« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Maricopa      
Roger Allan Stevenson - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Defender, Public   Master Calendar  CR2012-008319-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Roger Allan Stevenson  28-661 (F3)  HIT AND RUN W/DEATH/INJURY  1/13/2012  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  5/13/2013 
Roger Allan Stevenson  28-1381A1 (M1)  DUI-LIQUOR/DRUGS/VAPORS/COMBO  1/13/2012  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  6/13/2013 
Roger Allan Stevenson  28-1382 (M1)  EXTREME DUI-BAC .15 OR MORE  1/13/2012  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  5/13/2013 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
6/18/2018  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  6/21/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 1
6/18/2018  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  6/21/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 3
6/18/2018  CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)  6/22/2018   
8/19/2013  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)  8/21/2013   
NOTE: AND/OR OTHER FEES
7/3/2013  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  7/10/2013   
6/18/2013  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  6/18/2013   
6/13/2013  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  6/20/2013   
6/13/2013  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  6/20/2013   
6/13/2013  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  6/19/2013   
6/13/2013  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  6/18/2013   
5/14/2013  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  5/14/2013   
5/13/2013  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  5/21/2013   
5/13/2013  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  5/13/2013   
NOTE: Sentencing Memorandum
4/29/2013  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  4/29/2013   
4/22/2013  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  4/22/2013   
4/12/2013  STA - Statement - Party (001)  4/22/2013   
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
3/27/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  3/27/2013   
3/21/2013  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  3/21/2013   
3/20/2013  ORD - Order - Party (001)  3/22/2013   
NOTE: THAT SCOTTSDALE HEALTHCARE OSBORN HEREBY RELEASE FOLLOWING PORTIONS OF MEDICAL RECORDS
3/20/2013  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  3/20/2013   
3/19/2013  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  3/20/2013   
NOTE: IA Packet
3/19/2013  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  3/20/2013   
NOTE: IA Release Order
3/13/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/14/2013   
NOTE: FOR RELEASE OF VICTIM’S MEDICAL RECORDS
3/11/2013  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  3/12/2013   
NOTE: DEFENSE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT WITH ADDITIONAL WITNESS
2/26/2013  REL - Reply - Party (001)  2/26/2013   
NOTE: TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
2/19/2013  NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001)  2/19/2013   
NOTE: STATES /
2/19/2013  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)  2/19/2013   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES OTHER THAN PRIOR CONVICTIONS
2/15/2013  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  2/19/2013   
NOTE: TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
2/8/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/8/2013   
NOTE: Motion to Modify Release Conditions
2/7/2013  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  2/11/2013   
2/6/2013  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  2/11/2013   
2/6/2013  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  2/11/2013   
2/6/2013  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  2/11/2013   
2/5/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/5/2013   
NOTE: Request for Specific Items of Evidence
2/4/2013  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  2/4/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance
2/4/2013  RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)  2/5/2013   
NOTE: Request for Automatic Disclosure Required by Rule 15.1(a) and (b) and Request for Additional Disclosure Required by Rule 15.1(c)
2/4/2013  RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)  2/5/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS /
2/4/2013  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  2/5/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS /
1/29/2013  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  1/29/2013   
1/15/2013  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  1/15/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 1/14/2013
1/15/2013  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  1/15/2013   
NOTE: IA Release Order
1/15/2013  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  1/15/2013   
NOTE: IA Packet
12/28/2012  612 - ME: Gj Quash Summons/Issue Warrant - Party (001)  1/15/2013   
11/7/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/15/2013   
9/5/2012  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)  1/15/2013   
9/5/2012  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  1/15/2013   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/14/2013  23:00   Initial Appearance 
1/22/2013  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
3/11/2013  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
3/19/2013  8:15   Oral Argument 
4/12/2013  8:15   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
4/19/2013  8:15   Status Conference 
5/13/2013  9:30   Change Of Plea 
5/14/2013  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/21/2013  8:00   Trial 
6/13/2013  8:30   Sentencing 
click here for Law Library Resource Center