Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, S P 1 Homicide      
Edward O Meinhold - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Navazo, Gregory   Master Calendar  CR2015-002577-001  
Benjamin Taylor - (3)
 
Witness  M   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Edward O Meinhold  13-452 (F2)  HOM: WILFUL KILLING  3/22/1978  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  12/3/2021 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
12/10/2021  PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)  12/10/2021   
12/6/2021  193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)  12/6/2021   
12/3/2021  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  12/13/2021   
12/3/2021  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  12/15/2021   
12/3/2021  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  12/7/2021   
12/1/2021  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  12/2/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM 
10/29/2021  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  10/29/2021   
10/26/2021  RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)  10/26/2021   
NOTE: Release Order 
10/26/2021  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  10/26/2021   
NOTE: PLEA AGREEMENT  
10/22/2021  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  10/22/2021   
10/14/2021  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  10/14/2021   
10/1/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/5/2021   
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial 
9/30/2021  REP - Report - Party (001)  10/1/2021   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
9/21/2021  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  9/21/2021   
9/14/2021  REP - Report - Party (001)  9/16/2021   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
8/19/2021  331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)  8/19/2021   
8/5/2021  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)  8/5/2021   
8/4/2021  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/4/2021   
7/24/2021  REP - Report - Party (001)  7/29/2021   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
6/22/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  6/22/2021   
6/14/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  6/15/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE 
6/9/2021  REP - Report - Party (001)  6/11/2021   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
5/24/2021  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  5/24/2021   
5/7/2021  REP - Report - Party (001)  5/7/2021   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
4/19/2021  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  4/19/2021   
4/16/2021  REP - Report - Party (001)  4/16/2021   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
3/25/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/25/2021   
3/1/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  3/1/2021   
2/25/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/25/2021   
2/2/2021  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  2/2/2021   
2/1/2021  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  2/2/2021   
1/28/2021  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  1/28/2021   
1/21/2021  REP - Report - Party (001)  1/22/2021   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
1/21/2021  REP - Report - Party (001)  1/22/2021   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
1/15/2021  073 - ME: Motion Withdrawn - Party (001)  1/15/2021   
1/13/2021  098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001)  1/13/2021   
1/12/2021  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)  1/14/2021   
NOTE: WITHDRAWING MR BECKSTEAD AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD 
12/29/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/30/2020   
NOTE: Motion for Substitution of Counsel 
12/23/2020  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  12/23/2020   
12/22/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/23/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO WITHDRAW DOCKET 214 
12/17/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/17/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE THIRD-PARTY CULPABILITY DEFENSE 
12/15/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/15/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE THIRD-PARTY CULPABILITY DEFENSE 
12/10/2020  REP - Report - Party (001)  12/10/2020   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
11/20/2020  REL - Reply - Party (001)  11/23/2020   
NOTE: REPLY TO WITNESS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO HAVE WITNESS SHOW REASONBLE GROUNDS FOR THEIR EXERTING A RIGHT AGAINST SELF INCRIMINATION 
11/19/2020  RES - Response - Party (001)  11/20/2020   
NOTE: WITNESS COUNSEL’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO HAVE WINTESS SHOW REASONABLE GROUNDS FOR EXERTING (CONSTITUTIONALLY GUARANTEED) RIGHT AGAINST SELF-INCRIMINATION 
11/18/2020  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  11/19/2020   
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REQUEST TO HAVE WITNESS SHOW REASONABLE GROUNDS FOR THEIR EXERTING A RIGHT AGAINST SELF INCRIMINATION 
11/13/2020  REQ - Request - Party (001)  11/16/2020   
NOTE: REQUEST TO HAVE WITNESS SHOW REASONBLE GROUNDS FOR THEIR EXERTING A RIGHT AGAINST SELF INCRIMINATION 
11/13/2020  REQ - Request - Party (001)  11/16/2020   
NOTE: REQUEST TO HAVE WITNESS SHOW REASONBLE GROUNDS FOR THEIR EXERTING A RIGHT AGAINST SELF INCRIMINATION 
11/12/2020  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/12/2020   
10/30/2020  REP - Report - Party (001)  10/30/2020   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
9/25/2020  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  9/25/2020   
9/11/2020  REP - Report - Party (001)  9/11/2020   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
8/24/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  8/24/2020   
8/5/2020  REP - Report - Party (001)  8/6/2020   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
7/21/2020  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/22/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Continue 
7/16/2020  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  7/16/2020   
6/29/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/30/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S PROPOSED REDACTIONS TO DEFENDANT’S STATEMENTS (Oral Argument Requested) 
6/25/2020  REP - Report - Party (001)  6/29/2020   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT 
6/9/2020  RES - Response - Party (001)  6/9/2020   
NOTE: Defendant’s Response To States Request for 3d Party Defense Evidence 
6/4/2020  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  6/4/2020   
5/18/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  5/18/2020   
5/14/2020  REP - Report - Party (001)  5/15/2020   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT 
5/1/2020  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  5/1/2020   
NOTE: Defendants motion to continue trial currently set for June 3, 2020 
4/22/2020  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  4/22/2020   
4/7/2020  REP - Report - Party (001)  4/8/2020   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT 
3/4/2020  017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (001)  3/4/2020   
3/3/2020  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  3/3/2020   
2/24/2020  REP - Report - Party (001)  2/25/2020   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 2/25/20 
2/5/2020  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  2/5/2020   
NOTE: SERVED 02/04/2020 
1/28/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  1/28/2020   
1/27/2020  REQ - Request - Party (001)  1/27/2020   
NOTE: DEFENSE RESPONSE TO STATE’S REQUEST TO HAVE WITNESS RAY ESPINOZA APPOINTED COUNSEL 
1/22/2020  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  1/27/2020   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL CURRENTLY SET FOR FEBRUARY 22, 2020  
1/21/2020  REP - Report - Party (001)  1/23/2020   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 1/22/20 
1/15/2020  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  1/16/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S PRELIMINARY MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING THIRD PARTY CULPABILITY DEFENSE OFFERED BY THE DEFENSE 
1/14/2020  REQ - Request - Party (001)  1/14/2020   
NOTE: Request for court ordered transportation of DOC witness for Trial and Order to Transport 
1/9/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/9/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF RULE 609 PRIOR CONVICTIONS FOR IMPEACHMENT PURPOSES 
1/9/2020  REQ - Request - Party (001)  1/9/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO APPOINT COUNSEL 
1/8/2020  PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)  1/9/2020   
1/8/2020  CER - Certificate - Party (001)  1/9/2020   
NOTE: TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS 
11/25/2019  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/25/2019   
11/25/2019  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  11/25/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
11/18/2019  REP - Report - Party (001)  11/19/2019   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 11/20/19 
10/10/2019  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/10/2019   
10/2/2019  REP - Report - Party (001)  10/3/2019   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 10/3/19 
9/10/2019  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/16/2019   
9/3/2019  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  9/3/2019   
9/3/2019  WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)  9/11/2019   
NOTE: EXHIBIT 
8/21/2019  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  8/22/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL CURRENTLY SET FOR NOVEMBER 25, 2019 
8/14/2019  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  8/15/2019   
NOTE: Defendants Motion to Continue Trial currently set for November 25, 2019 
7/26/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/29/2019   
NOTE: supplemental notice of defenses and witnesses 
7/10/2019  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  7/10/2019   
7/3/2019  REP - Report - Party (001)  7/5/2019   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 7/3/19 
6/28/2019  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/3/2019   
NOTE: SERVED 06/26/19 
6/14/2019  REL - Reply - Party (001)  6/17/2019   
NOTE: Defendants Reply To State’s Response to Defense Notice of Intent to Utilize Hearsay Statements 
6/6/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/7/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO EXCEED SIX PAGE RESPONSE LIMIT 
6/6/2019  RES - Response - Party (001)  6/7/2019   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF USE OF RESIDUAL HEARSAY EXCEPTION UNDER RULE 807A 
6/5/2019  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  6/5/2019   
5/24/2019  REP - Report - Party (001)  5/28/2019   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 5/28/19 
5/24/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/28/2019   
NOTE: Defendants notice of utilizing hearsay statements of unavailable witness through evidentiary Rule 807(b) and request for 104(c) hearing 
5/3/2019  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  5/3/2019   
4/19/2019  REP - Report - Party (001)  4/19/2019   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 4/22/19 
4/1/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/2/2019   
NOTE: Amended Notice of Defenses 
3/6/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/6/2019   
3/6/2019  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  3/6/2019   
3/6/2019  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  3/8/2019   
NOTE: SERVED 2-22-19 
2/27/2019  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  2/28/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE MARCH TRIAL DATE  
2/25/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/26/2019   
NOTE: REQUEST TO VACATE DEPOSITION OF ROBIN ROBBINS REQUEST TO HAVE ROBIN ROBBINS RETURNED TO ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS 
2/21/2019  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  2/22/2019   
NOTE: Defendants motion to continue trial currently set for March 2017 
2/21/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/22/2019   
NOTE: REQUEST TO VACATE STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR FEBRUARY 22, 2019 
2/1/2019  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  2/1/2019   
1/28/2019  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  1/30/2019   
1/24/2019  086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)  1/24/2019   
1/24/2019  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  1/24/2019   
1/10/2019  REP - Report - Party (001)  1/11/2019   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 1/14/19 
12/12/2018  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)  12/12/2018   
12/7/2018  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  12/7/2018   
11/30/2018  REP - Report - Party (001)  12/3/2018   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 12/3/18 
11/9/2018  RES - Response - Party (001)  11/13/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE HYPNOTIZED WITNESSES 
11/1/2018  086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)  11/1/2018   
11/1/2018  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  11/1/2018   
10/5/2018  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/5/2018   
9/28/2018  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)  9/28/2018   
NOTE: Amended Request for extension of time to file response to States Motion to preclude hypnotized witnesses filed on June 27, 2018 
9/28/2018  REP - Report - Party (001)  9/28/2018   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT HEARING ON 10/01/18 
9/7/2018  REQ - Request - Party (001)  9/7/2018   
NOTE: Request for Court Ordered Deposition of the witness and Order to Transport 
8/28/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/28/2018   
8/27/2018  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  8/28/2018   
8/27/2018  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  8/28/2018   
8/21/2018  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/21/2018   
NOTE: Defendant’s Notice of Filing Request and Order Under Seal 
8/7/2018  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/7/2018   
7/30/2018  906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)  7/30/2018   
7/30/2018  REP - Report - Party (001)  7/31/2018   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 7/31/18 
7/30/2018  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/31/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL CURRENTLY SET FOR AUGUST 27, 2018 
7/30/2018  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  7/31/2018   
NOTE: Motion to allow extension time to file response to States Motion to Preclude Hypnotized Witnesses filed on June 27, 2018 
7/5/2018  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  7/5/2018   
6/27/2018  REQ - Request - Party (001)  6/28/2018   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR A FINDING OF FACT AND CONCLUSION OF LAW IN THE COURTS DENIAL OF DEFENSES MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE States USE OF Defendants PRIOR STATEMENTS 
6/27/2018  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)  6/28/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION FOR PRECLUSION OF HYPNOTIZED WITNESSES  
6/26/2018  REQ - Request - Party (001)  6/27/2018   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR A FINDING OF FACT AND CONCLUSION OF LAW IN THE COURTS DENIAL OF DEFENSES MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE STATE’S USE OF THE FINGER PRINT CARD 
6/26/2018  REQ - Request - Party (001)  6/27/2018   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR A FINDING OF FACT AND CONCLUSION OF LAW IN THE COURTS DENIAL OF DEFENSES MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE STATES USE OF THE FINGER PRINT CARD 
6/20/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  6/20/2018   
6/4/2018  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  6/5/2018   
NOTE: Motion for Reconsideration of Ruling that Family Statements Admissible as Admission EDWARD O MEINHOLD, Defendant. 
6/1/2018  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  6/6/2018   
5/30/2018  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  5/30/2018   
5/10/2018  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  5/10/2018   
5/10/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/11/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION REGARDING PRECLUSION OF HYPNOTIZED WITNESSES 
4/26/2018  RES - Response - Party (001)  4/27/2018   
NOTE: Response to States Motion to use defendants prior statements to family members 
4/24/2018  REQ - Request - Party (001)  4/25/2018   
NOTE: Defense request to exceed page limitation for its response to states motion to use defendants prior statements 
4/23/2018  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  4/23/2018   
4/16/2018  REQ - Request - Party (001)  4/17/2018   
NOTE: REQUEST TO ALLOW THE DEFENSE TILL APRIL 26, 2018 TO FILE ITS MOTION IN LIMINE RESPONSE REGARDING DEFENDANT’S PRIOR STATEMENTS 
3/23/2018  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  3/23/2018   
3/19/2018  REP - Report - Party (001)  3/19/2018   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 3/20/18 
1/29/2018  591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001)  1/29/2018   
1/23/2018  REP - Report - Party (001)  1/24/2018   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 1/24/18 
12/15/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  12/15/2017   
12/12/2017  REL - Reply - Party (001)  12/13/2017   
NOTE: Reply to State’s Response Objecting to Defense’s Request for Evidentiary Hearing On State’s Requested Use of 404(b) Hearsay in Trial 
12/11/2017  RES - Response - Party (001)  12/12/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON REQUESTED USE OF 404(b) HEARSAY IN TRIAL 
12/5/2017  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)  12/5/2017   
11/29/2017  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  11/30/2017   
NOTE: Request for Evidentiary Hearing on States use of 404(B) Hearsy Evidence 
10/3/2017  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  10/3/2017   
NOTE: Supplement to the record and motion for reconsideration on the States use of the finger print card 
9/29/2017  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  10/3/2017   
9/29/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  9/29/2017   
9/25/2017  REP - Report - Party (001)  9/25/2017   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 9/26/17 
9/21/2017  RES - Response - Party (001)  9/22/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S SUPPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE AND STATE'S REPLY TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING FOUNDATION FOR ADMISSION OF COLLECTED EVIDENCE 
9/5/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  9/5/2017   
7/28/2017  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  7/28/2017   
7/10/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  7/10/2017   
6/28/2017  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  6/28/2017   
6/28/2017  REP - Report - Party (001)  6/28/2017   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 6/29/17 
6/15/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  6/15/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
6/12/2017  REP - Report - Party (001)  6/12/2017   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 6/13/17 
6/12/2017  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  6/12/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record  
6/7/2017  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)  6/7/2017   
6/7/2017  REL - Reply - Party (001)  6/7/2017   
NOTE: Reply: Defendants Motion to Preclude 
5/31/2017  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  5/31/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE AND STATE'S REPLY TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING FOUNDATIN FOR ADMISSION OF COLLECTED EVIDENCE 
5/19/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/19/2017   
NOTE: Defendants Motion to Preclude 
5/19/2017  RES - Response - Party (001)  5/19/2017   
NOTE: Response: State Motion in Limine Regarding Foundation Necessary for Admission of Collected Evidence 
4/12/2017  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/17/2017   
NOTE: THE TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF 
4/10/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  4/10/2017   
4/10/2017  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/12/2017   
4/10/2017  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  4/12/2017   
4/10/2017  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/12/2017   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
4/5/2017  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/5/2017   
NOTE: INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS 
4/5/2017  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/5/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Request for Interview with Victims 
4/5/2017  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/5/2017   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE 
4/3/2017  REP - Report - Party (001)  4/3/2017   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 4/4/17 
2/24/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  2/24/2017   
2/9/2017  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  2/9/2017   
2/6/2017  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/6/2017   
NOTE: REQUEST TO HOLD RESPONSE TIME IN ABEYANCE 
1/18/2017  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  1/19/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THE ADMISSIBILITY OF DEFENDANTS STATEMENTS TO FAMILY MEMBERS  
1/13/2017  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  1/17/2017   
NOTE: STATES MOTION IN LIME LINE REGARDING FOUNDATION NECESSARY FOR ADMISSION OF COLLECTED EVIDENCE 
12/21/2016  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  12/21/2016   
12/13/2016  REP - Report - Party (001)  12/13/2016   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 12-14-16 
12/12/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/13/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2 SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE 
11/30/2016  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  11/30/2016   
11/28/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/29/2016   
NOTE: MOTION REQUESTING THE COURT TO ORDER THE GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT TO PROVIDE FINGERPRINT RECORDS, ANALYSIS AND REPORTS 
11/23/2016  ORD - Order - Party (001)  12/5/2016   
NOTE: THAT FORMER GLENDALE POLICE DEPT SERGEANT MERRION ALEXANDER MAKE HIMSELF AVAILABLE FOR A DEPOSITION AT A TIME BY THE COURT 
11/18/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/18/2016   
11/17/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/17/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR TAKING DEPOSITION UNDER RULE 15.3(c) OF MERRION ALEXANDER 
11/2/2016  REP - Report - Party (001)  11/2/2016   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 11-3-16 
10/3/2016  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  10/3/2016   
9/16/2016  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  9/16/2016   
NOTE: MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF THE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 
8/18/2016  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  8/18/2016   
8/8/2016  REP - Report - Party (001)  8/8/2016   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 8-9-16 
6/10/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  6/10/2016   
6/6/2016  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  6/6/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
5/31/2016  REP - Report - Party (001)  5/31/2016   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 6-1-16 
5/12/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  5/12/2016   
4/27/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  4/27/2016   
4/7/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/7/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AT THE NEXT COURT SETTING 
3/25/2016  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)  3/25/2016   
3/15/2016  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  3/15/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Filing of the Transcript Interview of Ray Espinoza (in 3 Parts) and Second Interview of Terry Meinhold 
3/15/2016  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  3/15/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Filing of the Transcript Interview of Ray Espinoza (in 3 Parts) and Second Interview of Terry Meinhold 
3/15/2016  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  3/15/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Filing of the Transcript Interview of Ray Espinoza (in 3 Parts) and Second Interview of Terry Meinhold 
3/14/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/14/2016   
NOTE: ATTACHMENT TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION TO REMAND  
3/11/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/11/2016   
3/11/2016  REQ - Request - Party (001)  3/11/2016   
NOTE: Request for judicial notice of interview transcripts of witnesses referred to in the Grand Jury transcript interview of Ray Espinoza 
3/11/2016  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)  3/11/2016   
NOTE: Secured Appearance Bond $250,000.00 
3/8/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/9/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS 
3/2/2016  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  3/2/2016   
2/17/2016  REP - Report - Party (001)  2/17/2016   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 2-18-16 
2/17/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/18/2016   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND/DISMISS filed on January 19, 2016 
2/11/2016  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  2/11/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO REMAND 
2/3/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  2/3/2016   
1/19/2016  REP - Report - Party (001)  1/20/2016   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 1-20-16 
1/19/2016  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  1/20/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO FILE MOTION TO REMAND /MOTION TO DISMISS BY ONE BUSINESS DAY 
1/19/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/20/2016   
NOTE: Motion To Remand For Redetermination Of Probable Cause Pursuant To Rule 12.9, ARIZ.R.CRIM.P./Motion To Dismiss 
12/3/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  12/3/2015   
11/19/2015  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/23/2015   
11/16/2015  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  11/18/2015   
NOTE: TAPES 
11/16/2015  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/18/2015   
11/16/2015  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/18/2015   
11/11/2015  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)  11/12/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Notice of Change of Address 
11/10/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/10/2015   
11/5/2015  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/5/2015   
11/2/2015  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS’ RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE 
10/26/2015  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  10/26/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION TO REMAND/MOTION TO DISMISS 
10/26/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/26/2015   
NOTE: KNAPP MOTION BY PRIVATE COUNSEL TO BE ASSOCIATED WITH PUBLIC DEFENDER 
10/23/2015  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/27/2015   
10/23/2015  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  10/23/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
10/23/2015  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  10/23/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES OTHER THAN PRIOR CONVICTIONS 
10/21/2015  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/23/2015   
10/21/2015  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/23/2015   
10/20/2015  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/22/2015   
10/19/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/20/2015   
