Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, S P 1 Gang      
Gerald Bowman - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Lackey, Cary   Master Calendar  CR2015-001671-001  
Julius Kane - (3)
 
Defendant  M   Schwartzstein, Matthew   Cohen  CR2015-001671-002  
Marcus David Morris - (4)
 
Defendant  M   ECKSTEIN, TIMOTHY   Master Calendar  CR2015-001671-003  
Markieff A Morris - (5)
 
Defendant  M   Belanger, James   Master Calendar  CR2015-001671-004  
Christopher MelendezJr. - (6)
 
Defendant  M   To Be Determined   Kiefer  CR2015-001671-005  
Clerk Of The Court - (7)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Marcus David Morris  13-1204A3 (F4)  Agg Aslt-Temp Disfigurement  1/24/2015  Not Guilty By Jury  Not Guilty By Jury  10/3/2017 
Marcus David Morris  13-1204A4 (F6)  Agg Aslt-Victim Bound/Restr  1/24/2015  Not Guilty By Jury  Not Guilty By Jury  10/3/2017 
Markieff A Morris  13-1204A3 (F4)  Agg Aslt-Temp Disfigurement  1/24/2015  Not Guilty By Jury  Not Guilty By Jury  10/3/2017 
Markieff A Morris  13-1204A4 (F6)  Agg Aslt-Victim Bound/Restr  1/24/2015  Not Guilty By Jury  Not Guilty By Jury  10/3/2017 
Gerald Bowman  13-1204A3 (F4)  Agg Aslt-Temp Disfigurement  1/24/2015  Not Guilty By Jury  Not Guilty By Jury  10/3/2017 
Gerald Bowman  13-1204A4 (F6)  Agg Aslt-Victim Bound/Restr  1/24/2015  Not Guilty By Jury  Not Guilty By Jury  10/3/2017 
Julius Kane  13-1204 (F4)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  1/24/2015  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  9/13/2017 
Julius Kane  13-1204 (F6)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  1/24/2015  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  9/13/2017 
Christopher Melendez Jr.  13-1204 (F4)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  1/24/2015  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  9/13/2017 
Christopher Melendez Jr.  13-1204 (F6)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  1/24/2015  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  9/13/2017 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/29/2020  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (002)  10/30/2020   
NOTE: APD Forms COUNT 2 
10/29/2020  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party ()  10/30/2020   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
10/9/2020  NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (002)  10/12/2020   
NOTE: DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE $2,500 
9/15/2020  CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (005)  9/15/2020   
NOTE: APD Forms 
9/15/2020  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (005)  9/15/2020   
NOTE: COUNT 2  
9/15/2020  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (005)  9/15/2020   
NOTE: ORDER OF DISCHARGE FROM PROBATION COUNT 1  
11/7/2019  DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet - Party (001)  11/8/2019   
9/18/2019  LED - 2.8 (d) Letter - Party (001)  9/18/2019   
6/15/2018  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (002)  6/19/2018   
NOTE: $2500 
3/7/2018  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (002)  3/8/2018   
NOTE: Request to Establish Start Date 
3/7/2018  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (002)  3/8/2018   
NOTE: Request to Establish Start Date 
1/22/2018  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)  1/24/2018   
1/5/2018  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (005)  1/8/2018   
NOTE: Request to Establish Start Date 
1/5/2018  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (005)  1/8/2018   
NOTE: Request to Establish Start Date 
12/14/2017  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (005)  12/14/2017   
12/11/2017  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (005)  12/14/2017   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
11/27/2017  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (005)  11/28/2017   
11/20/2017  SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (005)  11/20/2017   
NOTE: AMENDED SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation 
11/20/2017  SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (002)  11/20/2017   
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation 
11/20/2017  SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (005)  11/20/2017   
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation 
11/17/2017  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (005)  11/20/2017   
11/17/2017  NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (002)  11/17/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Release of Deposit $2,500.00 
11/16/2017  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (005)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: AMENDED COUNT 1 Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
11/16/2017  PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (002)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents 
11/16/2017  PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (005)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents 
11/16/2017  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review 
11/16/2017  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (005)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review 
11/16/2017  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (005)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: Order of Confinement Jail 
11/16/2017  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (002)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: Bond Exoneration 
11/16/2017  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (005)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: COUNT 2/Terms and Conditions of Probation 
11/16/2017  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (002)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: COUNT 2/Terms and Conditions of Probation 
11/16/2017  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: COUNT 1 Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
11/16/2017  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (002)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: Order of Confinement Jail 
11/16/2017  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
11/16/2017  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (005)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
11/16/2017  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (005)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: COUNT 1/Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
11/16/2017  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (005)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: COUNT 2 Terms and Conditions of Probation 
11/16/2017  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (005)  11/17/2017   
NOTE: AMENDED/Order of Confinement Jail 
11/15/2017  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (005)  11/16/2017   
10/19/2017  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)  10/19/2017   
10/19/2017  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (005)  10/19/2017   
10/13/2017  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (004)  10/16/2017   
10/13/2017  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (003)  10/16/2017   
10/11/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/11/2017   
10/11/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  10/11/2017   
10/11/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  10/11/2017   
10/11/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  10/11/2017   
10/11/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  10/11/2017   
10/11/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/11/2017   
10/10/2017  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
10/6/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/6/2017   
10/6/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  10/6/2017   
10/6/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  10/6/2017   
10/6/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/6/2017   
10/6/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  10/6/2017   
10/6/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  10/6/2017   
10/5/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/5/2017   
10/5/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  10/5/2017   
10/5/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  10/5/2017   
10/5/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/5/2017   
10/5/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  10/5/2017   
10/5/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  10/5/2017   
10/5/2017  STA - Statement - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 
10/4/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/4/2017   
10/4/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  10/4/2017   
10/4/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  10/4/2017   
10/3/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  10/3/2017   
10/3/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/3/2017   
10/3/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  10/3/2017   
10/3/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/3/2017   
10/3/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  10/3/2017   
10/3/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  10/3/2017   
10/3/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/3/2017   
10/3/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  10/3/2017   
10/3/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  10/3/2017   
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 5 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 4 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 3 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 2 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 1 
10/3/2017  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: SIGNED 
10/3/2017  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: SIGNED 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: #6 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 5 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 4 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 3 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 2 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 1 
10/3/2017  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)  10/19/2017   
10/3/2017  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (004)  10/19/2017   
10/3/2017  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/30/2018   
NOTE: JURY QUESTIONNAIRES 
10/3/2017  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (003)  10/13/2017   
10/3/2017  VER - Verdict - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: SIGNED 
10/3/2017  VER - Verdict - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: SIGNED 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 6 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 6 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 5 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 4 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 3 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 2 
10/3/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 1 
10/3/2017  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: SIGNED 
10/3/2017  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: SIGNED 
10/2/2017  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: FINAL 
10/2/2017  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: FINAL 
10/2/2017  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: FINAL 
9/28/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 21 
9/28/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 20 
9/28/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 19 
9/28/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 21 
9/28/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 20 
9/28/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 19 
9/28/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: #21 
9/28/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 20 
9/28/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 19 
9/27/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 18 
9/27/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 17 
9/27/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 18 
9/27/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 17 
9/27/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 18 
9/27/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 17 
9/27/2017  RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (003)  9/27/2017   
NOTE: Marcus Morriss Requested Jury Instructions 
9/27/2017  REQ - Request - Party (001)  9/28/2017   
NOTE: JURY INSTRUCTIONS 
9/26/2017  RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)  9/26/2017   
NOTE: STATES REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS 
9/26/2017  RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (003)  9/26/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTION 
9/26/2017  RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (004)  9/26/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 13 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 16 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 15 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 14 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 13 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 12 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 16 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 15 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 14 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 12 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 16 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 15 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 14 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 13 
9/26/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 12 
9/25/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 11 
9/25/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 10 
9/25/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 11 
9/25/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 10 
9/25/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 11 
9/25/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 10 
9/25/2017  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  9/25/2017   
9/25/2017  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)  9/25/2017   
9/25/2017  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (003)  9/25/2017   
9/25/2017  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (004)  9/25/2017   
9/25/2017  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (005)  9/25/2017   
9/25/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  9/25/2017   
9/25/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  9/25/2017   
9/25/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)  9/25/2017   
9/25/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  9/25/2017   
9/25/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)  9/25/2017   
9/25/2017  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (005)  9/25/2017   
9/25/2017  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)  9/25/2017   
9/25/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  9/25/2017   
9/25/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/25/2017   
9/25/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  9/25/2017   
9/21/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 9 
9/21/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 8 
9/21/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 7 
9/21/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 9 
9/21/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 8 
9/21/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 7 
9/21/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 9 
9/21/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 8 
9/21/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 7 
9/21/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 4 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 3 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 2 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 5 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 6 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 5 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 4 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 3 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 2 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 1 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 6 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 1 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 6 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 5 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 4 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 3 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 2 
9/20/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: # 1 
9/19/2017  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)  9/21/2017   
NOTE: SERVED 09/14/17 
9/19/2017  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)  9/21/2017   
NOTE: SERVED 09/14/17 
9/18/2017  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: PRELIMINARY 
9/18/2017  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (003)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: PRELIMINARY 
9/18/2017  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (004)  10/12/2017   
NOTE: PRELIMINARY 
9/15/2017  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  9/15/2017   
NOTE: STATES AMENDED REQUESTED FOR RULE 609 HEARING 
9/15/2017  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (003)  9/15/2017   
NOTE: STATES AMENDED REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING 
9/15/2017  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (004)  9/15/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S AMENDED REQUESTED FOR RULE 609 HEARING 
9/15/2017  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (004)  9/15/2017   
NOTE: STATES AMENDED REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING  
9/13/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  9/13/2017   
9/13/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  9/13/2017   
9/13/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (003)  9/13/2017   
9/13/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (004)  9/13/2017   
9/13/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (005)  9/13/2017   
9/13/2017  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  9/14/2017   
NOTE: DEFENDANT GERALD BOWMAN’S 2nd SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT 
9/11/2017  PMS - Pretrial Management Statement - Party (002)  9/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT 
9/11/2017  STA - Statement - Party (003)  9/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT 
9/11/2017  STA - Statement - Party (001)  9/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT 
9/11/2017  STA - Statement - Party (004)  9/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT 
9/11/2017  STA - Statement - Party (005)  9/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT 
9/8/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  9/8/2017   
9/8/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  9/8/2017   
9/8/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (003)  9/8/2017   
9/8/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (004)  9/8/2017   
9/8/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (005)  9/8/2017   
9/7/2017  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/12/2017   
NOTE: SERVED 08/29/2017 
9/5/2017  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/8/2017   
NOTE: SERVED 08/15/17 
8/29/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)  8/29/2017   
8/29/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/29/2017   
8/29/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  8/29/2017   
8/29/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)  8/29/2017   
8/29/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  8/29/2017   
8/16/2017  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)  8/18/2017   
NOTE: SERVED 08/08/2017 
8/11/2017  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)  8/11/2017   
8/10/2017  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)  8/15/2017   
NOTE: SERVED 8-4-17 
8/9/2017  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (005)  8/9/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
8/9/2017  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (005)  8/9/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
8/3/2017  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)  8/3/2017   
8/3/2017  RES - Response - Party (004)  8/3/2017   
NOTE: Crime Victims Response to Defendants Motion for Expedited Order Authorizing Limited Disclosure of Hood Photos for Use in Civil Mediation Proceedings 
7/25/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  7/26/2017   
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXPEDITED ORDER AUTHORIZING LIMITED DISCLOSURE OF HOOD PHOTOS FOR USE IN CIVIL MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS 
7/21/2017  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (005)  7/25/2017   
7/20/2017  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (003)  7/20/2017   
7/20/2017  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (004)  7/20/2017   
7/20/2017  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (005)  7/20/2017   
7/20/2017  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  7/20/2017   
7/20/2017  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)  7/20/2017   
6/20/2017  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)  6/20/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw David A Black as Counsel of Record and to Appoint New Counsel 
6/20/2017  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)  6/22/2017   
6/2/2017  STA - Statement - Party (001)  6/2/2017   
NOTE: DEFENDANT GERALD BOWMAN’S 1st SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT 
6/1/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  6/1/2017   
6/1/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)  6/1/2017   
6/1/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  6/1/2017   
6/1/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)  6/1/2017   
6/1/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  6/1/2017   
5/3/2017  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (004)  5/3/2017   
5/3/2017  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (005)  5/3/2017   
5/3/2017  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)  5/3/2017   
5/3/2017  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (003)  5/3/2017   
5/3/2017  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  5/3/2017   
4/26/2017  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  4/26/2017   
4/24/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  4/24/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Appear Telephonically (Markieff Moriis) 
4/4/2017  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  4/4/2017   
4/4/2017  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)  4/4/2017   
4/4/2017  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)  4/4/2017   
4/4/2017  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)  4/4/2017   
4/4/2017  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)  4/4/2017   
3/24/2017  REL - Reply - Party (003)  3/27/2017   
NOTE: CRIME VICTIM’S REPLY TO MARCUS MORRIS’S RESPONSE TO CRIME VICTIM’S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: CELL PHONE DATA OBTAINED WITHOUT HIS CONSENT 
3/24/2017  REL - Reply - Party (004)  3/27/2017   
NOTE: CRIME VICTIM’S REPLY TO MARKIEFF MORRIS’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: CELL PHONE DATA 
3/20/2017  RES - Response - Party (004)  3/20/2017   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE CELL PHONE DATA 
3/20/2017  RES - Response - Party (003)  3/20/2017   
NOTE: Marcus Morris s Response to Crime Victims Motion for a Protective Order Re Cell Phone Data Obtained Without His Consent 
3/14/2017  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)  3/15/2017   
3/14/2017  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  3/15/2017   
3/14/2017  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (002)  3/15/2017   
3/14/2017  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (002)  3/15/2017   
3/14/2017  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (003)  3/15/2017   
3/14/2017  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (003)  3/15/2017   
3/14/2017  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (004)  3/15/2017   
3/14/2017  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (004)  3/15/2017   
3/14/2017  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (005)  3/15/2017   
3/14/2017  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (005)  3/15/2017   
3/10/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  3/10/2017   
3/10/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  3/10/2017   
3/10/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  3/10/2017   
3/10/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)  3/10/2017   
3/10/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)  3/10/2017   
3/9/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  3/10/2017   
NOTE: Crime Victims Motion For A Protective Order RE: Cell Phone Data Obtained Without His Consent 
3/9/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  3/10/2017   
NOTE: CRIME VICTIM'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: CELL PHONE DATA OBTAINED WITHOUT HIS CONSENT  
3/9/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  3/9/2017   
NOTE: Crime Victims Motion For A Protective Order RE: Cell Phone Data Obtained Without His Consent 
3/9/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (005)  3/9/2017   
NOTE: Crime Victims Motion For A Protective Order RE: Cell Phone Data Obtained Without His Consent 
3/9/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/9/2017   
NOTE: Crime Victims Motion For A Protecticve Order RE: Cell Phone Data Obtained Without His Consent 
3/9/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  3/9/2017   
NOTE: Crime Victims Motion For A Protective Order RE: Cell Phone Data Obtained Without His Consent 
3/6/2017  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  3/8/2017   
NOTE: 2 CD'S TITLED ALL OF HOODS PHONE PDF FORMAT AND ALL OF SHERRODS PHONE PDF FORMAT 
3/6/2017  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)  3/8/2017   
NOTE: 2 CD'S TITLED ALL OF HOODS PHONE PDF FORMAT AND ALL OF SHERRODS PHONE PDF FORMAT 
3/6/2017  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (003)  3/8/2017   
NOTE: 2 CD'S TITLED ALL OF HOODS PHONE PDF FORMAT AND ALL OF SHERRODS PHONE PDF FORMAT 
3/6/2017  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)  3/8/2017   
NOTE: 2 CD'S TITLED ALL OF HOODS PHONE PDF FORMAT AND ALL OF SHERRODS PHONE PDF FORMAT 
3/6/2017  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)  3/8/2017   
NOTE: 2 CD'S TITLED ALL OF HOODS PHONE PDF FORMAT AND ALL OF SHERRODS PHONE PDF FORMAT 
2/15/2017  ORD - Order - Party (005)  2/17/2017   
NOTE: SUPREME COURT 
2/15/2017  ORD - Order - Party (004)  2/17/2017   
NOTE: SUPREME COURT ORDER 
2/15/2017  ORD - Order - Party (003)  2/17/2017   
NOTE: SUPREME COURT ORDER 
2/15/2017  ORD - Order - Party (002)  2/17/2017   
NOTE: SUPREME COURT ORDER 
2/15/2017  ORD - Order - Party (001)  2/17/2017   
NOTE: SUPREME COURT ORDER 
1/6/2017  NOT - Notice - Party (004)  1/6/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Change of Address 
