« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, T P C Appeals
Judge
Case #
Party Name
David Carl Rogers - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Defender, Public
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2010-167374-003
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Townsend, Corwin
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2010-167374-002
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2010-167374-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
David Carl Rogers 
Crime Date
12/26/2010
Date
1/5/2011
Description
BURGLARY 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1507 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
12/26/2010
Date
1/28/2011
Description
BURGLARY 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1507 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
12/26/2010
Date
1/28/2011
Description
DANGEROUS DRUG VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3407 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
12/26/2010
Date
1/28/2011
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3415 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
David Carl Rogers 
Crime Date
12/26/2010
Date
8/18/2011
Description
BURGLARY 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1507 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
12/26/2010
Date
6/18/2012
Description
BURGLARY 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1507 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
12/26/2010
Date
7/25/2012
Description
DANGEROUS DRUG VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3407 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
12/26/2010
Date
7/25/2012
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3415 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2016
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM COA, DIV 2
Filing Date
11/20/2015
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVIEW GRANTED; RELIEF DENIED W/RELATED CASES CR2010-162274-001 AND CR2011-131784-002
Filing Date
10/8/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER FROM COA:DIV 1 TO DIV 2 RE:TRANSFER OF CASE
Filing Date
10/8/2015
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM COA DIV 1 TO DIV 2 RE; TRANSFER OF CASE
Filing Date
9/24/2015
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY RESTITUTION ORDER
Filing Date
9/16/2015
Description
067 - ME: Stipulation And Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2015
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2015
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/14/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2015
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2015
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR A RESTITUTION ORDER
Filing Date
7/10/2015
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2015
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES REQUEST FOR A RESTITUTION HEARING
Filing Date
5/29/2014
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/29/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
4/18/2014
Description
AIN - Amended Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/27/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Petition for Review from Dismissal of Petition for Post-Conviction Relief
Filing Date
2/25/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/18/2014
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/19/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR 10-DAY EXTENSION IN WHICH TO FILE PETITION FOR REVIEW
Filing Date
1/23/2014
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2014
Description
597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2013
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply in Support of Petition for Post-Conviction Relief
Filing Date
11/21/2013
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2013
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
11/1/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2013
Description
RPP - Response to Petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2013
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
8/14/2013
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/14/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2013
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2013
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Post-Conviction Relief (Second Request)
Filing Date
5/1/2013
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
03/30/2012 BY LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY
Filing Date
3/7/2013
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ADDITIONAL TRANSCRIPT AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
1/3/2013
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2012
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
06/18/12 YVONNE M DE LA TORRE
Filing Date
11/19/2012
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2012
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
07/25/12 Sentencing, YVONNE M DE LA TORRE
Filing Date
11/15/2012
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
6-18-12 and 7-25-12 transcripts
Filing Date
9/19/2012
Description
595 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2012
Description
RPR - Request for Preparation of Record - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/14/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
9/13/2012
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/14/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
8/1/2012
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2012
Description
193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2012
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2012
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2012
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2012
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2012
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2012
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2012
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/8/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
6/4/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S STATUS UPDATE ON UPCOMING TRIALS
Filing Date
5/8/2012
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/8/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2012
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/24/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/26/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2012
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2012
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL HEARING
Filing Date
3/14/2012
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2012
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2012
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/2/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2012
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
1/23/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2012
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPRESS
Filing Date
1/19/2012
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS STATEMENTS
Filing Date
1/11/2012
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/9/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
12/21/2011
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/21/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
12/20/2011
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
12/20/2011
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
12/16/2011
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2011
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/16/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
12/14/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/19/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO SUPPRESS
Filing Date
12/14/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/19/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS STATEMENTS
Filing Date
12/14/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/19/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO SUPPRESS
Filing Date
12/9/2011
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / RULE 609
Filing Date
10/3/2011
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/19/2011
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/19/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2011
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2011
Description
AEB - Affidavit for Exoneration of Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR BOND EXONERATION
Filing Date
8/30/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR BOND EXONERATION
Filing Date
8/22/2011
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/9/2011
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/9/2011
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
7/13/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPRESS
Filing Date
7/7/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS STATEMENTS
Filing Date
7/7/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPRESS
Filing Date
7/6/2011
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2011
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2011
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
7/6/2011
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/27/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
6/27/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
6/21/2011
Description
BON - Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/21/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $3600 SAFETY NATIONAL CASUALTY CORP
Filing Date
6/21/2011
Description
196 - ME: Bond Exonerated - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
motion to suppress
Filing Date
6/16/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/16/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPRESS
Filing Date
6/16/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/16/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS STATEMENTS
Filing Date
6/14/2011
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2011
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/19/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2011
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR BOND EXONERATION
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2011
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/29/2011
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2011
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2011
Description
STA - Statement - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
3/10/2011
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/10/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2011
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
for temporary removal of official court files, transcript or exhibits
Filing Date
3/4/2011
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2011
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2011
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/3/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/3/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF REQUEST FOR DEFENSE INTERVIEW WITH VICTIM
Filing Date
2/25/2011
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2011
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/25/2011
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
2/25/2011
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/25/2011
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/25/2011
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION
Filing Date
2/25/2011
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/25/2011
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/24/2011
Description
STA - Statement - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
2/23/2011
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses
Filing Date
2/23/2011
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Extension of Time
Filing Date
2/23/2011
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Discovery
Filing Date
2/10/2011
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/10/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2011
Description
BON - Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $9500 SAFETY NATIONAL CASUALTY CORP
Filing Date
2/8/2011
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/8/2011
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
2/8/2011
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/8/2011
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
2/8/2011
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/7/2011
Description
DRO - Indigent Defense Reimbursement Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2011
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/9/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
2/1/2011
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/1/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2011
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2011
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/28/2011
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/27/2011
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2011
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/28/2011
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/27/2011
Description
NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL
Filing Date
1/26/2011
Description
NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2011
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2011
Description
185 - ME: Bw Quashed/Case Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2011
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/12/11
Filing Date
1/20/2011
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2011
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Quashed 2011-01-20
Filing Date
1/19/2011
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
$9500
Filing Date
1/13/2011
Description
DRO - Indigent Defense Reimbursement Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/26/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2011
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/21/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
$5,040
Filing Date
1/13/2011
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/24/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
1/11/2011
Description
BON - Bond - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $5040 INTERNATIONAL CREDIT OF NORTH AMERICA REINSURANCE, INC.
Filing Date
1/10/2011
Description
BON - Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $5040 ACCREDITED SURETY & CASUALTY COMPANY, INC.
Filing Date
1/7/2011
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2011
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2011
Description
NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2011
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2011
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2011
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2011
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/5/2011
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/4/2011
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2011
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/5/2011
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/4/2011
Description
NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL
Filing Date
12/28/2010
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/28/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/2010
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/28/2010
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/3/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/3/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/5/2011
Time
8:29
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
1/5/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference - Post Warrant
Date
1/5/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
1/13/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/19/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference - Post Warrant
Date
1/26/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/31/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/7/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/8/2011
Time
13:30
Event
Bond Forfeiture Hearing
Date
2/24/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
3/24/2011
Time
8:20
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
3/28/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/3/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
5/12/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference - Post Warrant
Date
6/2/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/9/2011
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/14/2011
Time
13:30
Event
Bond Forfeiture Hearing
Date
6/30/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/30/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/7/2011
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/7/2011
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/19/2011
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
9/7/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/7/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/14/2011
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/14/2011
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/14/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/27/2011
Time
14:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
12/7/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/14/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/10/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/3/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/14/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/17/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/21/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/2/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/12/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/12/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/12/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/16/2012
Time
14:30
Event
Hearing Pending Motion
Date
3/30/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/20/2012
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/5/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/8/2012
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
6/12/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/14/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/18/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/18/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/17/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/25/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/31/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Restitution Hearing
Date
8/3/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference