Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | County Attorney, S P 1 Homicide | ||
Gary Thomas Kelley - (2) |
Defendant | M | To Be Determined | Brnovich | CR2010-123572-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Gary Thomas Kelley | 13-1204 (F3) | AGGRAVATED ASSAULT | 5/6/2010 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 5/14/2010 |
Gary Thomas Kelley | 13-1104 (F1) | MURDER 2ND DEGREE | 5/6/2010 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 5/14/2010 |
Gary Thomas Kelley | 13-1104 (F1) | MURDER 2ND DEGREE | 5/6/2010 | Guilty By Jury | Guilty By Jury | 4/13/2011 |
Gary Thomas Kelley | 13-1204 (F3) | AGGRAVATED ASSAULT | 5/6/2010 | Guilty By Jury | Guilty By Jury | 4/13/2011 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
10/26/2020 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 10/28/2020 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |||
6/24/2020 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 6/25/2020 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |||
11/15/2018 | UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name - Party (001) | 11/19/2018 | Defendant (2) |
8/30/2018 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001) | 8/31/2018 | |
8/30/2018 | MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001) | 8/31/2018 | |
NOTE: REVIEW GRANTED ; RELEIF DENIED | |||
2/27/2018 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 3/1/2018 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING PETITION FOR REVIEW IN THE ARIZ SUPREME COURT | |||
10/4/2017 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 10/6/2017 | Defendant (2) |
10/4/2017 | UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name - Party (001) | 10/6/2017 | Defendant (2) |
10/6/2016 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 10/7/2016 | |
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL | |||
10/5/2016 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001) | 10/5/2016 | |
10/4/2016 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001) | 10/5/2016 | |
10/4/2016 | AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001) | 10/5/2016 | |
8/18/2016 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001) | 8/18/2016 | |
7/29/2016 | 167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (001) | 7/29/2016 | |
7/26/2016 | 597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001) | 7/26/2016 | |
7/11/2016 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 7/12/2016 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: SUCCESSIVE PETITION UNDER ARCP 32.11E AND ARCP 32.2B AS TO NEWLY DISCONVERED EXCULPATORY EVIDENCE | |||
7/11/2016 | NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001) | 7/12/2016 | |
7/24/2014 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 7/25/2014 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |||
7/17/2014 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 7/25/2014 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |||
3/31/2014 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 3/31/2014 | |
3/11/2014 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 3/11/2014 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE PRO PER PETITION FOR REVIEW MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |||
3/10/2014 | 187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001) | 3/10/2014 | |
2/11/2014 | 187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001) | 2/11/2014 | |
2/10/2014 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 2/11/2014 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: PETITION UNDER RULE 32 MOTION FOR PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPTS FOR INDIGENT PETITIONER R 32.4(d) | |||
1/24/2014 | 597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001) | 1/24/2014 | |
1/23/2014 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 2/3/2014 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPTS SHALL BE AT THE COUNTY EXPENSE | |||
1/23/2014 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 2/3/2014 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: MOTION TO HALT PCR RULE 32 UNTIL TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS ARE FULLY PREPARED | |||
1/9/2014 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 1/23/2014 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: REQUESTING FEE TO BE WAIVED FOR HAVING COURT REPORTER TO HAVE TRIAL PROCEEDING TRANSCRIPTS PREPARED | |||
1/7/2014 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 1/7/2014 | |
NOTE: Motion to withdraw pcr and allow defendant to file pro per petition | |||
12/24/2013 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 12/24/2013 | |
NOTE: REPLY Petition for Post-Conviction Relief | |||
12/9/2013 | 187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001) | 12/9/2013 | |
12/2/2013 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 12/4/2013 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT OF 9 FEBRUARY 2011 COURT REPORTER MARGE HARCARIK | |||
11/22/2013 | RPP - Response to Petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (001) | 11/22/2013 | |
NOTE: Response to Petition for Post-Conviction Relief | |||
11/21/2013 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 11/22/2013 | Defendant (2) |
10/10/2013 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 10/10/2013 | |
10/3/2013 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 10/7/2013 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: MEMORANDUM NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTION TO COUNSEL OF ISSUES TO BE RAISED IN MY RULE 32 PCR TO BE DOCKET FOR THE REOCORD | |||
10/2/2013 | PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (001) | 10/2/2013 | |
NOTE: PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF | |||
9/23/2013 | 197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001) | 9/23/2013 | |
9/6/2013 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 9/9/2013 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: ADDENDUM PLEASE ADD TO THE DOCUMENT OF MY RULE 32 POST CONVICTION RELIEF | |||
9/3/2013 | RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 9/3/2013 | |
NOTE: Rule 32 Request for Extension | |||
8/28/2013 | 905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (001) | 8/28/2013 | |
8/27/2013 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 8/28/2013 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: REQUESTING OF A COPY OF THE DOCKET LISTING THE ISSUES RAISED FOR MY POST CONVICTION RELIEF RULE 32 | |||
8/6/2013 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 8/8/2013 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: MEMORANDUM NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTION TO COUNSEL OF ISSUES TO BE RAISE TO BE DOCKET | |||
6/13/2013 | 197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001) | 6/13/2013 | |
6/10/2013 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 6/12/2013 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: MEMORANDUM NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTION TO COUNSEL OF ISSUES TO BE RAISE TO BE DOCKET | |||
6/6/2013 | RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 6/7/2013 | |
NOTE: Rule 32 Request for Extension | |||
6/3/2013 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 6/5/2013 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: MEMORANDUM NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTION TO COUNSEL OF ISSUES TO BE RAISE TO BE DOCKET | |||
5/28/2013 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 5/29/2013 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: MEMORANDUM NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTION TO COUNSEL OF ISSUES TO BE RAISE TO BE DOCKET | |||
5/28/2013 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 5/29/2013 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: MEMORANDUM NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTION TO COUNSEL OF ISSUES TO BE RAISE TO BE DOCKET | |||
5/17/2013 | 905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (001) | 5/17/2013 | |
5/13/2013 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 5/14/2013 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: MEMORANDUM NOTICE INSTRUCTION TO COUNSEL OF ISSUES TO BE RAISE IN RULE 32 POST CONVICTION RELIEF TO BE DOCKET | |||
5/8/2013 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 5/9/2013 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: MEMORANDUM NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTION TO COUNSEL OF ISSUES TO BE RAISE IN RULE 32 POST CONVICITON RELIEF TO BE DOCKET | |||
5/3/2013 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001) | 5/16/2013 | |
NOTE: APRIL 4, 2011 BY TRACI J. STUTSMAN, #50466 | |||
5/3/2013 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001) | 5/16/2013 | |
NOTE: JULY 30, 2010 BY HELENE PAUSTIAN #50072 | |||
5/3/2013 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001) | 5/16/2013 | |
NOTE: MARCH 25, 2011 BY LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY #50155 | |||
5/3/2013 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001) | 5/16/2013 | |
NOTE: FEBRUARY 8, 2011 BY MARYLYNN LEMOINE #50441 | |||
5/2/2013 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001) | 5/6/2013 | |
5/2/2013 | MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001) | 5/6/2013 | |
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS/MEMORANDUM DECISION - AFFIRMED | |||
4/29/2013 | 905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (001) | 4/29/2013 | |
4/22/2013 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 4/23/2013 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: MEMORANDUM NOTICE OF INSTRUCTION TO COUNSEL OF ISSUES OF ISSUES TO BE RAISE IN RULE 32 POST CONVICTION RELIEF TO BE DOCKET | |||
4/11/2013 | 197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001) | 4/11/2013 | |
4/9/2013 | RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 4/10/2013 | |
NOTE: RULE 32 REQUEST FOR EXTENSION | |||
3/11/2013 | 197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001) | 3/11/2013 | |
3/7/2013 | RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 3/7/2013 | |
NOTE: RULE 32 | |||
2/4/2013 | 197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001) | 2/4/2013 | |
1/30/2013 | RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 1/30/2013 | |
NOTE: Rule 32 / | |||
11/30/2012 | 596 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: trial - Party (001) | 11/30/2012 | |
11/19/2012 | NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001) | 11/21/2012 | Defendant (2) |
11/19/2012 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 11/21/2012 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: MOTION TO CORRECT TRIAL TRANSCRIPT | |||
9/26/2011 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 9/26/2011 | |
NOTE: PUBLIC DEFENDER | |||
9/22/2011 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 9/23/2011 | |
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL | |||
9/15/2011 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001) | 9/16/2011 | |
9/2/2011 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001) | 9/6/2011 | |
8/31/2011 | AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001) | 9/1/2011 | |
8/31/2011 | AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001) | 9/1/2011 | |
7/19/2011 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 7/20/2011 | |
NOTE: NOTIFICATION TO COURT REPORTER | |||
7/18/2011 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001) | 7/18/2011 | |
NOTE: FROM SUPERIOR COURT DESIGNATION OF RECORD FOR APPEAL | |||
7/15/2011 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 7/19/2011 | |
7/11/2011 | 571 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (no Monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001) | 7/11/2011 | |
7/5/2011 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 7/13/2011 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
7/5/2011 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 7/12/2011 | |
7/5/2011 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 7/19/2011 | |
7/5/2011 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 7/8/2011 | |
6/27/2011 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001) | 6/28/2011 | |
NOTE: OF CORRESPONDENCE | |||
5/17/2011 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001) | 5/17/2011 | |
4/20/2011 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/20/2011 | |
4/15/2011 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 4/15/2011 | |
NOTE: | |||
4/14/2011 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/14/2011 | |
4/14/2011 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/14/2011 | |
4/13/2011 | RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001) | 4/19/2011 | |
4/13/2011 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
4/13/2011 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
4/13/2011 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
4/13/2011 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
4/13/2011 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 4/22/2011 | |
4/13/2011 | WSH - Worksheet - Party (001) | 4/21/2011 | |
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING | |||
4/13/2011 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/12/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/12/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/12/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/12/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/12/2011 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
NOTE: FINAL | |||
4/11/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/11/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/11/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/11/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/11/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/11/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/11/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/8/2011 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/8/2011 | |
4/8/2011 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/8/2011 | |
4/8/2011 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/8/2011 | |
4/6/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/6/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/6/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/6/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/6/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/6/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/5/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/5/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/5/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/5/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/5/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
4/4/2011 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 4/18/2011 | |
NOTE: PRELIMINARY | |||
4/4/2011 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 4/19/2011 | |
4/4/2011 | JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001) | 4/15/2011 | |
4/4/2011 | WSH - Worksheet - Party (001) | 4/12/2011 | |
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING | |||
3/31/2011 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/31/2011 | |
3/31/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 4/1/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 03/29/11 | |||
3/31/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 4/1/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 03/29/11 | |||
3/31/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 4/1/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 03/29/11 | |||
3/31/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 4/1/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 03/29/11 | |||
3/31/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 4/1/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 03/29/11 | |||
3/31/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 4/1/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 03/29/11 | |||
3/31/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 4/1/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 03/29/11 | |||
3/31/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 4/1/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 03/29/11 | |||
3/31/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 4/1/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 03/29/11 | |||
3/30/2011 | 085 - ME: Conference - Party (001) | 3/30/2011 | |
3/30/2011 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/30/2011 | |
NOTE: STATES SUPPLEMENTAL/ OF WITNESSES AND EVIDENCE | |||
3/23/2011 | 004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001) | 3/23/2011 | |
3/10/2011 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 3/10/2011 | |
2/22/2011 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001) | 2/22/2011 | |
2/22/2011 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 2/22/2011 | |
NOTE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE/ | |||
2/11/2011 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 2/11/2011 | |
2/11/2011 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 2/11/2011 | |
2/11/2011 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 2/11/2011 | |
2/10/2011 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: ADMITTING DEFENDANTS SELF SERVING HEARSAY AT TRIAL | |||
2/9/2011 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1/UNSIGNED | |||
2/9/2011 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: COUNT 2/UNSIGNED | |||
2/9/2011 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 2/9/2011 | |
2/9/2011 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 2/9/2011 | |
2/9/2011 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 2/9/2011 | |
2/9/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
2/8/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
2/8/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
2/8/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
2/8/2011 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
2/4/2011 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 2/4/2011 | |
2/3/2011 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: FINAL/ | |||
2/3/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #30 | |||
2/3/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #29 | |||
2/3/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #28 | |||
2/2/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #27 | |||
2/2/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #26 | |||
2/2/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #25 | |||
2/2/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #24 | |||
2/2/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #23 | |||
2/2/2011 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 2/2/2011 | |
NOTE: STATES / TO PRECLUDE IRRELEVANT TESTIMONY BY JOSE VARELA AND REQUEST FOR OFFER OF PROOF | |||
2/1/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #22 | |||
2/1/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #21 | |||
2/1/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #20 | |||
2/1/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #19 | |||
2/1/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #18 | |||
2/1/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #17 | |||
2/1/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #16 | |||
1/31/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #15 | |||
1/31/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #14 | |||
1/31/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #13 | |||
1/31/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #12 | |||
1/31/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #11 | |||
1/31/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #10 | |||
1/31/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #9 | |||
1/31/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #8 | |||
1/31/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #7 | |||
1/31/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #6 | |||
1/31/2011 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 1/31/2011 | |
1/31/2011 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001) | 1/31/2011 | |
1/27/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #4 | |||
1/27/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #3 | |||
1/27/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #2 | |||
1/27/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #1 | |||
1/27/2011 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: PRELIMINARY/ | |||
1/27/2011 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: #5 | |||
1/26/2011 | JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001) | 2/10/2011 | |
1/26/2011 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 1/26/2011 | |
NOTE: IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE IRRELEVANT TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE | |||
1/25/2011 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 1/25/2011 | |
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE IRRELEVANT TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE | |||
1/25/2011 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 1/25/2011 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ TO PRECLUDE IRRELEVANT TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE | |||
1/24/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 1/25/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 01-21-2011 | |||
1/24/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 1/25/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 01-21-2011 | |||
1/24/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 1/25/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 01-21-2011 | |||
1/24/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 1/26/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 01-21-2011 | |||
1/24/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 1/26/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 01-21-2011 | |||
1/24/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 1/26/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 01-21-2011 | |||
1/24/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 1/26/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 01/21/11 | |||
1/24/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 1/26/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 01/21/11 | |||
1/24/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 1/26/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 01/21/11 | |||
1/24/2011 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 1/24/2011 | |
NOTE: STATES / VOIR DIRE | |||
1/24/2011 | RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 1/24/2011 | |
NOTE: STATES SUPPLEMENTAL/ | |||
1/21/2011 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 1/21/2011 | |
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE SELF SERVING HEARSAY | |||
1/20/2011 | RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 1/21/2011 | |
NOTE: Jury Instructions | |||
1/20/2011 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 1/21/2011 | |
NOTE: VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS | |||
1/19/2011 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 1/20/2011 | |
NOTE: | |||
1/14/2011 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 1/14/2011 | |
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL | |||
1/14/2011 | RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 1/14/2011 | |
NOTE: | |||
1/10/2011 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 1/11/2011 | |
NOTE: SERVED 01/04/11 | |||
1/3/2011 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 1/3/2011 | |
NOTE: notice supplemental witness | |||
1/3/2011 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 1/3/2011 | |
NOTE: SECOND / | |||
12/23/2010 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 12/23/2010 | |
12/15/2010 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 12/17/2010 | |
NOTE: DUCES TECUM/FAXED 12-07-2010 | |||
12/15/2010 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 12/17/2010 | |
NOTE: DUCES TECUM/FAXED 12-07-2010 | |||
12/15/2010 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 12/15/2010 | |
NOTE: mtc | |||
12/9/2010 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 12/9/2010 | |
12/3/2010 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 12/15/2010 | |
11/24/2010 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 11/24/2010 | |
11/22/2010 | ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (001) | 11/24/2010 | |
11/17/2010 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 11/17/2010 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS(ES) | |||
11/10/2010 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 11/10/2010 | |