11/22/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  11/23/2016   
11/22/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (002)  11/23/2016   
11/22/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (003)  11/23/2016   
11/22/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (004)  11/23/2016   
11/22/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (005)  11/23/2016   
11/16/2016  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  11/21/2016   
11/14/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)  11/14/2016   
11/14/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/14/2016   
11/14/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  11/14/2016   
11/14/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  11/14/2016   
11/14/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)  11/14/2016   
10/19/2016  ORD - Order - Party (002)  10/20/2016   
NOTE: AZ SUPREME CT 
10/19/2016  ORD - Order - Party (001)  10/20/2016   
NOTE: AZ SUPREME CT 
10/19/2016  ORD - Order - Party (003)  10/20/2016   
NOTE: AZ SUPREME CT 
10/19/2016  ORD - Order - Party (004)  10/20/2016   
NOTE: AZ SUPREME CT 
10/19/2016  ORD - Order - Party (005)  10/20/2016   
NOTE: AZ SUPREME CT 
10/5/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/5/2016   
10/5/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  10/5/2016   
10/5/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  10/5/2016   
10/5/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)  10/5/2016   
10/5/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)  10/5/2016   
8/15/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (005)  8/16/2016   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STAY 
8/15/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (004)  8/16/2016   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STAY 
8/15/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (003)  8/16/2016   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STAY 
8/15/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (002)  8/16/2016   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STAY 
8/15/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  8/16/2016   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STAY 
8/9/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/9/2016   
8/9/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  8/9/2016   
8/9/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  8/9/2016   
8/9/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)  8/9/2016   
8/9/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)  8/9/2016   
7/29/2016  ORD - Order - Party (001)  8/2/2016   
NOTE: PROPOSED 
7/28/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  7/29/2016   
NOTE: CRIME VICTIM’S MOTION FOR FREE TRANSCRIPT 
7/28/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  7/29/2016   
NOTE: crime Victims Motion for Free Transcript 
7/28/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/29/2016   
NOTE: Crime Victims Motion for Free Transcript 
7/28/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (005)  7/29/2016   
NOTE: Crime Victims Motion for Free Transcript EXPEDITED RULING REQUESTED  
7/28/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  7/29/2016   
NOTE: CRIME VICTIM’S MOTION FOR FREE TRANSCRIPT EXPEDITED RULING REQUESTED 
7/27/2016  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  7/29/2016   
7/25/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/25/2016   
7/22/2016  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (004)  7/22/2016   
7/22/2016  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  7/22/2016   
7/22/2016  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)  7/22/2016   
7/22/2016  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)  7/22/2016   
7/22/2016  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)  7/22/2016   
7/21/2016  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)  7/21/2016   
7/21/2016  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)  7/21/2016   
7/21/2016  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)  7/21/2016   
7/21/2016  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)  7/21/2016   
7/21/2016  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  7/21/2016   
6/29/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  6/29/2016   
6/29/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)  6/29/2016   
6/29/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)  6/29/2016   
6/29/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  6/29/2016   
6/29/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  6/29/2016   
6/23/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  6/23/2016   
NOTE: VICTIM’S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT 
6/23/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (005)  6/23/2016   
NOTE: VICTIM’S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT 
6/23/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  6/23/2016   
NOTE: VICTIM’S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT 
6/23/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/23/2016   
NOTE: Motion to Exceed Page Limit 
6/23/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  6/23/2016   
NOTE: Motion to Exceed Page Limit 
6/23/2016  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)  6/24/2016   
NOTE: CRIME VICTIM’S OBJECTION TO THE DISCLOSURE OF CELL PHONE DATA EXTRACTED FROM VICTIM’S CELL PHONE BEYOND THE SCOPE OF CONSENT 
6/23/2016  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (003)  6/24/2016   
NOTE: CRIME VICTIM’S OBJECTION TO THE DISCLOSURE OF CELL PHONE DATA EXTRACTED FROM VICTIM’S CELL PHONE BEYOND THE SCOPE OF CONSENT 
6/23/2016  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (004)  6/24/2016   
NOTE: CRIME VICTIM’S OBJECTION TO THE DISCLOSURE OF CELL PHONE DATA EXTRACTED FROM VICTIM’S CELL PHONE BEYOND THE SCOPE OF CONSENT 
6/23/2016  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  6/24/2016   
NOTE: CRIME VICTIM’S OBJECTION TO THE DISCLOSURE OF CELL PHONE DATA EXTRACTED FROM VICTIM’S CELL PHONE BEYOND THE SCOPE OF CONSENT  
6/23/2016  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (005)  6/24/2016   
NOTE: CRIME VICTIM’S OBJECTION TO THE DISCLOSURE OF CELL PHONE DATA EXTRACTED FROM VICTIM’S CELL PHONE BEYOND THE SCOPE OF CONSENT 
6/15/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  6/15/2016   
6/15/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  6/15/2016   
6/15/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)  6/15/2016   
6/15/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  6/15/2016   
6/15/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)  6/15/2016   
6/14/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/15/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANT GERALD BOWMAN’S MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANTS MARCUS DAVID MORRIS’ AND MARKIEFF A. MORRIS’ BRIEF RE: DISCLOSURE OF MATERIALS TAKEN FROM CELL PHONES 
6/7/2016  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (004)  6/7/2016   
6/7/2016  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  6/7/2016   
6/7/2016  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)  6/7/2016   
6/7/2016  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (005)  6/7/2016   
6/7/2016  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)  6/7/2016   
6/6/2016  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)  6/6/2016   
NOTE: VICTIM’S MOTION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE VICTIM’S POSITION ON DISCLOSURE OF HIS CELL PHONE DATA 
6/6/2016  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  6/6/2016   
NOTE: VICTIM’S MOTION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE VICTIM’S POSITION ON DISCLOSURE OF HIS CELL PHONE DATA 
6/6/2016  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)  6/6/2016   
NOTE: VICTIM’S MOTION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE VICTIM’S POSITION ON DISCLOSURE OF HIS CELL PHONE DATA 
6/6/2016  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (005)  6/6/2016   
NOTE: VICTIM’S MOTION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE VICTIM’S POSITION ON DISCLOSURE OF HIS CELL PHONE DATA 
6/6/2016  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)  6/6/2016   
NOTE: Victims Motion Requesting Extension of Time to File Position on Cell Phone Data 
6/3/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  6/3/2016   
NOTE: Of Counsel for Victims and Assertion of Victims Constitutional Rights 
6/3/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)  6/3/2016   
NOTE: Of Counsel for Victims and Assertion of Victims Constitutional Rights 
6/3/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (005)  6/3/2016   
NOTE: Of Counsel for Victims and Assertion of Victims Constitutional Rights 
6/3/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (003)  6/3/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR VICTIM AND ASSERTION OF VICTIMS’ CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS 
6/3/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (005)  6/3/2016   
NOTE: Of Counsel for Victims and Assertion of Victims Constitutional Rights 
6/3/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (004)  6/3/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR VICTIM AND ASSERTION OF VICTIMS’ CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS 
5/27/2016  RES - Response - Party (003)  5/27/2016   
NOTE: MARCUS MORRIS’S and MARKIEFF MORRIS’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S POSITION REGARDING RELEASE OF BOTH VICTIM AND WITNESS CELL PHONE DATA 
5/27/2016  RES - Response - Party (004)  5/27/2016   
NOTE: Marcus Morriss and Markieff Morriss Response to States Position Regarding Release of Both Victim and Witness Cell Phone Data 
5/25/2016  REL - Reply - Party (002)  5/25/2016   
NOTE: STATES REPLY TO DEFENSE MOTION REGARDING CELL DATA 
5/25/2016  REL - Reply - Party (005)  5/25/2016   
NOTE: STATES REPLY TO DEFENSE MOTION REGARDING CELL DATA 
5/25/2016  REL - Reply - Party (003)  5/25/2016   
NOTE: STATE'S REPLY TO DEFENSE MOTION REGARDING CELL DATA 
5/25/2016  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  5/25/2016   
NOTE: STATE'S REPLY TO DEFENSE MOTION REGARDING CELL DATA  
5/25/2016  REL - Reply - Party (004)  5/25/2016   
NOTE: STATE'S REPLY TO DEFENSE MOTION REGARDING CELL DATA 
5/13/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  5/13/2016   
NOTE: Marcus Morriss and Markieff Morriss Brief re Disclosure of Materials Taken from Cell Phones 
5/13/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  5/13/2016   
NOTE: MARCUS MORRIS’S and MARKIEFF MORRIS’S BRIEF RE DISCLOSURE OF MATERIALS TAKEN FROM CELL PHONES 
5/13/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  5/16/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF JOINING IN CODEFENDANTS’ BRIEF 
5/6/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/6/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S POSITION REGARDING RELEASE OF BOTH VICTIM AND WITNESS CELL PHONE DATA 
5/6/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  5/6/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S POSITION REGARDING RELEASE OF BOTH VICTIM AND WITNESS CELL PHONE DATA 
5/6/2016  REQ - Request - Party (003)  5/6/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S POSITION REGARDING RELEASE OF BOTH VICTIM AND WITNESS CELL PHONE DATA 
5/6/2016  REQ - Request - Party (004)  5/6/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S POSITION REGARDING RELEASE OF BOTH VICTIM AND WITNESS CELL PHONE DATA 
5/6/2016  ACS - Acceptance Of Service - Party (005)  5/6/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S POSITION REGARDING RELEASE OF BOTH VICTIM AND WITNESS CELL PHONE DATA 
5/2/2016  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (004)  5/2/2016   
5/2/2016  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  5/2/2016   
5/2/2016  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (003)  5/2/2016   
5/2/2016  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)  5/2/2016   
5/2/2016  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (005)  5/2/2016   
3/29/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  3/29/2016   
3/29/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)  3/29/2016   
3/29/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/29/2016   
3/29/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  3/29/2016   
3/29/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)  3/29/2016   
3/8/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  3/8/2016   
3/8/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/8/2016   
3/8/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  3/8/2016   
3/8/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)  3/8/2016   
3/8/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)  3/8/2016   
3/7/2016  REP - Report - Party (003)  3/10/2016   
3/7/2016  REP - Report - Party (002)  3/10/2016   
3/7/2016  REP - Report - Party (005)  3/10/2016   
3/7/2016  REP - Report - Party (004)  3/10/2016   
3/7/2016  REP - Report - Party (001)  3/14/2016   
NOTE: SPECIAL MASTER 
3/7/2016  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  3/29/2016   
3/1/2016  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (004)  3/1/2016   
3/1/2016  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (005)  3/1/2016   
3/1/2016  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (003)  3/1/2016   
3/1/2016  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)  3/1/2016   
3/1/2016  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  3/1/2016   
2/11/2016  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (004)  2/11/2016   
2/11/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/11/2016   
2/11/2016  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (005)  2/11/2016   
2/11/2016  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (002)  2/11/2016   
2/11/2016  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (003)  2/11/2016   
2/9/2016  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  2/9/2016   
2/5/2016  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  2/5/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR VICTIM ERIK HOOD 
2/5/2016  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (004)  2/5/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR VICTIM ERIK HOOD 
2/5/2016  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (003)  2/5/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR VICTIM ERIK HOOD 
2/5/2016  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (005)  2/5/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR VICTIM ERIK HOOD 
2/5/2016  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)  2/5/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEYOF RECORD FOR VICTIM ERIK HOOD 
2/1/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)  2/1/2016   
2/1/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (005)  2/1/2016   
2/1/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)  2/1/2016   
2/1/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)  2/1/2016   
2/1/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  2/1/2016   
1/21/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  1/21/2016   
1/21/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/21/2016   
1/21/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  1/21/2016   
1/21/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)  1/21/2016   
1/21/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)  1/21/2016   
1/19/2016  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (004)  1/19/2016   
1/19/2016  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  1/19/2016   
1/19/2016  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)  1/19/2016   
1/19/2016  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (005)  1/19/2016   
1/19/2016  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (003)  1/19/2016   
12/17/2015  RES - Response - Party (003)  12/17/2015   
NOTE: Response to States Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Rule 15 and Request for Court Review Regarding Disclosure 
12/17/2015  RES - Response - Party (004)  12/17/2015   
NOTE: Response to States Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Rule 15 and Request for Court Review Regarding Disclosure 
12/9/2015  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (004)  12/10/2015   
NOTE: ORDER ACCEPTING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION/RELIEF DENIED 
12/9/2015  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (003)  12/10/2015   
NOTE: ORDER ACCEPTING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION/RELIEF DENIED 
12/2/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  12/2/2015   
NOTE: STATES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15 AND REQUEST FOR COURT REVIEW REGARDING DISCLOSURE 
12/2/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  12/2/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15 AND REQUEST FOR COURT REVIEW REGADING DISCLOSURE 
12/2/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  12/2/2015   
NOTE: STATES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANTO RULE 15 AND REQUEST FOR COURT REVIEW REGARDING DISCLOSURE  
12/2/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/2/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15 AND REQUEST FOR COURT REVIEW REGARDING DISCLOSURE  
12/2/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (005)  12/2/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15 AND REQUEST FOR COURT REVIEW REGADING DISCLOSURE 
11/30/2015  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (004)  12/2/2015   
NOTE: PETITIONERS MAY FILE A REPLY TO THE RESPONSE TO THE PETITION FOR SPECIAL ACTION ON DECEMBER 3, 2015 W/RELATED CASE CR2015-001671-003 
11/30/2015  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (003)  12/2/2015   
NOTE: PETITIONERS MAY FILE A REPLY TO THE RESPONSE TO THE PETITION FOR SPECIAL ACTION ON DECMEBER 3, 2015 W/RELATED CASE CR2015-001671-004 
11/9/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (004)  11/9/2015   
11/9/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (005)  11/9/2015   
11/9/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (003)  11/9/2015   
11/9/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)  11/9/2015   
11/9/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  11/9/2015   
11/5/2015  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  11/6/2015   
NOTE: VIOLATION 
10/26/2015  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)  10/26/2015   
10/26/2015  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)  10/26/2015   
10/26/2015  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  10/26/2015   
10/26/2015  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)  10/26/2015   
10/26/2015  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)  10/26/2015   
10/22/2015  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)  10/22/2015   
10/19/2015  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (004)  10/19/2015   
10/19/2015  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (003)  10/19/2015   
10/15/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  10/15/2015   
10/15/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)  10/15/2015   
10/2/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (005)  10/6/2015   
NOTE: TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANTS MARCUS DAVID MORRIS AND MARKEIFF A MORRIS MOTION TO REMAND 
9/24/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  9/24/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT JULIUS KANE’S MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANTS MARCUS DAVID MORRIS’ AND MARKEIFF A. MORRIS’ MOTION TO REMAND 
9/22/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (004)  9/22/2015   
9/22/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  9/22/2015   
9/22/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (003)  9/22/2015   
9/22/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)  9/22/2015   
9/22/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (005)  9/22/2015   
9/14/2015  NOT - Notice - Party (004)  9/14/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF MARKIEFF A. MORRIS 
9/14/2015  AFF - Affidavit - Party (001)  9/16/2015   
NOTE: GERALD BOWMANS / OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF THE SEPTEMBER 16, 2015 COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE 
9/11/2015  ORD - Order - Party (004)  9/15/2015   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR REMAND 
9/11/2015  ORD - Order - Party (003)  9/24/2015   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR REMAND 
9/11/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  9/11/2015   
9/11/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  9/11/2015   
9/11/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)  9/11/2015   
9/11/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)  9/11/2015   
9/4/2015  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)  9/4/2015   
9/2/2015  REL - Reply - Party (003)  9/2/2015   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE 
9/2/2015  REL - Reply - Party (004)  9/2/2015   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion to Remand to the Grand Jury for a New Finding of Probable Cause 
8/31/2015  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)  8/31/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Extend Deadline to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand to the Grand Jury for a New Finding of Probable Cause 
8/31/2015  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)  9/1/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Extend Deadline to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand to Grand Jury for a New Finding of Probable Cause 
8/27/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  8/27/2015   
8/27/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)  8/27/2015   
8/24/2015  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)  8/25/2015   
NOTE: STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY  
8/24/2015  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (004)  8/25/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY  
8/21/2015  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)  8/24/2015   
NOTE: STATES MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO REMAND 
8/21/2015  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)  8/24/2015   
NOTE: STATES MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO REMAND 
8/12/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)  8/12/2015   
8/12/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)  8/12/2015   
8/12/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  8/12/2015   
8/12/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  8/12/2015   
8/12/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/12/2015   
8/4/2015  NOT - Notice - Party (003)  8/4/2015   
NOTE: Notice Re Clients Awareness of Next Court Date  
8/2/2015  STA - Statement - Party (001)  8/3/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT GERALD BOWMAN’S RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT 
7/31/2015  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)  7/31/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSE 
7/31/2015  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)  7/31/2015   
NOTE: TO FILE RESPONSE  
7/28/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  7/28/2015   
7/28/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)  7/28/2015   
7/27/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)  7/28/2015   
NOTE: EXHIBIT 7 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE 639TH MARICOPA COUNTY GRAND JURY 4/9/15 
7/27/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (004)  7/28/2015   
NOTE: EXHIBIT 7 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE THE 639TH MARICOPA COUNTY GRAND JURY 4/9/15 
7/27/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  7/29/2015   
NOTE: TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT 7 TO MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A NEW FINDINGOF PROBABLE CAUSE 
7/27/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  7/29/2015   
NOTE: TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT 7 TO MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE 
7/27/2015  ORD - Order - Party (003)  8/11/2015   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT 7 TO MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE 
7/27/2015  ORD - Order - Party (004)  8/11/2015   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT 7 TO MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE 
7/27/2015  ORD - Order - Party (003)  8/11/2015   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT 
7/27/2015  ORD - Order - Party (004)  8/11/2015   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT 
7/15/2015  NOT - Notice - Party (004)  7/15/2015   
NOTE: Defendants Notice of Defenses and Disclosure of Witnesses and Evidence 
7/14/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  7/14/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT 
7/14/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  7/14/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT 
7/14/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  7/14/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE 
7/14/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  7/14/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE 
7/13/2015  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (004)  7/13/2015   
7/13/2015  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (002)  7/13/2015   
7/13/2015  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (003)  7/13/2015   
7/13/2015  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (005)  7/13/2015   
7/13/2015  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)  7/13/2015   
7/13/2015  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)  7/13/2015   
7/13/2015  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/14/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT GERALD BOWMAN’S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE JULY 17, 2015 COMPREHENSIVE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE TO AUGUST 3, 2015 
7/10/2015  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (004)  7/10/2015   
7/10/2015  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)  7/10/2015   
7/10/2015  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)  7/10/2015   
7/10/2015  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)  7/10/2015   
7/10/2015  ORD - Order - Party (002)  7/13/2015   
NOTE: THAT THE DEFENDANT SUBMIT TO THE TAKING OF FINGERPRINTS AND PHOTOS 
7/2/2015  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (005)  7/7/2015   
6/29/2015  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (004)  6/29/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
6/29/2015  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  6/29/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
6/29/2015  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)  6/29/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
6/29/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  6/29/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Designate Case as Complex Criminal Matter  
6/29/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  6/29/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Designate Case as Complex Criminal Matter 
6/29/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/30/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT GERALD BOWMAN’S MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANTS MARCUS DAVID MORRIS’ AND MARKIEFF A. MORRIS’ MOTION TO DESIGNATE CASE AS COMPLEX CRIMINAL MATTER 
