« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   To Be Determined      
Victor Manuel Mejia - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Public Defender-, Ccc   Brickner  CR2013-462094-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Victor Manuel Mejia             
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
2/23/2016  PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)  2/25/2016   
NOTE: COUNT 1
2/23/2016  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  2/29/2016   
NOTE: COUNT 1
9/4/2014  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)  9/8/2014   
5/8/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/8/2014   
4/30/2014  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  4/30/2014   
NOTE: COUNT 1
4/29/2014  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  4/29/2014   
NOTE: IA Packet
4/29/2014  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  4/29/2014   
NOTE: IA Release Order
3/10/2014  BND - Bindover - Party (001)  3/10/2014   
3/10/2014  COM - Complaint - Party (001)  3/10/2014   
3/10/2014  JUD - Judgment - Party (001)  3/10/2014   
3/10/2014  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  3/10/2014   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
4/29/2014  2:00   Initial Appearance 
click here for Law Library Resource Center