Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | LEMKE, KATHY | ||
Kevin Michael Gerster - (2) |
Defendant | M | Lopez, Nicole | Master Calendar | CR2010-008073-001 |
Clerk Of The Court - (3) |
In The Matter Of | N/A | To Be Determined |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Kevin Michael Gerster | 13-1204 (F6) | AGGRAVATED ASSAULT | 6/5/2010 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 10/21/2011 |
Kevin Michael Gerster | 13-1204 (F6) | AGGRAVATED ASSAULT | 6/5/2010 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 10/21/2011 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
11/15/2023 | OSJ - Order re: Setting Aside Judgment of Guilt - Party (001) | 11/16/2023 | |
NOTE: Court Clerk Document Plus | |||
10/17/2023 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 10/19/2023 | |
NOTE: States Response to Defendants Motion to Set Aside Conviction and Judgement of Guilt | |||
7/7/2023 | CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001) | 7/7/2023 | |
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet | |||
7/3/2023 | ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (001) | 7/6/2023 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SET ASIDE CONVICTION/ JUDGMENT OF GUILT | |||
7/3/2023 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 7/6/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Internal Reassignment | |||
9/23/2020 | ORR - Order re: Restoring Civil Rights - Party (001) | 9/23/2020 | |
NOTE: ORDER REGARDING APPLICATION TO RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS AND/OR RIGHT TO POSSESS OR OWN A FIREARM | |||
9/23/2020 | OSJ - Order re: Setting Aside Judgment of Guilt - Party (001) | 9/23/2020 | |
NOTE: ORDER REGARDING APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE CONVICTION and RESTORATION OF FIREARM RIGHTS A.R.S. §§13-905 & 13-910 | |||
6/4/2020 | CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001) | 6/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet | |||
6/4/2020 | CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001) | 6/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet | |||
5/29/2020 | ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (001) | 5/29/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE CONVICTION/JUDGMENT OF GUILT AND RESTORE ALL CIVIL RIGHTS | |||
5/29/2020 | ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (001) | 5/29/2020 | |
NOTE: motion to set aside conviction of guilt and restore all civil rights | |||
3/12/2020 | NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001) | 3/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of substitution of counsel | |||
2/25/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 2/25/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of appearance | |||
2/13/2013 | SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment - Party (001) | 2/20/2013 | |
1/2/2013 | LET - Letter - Party (001) | 1/7/2013 | |
10/19/2012 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (001) | 10/19/2012 | |
10/17/2012 | ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001) | 10/23/2012 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 | |||
10/17/2012 | CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001) | 10/24/2012 | |
9/2/2012 | RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001) | 9/10/2012 | |
11/8/2011 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 11/10/2011 | |
10/28/2011 | 109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001) | 10/28/2011 | |
10/21/2011 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 10/27/2011 | |
10/21/2011 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 10/28/2011 | |
10/21/2011 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 10/28/2011 | |
8/25/2011 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 8/25/2011 | |
8/22/2011 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 8/30/2011 | |
8/16/2011 | 085 - ME: Conference - Party (001) | 8/16/2011 | |
8/10/2011 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 8/10/2011 | |
6/17/2011 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 6/17/2011 | |
6/8/2011 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 6/8/2011 | |
5/24/2011 | 081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001) | 5/24/2011 | |
4/25/2011 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 4/26/2011 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue JT in CR2010-008073-001 | |||
3/15/2011 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/15/2011 | |
3/11/2011 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 3/17/2011 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
2/17/2011 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/17/2011 | |
2/14/2011 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 2/14/2011 | |
2/11/2011 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 2/17/2011 | |
2/10/2011 | PMS - Pretrial Management Statement - Party (001) | 2/15/2011 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
2/3/2011 | AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001) | 2/3/2011 | |
NOTE: | |||
2/3/2011 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001) | 2/3/2011 | |
NOTE: | |||
2/3/2011 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 2/3/2011 | |
NOTE: | |||
2/3/2011 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 2/3/2011 | |
NOTE: TO CONSOLIDATE OFFENSES | |||
1/25/2011 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 1/26/2011 | |
1/12/2011 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 1/20/2011 | |
1/12/2011 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 1/20/2011 | |
1/12/2011 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 1/20/2011 | |
1/7/2011 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 1/7/2011 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
12/27/2010 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 12/27/2010 | |
12/23/2010 | UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name - Party (001) | 12/29/2010 | Defendant (2) |
12/23/2010 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001) | 12/28/2010 | |
12/21/2010 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 12/27/2010 | |
NOTE: TO CONSOLIDATE | |||
12/14/2010 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 12/14/2010 | |
NOTE: SERVED 12/10/2010 | |||
12/14/2010 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 12/21/2010 | |
NOTE: NOT GUILTY PLEA | |||
12/14/2010 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 12/21/2010 | |
NOTE: FOR DISCOVERY | |||
12/9/2010 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 12/14/2010 | |
12/9/2010 | 600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001) | 12/14/2010 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
12/23/2010 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
2/10/2011 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
3/11/2011 | 8:15 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
5/18/2011 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/25/2011 | 8:00 | Trial |
6/9/2011 | 8:45 | Status Conference |
8/8/2011 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/12/2011 | 14:00 | Settlement Conference |
8/15/2011 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/22/2011 | 8:45 | Change Of Plea |
8/29/2011 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/8/2011 | 8:00 | Trial |
10/21/2011 | 10:30 | Sentencing |