« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Maricopa      
Shari Lee Tobyne - (2)
 
Defendant  F   BEVILACQUA, GARY   Duncan  CR2011-006434-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Shari Lee Tobyne  13-1105 (F1)  MURDER 1ST DEGREE  11/24/2009  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  5/17/2013 
Shari Lee Tobyne  13-2926 (F5)  ABAND/CONCEAL DEAD BODY/PARTS  11/24/2009  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  5/17/2013 
Shari Lee Tobyne  13-2310 (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  11/24/2009  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  5/17/2013 
Shari Lee Tobyne  13-2310 (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  12/13/2009  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  5/17/2013 
Shari Lee Tobyne  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  12/13/2009  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  5/17/2013 
Shari Lee Tobyne  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  11/23/2009  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  5/17/2013 
Shari Lee Tobyne  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  11/26/2009  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  5/17/2013 
Shari Lee Tobyne  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  12/23/2009  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  5/17/2013 
Shari Lee Tobyne  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  12/28/2009  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  5/17/2013 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
5/21/2013  193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)  5/21/2013   
5/21/2013  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  5/21/2013   
5/17/2013  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  5/21/2013   
5/17/2013  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  5/29/2013   
5/17/2013  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  5/30/2013   
5/17/2013  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  5/22/2013   
5/14/2013  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  5/14/2013   
5/2/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  5/3/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
5/2/2013  RES - Response - Party (001)  5/3/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FROM PLEA AND MOTION TO STRIKE STATE’S MOTION TO WITHDRAW
5/1/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/1/2013   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FROM PLEA AGREEMENT
4/1/2013  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  4/5/2013   
2/8/2013  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  2/8/2013   
2/6/2013  RES - Response - Party (001)  2/6/2013   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO STRIKE STATE’S ALLEGATION OF “CRUEL, HEINOUS OR DEPRAVED” AGGRAVATING FACTOR (SEPARATION OF POWERS)
1/23/2013  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  1/23/2013   
1/15/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/16/2013   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE TO COURT OF DEFENSE’S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH DISCLOSURE
1/14/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/14/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / TO STRIKE STATES ALLEGATION OF HEINOUS CRUEL OR DEPRAVED
1/10/2013  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  1/10/2013   
12/28/2012  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  1/7/2013   
12/10/2012  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  12/10/2012   
11/29/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  11/29/2012   
11/8/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  11/8/2012   
10/10/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  10/11/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ TO STATES MEMORANDUM
10/9/2012  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  10/9/2012   
NOTE: STATES / REGARDING REINITIATION OF CONTACT FOLLOWING THE INVOCATION OF THE RIGHT TO COUNSEL
10/2/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  10/2/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE
10/1/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: TO DISQUALIFY THE COUNTY ATTORNEY’S OFFICE
9/28/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  9/28/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S/ TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR DEPOSITION
9/25/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  9/26/2012   
NOTE: STATES/ FOR DEPOSITION
9/24/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  9/24/2012   
9/24/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  9/24/2012   
9/21/2012  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  10/10/2012   
NOTE: DEFENSE/ RE: POLICE AGENT AND REINITIATION OF CONTACT
9/20/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/20/2012   
9/20/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  9/20/2012   
9/19/2012  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  9/19/2012   
NOTE: REGARDING DISQUALIFICATION OF THE COUNTY ATTORNEY’S OFFICE
9/19/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/19/2012   
NOTE: for Deposition
9/19/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/19/2012   
NOTE: FOR DEPOSITION
9/18/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/19/2012   
NOTE: TO STAY PROCEEDINGS
9/18/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/19/2012   
NOTE: TO DISQUALIFY THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE
9/14/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  9/14/2012   
9/7/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  9/7/2012   
NOTE: Defendants / to States 9-5-2012 Motion re: Franks Hearing
9/5/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/10/2012   
NOTE: STATES / TO DENY DEFENSE REQUEST FOR FRANKS HEARING
9/5/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/5/2012   
NOTE: TO DENY DEFENSE REQUEST FOR FRANKS HEARING
9/5/2012  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/7/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 09/04/12
9/5/2012  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/7/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 09/04/12
9/5/2012  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/7/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 09/04/12
9/5/2012  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/7/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 09/04/12
9/5/2012  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/7/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 09/04/12
8/30/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/30/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ RE FRANKS HEARING
8/28/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  8/28/2012   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR PROBABLE CAUSE HEARING
8/27/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/28/2012   
NOTE: STATE’S SUBMISSION TO COURT OF TRANSCRIPT FROM AUGUST 12, 2010 AND VIDEO/AUDIO RECORDINGS FROM AUGUST 12-13, 2010
8/27/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/28/2012   
NOTE: STATES SUBMISSION TO COURT OF AUDIO RECORDINGS
8/23/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/23/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ ON MOTION TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE OBTAINED PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-3905 ILLEGAL SEARCH
8/23/2012  REQ - Request - Party (001)  8/23/2012   