6/26/2015  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (004)  6/26/2015   
6/26/2015  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)  6/26/2015   
6/26/2015  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)  6/26/2015   
6/26/2015  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)  6/26/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
6/26/2015  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)  6/26/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
6/26/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  6/26/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER 
6/26/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  6/26/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE 
6/26/2015  ALG - Allegation - Party (002)  6/26/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
6/26/2015  ALG - Allegation - Party (002)  6/26/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
6/26/2015  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)  6/26/2015   
NOTE: AMENDED STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
6/25/2015  NOT - Notice - Party (003)  6/25/2015   
NOTE: Defendants Notice of Defenses and Disclosure of Witnesses and Evidence  
6/25/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  6/25/2015   
NOTE: Motion for Protected Address  
6/25/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  6/25/2015   
NOTE: Motion for Protected Address 
6/25/2015  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)  6/25/2015   
NOTE: Second Motion to Extend Deadline to File Motion for Remand 
6/25/2015  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)  6/25/2015   
NOTE: Second Motion to Extend Deadline to File Motion for Remand 
6/22/2015  ORD - Order - Party (003)  6/29/2015   
NOTE: THAT MARCUS DAVID MORRIS SUBMIT TO THE TAKING OF FINGERPRINTS & PHOTOS 
6/22/2015  ORD - Order - Party (004)  6/29/2015   
NOTE: THAT MARKIEFF A MORRIS SUBMIT TO THE TAKING OF FINGERPRINTS AND PHOTOS 
6/22/2015  ORD - Order - Party (005)  6/29/2015   
NOTE: THAT CHRISTOPHER MELENDEZ SUBMIT TO THE TAKING OF FINGERPRINTS AND PHOTOS 
6/19/2015  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  6/19/2015   
6/16/2015  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  6/16/2015   
6/15/2015  ALG - Allegation - Party (005)  6/16/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
6/15/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (005)  6/16/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER 
6/15/2015  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (005)  6/16/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
6/15/2015  ALG - Allegation - Party (004)  6/16/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
6/15/2015  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (003)  6/15/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
6/15/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  6/15/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER 
6/15/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  6/15/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER 
6/15/2015  ALG - Allegation - Party (003)  6/15/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
6/15/2015  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (004)  6/15/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
6/15/2015  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/19/2015   
NOTE: THAT GERALD BOWMAN SUBMIT TO THE TAKING OF FINGERPRINTS AND PHOTOS 
6/11/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/15/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT GERALD BOWMAN'S/ TO EXTEND RULE 12.9 DEADLINE 
6/11/2015  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)  6/15/2015   
6/10/2015  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)  6/10/2015   
6/10/2015  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  6/10/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
6/10/2015  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  6/10/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
6/10/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/10/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER 
6/4/2015  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002)  6/4/2015   
NOTE: $2500 
6/2/2015  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)  6/2/2015   
6/2/2015  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (004)  6/2/2015   
6/2/2015  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)  6/2/2015   
6/2/2015  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)  6/2/2015   
5/28/2015  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (004)  5/28/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRAVEL 
5/28/2015  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)  5/28/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRAVEL 
5/28/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (005)  6/1/2015   
NOTE: FOR GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPTS 
5/28/2015  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (005)  6/1/2015   
5/28/2015  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (005)  6/1/2015   
5/28/2015  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (005)  6/1/2015   
5/27/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  5/27/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Allow Out of State Travel  
5/27/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  5/27/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO ALLOW OUT OF STATE TRAVEL 
5/27/2015  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)  5/27/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR REMAND 
5/27/2015  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)  5/27/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Extend Deadline to File Motion for Remand  
5/21/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (005)  5/21/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
5/15/2015  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (005)  5/19/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: QUASHED 5/14/15 
5/15/2015  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (005)  5/19/2015   
5/14/2015  ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (005)  5/22/2015   
5/13/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)  5/13/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
5/13/2015  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)  5/13/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES 
5/13/2015  REQ - Request - Party (002)  5/13/2015   
NOTE: Request for Discovery 
5/13/2015  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)  5/18/2015   
5/12/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)  5/12/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
5/12/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  5/13/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
5/12/2015  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (002)  5/14/2015   
NOTE: $2500 
5/11/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (004)  5/11/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
5/8/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (005)  5/19/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
5/8/2015  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (004)  5/8/2015   
5/8/2015  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (003)  5/8/2015   
5/7/2015  ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (003)  5/7/2015   
NOTE: Release Order 
5/7/2015  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (002)  5/7/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: SERVED 5/6/15 
5/7/2015  ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (004)  5/7/2015   
NOTE: Release Order 
5/7/2015  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)  5/11/2015   
5/7/2015  ORD - Order - Party (003)  5/12/2015   
NOTE: RE STILL AND ELECTRONIC CAMERA 
5/7/2015  ORD - Order - Party (004)  5/12/2015   
NOTE: RE STILL AND ELECTRONIC CAMERAS 
5/7/2015  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)  5/12/2015   
5/7/2015  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)  5/12/2015   
5/6/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (003)  5/6/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance  
5/5/2015  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  5/5/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: QUASHED 5/4/15 
5/4/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (003)  5/4/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
5/4/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (004)  5/4/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
4/30/2015  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  5/5/2015   
4/30/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  5/6/2015   
4/30/2015  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)  5/4/2015   
4/29/2015  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  4/30/2015   
4/29/2015  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)  4/30/2015   
4/29/2015  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)  4/30/2015   
4/29/2015  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004)  4/30/2015   
4/29/2015  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (005)  4/30/2015   
4/17/2015  SUM - Summons - Party (003)  4/17/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: SERVED 4/13/15 
4/17/2015  SUM - Summons - Party (004)  4/17/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: SERVED 4/13/15 
4/9/2015  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  5/5/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
4/9/2015  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  5/5/2015   
4/9/2015  IND - Indictment - Party (004)  4/17/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
4/9/2015  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (004)  4/17/2015   
4/9/2015  IND - Indictment - Party (003)  4/17/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
4/9/2015  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (003)  4/17/2015   
4/9/2015  IND - Indictment - Party (002)  5/7/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
4/9/2015  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (002)  5/7/2015   
4/9/2015  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (005)  5/19/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
4/9/2015  IND - Indictment - Party (005)  5/19/2015  Plaintiff (1)  
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
4/30/2015  8:30   Initial Appearance 
4/30/2015  8:31   Original Arraignment Hearing 
4/30/2015  8:32   Self Surrender 
5/7/2015  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
5/7/2015  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
5/14/2015  8:30   Self Surrender 
5/14/2015  8:31   Initial Appearance 
5/14/2015  8:32   Original Arraignment Hearing 
6/4/2015  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
6/11/2015  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/23/2015  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/23/2015  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/30/2015  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/30/2015  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/30/2015  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/30/2015  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
7/17/2015  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
7/21/2015  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
8/3/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/3/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/3/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/3/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/3/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/16/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/16/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/16/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/16/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/16/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/16/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/23/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/30/2015  8:00   Trial 
10/15/2015  10:30   Oral Argument 
10/15/2015  10:30   Oral Argument 
11/5/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/5/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/5/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/5/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/5/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/15/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/15/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/15/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/15/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/15/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/26/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/26/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/26/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/26/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/26/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/29/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/29/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/29/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/29/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/29/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/28/2016  10:30   Oral Argument 
7/29/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/29/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/29/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/29/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/29/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/30/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/30/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/30/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/30/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/30/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/4/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/4/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/4/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/4/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/4/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/3/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/3/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/3/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/3/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/3/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/28/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/28/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/28/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/28/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/28/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/26/2017  9:00   Complex / Capital Case 
5/26/2017  9:00   Complex / Capital Case 
5/26/2017  9:00   Complex / Capital Case 
5/26/2017  9:00   Complex / Capital Case 
5/26/2017  9:00   Complex / Capital Case 
7/14/2017  9:00   Status Conference 
7/14/2017  9:00   Status Conference 
7/14/2017  9:00   Status Conference 
7/14/2017  9:30   Status Conference 
7/14/2017  9:30   Status Conference 
8/7/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/7/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/7/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/7/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/7/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/21/2017  8:00   Trial 
8/21/2017  8:00   Trial 
8/21/2017  8:00   Trial 
8/21/2017  8:00   Trial 
8/21/2017  8:00   Trial 
8/21/2017  9:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/21/2017  9:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/21/2017  9:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/21/2017  9:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/21/2017  9:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/28/2017  8:15   Status Conference 
8/28/2017  8:15   Status Conference 
8/28/2017  8:15   Status Conference 
8/28/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
8/28/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
9/6/2017  8:15   Status Conference 
9/6/2017  8:15   Status Conference 
9/6/2017  8:15   Status Conference 
9/6/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
9/6/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
9/12/2017  8:00   Trial 
9/12/2017  8:00   Trial 
9/12/2017  8:00   Trial 
9/12/2017  8:00   Trial 
9/12/2017  8:00   Trial 
9/13/2017  9:00   Trial 
9/13/2017  9:00   Trial 
9/13/2017  9:00   Trial 
9/13/2017  9:00   Trial 
9/13/2017  9:00   Trial 
9/14/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/14/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/14/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/18/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/18/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/18/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/19/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/19/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/19/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/20/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/20/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/20/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/21/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/21/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/21/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/25/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/25/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/25/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/26/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/26/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/26/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/27/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/27/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/27/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/28/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/28/2017  10:30   Trial 
9/28/2017  10:30   Trial 
10/2/2017  10:30   Trial 
10/2/2017  10:30   Trial 
10/2/2017  10:30   Trial 
10/3/2017  10:30   Trial 
10/3/2017  10:30   Trial 
10/3/2017  10:30   Trial 
10/16/2017  10:00   Sentencing 
10/16/2017  10:00   Sentencing 
11/16/2017  9:30   Sentencing 
11/16/2017  9:30   Sentencing