Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Ramunno, Elisa      
Justin Francis Laclere - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Nolan, Todd   Brickner  CR2014-103013-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Justin Francis Laclere  13-1405 (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  1/14/2014  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/24/2014 
Justin Francis Laclere  13-3554 (F3)  LURE MINOR FOR SEX EXPLOIT  1/13/2014  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/24/2014 
Justin Francis Laclere  13-3623C (F6)  CHILD ABUSE  1/13/2014  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  7/8/2015 
Justin Francis Laclere  13-1405 (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  1/14/2014  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  7/8/2015 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/27/2019  004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)  11/27/2019   
11/26/2019  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)  11/27/2019   
11/21/2019  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  11/22/2019   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE MITIGATION HEARING 
11/5/2019  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  11/5/2019   
9/25/2019  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  9/25/2019   
9/4/2019  112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)  9/4/2019   
7/24/2019  004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)  7/24/2019   
7/22/2019  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)  7/24/2019   
7/18/2019  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/18/2019   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE NON-WITNESS VIOLATION HEARING 
6/28/2019  112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)  6/28/2019   
6/21/2019  ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)  6/21/2019   
NOTE: Release Order 
6/18/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/19/2019   
NOTE: Motion to Amend Release Conditions 
6/18/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  6/19/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
6/17/2019  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  6/17/2019   
NOTE: PTR COUNT 2 
6/15/2019  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  6/17/2019   
NOTE: IA Packet 
6/15/2019  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  6/17/2019   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
12/14/2018  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  12/20/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 1/REMAIN UNDESIGNATED 
5/5/2016  CCR - Confidential Criminal Report - Party (001)  5/6/2016   
2/4/2016  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  2/4/2016   
2/4/2016  NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)  2/5/2016   
NOTE: $10,000 MORRIS LACLERE 
2/3/2016  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  2/3/2016   
2/3/2016  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)  2/8/2016   
1/28/2016  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  1/28/2016   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw 
1/22/2016  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)  1/26/2016   
1/22/2016  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  1/26/2016   
1/22/2016  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  2/8/2016   
1/22/2016  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  2/8/2016   
1/22/2016  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  2/8/2016   
NOTE: PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION 
1/14/2016  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  1/14/2016   
1/11/2016  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  1/11/2016   
12/21/2015  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  12/22/2015   
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE 
12/21/2015  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  12/21/2015   
12/18/2015  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  12/22/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION TO PRECLUDE 
12/15/2015  REQ - Request - Party (001)  12/15/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENTION OF TIME TO RESPOND 
12/11/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/11/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE 
11/3/2015  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
10/22/2015  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/22/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING 
9/16/2015  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  9/16/2015   
9/8/2015  REL - Reply - Party (001)  9/9/2015   
NOTE: REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE 
9/8/2015  RES - Response - Party (001)  9/9/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE 
9/8/2015  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  9/9/2015   
NOTE: SENTENCING MEMORANDUM 
9/4/2015  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  9/4/2015   
NOTE: DEFENSE OBJECTION TO CAMERA COVERAGE 
9/4/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/4/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE 
9/4/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/8/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE 
9/2/2015  LET - Letter - Party (001)  9/4/2015   
8/19/2015  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  8/19/2015   
8/11/2015  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/19/2015   
NOTE: SUCCESSFUL COMPLIANCE 
7/10/2015  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  7/10/2015   
7/8/2015  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  7/9/2015   
7/2/2015  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  7/2/2015   
6/16/2015  REP - Report - Party (001)  6/18/2015   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT 
6/2/2015  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  6/2/2015   
5/12/2015  REP - Report - Party (001)  5/12/2015   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT 
4/14/2015  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  4/14/2015   
4/7/2015  ORD - Order - Party (001)  4/21/2015   
NOTE: RE STILL/ELECTRONIC CAMERAS 
4/6/2015  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  4/6/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
1/20/2015  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  1/20/2015   
1/7/2015  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  1/8/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
11/26/2014  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  11/26/2014   
11/10/2014  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  11/12/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL  
10/14/2014  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  10/14/2014   
10/1/2014  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  10/1/2014   
9/23/2014  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  9/23/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
9/19/2014  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  9/19/2014   
9/5/2014  REP - Report - Party (001)  9/5/2014   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT 
8/6/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/6/2014   
7/25/2014  REP - Report - Party (001)  7/25/2014   
NOTE: Joint Case Management Report 
7/17/2014  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  7/17/2014   
7/3/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  7/3/2014   
6/23/2014  REP - Report - Party (001)  6/23/2014   
NOTE: Joint Case Management Report 
6/17/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  6/17/2014   
6/5/2014  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/5/2014   
NOTE: Advisement to the Court and Supplemental Motion to Modify Release Conditions 
5/19/2014  591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001)  5/19/2014   
5/7/2014  REP - Report - Party (001)  5/7/2014   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT 
4/28/2014  RES - Response - Party (001)  4/28/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS 
4/28/2014  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  4/29/2014   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
4/23/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/23/2014   
4/16/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/17/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO AMEND RELEASE CONDITIONS TO HAVE CONTACT WITH HIS MINOR CHILD 
3/26/2014  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)  3/26/2014   
3/21/2014  STA - Statement - Party (001)  3/24/2014   
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 
3/21/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/21/2014   
NOTE: Motion to Designate Complex 
3/20/2014  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  3/20/2014   
3/18/2014  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/21/2014   
3/6/2014  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/11/2014   
NOTE: PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(e) 
3/6/2014  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/11/2014   
NOTE: PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(e) 
3/6/2014  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/11/2014   
2/28/2014  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  2/28/2014   
NOTE: Motion to Extend Time to File Motion for Remand 
2/27/2014  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)  2/27/2014   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704 
2/27/2014  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  2/27/2014   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
2/7/2014  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  2/11/2014   
2/7/2014  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  2/12/2014   
2/6/2014  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  2/12/2014   
2/6/2014  ORD - Order - Party (001)  2/13/2014   
NOTE: AUTHORIZING AND DIRECTING CLERK OF SUPERIOR COURT TO SURRENDER INTO THE TEMPORARY CUSTODY OF ATTORNEY SEEKING CUSTODY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPTS 
2/6/2014  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  2/12/2014   
2/5/2014  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  2/5/2014   
1/30/2014  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  1/31/2014   
1/29/2014  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  1/29/2014   
1/27/2014  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)  1/29/2014   
1/27/2014  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  1/28/2014   
1/24/2014  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)  1/27/2014   
NOTE: $10,000.00 
1/23/2014  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  1/24/2014  Plaintiff (1)  
1/23/2014  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  1/24/2014   
1/23/2014  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  1/24/2014  Plaintiff (1)  
1/22/2014  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/23/2014   
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM 
1/21/2014  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  1/21/2014   
1/21/2014  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  1/22/2014   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
1/21/2014  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  1/22/2014   
NOTE: IA Packet 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/18/2014  8:00   Initial Appearance 
1/24/2014  8:30   Status Conference 
1/28/2014  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
2/3/2014  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
3/21/2014  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
5/7/2014  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/24/2014  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/15/2014  11:00   Settlement Conference 
7/28/2014  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/8/2014  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/24/2014  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/30/2014  8:00   Trial 
10/3/2014  15:15   Settlement Conference 
11/10/2014  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
11/17/2014  8:00   Trial 
1/7/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/14/2015  8:00   Trial 
4/7/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/14/2015  8:00   Trial 
5/14/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/1/2015  11:00   Settlement Conference 
6/16/2015  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/8/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/15/2015  8:00   Trial 
8/12/2015  8:30   Sentencing 
9/9/2015  8:30   Sentencing 
10/23/2015  10:00   Sentencing 
1/8/2016  10:00   Sentencing 
1/22/2016  13:30   Sentencing 
6/15/2019  5:00   Initial Appearance 
6/21/2019  8:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
6/21/2019  8:31   Disposition Hearing 
7/22/2019  13:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
7/22/2019  13:32   Disposition Hearing 
8/26/2019  13:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
8/26/2019  13:32   Disposition Hearing 
9/24/2019  13:30   Disposition Hearing 
10/30/2019  13:30   Disposition Hearing 
11/26/2019  13:30   Disposition Hearing 
12/17/2019  13:30   Disposition Hearing