Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | County Attorney, Maricopa | ||
Nelson Douglas Johnson - (2) |
Defendant | M | Defender, Public | Master Calendar | CR2010-166303-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Nelson Douglas Johnson | 13-1506 (F5) | ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - BURGLARY 3RD DEGREE | 12/19/2010 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 1/18/2011 |
Nelson Douglas Johnson | 13-2508 (F6) | RESISTING ARREST | 12/19/2010 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 1/18/2011 |
Nelson Douglas Johnson | 13-1505 (F6) | BURGLARY TOOLS POSSESSION | 12/19/2010 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 1/18/2011 |
Nelson Douglas Johnson | 13-2904 (M1) | DISORDERLY CONDUCT | 12/19/2010 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 1/18/2011 |
Nelson Douglas Johnson | 13-1506 (F5) | ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - BURGLARY 3RD DEGREE | 12/19/2010 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 5/9/2011 |
Nelson Douglas Johnson | 13-1505 (F6) | BURGLARY TOOLS POSSESSION | 12/19/2010 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 5/9/2011 |
Nelson Douglas Johnson | 13-2508 (F6) | RESISTING ARREST | 12/19/2010 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 4/7/2011 |
Nelson Douglas Johnson | 13-2904 (M1) | DISORDERLY CONDUCT | 12/19/2010 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 5/9/2011 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
5/25/2011 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 5/26/2011 | |
5/11/2011 | 193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001) | 5/11/2011 | |
5/9/2011 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 5/12/2011 | |
5/9/2011 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 5/13/2011 | |
5/2/2011 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 5/17/2011 | |
4/11/2011 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 4/11/2011 | |
4/7/2011 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 4/12/2011 | |
4/7/2011 | RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001) | 4/12/2011 | |
3/29/2011 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 3/31/2011 | |
3/28/2011 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 3/29/2011 | |
NOTE: for temporary removal of official court files, transcripts or exhibits | |||
3/28/2011 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 3/29/2011 | |
3/28/2011 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 3/29/2011 | |
3/16/2011 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/16/2011 | |
3/3/2011 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 3/3/2011 | |
3/1/2011 | ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (001) | 3/9/2011 | |
3/1/2011 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 3/7/2011 | |
NOTE: THAT THE DEFENDANT SUMBIT TO THE TAKING OF FINGERPRINTS | |||
2/24/2011 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 2/24/2011 | |
NOTE: FOR COURT INTERPRETER | |||
2/24/2011 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/24/2011 | |
NOTE: FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE | |||
2/24/2011 | ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001) | 2/24/2011 | |
NOTE: | |||
2/24/2011 | RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001) | 2/24/2011 | |
NOTE: RULE 609 | |||
2/24/2011 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001) | 2/24/2011 | |
NOTE: | |||
2/24/2011 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 2/24/2011 | |
NOTE: | |||
2/9/2011 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 2/9/2011 | |
2/3/2011 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001) | 2/3/2011 | |
2/2/2011 | MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001) | 2/2/2011 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR DISCOVERY | |||
2/2/2011 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/2/2011 | |
NOTE: INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS | |||
2/2/2011 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 2/2/2011 | |
NOTE: TO FILE MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY | |||
2/2/2011 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 2/2/2011 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES | |||
2/2/2011 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 2/2/2011 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
2/2/2011 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/2/2011 | |
NOTE: FOR DISCLOSURE OF SPECIFIC ITEMS OF EVIDENCE | |||
1/28/2011 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001) | 2/1/2011 | |
NOTE: $1800 | |||
1/27/2011 | NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (001) | 1/27/2011 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR CHANGE OF JUDGE | |||
1/26/2011 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 1/26/2011 | |
1/24/2011 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 1/24/2011 | |
1/14/2011 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001) | 1/14/2011 | |
1/14/2011 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 1/18/2011 | Plaintiff (1) |
1/14/2011 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 1/18/2011 | |
1/14/2011 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 1/18/2011 | Plaintiff (1) |
1/14/2011 | NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001) | 1/18/2011 | |
NOTE: INITIAL | |||
1/13/2011 | NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001) | 1/19/2011 | |
12/29/2010 | 584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001) | 12/29/2010 | |
12/29/2010 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 12/29/2010 | |
12/28/2010 | OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001) | 12/30/2010 | |
12/22/2010 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 12/22/2010 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
12/27/2010 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
12/30/2010 | 8:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
1/13/2011 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
1/20/2011 | 8:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
1/24/2011 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
3/11/2011 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
4/7/2011 | 8:16 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
5/9/2011 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
5/16/2011 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/23/2011 | 8:00 | Trial |