« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Ashton, Edwin
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Tyrell Whitehat - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Godley, Davina
Judge
Giaquinto
Case #
CR2014-142721-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2014-142721-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Tyrell Whitehat
Crime Date
9/3/2014
Date
9/12/2014
Description
UNLAW FLIGHT FROM LAW ENF VEH
ARSCode
28-622.01 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Tyrell Whitehat
Crime Date
9/3/2014
Date
11/24/2014
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Tyrell Whitehat
Crime Date
9/3/2014
Date
11/24/2014
Description
DUI-LIQUOR/DRUGS/VAPORS/COMBO
ARSCode
28-1381A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Tyrell Whitehat
Crime Date
9/3/2014
Date
1/21/2015
Description
DUI W/BAC OF .08 OR MORE
ARSCode
28-1381A2 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Tyrell Whitehat
Crime Date
9/3/2014
Date
1/21/2015
Description
Extreme DUI-BAC .15 TO .20
ARSCode
28-1382A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
ODM - Order of Discharge from Probation - Misdemeanor Designation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
8/15/2023
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
10/31/2019
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEMO TO THE COURT count 1
Filing Date
5/15/2019
Description
DIP - Dispo: Revoke-imprisonment/reinstate-probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DIP - Disposition Order - Imprisonment Reinstated
Filing Date
5/15/2019
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2019
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
5/14/2019
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
5/14/2019
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
4/15/2019
Description
117 - ME: Guilt New Chg/Prob Violation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2019
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
3/13/2019
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2019
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
2/22/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/22/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2019
Description
ASN – Amended/Supp Pet/Order to Revoke Probation no warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTS 1,2
Filing Date
2/13/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2019
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2019
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2019
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw
Filing Date
2/1/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2019
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
1-19-19
Filing Date
1/22/2019
Description
ASN – Amended/Supp Pet/Order to Revoke Probation no warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1,2
Filing Date
1/20/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
1/20/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
4/6/2016
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1,2/Appearance Bond (Secured) set at $4,000.00
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2015-11-24
Filing Date
9/16/2015
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2
Filing Date
6/22/2015
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
6/22/2015
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2
Filing Date
2/13/2015
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2015
Description
110 - ME: Suspension Of Sentence - Unsupervised Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2015
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2015
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2015
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2015
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
1/6/2015
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2014
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/26/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2014
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2014
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2014
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2014
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
10/28/2014
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2014
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2014
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/23/2014
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2014
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2014
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2014
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2014
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND
REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF
REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
9/26/2014
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Request for Extension of Time to Challenge the Grand Jury Proceedings
Filing Date
9/26/2014
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Disclosure of Victim/Witness Availability
Filing Date
9/26/2014
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Invocation of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights
Filing Date
9/26/2014
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1 (a), (b), (d), (e)
Filing Date
9/25/2014
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2014
Description
DRO - Indigent Defense Reimbursement Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2014
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
9/11/2014
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2014
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
9/11/2014
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2014
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2014
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
9/8/2014
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2014
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
9/8/2014
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/4/2014
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
9/18/2014
Time
8:35
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/22/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/24/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
11/7/2014
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
11/24/2014
Time
14:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
12/11/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
12/17/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/21/2015
Time
9:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
2/18/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/25/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/20/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
1/28/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/28/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
2/6/2019
Time
8:29
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/6/2019
Time
8:32
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
2/21/2019
Time
8:29
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
2/21/2019
Time
8:32
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
2/22/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
2/28/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/28/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
3/11/2019
Time
8:29
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/11/2019
Time
8:32
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
4/2/2019
Time
8:15
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
4/11/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
4/11/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
5/14/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Disposition Hearing