« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Johnson, Patrick
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Christopher Paul Mason - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Brown, Matthew
Judge
Kreamer
Case #
CR2014-158518-001
Party Name
B Witness - (3)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2014-158518-001
Party Name
B Witness - (4)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2014-158518-001
Party Name
B Witness - (5)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2014-158518-001
Party Name
B Witness - (6)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
M
Attorney
Ulrich, Walter
Judge
Case #
CR2014-158518-001
Party Name
David Foster - (7)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
M
Attorney
Tosto, Rick
Judge
Case #
CR2014-158518-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Christopher Paul Mason
Crime Date
4/15/2014
Date
12/22/2014
Description
ABAND/CONCEAL DEAD BODY/PARTS
ARSCode
13-2926A (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christopher Paul Mason
Crime Date
4/15/2014
Date
12/22/2014
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christopher Paul Mason
Crime Date
4/15/2014
Date
12/22/2014
Description
STREET GANG-ASSIST
ARSCode
13-2321B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christopher Paul Mason
Crime Date
4/15/2014
Date
12/22/2014
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christopher Paul Mason
Crime Date
4/15/2014
Date
12/22/2014
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christopher Paul Mason
Crime Date
4/15/2014
Date
12/22/2014
Description
KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL
ARSCode
13-1304A3 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christopher Paul Mason
Crime Date
4/15/2014
Date
4/18/2023
Description
MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL
ARSCode
13-1104A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Christopher Paul Mason
Crime Date
4/15/2014
Date
4/18/2023
Description
KIDNAP
ARSCode
13-1304 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Christopher Paul Mason
Crime Date
4/15/2014
Date
4/5/2023
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Christopher Paul Mason
Crime Date
4/15/2014
Date
4/5/2023
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Christopher Paul Mason
Crime Date
4/15/2014
Date
4/5/2023
Description
STREET GANG-ASSIST
ARSCode
13-2321B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Christopher Paul Mason
Crime Date
4/15/2014
Date
4/5/2023
Description
ABAND/CONCEAL DEAD BODY/PARTS
ARSCode
13-2926A (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE
RESTITUTION HEARING
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME
(FIRST REQUEST)
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION SET STATUS CONFERENCE FOR RESTITUTION
Filing Date
12/19/2023
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2023
Description
PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
April 13, 2023 Debra R. Carney
Filing Date
11/30/2023
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2023
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
(Sentencing)
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST MOTION FOR EXTENSION
) OF TIME TO FILE TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance with Courts Order
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Jury Trial Day 3, Settlement Conference
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
657 – ME: PCR: Counsel Withdrawn - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH KREAMER REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
9/20/2023
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
595 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2023
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
8/3/2023
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2023
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2023
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBITS Re: SENTENCING
HEARING
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
6/24/2023
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTERS Re: SENTENCING
HEARING
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Additional Information for Sentencing Hearing
Filing Date
6/5/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2023
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES (001-149)
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES (300-450)
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES (150-299)
Filing Date
4/25/2023
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2023
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2023
Description
092 - ME: Order Releasing Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2023
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
4/20/2023
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2023
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2023
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2023
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
4/18/2023
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2023
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD FOR
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CONTINUE TRIAL & HEARING ON
MARCH 20, 2023.
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to States Motion in Limini to Preclude non-admissible testimony or evidence in guilt phase
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUESTED EXPERT SUMMARIES
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE NON-ADMISSIBLE TESTIMONY OR EVIDENCE IN GUILT PHASE
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION IN
LIMINE TO LIMIT THE
DEFENDANT’S CROSS
EXAMINATION OF WITNESSES RE:
ALLEGED FAVORABLE
TREATMENT FROM THE STATE IN
EXCHANGE FOR TESTIMONY
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2023
Description
079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2023
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE RESULTS OF DAVID FOSTER’S POLYGRAPH EXAMINATION
Filing Date
4/7/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE STIPLATION ATTACHED TO THE NOTICE OF STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES REGARDING WITNESS 609 PRIORS BE FILED AND ENTERED INTO THE COURT RECORD
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR WITNESS CONTACT
INFORMATION
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Notice of Witnesses
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINI TO PROHIBIT
STATE FROM ARGUING THE LAW
REQUIRES DEATH SENTENCE
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
4/4/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 3, 4, 5, AND 6 WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHRONIS HEARING MOTION
TO DISMISS ALLEGED
AGGRAVATORS
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT THE DEFENDANT’S CROSS EXAMINATION OF WITNESSES RE: ALLEGED FAVORABLE TREATMENT FROM THE STATE IN EXCHANGE FOR TESTIMONY
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF
PROBABLE CAUSE FOR ALLEGED DEATH
PENALTY AGGRAVATING FACTORS RE:
CHRONIS V. STEINLE, 220 Ariz. 559, 208 P.3d
210 (2009)
Filing Date
3/30/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2023
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE
HEARSAY RE: Witness Brenna (Kit)
Maas
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE ANY
REFERENCE TO THE EXISTENCE OF
A POLYGRAPH EXAMINATION AND
THE RESULTS OF THE POLYGRAPH
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO MEDICAL
EXAMINERS TESTIMONY RE:
MANNER OF DEATH
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
UPDATED NOTICE OF MITIGATING
FACTORS & WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S LIST OF
PHASE I WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: HANNAH SHILEY
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Notice of Witnesses
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PREVENT TESTIMONY OF UNRELIABLE CRIMINAL INFORMANTS
Filing Date
3/24/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUESTED
ADDITIONS TO CAPITAL JURY
QUESTIONNAIRE
Filing Date
3/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ADDITIONAL PROPOSED JURY QUESTIONS
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO TRANSPORT
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Transport
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO TRANSPORT
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order to Transport
Filing Date
3/22/2023
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2023
Description
092 - ME: Order Releasing Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2023
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Hearing
Filing Date
3/20/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Mason; Joseph Kreamer
