« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Aiken, Stephen
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Jason Farrell Heckendorn - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Shah, Arja
Judge
Adib
Case #
CR2014-105913-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2014-105913-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Jason Farrell Heckendorn 
Crime Date
11/30/2013
Date
8/12/2014
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Jason Farrell Heckendorn 
Crime Date
11/30/2013
Date
7/16/2014
Description
RESISTING ARREST
ARSCode
13-2508 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Jason Farrell Heckendorn 
Crime Date
11/30/2013
Date
8/12/2014
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2015
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2015
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 3
Filing Date
5/4/2015
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 3
Filing Date
8/14/2014
Description
110 - ME: Suspension Of Sentence - Unsupervised Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2014
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2014
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2014
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2014
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2014
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2014
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2014
Description
179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2014
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2014
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION
Filing Date
5/12/2014
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2014
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
2/10/2014
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2014
Description
SUM - Summons - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/6/2014
Time
8:29
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
6/10/2014
Time
8:29
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
7/16/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
7/16/2014
Time
8:31
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/12/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt