« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Southeast  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   COUNTY ATTORNEY CRIMINAL -SE,      
Ersula Jawanna Ore - (2)
 
Defendant  F   To Be Determined   Master Calendar  CR2014-124175-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Ersula Jawanna Ore  13-2508 (M1)  RESISTING ARREST  5/20/2014  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  7/9/2014 
Ersula Jawanna Ore  13-2508 (M1)  RESISTING ARREST  5/20/2014  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  7/9/2014 
Ersula Jawanna Ore  13-1204 (F5)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  5/20/2014  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  7/9/2014 
Ersula Jawanna Ore  13-2412 (M2)  OBSTRUCTION-REFUSE TRUE NAME  5/20/2014  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/1/2014 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
5/5/2016  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  5/6/2016   
4/6/2016  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  4/6/2016   
3/22/2016  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  3/22/2016   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record
2/1/2016  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  2/1/2016   
1/14/2016  597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001)  1/14/2016   
12/1/2015  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  12/1/2015   
11/12/2015  RPP - Response to Petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  11/12/2015   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
8/21/2015  AFF - Affidavit - Party (001)  8/24/2015   
NOTE: AFFIDAVIT
8/20/2015  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  8/20/2015   
8/17/2015  PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  8/17/2015   
NOTE: PETITION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF (RULE 32)
7/17/2015  129 – ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Retained re: plea - Party (001)  7/17/2015   
7/2/2015  597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001)  7/2/2015   
5/4/2015  PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  5/4/2015   
NOTE: PETITION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF (Rule 32)
5/1/2015  049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (001)  5/1/2015   
4/30/2015  CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)  5/4/2015   
4/30/2015  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  5/4/2015   
NOTE: COUNT 1
8/5/2014  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  8/5/2014   
8/1/2014  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  8/6/2014   
8/1/2014  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/11/2014   
NOTE: DEFENSE SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION
8/1/2014  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/11/2014   
NOTE: DEFENSE SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION
8/1/2014  LET - Letter - Party (001)  8/11/2014   
8/1/2014  LET - Letter - Party (001)  8/11/2014   
8/1/2014  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  8/11/2014   
7/15/2014  102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)  7/15/2014   
7/10/2014  584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)  7/10/2014   
7/9/2014  INF - Information - Party (001)  7/11/2014   
7/9/2014  WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)  7/14/2014   
7/3/2014  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)  7/7/2014   
6/27/2014  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/27/2014   
NOTE: DEMAND FOR PRESERVATION OF EVIDENCE
6/27/2014  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  6/30/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES, WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
6/6/2014  584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)  6/6/2014   
6/3/2014  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  6/3/2014   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance
6/3/2014  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  6/3/2014   
NOTE: Motion to Continue
5/22/2014  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  5/22/2014   
5/22/2014  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  5/22/2014   
NOTE: IA Release Order
5/22/2014  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  5/22/2014   
NOTE: IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
5/21/2014  8:00   Initial Appearance 
6/4/2014  8:35   Status Conference 
6/10/2014  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
7/3/2014  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
7/9/2014  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
7/9/2014  8:31   Original Arraignment Hearing 
7/29/2014  13:30   Preliminary Hearing 
8/1/2014  8:30   Sentencing 
click here for Law Library Resource Center