Filing Date
3/19/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELY RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
3/17/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S OBJECTION TO THE DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
3/17/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S UPDATED NOTICE OF GUILT PHASE WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/16/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Mason; Joseph Kreamer
Filing Date
3/16/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESS FOR PENALTY PHASE
Filing Date
3/16/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Enforce Screening Protocol
Filing Date
3/15/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
3/12/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION RE: WITNESS RYAN
EATON’S ATTENDANCE AT
TRIAL
Filing Date
3/12/2023
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
REGARDING BIAS & MOTIVE
EVIDENCE, OFFER OF PROOF &
REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION
Filing Date
3/11/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PREVENT TESTIMONY OF UNRELIABLE CRIMINAL INFORMANTS
Filing Date
3/10/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Produce Discovery or in the Alternative Issue a Court Order
Filing Date
3/10/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESSES (DNA and FINGERPRINT ANALYSTS)
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Case Status Report
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S DISCLOSURE OF DNA EXPERT FOR WITNESS REPLACEMENT FOR PREVIOUSLY DISCLOSED WITNESS ODENIEL SERTIL PHD
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
2/26/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Transport Sherri Traux aka Truax for Trial
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO ORDER STATE TO
NOTICE HEARSAY EVIDENCE IN
PENALTY AND REQUEST FOR
HEARING TO DETERMINE
WHETHER THE EVIDENCE IS
RELIABLE AND REBUTS
MITIGATION
Filing Date
2/14/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Defendants Supplemental Motion to Preclude or Limit States Cell Phone Expert Cell Phone Mapping
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
092 - ME: Order Releasing Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Order State to Notice Hearsay Evidence in Penalty Phase and Request for Hearing to Determine whether the Evidence is Reliable and Rebuts Mitigation
Filing Date
1/27/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response to Supplemental Motions to Preclude or Limit the Testimony of Cell Phone Expert or Cell Phone Mapping Evidence
Filing Date
1/25/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Exhibit #2 RE: SUPPLEMENTAL
MOTION TO PRECLUDE OR LIMIT
STATE’S CELL PHONE EXPERT &
CELL PHONE MAPPING
Filing Date
1/24/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
1/19/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Preclude Presumptive Blood Testing False Inferences
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO
PRECLUDE OR LIMIT STATE’S CELL
PHONE EXPERT & CELL PHONE
MAPPING
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBITS FOR SUPPLEMENTAL
MOTION TO PRECLUDE OR LIMIT
STATE’S CELL PHONE EXPERT &
CELL PHONE MAPPING
Filing Date
12/30/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT
TO THE HONORABLE
JUDGE KREAMER
Filing Date
12/20/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/19/2022
Filing Date
12/16/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-PARTY ARIZONA
DEPARTMENT OF
CORRECTIONS’ MOTION TO
TOLL RESPONSE TIME RE:
DEFENSE MOTIONS FOR
RECORDS
Filing Date
12/15/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2022
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNSELS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR WITNESS JUSTIN MURPHY
Filing Date
12/12/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS COUNSEL FOR WITNESS JUSTIN MURPHY
Filing Date
12/12/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: WITNESS DAVID FOSTER'S MCSO RECORDS
Filing Date
12/9/2022
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBIT FOR RULE 404(b) NOTICE
Re: Joshua Calkins
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2022
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Motion for Discovery
Filing Date
12/6/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO TRANSPORT THE WITNESS JUSTIN MURPHY ID#230125
Filing Date
12/5/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Production of ADOC Records for Justin Trouble Murphy or in Alternative Court Order
Filing Date
12/5/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION of
ADOC RECORDS for MICHAEL
PERKINS or in the ALTERNATIVE A
COURT ORDER FOR SAME
Filing Date
12/3/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR CONTACT
INFORMATION RE: WITNESSES
C.S.S. Katie Mason and C.S.S Ryan Eaton
Filing Date
12/2/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR BRADY
DISCLOSURE RE: COOPERATING
WITNESS JOSHUA TROUBLE
MURPHY
Filing Date
11/28/2022
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Exhibit for Conflict of Interest Motion
Filing Date
11/28/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO TRANSPORT THE
WITNESS JUSTIN MURPHY ID#230125
(EXPEDITED RULING REQUESTED)
Filing Date
11/21/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATUS OF JUDGE GRANVILLE’S
OURT ORDER & REPLY TO ATTORNEY GENERAL/ADOC’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR STG
RECORDS RE: FOSTER & ROBBINS
Filing Date
11/17/2022
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2022
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RELEASE OF
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF’S
OFFICE JAIL RECORDS RE: DAVID
FOSTER
Filing Date
11/10/2022
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF
CORRECTIONS’ OBJECTION
TO DEFENDANT’S OCTOBER
27, 2022, REQUEST FOR COURT
ORDER RE: DOC/STG FILES
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
11/4/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/04/2022
Filing Date
11/2/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Stipulation of the Parties Regarding Witness 609 Prior
Filing Date
11/2/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Corrected Notice of Stipulation of the Parties Regarding Witness 609 Priors
Filing Date
11/2/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Transport David Foster
Filing Date
10/31/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CONTEMPORANEOUS
RECORDATION OF ARGUMENT ON
MOTIONS, OBJECTIONS AND BENCH
CONFERENCES TO PRESERVE
DEFENDANT’S RIGHTS ON APPEAL
Filing Date
10/28/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO TRANSPORT
WITNESS THOMAS BASTIAN
Filing Date
10/27/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER
Re: DOC/STG files
Filing Date
10/18/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Notice of Other Act Evidence re Bias and Motive
Filing Date
10/10/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CORRECT THE LETTER SUBMITTED BY THE STATE
Filing Date
10/8/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTION RE: CHAPMAN
LETTER TO JUDGE MROZ
Filing Date
10/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Motion to Unseal All Sentencing Related Documents in CR2014-148449-001 CR2014-002401-001
Filing Date
9/25/2022
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Supplemental List of Witnesses
Filing Date
9/22/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Deadline for Production of States Revised Cell Phone Video
Filing Date
9/16/2022
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
9/16/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE PROTECTIVE ORDER APPLIES
Filing Date
9/14/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Mason; Joseph Kreamer
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Mason; Joseph Kreamer
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 9/13/2022
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBITS RE: CONFLICT OF
INTEREST HEARING (Part 2)
Filing Date
9/12/2022
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBITS RE: CONFLICT OF
INTEREST HEARING (Part
Filing Date
9/8/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT TO PRODUCE DEPARTMENTAL RECORDS
Filing Date
9/8/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY TO PRODUCE DEPARTMENTAL RECORDS
Filing Date
9/8/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT PRODUCE DEPARTMENTAL RECORDS
Filing Date
9/8/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE PRODUCE THE DEPARTMENTAL RECORDS
Filing Date
9/8/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Mason; Joseph Kreamer
Filing Date
8/30/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE AMY TAN
Filing Date
8/22/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY
REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT
FILES, TRANSCRIPTS, TAPES OR
EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA
COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(e)
Filing Date
8/18/2022
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
for Coconino County Sheriff’s Office RE: Michael Perkins
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
for Flagstaff Police Department RE: Michael Perkins
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
for Mesa Police Department RE: David Foster
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Re: Glendale Police Reports
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Re: Phoenix Police Reports
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Re: Arizona Department of Public Safety (DPS)
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Re: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office (MCSO)
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED REQUEST FOR RULE 609
HEARING Re: Witness DAVID
FOSTER
Filing Date
8/11/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/11/2022
Filing Date
8/9/2022
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Case Status Report
Filing Date
8/8/2022
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO WITHDRAW
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
NOTICE OF RULE 404 OTHER ACT
EVIDENCE Re Calkins
Filing Date
8/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Preclude Testimony of States Expert Amy Tan
Filing Date
7/31/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER
RE: Witness Michael Perkins’
Flagstaff Police Department
Filing Date
7/31/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER
RE: Witness Michael Perkins’
Coconino County Sheriffs Office Report
Filing Date
7/31/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER
RE: Witness Michael Perkins’
Coconino County Sheriff’s Office Report
Filing Date
7/31/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT
Filing Date
7/31/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER
RE: Witness Michael Perkins’
Flagstaff Police Department
Filing Date
7/30/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED NOTICE OF DEFENSES
Filing Date
7/30/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION IN
LIMINI TO SANITIZE THE PRIOR
FELONY CONVICTIONS OF ALL
WITNESSES
Filing Date
7/27/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER
RE: Witness David Foster & ORDER
Filing Date
7/25/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
PRECLUDE OR LIMIT STATE’S CELL
PHONE EXPERT’S TESTIMONY AND
CELL-PHONE MAPPING
Filing Date
7/20/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBIT FOR DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO PRECLUDE OR LIMIT
STATE’S CELL PHONE EXPERT’S
TESTIMONY AND CELL-PHONE
MAPPING
Filing Date
7/14/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
UPDATED NOTICE OF MITIGATING FACTORS & WITNESSES
Filing Date
7/13/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response to Defendants Motion to Preclude or Limit States Cellphone Experts Testimony and Cellphone Mapping
Filing Date
7/12/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Notice of Supplemental Disclosure
Filing Date
7/12/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response to Defendants Motion to Produce All Correspondence
Filing Date
7/8/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response to Defendants Supplemental Motion RE: Conflict of Interest
Filing Date
7/7/2022
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2022
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Preclude or Limit States Cellphone Experts Testimony and Cellphone Mapping
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6/20/22
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER re:
Phoenix Police Reports & Proposed Order
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Notice Rule 404 Other Act Evidence re Calkins
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO UNSEAL ALL SEALED
DOCUMENTS IN CR2014-148449-001&
CR2014-002401-001
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER re:
Maricopa County Sheriffs Office
(MCSO) Departmental Reports
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION RE:
CONFLICT OF INTEREST
Filing Date
6/16/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRODUCE ALL
CORRESPONDENCE/EMAILS/
LETTERS RELATING TO
NEGOTIATIONS/ SETTLEMENT
CONFERENCE/CHANGE OF
PLEA/SENTENCING
PROCEEDINGS OF COOPERATING
STATE WITNESS IN CASES
CR2020-127576-001; CR2021-113306-
001; CR2021-112032-001
Filing Date
6/15/2022
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response to Defendants Motion re: Conflict of Interest
Filing Date
6/12/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to States Motion to Strike Defendants Motion re Conflict of Interest
Filing Date
6/9/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
6/7/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRODUCE RECORDED VIDEO INTERVIEW OF DAVID FOSTER AND BODY CAM VIDEO
Filing Date
6/6/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBITS for CONFLICT OF
INTEREST MOTION
Filing Date
6/6/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBITS for CONFLICT OF
INTEREST MOTION
Filing Date
6/3/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT’S MOTION RE: CONFLICT OF INTEREST
Filing Date
6/3/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’s NOTICE OF OTHER
ACT EVIDENCE re DAVID FOSTER
Filing Date
6/2/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF OTHER ACTS FOR WITNESS DAVID FOSTER
Filing Date
6/2/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION RE: CONFLICT OF
INTEREST
Filing Date
6/1/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER
RE: Witness David Foster & ORDER
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION RE: RULE 10.2 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PHOENIX POLICE REPORT
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PHOENIX POLICE REPORTS
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS
FOR NOTICE OF OTHER ACT
EVIDENCE RE:
David Foster aka “Belial”
(Evidentiary Hearing Requested)(Capital Case)
Filing Date
5/23/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Notice of Supplemental Disclosure
Filing Date
5/20/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Notice of Defense
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF OTHER ACTS
EVIDENCE RE: David Foster aka
“Belial”
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 10.2 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF
JUDGE
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITH INTERVIEWS WITHOUT APPOINTING COUNSEL FOR ANDREA SORENSON
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL FOR WITNESSES KRISTOPHER MILLER AND ANDREA SORENSON
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBITS for NOTICE OF
OTHER ACT EVIDENCE RE:
David Foster aka “Belial”
Filing Date
5/16/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DEFENSES
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/09/2022
Filing Date
5/6/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/05/2022
Filing Date
5/1/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBIT FOR DEFENDANT’S CELL
PHONE MAPPING MOTION
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED ORDER SERVED 04/26/22
Filing Date
4/26/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ORDER SERVED 04/25/22
Filing Date
4/19/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2022
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED COURT ORDER RE: REDACTED GLENDALE POLICE REPORTS
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF REDACTED GLENFALE POLICE REPORTS
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSPORT
Filing Date
4/9/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO TRANSPORT
RE: SHERRI TRAUX aka Truax
& ORDER
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW
CAUSE HEARING RE: Witness Sherri
Traux’s Refusal to Comply with Court
Ordered Deposition
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Court Order RE: Phoenix Police Reports Proposed Order
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRODUCE AUDO/VIDEO RECORDED INTERVIEWS
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRODUCE THE DEPARTMENTAL RECORDS
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO UNSEAL ALL SEALED PROCEEDINGS AND DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS MEMO
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA SERVED 04/05/22
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER RE: EYE EXAM AND GLASSES FOR DEFENDANT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DIRECTING MARICOPA COUNTY CORRECIONAL HEALTH SERVICES TO PROVIDE DEFENDANT WITH AN EYE EXAM AND GLASSES.
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER
RE: Eye Exam & Glasses for
Defendant
Filing Date
4/4/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE RESIDUAL DOUBT MITIGATION
Filing Date
4/1/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/31/2022
Filing Date
3/31/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION IN
LIMINI TO LIMIT IMPEACHMENT
TO PRIOR FELONY CONVICTIONS
Filing Date
3/31/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNREDACTED GLENDALE POLICE REPORTS
Filing Date
3/31/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
LIST OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/31/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION
TO COMPEL Re: Rule 15.2 (h)
Filing Date
3/31/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED MARCH 30, 2022
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER re:
Surprise Police Department Audio
Interviews & Proposed Order
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO
UNSEAL ALL SEALED
PROCEEDINGS AND
DOCUMENTS IN CR2020-127576-
001; CR2021-113306-001; CR2021-
112032-001
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Exhibit for Notice of Other Act Evidence re: Joshua Calkins
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
REQUEST FOR BRADY RECORDS
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
03/18/2022
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE INMATE TELEPHONE RECORDS UNIT RELEASE ALL AUDIO RECORDED TELEPHONE CONVERSATIONS AND VIDEO VISITS MADE UNDER BOOKING NO T644261 INMATE DAVID FOSTER DOB 8-6-77 FROM 6-1-21 TO 3-10-22 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL LISTED ABOVE
Filing Date
3/18/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S COMBINED RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE: WARRANTLESS ENTRY OF APARTMENT AND DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR REVISION OR
CORRECTION OF FACTS IN COURT’S
MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
3/17/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT IMPEACHMENT OF WITNESSES TO PRIOR FELONY CONVICTIONS
Filing Date
3/16/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO SANITIZE THE PRIOR FELONY CONVICTIONS OF ALL WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/14/2022
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2022
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION EXHIBIT
Filing Date
3/10/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST for
BRADY RECORDS DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/10/2022
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
RE: Defendant’s Motion to Suppress
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR
DISCOVERY RE: WITNESS STG
INFORMATION
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RELEASE OF
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF’S
OFFICE JAIL PHONE RECORDS AND
ORDER
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO UNSEAL MS. TRUAX'S LETTER FOR SENTENCING
Filing Date
2/26/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Revision or Correction of Facts in Courts Minute Entry
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ADMIT VICTIM'S REPUTATION FOR VIOLENCE AND SPECIFIC BAD ACTS
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO UNSEAL LETTER FROM
SHERRI TRAUX aka SHERRI TRUAX
TO COURT CR2016-001246-001
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL
DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO
RULE 15. 1
Filing Date
2/11/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO UNSEAL SETTLEMENT
CONFERENCE/CHANGE OF PLEA
PROCEEDINGS OF COOPERATING
STATE WITNESS IN CR2020-127576-
001; CR2021-113306-001; CR2021-
112032-001
Filing Date
2/8/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEPOSITION
For Witness Traux aka Sherri Truax
Filing Date
2/4/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF OTHER ACT EVIDENCE RE:JOSHUA CALKINS
Filing Date
1/27/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Disclosure
Filing Date
1/25/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL
PRODUCTION OF REDACTED
GLENDALE POLICE REPORTS
Filing Date
1/21/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2022
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
12/17/2021
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(B)(4)(c)
Filing Date
12/1/2021
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DENIAL OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SUPPRESS
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Suppression Hearing Final Argument
Filing Date
11/9/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/08/2021
Filing Date
11/5/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRODUCE DEPARTMENTAL RECORDS
Filing Date
11/4/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Suppress-
WITNESS OFFER OF PROOF
Filing Date
10/31/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER re:
Glendale Police Reports & Proposed
Order
Filing Date
10/28/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE’S
PROPOSED EXPERT’S CELLPHONE
MAPPING EXHIBITS
Filing Date
10/21/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Notice of Supplemental Disclosure
Filing Date
10/15/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT EXHIBIT RE: Suppression
Hearing- Lori Pohlman’s 5/23/14
Interview
Filing Date
10/7/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/7/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
9/29/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER RULE 15
Filing Date
9/27/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO LIMIT
TESTIMONY OF STATE’S GANG
EXPERT KELAND BOGGS
Filing Date
9/23/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response to Defendants Motion in Limine to Limit Testimony of States Gang Expert
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 9/13/2021
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE TO COURT RE:
DISCLOSURE FROM MEDICAL
EXAMINERS OFFICE
Filing Date
9/15/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Filing Date
9/10/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Limit Testimony of States Gang Expert Keland Boggs
Filing Date
9/7/2021
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/20/2021
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR DEPOSITION OF MATERIAL WITNESS EMMETT MIRELES DOB 6-7-66 CURRENTLY LOCATED AT ASPC LEWIS BACHMAN UNIT 26700 AZ-85 BUCKEYE AZ 85326 ADOC #14385
Filing Date
8/12/2021
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response to Defendants Motion to Continue
Filing Date
8/5/2021
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEPOSITION
Filing Date
8/2/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response to Defendants Motion to Appoint Counsel for Witness Justin Murphy
Filing Date
7/30/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR
DISCOVERY RE: STATE’S WITNESS
BRIDGET EUTENIER, MD
Filing Date
7/30/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REply to States Response to Defendants 2nd Request for Discovery re States Witness Bridget Eutenier MD
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limit
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHRONIS HEARING RESETTING TO 08/06/21
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S
RESPONSE re: MOTION TO SUPPRESS
Warrantless Entry of Apartment
Filing Date
7/27/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION FOR
RECONSIDERATION RE COURT
ORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANT
DAILY ACCESS TO MCSO LEGAL
ROOM TO MAKE LEGAL CALLS
Filing Date
7/21/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE
CHRONIS HEARING
Filing Date
7/20/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
7/19/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response to Defendants Motion to Suppress Re Warrantless Search of Apartment
Filing Date
7/19/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Appoint Counsel for witness Justin Murphy
Filing Date
7/19/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Disclosure or Court Order re Michael Peterson
Filing Date
7/16/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2021
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/07/21
Filing Date
7/7/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT BATES PAGES 125619 AND THE CONTENTS OF THESE PAGES SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED
Filing Date
7/2/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Suppress re Warrantless Entry
Filing Date
7/2/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR
ORDER TO ALLOW DEFENDANT
DAILY ACCESS TO MCSO LEGAL
ROOM TO MAKE LEGAL CALLS
Filing Date
6/30/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2021
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER RULE 15
Filing Date
6/29/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
2ND REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
RE: STATE’S WITNESS- Bridget
Eutenier, MD
Filing Date
6/29/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION FOR ORDER TO ALLOW DEFENDANT DAILY ACCESS TO MCSO LEGAL ROOM TO MAKE LEGAL CALLS
Filing Date
6/28/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/28/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/21/2021
Filing Date
6/28/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/25/2021
Filing Date
6/22/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ORDER TO ALLOW
DEFENDANT DAILY ACCESS TO
MCSO LEGAL ROOM TO MAKE
LEGAL CALLS
Filing Date
6/18/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION FOR RELEASE OF MCSO JAIL PHONE RECORDS
Filing Date
6/18/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RELEASE OF
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF’S
OFFICE JAIL PHONE RECORDS AND
ORDER
Filing Date
6/17/2021
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Case Status Report
Filing Date
6/16/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSCRIPT: CAPITAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - DATED 07/24/2021 - BY SCOTT A. KINLDLE
