« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Southeast  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Maricopa      
Elizabeth Joanne Johnson - (2)
 
Defendant  F   Victor, Marc     CR2010-101760-001  
Tammi Peters Smith - (3)
 
Defendant  F   Mitchell, Tyrone   Granville  CR2010-101760-002  
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Elizabeth Joanne Johnson  13-1304 (F2)  KIDNAP  12/18/2009  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2010 
Elizabeth Joanne Johnson  13-3623 (F4)  CHILD/VULNERABLE ADULT ABUSE  12/18/2009  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2010 
Elizabeth Joanne Johnson  13-1302 (F4)  CUSTODIAL INTERFERENCE  12/18/2009  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2010 
Elizabeth Joanne Johnson  13-1303 (F2)  UNLAWFUL IMPRISONMENT  12/18/2009  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  10/18/2012 
Elizabeth Joanne Johnson  13-3623 (F4)  CHILD/VULNERABLE ADULT ABUSE  12/18/2009  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  7/13/2012 
Elizabeth Joanne Johnson  13-1302 (F4)  CUSTODIAL INTERFERENCE  12/18/2009  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  10/18/2012 
Elizabeth Joanne Johnson  13-1302 (F4)  CUSTODIAL INTERFERENCE  12/18/2009  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  10/18/2012 
Tammi Peters Smith  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  12/14/2009  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/11/2010 
Tammi Peters Smith  13-1302 (F4)  CUSTODIAL INTERFERENCE  12/9/2009  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/11/2010 
Tammi Peters Smith  13-1302 (F4)  CUSTODIAL INTERFERENCE  12/9/2009  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  5/17/2012 
Tammi Peters Smith  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  12/14/2009  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  5/17/2012 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
12/23/2014  930 - ME: Order Designating Case Historically Significant - Party (001)  12/23/2014   
12/22/2014  ORD - Order - Party (001)  12/24/2014   
NOTE: FOR HISTORICALLY SIGNIFICANT CASE DESIGNATION
12/22/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/24/2014   
NOTE: TO DESIGNATE CASE AS HISTORICALLY SIGNIFICANT
11/24/2014  930 - ME: Order Designating Case Historically Significant - Party (002)  11/24/2014   
11/21/2014  ORD - Order - Party (002)  11/26/2014   
NOTE: FOR HISTORICALLY SIGNIFICANT CASE DESIGNATION
11/21/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  11/26/2014   
NOTE: TO DESIGNATE CASE AS HISTORICALLY SIGNIFICANT
9/29/2014  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (002)  9/30/2014   
8/26/2014  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (002)  8/26/2014   
8/6/2014  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (002)  8/8/2014   
NOTE: COUNT 1
8/6/2014  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (002)  8/8/2014   
NOTE: COUNT 2
7/2/2014  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  7/2/2014   
5/9/2014  PHC - Petition For Habeas Corpus - Party (001)  5/9/2014   
NOTE: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
4/28/2014  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (002)  4/30/2014   
NOTE: AMENDED
4/28/2014  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (002)  4/30/2014   
4/28/2014  MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (002)  4/30/2014   
NOTE: AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART/1CA-CR12-0443
4/25/2014  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (002)  5/6/2014   
NOTE: 04/17/12 BY JANELL ROSE
4/25/2014  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (002)  5/6/2014   
NOTE: 07/26/11 BY MICHAEL A BABICKY
4/25/2014  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (002)  5/6/2014   
NOTE: 07/26/11 BY MICHAEL A BABICKY
4/25/2014  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (002)  5/6/2014   
NOTE: 04/19/12 BY JANELL ROSE
4/24/2014  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)  4/28/2014   
NOTE: COUNT 3
4/24/2014  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)  4/28/2014   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS PETITION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION
4/11/2014  PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (002)  4/16/2014   
NOTE: COUNT 2
4/11/2014  PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (002)  4/16/2014   
NOTE: COUNT 1
2/13/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/13/2014   
2/7/2014  RMT - Response to Defendant’s Motion to Terminate Probation - Party (002)  2/11/2014   
2/7/2014  RPT - Response to Petition for Early Termination - Party (002)  2/7/2014   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S PETITION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION OR MODIFICATION TO UNSUPERVISED PROBATION
2/6/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/7/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY MOTION TO MODIFY SENTENCING ORDER ISSUED DECEMBER 7, 2012
1/24/2014  PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (002)  1/28/2014   
NOTE: COUNT 1
1/24/2014  PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (002)  1/28/2014   
NOTE: COUNT 2
6/24/2013  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  6/26/2013   
4/25/2013  NTF - Notice to the File - Party (002)  4/25/2013   
4/25/2013  LET - Letter - Party (002)  4/25/2013   
2/25/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)  2/25/2013   
2/12/2013  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)  2/12/2013   
1/3/2013  RES - Response - Party (002)  1/3/2013   
NOTE: TO STATE’S REQUEST FOR TERM OF PROBATION
12/14/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  12/31/2012   
12/14/2012  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  1/22/2013   
12/12/2012  118 - ME: Modifica/Terms Probation - Party (002)  12/12/2012   
12/12/2012  189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (001)  12/12/2012   
12/7/2012  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  12/21/2012   
12/7/2012  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  12/28/2012   
12/7/2012  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  12/13/2012   
12/7/2012  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  12/18/2012   
12/6/2012  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  12/10/2012   
NOTE: STATE'S/
12/6/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  12/10/2012   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE CONSECUTIVE SENTENCES
12/5/2012  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  12/5/2012   
NOTE: SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
12/5/2012  REQ - Request - Party (001)  12/5/2012   
NOTE: REQUEST TO FILE EXHIBITS TO SENTENCING MEMORANDUM UNDER SEAL
12/5/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  12/5/2012   
NOTE: OF LETTER FOR SENTENCING HEARING
12/5/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  12/5/2012   
NOTE: OF LETTER FOR SENTENCING HEARING
12/5/2012  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (002)  12/6/2012   
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS ORDER
11/28/2012  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)  11/28/2012   
NOTE: OFFICE OF CONTRACT COUNSEL
11/27/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/28/2012   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE CONSECUTIVE SENTENCES
11/26/2012  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (002)  11/27/2012   
NOTE: TRANSMITTED
11/20/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  11/20/2012   
11/19/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  12/12/2012   
11/13/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/14/2012   
NOTE: OF WITNESSES EXPECTED TO APPEAR AT SENTENCING, MOTION TO HAVE CERTAIN WITNESSES APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY, AND MOTION TO HAVE CERTAIN WITNESSES NOT SHOWN THROUGH MEDIA COVERAGE
11/8/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  11/8/2012   
11/2/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/2/2012   
NOTE: FOR FUNDS TO RETAIN A PSYCHOLOGIST
10/31/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  11/1/2012   
