« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Lawson, Todd
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Peter CanovaIII - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Donau, Alfred
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2011-005543-001
Party Name
Gina Thi Canova - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Donau, Alfred
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2011-005543-002
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2011-005543-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Peter Canova III 
Crime Date
1/24/2007
Date
6/28/2011
Description
FALSE VOTER REGISTRATION
ARSCode
16-182 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Peter Canova III 
Crime Date
1/28/2008
Date
6/28/2011
Description
ILLEGAL VOTING
ARSCode
16-1016 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Peter Canova III 
Crime Date
10/9/2008
Date
6/28/2011
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ILLEGAL VOTING
ARSCode
16-1016 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Peter Canova III 
Crime Date
10/9/2008
Date
6/28/2011
Description
ILLEGAL VOTING
ARSCode
16-1016 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Peter Canova III 
Crime Date
1/28/2008
Date
6/28/2011
Description
PUB RCDS-FALSE INSTRMT FILING
ARSCode
39-161 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Peter Canova III 
Crime Date
10/9/2008
Date
6/28/2011
Description
PUB RCDS-FALSE INSTRMT FILING
ARSCode
39-161 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Gina Thi Canova 
Crime Date
12/4/2006
Date
6/28/2011
Description
FALSE VOTER REGISTRATION
ARSCode
16-182 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Gina Thi Canova 
Crime Date
10/9/2008
Date
5/12/2011
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ILLEGAL VOTING
ARSCode
16-1016 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Gina Thi Canova 
Crime Date
10/9/2008
Date
6/28/2011
Description
ILLEGAL VOTING
ARSCode
16-1016 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Gina Thi Canova 
Crime Date
10/21/2009
Date
6/28/2011
Description
ILLEGAL VOTING
ARSCode
16-1016 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Gina Thi Canova 
Crime Date
5/24/2010
Date
6/28/2011
Description
ILLEGAL VOTING
ARSCode
16-1016 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Gina Thi Canova 
Crime Date
8/11/2010
Date
6/28/2011
Description
ILLEGAL VOTING
ARSCode
16-1016 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Gina Thi Canova 
Crime Date
10/21/2009
Date
6/28/2011
Description
PUB RCDS-FALSE INSTRMT FILING
ARSCode
39-161 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Gina Thi Canova 
Crime Date
10/9/2008
Date
6/28/2011
Description
PUB RCDS-FALSE INSTRMT FILING
ARSCode
39-161 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Gina Thi Canova 
Crime Date
8/11/2010
Date
6/28/2011
Description
PUB RCDS-FALSE INSTRMT FILING
ARSCode
39-161 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2014
Description
OSJ - Order re: Setting Aside Judgment of Guilt - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2014
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/8/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
CFO INFO
Filing Date
12/13/2013
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/13/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT
Filing Date
4/15/2013
Description
OSJ - Order re: Setting Aside Judgment of Guilt - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2013
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
CFO INFO
Filing Date
2/28/2013
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT
Filing Date
2/19/2013
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DENIED SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT
Filing Date
2/7/2013
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DENIED SET ASIDE JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/1/2013
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
CFO INFO
Filing Date
2/1/2013
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
CFO INFO
Filing Date
1/10/2013
Description
ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
1/10/2013
Description
ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
9/14/2012
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 5
Filing Date
8/2/2012
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 5
Filing Date
7/31/2012
Description
ODM - Order of Discharge from Probation - Misdemeanor Designation - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/6/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 9
Filing Date
7/31/2012
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 9
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTION OF MISAPPLIED PAYMENTS
Filing Date
6/30/2011
Description
110 - ME: Suspension Of Sentence - Unsupervised Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2011
Description
110 - ME: Suspension Of Sentence - Unsupervised Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2011
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2011
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2011
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2011
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2011
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2011
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2011
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/24/2011
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/16/2011
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2011
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2011
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2011
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2011
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2011
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2011
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-701 (D)
Filing Date
4/12/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S DISCLOSURE NOTICE PURSUANT TO RULE 15, ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
4/12/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S DISCLOSURE NOTICE PURSUANT TO RULE 15, ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
4/12/2011
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-701 (D)
Filing Date
3/24/2011
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2011
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR HANDWRITING SPECIMEN
Filing Date
3/14/2011
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/23/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2011
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2011
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/14/2011
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name - Party (001,002)
Docket Date
3/23/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/14/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR HANDWRITING SPECIMEN
Filing Date
3/8/2011
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
3/8/2011
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
3/4/2011
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT SERVED 03/03/11 SUMMONS REISSUED AS SUMMONS
Filing Date
3/4/2011
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/03/2011
Filing Date
3/4/2011
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/03/2011
Filing Date
3/3/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2011
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2011
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2011
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2011
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/4/2011
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/14/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/14/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/28/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/28/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/12/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/12/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/26/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
5/26/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
6/28/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Sentencing
Date
6/28/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/3/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/3/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/10/2011
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/10/2011
Time
8:00
Event
Trial