Filing Date
6/16/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR BRADY STG RECORDS DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/14/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REINSTATING MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
6/11/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Request for Physical Evidence
Filing Date
6/8/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER RE DAVID FOSTER
Filing Date
6/4/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REINSTATE 2/25/21 ORDER GRANTING THE MOTION TO UNSEAL
Filing Date
6/1/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
6/1/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY RE:COOPERATING WITNESSES
Filing Date
5/30/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER
Filing Date
5/29/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to States Request for Physical Evidence
Filing Date
5/27/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Request for Physical Evidence
Filing Date
5/27/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses
Filing Date
5/20/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR BRADY STG
RECORDS DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/19/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY RE:
COOPERATING WITNESSES
Filing Date
5/18/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAGES SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED
Filing Date
5/14/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAGES TO NOT BE DISSEMINATED.
Filing Date
5/13/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER UNDER RULE 15
Filing Date
5/2/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR STATE’S PHASE I & 2
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/30/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Notice of Penalty Phase Witnesses
Filing Date
4/21/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR PPD LSB CAR
REPORTS or in the Alternative a
COURT ORDER
Filing Date
4/19/2021
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTING OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENSE SERVICES AS COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/5/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
3/10/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Supplemental Disclosure
Filing Date
3/8/2021
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARILY UNSEALING
Filing Date
2/19/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Unopposed Motion To Unseal
Filing Date
2/19/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO UNSEAL
Filing Date
2/18/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/10/2020
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/10/2020
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/10/20
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/10/20
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/10/20
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/10/2020
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/10/2020
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/10/2020
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/10/2020
Filing Date
2/9/2021
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S LIST OF
WITNESSES & EXHIBITS
Filing Date
2/9/2021
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Updated Notice of Trial Witnesses
Filing Date
2/9/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
1/19/2021
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2021
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Case Status Report
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINI RE:
INVOCATION OF MIRANDA
RIGHTS
Filing Date
12/18/2020
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
11/16/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2020
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRODUCE ALL PROBATION RECORDS
Filing Date
10/30/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRODUCE ALL PROBATION RECORDS
Filing Date
10/30/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRODUCE ALL PROBATION RECORDS
Filing Date
10/30/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
10/30/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED / RE: ROSALIE BROOKS ADULT PROBATION FILE
Filing Date
10/30/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE SORENSONS ADULT PROBATION FILE
Filing Date
10/30/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE BRETT MILLERS ADULT PROBATION FILE
Filing Date
10/30/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE STUDWELLS ADULT PROBATION FEE
Filing Date
10/30/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE CALKINS ADULT PROBATION FILE REVISED
Filing Date
10/30/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE SHAWELLA HINTONS ADULT PROBATION FILE
Filing Date
10/29/2020
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Case Status Report
Filing Date
9/28/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO STRIKE
AMENDMENT TO INDICTMENT &
REQUEST FOR CHRONIS HEARING
Filing Date
9/25/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response to Defendants Motion for Discovery RE: Adult Probation Files
Filing Date
9/22/2020
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response to Defendants Motion to Strike States Allegations to Amend the Indictment
Filing Date
9/17/2020
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
9/16/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL REQUEST
Filing Date
9/16/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO SEAL FOR RULE 609
Filing Date
9/16/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING RE: WITNESS BRETT MILLER
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for 609 Hearing re McFadden
Filing Date
9/14/2020
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Re: Adult Probation Files- Brooks
& ORDER
Filing Date
9/14/2020
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Re: Adult Probation Files-Miller
& ORDER
Filing Date
9/14/2020
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Re: Adult Probation Files- Sorenson
& ORDER
Filing Date
9/14/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Discovery re APO files McDowell
Filing Date
9/12/2020
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Re: Witness Rosalie Brooks
Filing Date
9/11/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Case Status Report
Filing Date
9/10/2020
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Re: Witness Michael Peterson
Filing Date
9/10/2020
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Re: Adult Probation Files- Calkin
& ORDER
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Re: Adult Probation Files- Pohlman
& ORDER
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Re: Adult Probation Files- Hinton
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Re: Adult Probation Files- Studwell
Filing Date
9/7/2020
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Re: Witness Joshua Calkins
Filing Date
9/7/2020
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Re: Witness Shawn Sutherlin
Filing Date
9/4/2020
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2020
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Re: Adult Probation Files-Miller
& ORDER
Filing Date
9/3/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Strike States Allegation to Amend Indictment
Filing Date
8/28/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S NOTICE OF
TRANSFER OF PROSECUTION TO
PINAL COUNTY ATTORNEY’S
OFFICE AND REQUEST FOR ORDER
TO SCREEN AND INSULATE
MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY’S
OFFICE FROM ANY FURTHER
INVOLVEMENT ON THESE CASES
Filing Date
8/26/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL DEFENSE STATEMENT RE: DISQUALIFICATION HEARING
Filing Date
8/26/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL
Filing Date
8/26/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Transfer of Prosecution to Pinal County Attorneys Office
Filing Date
8/19/2020
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION DEFENDANT
INTENDED TO PROMOTE, FURTHER, OR
ASSIST CRIMINAL CONDUCT BY CRIMINAL
STREET GANG
Filing Date
8/18/2020
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL FOR
WITNESS STACEY STUDWELL
Filing Date
8/17/2020
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/12/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEFENSE TO FILE A RULE 15.2 GUILT PHASE DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/11/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEFENSE TO FILE A RULE 15.2 GUILT PHASE DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/9/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN DEFENANDT MASON STATEMENT RE DISQUALIFICATION HEARING
Filing Date
8/7/2020
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Statement Re Disqualification Hearing
Filing Date
7/28/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SE TO PLAINTIFF’S
MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT’S
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
DISQUALIFY MCAO OR, IN THE
ALTERNATIVE, ERIN OTIS
Filing Date
7/23/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION
TO CONTINUE TRIAL OF AUGUST 17, 2020
Filing Date
7/23/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Declaration in Support of Defendants Motion to Disqualify MCAO or, in the Alternative, Erin Otis
Filing Date
7/21/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
DUE TO COVID-19 PANDEMIC
Filing Date
7/17/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2020
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE UNDER RULE 13.3(C) FOR LIMITED ISUSE OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNTY ATTORNEY
Filing Date
7/16/2020
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DEPUTY COUNTY ATTORNEY ERIN OTIS DATED 07/06/2020
Filing Date
7/14/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN DEFENDANT MASONS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Filing Date
7/8/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO UNSEAL MOTION TO DISCUALIFY CONTY ATTORNEY
Filing Date
7/2/2020
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2020
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
TO REPLY TO STATE ‘S RESPONSE
Re: DISQUALIFICATION MOTION
Filing Date
6/27/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to State’s Request for Court
Ordered Process Re: Witness
Transcripts
Filing Date
6/26/2020
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR COURT ORDERED PROCESS RE: WITNESS TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
6/26/2020
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER REGARDING WITNESS
STATEMENT TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
6/25/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DEPUTY COUNTY ATTORNEY ERIN OTIS
Filing Date
6/23/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
6/19/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING SET ON
JULY 7, 2020
Filing Date
6/18/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT CHARLES ROBBINS’S MOTION TO UNSEAL MOTION TO DISQUALIFY FILED MAY 11, 2020
Filing Date
6/18/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL
FOR WITNESS (LORI POHLMAN)
Filing Date
6/17/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Motion to Exceed Page Limitation in Their Response to Defendants Motion to Disqualify the Maricopa County Attorneys Office, or in the Alternative, Deputy County Attorney Erin Otis
Filing Date
6/8/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
RESPONSE re: Mitigation Disclosure
Filing Date
6/1/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY RE: REQUEST FOR
DISCOVERY (MITIGATION PHASE)
Filing Date
5/29/2020
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED REQUEST FOR RULE 609
HEARING Re: Witness Kristopher
Miller
Filing Date
5/28/2020
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2020
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for States Phase I Disclosure
Filing Date
5/27/2020
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE: MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNTY ATTORNEY
Filing Date
5/26/2020
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR
EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND
TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY THE
MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY’S
OFFICE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE,
DEPUTY COUNTY ATTORNEY ERIN
OTIS
Filing Date
5/22/2020
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time
Filing Date
5/22/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Limited Appearance
Filing Date
5/22/2020
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
(MITIGATION PHASE)
Filing Date
5/20/2020
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2020
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2020
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2020
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO SEAL DEFENSE
PLEADING FILED ON MAY 11, 2020
Filing Date
5/8/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF REVIEW OF
PROTECTED MATERIALS
Filing Date
5/1/2020
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF
PENALTY PHASE DISCOVERY DEADLINE
Filing Date
4/3/2020
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2020
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE STATUS
CONFERENCE AND CCMC
Filing Date
3/17/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION
FOR DISCOVERY (WITNESS EUTENIER)
Filing Date
3/17/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION
FOR DISCOVERY (WITNESS EUTENIER)
Filing Date
3/16/2020
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED NOTICE OF MITIGATING
FACTORS & WITNESSES
Filing Date
2/26/2020
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/18/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE SUMMARY UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/14/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE SUMMARY UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/14/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUMMARY OF ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS RECORD REDACTION PRACTICES
Filing Date
2/13/2020
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Exhibits re STG
Filing Date
2/13/2020
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MEMORANDUM OF RELEVANCY OF VARIOUS INDIVIDUALS/MASONS UNREDACTED DOC INFORMATION REQUEST
Filing Date
2/9/2020
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Court Order re: DNA
Filing Date
2/9/2020
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
RE: STATE’S WITNESS- Bridget
Eutenier, MD
Filing Date
2/7/2020
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
2/7/2020
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2020
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR ACCOMPLICE
LIABILITY JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
1/15/2020
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTIONS TO REDACTIONS AND REQUEST FOR REINSTATEMENT RE WITNESS STG FILES
Filing Date
1/13/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO REDACTIONS AND REQUEST FOR REINSTATEMENT RE WITNESSTG FILES
Filing Date
1/13/2020
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2019
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE ORAL
ARGUMENT SET FOR DECEMBER 13, 2019
RE: STG REDACTIONS
Filing Date
11/6/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
11/3/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Re: Witness Robert Haubois
Filing Date
10/29/2019
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2019
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2019
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Discovery Re DNA
Filing Date
10/18/2019
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL NOTICE OF MITIGATING
FACTORS & WITNESSES
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
10/11/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION THAT ALL RECORDS AND DOCUMENTS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE STG FILES GMIC RECORDS
Filing Date
10/9/2019
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion to Extend Defense Mitigation Disclosure Deadline
Filing Date
10/8/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
10/1/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION
TO EXTEND MITIGATION DEADLINE
Filing Date
9/24/2019
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2019
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND DEFENSE MITIGATION DISCLOSURE DEADLINE
Filing Date
9/19/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2019
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Arizona Department of Corrections Expedited Motion to Continue Oral Argument Set for September 20, 2019
Filing Date
8/28/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANTS SUPPELEMENTAL REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY RE WITNESS STG INFORMATION
Filing Date
8/15/2019
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion For Discovery Re: "Lost" Witness Jail Phone Call Records
Filing Date
8/15/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR
DISCOVERY RE: WITNESS STG
INFORMATION
Filing Date
8/14/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Fourth Request for Discovery re witness prior convictions
Filing Date
8/13/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2019
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2019
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2019
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for 609 Hearing re witness Kris Miller
Filing Date
7/22/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO UNSEAL
DOCUMENTS re: Perkins & Studwell
Filing Date
7/21/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for 609 Hearing re Stacey Studwell
Filing Date
7/19/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING PETITION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
7/15/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Re: Witness Perkins
Filing Date
7/12/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for 609 hearing re witness Mireles
Filing Date
7/12/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
7/12/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for 609 Hearing re witness Sorenson
Filing Date
7/8/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Corrected Request for 609 hearing re witness Beitz
Filing Date
7/8/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for 609 Hearing re witness Murphy
Filing Date
7/4/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Hearing 609 re witness Maas
Filing Date
7/4/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Hearing 609 re witness Truax
Filing Date
7/4/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for 609 Hearing re witness Pohlman
Filing Date
7/4/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Hearing 609 re witness Beitz
Filing Date
7/4/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Re: Witness Charles Robbins
Filing Date
7/3/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Re: Witness DAVID FOSTER
Filing Date
6/18/2019
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER
Re: DOC/STG files
Filing Date
5/24/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION RE: STATE’S
NON-COMPLIANCE WITH COURT
ORDERS
Filing Date
5/23/2019
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2019
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION RE: STATE’S NON NON- COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
5/16/2019
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY to CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES RESPONSE Re: EYE EXAM & GLASSES
Filing Date
5/16/2019
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO MCSO’S RESPONSE TO THE MOTION FOR COURT ORDER RE: Legal Boxes, Expando Files & Colored Files
Filing Date
5/13/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH Services RESPONSE TO Defendants MOTION FOR COURT ORDER RE: EYE EXAM AND EYEGLASSES
Filing Date
5/10/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Court Order
Filing Date
5/7/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER RE: Eye Exam & Glasses for Defendant
Filing Date
5/1/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER
RE: Viewing of Crime Scene
Filing Date
4/25/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
4/25/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
4/25/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
4/22/2019
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2019
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY
REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT
FILES, TRANSCRIPTS, TAPES OR
EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA
COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(e)
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RETURN RECEIPT FOR OFFICIAL
COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS, TAPES
OR EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO
MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE
2.8(e)
Filing Date
4/8/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RETURN RECEIPT FOR OFFICIAL
COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS, TAPES
OR EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO
MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE
Filing Date
4/8/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY
REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT
FILES, TRANSCRIPTS, TAPES OR
EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA
COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(e)
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RETURN RECEIPT FOR OFFICIAL
COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS, TAPES
OR EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO
MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE
2.8(e)
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY
REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT
FILES, TRANSCRIPTS, TAPES OR
EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA
COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(e)
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Compel Discovery
Filing Date
3/22/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2019
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND DEFENSE MITIGATION DISCLOSURE DEADLINE
Filing Date
3/11/2019
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND CURRENT DEFENSE MITIGATION DISCLOSURE DEADLINE
Filing Date
3/1/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
2/28/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Court Order re: cell phone records
Filing Date
2/26/2019
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF’S RESPONSE PERTAINING TO REQUEST FOR ACCESS TO INMATE LEGAL SERVICES
Filing Date
2/25/2019
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/18/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
2/15/2019
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2019
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION ACCESS TO I L S
Filing Date
2/7/2019
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2019
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw as Co-Counsel of Record
Filing Date
1/31/2019
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2019
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2019
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CHANGE CO COUNSEL VERNON E LORENZ
Filing Date
12/13/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2018
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Discovery
Filing Date
12/10/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION
Filing Date
12/10/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2018
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2018
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2018
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2018
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Temporary Removal of Official Court Files, Transcripts, Tapes or Exhibits Pursuant to Maricopa County Local RUle 2.8(e)
Filing Date
10/24/2018
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2018
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2018
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFICIAL
Filing Date
10/19/2018
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2018
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
7/30/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2018
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND APPOINTMENT PURSUANT TO RULES 6.2 AND 6.8
Filing Date
5/22/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 05/16/2018
Filing Date
5/8/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2018
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Discovery/Motion in Limine
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S INPUT REGARDING LENGTH OF CONTINUANCE
Filing Date
7/24/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
7/11/2017
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Continue Trial Past Last Day
Filing Date
4/20/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 03/24/2017
Filing Date
3/24/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO ASSIST MITIGATION INVESTIGATION
Filing Date
3/24/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION DATED 03/23/2017
Filing Date
2/24/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2016
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
8/9/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
8/9/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE ORDER TO SEAL EX PARTE MOTIONS
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S UPDATED NOTICE OF TRIAL WITNESS
Filing Date
5/5/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/25/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/20/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF REALISTIC
WITNESSES TO BE CALLED AT TRIAL
PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1
Filing Date
1/12/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Compel Production of Documents
Filing Date
12/7/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE DOCUMENTS BATES STAMPED WADE 000001 WADE 000284 DISCLOSED BY THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
11/12/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2015
Description
960 ME: Capital Case Assignment and Scheduling Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2015
Description
NID - Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO
SEEK DEATH PENALTY, NOTICE
OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND
WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/28/2015
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION OF PARTIES TO
EXTEND TIME FOR THE STATE
NOTICE ITS INTENT TO SEEK THE
DEATH PENALTY AND TO EXTEND
THE LAST DAY
Filing Date
8/14/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2015
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION OF PARTIES TO EXTEND TIME FOR THE STATE NOTICE ITS INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
6/5/2015
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/1/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2015
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/8/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 4/7/15
Filing Date
4/7/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL EX PARTE MOTION
Filing Date
4/7/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPARTE MOTION
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2015
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/17/2015
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER
Filing Date
3/9/2015
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/5/2015
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2015
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2015
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/13/2015
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SWAHILI SPEAKING
Filing Date
2/13/2015
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
/PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(e)
Filing Date
2/13/2015
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2015
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2015
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION DEFENDANT INTENDED TO PROMOTE, FURTHER, OR ASSIST CRIMINAL CONDUCT BY CRIMINAL STREET GANG
Filing Date
2/11/2015
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
2/11/2015
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
2/11/2015
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER
Filing Date
2/11/2015
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
2/11/2015
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/11/2015
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE
OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE
SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §
13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
2/4/2015
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2015
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S FIRST REQUEST FOR
EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE
THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
1/22/2015
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2015
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO ASSIST MITIGATION INVESTIGATION SIGNED ON 1/20/15; OFFLINE MINUTE ENTRY; ORDER TO SEAL MOTION SIGNED ON 1/20/15
Filing Date
1/16/2015
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2015
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2015
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO EXTEND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
1/16/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO
EXTEND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK
DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
1/15/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Entry of Ex Parte Orders
Filing Date
1/12/2015
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2015
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2015
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER DATED 1/7/15; EXPARTE ORDER SIGNED BY COURTON 1/7/15; OFFLINE MINUTE ENTRY DATED 1/7/15
Filing Date
12/29/2014
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
$1,000,000
Filing Date
12/23/2014
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2014
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2014
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/19/2014
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2014
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2014
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/16/2014
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
12/16/2014
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2014
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/12/2014
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
12/18/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/22/2014
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
12/29/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/17/2015
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
3/18/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/28/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/30/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/5/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/2/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/7/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/19/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/3/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/5/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/19/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/29/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/29/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/9/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/25/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/31/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/13/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/14/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/15/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/17/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/27/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/27/2017
Time
8:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/3/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/5/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/7/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/16/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/11/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/8/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/2/2018
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/9/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/16/2018
Time
14:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/26/2018
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/24/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/29/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/11/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/21/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/4/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/1/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/6/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/28/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/4/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/10/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/17/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/25/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/25/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/31/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/14/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/19/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/25/2019
Time
10:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/26/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/16/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/17/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/28/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/10/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/23/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/6/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/20/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/11/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/16/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/16/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/22/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/1/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/15/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/13/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/10/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/21/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/9/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/9/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/23/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/13/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/11/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/8/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/29/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/7/2020
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/24/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/31/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/13/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/17/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/20/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/2/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/16/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/30/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/8/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/8/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/10/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/5/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/6/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/14/2021
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/18/2021
Time
14:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/18/2021
Time
14:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
7/6/2021
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/6/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
8/10/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/27/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/27/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/14/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/8/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/8/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/4/2021
Time
10:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/5/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/6/2021
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/21/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/17/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/23/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/2/2022
Time
9:20
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/8/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/13/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/13/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/15/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/16/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/17/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
6/24/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/1/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/19/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/15/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/29/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/16/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/14/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/21/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/12/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/30/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/30/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/2/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/2/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/3/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/6/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/10/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/10/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/23/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/3/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/3/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/3/2023
Time
13:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
3/20/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/20/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/21/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/22/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/22/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/23/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/3/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/5/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/6/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/11/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/12/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/12/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/13/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/17/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/17/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/18/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/26/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
2/21/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/12/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/31/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference