Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Davis, Christine | ||
Alvin Samir Yono - (2) |
Defendant | M | Kimerer, Michael | Astrowsky | CR2012-007826-001 |
Clerk Of The Court - (3) |
In The Matter Of | N/A | To Be Determined |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Alvin Samir Yono | 13-3209 (F5) | PANDERING | 1/1/2011 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 5/18/2015 |
Alvin Samir Yono | 13-1307 (F2) | SEX TRAFFICKING | 1/1/2011 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 8/14/2015 |
Alvin Samir Yono | 13-3209 (F5) | ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - PANDERING | 1/1/2011 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 5/18/2015 |
Alvin Samir Yono | 13-3212 (F2) | CHILD SEX TRAFNG | 2/1/2011 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 8/14/2015 |
Alvin Samir Yono | 13-3212 (F2) | CHILD SEX TRAFNG | 2/1/2011 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 8/14/2015 |
Alvin Samir Yono | 13-3212 (F2) | CHILD SEX TRAFNG | 2/1/2011 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 8/14/2015 |
Alvin Samir Yono | 13-3209 (F5) | PANDERING | 2/1/2011 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 5/18/2015 |
Alvin Samir Yono | 13-3209 (F5) | PANDERING | 3/25/2011 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 8/14/2015 |
Alvin Samir Yono | 13-3209 (F5) | PANDERING | 3/25/2011 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 5/18/2015 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
10/30/2019 | 119 - ME: Ord Discharge/Probation - Party (001) | 10/30/2019 | |
10/11/2019 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001) | 10/11/2019 | |
9/25/2019 | PFC - Petition for Earned Time Credit - Party (001) | 9/25/2019 | |
NOTE: APD Forms | |||
8/29/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/30/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION | |||
7/22/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION RE TERMINATION OF PROBATION | |||
5/28/2019 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 5/29/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Status Report in Support of Request for Early Termination of Probation | |||
4/17/2019 | MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001) | 4/17/2019 | |
NOTE: COUNT 3 | |||
4/5/2019 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 4/5/2019 | |
3/28/2019 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 3/28/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION | |||
3/27/2019 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 3/27/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR EARLY TERMINATION | |||
2/25/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/26/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION | |||
9/20/2018 | 118 - ME: Modifica/Terms Probation - Party (001) | 9/20/2018 | |
9/4/2018 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001) | 9/4/2018 | |
8/28/2018 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001) | 8/28/2018 | |
8/22/2018 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 8/28/2018 | |
8/7/2018 | MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001) | 8/8/2018 | |
NOTE: COUNT 3 | |||
7/31/2018 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001) | 7/31/2018 | |
7/31/2018 | MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001) | 8/3/2018 | |
NOTE: COUNT 3 | |||
6/11/2018 | NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001) | 6/12/2018 | |
NOTE: Notice of Substitution of Counsel with Consent | |||
6/8/2018 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001) | 6/8/2018 | |
6/8/2018 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 6/9/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO MODIFY TERMS OF PROBATION | |||
5/2/2018 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001) | 5/2/2018 | |
5/2/2018 | 906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001) | 5/2/2018 | |
4/18/2018 | MPL - Modification of Probation Level - Party (001) | 4/19/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY TERMS OF PROBATION | |||
9/13/2017 | MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001) | 9/15/2017 | |
NOTE: COUNT 3 | |||
8/7/2017 | 021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001) | 8/7/2017 | |
8/2/2017 | 589 - ME: Dispo: Revoke-Imprisonment/Reinstate-Probation - Party (001) | 8/2/2017 | |
7/20/2017 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 8/10/2017 | |
7/20/2017 | OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001) | 7/25/2017 | |
7/20/2017 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 7/25/2017 | |
7/12/2017 | 117 - ME: Guilt New Chg/Prob Violation - Party (001) | 7/12/2017 | |
7/12/2017 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001) | 7/12/2017 | |
6/28/2017 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 6/28/2017 | |
NOTE: Disposition and Settlement Conference Memorandum | |||
6/2/2017 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 6/2/2017 | |
5/3/2017 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001) | 5/3/2017 | |
4/18/2017 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001) | 4/19/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion for 1 Reconsideration Re Reassignment of Post-Conviction Relief Petition and 2 Transfer of Case | |||
3/28/2017 | 597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001) | 3/28/2017 | |
3/10/2017 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 3/10/2017 | |
NOTE: Request for Informal Conference | |||
3/9/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 3/9/2017 | |
3/9/2017 | RPT - Response to Petition for Early Termination - Party (001) | 3/9/2017 | |
NOTE: CONCESSION IN LIEU OF RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF | |||
3/8/2017 | 187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001) | 3/8/2017 | |
2/27/2017 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 2/27/2017 | |
NOTE: MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR POSTCONVICTION RELIEF | |||
2/27/2017 | PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (001) | 2/27/2017 | |
NOTE: Petition for Post-Conviction Relief | |||
2/8/2017 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/8/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion to File Notice of Disclosure Under Seal | |||
2/8/2017 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 2/9/2017 | |
NOTE: DEFENSE COUNSEL KIMERER & DERRICK’S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |||
2/2/2017 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 2/3/2017 | |
NOTE: OF COMPLIANCE | |||
1/27/2017 | 129 – ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Retained re: plea - Party (001) | 1/27/2017 | |
1/18/2017 | NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001) | 1/18/2017 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF POST-CONVICTION RELIEF | |||
1/9/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 1/9/2017 | |
12/15/2016 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 12/20/2016 | |
NOTE: SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL | |||
12/6/2016 | APL - Application - Party (001) | 12/6/2016 | |
NOTE: Application for Substitution of Counsel | |||
12/6/2016 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 12/6/2016 | |
NOTE: Motion for Modification of Sentence | |||
10/26/2016 | 115 - ME: Dispo-Revoke/Prison (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001) | 10/26/2016 | |
10/26/2016 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001) | 10/27/2016 | |
10/25/2016 | PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001) | 10/28/2016 | |
10/25/2016 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 10/31/2016 | |
10/25/2016 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 10/27/2016 | |
10/11/2016 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001) | 10/11/2016 | |
9/23/2016 | 112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001) | 9/23/2016 | |
9/20/2016 | WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001) | 9/22/2016 | |
NOTE: SERVED 09/14/16 | |||
9/16/2016 | RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001) | 9/20/2016 | |
9/15/2016 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 9/15/2016 | |
8/30/2016 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 8/30/2016 | |
8/29/2016 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/31/2016 | |
NOTE: RESETTING THE HEARING DATE TO 9/14/16 8:30AM | |||
8/26/2016 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/26/2016 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION RE DEFENDANTS PROBATION PENDING REVOCATION HEARING AND TO MODIFY HIS PROBATION TERMS | |||
8/24/2016 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/25/2016 | |
NOTE: TO RESET DATE RE ORAL ARGUMENT/MOTION TO QUASH AND ATTACHED ORDER | |||
8/22/2016 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001) | 8/22/2016 | |
8/16/2016 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/17/2016 | |
NOTE: TO SELF-SURRENDER AND TO SET RELEASE CONDITIONS | |||
8/11/2016 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/15/2016 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL/RE: DEFENDANTS PROBATION PENDING REVOCATION HEARING AND TO MODIFY HIS PROBATION TERMS | |||
8/11/2016 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/15/2016 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION RE: DEFENDANTS PROBATION PENDING REVOCATION HEARING AND TO MODIFY HIS PROBATION TERMS | |||
5/6/2016 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 5/6/2016 | |
5/3/2016 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 5/3/2016 | |
4/20/2016 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/21/2016 | |
NOTE: FOR THIS COURT TO ACCEPT JURISDICTION ON DEFENDANTS PROBATION REVOCATION HEARING AND TO MODIFY HIS PROBATION TERM | |||
4/20/2016 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/21/2016 | |
NOTE: TO SET STATUS CONFERENCE | |||
4/20/2016 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 4/21/2016 | |
11/30/2015 | 099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001) | 11/30/2015 | |
11/25/2015 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001) | 12/3/2015 | |
11/9/2015 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 11/10/2015 | |
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record | |||
10/28/2015 | PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001) | 10/28/2015 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1,3,7&9/NO BOND | |||
10/28/2015 | PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (001) | 10/28/2015 | |
NOTE: Issued 2015-10-28 | |||
9/1/2015 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 9/2/2015 | |
8/20/2015 | 109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001) | 8/20/2015 | |
8/14/2015 | OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001) | 8/17/2015 | |
8/14/2015 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 8/19/2015 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO SEAL REPORT OF MARTA DESOTO AND KEN WELLS | |||
8/14/2015 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 8/19/2015 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO SEAL REPORT OF SCOTT NAEGELE | |||
8/14/2015 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 8/21/2015 | |
8/14/2015 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 8/21/2015 | |
8/14/2015 | TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001) | 8/21/2015 | |
8/14/2015 | TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001) | 8/21/2015 | |
8/14/2015 | TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001) | 8/21/2015 | |
8/14/2015 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 8/21/2015 | |
8/14/2015 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 8/22/2015 | |
8/13/2015 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001) | 8/13/2015 | |
NOTE: Second Notice of Filing Letters of Support | |||
8/13/2015 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 8/13/2015 | |
NOTE: Defendants Sentencing Memorandum | |||
8/13/2015 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001) | 8/13/2015 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing | |||
8/12/2015 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001) | 8/13/2015 | |
NOTE: Letters of Support | |||
8/5/2015 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001) | 8/5/2015 | |
8/4/2015 | EMF - Email Filed - Party (001) | 8/7/2015 | |
6/18/2015 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 6/18/2015 | |
6/12/2015 | EMF - Email Filed - Party (001) | 6/16/2015 | |
6/12/2015 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 6/15/2015 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO SEAL REPORT OF SCOTT NAEGELE | |||
6/12/2015 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 6/15/2015 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE: MOTION TO SEAL REPORT OF SCOTT NAEGELE | |||
6/1/2015 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001) | 6/1/2015 | |
5/22/2015 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 5/22/2015 | |
5/22/2015 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 5/22/2015 | |
5/18/2015 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 5/19/2015 | |
5/14/2015 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 5/14/2015 | |
5/12/2015 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/13/2015 | |
NOTE: Motion for Permission to Travel | |||
5/11/2015 | EMF - Email Filed - Party (001) | 5/18/2015 | |
5/8/2015 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001) | 5/8/2015 | |
3/31/2015 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 3/31/2015 | |
2/6/2015 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 2/6/2015 | |
1/28/2015 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001) | 1/28/2015 | |
11/7/2014 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 11/7/2014 | |
9/19/2014 | 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (001) | 9/19/2014 | |
8/18/2014 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 8/18/2014 | |
8/5/2014 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 8/5/2014 | |
NOTE: CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT | |||
6/13/2014 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 6/13/2014 | |
6/6/2014 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 6/6/2014 | |
6/2/2014 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 6/3/2014 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial and Last Day | |||
5/30/2014 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 6/2/2014 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO TRAVEL | |||
4/30/2014 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 4/30/2014 | |
4/23/2014 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 4/24/2014 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE VICTIM’S RECORDS | |||
4/8/2014 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/8/2014 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF ALLEGED VICTIM'S RECORDS | |||
4/2/2014 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 4/2/2014 | |
3/28/2014 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 3/28/2014 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
3/26/2014 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/27/2014 | |
NOTE: Motion for Permission to Travel | |||
3/24/2014 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 3/24/2014 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
3/13/2014 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/13/2014 | |
3/11/2014 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/13/2014 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT | |||
3/4/2014 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/5/2014 | |
NOTE: Notice of Association | |||
2/5/2014 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 2/5/2014 | |
2/4/2014 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001) | 2/7/2014 | |
1/27/2014 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 1/29/2014 | |
NOTE: AS CO-COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT | |||
1/24/2014 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 1/24/2014 | |
1/13/2014 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 1/13/2014 | |
11/25/2013 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 11/25/2013 | |
10/8/2013 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 10/8/2013 | |
9/5/2013 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 9/5/2013 | |
9/4/2013 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 9/5/2013 | |
NOTE: GRANTING DEFENDANT PERMISSION TO TRAVEL OUTSIDE OF THE STATE OF AZ AS FOLLOWS: 09/05/13 TO 09/11/13 TO SAN DIEGO CALIF AND 09/25/13 TO 10/01/13 DALLAS TX | |||
8/27/2013 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 8/27/2013 | |
8/21/2013 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/29/2013 | |
NOTE: FOR PERMISSION TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE | |||
7/22/2013 | 081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001) | 7/22/2013 | |
7/9/2013 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 7/9/2013 | |
7/2/2013 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/3/2013 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO TRAVEL Expedited Ruling Requested | |||
6/5/2013 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 6/5/2013 | |
5/29/2013 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 6/6/2013 | |
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE /FORM | |||
4/19/2013 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 4/19/2013 | |
4/16/2013 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 4/23/2013 | |
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE FORM | |||
3/8/2013 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 3/8/2013 | |
3/1/2013 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 3/6/2013 | |
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE REQUEST FORM | |||
1/28/2013 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 1/28/2013 | |
11/20/2012 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 11/20/2012 | |
11/14/2012 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 11/28/2012 | |
NOTE: JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |||
10/26/2012 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 10/26/2012 | |
10/4/2012 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 10/4/2012 | |
9/26/2012 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 10/4/2012 | |
NOTE: OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL | |||
9/17/2012 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001) | 9/17/2012 | |
9/17/2012 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 9/17/2012 | |
9/17/2012 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 9/18/2012 | |
NOTE: TO FILE 12.9 MOTION FOR REMAND | |||
9/11/2012 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 9/11/2012 | |
NOTE: to Designate Case Complex | |||
8/30/2012 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001) | 8/30/2012 | |
8/24/2012 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/28/2012 | |
8/22/2012 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 8/22/2012 | |
NOTE: TO FILE 12.9 MOTION FOR REMAND | |||
8/22/2012 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 8/27/2012 | |
8/22/2012 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/27/2012 | |
8/22/2012 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/27/2012 | |
8/16/2012 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/16/2012 | |
8/16/2012 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 8/17/2012 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
8/16/2012 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 8/17/2012 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
8/9/2012 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 8/10/2012 | |
8/9/2012 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/10/2012 | |
8/9/2012 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/10/2012 | |
8/8/2012 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 8/8/2012 | |
NOTE: Defendants / of Defenses, Witnesses and Exhibits | |||
8/7/2012 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 8/7/2012 | |
8/6/2012 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 8/6/2012 | |
8/3/2012 | ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001) | 8/3/2012 | |
NOTE: | |||
8/3/2012 | AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001) | 8/3/2012 | |
NOTE: | |||
8/3/2012 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 8/3/2012 | |
NOTE: | |||
8/1/2012 | BON - Bond - Party (001) | 8/6/2012 | |
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY $95,000 SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. | |||
8/1/2012 | UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name - Party (001) | 8/21/2012 | Defendant (2) |
7/26/2012 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 7/26/2012 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
7/26/2012 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 7/26/2012 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED / | |||
7/25/2012 | WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001) | 7/25/2012 | |
NOTE: SERVED 7/24/2012 | |||
7/18/2012 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 7/25/2012 | |
7/18/2012 | 604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001) | 7/25/2012 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
7/24/2012 | 23:00 | Initial Appearance |
7/30/2012 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
8/1/2012 | 8:30 | Arraignment Hearing |
9/10/2012 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
9/27/2012 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
11/5/2012 | 8:15 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
11/14/2012 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
12/11/2012 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/17/2012 | 8:00 | Trial |
1/14/2013 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2013 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
4/16/2013 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
5/29/2013 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
7/17/2013 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
8/21/2013 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/21/2013 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
8/28/2013 | 8:00 | Trial |
10/2/2013 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
11/20/2013 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
1/10/2014 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/11/2014 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
4/24/2014 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
6/2/2014 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
6/16/2014 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/24/2014 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/6/2014 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
9/10/2014 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
11/5/2014 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
12/5/2014 | 13:30 | Settlement Conference |
12/16/2014 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
2/3/2015 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/24/2015 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
4/24/2015 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
4/30/2015 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
5/13/2015 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
5/18/2015 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
7/21/2015 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
7/28/2015 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
8/14/2015 | 9:30 | Sentencing |
9/9/2016 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
9/14/2016 | 8:30 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
9/14/2016 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
9/22/2016 | 8:30 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
10/10/2016 | 13:30 | Disposition Hearing |
10/25/2016 | 13:30 | Disposition Hearing |
5/19/2017 | 10:00 | Informal Conference |
6/30/2017 | 14:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
7/20/2017 | 8:30 | Disposition Hearing |
8/7/2017 | 8:30 | Disposition Hearing |
8/17/2018 | 13:30 | Hearing Pending Motion |
9/11/2018 | 10:00 | Hearing Pending Motion |