NOTE: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF EXHIBITS TO THE OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS ON AUGUST 14, 2015 
10/14/2015  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  10/14/2015   
9/24/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/25/2015   
NOTE: MOTION FOR RELEASE OF GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT 
9/16/2015  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  9/16/2015   
9/9/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/9/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO SCHEDULE RELEASE CONDITIONS HEARING PURSUANT TO ARIZ.R.CRIM.P. 7.4 (a) 
9/4/2015  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  9/4/2015   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
9/4/2015  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  9/4/2015   
NOTE: SERVED 09/03/2015 
9/4/2015  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  9/4/2015   
NOTE: IA Packet 
9/4/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  9/4/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
8/14/2015  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  9/4/2015   
8/14/2015  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  9/4/2015   
8/14/2015  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  9/4/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/4/2015  5:00   Initial Appearance 
9/11/2015  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
10/27/2015  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
11/24/2015  8:30   Status Conference 
12/9/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/20/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/18/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/11/2016  14:30   Oral Argument 
4/14/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/21/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/1/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/9/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
10/5/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/3/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
12/14/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/31/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/6/2017  8:00   Trial 
2/16/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
4/4/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/6/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/13/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/29/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
7/25/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/29/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/26/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/26/2017  8:30   Oral Argument 
12/5/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
12/13/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/24/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/20/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/16/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/23/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/31/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/22/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/27/2018  8:00   Trial 
10/1/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
12/3/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
12/14/2018  13:30   Oral Argument 
1/14/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/25/2019  13:30   Oral Argument 
2/22/2019  9:00   Status Conference 
2/28/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
2/28/2019  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/7/2019  8:00   Trial 
4/22/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/28/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
7/3/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
8/6/2019  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/6/2019  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/15/2019  8:00   Trial 
8/23/2019  10:00   Oral Argument 
10/3/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/14/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/18/2019  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
11/20/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/25/2019  8:00   Trial 
1/22/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/11/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/18/2020  8:00   Trial 
2/25/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/8/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/18/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/18/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/3/2020  8:00   Trial 
6/29/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/10/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/24/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/31/2020  8:00   Trial 
9/14/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/2/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
12/14/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/11/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/25/2021  11:15   Complex / Capital Case 
1/26/2021  11:00   Trial 
1/29/2021  10:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
2/26/2021  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
3/8/2021  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/8/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/25/2021  11:00   Trial 
4/12/2021  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/19/2021  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/10/2021  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/14/2021  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/21/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/6/2021  11:00   Trial 
7/26/2021  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/13/2021  11:00   Settlement Conference 
9/13/2021  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
10/4/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/19/2021  9:00   Trial 
10/26/2021  10:30   Change Of Plea 
11/15/2021  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/29/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
11/29/2021  13:30   Acceptance Of Plea/Snt 
12/3/2021  10:30   Acceptance Of Plea/Snt 
12/15/2021  9:00   Trial