« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Johnson, Erica      
Charles D'Mon Harden - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Per, Pro   Van Wie  CR2013-004990-001  
Keith Damone ChildressJr. - (3)
 
Defendant  M   Reinhart, Brad   Master Calendar  CR2013-004990-002  
Pierre Craig Simmons - (4)
 
Defendant  M   Foutz, Brian   Brickner  CR2013-004990-003  
Edward James Steagall - (5)
 
Defendant  M   Martinez, Jon   Master Calendar  CR2013-004990-004  
Clerk Of The Court - (6)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Keith Damone Childress Jr.  13-1508 (F2)  BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE  3/3/2013  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  1/27/2016 
Keith Damone Childress Jr.  13-1904 (F2)  ARMED ROBBERY  3/3/2013  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  1/27/2016 
Keith Damone Childress Jr.  13-1304 (F2)  KIDNAP  3/3/2013  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  1/27/2016 
Keith Damone Childress Jr.  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  3/3/2013  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  1/27/2016 
Keith Damone Childress Jr.  13-1904 (F2)  ARMED ROBBERY  3/3/2013  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  1/27/2016 
Keith Damone Childress Jr.  13-1304 (F2)  KIDNAP  3/3/2013  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  1/27/2016 
Keith Damone Childress Jr.  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  3/3/2013  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  1/27/2016 
Keith Damone Childress Jr.  13-1802 (F6)  THEFT  3/3/2013  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  1/27/2016 
Keith Damone Childress Jr.  13-1802 (F6)  THEFT  3/3/2013  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  1/27/2016 
Charles D'Mon Harden  13-1508 (F2)  BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Charles D'Mon Harden  13-1904 (F2)  ARMED ROBBERY  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Charles D'Mon Harden  13-1304 (F2)  KIDNAP  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Charles D'Mon Harden  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Charles D'Mon Harden  13-1904 (F2)  ARMED ROBBERY  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Charles D'Mon Harden  13-1304 (F2)  KIDNAP  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Charles D'Mon Harden  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Charles D'Mon Harden  13-1802 (F6)  THEFT  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Charles D'Mon Harden  13-1802 (F6)  THEFT  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Charles D'Mon Harden  13-3102 (F4)  MISCONDUCT INVOLVING WEAPONS  3/5/2013  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  2/18/2016 
Edward James Steagall  13-1508 (F2)  BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Edward James Steagall  13-1904 (F2)  ARMED ROBBERY  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Edward James Steagall  13-1304 (F2)  KIDNAP  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Edward James Steagall  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Edward James Steagall  13-1904 (F2)  ARMED ROBBERY  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Edward James Steagall  13-1304 (F2)  KIDNAP  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Edward James Steagall  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Edward James Steagall  13-1802 (F6)  THEFT  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Edward James Steagall  13-1802 (F6)  THEFT  3/3/2013  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  12/17/2015 
Edward James Steagall  13-3102 (F4)  MISCONDUCT INVOLVING WEAPONS  3/3/2013  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  6/1/2016 
Edward James Steagall  13-3102 (F4)  MISCONDUCT INVOLVING WEAPONS  3/7/2013  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  6/1/2016 
Pierre Craig Simmons  13-1508 (F2)  BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE  3/3/2013  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  1/27/2016 
Pierre Craig Simmons  13-1904 (F2)  ARMED ROBBERY  3/3/2013  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/27/2016 
Pierre Craig Simmons  13-1904 (F2)  ARMED ROBBERY  3/3/2013  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/27/2016 
Pierre Craig Simmons  13-1304 (F2)  KIDNAP  3/3/2013  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/27/2016 
Pierre Craig Simmons  13-1304 (F2)  KIDNAP  3/3/2013  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/27/2016 
Pierre Craig Simmons  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  3/3/2013  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/27/2016 
Pierre Craig Simmons  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  3/3/2013  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/27/2016 
Pierre Craig Simmons  13-1802 (F6)  THEFT  3/3/2013  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/27/2016 
Pierre Craig Simmons  13-1802 (F6)  THEFT  3/3/2013  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/27/2016 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
6/12/2019  DHR - Dispo: Reinstate probation - Party (003)  6/12/2019   
NOTE: DHR - Disposition Order - Reinstated
6/12/2019  DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (003)  6/13/2019   
6/11/2019  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (003)  6/11/2019   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
6/11/2019  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (003)  6/11/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review
6/11/2019  OOR - Order Of Release - Party (003)  6/11/2019   
NOTE: Order of Release
5/15/2019  117 - ME: Guilt New Chg/Prob Violation - Party (003)  5/15/2019   
4/10/2019  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (003)  4/10/2019   
3/27/2019  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (003)  3/27/2019   
3/6/2019  112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (003)  3/6/2019   
2/26/2019  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (003)  2/26/2019   
2/19/2019  ASN – Amended/Supp Pet/Order to Revoke Probation no warrant - Party (003)  2/19/2019   
NOTE: COUNT 1
2/16/2019  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (003)  2/19/2019   
NOTE: IA Release Order
2/16/2019  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (003)  2/19/2019   
NOTE: IA Packet
2/12/2019  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (003)  2/12/2019   
1/24/2019  112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (003)  1/24/2019   
1/23/2019  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (003)  1/24/2019   
NOTE: $500
1/23/2019  WRS-Warrant Served - Party (003)  1/28/2019   
NOTE: 01/14/19 PV WARRANT
1/17/2019  ASN – Amended/Supp Pet/Order to Revoke Probation no warrant - Party (003)  1/17/2019   
NOTE: COUNT 1
1/15/2019  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (003)  1/15/2019   
NOTE: IA Packet
1/15/2019  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (003)  1/15/2019   
NOTE: IA Release Order
11/5/2018  167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (001)  11/5/2018   
11/2/2018  597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001)  11/2/2018   
10/26/2018  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  10/31/2018  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: LETTER
10/9/2018  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  10/9/2018   
10/1/2018  RES - Response - Party (001)  10/2/2018   
NOTE: Response to Petition for Post-Conviction Relief
8/20/2018  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  8/20/2018   
8/9/2018  PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  8/13/2018  Defendant (2)  
7/30/2018  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  7/30/2018   
7/20/2018  NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  7/23/2018  Defendant (2)  
6/15/2018  197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)  6/15/2018   
6/5/2018  PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (003)  6/5/2018   
NOTE: Appearance Bond (Secured) set at $900.00 Appearance Bond (Secured) set at $900.00
6/5/2018  PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (003)  6/5/2018   
NOTE: Issued 2018-06-05
6/5/2018  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  6/6/2018  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION REQUEST FOR TIME EXTENSION TO FILE PCR PETITION NOT TO EXCEED 45 DAYS
4/12/2018  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/13/2018   
NOTE: Notice of compliance
4/11/2018  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  4/11/2018   
3/18/2018  NRE - Notice of Completion of Post Conviction Relief Request for Extension of Time - Party (001)  3/19/2018   
NOTE: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF POST-CONVICTION REVIEW BY COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TO FILE PRO PER PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
3/7/2018  197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)  3/7/2018   
2/8/2018  197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)  2/8/2018   
1/4/2018  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  1/5/2018   
NOTE: Motion to extend time
11/30/2017  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/1/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/6/17
11/13/2017  596 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: trial - Party (001)  11/13/2017   
11/13/2017  MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)  11/14/2017   
11/13/2017  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)  11/14/2017   
10/31/2017  NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  11/1/2017  Defendant (2)  
7/24/2017  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  7/25/2017   
7/13/2017  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  7/14/2017   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT
7/13/2017  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)  7/14/2017   
NOTE: AMENDED ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD
7/5/2017  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  7/6/2017   
1/18/2017  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  1/19/2017   
12/9/2016  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment - Party (002)  12/14/2016   
11/1/2016  NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (002)  11/1/2016   
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER $2700
10/27/2016  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (002)  10/28/2016   
NOTE: $2700
9/9/2016  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  9/12/2016   
NOTE: FROM PUBLIC DEFENDER
9/9/2016  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  9/12/2016   
NOTE: FROM PUBLIC DEFENDER
9/8/2016  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  9/12/2016   
NOTE: FROM ATTORNEY GENERAL
9/8/2016  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  9/12/2016   
NOTE: FROM ATTORNEY GENERAL
9/6/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  9/6/2016   
NOTE: Reporters Transcript COPY 7-31-14 Status Conference (Barbara Stockford)
9/5/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  9/6/2016   
NOTE: 12/17/15 BY WANDA J BAUER
9/5/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  9/6/2016   
NOTE: WANDA J BAUER 11-18-15
9/5/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  9/6/2016   
NOTE: 12-14-15 by Wanda J. Bauer
9/5/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  9/6/2016   
NOTE: Reporters Transcript - 04/23/2015 - Final Trial Management Conference (Patricia Kotarba)
9/4/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  9/6/2016   
NOTE: Reporters Transcript 10-29-14 Status Conference (Barbara Stockford)
9/2/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  9/2/2016   
NOTE: 12-15-15 WANDA J BAUER
9/1/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  9/1/2016   
NOTE: 12-3-15 by Wanda J. Bauer
9/1/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  9/1/2016   
NOTE: 10-14-15 DIANE DONOHO
8/31/2016  RNM - Returned Mail - Party (002)  8/31/2016   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry
8/30/2016  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  8/30/2016   
8/30/2016  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)  8/30/2016   
NOTE: AMENDED
8/29/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/29/2016   
NOTE: 11-30-15 by Wanda J. Bauer
8/29/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/29/2016   
NOTE: 12-1-15 WANDA J BAUER
8/29/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/29/2016   
NOTE: 12-2-15 WANDA J BAUER
8/26/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/26/2016   
NOTE: 4-8-16 WANDA J BAUER
8/26/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/26/2016   
NOTE: 01/15/2016 BY WANDA J BAUER
8/26/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/26/2016   
NOTE: 2-18-16 by Wanda Bauer
8/26/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/26/2016   
NOTE: 11-02-15 by Wanda J. Bauer
8/22/2016  196 - ME: Bond Exonerated - Party (002)  8/22/2016   
8/22/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/23/2016   
NOTE: 10-28-15 by Wanda J. Bauer
8/19/2016  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  8/23/2016   
8/19/2016  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)  8/23/2016   
NOTE: AMENDED
8/18/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/18/2016   
NOTE: 10-27-15 WANDA J BAUER
8/17/2016  DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (001)  8/17/2016   
NOTE: 2nd CORRECTED Designation of Record for Appeal
8/16/2016  BFJ - Bond Forfeiture Judgment - Party (002)  8/26/2016   
8/13/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/15/2016   
NOTE: 11/19/2015 BY WANDA J BAUER
8/13/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/15/2016   
NOTE: 11-3-15 by Wanda Bauer
8/13/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/15/2016   
NOTE: 11/17/15 BY WANDA J BAUER
8/9/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/9/2016   
NOTE: 11-16-15 by Wanda J. Bauer
8/7/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/8/2016   
NOTE: 11-4-15 by Wanda Bauer
8/7/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/8/2016   
NOTE: 11-5-15 by Wanda Bauer
8/5/2016  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  8/10/2016   
NOTE: FROM PUBLIC DEFENDER
8/4/2016  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  8/4/2016   
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL
8/2/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/2/2016   
NOTE: Designation of Record for Appeal
8/2/2016  DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (001)  8/2/2016   
NOTE: CORRECTED Designation of Record for Appeal
7/28/2016  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  7/28/2016   
7/28/2016  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)  7/28/2016   
7/25/2016  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  7/26/2016   
NOTE: 5-13-16 DEBRA R CARNEY
7/18/2016  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  7/19/2016   
NOTE: FOR EXHIBITS
6/27/2016  180 - ME: Bond Forfeiture Hrg - Party (002)  6/27/2016   
6/10/2016  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  6/13/2016   
NOTE: COURT REPORTER NOTIFICATION
6/6/2016  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (003)  6/6/2016   
NOTE: Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines, and/or Other Fees
6/3/2016  193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (004)  6/3/2016   
6/3/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/6/2016   
NOTE: NOTIFICATION NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
6/3/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  6/3/2016   
6/1/2016  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (004)  6/1/2016   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
6/1/2016  OOR - Order Of Release - Party (004)  6/3/2016   
6/1/2016  ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (004)  6/3/2016   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE
5/31/2016  NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)  6/1/2016   
