Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Maricopa      
William Franklin HughesIII - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Defender, Public   Hartsell  CR2010-157924-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
William Franklin Hughes III  13-1602 (M2)  CRIMINAL DAMAGE  10/29/2010  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  3/17/2011 
William Franklin Hughes III  13-1402 (M1)  INDECENT EXPOSURE  10/29/2010  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  3/17/2011 
William Franklin Hughes III  13-1402 (F6)  INDECENT EXPOSURE  10/29/2010  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/26/2011 
William Franklin Hughes III  13-1402 (F6)  INDECENT EXPOSURE  10/29/2010  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/26/2011 
William Franklin Hughes III  13-1402 (M1)  INDECENT EXPOSURE  10/29/2010  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/26/2011 
William Franklin Hughes III  13-2904 (M1)  DISORDERLY CONDUCT  10/29/2010  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/26/2011 
William Franklin Hughes III  13-1402 (M1)  INDECENT EXPOSURE  10/29/2010  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/26/2011 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
5/7/2012  049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (001)  5/7/2012   
5/3/2012  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  5/15/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
5/3/2012  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  5/15/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 2 
5/3/2012  CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)  5/21/2012   
3/28/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/28/2012   
3/27/2012  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  3/29/2012   
3/27/2012  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  3/30/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 2 
3/27/2012  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  3/30/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
10/19/2011  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)  11/1/2011   
5/13/2011  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  5/16/2011   
4/29/2011  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  4/29/2011   
4/27/2011  NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)  4/29/2011   
NOTE: $900 PAID TO WILLIAM HUGHES 
4/26/2011  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  5/4/2011   
4/26/2011  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)  4/29/2011   
4/26/2011  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  5/2/2011   
4/26/2011  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  5/2/2011   
4/26/2011  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  5/2/2011   
4/21/2011  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  4/21/2011   
NOTE: Sentencing Memorandum and Notice of Filing Letter 
3/22/2011  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  3/22/2011   
3/17/2011  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  3/23/2011   
3/10/2011  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  3/10/2011   
NOTE:  
3/4/2011  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  3/4/2011   
3/1/2011  STA - Statement - Party (001)  3/10/2011   
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/ 
2/28/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/1/2011   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL/OF DISCLOSURE 
2/4/2011  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  2/4/2011   
1/24/2011  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  1/24/2011   
1/13/2011  123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001)  1/13/2011   
1/11/2011  RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)  1/11/2011   
NOTE: Request for Automatic Disclosure Required by Rule 15.1(a) and (b) and Additional Disclosure Required by Rule 15.1(c) 
1/11/2011  STA - Statement - Party (001)  1/11/2011   
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.2 Disclosure Statement 
1/6/2011  SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)  1/24/2011   
1/6/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  2/2/2011   
12/30/2010  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  12/30/2010   
NOTE:  
12/23/2010  122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)  12/23/2010   
12/20/2010  OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)  12/22/2010   
12/15/2010  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  12/15/2010   
12/15/2010  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)  12/16/2010   
NOTE: $900 
12/13/2010  122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)  12/13/2010   
12/9/2010  STP - Stipulation - Party (001)  12/9/2010   
NOTE: Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel 
12/5/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/6/2010   
NOTE: Invocation of 5th and 6th Amendment Rights 
11/15/2010  NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001)  11/16/2010   
NOTE: INITIAL 
11/12/2010  120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)  11/12/2010   
11/10/2010  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  11/10/2010   
11/9/2010  INF - Information - Party (001)  11/16/2010   
11/9/2010  ORD - Order - Party (001)  11/15/2010   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR RULE 11 COURT 
11/9/2010  ORD - Order - Party (001)  11/15/2010   
NOTE: DENYING MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS 
11/8/2010  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  11/8/2010   
11/4/2010  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)  11/9/2010   
11/2/2010  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  11/2/2010   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
11/4/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
11/8/2010  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
11/9/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
11/9/2010  8:31   Original Arraignment Hearing 
11/15/2010  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
1/6/2011  13:30   Rule 11 Hearing 
1/14/2011  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
1/28/2011  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
3/1/2011  8:15   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
3/17/2011  8:15   Status Conference 
4/26/2011  10:00   Sentencing 
5/10/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/18/2011  8:00   Trial