NOTE: STATE'S/ TO STRIKE STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. 13-703
10/30/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  10/31/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ TO THE STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
10/29/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  10/29/2012   
NOTE: STATE'S/ TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS FILED ON OCTOBER 18, 2012
10/25/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/25/2012   
10/24/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/31/2012   
NOTE: TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
10/23/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/23/2012   
10/22/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/22/2012   
NOTE: TO STRIKE STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES COMMITTED ON MULTIPLE OCCASIONS PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703
10/19/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  10/19/2012   
10/18/2012  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: RANDOM
10/18/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/18/2012   
10/18/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: #8
10/18/2012  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES/
10/18/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED
10/18/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED
10/18/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED
10/18/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED
10/18/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED
10/18/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED
10/18/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: NOT SIGNED
10/17/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/31/2012   
10/16/2012  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: FINAL/
10/15/2012  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  10/16/2012   
NOTE: LEGAL /RE: RESTRAINT
10/12/2012  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  10/12/2012   
NOTE: COUNT ONE OF THE INDICTMENT
10/12/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/12/2012   
NOTE: PURSUANT TO RULE 20 RE: KIDNAPPING
10/12/2012  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  10/12/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUESTED FINAL/
10/9/2012  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)  10/9/2012   
10/5/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/5/2012   
10/4/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  10/4/2012   
10/4/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/4/2012   
10/4/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/4/2012   
10/3/2012  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  10/4/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REQUESTED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS
10/2/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: #7
10/2/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: #6
10/2/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: #5
10/1/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: #4
10/1/2012  REC - Receipt - Party (002)  10/3/2012   
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL
10/1/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
10/1/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
10/1/2012  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (002)  10/2/2012   
10/1/2012  REC - Receipt - Party (002)  10/2/2012   
NOTE: PUBLIC DEFENDER
9/28/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  9/28/2012   
9/28/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  9/28/2012   
9/28/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/28/2012   
9/28/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  9/28/2012   
9/28/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/28/2012   
9/26/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: #3
9/26/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: #1
9/26/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/26/2012   
9/26/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  9/26/2012   
9/26/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: # 2
9/21/2012  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (002)  9/24/2012   
9/20/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/20/2012   
9/20/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/20/2012   
9/20/2012  STP - Stipulation - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: TO THE TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL KADOSH
9/20/2012  STP - Stipulation - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
NOTE: TO THE TESTIMONY OF FRANK VASQUEZ
9/20/2012  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  10/26/2012   
NOTE: PRELIMINARY/
9/19/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/19/2012   
NOTE: FOR LUNCH
9/18/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  9/18/2012   
9/17/2012  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  9/17/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S/ TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF FRANK MCQUEARY
9/17/2012  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  9/17/2012   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT ADMISSIBILITY OF TAMMI SMITH'S STATEMENTS
9/17/2012  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  9/17/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF LOGAN MCQUEARYS STATE OF MIND
9/14/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/14/2012   
9/13/2012  ORD - Order - Party (002)  9/18/2012   
NOTE: RELEASING TO THE CLERK OF MARICOPA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, EXHIBITS FOR USE BY JOSEPH KREAMER, JUDGE FOR THE TEMPORARY USE IN THE SUPERIOR COURT, AND THAT SAID ITEMS BE RETURNED IN AN UNALTERED CONDITION TO THE COURT OF APPEALS, DIVISION ONE BY 11/13/12
9/13/2012  LET - Letter - Party (002)  9/18/2012   
9/13/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/13/2012   
9/13/2012  REQ - Request - Party (001)  9/14/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENT TO / PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND REQUESTED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS
9/13/2012  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
9/12/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  9/12/2012   
9/12/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/12/2012   
9/12/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  9/12/2012   
9/10/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  9/10/2012   
NOTE: IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ELIZABETH JOHNSON’S STATEMENT TO SPECIAL AGENT CHAVEZ
9/10/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  9/10/2012   
NOTE: IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ELIZABETH JOHNSON’S STATEMENT TO DETECTIVE VELAZQUEZ
9/10/2012  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (002)  9/12/2012   
9/10/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/10/2012   
9/7/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  9/7/2012   
NOTE: STATES/ IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ELIZABETH JOHNSON'S STATEMENT TO SPECIAL AGENT CHAVEZ
9/7/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/7/2012   
NOTE: TO REMOVE DEFENDANTS SHOCK BELT
9/7/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  9/7/2012   
NOTE: IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ELIZABETH JOHNSONS STATEMENT TO DETECTIVE VELAZQUEZ
9/6/2012  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (002)  9/7/2012   
9/6/2012  REC - Receipt - Party (002)  9/7/2012   
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL
9/6/2012  REC - Receipt - Party (002)  9/7/2012   
NOTE: PUBLIC DEFENDER
9/5/2012  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  9/5/2012   
9/4/2012  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  9/5/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / TO EXCLUDE ELIZABETH JOHNSONS STATEMENT TO DETECTIVE VELAZQUEZ
9/4/2012  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  9/5/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / TO EXCLUDE ELIZABETH JOHNSONS STATEMENT TO SPECIAL AGENT REGINO CHAVEZ
9/4/2012  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  9/12/2012  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: AUTHORIZATION FOR APPEARANCE BY CERTIFIED LIMITED PRACTICE STUDENT
8/30/2012  REQ - Request - Party (001)  8/31/2012   
NOTE: PARTIES JOINT / JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE
8/30/2012  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (002)  9/4/2012   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT
8/30/2012  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (002)  9/4/2012   
8/28/2012  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  8/28/2012   
8/27/2012  RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)  8/28/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PRELIMINARY
8/23/2012  MFH - Motion For Hearing - Party (001)  8/23/2012   
NOTE: VOLUNTARINESS
8/22/2012  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)  8/28/2012   
8/21/2012  DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (002)  8/22/2012   
NOTE: Designation of Record for Appeal
8/21/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/21/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE NOTICE
8/21/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/21/2012   
NOTE: OF JOINING STATES PROPOSED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE AND REQUEST TO INCLUDE ADDITIONAL QUESTIONS
8/21/2012  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  8/21/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / TO EXCLUDE A TEXT MESSAGE BETWEEN ELIZABETH JOHNSON AND TAMMI SMITH
8/16/2012  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  8/16/2012   
NOTE:
8/15/2012  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (002)  8/21/2012   
8/15/2012  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (002)  8/21/2012   
NOTE: DECLINING JURISDICTION OF SPECIAL ACTION
8/15/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  8/15/2012   
8/15/2012  REQ - Request - Party (001)  8/16/2012   
NOTE: STATES/ JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE
8/13/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  8/28/2012   
NOTE: FOR FUNDS FOR FTR OF TAMMI SMITH TRIAL
8/10/2012  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  8/10/2012   
8/9/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/15/2012   
NOTE: FOR FUNDS FOR FTR OF TRAMMI SMITH TRIAL
8/7/2012  NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (002)  8/7/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Cross-Appeal
8/7/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/8/2012   
NOTE: FOR FUNDS FOR FTR OF TAMMI SMITH TRIAL
8/3/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/6/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TEXT MESSAGES AND LIMIT RECORDING
8/2/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  8/3/2012   
NOTE: TO EXCLUDE TEXT MESSAGES AND LIMIT RECORDING
7/31/2012  REQ - Request - Party (002)  7/31/2012   
NOTE: STATE’S / FOR TERM OF PROBATION
7/31/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  7/31/2012   
NOTE: STATES / TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO ADMIT OTHER ACTS
7/30/2012  130 - ME: Counsel Appt For Appeal - Party (002)  7/30/2012   
7/23/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  7/23/2012   
7/23/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  7/23/2012   
7/23/2012  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  7/23/2012   
7/20/2012  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  8/3/2012  Defendant (2)  
7/20/2012  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (002)  8/6/2012   
7/19/2012  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  7/19/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S/ TO EXCLUDE TEXT MESSAGES AND LIMIT RECORDING
7/19/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/19/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S/ TO THE STATES MOTION TO ADMIT OTHER ACTS UNDER RULE 404(b) , ARIZ. R. EVIDENCE
7/18/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  7/19/2012   
NOTE: NOTIFICATION TO COURT REPORTER NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
7/17/2012  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)  7/20/2012   
7/17/2012  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (002)  7/20/2012   
7/17/2012  NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (002)  7/17/2012   
NOTE:
7/17/2012  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)  7/17/2012   
NOTE:
7/16/2012  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (002)  7/16/2012   
7/16/2012  ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)  8/1/2012   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE
7/16/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  8/1/2012   
NOTE: THAT ANY AND ALL POLICE REPORTS PROVIDED BY SAN ANTONIO PD TO THE STATE AND DEFENDANT SHALL BE SEALED
7/10/2012  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  7/10/2012   
NOTE: STATES / COUNT 2 OF THE INDICTMENT
7/10/2012  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  7/10/2012   
7/9/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/10/2012   
NOTE: FOR FUNDS FOR TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES
7/9/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/10/2012   
NOTE: FOR FUNDS TO RETAIN AN INVESTIGATOR
7/6/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)  7/6/2012   
7/6/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)  7/6/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL/ LETTERS
7/6/2012  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (002)  7/18/2012   
7/6/2012  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)  7/20/2012   
7/5/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)  7/5/2012   
7/5/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)  7/5/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL / OF FILING LETTERS
7/5/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/5/2012   
NOTE: STIPULATED MOTION FOR ORDER TO DISCLOSE POLICE REPORTS
7/3/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)  7/3/2012   
NOTE: Defense / to Stats Motion to Stay
7/2/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  7/2/2012   
NOTE: TO STAY SENTENCING PROCEEDINGS PENDING CONSIDERATION OF SPECIAL ACTION IN REGARD TO ARS §13-703 RULING
7/2/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)  7/3/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Letters
7/2/2012  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (002)  7/3/2012   
NOTE: Sentencing Memorandum
6/29/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)  6/29/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL/ OF LETTERS
6/29/2012  REQ - Request - Party (002)  6/29/2012   
NOTE: DEFENSE / FOR ORAL ARGUMENT ON STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE
6/29/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/29/2012   
NOTE: TO ADMIT OTHER ACTS UNDER RULE 404(b), ARIZ. R. EVIDENCE
6/29/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)  6/29/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL / LETTERS
6/28/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  6/28/2012   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE
6/28/2012  RES - Response - Party (002)  6/28/2012   
NOTE: AMENDED RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE
6/28/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)  6/28/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL/ LETTERS
6/28/2012  REL - Reply - Party (002)  6/29/2012   
NOTE: STATE’S/ TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING SCHEDULED FOR JULY 6, 2012
6/27/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)  6/27/2012   
NOTE: LETTERS
6/27/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  6/27/2012   
NOTE: SENTENCING SCHEDULED FOR JULY 6, 2012
6/22/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)  6/22/2012   
6/11/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  6/11/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL FILING FOR / FOR NEW TRIAL
6/6/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  6/6/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL/ TO Strike State’s Allegation of Multiple Offenses Committed on Multiple Occasions pursuant to A.R.S. §13-703
6/6/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)  6/7/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO STATE’S/ TO STRIKE STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES COMMITTED ON MULTIPLE OCCASIONS PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §13-703
6/5/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)  6/6/2012   
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FOR NEW TRIAL OR JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL
6/5/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  6/6/2012   
NOTE: TO STRIKE STATES ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES COMMITTED ON MULTIPLE OCCASIONS PURSUANT TO ARS §13-703
5/31/2012  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  5/31/2012   
5/31/2012  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (002)  6/13/2012   
5/24/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  5/24/2012   
NOTE: FOR NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 24.1/MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DIRECTED VERDICT UNDER RULE 20 /MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL UNDER RULE 20(b)
5/23/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  5/23/2012   
5/23/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  5/23/2012   
5/23/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  5/23/2012   
5/23/2012  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  5/23/2012   
NOTE:
5/23/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  5/24/2012   
NOTE: SHERIFF ARPAIOS / IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF APRIL 26, 2012 COURT ORDER ON JAIL VISITATION ISSUES AND RESPONSE TO DEFENEDANT JOHNSONS MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
5/22/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  5/22/2012   
5/17/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  5/17/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS REPLY TO THE STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
5/17/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/18/2012   
NOTE: TO REVEAL AND PRECLUDE EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 404
5/17/2012  WSH - Worksheet - Party (002)  5/31/2012   
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING
5/17/2012  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)  5/31/2012   
NOTE: AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES/
5/17/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  5/31/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED
5/17/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  5/31/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED
5/17/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  5/31/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED
5/17/2012  VER - Verdict - Party (002)  5/31/2012   
NOTE: SIGNED
5/17/2012  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (002)  6/1/2012   
5/15/2012  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)  6/4/2012   
NOTE: FINAL/ OF LAW
5/14/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)  5/30/2012   
5/14/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)  5/31/2012   
5/14/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  5/14/2012   
5/14/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  5/14/2012   
5/14/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  5/14/2012   
5/11/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  5/11/2012   
5/9/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)  5/31/2012   
5/9/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  5/9/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / TO SHERIFF ARPAIOS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT ORDER AND MOTION TO STAY COURT ORDER
5/8/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  5/8/2012   
5/8/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  5/8/2012   
5/8/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/8/2012   
NOTE: FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
5/8/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/8/2012   
NOTE: PURSUANT TO RULE 20 RE: CHILD ABUSE
5/8/2012  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  5/9/2012   
NOTE: Sheeriff Arpaios / of April 26, 2012 Court Order on Jail Visitation Issues
5/8/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/9/2012   
NOTE: OF ERRATA AND MOTION TO CORRECT TITLE
5/7/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  5/7/2012   
5/3/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  5/3/2012   
5/2/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  5/2/2012   
NOTE: TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS FILED ON 4-25-12
5/2/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)  5/8/2012   
5/2/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)  5/8/2012   
5/1/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  5/1/2012   
5/1/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  5/1/2012   
5/1/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  5/1/2012   
5/1/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)  5/31/2012   
4/30/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  4/30/2012   
4/27/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  4/27/2012   
NOTE: Motion to Reconsider Ruling on States Motion to Preclude Mental Health Testimony
4/27/2012  ORD - Order - Party (001)  5/8/2012   
NOTE: THAT THE MCSO SHALL ALLWO CONTACT LEGAL VISITS WITHOUT THE DEFENDANTS BEING RESTRAINED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT
4/26/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)  5/31/2012   
4/25/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  4/25/2012   
4/25/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/25/2012   
NOTE: TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
4/23/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)  4/23/2012   
4/23/2012  REQ - Request - Party (001)  4/23/2012   
NOTE: FOR ORDER RE: REMOVAL OF RESTRAINTS DURING CONTACT LEGAL VISITS
4/20/2012  MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (002)  4/27/2012   
NOTE: SUBPOENA OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
4/20/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  4/20/2012   
4/20/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  4/20/2012   
4/19/2012  025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (002)  4/19/2012   
4/19/2012  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  4/19/2012   
4/18/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)  5/31/2012   
4/17/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  4/17/2012   
4/17/2012  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)  5/31/2012   
NOTE: PRELIMINARY/
4/16/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)  4/16/2012   
4/16/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  4/16/2012   
4/16/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)  4/16/2012   
4/10/2012  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)  4/10/2012   
4/10/2012  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  4/10/2012   
4/9/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  4/17/2012   
4/6/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)  4/6/2012   
4/6/2012  RES - Response - Party (002)  4/6/2012   
NOTE: to State’s Motion for Protective Order
4/6/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  4/6/2012   
NOTE: FOR RECONSIDERATION OF STATE’S REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING PRIOR TO JURY SELECTIO
4/6/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  4/6/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S SECOND RULE 609 /- Craig Cherry
4/5/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)  4/5/2012   
4/5/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/5/2012   
4/5/2012  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)  4/11/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 03/15/12
4/4/2012  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  4/4/2012   
4/3/2012  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  4/3/2012   
NOTE: SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL /RE: SIXTH AMENDMENT VIOLATION
