« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, T P C Appeals
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Per, Pro
Judge
Boyle
Case #
CR2011-131784-002
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2011-131784-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
6/21/2011
Date
2/28/2012
Description
MISCONDUCT INVOLVING WEAPONS
ARSCode
13-3102 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
6/21/2011
Date
6/18/2012
Description
MISCONDUCT INVOLVING WEAPONS
ARSCode
13-3102 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
NRE - Notice of Completion of Post Conviction Relief Request for Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF NO COLORABLE CLAIMS; REQUEST FOR 45 DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TO FILE A PRO PER PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INTENT NOT TO FILE A NARRATIVE STATEMENT
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INTENT NOT TO FILE A NARRATIVE STATEMENT
Filing Date
12/22/2023
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/14/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S NARRATIVE STATEMENT OF THE SENTENCING PROCEEDING ON AUGUST 21, 2023.
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/10/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
9/29/2023
Description
595 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2023
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/26/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2023
Description
DHI - Dispo: Revoke/prison - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DHI - Disposition Order - Imprisonment
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
7/20/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2023
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
12/21/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2022
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
ASN – Amended/Supp Pet/Order to Revoke Probation no warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
5/17/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/17/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
4/19/2022
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2022
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2022
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
02/09/22
Filing Date
2/10/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/10/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
2/8/2022
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/14/2021
Description
APW – Amended/Supp Pet/Order to Revoke Probation w/warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1 Appearance Bond (Secured) set at $0.00
Filing Date
12/14/2021
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2021-12-14
Filing Date
12/2/2021
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
11/30/2021
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2021
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2021
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2021
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2021
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
$900
Filing Date
10/7/2021
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2021
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
9/21/2021
Filing Date
9/28/2021
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2021-08-16
Filing Date
8/15/2021
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1 Appearance Bond (Secured) set at $900
Filing Date
2/1/2021
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Establish Start Date
Filing Date
9/14/2020
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2020
Description
DHR - Dispo: Reinstate probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DHR - Disposition Order - Reinstated
Filing Date
9/10/2020
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
9/1/2020
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/3/2020
Description
ASN – Amended/Supp Pet/Order to Revoke Probation no warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PTR COUNT 1
Filing Date
9/1/2020
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
9/1/2020
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
7/31/2020
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/31/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1:Appearance Bond (Secured) set at $250.00
Filing Date
7/31/2020
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2020-07-31
Filing Date
5/9/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2016
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM COA, DIV 2
Filing Date
11/20/2015
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVIEW GRANTED; RELIEF DENIED W/RELATED CASES CR2010-162274-001 AND CR2010-167374-002
Filing Date
10/8/2015
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM COA DIV 1 TO DIV 2 RE:TRANSFER OF CASE
Filing Date
10/8/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER FROM COA: DIV 1 TO DIV 2 RE: TRANSFER OF CASE
Filing Date
4/28/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/29/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
4/18/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION
Filing Date
4/18/2014
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/27/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING PETITION FOR REVIEW FROM DISMISSAL OF PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
2/25/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/18/2014
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/18/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion For 10-Day Extension In Which To File Petition For Review
Filing Date
1/23/2014
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2014
Description
597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2013
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petition for Post-Conviction Relief
Filing Date
12/20/2013
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply in Support of Petition for Post-Conviction Relief
Filing Date
11/21/2013
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2013
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
11/1/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2013
Description
RPP - Response to Petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2013
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petition for Post-Conviction Relief
Filing Date
8/14/2013
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/14/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2013
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Post-Conviction Relief (Third Request)
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2013
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
5/1/2013
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS 03/30/12 BY LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY, RPR
Filing Date
3/7/2013
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2013
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
For Additional Transcript
Filing Date
1/3/2013
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2012
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
06/18/12 YVONNE M DE LA TORRE
Filing Date
11/30/2012
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
7-25-12 YVONNE M DE LA TORRE
Filing Date
11/19/2012
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2012
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
07/25/12 YVONNE M DE LA TORRE
Filing Date
11/15/2012
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/19/2012
Description
595 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2012
Description
RPR - Request for Preparation of Record - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/14/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
9/13/2012
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/14/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
8/1/2012
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2012
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2012
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/6/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2012
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2012
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2012
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2012
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2012
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2012
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/8/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2012
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/8/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2012
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/24/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2012
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/12/2012
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
UPON CONVICTION IN A CURRENTLY PENDING CASE
Filing Date
4/12/2012
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/12/2012
Description
AFL - Allegation of Felony Committed While on Release/ Enhanced Sentencing - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/12/2012
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
4/12/2012
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/12/2012
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
4/12/2012
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/3/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/26/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2012
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/16/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2012
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2012
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/12/2012
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/12/2012
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/6/2012
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2012
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2012
Description
NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2012
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2012
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2012
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2012
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/27/2012
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2012
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2012
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/24/2012
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND APPOINT OPDS
Filing Date
2/21/2012
Description
IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2012
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/17/2012
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/24/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/28/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
3/7/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/30/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/20/2012
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/5/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/8/2012
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
6/12/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/14/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/18/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/18/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/17/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/25/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
9/1/2020
Time
17:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
9/8/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/8/2020
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
9/22/2021
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
9/29/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/29/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
10/27/2021
Time
8:29
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/27/2021
Time
8:32
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
11/24/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
11/24/2021
Time
10:32
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
12/29/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/29/2021
Time
10:32
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
2/10/2022
Time
5:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
2/16/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/16/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
3/16/2022
Time
8:29
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
3/16/2022
Time
8:29
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/16/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
3/24/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
3/28/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
3/28/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
4/5/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
4/12/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
4/12/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
5/17/2022
Time
20:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/19/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
5/24/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
5/24/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/24/2022
Time
13:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
5/25/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
6/21/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
6/27/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
7/19/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
7/26/2022
Time
9:40
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
8/2/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
8/9/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
8/18/2022
Time
9:50
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
9/13/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
9/15/2022
Time
10:10
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
9/29/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
11/21/2022
Time
9:40
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
11/29/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
12/19/2022
Time
10:40
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
1/3/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
1/17/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
2/21/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
3/3/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
3/15/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
3/22/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
4/19/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
4/26/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
5/17/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
6/14/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
6/19/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
6/21/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
6/22/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
6/26/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
6/27/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
7/5/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
7/10/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
7/17/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
8/21/2023
Time
9:10
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
8/21/2023
Time
9:10
Event
Disposition Hearing