Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Martinez, Juan      
Richard Chrisman - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Mehrens, Craig   Master Calendar  CR2010-153913-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Richard Chrisman  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  10/5/2010  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  10/14/2010 
Richard Chrisman  13-1103 (F2)  MANSLAUGHTER  10/5/2010  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  12/11/2013 
Richard Chrisman  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  10/5/2010  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  9/17/2013 
Richard Chrisman  13-2910 (M1)  ANIMAL CRUELTY/WORK ANIMAL  10/5/2010  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/20/2013 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
7/6/2020  DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet - Party (001)  7/9/2020   
4/29/2020  LED - 2.8 (d) Letter - Party (001)  4/29/2020   
12/5/2017  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  12/12/2017   
9/25/2015  NTF - Notice to the File - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
2/3/2014  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  2/6/2014   
1/2/2014  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  9/29/2015   
1/2/2014  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  1/8/2014   
12/30/2013  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  12/31/2013   
12/24/2013  193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)  12/24/2013   
12/20/2013  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  12/24/2013   
12/20/2013  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  12/27/2013   
12/20/2013  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  12/24/2013   
NOTE: DEFENSE/ RE CRACK PIPE INCIDENT 
12/19/2013  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  12/19/2013   
NOTE: Defense Sentencing Memorandum 
12/18/2013  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  12/18/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Filing 
12/17/2013  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  12/17/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING  
12/13/2013  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  12/13/2013   
12/11/2013  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  12/16/2013   
12/4/2013  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  12/4/2013   
11/25/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  11/26/2013   
NOTE: Request to Withdraw Oral Argument 
11/25/2013  REL - Reply - Party (001)  11/26/2013   
NOTE: REPLY TO “STATE’S OBJECTION” TO MOTION TO STRIKE STATE’S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTION 
11/19/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  11/19/2013   
11/18/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  11/21/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION TO STRIKE STATES ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS 
11/12/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/12/2013   
NOTE: Motion to Strike States Allegation of Historical Prior Conviction 
11/8/2013  REL - Reply - Party (001)  11/8/2013   
NOTE: REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL (Rule 24.1) 
11/6/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  11/6/2013   
10/31/2013  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/31/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE RETRIAL PAST LAST DAY 
10/29/2013  REL - Reply - Party (001)  10/29/2013   
NOTE: Reply to States Objection to Motion to Unseal Records in CR2005-009056-001 
10/25/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/25/2013   
NOTE: Motion for Clothing  
10/24/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  10/24/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION TO UNSEAL RECORDS IN CR2005-009056 
10/23/2013  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  10/23/2013   
10/18/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/18/2013   
NOTE: Motion to Unseal Records in CR2005-009056-001 
10/11/2013  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  10/11/2013   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTION 
10/11/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/11/2013   
NOTE: MOTION FOR RULE 609 HEARING 
10/11/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/11/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE OF WITNESSES AND EXHBIITS FOR TRIAL OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTION 
10/11/2013  REL - Reply - Party (001)  10/11/2013   
NOTE: Reply to Response to Motion to Vacate Judgment of Aggravating Factor: "Emotional Harm" (Rule 24.2) 
10/7/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  10/7/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL (RULE 24.1) 
9/27/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/27/2013   
NOTE: MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL (Rule 24.1) Oral Argument Requested 
9/26/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  9/26/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT OF AGGRAVATING FACTOR EMOTIONAL HARM RULE 24.2 
9/25/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/25/2013   
9/23/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/23/2013   
9/20/2013  MVJ - Motion To Vacate Judgment - Party (001)  9/20/2013   
NOTE: Motion to Vacate Judgment of Aggravating Factor: "Emotional Harm" 
9/20/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/20/2013   
9/20/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/20/2013   
9/20/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/20/2013   
9/17/2013  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)  9/20/2013   
9/17/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
9/17/2013  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
9/17/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
9/17/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
9/17/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
9/17/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
9/17/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
9/17/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
9/17/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
9/17/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
9/17/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
9/17/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
9/17/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
9/17/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
9/17/2013  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2013   
NOTE: SIGNED 
9/17/2013  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2013   
NOTE: SIGNED 
9/17/2013  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2013   
NOTE: SIGNED 
9/17/2013  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/1/2013   
NOTE: SIGNED 
9/17/2013  WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)  10/9/2013   
NOTE: JURY TRIAL 
9/17/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/17/2013   
9/13/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/13/2013   
9/12/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/12/2013   
9/11/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/11/2013   
9/10/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/10/2013   
9/10/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/10/2013   
9/10/2013  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: FINAL/ 
9/6/2013  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  9/6/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 3 OF THEINDICTMENT 
9/5/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/5/2013   
9/4/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/4/2013   
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #42 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #50 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #49 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #48 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #47 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #46 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #45 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #44 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #43 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #41 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #40 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #39 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #37 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #38 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #36 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #35 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #34 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #33 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #32 
9/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #31 
9/3/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #30 
9/3/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/3/2013   
9/3/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #29 
8/30/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/4/2013   
8/29/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/29/2013   
8/28/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/29/2013   
8/28/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/28/2013   
8/28/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/28/2013   
8/27/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  8/27/2013   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE RE: EXTRANEOUS MATTERS 
8/27/2013  ORD - Order - Party (001)  8/30/2013   
NOTE: THAT PHX POLICE DEPT PRODUCE ALL INFORMATION CURRENTLY IN THE POSSESSION OF PHX POLICE DEPT DATA WAREHOUSE PERTAINING TO OFFCR RICHARD CHRISMAN AND OFFCR SERGIO VIRGILLO FOR 10/05/10 TO CTY ATTY JUAN MARTINEZ ON 08/28/13 4:00PM. 
8/27/2013  ORD - Order - Party (001)  8/30/2013   
NOTE: /THAT PHX POLICE DEPT SHALL RUN AN INQUIRY IDENTICAL TO THE ONE RAN BY OFFICERS CHRISMAN AND VIRGILLO AS TO DANIEL RODRIGUEZ ON 10/05/13 AND PROVIDE COPIES OF SUCH TO CTY ATTY JUAN MARTINEZ ON 08/27/13 2:00PM 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #24 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #23 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #22 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #21 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #20 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #19 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #18 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #17 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #16 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #15 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #14 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #13 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #11 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #12 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #10 
8/27/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #28 
8/26/2013  ORD - Order - Party (001)  8/30/2013   
NOTE: THAT THE MARICOPA CTY OFFICE VIA PHX POLICE DEPT PRODUCE ALL INFORMATION CURRENTLY AT PHX POLICE DEPT WAREHOUSE PERTAINING TO OFFICERS RICHARD CHRISMAN AND SERGIO VIRGILLO FOR 10/05/10 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL ON 08/28/13 NO LATER THAN 5:00PM 
8/26/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/26/2013   
8/26/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/26/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL DATA 
8/24/2013  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  8/26/2013   
NOTE: Defendants Seventh Supplemental Witness List 
8/24/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  8/26/2013   
NOTE: Motion in Limine Re: Defense Witness Opinions of Sergio Virgillo 
8/23/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/27/2013   
8/23/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/27/2013   
8/23/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/27/2013   
8/22/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/22/2013   
8/22/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/22/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF WITNESSES 
8/22/2013  ORD - Order - Party (001)  8/30/2013   
NOTE: /FOR DEPOSITION OF PAULA VEACH 
8/22/2013  ORD - Order - Party (001)  8/30/2013   
NOTE: /FOR DEPOSITION OF CY VILLEGAS 
8/22/2013  SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)  9/3/2013   
8/22/2013  SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)  9/3/2013   
8/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #9 
8/21/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/21/2013   
8/19/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/19/2013   
8/19/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  8/19/2013   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE INCONCLUSIVE DNA TEST RESULTS RE: WITNESS KATHLEEN STOLLER  
8/19/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/19/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION IN LIMINE RE:STATES WITNESS INGRID CHRISMAN OR,IN THE ALTERNATIVE,REQUEST FOR SURREBUTTAL 
8/19/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #8 
8/15/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #8 
8/15/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #7 
8/15/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #6 
8/15/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #5 
8/15/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #4 
8/15/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/15/2013   
8/15/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/15/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL 
8/14/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #14 
8/14/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #13 
8/14/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #2 
8/14/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/14/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S SEVENTH SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST 
8/14/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/19/2013   
8/13/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/19/2013   
8/13/2013  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SIXTH SUPPLEMENTAL 
8/13/2013  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  8/29/2013   
8/13/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/13/2013   
8/12/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/12/2013   
8/12/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/12/2013   
8/12/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  8/12/2013   
8/12/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/19/2013   
8/12/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/19/2013   
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13  
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/09/13 
8/9/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  8/12/2013   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE RE: STATE’SWITNESS WAYNE DILLON 
8/9/2013  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/12/2013   
NOTE: Reply to Objections to Motions in Limine to Preclude Introduction of Evidence of Disciplinary Action and Policy Violations 
8/9/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  8/12/2013   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE RE: STATE’SWITNESS INGRID CHRISMAN OR, IN THEALTERNATIVE, REQUEST FORSURREBUTTAL 
8/9/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  8/9/2013   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE RE: STATE’S WITNESS WILLIAM BISHEL 
8/9/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/9/2013   
8/8/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: #1 
8/7/2013  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  8/7/2013   
8/7/2013  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: PRELIMINARY/ 
8/6/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/6/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL 
8/5/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/5/2013   
8/5/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  8/5/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION IN LIMINE RE MANNER OF DEATH 
8/4/2013  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/5/2013   
NOTE: REPLY TO STATES OBJECTION TOMOTION IN LIMINE RE: ILLEGALLYSEIZED EVIDENCE [MOBILE PHONE] 
8/2/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  8/2/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE OF POLICY VIOLATIONS TO PRECLUDE INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE OF DISCIPLINARY ACTION 
8/1/2013  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/1/2013   
NOTE: REPLY TO STATE OBJECTION TODEFENSE MOTION: RE: STATE’SWITNESS: LUCIEN HAAG 
8/1/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  8/1/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION IN LIMINE RE: ILLEGALLY SEIZED EVIDENCE (MOBILE PHONE) 
8/1/2013  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  8/29/2013   
7/31/2013  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  8/29/2013   
7/31/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  7/31/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JURY QUESTIONAIRE  
7/31/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  8/1/2013   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION ON ULTIMATE ISSUE(LON BARTEL) 
7/31/2013  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  7/31/2013   
7/31/2013  NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (001)  8/8/2013   
7/30/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  7/31/2013   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDEINTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE OFPOLICY VIOLATIONS 
7/30/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  7/31/2013   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDEINTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE OFDISCIPLINARY ACTION 
7/30/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  7/31/2013   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDEINTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE OFPOLICY VIOLATIONS 
7/30/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  7/31/2013   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE RE: MANNER OF DEATH 
7/30/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE RE: ILLEGALLY SEIZED EVIDENCE [MOBILE PHONE] 
7/30/2013  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO MOTION IN LIMINE RE: PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT 
7/30/2013  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: RESPONSES TO STATE’S MOTION INLIMINE RE: VICTIM’S CRIMINAL HISTORYAND MOTION IN LIMINE RE: VICTIM’SVIOLENT ACTS 
7/30/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION IN LIMINE RE: STATE'S WITNESS: LUCIEN HAAG 
7/29/2013  STA - Statement - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: STATE'S PRETRIAL STATEMENT  
7/29/2013  STA - Statement - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: Defendants Pretrial Statement 
7/29/2013  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/31/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 07/24/13 
7/29/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/5/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 7/29/13 
7/26/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  7/26/2013   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO "VIOLENT" ACTS BY THE VICTIM 
7/25/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/29/2013   
NOTE: IN LIMINE RE PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT 
7/25/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  7/29/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / FOR JURY QUESTIONNAIRE 
7/25/2013  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  7/25/2013   
7/25/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 07/24/13 
7/25/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 07/24/13 
7/25/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 07/24/13 
7/25/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 07/24/13 
7/25/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 07/24/13 
7/25/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 07/24/13 
7/25/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 07/24/13 
7/25/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 07/24/13 
7/25/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 07/24/13 
7/25/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/30/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 07/24/13 
7/23/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  7/23/2013   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ADMISSION OF INADMISSIBLE HEARSAY 
7/19/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  7/23/2013   
NOTE: /STATE'S WITNESS: LUCIEN HAAG 
7/17/2013  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  7/22/2013   
NOTE: FIFTH SUPPLEMENTAL/ 
7/17/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/17/2013   
7/17/2013  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  7/18/2013   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE VICTIM'S CRIMINAL HISTORY 
7/17/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/18/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE OF POTENTIAL REBUTTAL WITNESS FOR TRIAL 
7/10/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/16/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 07/09/13 
7/9/2013  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  7/9/2013   
6/21/2013  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  6/26/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL/ 
6/5/2013  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  6/5/2013   
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIMEWITHIN TO FILE PRETRIAL MOTIONS 
6/5/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/5/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S THIRD SUPPLEMENTALWITNESS LIST 
6/3/2013  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
5/17/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  6/13/2013   
5/9/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/9/2013   
4/29/2013  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  4/29/2013   
4/23/2013  REL - Reply - Party (001)  4/23/2013   
NOTE: REPLY TO RESPONSE/OBJECTION TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE WITNESS/MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 
4/19/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  4/22/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO SECOND MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE’S EXPERT WITNESS: LUCIAN HAAG 
4/3/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/4/2013   
NOTE: Motion to Preclude States Expert Witness: Lucien Haag 
3/12/2013  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  3/12/2013   
3/4/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  3/4/2013   
2/26/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/26/2013   
2/26/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/26/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT LIST 
2/13/2013  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  2/13/2013   
2/7/2013  AFF - Affidavit - Party (001)  2/7/2013   
NOTE: Affidavit of the Honorable Timothy J. Ryan 
2/6/2013  REL - Reply - Party (001)  2/6/2013   
NOTE: TO RESPONSE/OBJECTION TOMOTION TO PRECLUDEWITNESS/MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 
2/6/2013  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  2/6/2013   
NOTE: EXPEDITED/ORAL ARGUMENT 
2/5/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  2/5/2013   
1/31/2013  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  1/31/2013   
1/31/2013  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  1/31/2013   
1/31/2013  RES - Response - Party (001)  2/1/2013   
NOTE: Response to Objection to Notice of Change of Judge 
1/25/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/25/2013   
1/25/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  1/25/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE 
1/25/2013  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  1/25/2013   
NOTE: Motion to Continue Oral Argument 
1/24/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  1/25/2013   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE WITNESS/MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 
1/24/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/24/2013   
1/18/2013  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  1/18/2013   
1/16/2013  NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (001)  1/23/2013   
1/15/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/15/2013   
NOTE: Motion to Compel 
1/9/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/9/2013   
NOTE: Motion to Preclude Witness/Motion for Sanctions 
11/30/2012  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/30/2012   
11/27/2012  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  12/4/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST 
11/5/2012  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  11/5/2012   
NOTE: Supplemental Notice of Disclosure 
10/19/2012  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  10/19/2012   
10/17/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/23/2012   
NOTE: JURY TRIAL 
10/2/2012  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  10/3/2012   
NOTE: STATES SIXTH SUPPLEMENTAL / 
9/7/2012  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  9/7/2012   
9/5/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  9/5/2012   
8/28/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/28/2012   
8/27/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  8/31/2012   
NOTE: TO TRAVEL 
8/24/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/24/2012   
8/24/2012  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  8/27/2012   
NOTE: STATE'S FIFTH SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES 
8/22/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/22/2012   
8/15/2012  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  8/15/2012   
8/15/2012  REQ - Request - Party (001)  8/15/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / FOR COURTS PERMISSION TO TRAVEL 
7/24/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  7/27/2012   
NOTE: TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR DEPOSITION 
7/16/2012  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  7/16/2012   
7/13/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/20/2012   
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIXS/ TO MOTION FOR DEPOSITION BY DEFENDANT CHRISMAN 
7/13/2012  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  7/20/2012   
6/28/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/11/2012   
NOTE: FOR DEPOSITION 
6/8/2012  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  6/8/2012   
6/6/2012  REQ - Request - Party (001)  6/18/2012   
NOTE: FOR COURT'S PERMISSION TO TRAVEL 
5/8/2012  026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (001)  5/8/2012   
3/16/2012  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  3/16/2012   
3/4/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  3/21/2012   
NOTE: JURY TRIAL 
1/18/2012  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  1/18/2012   
1/18/2012  AFF - Affidavit - Party (001)  1/24/2012   
NOTE: AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF COURT DATE 
1/11/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  1/18/2012   
NOTE: TRIAL 
12/30/2011  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)  1/4/2012   
12/30/2011  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  1/4/2012   
NOTE: DECLINING JURISDICTION 
11/22/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/22/2011   
11/4/2011  AFF - Affidavit - Party (001)  11/9/2011   
NOTE: AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF COURT DATE 
11/1/2011  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  11/1/2011   
10/20/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/25/2011   
NOTE: TO UNSEAL SEARCH WARRANT FILE 
10/17/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/18/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Association 
10/13/2011  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  10/17/2011   
NOTE: ORDER DECLINNING JURISDICTION 
10/13/2011  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)  10/17/2011   
10/12/2011  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/12/2011   
10/5/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/11/2011   
NOTE: TRIAL 
9/27/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  9/27/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE 
9/14/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/19/2011   
NOTE: TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE 
8/30/2011  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/30/2011   
6/24/2011  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  6/24/2011   
6/14/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  6/17/2011   
NOTE: TRIAL 
6/10/2011  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  6/14/2011   
NOTE: SERVED 06/09/11 
6/10/2011  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  6/14/2011   
NOTE: SERVED 06/09/11 
5/19/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  5/19/2011   
5/19/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  5/19/2011   
5/12/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  5/12/2011   
5/10/2011  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  5/23/2011   
5/4/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/6/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST 
4/28/2011  REL - Reply - Party (001)  4/29/2011   
NOTE: TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT TO WILLIAM LEWINSKI 
4/28/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  5/4/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT TO DR. WILLIWM LEWINSKI 
4/27/2011  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  4/27/2011   
4/22/2011  REL - Reply - Party (001)  4/27/2011   
NOTE: TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR RECUSAL/DISQUALIFICATION OF THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE 
4/20/2011  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  4/20/2011   
4/14/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  4/14/2011   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE OF 04/22/11 
4/7/2011  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  4/7/2011   
3/30/2011  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  3/31/2011   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM/SERVED 03/24/11 
3/23/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  3/25/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE STATUS CONFERENCE 
3/18/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  3/18/2011   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE OF 04/08/11 
3/16/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/18/2011   
NOTE: AND/OR REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION 
3/14/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/15/2011   
NOTE: TO COMPEL DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANTS STATEMENT TO WILLIAM LEWINSKI 
3/4/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  3/4/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR RECUSAL/DISQUALIFICATION OF THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE 
3/1/2011  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  3/1/2011   
2/24/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  2/28/2011   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE 
2/24/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  2/24/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS 
2/23/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/1/2011   
NOTE: FOR RECUSAL/DISQUALIFICATION OF THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE 
2/22/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/23/2011   
NOTE: FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS 
2/7/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  2/7/2011   
2/2/2011  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  2/2/2011   
NOTE: STATES 4TH SUPPLEMENTAL/ 
2/1/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  2/1/2011   
1/27/2011  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  1/27/2011   
1/25/2011  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  1/25/2011   
NOTE: STATES 3RD/ 
1/18/2011  REL - Reply - Party (001)  1/20/2011   
NOTE: TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO REMAND 
1/13/2011  REL - Reply - Party (001)  1/19/2011   
NOTE: TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY 
1/7/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  1/11/2011   
NOTE: TO MEMORANDUM TO SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND 
1/5/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/5/2011   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO / COMPEL DISCOVERY  
1/3/2011  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)  1/3/2011   
NOTE:  
1/3/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/4/2011   
NOTE: FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION IN DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND 
1/3/2011  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  1/4/2011   
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND 
12/22/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/28/2010   
NOTE: TO COMPEL DISCOVERY 
12/16/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/16/2010   
12/16/2010  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  12/16/2010   
NOTE: STATES SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL / 
12/16/2010  STA - Statement - Party (001)  12/20/2010   
NOTE: INITIAL 15.2/ 
12/13/2010  REL - Reply - Party (001)  12/15/2010   
NOTE: TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DESIGNATE AS COMPLEX CASE 
12/9/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/9/2010   
12/8/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/9/2010   
NOTE: TO CORRECT MINUTE ENTRY OF 12/06/10 
12/8/2010  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  12/8/2010   
12/7/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  12/9/2010   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO REQUIRE PROPERLY FILED MOTIONS 
12/7/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  12/7/2010   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO DESIGNATE AS COMPLEX CASE 
12/6/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/14/2010   
NOTE: TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE 
12/6/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/8/2010   
NOTE: TO REQUIRE PROPERLY FILED MOTIONS 
12/6/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/6/2010   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE OF SUPPLEMENT 83 
12/3/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/6/2010   
NOTE: TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE 
12/2/2010  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  12/2/2010   
NOTE: FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES 
11/24/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/1/2010   
NOTE: DESIGNATE AS COMPLEX CASE 
11/23/2010  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  11/23/2010   
11/22/2010  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  11/22/2010   
11/18/2010  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/19/2010   
11/17/2010  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  11/17/2010   
NOTE:  
11/17/2010  REL - Reply - Party (001)  11/17/2010   
NOTE: TO RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO MOTION TO REMAND 
11/17/2010  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  11/17/2010   
11/16/2010  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  11/17/2010   
11/16/2010  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/17/2010   
11/16/2010  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/17/2010   
11/15/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  11/22/2010   
NOTE: TO OBJECTION TO MOTION TO REMAND 
11/12/2010  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  11/12/2010   
11/5/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  11/8/2010   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO REMAND 
11/2/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/5/2010   
NOTE: TO REMAND 
11/1/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/3/2010   
NOTE: OF CHANGE OF COMMISSIONER 
10/22/2010  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  10/22/2010   
10/21/2010  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)  10/25/2010   
NOTE: $150,000 (BOND POSTED) 
10/20/2010  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  10/20/2010   
10/15/2010  179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (001)  10/15/2010   
10/13/2010  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  10/14/2010  Plaintiff (1)  
10/13/2010  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  10/14/2010   
10/13/2010  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  10/14/2010  Plaintiff (1)  
10/8/2010  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  10/8/2010   
10/6/2010  ROR - Release Order - Party (001)  10/8/2010   
NOTE: UNSECURED APPEARANCE BOND $150,000.00 
10/6/2010  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  10/8/2010   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
10/6/2010  10:30   Initial Appearance 
10/13/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
10/18/2010  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
10/21/2010  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
11/4/2010  15:00   Status Conference 
11/18/2010  9:30   Oral Argument 
12/6/2010  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
1/14/2011  8:16   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
1/24/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
1/28/2011  11:00   Oral Argument 
3/8/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
3/10/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/17/2011  8:00   Trial 
4/8/2011  10:30   Status Conference 
4/22/2011  10:30   Status Conference 
4/25/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
5/10/2011  8:30   Oral Argument 
6/21/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
6/21/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
6/27/2011  8:00   Trial 
8/18/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
10/5/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
10/26/2011  8:30   Oral Argument 
11/9/2011  8:00   Trial 
1/11/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
2/2/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/9/2012  8:00   Trial 
3/14/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/2/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/30/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
6/6/2012  8:00   Trial 
6/6/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/12/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/1/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/8/2012  8:00   Trial 
8/8/2012  8:30   Oral Argument 
9/5/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
10/17/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/28/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/16/2013  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/28/2013  13:30   Oral Argument 
2/1/2013  10:00   Oral Argument 
2/7/2013  8:30   Status Conference 
2/13/2013  8:00   Trial 
2/22/2013  11:00   Oral Argument 
2/26/2013  10:00   Oral Argument 
3/6/2013  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/13/2013  8:00   Trial 
4/24/2013  8:30   Status Conference 
5/29/2013  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/24/2013  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/22/2013  10:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/24/2013  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/29/2013  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/31/2013  8:00   Trial 
7/31/2013  10:30   Trial 
8/1/2013  13:00   Oral Argument 
8/5/2013  10:30   Trial 
8/6/2013  10:30   Trial 
8/7/2013  10:30   Trial 
8/8/2013  10:30   Trial 
8/12/2013  10:30   Trial 
8/14/2013  10:30   Trial 
8/15/2013  10:30   Trial 
8/19/2013  10:30   Trial 
8/21/2013  10:30   Trial 
8/22/2013  10:30   Trial 
8/26/2013  10:30   Trial 
8/27/2013  10:30   Trial 
8/28/2013  10:30   Trial 
8/29/2013  15:00   Trial 
9/3/2013  10:30   Trial 
9/4/2013  10:30   Trial 
9/5/2013  10:30   Trial 
9/9/2013  10:30   Trial 
9/10/2013  10:30   Trial 
9/11/2013  10:30   Trial 
9/12/2013  10:30   Trial 
9/13/2013  10:30   Trial 
9/16/2013  10:30   Trial 
9/17/2013  10:00   Trial 
10/18/2013  8:30   Sentencing 
11/1/2013  11:00   Oral Argument 
11/13/2013  10:30   Oral Argument 
11/22/2013  10:00   Sentencing 
12/11/2013  8:30   Oral Argument 
12/11/2013  10:00   Status Conference 
12/20/2013  13:30   Sentencing 
1/27/2014  10:30   Trial