NOTE: notice of appeal
5/27/2016  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (004)  5/27/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review
5/27/2016  OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (004)  5/27/2016   
NOTE: Monetary Orders
5/27/2016  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (004)  5/27/2016   
NOTE: Order of Confinement
5/27/2016  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (004)  6/3/2016  Defendant (5)  
5/25/2016  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  6/1/2016   
NOTE: AMENDED
5/24/2016  193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)  5/24/2016   
5/23/2016  OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)  5/24/2016   
NOTE: AMENDED
5/13/2016  OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)  5/13/2016   
NOTE: Restitution Ledger Confidential (Restricted)
5/13/2016  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  5/13/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review
5/13/2016  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  5/13/2016   
NOTE: Order of Confinement
5/13/2016  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  5/13/2016   
NOTE: Presentence Report
5/13/2016  OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)  5/13/2016   
NOTE: Monetary Orders
4/28/2016  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (004)  4/28/2016   
4/19/2016  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  4/19/2016   
4/12/2016  180 - ME: Bond Forfeiture Hrg - Party (002)  4/12/2016   
4/11/2016  MEB - Motion to Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (002)  4/13/2016   
4/11/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)  4/14/2016   
NOTE: ON BEHALF OF BLACK DOG BAIL BONDS
3/22/2016  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (003)  3/24/2016   
3/17/2016  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (003)  3/17/2016   
3/9/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  3/9/2016   
3/3/2016  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (003)  3/3/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review
3/3/2016  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (003)  3/3/2016   
NOTE: Presentence Report
3/3/2016  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (003)  3/3/2016   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
3/1/2016  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (004)  3/1/2016   
2/29/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (004)  2/29/2016   
2/25/2016  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  2/25/2016   
2/19/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (004)  2/19/2016   
2/18/2016  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  2/19/2016   
2/5/2016  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)  2/5/2016   
2/4/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  2/4/2016   
2/4/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (004)  2/4/2016   
2/2/2016  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (003)  2/2/2016   
2/2/2016  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)  2/2/2016   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
1/29/2016  ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (002)  2/8/2016   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE
1/27/2016  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (003)  1/28/2016   
1/25/2016  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  1/26/2016   
1/21/2016  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  1/22/2016  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL
1/12/2016  BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (002)  1/14/2016   
1/8/2016  185 - ME: Bw Quashed/Case Reset - Party (002)  1/8/2016   
1/8/2016  092 - ME: Order Releasing Exhibit - Party (001)  1/8/2016   
1/8/2016  092 - ME: Order Releasing Exhibit - Party (002)  1/8/2016   
1/8/2016  092 - ME: Order Releasing Exhibit - Party (004)  1/8/2016   
1/7/2016  133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
1/7/2016  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
1/7/2016  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
1/7/2016  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
1/5/2016  BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: QUASHED 12/29/15
1/4/2016  BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (002)  1/4/2016   
NOTE: Quashed 2016-01-04
1/4/2016  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  1/14/2016   
12/30/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  12/30/2015   
12/29/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  12/29/2015   
12/29/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/29/2015   
12/29/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  12/29/2015   
12/29/2015  BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (002)  12/29/2015   
NOTE: Quashed 2015-12-29
12/29/2015  IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (002)  12/29/2015   
NOTE: Issued 2015-12-29
12/19/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/18/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/18/2015   
12/18/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  12/18/2015   
12/18/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  12/18/2015   
12/17/2015  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (004)  12/22/2015   
12/17/2015  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)  12/22/2015   
12/17/2015  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: AGGRAVATION PHASE
12/17/2015  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: AGGRAVATION PHASE
12/17/2015  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: AGGRAVATION PHASE
12/17/2015  WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING
12/17/2015  WSH - Worksheet - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING
12/17/2015  WSH - Worksheet - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SIGNED
12/17/2015  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)  1/21/2016   
12/17/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/17/2015   
12/17/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  12/17/2015   
12/17/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  12/17/2015   
12/17/2015  IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (002)  12/17/2015   
NOTE: Issued 2015-12-17
12/16/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/16/2015   
12/16/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  12/16/2015   
12/16/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  12/16/2015   
12/16/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #1
12/15/2015  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL
12/15/2015  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL
12/15/2015  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL
12/14/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
12/14/2015  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: FINAL
12/14/2015  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: FINAL
12/14/2015  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: FINAL
12/10/2015  BON - Bond - Party (002)  12/14/2015   
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY $17,700 SUN SURETY
12/8/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  12/8/2015   
12/8/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/8/2015   
12/8/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  12/8/2015   
12/4/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  12/4/2015   
12/4/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  12/4/2015   
12/4/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/4/2015   
12/3/2015  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (003)  12/3/2015   
12/1/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/1/2015   
12/1/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  12/1/2015   
12/1/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  12/1/2015   
12/1/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #22
12/1/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #21
11/30/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #20
11/30/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #19
11/30/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #18
11/25/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  11/25/2015   
11/25/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  11/25/2015   
11/25/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/25/2015   
11/25/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  11/25/2015   
11/25/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  11/25/2015   
11/25/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/25/2015   
11/24/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/24/2015   
11/24/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  11/24/2015   
11/24/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  11/24/2015   
11/20/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  11/20/2015   
11/20/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  11/20/2015   
11/20/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/20/2015   
11/19/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  11/19/2015   
11/19/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/19/2015   
11/19/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  11/19/2015   
11/19/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  11/19/2015   
11/19/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/19/2015   
11/19/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  11/19/2015   
11/19/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #17
11/19/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #15
11/19/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #16
11/18/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #11
11/18/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #12
11/18/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #13
11/18/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #14
11/17/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #9
11/17/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #10
11/17/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/17/2015   
11/17/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  11/17/2015   
11/17/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  11/17/2015   
11/16/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #6
11/16/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #7
11/16/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #8
11/16/2015  ORD - Order - Party (001)  1/20/2016   
NOTE: THAT THE WITNESS ABOVE NAMED IS HEREBY REQUIRED TO GIVE TESTIMONY OR PRODUCE EVIDENCE AS TO THE WITHIN MATTER REGARDING HIS RESIDENCE OR PRESENCE IN AND KNOWLEDGE,POSSESSION FOR SALE, SALE, POSSESSION OR USE OF MARIJUANA AT 4718 N THIRD AVE PHX PRIOR TO
11/16/2015  PTT - Petition - Party (001)  1/20/2016   
NOTE: FOR ORDER GRANTING IMMUNITY TO WITNESS AND ORDER
11/12/2015  PTT - Petition - Party (001)  1/20/2016   
NOTE: FOR ORDER GRANTING IMMUNITY TO WITNESS AND ORDER
11/12/2015  ORD - Order - Party (001)  1/20/2016   
NOTE: THAT THE WITNESS ABOVE NAMED IS HEREBY REQUIRED TO GIVE TESTIMONY OR PRODUCE EVIDENCE AS TO THE WITHIN MATTER REGARDING HIS RESIDENCE OR PRESENCE IN AND KNOWLEDGE,POSSESSION OR USE OF MARIJUANA AT 4718 N THIRD AVE, PHX PRIOR TO MARCH 4,2013
11/12/2015  NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)  11/12/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF INTENT TO IMPEACH WITNESS NATHAN VIZZERRA WITH PENDING CHARGES BEING PROSECUTED BY PLAINTIFF
11/10/2015  ORD - Order - Party (001)  1/20/2016   
NOTE: THAT THE WITNESS ABOVE NAMED IS HEREBY REQUIRED TO GIVE TESTIMONY OR PRODUCE EVIDENCE AS TO THE WITHIN MATTER REGARDING HIS RESIDENCE OR PRESENCE IN AND KNOWLEDGE,POSSESSION OR USE OF MARIJUANA AT 4718 N THIRD AVE.PHX PRIOR TO MARCH 4,2013
11/10/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #2
11/10/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #3
11/10/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #4
11/10/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #5
11/9/2015  ORD - Order - Party (001)  11/17/2015   
NOTE: THAT DEFENSE COUNSEL RESTRICT DISSEMINATION OF THE PROTECTED INFORMATION CONTAINED WITHIN MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE DEPARTMENTAL REPORT NO 150014324 AND PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT REPORT NO 201300378288A
11/9/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  11/16/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S/ FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
11/9/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  11/16/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S/ FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
11/9/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/16/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S/ FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
11/9/2015  ORD - Order - Party (002)  11/17/2015   
NOTE: THAT DEFENSE COUNSEL RESTRICT DISSEMINATION OF THE PROTECTED INFORMATION CONTAINED WITHIN MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE DEPARTMENTAL REPORT NO 150014324 AND PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT REPORT NO 201300378288A
11/9/2015  ORD - Order - Party (004)  11/17/2015   
NOTE: THAT DEFENSE COUNSEL RESTRICT DISSEMINATION OF THE PROTECTED INFORMATION CONTAINED WITHIN MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE DEPARTMENTAL REPORT NO 150014324 AND PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT REPORT NO 21300378288A
11/9/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/9/2015   
11/9/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  11/9/2015   
11/9/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  11/9/2015   
11/9/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/9/2015   
11/9/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  11/9/2015   
11/9/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  11/9/2015   
11/9/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  11/9/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE NATHAN VIZZERRA
11/9/2015  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (002)  11/9/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER
11/6/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/6/2015   
11/6/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  11/6/2015   
11/6/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  11/6/2015   
11/6/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  11/6/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER
11/6/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  11/6/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER
11/6/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/6/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER
11/5/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/5/2015   
11/5/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  11/5/2015   
11/5/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  11/5/2015   
11/5/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/5/2015   
11/5/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  11/5/2015   
11/5/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  11/5/2015   
11/5/2015  REQ - Request - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR RULING
11/4/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: #1
11/4/2015  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  11/4/2015   
11/4/2015  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (003)  11/4/2015   
11/4/2015  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)  11/4/2015   
11/4/2015  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (004)  11/4/2015   
11/4/2015  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  11/4/2015   
11/4/2015  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)  11/4/2015   
11/4/2015  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (004)  11/4/2015   
11/3/2015  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (004)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: PRELIMINARY
