« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, Maricopa
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mario Galvan-Colazo - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Defender, Public
Judge
van Wie
Case #
CR2012-159483-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2012-159483-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mario Galvan-Colazo
Crime Date
11/21/2012
Date
11/28/2012
Description
AGGRAVATED DUI
ARSCode
28-1383 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Mario Galvan-Colazo
Crime Date
11/21/2012
Date
1/4/2013
Description
AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI
ARSCode
28-1383A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mario Galvan-Colazo
Crime Date
11/21/2012
Date
1/4/2013
Description
AGGRAVATED DUI-THIRD DUI
ARSCode
28-1383A2 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mario Galvan-Colazo
Crime Date
11/21/2012
Date
1/4/2013
Description
AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI
ARSCode
28-1383A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
IRF - Interest Request Form - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Interest Request Form
Filing Date
7/27/2021
Description
ORR - Order re: Restoring Civil Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING ORDER REGARDING APPLICATION TO
RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS AND/OR
RIGHT TO POSSESS OR OWN A FIREARM
Filing Date
4/7/2021
Description
CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
Filing Date
3/29/2021
Description
APL - Application - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS / RESTORE GUN RIGHTS
Filing Date
2/13/2018
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
2/13/2018
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2016
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1/DENIED
Filing Date
12/13/2013
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
6/17/2013
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
6/5/2013
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2013
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2013
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2013
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2013
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2013
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2013
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2013
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2012
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2012
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2012
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2012
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2012
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
11/27/2012
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/21/2012
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
11/28/2012
Time
8:35
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/28/2012
Time
8:36
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
11/30/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
1/4/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing