« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, T P C Appeals
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Public Defender-, Ccc
Judge
Martin
Case #
CR2010-007912-001
Party Name
Eldridge Auzzele Gittens - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Droban-Zhivago, Kerrie
Judge
Unit
Case #
CR2010-007912-002
Party Name
Jerry Wayne CockhearnJr. - (4)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Mehu, Katia
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2010-007912-003
Party Name
Thandika Taweh Singleton - (5)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Per, Pro
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2010-007912-004
Party Name
John Howard WebberIII - (6)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Per, Pro
Judge
Palmer
Case #
CR2010-007912-005
Party Name
Corey Royalty - (8)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Green, Kyle
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2010-007912-007
Party Name
Anthony Jerome Wright - (9)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Brown, Matthew
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2010-007912-008
Party Name
B Witness - (10)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
F
Attorney
Tosto, Rick
Judge
Case #
CR2010-007912-008
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (11)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2010-007912-008
Disposition Information
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
8/19/2011
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
8/19/2011
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
8/19/2011
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
8/19/2011
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1904 (F3)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
8/19/2011
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1904 (F3)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
8/19/2011
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1904 (F3)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
8/19/2011
Description
ARMED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1904 (F2)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
8/19/2011
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
8/19/2011
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
8/19/2011
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F3)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
8/19/2011
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Anthony Jerome Wright
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
11/6/2020
Description
MURDER 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1104A (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Anthony Jerome Wright
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
11/6/2020
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Anthony Jerome Wright
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
11/6/2020
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Anthony Jerome Wright
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
11/6/2020
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Anthony Jerome Wright
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
11/6/2020
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Anthony Jerome Wright
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
11/6/2020
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Anthony Jerome Wright
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
11/6/2020
Description
ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Anthony Jerome Wright
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
11/6/2020
Description
MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Anthony Jerome Wright
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
4/29/2019
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3405A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Anthony Jerome Wright
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
12/6/2013
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F3)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Anthony Jerome Wright
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
12/6/2013
Description
MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Corey Royalty
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Corey Royalty
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Corey Royalty
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Corey Royalty
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Corey Royalty
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Corey Royalty
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Corey Royalty
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Corey Royalty
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/18/2022
Description
MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Corey Royalty
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3405A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Corey Royalty
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
12/6/2013
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F3)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Corey Royalty
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
12/6/2013
Description
MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Thandika Taweh Singleton
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2016
Description
MURDER 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1104 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Thandika Taweh Singleton
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2016
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Thandika Taweh Singleton
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2016
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Thandika Taweh Singleton
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2016
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Thandika Taweh Singleton
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2016
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Thandika Taweh Singleton
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2016
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Thandika Taweh Singleton
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2016
Description
ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Thandika Taweh Singleton
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2016
Description
MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Thandika Taweh Singleton
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2016
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3405A2 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Thandika Taweh Singleton
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
12/6/2013
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F3)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Thandika Taweh Singleton
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
12/6/2013
Description
MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Eldridge Auzzele Gittens
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
10/21/2013
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Eldridge Auzzele Gittens
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/5/2017
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Eldridge Auzzele Gittens
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/5/2017
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Eldridge Auzzele Gittens
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/5/2017
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Eldridge Auzzele Gittens
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/5/2017
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Eldridge Auzzele Gittens
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/5/2017
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Eldridge Auzzele Gittens
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/5/2017
Description
ARMED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1904 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Eldridge Auzzele Gittens
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/5/2017
Description
MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Eldridge Auzzele Gittens
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/5/2017
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3405A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Eldridge Auzzele Gittens
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/5/2017
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Eldridge Auzzele Gittens
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/5/2017
Description
MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Eldridge Auzzele Gittens
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
10/21/2013
Description
POSSESS/USE WPN IN DRUG OFF
ARSCode
13-3102A8 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Eldridge Auzzele Gittens
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/5/2017
Description
POSS WPN BY PROHIB PERSON
ARSCode