NOTE: FOR COURT INTERPRETER | |||
11/10/2010 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 11/10/2010 | |
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ANTONIO VARELA'S AND JOE PENA'S PRIOR FELONYCONVICTIONS | |||
11/9/2010 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 11/9/2010 | |
10/22/2010 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 10/22/2010 | |
10/5/2010 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 10/5/2010 | |
9/23/2010 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 9/23/2010 | |
9/1/2010 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001) | 9/1/2010 | |
8/24/2010 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 8/24/2010 | |
8/23/2010 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 8/24/2010 | |
NOTE: TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS | |||
8/23/2010 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 8/23/2010 | |
8/20/2010 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 8/27/2010 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/ | |||
8/20/2010 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/20/2010 | |
NOTE: TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS | |||
8/4/2010 | 085 - ME: Conference - Party (001) | 8/4/2010 | |
8/2/2010 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 8/3/2010 | |
NOTE: TRIAL | |||
7/29/2010 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 7/29/2010 | |
NOTE: IN LIMINE TO ADMIT EVIDENCE OF THE VICTIMS OTHER CRIMES, WRONGS OR ACTS | |||
7/22/2010 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001) | 7/22/2010 | |
7/21/2010 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 7/22/2010 | |
NOTE: supplemental / of defenses | |||
7/19/2010 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 7/19/2010 | |
7/14/2010 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/14/2010 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL FOR A COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION | |||
7/14/2010 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 7/14/2010 | |
NOTE: TO ADMIT EVIDENCE OF THE VICTIM'S OTHER CRIMES, WRONGS OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(B) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE | |||
7/13/2010 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 7/13/2010 | |
7/12/2010 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001) | 7/12/2010 | |
7/8/2010 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 7/8/2010 | |
6/30/2010 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 6/30/2010 | |
NOTE: Motion to Designate Complex | |||
6/29/2010 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001) | 6/29/2010 | |
6/9/2010 | ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001) | 6/9/2010 | |
NOTE: | |||
6/8/2010 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 6/8/2010 | |
NOTE: | |||
6/8/2010 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 6/9/2010 | |
6/7/2010 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 6/9/2010 | |
NOTE: for temporary removal of official court files,transcripts or exhibits | |||
6/7/2010 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 6/9/2010 | |
6/7/2010 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 6/9/2010 | |
6/4/2010 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 6/4/2010 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.1 (a), (b), (c), (d), (e) REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
6/4/2010 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 6/4/2010 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE | |||
6/1/2010 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 6/1/2010 | |
5/26/2010 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 5/27/2010 | |
NOTE: | |||
5/25/2010 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 5/25/2010 | |
5/18/2010 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 5/18/2010 | |
5/13/2010 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 5/14/2010 | Plaintiff (1) |
5/13/2010 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 5/14/2010 | |
5/13/2010 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 5/14/2010 | Plaintiff (1) |
5/11/2010 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 5/11/2010 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
5/13/2010 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
5/17/2010 | 8:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
5/24/2010 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
7/7/2010 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
7/23/2010 | 10:00 | Settlement Conference |
7/30/2010 | 10:30 | Settlement Conference |
8/20/2010 | 8:20 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
8/20/2010 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
9/10/2010 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/16/2010 | 8:17 | Oral Argument |
9/22/2010 | 8:00 | Trial |
10/22/2010 | 8:45 | Status Conference |
10/25/2010 | 8:45 | Status Conference |
11/5/2010 | 8:45 | Status Conference |
12/3/2010 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
12/3/2010 | 13:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/16/2010 | 8:45 | Oral Argument |
12/16/2010 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/21/2010 | 8:45 | Status Conference |
1/3/2011 | 8:00 | Trial |
1/26/2011 | 8:00 | Trial |
1/26/2011 | 13:30 | Trial |
1/27/2011 | 10:30 | Trial |
1/31/2011 | 10:30 | Trial |
2/1/2011 | 10:30 | Trial |
2/2/2011 | 13:30 | Trial |
2/3/2011 | 10:00 | Trial |
2/8/2011 | 10:30 | Trial |
2/9/2011 | 10:30 | Trial |
2/17/2011 | 8:45 | Status Conference |
3/17/2011 | 10:00 | Settlement Conference |
3/18/2011 | 10:30 | Settlement Conference |
3/25/2011 | 13:30 | Settlement Conference |
3/28/2011 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/4/2011 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/5/2011 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/6/2011 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/11/2011 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/12/2011 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/13/2011 | 10:30 | Trial |
5/13/2011 | 8:45 | Sentencing |
7/5/2011 | 9:30 | Sentencing |