« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, T P C Appeals
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Coy Glen Ball - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Per, Pro
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2013-420642-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2013-420642-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Coy Glen Ball 
Crime Date
1/1/1990
Date
5/20/2013
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Coy Glen Ball 
Crime Date
1/1/1990
Date
6/23/2014
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (M3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Coy Glen Ball 
Crime Date
1/1/1990
Date
6/23/2014
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Coy Glen Ball 
Crime Date
1/1/1990
Date
6/23/2014
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Coy Glen Ball 
Crime Date
1/1/1990
Date
7/25/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Coy Glen Ball 
Crime Date
1/1/1990
Date
7/25/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Coy Glen Ball 
Crime Date
1/1/1990
Date
7/25/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Coy Glen Ball 
Crime Date
1/1/1990
Date
7/25/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Coy Glen Ball 
Crime Date
1/1/1990
Date
7/25/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Coy Glen Ball 
Crime Date
1/1/1990
Date
7/25/2014
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Coy Glen Ball 
Crime Date
1/1/1990
Date
7/25/2014
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2023
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RSD money/[prob start Ball, Coy CR2013-420642-001
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVIEW GRANTED; RELIEF DENIED
Filing Date
1/21/2022
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
1/14/2022
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2022
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD
Filing Date
12/1/2021
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2021
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2021
Description
597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2021
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER REQUESTING STATUS UPDATE ON RULE 33 NOTICE PREVIOUSLY SUBMITTED
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
8/5/2021
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
10/5/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Filing Date
7/24/2018
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Filing Date
6/12/2018
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2018
Description
597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2018
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
5/15/2018
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
4/29/2016
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CORRECTION OF SENTENCE
Filing Date
7/30/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTIO FOR CLARIFICATION OF SENTENCE
Filing Date
6/30/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF SENTENCE
Filing Date
8/18/2014
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2014
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2014
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
7/28/2014
Description
189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2014
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2014
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2014
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTERS
Filing Date
7/25/2014
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2014
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTERS
Filing Date
6/24/2014
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2014
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2014
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2014
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2014
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUESTED 15.2 DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/14/2014
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2014
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2014
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2014
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2014
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2014
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2014
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2014
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2014
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw
Filing Date
2/13/2014
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2014
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/24/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2013
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2013
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2013
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2013
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE ORDER TO TRANSPORT
Filing Date
9/5/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX-PARTE/ TO TRANSPORT
Filing Date
7/15/2013
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RULE 15.1 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RULE 15.1 (a), (b), (c), (d), (e) REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2013
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2013
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2013
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2013
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2013
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
05/17/13 BY CINDY BENNER
Filing Date
6/4/2013
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/28/2013
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2013
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2013
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/17/2013
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2013
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2013
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/10/2013
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2013
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/10/2013
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/8/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/15/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/17/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/28/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/11/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/30/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/14/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
10/18/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/7/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/11/2014
Time
8:1
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/11/2014
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/27/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/6/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/10/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/13/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/1/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/16/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/20/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/23/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/25/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing