Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | County Attorney, Maricopa | ||
John Robert Smith - (2) |
Defendant | M | Defender, Public | ZZ CR Admin | CR2010-142511-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
John Robert Smith | 13-2502 (F6) | ESCAPE 3RD DEGREE | 2/10/2010 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 12/14/2010 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
6/27/2018 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 6/27/2018 | |
1/14/2011 | 571 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (no Monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001) | 1/14/2011 | |
1/12/2011 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 1/19/2011 | |
1/12/2011 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 1/21/2011 | |
1/12/2011 | PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001) | 1/18/2011 | |
12/16/2010 | 102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001) | 12/16/2010 | |
12/14/2010 | WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001) | 12/16/2010 | |
12/14/2010 | INF - Information - Party (001) | 1/3/2011 | |
12/3/2010 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 12/3/2010 | |
12/1/2010 | 584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001) | 12/1/2010 | |
11/30/2010 | OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001) | 12/7/2010 | |
11/29/2010 | WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001) | 12/1/2010 | |
NOTE: SERVED 11/21/10 | |||
8/19/2010 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 8/19/2010 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
11/29/2010 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
12/1/2010 | 8:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
12/14/2010 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
12/14/2010 | 8:31 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
12/17/2010 | 8:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
1/12/2011 | 8:30 | Sentencing |