« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Brady, Tiffany
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Souccar, Michael
Judge
Nicholls
Case #
CR2013-453879-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2013-453879-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
11/15/2013
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
11/15/2013
Description
AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI
ARSCode
28-1383A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
11/15/2013
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
11/15/2013
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
11/15/2013
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
11/15/2013
Description
AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI
ARSCode
28-1383A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
11/15/2013
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
11/15/2013
Description
HIT AND RUN W/DEATH/INJURY
ARSCode
28-661 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
6/24/2014
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
6/24/2014
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
7/24/2014
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
7/24/2014
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
7/24/2014
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
6/24/2014
Description
HIT AND RUN W/DEATH/INJURY
ARSCode
28-661 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
7/24/2014
Description
AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI
ARSCode
28-1383A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Nathan Joseph Painter 
Crime Date
10/26/2013
Date
7/24/2014
Description
AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI
ARSCode
28-1383A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
3/24/2025
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 6
Filing Date
4/12/2022
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Nathan Painter
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2014
Description
189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2014
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
7/24/2014
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2014
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2014
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2014
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2014
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
7/3/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2014
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2014
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2014
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2014
Description
591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2014
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
2/18/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2014
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
/THAT MARICOAP COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER IN PHOENIX AZ HEREBY RELEASE FOLLOWING PORTIONS OF MEDICAL RECORDS REGARDING LILIA JUAREZ VICTIMS A and B FOR TREATMENT RENDERED 10/26/13 TO PRESENT
Filing Date
2/14/2014
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
/THAT SCOTTSDALE HEALTHCARE OSBORN IN SCOTTSDALE AZ HEREBY RELEASE FOLLOWING PORTIONS OF MEDICAL RECORDS REGARDING SEANA MOLITOR FOR TREATMENT RENDERED 10/26/13 TO PRESENT
Filing Date
2/14/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2014
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2014
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
1/15/2014
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2014
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
1/13/2014
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
1/13/2014
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2014
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2014
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2014
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO AMEND RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM AND INDICTMENT
Filing Date
1/3/2014
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES OTHER THAN PRIOR CONVICTIONS
Filing Date
1/3/2014
Description
NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
12/6/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
11/27/2013
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2013
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2013
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2013
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2013
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2013
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/14/2013
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2013
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2013
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/8/2013
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
11/8/2013
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
11/7/2013
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2013
Description
IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2013
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/8/2013
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
11/14/2013
Time
8:35
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/18/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
11/25/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/14/2014
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
2/11/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
3/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/13/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/12/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/3/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
6/17/2014
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
6/24/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/24/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/29/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/4/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Trial