Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Maricopa      
Michael Charles Gilliland - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Cabou, Jean   Master Calendar  CR2011-107426-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Michael Charles Gilliland  13-3212 (F2)  CHILD SEX TRAFNG  2/10/2011  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/17/2011 
Michael Charles Gilliland  13-3209 (M1)  PANDERING  2/10/2011  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  8/27/2012 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/21/2013  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  10/25/2013   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
10/21/2013  ORD - Order - Party (001)  10/28/2013   
NOTE: COUNT 1/GRANTING PETITION FOR EARNED TIME CREDIT EFFECTIVE 09/09/13 
7/17/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/17/2013   
7/8/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/8/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT MICHAEL GILLILAND’S MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION 
3/6/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/6/2013   
3/5/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/5/2013   
3/5/2013  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  3/5/2013   
2/28/2013  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  2/28/2013   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw 
2/28/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/1/2013   
NOTE: Defendant Michael Gillilands Motion for Approval of International Travel 
2/22/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/25/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT MICHAEL GILLILAND’S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO MODIFY TERMS OF PROBATION 
1/14/2013  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  1/16/2013   
1/9/2013  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  1/9/2013   
1/8/2013  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  1/10/2013   
1/8/2013  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  1/11/2013   
1/8/2013  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  1/10/2013   
NOTE: AFTER CONVICTION AND PROCEDURE 
1/7/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/7/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT MICHAEL GILLILAND’S / REGARDING LOWEST POSSIBLE RISK OF RECIDIVISM 
12/10/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  12/10/2012   
11/30/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/30/2012   
11/26/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/27/2012   
NOTE: MOTION FOR OUT-OF-COUNTRY TRAVEL 
11/19/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/20/2012   
NOTE: FOR OUT OF STATE TRAVEL  
11/14/2012  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  11/14/2012   
10/18/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/18/2012   
10/17/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/17/2012   
NOTE: Sheriff Arpaios Notice Regarding Defendants Work Release/Furlough Placement Request 
10/16/2012  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  10/16/2012   
10/15/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/15/2012   
NOTE: for Out-of-Country Travel 
10/11/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  10/11/2012   
10/10/2012  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  10/16/2012   
10/2/2012  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  10/2/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT MICHAEL GILLILAND’S 
10/2/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/3/2012   
NOTE: Unopposed /Sentencing 
9/14/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  9/14/2012   
9/13/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  9/18/2012   
NOTE: ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO TRAVEL TO THE STATE OF COLORADO 
9/12/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/12/2012   
NOTE: Motion for Out-of-State Travel 
8/31/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  8/31/2012   
8/29/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  9/4/2012   
NOTE: ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE 
8/29/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  9/4/2012   
NOTE: ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE 
8/29/2012  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  8/29/2012   
8/28/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/28/2012   
NOTE: for Out-of-State Travel 
8/28/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/28/2012   
NOTE: for Out-of-State Travel 
8/27/2012  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  8/30/2012   
8/16/2012  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)  8/16/2012   
7/23/2012  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  7/23/2012   
7/23/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/23/2012   
7/20/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  7/27/2012   
NOTE: STILL AND ELECTRONIC CAMERAS PERMITTED ONLY IN COURTROOM. NO LIGHTS ANYWHERE IN COURTHOUSE. NO CAMERAS IN HALLWAY, STAIRWELL, ELEVATOR, CAFE OR OTHER PUBLIC, PRIVATE AREAS WITHOUT JUDICIAL APPROVAL 
6/18/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  6/18/2012   
6/18/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  6/18/2012   
6/15/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/28/2012   
NOTE: ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE 
6/15/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/28/2012   
NOTE: ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE 
6/14/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/14/2012   
NOTE: FOR OUT-OF-STATE TRAVEL  
6/14/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/14/2012   
NOTE: Motion for Ou-of-State Travel 
6/11/2012  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  6/11/2012   
5/30/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  5/31/2012   
NOTE: Defendants / in Support of His Motion to Remove His Case from the Courts "High Profile" Case List 
5/25/2012  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  5/25/2012   
5/22/2012  STA - Statement - Party (001)  5/22/2012   
NOTE: Brief in Compliance with Minute Entry dated 4-24-2012 
5/18/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/18/2012   
5/17/2012  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  5/17/2012   
5/16/2012  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  5/16/2012   
5/16/2012  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  5/16/2012   
NOTE: Motion for Reconsideration 
5/11/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  5/11/2012   
5/10/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  5/21/2012   
NOTE: ALLOWING TO TRAVEL 
5/9/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/9/2012   
NOTE: for Out-of-State Travel 
5/3/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  5/3/2012   
NOTE: Unopposed / Trial 
4/25/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/26/2012   
NOTE: TO VACATE AND RESET MAY 25, 2012 ORAL ARGUMENT 
4/24/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  4/24/2012   
4/24/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/24/2012   
4/24/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  4/24/2012   
4/23/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  5/3/2012   
NOTE: ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO TRAVEL OUT OF THE COUNTRY TO LONDON, ENGLAND ON THE FOLLOWING DATES: MAY 3 -- MAY 19, 2012 
4/19/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  4/19/2012   
4/19/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/19/2012   
NOTE: Motion for Out-of-Country Travel 
4/19/2012  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  4/19/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / INDICTMENT BECAUSE OF OUTRAGEOUS GOVERNMENT CONDUCT  
4/19/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/19/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / TO REMOVE HIS CASE FROM THE COURTS HIGH PROFILE CASE LIST  
4/17/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  4/25/2012   
NOTE: ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO TRAVEL OUT OF THE STATE 
4/16/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/16/2012   
NOTE: OF CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION AND CHANGE OF ADDRESS 
4/9/2012  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  4/9/2012   
4/4/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  4/5/2012   
NOTE: TRIAL AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TIME FOR FILING PRETRIAL MOTIONS 
3/14/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/14/2012   
3/12/2012  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  3/12/2012   
3/9/2012  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)  3/15/2012   
3/9/2012  MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)  3/15/2012   
3/8/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  3/8/2012   
3/8/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  3/8/2012   
NOTE: Pretrial Conference, Motion to Continue Trail, and Motion to Continue Pretrial Motions 
3/8/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/8/2012   
NOTE: for Out-of-Country Travel 
3/1/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  3/7/2012   
NOTE: ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO TRAVEL OUT OF THE STATE 02/28 - 3/2/12 
2/23/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/23/2012   
NOTE: Motion for Out-of-State Travel 
2/14/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  2/14/2012   
2/13/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  2/16/2012   
NOTE: ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO TRAVEL OUT OF THE STATE ON THE FOLLOWING DATES FEBRUARY 21-25 2012 
2/10/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/10/2012   
NOTE: FOR OUT-OF-STATE TRAVEL  
1/25/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/25/2012   
1/24/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/24/2012   
NOTE: Motion for Out-of-Country Travel 
1/17/2012  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  1/17/2012   
12/19/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/19/2011   
NOTE: FOR OUT OF STATE TRAVEL 
12/9/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/9/2011   
12/7/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/7/2011   
NOTE: Motion for Ou-of-State Travel 
11/9/2011  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  11/9/2011   
11/3/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  11/3/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial and Motion to Continue Time for Filing Pretrial Motions 
11/3/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/3/2011   
NOTE: Motion for Out-of-Country Travel 
10/21/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/24/2011   
NOTE: Motion for Out-of-State Travel 
10/13/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  10/13/2011   
10/7/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/7/2011   
NOTE: FOR OUT-OF-STATE TRAVEL 
10/6/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/6/2011   
NOTE: Motion for Out-of-State Travel 
9/22/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  9/22/2011   
9/16/2011  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  9/16/2011   
9/16/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/16/2011   
NOTE: FOR OUT OF STATE TRAVEL 
9/15/2011  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)  9/16/2011   
9/15/2011  MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)  9/16/2011   
NOTE: ACCEPTING JURISDICTION OF PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR SPECIAL ACTION & DENYING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR AN ORDER REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE 
9/14/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  9/14/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial and Motion to Continue Time for Filing Pretrial Motions 
8/4/2011  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  8/4/2011   
8/4/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/4/2011   
7/28/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/28/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO TRAVEL OUT-OF-STATE (EXPEDITED RULING REQUESTED) 
7/12/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  7/12/2011   
7/5/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  7/5/2011   
6/27/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  6/28/2011   
NOTE: Defendants Response to States Notice of Objection to Defendants First Supplemental Discovery Request and Alternative Motion for Excision Order 
6/24/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/24/2011   
NOTE: Motion for Out-of-Country Travel 
6/20/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/20/2011   
NOTE: OF OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY REQUEST AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR EXCISION ORDER 
6/14/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  6/14/2011   
5/26/2011  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  5/26/2011   
5/23/2011  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  5/23/2011   
5/20/2011  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)  5/20/2011   
5/20/2011  STA - Statement - Party (001)  5/31/2011   
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/ 
5/17/2011  REL - Reply - Party (001)  5/17/2011   
NOTE: Defendants Reply in Support of His Motion to Remand to the Grand Jury 
5/9/2011  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)  5/9/2011   
NOTE: Defendants First Supplemental Motion for Discovery 
5/5/2011  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  5/5/2011   
5/4/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  5/6/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO REMAND 
5/3/2011  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  5/3/2011   
4/20/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/20/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Remand to the Grand Jury 
4/20/2011  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  4/21/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices 
4/18/2011  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)  4/18/2011   
NOTE: Motion for Discovery 
3/28/2011  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  3/28/2011   
3/28/2011  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/29/2011   
3/22/2011  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/24/2011   
3/22/2011  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/24/2011   
3/22/2011  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/24/2011   
3/18/2011  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  3/18/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses 
3/18/2011  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  3/18/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Extend Time for Filing Motion for Remand Pursuant to Rule 12.9 
3/17/2011  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/22/2011   
3/14/2011  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/16/2011   
3/14/2011  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/16/2011   
3/14/2011  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/16/2011   
3/14/2011  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  3/14/2011   
3/11/2011  BON - Bond - Party (001)  3/15/2011   
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY BOND $12,000 ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY 
3/11/2011  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)  3/11/2011   
NOTE:  
3/11/2011  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  3/11/2011   
NOTE:  
3/3/2011  UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name - Party (001)  3/9/2011  Defendant (2)  
2/23/2011  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  2/23/2011   
2/22/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  2/22/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Continue Not Guilty Arraignment 
2/18/2011  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  2/18/2011   
2/16/2011  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  2/16/2011   
NOTE:  
2/16/2011  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  2/17/2011  Plaintiff (1)  
2/16/2011  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  2/17/2011   
2/16/2011  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  2/17/2011  Plaintiff (1)  
2/14/2011  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  2/14/2011   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
2/17/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
2/22/2011  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
2/24/2011  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
3/3/2011  8:30   Arraignment Hearing 
4/21/2011  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
5/19/2011  9:30   Oral Argument 
5/20/2011  8:15   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
6/13/2011  13:30   Oral Argument 
7/8/2011  11:00   Oral Argument 
8/2/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/2/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/9/2011  8:00   Trial 
9/14/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/19/2011  8:00   Trial 
11/7/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
11/14/2011  8:00   Trial 
1/12/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/19/2012  8:00   Trial 
3/8/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/15/2012  8:00   Trial 
4/5/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/12/2012  8:00   Trial 
5/25/2012  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
6/7/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
6/7/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
6/8/2012  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
6/8/2012  14:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
6/11/2012  8:00   Trial 
6/12/2012  10:30   Settlement Conference 
7/19/2012  13:30   Settlement Conference 
7/25/2012  11:30   Status Conference 
8/15/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/27/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/6/2012  8:00   Trial 
10/9/2012  8:30   Sentencing 
10/15/2012  9:30   Sentencing 
11/13/2012  10:30   Sentencing 
1/8/2013  10:30   Sentencing