Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | County Attorney, S P 1 Vehicular Crimes | ||
Diego Ivan Venegas - (2) |
Defendant | M | Public Defender-, Ccc | Master Calendar | CR2014-160593-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Diego Ivan Venegas | 13-1103A1 (F2) | MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS | 11/12/2014 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 1/2/2015 |
Diego Ivan Venegas | 13-1102 (F4) | NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE | 11/12/2014 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 12/8/2015 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
1/26/2016 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 1/27/2016 | |
1/26/2016 | ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001) | 1/27/2016 | |
1/21/2016 | 193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001) | 1/21/2016 | |
1/15/2016 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 1/20/2016 | |
NOTE: VICTIM IMPACT STATEMENTS | |||
1/15/2016 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 1/15/2016 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF RIGHTS OF REVIEW AFTER CONVICTION AND PROCEDURE RIGHT TO APPEAL | |||
1/15/2016 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 1/15/2016 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
1/15/2016 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 1/15/2016 | |
NOTE: Order of Confinement | |||
1/15/2016 | OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001) | 1/15/2016 | |
NOTE: Monetary Orders | |||
1/14/2016 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001) | 1/14/2016 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Mitigation Materials | |||
1/11/2016 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 1/11/2016 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM | |||
12/14/2015 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 12/14/2015 | |
12/8/2015 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 12/8/2015 | |
12/8/2015 | OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001) | 12/10/2015 | |
12/8/2015 | ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001) | 12/9/2015 | |
11/19/2015 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 11/19/2015 | |
10/5/2015 | 591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001) | 10/5/2015 | |
8/12/2015 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 8/12/2015 | |
8/11/2015 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 8/12/2015 | |
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |||
6/19/2015 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 6/19/2015 | |
3/25/2015 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001) | 3/25/2015 | |
3/24/2015 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/24/2015 | |
NOTE: Motion for Complex Case Designation | |||
2/26/2015 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 2/26/2015 | |
2/11/2015 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/11/2015 | |
2/6/2015 | NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001) | 2/6/2015 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY | |||
2/6/2015 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 2/11/2015 | |
2/5/2015 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 2/9/2015 | |
2/5/2015 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 2/10/2015 | |
NOTE: PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8E | |||
2/5/2015 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 2/10/2015 | |
2/2/2015 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/2/2015 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO PRESERVE AND PRODUCE | |||
2/2/2015 | RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001) | 2/2/2015 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(a) and (b) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(c) | |||
2/2/2015 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 2/2/2015 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL WITNESSES | |||
1/30/2015 | RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001) | 2/2/2015 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS | |||
1/28/2015 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 1/28/2015 | |
NOTE: THAT CHANDLER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER RELEASE PORTIONS OF MEDICAL RECORDS FOR DWAYNE FALKNER FOR TREATMENT ON 11/12/14 | |||
1/22/2015 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 1/22/2015 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR RELEASE OF VICTIM’S MEDICAL RECORDS | |||
1/12/2015 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 1/12/2015 | |
1/9/2015 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 1/13/2015 | |
1/6/2015 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 1/6/2015 | |
1/6/2015 | BON - Bond - Party (001) | 1/8/2015 | |
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY $3600 BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY | |||
12/31/2014 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 1/2/2015 | Plaintiff (1) |
12/31/2014 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 1/2/2015 | |
12/31/2014 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 1/2/2015 | Plaintiff (1) |
12/29/2014 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 12/29/2014 | |
12/29/2014 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 12/29/2014 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
12/29/2014 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 12/30/2014 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
12/24/2014 | 17:00 | Initial Appearance |
12/31/2014 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
1/5/2015 | 8:45 | Preliminary Hearing |
1/8/2015 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
2/23/2015 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
2/24/2015 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
3/24/2015 | 8:30 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
5/26/2015 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/4/2015 | 8:00 | Trial |
6/16/2015 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
8/11/2015 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
9/29/2015 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
11/17/2015 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
12/8/2015 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
1/12/2016 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
1/15/2016 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
1/19/2016 | 8:00 | Trial |