Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, S P 1 Vehicular Crimes      
Patrick McLeod Nissley - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Segal, Natalee   Master Calendar  CR2011-110536-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Patrick McLeod Nissley  13-1104 (F1)  MURDER 2ND DEGREE  11/2/2010  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  3/9/2011 
Patrick McLeod Nissley  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  11/2/2010  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  3/9/2011 
Patrick McLeod Nissley  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  11/2/2010  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  3/9/2011 
Patrick McLeod Nissley  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  11/2/2010  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  3/9/2011 
Patrick McLeod Nissley  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  11/2/2010  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  3/9/2011 
Patrick McLeod Nissley  13-3408 (F4)  NARCOTIC DRUG VIOLATION  11/2/2010  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  3/9/2011 
Patrick McLeod Nissley  13-1103 (F2)  MANSLAUGHTER  11/2/2010  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  6/28/2017 
Patrick McLeod Nissley  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  11/2/2010  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  6/28/2017 
Patrick McLeod Nissley  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  11/2/2010  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  6/28/2017 
Patrick McLeod Nissley  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  11/2/2010  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  6/28/2017 
Patrick McLeod Nissley  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  11/2/2010  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  6/28/2017 
Patrick McLeod Nissley  13-3408 (F4)  NARCOTIC DRUG VIOLATION  11/2/2010  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  9/20/2012 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
5/25/2021  DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet - Party (001)  5/27/2021   
3/1/2021  LED - 2.8 (d) Letter - Party (001)  3/1/2021   
8/10/2017  193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)  8/10/2017   
8/4/2017  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  8/16/2017   
8/4/2017  LET - Letter - Party (001)  8/8/2017   
8/4/2017  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  8/8/2017   
7/13/2017  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  7/13/2017   
6/28/2017  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  7/3/2017   
6/28/2017  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)  7/5/2017   
5/5/2017  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  5/5/2017   
3/22/2017  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  3/22/2017   
3/20/2017  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  3/20/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
3/1/2017  086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)  3/1/2017   
2/27/2017  ORD - Order - Party (001)  3/1/2017   
NOTE: SUPREME COURT 
2/27/2017  ORD - Order - Party (001)  3/1/2017   
NOTE: SUPREME COURT 
8/30/2016  LET - Letter - Party (001)  9/1/2016   
NOTE: FROM AZ SUPREME CT 
9/15/2014  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  9/17/2014   
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL 
9/3/2014  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)  9/4/2014   
9/3/2014  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  9/4/2014   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION 
8/27/2014  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  8/27/2014   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR POST-TRANSMISSION FILINGS 
11/12/2013  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  11/21/2013   
NOTE: APPOINTING NATALEE SEGAL AS ATTORNEY FOR APPELLANT IN THIS APPEAL 
6/13/2013  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  6/19/2013   
4/18/2013  DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (001)  4/19/2013   
NOTE: DESIGNATION OF RECORD FOR APPEAL 
3/22/2013  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  3/22/2013   
NOTE: FROM PUBLIC DEFENDER 
3/5/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/5/2013   
2/11/2013  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  2/12/2013   
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL 
1/30/2013  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  1/30/2013   
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS RECEIPT 
1/29/2013  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  2/4/2013   
NOTE: EROA 
1/29/2013  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)  2/4/2013   
NOTE: EROA 
1/10/2013  ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)  1/15/2013   
1/10/2013  ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)  1/15/2013   
12/21/2012  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  12/21/2012   
12/17/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/18/2012   
NOTE: NOTIFICATION TO COURT REPORTER NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED 
12/13/2012  NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)  12/14/2012   
NOTE: Defendants / 
12/13/2012  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  12/14/2012   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 
12/11/2012  193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)  12/11/2012   
12/7/2012  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  12/11/2012   
12/7/2012  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  12/13/2012   
12/7/2012  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  12/27/2012   
12/7/2012  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  12/27/2012   
12/4/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  12/11/2012   
NOTE: OF SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION WITH EXHIBITS 
10/30/2012  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  10/30/2012   
9/25/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/25/2012   
9/25/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/25/2012   
9/21/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/21/2012   
9/21/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/21/2012   
9/20/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/20/2012   
9/20/2012  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
9/20/2012  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  11/6/2012   
9/20/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  11/14/2012   
9/20/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: JURY DELIBERATION/ 
9/20/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED 
9/20/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED 
9/20/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED 
9/20/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED 
9/20/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED 
9/20/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED 
9/20/2012  WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING 
9/20/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: AGGRAVATION/ SIGNED 
9/20/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: AGGRAVATION/ SIGNED 
9/20/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: AGGRAVATION/ SIGNED 
9/20/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: AGGRAVATION/ SIGNED 
9/20/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: AGGRAVATION/ SIGNED 
9/19/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
9/17/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/17/2012   
9/17/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/17/2012   
9/14/2012  RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)  9/14/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S/ 
9/14/2012  RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)  9/14/2012   
NOTE: REGARDING HYPOGLYCEMIA UNAWARENESS 
9/14/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #75 
9/14/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #76 
9/14/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #77 
9/14/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #78 
9/14/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #79 
9/14/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #80 
9/13/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #67 
9/13/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #68 
9/13/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #69 
9/13/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #70 
9/13/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #71 
9/13/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #72 
9/13/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #73 
9/13/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #74 
9/11/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #66 
9/11/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #59 
9/11/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #60 
9/11/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #61 
9/11/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #62 
9/11/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #63 
9/11/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #64 
9/11/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #65 
8/31/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/31/2012   
8/30/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/30/2012   
8/30/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/30/2012   
8/29/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #47 
8/29/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #48 
8/29/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #49 
8/29/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #50 
8/29/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #51 
8/29/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #52 
8/29/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #53 
8/29/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #54 
8/29/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #55 
8/29/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #56 
8/29/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #57 
8/29/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #58 
8/28/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #40 
8/28/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #41 
8/28/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #42 
8/28/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #43 
8/28/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #44 
8/28/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #45 
8/28/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #46 
8/28/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/28/2012   
8/27/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/27/2012   
8/27/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #32 
8/27/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #33 
8/27/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #34 
8/27/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #35  
8/27/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #36 
8/27/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #37 
8/27/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #38 
8/27/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #39 
8/24/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/24/2012   
8/23/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/23/2012   
8/23/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #27 
8/23/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #28 
8/23/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #29 
8/23/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #30 
8/23/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #31 
8/22/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #22 
8/22/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #23 
8/22/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #24 
8/22/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #25 
8/22/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #26 
8/21/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/21/2012   
8/21/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #14 
8/21/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #15 
8/21/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #16 
8/21/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #17 
8/21/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #18 
8/21/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #19 
8/21/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #20 
8/21/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #21 
8/20/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #8 
8/20/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #9 
8/20/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #11 
8/20/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #12 
8/20/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #13 
8/20/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #10 
8/17/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/17/2012   
8/16/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #3 
8/16/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
8/16/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #5 
8/16/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #6 
8/16/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: #7 
8/16/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/16/2012   
8/15/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/15/2012   
8/15/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
8/15/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
8/15/2012  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: PRELIMINARY/ 
8/14/2012  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: RANDOM 
8/14/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/14/2012   
8/13/2012  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  8/13/2012   
8/9/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  8/9/2012   
8/9/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/9/2012   
8/2/2012  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  8/3/2012   
NOTE: STATES TRIAL/ 
8/1/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  8/1/2012   
NOTE: Defendants / to States Motion to Preclude Dr. John White and Diminished Capacity Defense 
8/1/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/1/2012   
NOTE: Defendants / to Preclude States Witness Christine Duemler 
7/19/2012  NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001)  7/19/2012   
NOTE: STATES SUPPLEMENTAL/ 
7/13/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  7/13/2012   
7/10/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  7/10/2012   
7/9/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  7/9/2012   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANT’S REQUESTED VOIR DIRE BY WAY OF JUROR QUESTIONAIRE 
7/3/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  7/3/2012   
NOTE: Defendants / to States Positions Raised at Oral Argument 
7/3/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/3/2012   
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE DR JOHN WHITE AND DIMINISHED CAPACITY DEFENSE 
7/2/2012  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  7/30/2012   
7/2/2012  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  7/2/2012   
7/2/2012  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  7/2/2012   
6/22/2012  STA - Statement - Party (001)  6/22/2012   
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL/ 
6/21/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/21/2012   
NOTE: Defendant's / for Court Order Controlling States Witness 
6/15/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  6/15/2012   
NOTE: Defendant's / to State's Motion in Limine Re 404(b) Evidence 
6/14/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  6/14/2012   
6/14/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  6/15/2012   
NOTE: RE Motion to Preclude Blood Test Results 
6/13/2012  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  6/13/2012   
6/12/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  6/12/2012   
NOTE: Defendants / to Allow Use of Video Trial Deposition of States Witness Eric Hudspeth 
6/8/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  6/8/2012   
NOTE: STATES / TO PRECLUDE BLOOD TEST RESULTS  
6/5/2012  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  6/5/2012   
6/5/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/5/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / OF WAIVER 
5/31/2012  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  6/1/2012   
NOTE:  
5/31/2012  STA - Statement - Party (001)  6/1/2012   
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL 
5/30/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  5/30/2012   
NOTE: States/ In Limine To Preclude Expert Opinion Testimony Re: Lack of Foundation 
5/30/2012  REQ - Request - Party (001)  5/30/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / VOIR DIRE BY WAY OF JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE  
5/29/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/7/2012   
NOTE: STATE'S/ FOR COURT TO DETERMINE WITNESS ERIC HUDSPETH IS UNAVAILABLE FOR TRIAL AND ALLOW USE OF VIDEO TRIAL DEPOSITION 
5/29/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/29/2012   
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE BLOOD TEST RESULTS 
4/26/2012  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  4/26/2012   
4/20/2012  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  4/20/2012   
NOTE: Defendants / to Preclude Expert Opinion Testimony re Lack of Foundation 
4/18/2012  SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)  4/27/2012   
4/18/2012  SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)  4/27/2012   
4/18/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  4/27/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 4-17-12 
4/18/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  4/27/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 4-17-12 
4/13/2012  STA - Statement - Party (001)  4/13/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE / SUPPLEMENT  
3/21/2012  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  3/21/2012   
3/15/2012  STA - Statement - Party (001)  3/15/2012   
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15-2 Disclosure / Supplement 
3/12/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  3/12/2012   
NOTE: TRIAL 
3/5/2012  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  3/5/2012   
NOTE: RE: 404(B) EVIDENCE 
2/8/2012  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  2/8/2012   
2/2/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  2/2/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ TRIAL 
1/26/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/26/2012   
NOTE: OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS 
1/25/2012  NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001)  1/25/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL/ 
1/19/2012  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  1/19/2012   
12/8/2011  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  12/8/2011   
12/2/2011  STA - Statement - Party (001)  12/2/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE/ SUPPLEMENT 
11/16/2011  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  11/16/2011   
10/18/2011  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  10/18/2011   
10/13/2011  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  10/14/2011   
10/13/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  10/13/2011   
10/13/2011  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)  10/13/2011   
10/6/2011  133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (001)  10/6/2011   
10/6/2011  591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001)  10/6/2011   
10/5/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  10/5/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / TO STATES NOTICE OF VIDEO TRIAL DEPOSITION  
10/4/2011  BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (001)  10/5/2011   
NOTE: SERVED 09/29/11 
10/4/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/4/2011   
NOTE: STATES/ OF VIDEO TRIAL DEPOSITION 
9/28/2011  NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)  10/4/2011   
NOTE: $100,000 PAID TO P ANTHONY NISSLEY 
9/27/2011  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)  10/4/2011   
9/27/2011  IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001)  9/28/2011   
NOTE: Issued 2011-09-27 
9/20/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/20/2011   
NOTE: TO COMPEL DISCOVERY  
9/20/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/20/2011   
NOTE: TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF MATERIAL WITNESS 
9/15/2011  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  9/15/2011   
8/5/2011  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  8/5/2011   
7/5/2011  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  7/11/2011   
7/1/2011  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  7/1/2011   
7/1/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/1/2011   
6/14/2011  STA - Statement - Party (001)  6/14/2011   
NOTE: Rule 15.2 Disclosure Statement 
6/14/2011  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  6/14/2011   
NOTE: STATES / TO REMAND FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE  
5/20/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/20/2011   
NOTE: TO SEAL MOTION TO REMAND 
5/11/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/11/2011   
5/9/2011  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  5/9/2011   
5/6/2011  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/6/2011   
5/4/2011  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  5/4/2011   
5/3/2011  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  5/4/2011   
5/3/2011  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/4/2011   
5/3/2011  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/4/2011   
4/28/2011  NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001)  4/28/2011   
NOTE:  
4/28/2011  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)  4/28/2011   
NOTE:  
4/14/2011  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)  4/15/2011   
NOTE: TO FILE RULE 12.9 MEMORANDUM 
4/5/2011  REQ - Request - Party (001)  4/5/2011   
NOTE: for Designation of Complex Criminal Case 
3/29/2011  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  4/1/2011   
NOTE: CASH BAIL 
3/28/2011  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/29/2011   
3/25/2011  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/30/2011   
3/25/2011  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/30/2011   
3/25/2011  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/30/2011   
3/22/2011  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  3/22/2011   
3/17/2011  ROR - Release Order - Party (001)  3/22/2011   
NOTE: CASH BOND $100,000 
3/15/2011  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  3/15/2011   
3/15/2011  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  3/15/2011   
3/11/2011  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)  3/14/2011   
NOTE: $100,000 
3/10/2011  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  3/10/2011   
3/10/2011  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  3/10/2011   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
3/8/2011  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  3/9/2011  Plaintiff (1)  
3/8/2011  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  3/9/2011   
3/8/2011  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  3/9/2011  Plaintiff (1)  
3/4/2011  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  3/4/2011   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
3/9/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
3/14/2011  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
3/17/2011  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
5/5/2011  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/29/2011  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/3/2011  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/19/2011  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/27/2011  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
10/6/2011  8:15   Status Conference - Post Warrant 
10/14/2011  11:00   Status Conference 
11/7/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
12/5/2011  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
12/6/2011  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/11/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/6/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/21/2012  8:00   Trial 
3/19/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/26/2012  8:00   Trial 
4/23/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/30/2012  8:00   Trial 
6/1/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
6/7/2012  8:00   Trial 
6/11/2012  8:00   Trial 
6/18/2012  13:30   Oral Argument 
6/28/2012  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
7/2/2012  9:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
8/8/2012  11:00   Oral Argument 
8/9/2012  8:00   Trial 
8/9/2012  10:30   Trial 
8/13/2012  8:00   Trial 
8/13/2012  10:30   Trial 
8/14/2012  10:30   Trial 
8/15/2012  10:30   Trial 
8/16/2012  10:30   Trial 
8/20/2012  10:30   Trial 
8/21/2012  10:30   Trial 
8/22/2012  10:30   Trial 
8/23/2012  10:30   Trial 
8/27/2012  10:30   Trial 
8/28/2012  10:30   Trial 
8/29/2012  10:30   Trial 
9/11/2012  10:30   Trial 
9/13/2012  13:00   Trial 
9/14/2012  10:30   Trial 
9/18/2012  10:30   Trial 
9/19/2012  9:30   Trial 
9/20/2012  8:30   Trial 
10/25/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
12/7/2012  9:30   Sentencing 
3/14/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
4/27/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
6/28/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
8/4/2017  13:30   Sentencing