« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Hazelton, Arthur
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Public Defender-, Ccc
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2013-423334-001
Party Name
Dale Brakhop - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Debrigida, Ronald
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2013-423334-002
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2013-423334-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
11/4/2012
Date
5/31/2013
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
11/4/2012
Date
5/31/2013
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
12/11/2013
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
12/11/2013
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
12/11/2013
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carola Margaretha Rundblad 
Crime Date
5/23/2013
Date
7/10/2014
Description
BESTIALITY
ARSCode
13-1411 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
4/30/2014
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
4/30/2014
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2013
Date
7/10/2014
Description
BESTIALITY
ARSCode
13-1411 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
4/30/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dale Brakhop 
Crime Date
5/23/2012
Date
7/10/2014
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/21/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION REQUESTING THIS COURTS COMPLIANCE WITH THE LAW AND BREIF SUPPORT
Filing Date
4/30/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/1/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION REQUESTING LEAVE OF COURT TO AMEND PETITIONERS WRIT OF MANDAMUS WITH BRIEF
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION REQUESTING WRIT OF MANDAMUS WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM WITH ATTACHMENTS
Filing Date
3/5/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION REQUESTING DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/5/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION UNDER RULE 10.1 REQUESTING CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
10/11/2017
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2017
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2016
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
11/3/2016
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2016
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2016
Description
905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/21/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITH BRIEF
Filing Date
5/23/2016
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/24/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM SUPERIOR COURT
Filing Date
5/12/2016
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2016
Description
597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/29/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE
Filing Date
4/13/2016
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2016
Description
RPP - Response to Petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
2/25/2016
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2016
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/16/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
1/13/2016
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITH BRIEF
Filing Date
12/14/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/15/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITH BRIEF IN SUPPORT
Filing Date
11/19/2015
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/19/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/19/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITH BRIEF IN SUPPORT
Filing Date
11/16/2015
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2015
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2015
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE BY PCR COUNSEL RE: CONSULTATION AND TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
9/22/2015
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITH BRIEF IN SUPPORT
Filing Date
6/24/2015
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2015
Description
NRE - Notice of Completion of Post Conviction Relief Request for Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF POST-CONVICTION REVIEW BY COUNSEL; REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TO FILE PRO PER PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
2/25/2015
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2015
Description
PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
4-11-14 LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY
Filing Date
2/23/2015
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2015
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2015
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
07/10/14 BY SALLY STEARMAN
Filing Date
11/5/2014
Description
PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
4-30-14 TREVA B COLWELL
Filing Date
10/13/2014
Description
595 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2014
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/7/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
7/14/2014
Description
189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/14/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2014
Description
189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2014
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFTER CONVICTION AND PROCEDURE
Filing Date
7/10/2014
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/14/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFTER CONVICTION AND PROCEDURE
Filing Date
7/10/2014
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2014
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2014
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2014
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2014
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2014
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2014
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2014
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT OF POLYGRAPH EXAMINATION
Filing Date
6/11/2014
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2014
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2014
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2014
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2014
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/9/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2014
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/8/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES
Filing Date
4/7/2014
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/5/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/27/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2014
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/30/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
12/19/2013
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/24/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2013
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2013
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2013
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2013
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2013
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2013
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/7/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/30/2013
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2013
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2013
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2013
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES
Filing Date
9/16/2013
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2013
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2013
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/11/2013
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2013
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2013
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2013
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2013
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2013
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO DESIGNATE COMPLEX
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF OPPORTUNITY TO INSPECT CONTRABAND EVIDENCE
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF OPPORTUNITY TO INSPECT CONTRABAND EVIDENCE
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO DESIGNATE COMPLEX
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2013
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2013
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2013
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2013
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC ISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(a) and (b) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(c)
Filing Date
6/26/2013
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
6/26/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DEFENSE INTERVIEW WITH VICTIM AND VICTIMS GUARDIAN
Filing Date
6/26/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
6/26/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF SPECIFIC ITEMS OF EVIDENCE
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2013
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2013
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2013
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2013
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2013
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2013
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2013
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2013
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2013
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2013
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/30/2013
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2013
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2013
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/30/2013
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/31/2013
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/30/2013
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/31/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2013
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/31/2013
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/28/2013
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2013
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2013
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
5/28/2013
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/28/2013
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/28/2013
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/23/2013
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/25/2013
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/30/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/31/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/3/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/4/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/10/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/10/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/29/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/29/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/18/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/18/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/29/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/29/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/11/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/11/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/30/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/30/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/30/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/6/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/6/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/2/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/8/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/11/2014
Time
10:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/30/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
5/12/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/12/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/19/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/10/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/10/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing