« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Kay, Treena
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Craig Leslie Jacobsen - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Cutrer, David
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2014-002806-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Craig Leslie Jacobsen
Crime Date
4/22/1997
Date
11/16/2021
Description
MURDER 2ND DEG-KNOWING
ARSCode
13-1104A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Craig Leslie Jacobsen
Crime Date
4/22/1997
Date
11/16/2021
Description
KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL
ARSCode
13-1304A3 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
(LETTER)
Filing Date
9/28/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
4/20/2022
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
4/1/2022
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
4/1/2022
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
4/1/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/1/2022
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
4/1/2022
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
3/9/2022
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE
SENTENCING
Filing Date
2/3/2022
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2021
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
11/17/2021
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2021
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
11/16/2021
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
11/10/2021
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2021
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2021
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
3/4/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY
TRIAL
Filing Date
6/2/2020
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2020
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2020
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2020
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2020
Description
123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. LESLIE DANA KIRBY DATED 11/18/2019
Filing Date
3/9/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. LESLIE DANA KIRBY DATED 11/19/2019
Filing Date
3/9/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. LESLIE DANA KIRBY DATED 01/19/2020
Filing Date
3/9/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT DR. LESLIE DANA-KIRBY DATED 05/30/2019
Filing Date
3/9/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT DR. LESLIE DANA-KIRBY DATED 08/17/2019
Filing Date
3/9/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT DR. LESLIE DANA-KIRBY DATED 10/07/2019
Filing Date
2/25/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2020
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/24/2019
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
10/21/2019
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2019
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2019
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2019
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2019
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT DR JASON FRIZZELL DATED 03/20/2019
Filing Date
4/11/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT DR KATHERINE SPECTOR DATED 02/25/2019
Filing Date
4/11/2019
Description
SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONSESNT FOR LAW STUDENT TO REPRESENT THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY
Filing Date
1/23/2019
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11 / OF APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
1/17/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/4/2019
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2018
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance
Filing Date
12/18/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2018
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2018
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2018
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2018
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw
Filing Date
8/22/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO ADMIT
EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 404(b)
Filing Date
8/5/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE TO STATE’S 404(B)
NOTICE
Filing Date
7/30/2018
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE RESPONSE CONCERNING T
STATE’S 404(b) NOTICE
Filing Date
7/24/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/4/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2018
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2018
Description
123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT DR JASON FRIZZELL DATED 10/23/2017
Filing Date
3/1/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT DR JACQUELINE WORSLEY DATED 01/03/2018
Filing Date
3/1/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT DR CAMILLE HERNANDEZ DATED 10/23/2017
Filing Date
3/1/2018
Description
SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw Request for Hearing on Competency Determination
Filing Date
2/13/2018
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF RULE 11 COMPETENCY HEARING
Filing Date
1/8/2018
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2017
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11/ OF APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
9/19/2017
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ORDER TO RELEASE RECORDS FROM THE MARICOPA COUNTY PUBLIC ADVOCATE
Filing Date
8/1/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2017
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR THIRTY (30) DAY CONTINUANCE OF August 8, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
6/19/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2016
Description
123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
11/7/2016
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. DEBORAH GROSS DATED 08/25/16
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
10/6/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2016
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2016
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE FROM REPRESENTATION
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. JOHN R. WALKER III DATED 07/01/16
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. JANET S. PERRY DATED 07/05/16
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2016
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2016
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL
Filing Date
6/1/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
5/31/2016
Description
122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2016
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EVALUATION OF
DEFENDANT’S MENTAL
CONDITION
Filing Date
4/12/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2016
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
notice of appearance
Filing Date
2/5/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
1/11/2016
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2016
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE NOTICE OF INTENTION TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
11/12/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2015
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR SECURITY VIDEO
FOOTAGE OBTAINED BY LAS VEGAS
POLICE ON APRIL 7, 1997
Filing Date
10/25/2015
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE DEFENDANTS OTHER CRIMES WRONG OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(b) ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE
Filing Date
10/21/2015
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE NOTICE OF INTENTION TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
9/10/2015
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2015
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2015
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/3/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND
REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF
REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/27/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION
Filing Date
8/27/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
8/27/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFF-LINE MINUTE ENTRY DATED 8/27/15
Filing Date
8/20/2015
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2015
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2015
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2015
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2015
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF
DANGEROUS NATURE OF FELONY
Filing Date
8/13/2015
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/13/2015
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
8/13/2015
Description
ALP - State's Allegation Pursuant to ARS 13-702.02 - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-702.02
Filing Date
8/13/2015
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
8/13/2015
Description
AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES
COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM
CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §
13-604.02(A) or (B)
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
8/6/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE NOTICE OF INTENTION TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
7/31/2015
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CLARIFY RULING
Filing Date
7/27/2015
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2015
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
7/22/2015
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF
Filing Date
7/21/2015
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2015
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2015
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
7/20/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
7/20/2015
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Appearance
Filing Date
7/17/2015
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
7/17/2015
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
7/17/2015
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/16/2015
Filing Date
11/4/2014
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2014
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2014
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2014
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2014
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2015
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/16/2015
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
7/23/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/4/2015
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
11/3/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/2/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/18/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/5/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/19/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/7/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
9/1/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
9/29/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
10/17/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
10/20/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
10/31/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
11/10/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/5/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/22/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/4/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/14/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/8/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/12/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/26/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
11/30/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
1/4/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
2/8/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
2/13/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
2/22/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
3/1/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
3/5/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
3/14/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/2/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/6/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/19/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/24/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/28/2018
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/4/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/4/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/24/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/25/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/3/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/4/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/12/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/4/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/15/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/28/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
3/21/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
3/28/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
4/11/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
6/13/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
6/27/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
8/22/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
10/17/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
11/21/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
12/19/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
1/13/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
2/20/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
2/24/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
3/17/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/17/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/15/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/8/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/13/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/20/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/4/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/11/2021
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/14/2021
Time
9:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/29/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/22/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/15/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
10/28/2021
Time
9:40
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
11/9/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
11/16/2021
Time
9:35
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
12/3/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
1/5/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/7/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
1/7/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/20/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/27/2022
Time
9:10
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/4/2022
Time
10:45
Event
Sentencing
Date
2/10/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/11/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
4/1/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Sentencing