11/3/2015  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: PRELIMINARY
11/3/2015  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  1/7/2016   
NOTE: PRELIMINARY
11/2/2015  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)  11/2/2015   
10/30/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  10/30/2015   
10/30/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  10/30/2015   
10/30/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/30/2015   
10/28/2015  RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (002)  10/28/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUESTED JURY QUESTIONS
10/28/2015  RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (004)  10/28/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUESTED JURY QUESTIONS
10/27/2015  RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)  10/27/2015   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUESTED JURY QUESTIONS
10/23/2015  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  10/23/2015   
10/23/2015  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)  10/23/2015   
10/23/2015  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (004)  10/23/2015   
10/23/2015  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  10/23/2015   
10/23/2015  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  10/26/2015   
NOTE: NOTCE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
10/21/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  10/21/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO REQUEST TRAVEL
10/20/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/20/2015   
10/20/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  10/20/2015   
10/20/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)  10/20/2015   
10/20/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  10/20/2015   
10/14/2015  LET - Letter - Party (003)  10/23/2015   
10/8/2015  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)  10/8/2015   
10/8/2015  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  10/8/2015   
10/8/2015  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)  10/8/2015   
10/8/2015  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)  10/8/2015   
9/30/2015  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (002)  10/9/2015   
NOTE: SECURED APPEARANCE BOND $17,700
9/23/2015  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  9/23/2015   
9/18/2015  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)  9/18/2015   
9/18/2015  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)  9/18/2015   
9/18/2015  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)  9/18/2015   
9/18/2015  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  9/18/2015   
9/1/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/1/2015   
8/24/2015  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/24/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Witnesses and Exhibits
8/21/2015  REP - Report - Party (001)  8/25/2015   
NOTE: status
8/21/2015  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (003)  8/21/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER SEVERANCE OF DEFENDANT
8/20/2015  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  8/20/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO REMOVE ANKLE MONITORING DEVICE
8/19/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  8/19/2015   
8/19/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/19/2015   
8/19/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  8/19/2015   
8/19/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  8/19/2015   
8/17/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  8/17/2015   
8/17/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  8/17/2015   
8/17/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  8/17/2015   
8/17/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/17/2015   
8/14/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/14/2015   
8/14/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  8/14/2015   
8/14/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  8/14/2015   
8/14/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  8/14/2015   
8/14/2015  092 - ME: Order Releasing Exhibit - Party (001)  8/14/2015   
8/14/2015  092 - ME: Order Releasing Exhibit - Party (002)  8/14/2015   
8/14/2015  092 - ME: Order Releasing Exhibit - Party (003)  8/14/2015   
8/14/2015  092 - ME: Order Releasing Exhibit - Party (004)  8/14/2015   
8/13/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/14/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Remove Ankle Monitoring Device
8/13/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  8/13/2015   
8/13/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  8/13/2015   
8/13/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  8/13/2015   
8/13/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/13/2015   
8/13/2015  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  8/20/2015   
8/12/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)  8/12/2015   
8/12/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  8/12/2015   
8/12/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (004)  8/12/2015   
8/12/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/12/2015   
8/10/2015  WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)  8/20/2015   
NOTE: TRIAL
8/10/2015  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)  8/20/2015   
8/10/2015  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)  8/20/2015   
8/6/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  8/6/2015   
8/6/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  8/6/2015   
8/6/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/6/2015   
8/6/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)  8/6/2015   
8/5/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  8/6/2015   
NOTE: PROSPECTIVE JUROR 170'S LETTER DATED 8/4/15
8/5/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  8/6/2015   
NOTE: PROSPECTIVE JUROR 16'S LETTER DATED 8/4/15
8/5/2015  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (003)  8/5/2015   
8/5/2015  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (002)  8/5/2015   
8/5/2015  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)  8/5/2015   
8/5/2015  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (004)  8/5/2015   
7/31/2015  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (004)  7/31/2015   
7/31/2015  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)  7/31/2015   
7/31/2015  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)  7/31/2015   
7/31/2015  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  7/31/2015   
7/29/2015  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (003)  7/29/2015   
7/29/2015  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (004)  7/29/2015   
7/29/2015  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  7/29/2015   
7/29/2015  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)  7/29/2015   
7/23/2015  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/23/2015   
NOTE: OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS
7/20/2015  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  7/20/2015   
7/20/2015  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (003)  7/20/2015   
7/20/2015  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (004)  7/20/2015   
7/20/2015  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)  7/20/2015   
7/15/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/17/2015   
NOTE: TO SEVER
7/14/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  7/14/2015   
7/14/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  7/14/2015   
7/14/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  7/14/2015   
7/14/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)  7/14/2015   
7/10/2015  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (004)  7/14/2015   
NOTE: SERVED 07/07/2015
7/10/2015  STA - Statement - Party (001)  7/10/2015   
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
7/7/2015  STA - Statement - Party (003)  7/7/2015   
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL
7/7/2015  STA - Statement - Party (004)  7/7/2015   
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
7/7/2015  STA - Statement - Party (002)  7/7/2015   
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
7/1/2015  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (003)  7/10/2015   
6/2/2015  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)  6/3/2015   
NOTE: STATES SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
6/2/2015  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  6/3/2015   
NOTE: STATES SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
6/2/2015  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (004)  6/3/2015   
NOTE: STATES SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
6/2/2015  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)  6/3/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
4/29/2015  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)  4/29/2015   
4/29/2015  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)  4/29/2015   
4/29/2015  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  4/29/2015   
4/29/2015  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (004)  4/29/2015   
4/22/2015  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  4/22/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE 04/30/15 FIRM TRIAL DATE
4/6/2015  331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (002)  4/6/2015   
3/26/2015  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)  3/26/2015   
3/24/2015  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)  3/24/2015   
3/24/2015  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (004)  3/24/2015   
3/24/2015  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  3/24/2015   
3/24/2015  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)  3/24/2015   
2/17/2015  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  2/17/2015   
2/17/2015  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (003)  2/17/2015   
2/17/2015  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (004)  2/17/2015   
2/17/2015  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)  2/17/2015   
12/8/2014  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  12/8/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
11/6/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  11/6/2014   
11/6/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)  11/6/2014   
11/6/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  11/6/2014   
11/6/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/6/2014   
11/6/2014  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  11/6/2014   
10/30/2014  BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (002)  10/30/2014   
NOTE: Quashed 2014-10-30
10/30/2014  MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (002)  10/30/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO QUASH BENCH WARRANT
10/29/2014  IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (002)  10/29/2014   
NOTE: Issued 2014-10-29
10/1/2014  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (004)  10/1/2014   
9/29/2014  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (004)  9/29/2014   
9/23/2014  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (004)  10/2/2014   
NOTE: $50,000
9/18/2014  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)  9/18/2014   
9/11/2014  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (004)  9/11/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW DUE TO CONFLICT OF INTEREST
8/4/2014  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (004)  8/4/2014   
8/4/2014  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)  8/4/2014   
8/4/2014  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)  8/4/2014   
8/4/2014  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  8/4/2014   
7/31/2014  STA - Statement - Party (003)  8/7/2014   
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL /
7/31/2014  STA - Statement - Party (002)  8/7/2014   
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL /
7/31/2014  STA - Statement - Party (001)  8/7/2014   
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL /
7/31/2014  STA - Statement - Party (004)  8/7/2014   
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL /
7/31/2014  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (003)  8/8/2014   
5/23/2014  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (004)  5/23/2014   
5/23/2014  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (003)  5/23/2014   
5/23/2014  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)  5/23/2014   
5/23/2014  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  5/23/2014   
5/22/2014  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/27/2014   
NOTE: /PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(e)
5/20/2014  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  5/27/2014   
5/20/2014  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/27/2014   
NOTE: TEMPORARY / PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(e)
5/20/2014  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/27/2014   
5/19/2014  MEM - Memorandum - Party (004)  5/27/2014   
NOTE: ADDENDUM
5/19/2014  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (004)  5/27/2014   
NOTE: AMENDED/SECURED APPEARANCE BOND $15,000
5/15/2014  NOT - Notice - Party (004)  5/16/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S CASE PLAN
4/16/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  4/16/2014   
4/16/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  4/16/2014   
4/16/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  4/16/2014   
4/16/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)  4/16/2014   
4/16/2014  ALG - Allegation - Party (003)  4/16/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF DANGEROUS OFFENSE
4/16/2014  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (003)  4/16/2014   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
4/16/2014  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (003)  4/16/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES OTHER THAN PRIOR CONVICTIONS
4/10/2014  REP - Report - Party (004)  4/14/2014   
NOTE: VIOLATION /
4/10/2014  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (004)  4/14/2014   
NOTE: $15000
4/10/2014  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (003)  4/14/2014   
4/9/2014  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (003)  4/9/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
4/9/2014  RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (003)  4/9/2014   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY ROLE 15.1 (A) AND (B) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1 (C)
4/8/2014  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (003)  4/8/2014   
4/8/2014  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (004)  4/8/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-702.02
4/8/2014  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)  4/8/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-702.02
4/8/2014  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)  4/8/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES OTHER THAN PRIOR CONVICTIONS
4/8/2014  AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (004)  4/8/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 708
4/8/2014  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  4/8/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF DANGEROUS OFFENSE
4/8/2014  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (004)  4/8/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES OTHER THAN PRIOR CONVICTIONS
4/8/2014  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  4/8/2014   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
4/8/2014  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  4/8/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
4/8/2014  ALG - Allegation - Party (004)  4/8/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF DANGEROUS OFFENSE
4/8/2014  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  4/8/2014   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
4/8/2014  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (004)  4/8/2014   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
4/2/2014  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (003)  4/4/2014   
4/2/2014  ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (003)  4/7/2014   
4/2/2014  FIN - Financial Information - Party (003)  4/7/2014   
4/1/2014  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (003)  4/1/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
3/26/2014  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (004)  3/31/2014   
3/26/2014  SUM - Summons - Party (003)  3/26/2014   
NOTE: SERVED 03/21/2014
3/24/2014  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (004)  3/28/2014   
3/24/2014  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (004)  3/28/2014   
3/24/2014  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (004)  3/27/2014   
3/18/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)  3/26/2014   
3/17/2014  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)  3/18/2014   
3/14/2014  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (004)  3/14/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
3/11/2014  085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)  3/11/2014   
3/11/2014  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  3/11/2014   
3/11/2014  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  3/11/2014   
3/6/2014  RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (004)  3/6/2014   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(a) and (b) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1 (c) and (d)
3/5/2014  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (004)  3/5/2014   
3/5/2014  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (002)  3/11/2014   
3/3/2014  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  3/3/2014   
3/3/2014  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)  3/3/2014   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
3/3/2014  ALG - Allegation - Party (002)  3/3/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF DANGEROUS OFFENSE
3/3/2014  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (002)  3/3/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES OTHER THAN PRIOR CONVICTIONS
2/26/2014  FIN - Financial Information - Party (004)  3/5/2014   
2/26/2014  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (004)  3/5/2014   
NOTE: $15,000.00
2/25/2014  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  2/25/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND WITNESSES BY DEFENDANT AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
2/24/2014  ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  3/5/2014   
2/24/2014  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)  3/5/2014   
NOTE: $42,000
2/24/2014  FIN - Financial Information - Party (001)  3/5/2014   
2/20/2014  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  2/24/2014   
NOTE: TEMPORARY
2/20/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  2/20/2014   
2/19/2014  SUM - Summons - Party (004)  2/19/2014   
NOTE: SERVED 02/13/2014
2/19/2014  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  2/24/2014   
NOTE: TEMPORARY/
2/19/2014  SUM - Summons - Party (001)  2/19/2014   
NOTE: SERVED 02/13/2014
2/19/2014  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  2/25/2014   
2/19/2014  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  2/25/2014   
2/14/2014  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)  2/14/2014   
NOTE: Motion to Extend Rule 12.9 Deadline
2/14/2014  REQ - Request - Party (002)  2/14/2014   
NOTE: Request for Discovery
2/12/2014  SUM - Summons - Party (001)  2/21/2014   
NOTE: QUASH SUMMONS REISSUE SUMMONS 02/10/14 A7549
2/11/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  2/21/2014   
2/10/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/21/2014   
2/10/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)  3/26/2014   
2/4/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/19/2014   
2/3/2014  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)  2/3/2014   
1/29/2014  BON - Bond - Party (002)  1/31/2014   
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY/$17,700/SUN SURETY
1/23/2014  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)  1/23/2014   
NOTE: IA Release Order
1/23/2014  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)  1/23/2014   
NOTE: IA Packet
1/23/2014  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (002)  1/23/2014   
NOTE: SERVED 01/22/2014
1/14/2014  612 - ME: Gj Quash Summons/Issue Warrant - Party (002)  1/28/2014   
1/10/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  2/19/2014   
1/6/2014  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  1/13/2014   
1/6/2014  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)  1/13/2014   
1/6/2014  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)  1/13/2014   
1/6/2014  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004)  1/13/2014   
12/17/2013  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (002)  1/23/2014   
12/17/2013  IND - Indictment - Party (002)  1/23/2014   
12/17/2013  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)  2/19/2014   
12/17/2013  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  2/19/2014   
12/17/2013  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (004)  2/19/2014   
12/17/2013  IND - Indictment - Party (004)  2/19/2014   
12/17/2013  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (003)  3/26/2014   
12/17/2013  IND - Indictment - Party (003)  3/26/2014   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/22/2014  23:00   Initial Appearance 
1/29/2014  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
2/24/2014  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
2/26/2014  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
3/5/2014  8:30   Status Conference 
3/5/2014  8:30   Status Conference 
3/5/2014  8:30   Status Conference 
3/13/2014  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
4/2/2014  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
4/10/2014  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
4/10/2014  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
4/10/2014  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
4/10/2014  8:30   Status Conference 
4/11/2014  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
4/11/2014  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
5/19/2014  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
5/19/2014  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
5/19/2014  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
5/19/2014  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
5/20/2014  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
7/31/2014  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/31/2014  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/31/2014  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/31/2014  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/18/2014  8:00   Trial 
8/18/2014  8:00   Trial 
8/18/2014  8:00   Trial 
8/18/2014  8:00   Trial 
9/23/2014  8:30   Status Conference 
10/29/2014  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/29/2014  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/29/2014  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/29/2014  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/30/2014  8:30   Status Conference 
11/4/2014  8:00   Trial 
11/4/2014  8:00   Trial 
11/4/2014  8:00   Trial 
11/4/2014  8:00   Trial 
1/20/2015  13:30   Bond Forfeiture Hearing 
1/21/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/21/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/21/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/21/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/28/2015  8:00   Trial 
1/28/2015  8:00   Trial 
1/28/2015  8:00   Trial 
1/28/2015  8:00   Trial 
3/18/2015  8:1   Settlement Conference 
3/18/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/18/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/18/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/18/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/18/2015  13:30   Settlement Conference 
3/25/2015  8:00   Trial 
3/25/2015  8:00   Trial 
3/25/2015  8:00   Trial 
3/25/2015  8:00   Trial 
4/2/2015  9:00   Settlement Conference 
4/23/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/23/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/23/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/23/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/30/2015  8:00   Trial 
4/30/2015  8:00   Trial 
4/30/2015  8:00   Trial 
4/30/2015  8:00   Trial 
7/1/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/1/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/1/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/1/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/13/2015  8:00   Trial 
7/13/2015  8:00   Trial 
7/13/2015  8:00   Trial 
7/13/2015  8:00   Trial 
7/21/2015  8:00   Trial 
7/21/2015  8:00   Trial 
7/21/2015  8:00   Trial 
7/21/2015  8:00   Trial 
7/21/2015  8:30   Trial 
7/21/2015  8:30   Trial 
7/21/2015  8:30   Trial 
7/21/2015  8:30   Trial 
7/27/2015  11:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/27/2015  11:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/27/2015  11:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/27/2015  11:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/28/2015  11:00   Oral Argument 
7/28/2015  11:00   Oral Argument 
7/28/2015  11:00   Oral Argument 
7/28/2015  11:00   Oral Argument 
8/3/2015  13:30   Trial 
8/3/2015  13:30   Trial 
8/3/2015  13:30   Trial 
8/3/2015  13:30   Trial 
8/4/2015  13:30   Trial 
8/4/2015  13:30   Trial 
8/4/2015  13:30   Trial 
8/4/2015  13:30   Trial 
8/5/2015  11:00   Trial 
8/5/2015  11:00   Trial 
8/5/2015  11:00   Trial 
8/5/2015  11:00   Trial 
8/6/2015  11:00   Trial 
8/6/2015  11:00   Trial 
8/6/2015  11:00   Trial 
8/6/2015  11:00   Trial 
8/10/2015  10:30   Trial 
8/10/2015  10:30   Trial 
8/10/2015  10:30   Trial 
8/10/2015  10:30   Trial 
9/10/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/10/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/10/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/10/2015  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/14/2015  8:30   Status Conference 
9/30/2015  8:30   Status Conference 
9/30/2015  8:30   Status Conference 
9/30/2015  8:30   Status Conference 
9/30/2015  20:30   Status Conference 
10/14/2015  11:00   Status Conference 
10/14/2015  11:00   Status Conference 
10/14/2015  11:00   Oral Argument 
10/14/2015  11:00   Status Conference 
10/23/2015  11:30   Status Conference 
10/23/2015  11:30   Status Conference 
10/23/2015  11:30   Status Conference 
10/23/2015  11:30   Status Conference 
10/26/2015  8:00   Trial 
10/26/2015  8:00   Trial 
10/26/2015  8:00   Trial 
10/26/2015  11:00   Trial 
10/26/2015  11:00   Trial 
10/26/2015  11:00   Trial 
10/27/2015  8:30   Status Conference 
10/27/2015  10:30   Trial 
10/27/2015  10:30   Trial 
10/27/2015  10:30   Trial 
10/28/2015  10:30   Trial 
10/28/2015  10:30   Trial 
10/28/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/2/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/2/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/2/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/3/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/3/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/3/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/4/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/4/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/4/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/5/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/5/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/5/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/9/2015  10:00   Trial 
11/9/2015  10:00   Trial 
11/9/2015  10:00   Trial 
11/10/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/10/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/10/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/12/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/12/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/12/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/16/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/16/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/16/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/17/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/17/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/17/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/18/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/18/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/18/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/19/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/19/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/19/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/24/2015  8:30   Status Conference 
11/30/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/30/2015  10:30   Trial 
11/30/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/1/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/1/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/1/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/2/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/2/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/2/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/3/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/3/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/3/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/14/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/14/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/14/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/15/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/15/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/15/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/16/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/16/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/16/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/17/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/17/2015  10:30   Trial 
12/17/2015  10:30   Trial 
1/15/2016  10:30   Status Conference 
1/15/2016  10:30   Status Conference 
1/15/2016  10:30   Status Conference 
1/27/2016  8:30   Status Conference 
2/2/2016  8:30   Status Conference 
2/16/2016  13:30   Bond Forfeiture Hearing 
2/17/2016  8:00   Status Conference 
2/18/2016  8:30   Status Conference 
2/25/2016  8:00   Status Conference 
2/25/2016  13:30   Status Conference 
3/1/2016  11:00   Status Conference 
3/3/2016  8:30   Sentencing 
4/5/2016  13:30   Bond Forfeiture Hearing 
4/8/2016  9:00   Sentencing 
4/22/2016  9:00   Sentencing 
5/13/2016  11:00   Sentencing 
5/27/2016  9:00   Sentencing 
6/14/2016  13:31   Bond Forfeiture Hearing 
8/16/2016  13:31   Bond Forfeiture Hearing 
1/15/2019  5:00   Initial Appearance 
1/23/2019  8:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
1/23/2019  8:31   Disposition Hearing 
2/8/2019  8:29   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
2/8/2019  8:32   Disposition Hearing 
2/16/2019  8:00   Initial Appearance 
2/22/2019  8:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
2/22/2019  8:31   Disposition Hearing 
3/1/2019  8:29   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
3/1/2019  8:32   Disposition Hearing 
3/14/2019  8:15   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
4/9/2019  8:15   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
4/15/2019  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
5/7/2019  9:00   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
5/13/2019  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
6/11/2019  8:30   Disposition Hearing 
6/17/2019  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
6/24/2019  8:00   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
click here for Law Library Resource Center