4/3/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  4/3/2012   
NOTE: STATES / TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM RE :SIXTH AMENDMENT VIOLATION
4/3/2012  JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)  4/3/2012   
NOTE: STATES PROPOSED ADDITIONAL / FOR JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE
4/2/2012  PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions - Party (002)  4/2/2012   
NOTE:
4/2/2012  ORD - Order - Party (002)  4/12/2012   
NOTE: WITNESS TO PARTICIPATE IN DEFENSE INTERVIEW
3/30/2012  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)  3/30/2012   
3/30/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)  3/30/2012   
3/30/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  3/30/2012   
3/28/2012  ORD - Order - Party (002)  4/4/2012   
NOTE: THAT WITNESS THE HONORABLE MICHAEL MCVEY SUBMIT TO A DENFENSE INTERVIEW
3/28/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  4/12/2012   
3/28/2012  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)  3/28/2012   
3/28/2012  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)  3/28/2012   
3/28/2012  REQ - Request - Party (002)  3/28/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS /JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE
3/28/2012  RES - Response - Party (002)  3/28/2012   
NOTE: TO STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE MENTAL HEALTH TESTIMONY
3/28/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  3/28/2012   
NOTE: TRIAL
3/22/2012  RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (002)  3/22/2012   
NOTE:
3/22/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  3/22/2012   
NOTE: STATES EXPEDITED/ REQUESTING ORDER FOR DEFENSE INTERVIEW
3/20/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  3/20/2012   
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE MENTAL HEALTH TESTIMONY
3/19/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  3/19/2012   
3/19/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  3/19/2012   
NOTE: STATES EXPEDITED / REQUESTING COURT ORDERED DEFENSE INTERVIEW
3/16/2012  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  3/16/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL / RE: SIXTH AMENDMENT VIOLATION
3/7/2012  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  3/7/2012   
3/6/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/6/2012   
3/6/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)  3/6/2012   
3/5/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  3/5/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS RULE 609/
3/2/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  3/2/2012   
NOTE: STATES EXPEDITED / REQUESTING DEFENSE INTERVIEW
3/2/2012  ORD - Order - Party (002)  3/7/2012   
NOTE: THAT WITNESS JUDICAL ASSISTANT JOHN JOHNSON SUBMIT TO THE DEFENSE INTERVIEW
3/1/2012  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  3/1/2012   
2/28/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  3/14/2012   
2/17/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/17/2012   
2/15/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)  2/16/2012   
NOTE: TO STRIKE STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES COMMITTED ON MULTIPLE OCCASIONS PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §13-703
2/14/2012  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  2/14/2012   
2/14/2012  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)  2/14/2012   
2/10/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/15/2012   
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF LEGAL COUNSEL WITH CLIENT CONSENT
2/10/2012  SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)  2/15/2012   
2/10/2012  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  2/15/2012   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR OMNIBUS HEARING AND REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
2/3/2012  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)  2/3/2012   
1/31/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  1/31/2012   
NOTE: to Strike State’s Allegation of Multiple Offenses Committed on Multiple Occasions pursuant to A.R.S. §13-703
1/27/2012  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  1/27/2012   
1/23/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/23/2012   
1/19/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/19/2012   
1/17/2012  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  1/17/2012   
1/17/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  1/17/2012   
NOTE: TRIAL DATE OF FEBRUARY 21, 2012
1/17/2012  LET - Letter - Party (001)  1/20/2012   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION TO FILE TRANSCRIPT
1/11/2012  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  1/11/2012   
1/11/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  1/11/2012   
NOTE: Defendant’s / of Disclosure
12/15/2011  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  12/15/2011   
12/15/2011  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  12/15/2011   
12/13/2011  ORD - Order - Party (001)  12/19/2011   
NOTE: THAT COURT REPORTERS CINDY BENNER AND MARMIE GUIMONT TRANSCRIBE THE FOLLING WITNESS TESTIMONY WHICH OCCURRED ON 09/16/11 AND 09/30/11: DR GWEN LEVIN, DR. DANIEL GAUGHAN, DR. LAWRENCE ALLEN, DR. BRUCE KUSHNER, DR. JOHN SCHAUGHNESSY AND DR. THOMAS GREEN
12/8/2011  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  12/8/2011   
12/8/2011  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  12/8/2011   
12/7/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  12/19/2011   
11/29/2011  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  12/1/2011   
NOTE: 09/16/11 BY CINDY BENNER
11/23/2011  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  11/23/2011   
11/14/2011  048 - ME: Informal Conference - Party (001)  11/14/2011   
11/9/2011  WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)  11/15/2011   
NOTE: HEARING/
11/9/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  11/18/2011   
10/4/2011  124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)  10/4/2011   
9/30/2011  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  10/7/2011   
9/30/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/19/2011   
9/30/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/19/2011   
9/30/2011  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)  9/30/2011   
9/28/2011  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (002)  10/5/2011   
NOTE: SUPERVISED RELEASE AND SECURED APPEARANCE BOND $15,000 (POSTED)
9/27/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  9/28/2011   
NOTE: STATES/ TRIAL 10-5-11
9/20/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  9/20/2011   
9/16/2011  LET - Letter - Party (001)  9/19/2011   
9/16/2011  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  9/19/2011  Defendant (2)  
9/16/2011  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  9/19/2011  Defendant (2)  
9/16/2011  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  9/19/2011  Defendant (2)  
9/16/2011  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  9/19/2011  Defendant (2)  
9/16/2011  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  9/19/2011  Defendant (2)  
9/16/2011  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  9/19/2011  Defendant (2)  
9/16/2011  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  9/19/2011  Defendant (2)  
9/16/2011  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  9/19/2011  Defendant (2)  
9/16/2011  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  9/19/2011  Defendant (2)  
9/14/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/14/2011   
NOTE: Renewed Motion to Remove the Maricopa County Attorneys Office
9/6/2011  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  9/6/2011   
9/6/2011  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  9/6/2011   
8/30/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/30/2011   
8/29/2011  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  8/29/2011   
8/24/2011  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/24/2011   
NOTE: Reply to Response to Motion to Remove Maricopa County Attorneys Office
8/24/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/7/2011   
8/24/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/8/2011   
8/22/2011  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  8/22/2011   
NOTE: TO REMOVE THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE
8/12/2011  MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (001)  8/12/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Quash Criminal Subpoena
8/10/2011  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  8/10/2011   
8/10/2011  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  8/10/2011   
8/10/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/10/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Remove the Maricopa County Attorneys Office
8/8/2011  ORD - Order - Party (001)  8/15/2011   
NOTE: DIRECTING THE CORRECITONAL HEALTH SERVICES TO RELEASE TO COURT STAFF ALL RECORDS RELATED TO THE COMPETENCY EVALUATION
8/4/2011  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  8/4/2011   
8/4/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  8/4/2011   
8/4/2011  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)  8/4/2011   
8/4/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/5/2011   
NOTE: TO REQUEST COURT ORDER FOR RELEASE OF COMPETENCY RECORDS
7/28/2011  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  7/28/2011   
7/27/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  7/27/2011   
NOTE: TRIAL OF AUGUST 1, 2011
7/13/2011  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  7/13/2011   
NOTE: TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
7/8/2011  RES - Response - Party (002)  7/8/2011   
NOTE: TO STATES MOTION TO ADMIT OTHER ACTS UNDER RULE 404(B)
7/8/2011  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)  7/11/2011   
NOTE: RE DEFENDANTS MENTAL HEALTH HISTORY
7/5/2011  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  7/5/2011   
7/1/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  7/1/2011   
NOTE: States Motion to Admit Other Acts Under 404(B)
6/14/2011  122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)  6/14/2011   
6/14/2011  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)  6/14/2011   
NOTE: FOR DISCOVERY OF ALL E-MAIL COMMUNICATIONS RECEIVED BY THE STATE FROM THE PUBLIC
6/10/2011  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)  6/10/2011   
6/8/2011  122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)  6/8/2011   
6/8/2011  025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (002)  6/8/2011   
6/8/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)  6/8/2011   
6/7/2011  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002)  6/8/2011   
NOTE: Motion for Discovery of All E-mail Communications Received by the State from the Public
6/6/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/6/2011   
NOTE: Defendants Motion to Modify Release Conditions
6/2/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  6/2/2011   
NOTE: TO DETERMINE COUNSEL
5/31/2011  122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)  5/31/2011   
5/31/2011  025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)  5/31/2011   
5/27/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  5/27/2011   
5/27/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)  5/27/2011   
5/20/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/20/2011   
5/20/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/20/2011   
5/20/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/20/2011   
5/20/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  5/20/2011   
5/19/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/19/2011   
NOTE: TO COMPEL ATTENDNCE OF WITNESS AT EVIDENTIARY HEARING
5/19/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  6/3/2011   
5/19/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  6/6/2011   
5/17/2011  REL - Reply - Party (001)  5/18/2011   
NOTE: DETECTIVE SALAME'S / IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SEAL DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR COSTS FOR DEPOSITION
5/17/2011  MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (001)  5/19/2011   
NOTE: TRIAL SUBPOENA
5/16/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  6/14/2011   
5/16/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  6/14/2011   
5/4/2011  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)  5/4/2011   
5/4/2011  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  5/4/2011   
5/3/2011  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)  5/3/2011   
5/3/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  5/3/2011   
NOTE: Response to Salame and City of San Antonios Motion to Seal detective salames deposition
4/28/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  4/28/2011   
NOTE: STATUS CONFERENCE
4/28/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/3/2011   
NOTE: TO SEAL DETECTIVE SALAME'S DEPOSITION
4/20/2011  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  4/20/2011   
4/15/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  4/15/2011   
NOTE: TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
4/14/2011  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  4/14/2011   
3/10/2011  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  3/10/2011   
2/25/2011  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  2/25/2011   
2/14/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)  2/14/2011   
2/2/2011  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  2/2/2011   
2/2/2011  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  2/2/2011   
2/2/2011  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)  2/2/2011   
1/31/2011  ORD - Order - Party (001)  2/3/2011   
NOTE: SEALING STATE'S SUPPLEMENT TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDNT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND STATE'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF APPEARNACE AT COURT HEARINGS
1/31/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  2/11/2011   
1/31/2011  LET - Letter - Party (001)  1/31/2011   
1/31/2011  LET - Letter - Party (001)  1/31/2011   
1/31/2011  LET - Letter - Party (001)  1/31/2011   
1/31/2011  CER - Certificate - Party (001)  1/31/2011   
NOTE: OF REQUESTING JUDGE
1/28/2011  REP - Report - Party (001)  1/28/2011   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
1/20/2011  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)  1/20/2011   
1/20/2011  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)  1/20/2011   
1/20/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/20/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Have Investigator Appointed
1/20/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  1/20/2011   
NOTE: Response to States Request for Defense Particular Bases for Rule 15.1 Request For Discovery
1/12/2011  REQ - Request - Party (001)  1/12/2011   
NOTE: STATE’S REQEST FOR DEFENSE PARTICULAR BASES FOR RULE 15.1- REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
1/6/2011  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (002)  1/6/2011   
1/6/2011  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  1/10/2011   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM SERVED 12/30/10
1/6/2011  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  1/10/2011   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM/SERVED 12/30/10
12/22/2010  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)  12/22/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw
12/15/2010  REL - Reply - Party (002)  12/15/2010   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9
12/14/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  12/14/2010   
12/9/2010  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  12/10/2010  Defendant (2)  
12/9/2010  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)  12/9/2010   
NOTE: TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY
12/8/2010  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)  12/8/2010   
NOTE: TO FILE REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS
12/8/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/8/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Depose Detective John Salame Pursuant to Rule 15.3 A.R.C.P.
12/6/2010  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)  12/6/2010   
NOTE: Substitution of Counsel
12/1/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  12/1/2010   
NOTE: MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9
11/24/2010  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  11/24/2010   
11/19/2010  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  11/19/2010   
11/19/2010  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)  11/19/2010   
11/19/2010  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  11/19/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw
11/16/2010  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  11/17/2010   
NOTE: Motion To Continue Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss
11/10/2010  ORD - Order - Party (001)  11/29/2010   
NOTE: THAT ALL TRANSCRIPTS ATTACHED TO STATE'S RESPONSE BE FILED UNDER SEAL
11/10/2010  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  12/6/2010   
11/4/2010  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  11/4/2010   
11/4/2010  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)  11/4/2010   
11/1/2010  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  11/10/2010   
NOTE: TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS
10/29/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  10/29/2010   
10/29/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)  10/29/2010   
10/27/2010  ORD - Order - Party (001)  11/1/2010   
NOTE: COMPELLING INFORMATION AND WITNESS INTERVIEW
10/22/2010  REQ - Request - Party (002)  10/22/2010   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RULE 12.9
10/13/2010  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  10/13/2010   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS
10/8/2010  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  10/8/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss
10/6/2010  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (002)  10/6/2010   
10/5/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  10/5/2010   
10/5/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/5/2010   
10/1/2010  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)  10/1/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw and Request for Appointment of Counsel
10/1/2010  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  10/8/2010   
NOTE: CORRESPONDANCE
9/30/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/30/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw Motion for Change of Counsel
9/29/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)  9/29/2010   
9/29/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  9/29/2010   
9/27/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/28/2010  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: TO CHANGE COUNSEL
9/24/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/27/2010   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANGEMENT PLAN
9/24/2010  123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001)  9/24/2010   
9/24/2010  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  9/24/2010   
NOTE: TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
9/23/2010  SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)  9/30/2010   
9/23/2010  RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)  10/1/2010   
9/23/2010  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/13/2010   
9/22/2010  REP - Report - Party (001)  9/22/2010   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
9/22/2010  REP - Report - Party (001)  9/22/2010   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
9/22/2010  REP - Report - Party (002)  9/23/2010   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
9/17/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/17/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Vacate Hearings and Order Defendant Competent
9/15/2010  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  9/15/2010   
9/13/2010  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/24/2010   
9/13/2010  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/24/2010   
8/18/2010  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  8/18/2010   
8/18/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)  8/18/2010   
7/1/2010  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  7/1/2010   
7/1/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/14/2010   
NOTE: SERVED 06/30/10
6/29/2010  ORD - Order - Party (001)  7/2/2010   
NOTE: COMPELLING INFORMATION AND WITNESS INTERVIEWS
6/9/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)  6/9/2010   
6/9/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  6/9/2010   
6/9/2010  124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)  6/9/2010   
6/3/2010  SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)  6/14/2010   
6/3/2010  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)  6/3/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Extend Time to File Rule 12 9 Motion to Remand
6/3/2010  WAV - Waiver - Party (002)  6/3/2010   
NOTE: Waiver of Personal Appearance
6/3/2010  REP - Report - Party (001)  6/4/2010   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
6/3/2010  REP - Report - Party (002)  6/4/2010   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
6/3/2010  REP - Report - Party (002)  6/4/2010   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
6/3/2010  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/2/2010   
5/19/2010  122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)  5/19/2010   
4/29/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)  4/29/2010   
4/29/2010  120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)  4/29/2010   
4/26/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/27/2010   
NOTE: Motion for Rule 11 Evaluation
4/26/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  4/27/2010   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
4/22/2010  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  4/22/2010   
4/16/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/16/2010   
4/15/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/15/2010   
4/14/2010  REP - Report - Party (001)  4/15/2010   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
4/14/2010  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)  4/14/2010   
4/14/2010  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  4/14/2010   
4/14/2010  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/16/2010   
4/9/2010  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  4/12/2010   
4/8/2010  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  4/8/2010   
4/8/2010  098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001)  4/8/2010   
4/7/2010  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/8/2010   
4/7/2010  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/8/2010   
4/7/2010  RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)  4/9/2010   
4/5/2010  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  4/7/2010   
4/5/2010  REQ - Request - Party (001)  4/7/2010   
NOTE: FOR DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1
4/5/2010  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  4/7/2010   
4/1/2010  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (002)  4/1/2010   
4/1/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/5/2010   
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
3/30/2010  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  3/31/2010   
3/30/2010  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/31/2010   
3/30/2010  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/31/2010   
3/29/2010  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/31/2010   
3/26/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  3/26/2010   
3/23/2010  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)  3/23/2010   
3/23/2010  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (002)  3/23/2010   
NOTE:
3/23/2010  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (002)  3/23/2010   
NOTE:
3/23/2010  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)  3/23/2010   
NOTE:
3/23/2010  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/25/2010   
3/23/2010  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/25/2010   
3/23/2010  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/25/2010   
3/22/2010  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)  3/22/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Extend Time In Which to File Rule 12 9 Motion to Remand
3/17/2010  ORD - Order - Party (001)  3/23/2010   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR STILL AND ELECTRONIC CAMERAS
3/16/2010  REL - Reply - Party (001)  3/16/2010   
NOTE: Reply in Support of KPHO-TV CBS 5s Motion to Permit Television Camera and Video Coverage; and Request for Hearing
3/15/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/16/2010   
NOTE: KPHO-TV CBS 5'S / TO PERMIT TELEVISION CAMERA AND VIDEO COVERAGE AND REQUEST FOR HEARING
3/15/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  3/16/2010   
NOTE: Response to KPHO-TV CBS 5s Motion To Permit Television Camera and Video Coverage
3/15/2010  APL - Application - Party (001)  3/17/2010   
NOTE: DECLARATION OF JEROME PARRA IN SUPPORT OF / OF KPNX BROADCASTING CO. TO INTERVENE FOR THE LIMINTED PURPOSE OF OPPOSING DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO MEDIA COVERAGE
3/15/2010  APL - Application - Party (001)  3/17/2010   
NOTE: OF KPNX BROADCASTING CO. TO INTERVENE FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF OPPOSING DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO MEDIA COVERAGE
3/10/2010  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)  3/10/2010   
3/10/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/10/2010   
3/8/2010  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  3/9/2010   
3/8/2010  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)  3/9/2010   
3/8/2010  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)  3/9/2010   
3/5/2010  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/9/2010   
3/4/2010  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  3/4/2010   
3/3/2010  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  3/8/2010   
3/3/2010  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/8/2010   
3/3/2010  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/8/2010   
3/1/2010  BON - Bond - Party (002)  3/2/2010   
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY $15,000 SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY
3/1/2010  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/3/2010   
2/25/2010  REQ - Request - Party (001)  3/1/2010   
NOTE: FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS OR EXHIBITS
2/25/2010  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/1/2010   
2/25/2010  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/1/2010   
2/25/2010  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)  2/25/2010   
2/25/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/25/2010   
NOTE: FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION
2/25/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/25/2010   
NOTE: OF REQUEST FOR VICTIM INTERVIEW
2/24/2010  RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)  2/24/2010   
2/24/2010  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  2/24/2010   
2/24/2010  RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)  2/24/2010   
2/24/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/24/2010   
NOTE: FOR CONTEMPORANEOUS RECORDATION OF ARGUMENT ON MOTIONS AND OBJECTIONS TO PRESERVE DEFENDANT’S RIGHTS ON APPEAL
2/24/2010  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/24/2010   
NOTE: DISCOVERY / JAIL TAPES
2/24/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  2/24/2010   
NOTE: TO MEDIA COVERAGE
2/23/2010  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (002)  2/23/2010   
2/22/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/23/2010  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: TO CHANGE COUNSEL
2/18/2010  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)  2/23/2010   
2/18/2010  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)  2/18/2010   
2/10/2010  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)  2/11/2010  Plaintiff (1)  
2/10/2010  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)  2/11/2010   
2/10/2010  IND - Indictment - Party (002)  2/11/2010  Plaintiff (1)  
2/5/2010  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)  2/5/2010   
2/4/2010  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)  2/8/2010   
NOTE: $1,000,000
2/3/2010  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)  2/3/2010   
1/26/2010  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  1/26/2010   
1/21/2010  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  1/21/2010   
1/14/2010  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  1/14/2010   
1/14/2010  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  1/15/2010  Plaintiff (1)  
1/14/2010  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  1/15/2010   
1/14/2010  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  1/15/2010  Plaintiff (1)  
1/12/2010  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  1/13/2010   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/15/2010  8:35   Status Conference 
1/20/2010  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
1/25/2010  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
2/8/2010  8:35   Status Conference 
2/12/2010  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
2/18/2010  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
3/9/2010  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
3/9/2010  9:30   Oral Argument 
3/17/2010  10:00   Status Conference 
4/5/2010  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
4/6/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
4/6/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
4/16/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/16/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/23/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/23/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/27/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/27/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/3/2010  13:30   Rule 11 Hearing 
6/7/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
6/7/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
8/12/2010  13:30   Rule 11 Hearing 
8/16/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
8/16/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
9/23/2010  13:30   Rule 11 Hearing 
9/27/2010  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
9/27/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
9/27/2010  9:00   Rule 11 Hearing 
10/25/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
10/25/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
10/27/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
11/2/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
11/2/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
11/22/2010  9:30   Oral Argument 
12/1/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
12/9/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
1/10/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
1/24/2011  8:30   Oral Argument 
1/24/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
1/31/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
1/31/2011  8:30   Oral Argument 
2/11/2011  8:30   Oral Argument 
3/1/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
3/8/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
4/12/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
4/29/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
4/29/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
5/2/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/2/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/3/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/3/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/9/2011  8:30   Trial 
5/9/2011  10:30   Trial 
5/25/2011  10:30   Oral Argument 
5/25/2011  10:30   Oral Argument 
6/7/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
6/7/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
7/1/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
7/1/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
7/26/2011  8:30   Settlement Conference 
8/1/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/1/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/2/2011  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
8/8/2011  8:30   Trial 
8/8/2011  8:30   Trial 
8/11/2011  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
8/25/2011  9:00   Oral Argument 
9/2/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
9/2/2011  10:00   Status Conference 
9/16/2011  10:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
9/28/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/30/2011  10:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
10/5/2011  8:30   Trial 
11/9/2011  8:30   Informal Conference 
11/21/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
12/2/2011  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
12/7/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
12/13/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
1/6/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
1/13/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
2/1/2012  8:30   Oral Argument 
2/10/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
2/13/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
2/21/2012  8:30   Trial 
2/23/2012  10:30   Trial 
2/28/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
2/28/2012  10:30   Trial 
3/5/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
3/27/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/27/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/2/2012  8:00   Trial 
4/2/2012  8:00   Trial 
4/3/2012  13:30   Hearing Pending Motion 
4/5/2012  11:00   Status Conference 
4/5/2012  15:30   Status Conference 
4/6/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
4/9/2012  13:30   Trial 
4/10/2012  10:30   Trial 
4/11/2012  10:30   Trial 
4/12/2012  10:30   Trial 
4/16/2012  8:30   Oral Argument 
4/16/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
4/17/2012  10:30   Trial 
4/18/2012  10:30   Trial 
4/19/2012  10:30   Trial 
4/24/2012  10:30   Trial 
4/25/2012  10:30   Trial 
4/26/2012  10:30   Trial 
4/30/2012  10:30   Trial 
5/1/2012  10:30   Trial 
5/2/2012  10:30   Trial 
5/3/2012  10:30   Trial 
5/7/2012  10:30   Trial 
5/8/2012  10:30   Trial 
5/9/2012  10:30   Trial 
5/10/2012  10:30   Trial 
5/14/2012  10:30   Trial 
5/15/2012  10:30   Trial 
5/16/2012  10:30   Trial 
5/17/2012  10:30   Trial 
5/25/2012  8:30   Order To Show Cause 
6/18/2012  13:30   Oral Argument 
7/3/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
7/6/2012  13:30   Sentencing 
7/17/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
7/27/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
7/27/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
8/6/2012  13:30   Oral Argument 
8/9/2012  13:30   Status Conference 
8/20/2012  10:30   Status Conference 
8/22/2012  9:30   Status Conference 
8/28/2012  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/28/2012  9:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/4/2012  8:00   Trial 
9/4/2012  10:30   Trial 
9/4/2012  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
9/5/2012  10:30   Trial 
9/6/2012  10:30   Trial 
9/10/2012  13:30   Trial 
9/11/2012  10:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
9/11/2012  13:30   Trial 
9/13/2012  15:00   Evidentiary Hearing 
9/17/2012  10:30   Trial 
9/18/2012  10:30   Trial 
9/19/2012  10:30   Trial 
9/20/2012  10:30   Trial 
9/24/2012  8:25   Oral Argument 
9/24/2012  10:30   Trial 
9/25/2012  10:30   Trial 
9/26/2012  10:30   Trial 
9/27/2012  10:30   Trial 
10/1/2012  10:30   Trial 
10/2/2012  10:30   Trial 
10/3/2012  10:30   Trial 
10/4/2012  10:30   Trial 
10/15/2012  10:30   Trial 
10/16/2012  10:30   Trial 
10/17/2012  10:30   Trial 
10/18/2012  10:30   Trial 
11/1/2012  9:30   Oral Argument 
12/7/2012  8:30   Review Hearing 
12/7/2012  13:30   Sentencing 
2/1/2013  15:30   Status Conference 
2/20/2013  8:30   Status Conference 
2/22/2013  8:30   Status Conference 
click here for Self-Service Center