NOTE: FOR PROBABLE CAUSE HEARING
8/23/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/23/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ TO SEARCH TO DEFENDANTS HONDA AUTOMOBILE
8/23/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/23/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ ON MOTION TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS(24 MINUTE INTERROGATION)
8/17/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  8/17/2012   
8/13/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/13/2012   
NOTE: TO STRIKE STATE’S “SUPPLEMENTAL” PLEADING alternatively DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE
8/13/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/14/2012   
NOTE: TO STRIKE STATES SUPPLMENTAL PLEADING ALTERNATIVELY DEFENDANTS RESPONSE (AMENDED)
8/10/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  8/17/2012   
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE OBTIANED PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-3905 BASED ON AN ALLEGED ILLEGAL SEARCH
8/10/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  8/17/2012   
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE BASED ON ALLEGED ILLEGAL SEIZURE AND SEACH OF DEFENDANT'S CAR
8/10/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  8/17/2012   
NOTE: SECOND / TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS
8/9/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  8/14/2012   
NOTE: AMENDED / TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE OBTAINED PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-3905 (STATUE UNCONSTITUTIONAL)
8/9/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  8/9/2012   
NOTE: STATES/ TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE OBTAINED PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-3905 (STATUTE UNCONSTITUTIONAL)
8/9/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  8/9/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO STATES/ TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE FROM FORD TRUCK
8/8/2012  REQ - Request - Party (001)  8/9/2012   
NOTE: TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT IN ITS RESPONSES TO TWO OF DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS TO SUPPRESS
8/7/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  8/7/2012   
NOTE: STATES/ TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE OBTAINED PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-3905 (STATUTE UNCONSTITUTIONAL)
8/7/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/7/2012   
NOTE: REPLY ON MOTION TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO A.R.S. 13-3905 (STATUTE CHALLENGE)
7/31/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/31/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S “MEMORANDUM” RE ORAL ARGUMENT AND HEARINGS
7/30/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  7/30/2012   
NOTE: ON MOTION TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE FROM FORD TRUCK
7/26/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  7/26/2012   
NOTE: STATES / TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE FROM FORD TRUCK
7/26/2012  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  7/26/2012   
NOTE: STATES / REGARDING THE HOLDING OF ORAL ARGUMENT AND/OR EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS NUMEROUS MOTIONS
7/20/2012  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  7/20/2012   
7/16/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/17/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ TO STATES MOTIONS TO STRIKE OR ALTERNATIVELY REQUEST FOR EXTENSTION OF TIME
7/16/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/17/2012   
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE FROM FOR TRUCK
7/13/2012  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  7/16/2012   
NOTE: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE OBTAINED PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 3905
7/13/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/16/2012   
NOTE: TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE OBTAINED PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-3905
7/13/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/16/2012   
NOTE: STATES/ TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S SECOND MOTION TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS
7/13/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/16/2012   
NOTE: STATES/ TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS
7/10/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/10/2012   
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE OBTAINED PURSUANT TO ARS § 13-3905
7/10/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/10/2012   
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE
7/10/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/10/2012   
NOTE: SECOND / TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS
7/9/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/9/2012   
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE OBTAINED PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-3905
6/29/2012  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  6/29/2012   
5/15/2012  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  5/15/2012   
5/14/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  5/14/2012   
5/2/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  5/2/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS
5/1/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  5/1/2012   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE
4/30/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/30/2012   
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE STATE RESPONSE PLEADING AND ENTER RULING BASED ON DEFENSE MOTION AFTER ORAL ARGUMENT
4/30/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/1/2012   
NOTE: DEFENANT’S SECOND / TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE
4/26/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  4/26/2012   
4/23/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  5/4/2012   
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS
4/23/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  5/16/2012   
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS
4/20/2012  REQ - Request - Party (001)  4/20/2012   
NOTE: TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT IN ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTIONS TO SUPPRESS
4/11/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/11/2012   
NOTE: TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE
3/1/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  3/1/2012   
2/29/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  2/29/2012   
2/27/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/27/2012   
NOTE: TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS
2/27/2012  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/27/2012   
NOTE: FOR PAGE LIMIT EXTENSION
2/15/2012  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  2/15/2012   
2/8/2012  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  2/8/2012   
NOTE: VOLUNTARINESS
2/8/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/8/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS /TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS
2/8/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/8/2012   
NOTE: FOR PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION AS TO STATE’S ALLEGATION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-702 et al, 702.01 et al, and RULE 13.5(C), Ariz.R.Crim.Pro.
1/20/2012  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  1/20/2012   
NOTE: RULE 609
1/20/2012  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  1/20/2012   
NOTE:
11/7/2011  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  11/7/2011   
11/3/2011  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  11/3/2011   
11/1/2011  REP - Report - Party (001)  11/1/2011   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
10/31/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  10/31/2011   
10/17/2011  REL - Reply - Party (001)  10/17/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY
10/7/2011  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  10/11/2011   
NOTE: TO STRIKE STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISS COUNT 1
9/28/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/28/2011   
NOTE: TO STRIKE NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISS COUNT 1
9/23/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  9/23/2011   
9/12/2011  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  9/12/2011   
9/8/2011  REL - Reply - Party (001)  9/8/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
8/31/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  9/8/2011   
NOTE: TO MENTAL HEALTH EVALUATION AND SCREENING
8/30/2011  REP - Report - Party (001)  8/30/2011   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
8/30/2011  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  8/31/2011   
NOTE: FOR DISCOVERY
8/26/2011  960 ME: Capital Case Assignment and Scheduling Order - Party (001)  8/26/2011   
8/26/2011  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  8/26/2011   
8/24/2011  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)  8/26/2011   
8/22/2011  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  8/22/2011   
8/19/2011  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/22/2011   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM/SERVED 08/17/11
8/18/2011  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  8/19/2011   
8/17/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/17/2011   
NOTE: MOTION TO SET STATUS CONFERENCE BEFORE PRESIDING CRIMINAL JUDGE, FOR ASSIGNMENT TO TRIAL DIVISION AND TO VACATE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED TRIAL AND ALL HEARINGS
8/17/2011  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)  8/18/2011   
NOTE: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
8/17/2011  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  8/18/2011   
8/17/2011  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  8/18/2011   
8/17/2011  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  8/18/2011   
8/11/2011  NID - Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty - Party (001)  8/11/2011   
NOTE: TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY NOTICE OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND WITNESSES
8/1/2011  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  8/12/2011   
7/27/2011  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  7/28/2011   
7/27/2011  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/28/2011   
7/27/2011  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/28/2011   
7/25/2011  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  7/25/2011   
7/21/2011  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  7/21/2011   
7/20/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/20/2011   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS VERBAL REQUEST FOR AN AVOWAL FROM THE STATE REGARDING DEATH PENALTY
7/19/2011  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  7/19/2011   
7/18/2011  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  7/18/2011   
7/18/2011  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  7/19/2011   
NOTE:
7/11/2011  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  7/12/2011   
NOTE: SERVED 07/8/11
7/7/2011  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  7/12/2011   
7/7/2011  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  7/12/2011   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
7/14/2011  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
7/19/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
7/21/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
8/24/2011  11:00   Status Conference 
8/29/2011  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
8/31/2011  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/16/2011  13:30   Settlement Conference 
11/2/2011  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/8/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/9/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/25/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
9/14/2012  10:00   Oral Argument 
9/21/2012  10:00   Probable Cause Hearing 
1/16/2013  9:00   Status Conference 
1/17/2013  9:00   Status Conference 
4/1/2013  9:00   Change Of Plea 
4/12/2013  9:00   Oral Argument 
5/17/2013  10:00   Change Of Plea 
5/17/2013  10:00   Sentencing 
6/24/2013  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/30/2013  10:00   Trial 
click here for Law Library Resource Center