« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, Maricopa
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Townsend, Corwin
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2011-138593-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2011-138593-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
7/26/2011
Date
8/3/2011
Description
CRIM TRESP 1ST DEG-RES STRUCT
ARSCode
13-1504A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
7/26/2011
Date
8/3/2011
Description
TAMPERING W/PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
ARSCode
13-2809 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
7/26/2011
Date
7/25/2012
Description
CRIM TRESP 1ST DEG-RES STRUCT
ARSCode
13-1504A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
7/26/2011
Date
7/25/2012
Description
TAMPERING W/PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
ARSCode
13-2809 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
3-30-12 LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY
Filing Date
1/31/2013
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2012
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
9/13/2012
Description
RPR - Request for Preparation of Record - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
6/20/2012
Description
106 - ME: Motion To Dismiss Pending - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2012
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2012
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2012
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2012
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2012
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2012
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2012
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2012
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2012
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL
Filing Date
3/1/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES / OF TRIAL CONFLICTS
Filing Date
2/2/2012
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2012
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2012
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2011
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2011
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2011
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
AFL - Allegation of Felony Committed While on Release/ Enhanced Sentencing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/19/2011
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2011
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2011
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2011
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
$1800
Filing Date
8/16/2011
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2011
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2011
Description
DRO - Indigent Defense Reimbursement Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2011
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2011
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2011
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASH BAIL
Filing Date
8/4/2011
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
$1800
Filing Date
8/2/2011
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2011
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/2/2011
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2011
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2011
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/29/2011
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2011
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/3/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/8/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
8/11/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/14/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/23/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/27/2011
Time
14:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
12/7/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/14/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/10/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/3/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/14/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/17/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/21/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/2/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/12/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/12/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/12/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/16/2012
Time
14:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/30/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/20/2012
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/5/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/8/2012
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
6/12/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/14/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/18/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/18/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/17/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference