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2015
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2015
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE DEFENDANT'S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
12/9/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
12/9/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
12/8/2015
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
12/8/2015
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
10/8/2015
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
WPH - Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
177 - ME: Direct Information/Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S LETTER
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2015
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/7/2015
Time
9:58
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
10/7/2015
Time
10:00
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/7/2015
Time
10:1
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/11/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
12/9/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Review Hearing