13-3102A4 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
John Howard Webber III
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/15/2016
Description
MURDER 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1104 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
John Howard Webber III
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/15/2016
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
John Howard Webber III
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/15/2016
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
John Howard Webber III
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/15/2016
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
John Howard Webber III
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/15/2016
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
John Howard Webber III
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/15/2016
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
John Howard Webber III
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/15/2016
Description
ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
John Howard Webber III
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/15/2016
Description
MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
John Howard Webber III
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/15/2016
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
John Howard Webber III
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
12/6/2013
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MARIJUANA-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3405A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
John Howard Webber III
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
12/6/2013
Description
MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2017
Description
MURDER 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1104 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2017
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2017
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2017
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2017
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2017
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2017
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2017
Description
ARMED ROBBERY-WITH DEADLY WPN
ARSCode
13-1904A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2017
Description
MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2017
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3405A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
12/6/2013
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MARIJUANA-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3405A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
12/6/2013
Description
MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
9/16/2016
Description
POSSESS/USE WPN IN DRUG OFF
ARSCode
13-3102A8 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Doarnell Reuna Jackson
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
7/21/2017
Description
MISCONDUCT INVOLVING WEAPONS
ARSCode
13-3102 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Christopher Paul Gonzales
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
10/19/2012
Description
MURDER 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1104 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Christopher Paul Gonzales
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
6/6/2022
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christopher Paul Gonzales
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
6/6/2022
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christopher Paul Gonzales
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
6/6/2022
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1904 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christopher Paul Gonzales
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
6/6/2022
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1904 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christopher Paul Gonzales
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
6/6/2022
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1904 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christopher Paul Gonzales
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
6/6/2022
Description
ARMED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1904 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christopher Paul Gonzales
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
6/6/2022
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christopher Paul Gonzales
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
6/6/2022
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christopher Paul Gonzales
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
6/6/2022
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christopher Paul Gonzales
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
6/6/2022
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1904 (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1904 (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - ARMED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1904 (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
ARMED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1904 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/18/2022
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
5/31/2022
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
12/6/2013
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F3)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Jerry Wayne Cockhearn Jr.
Crime Date
7/28/2010
Date
12/6/2013
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY MEMORANDUM
IN SUPPORT OF
MOTION TO QUASH
SUBPOENA
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF AGREEMENT
BETWEEN APPOINTED COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
3/12/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Motion to Quash Subpoena
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
MOTION TO UNSEAL ALL SEALED FILINGS.
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
notice of filing
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO QUASH
SUBPOENA
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
596 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of compliance
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/16/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Service and Request for Briefing Schedule
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION REGARDING THE COURT’S ORDER GRANTING AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING WHERE THERE HAS BEEN NO JUDICIAL FINDING THAT A “COLORABLE CLAIM” EXISTS
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR
CLARIFICATION REGARDING
THE COURT’S ORDER GRANTING
AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING
WHERE THERE HAS BEEN NO
JUDICIAL FINDING THAT A
“COLORABLE CLAIM” EXISTS
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Appellate Counsels Notice of Compliance
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
596 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2023
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/12/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(8)
Filing Date
12/12/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
12/4/2023
Description
RPP - Response to Petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
11/20/2023
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Requesting Post-Conviction Relief
Filing Date
11/6/2023
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2023
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2023
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO KNAPP COUNSEL’S PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF EXPEDITED RULING REQUESTED
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO
FILE RESPONSE TO KNAPP COUNSEL’S PETITION FOR
POST-CONVICTION RELIEF/EXPEDITED
RULING REQUESTED
Filing Date
10/5/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO DETERMINE COUNSEL
Filing Date
10/2/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Response to States Motion to Determine Counsel
Filing Date
9/29/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance
Filing Date
9/28/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO
DETERMINE COUNSEL
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
9/18/2023
Description
657 – ME: PCR: Counsel Withdrawn - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2023
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2023
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/6/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
NOTE:
PETITION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw
Filing Date
8/29/2023
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2023
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petition for Post Conviction Relief
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice and Request for Court to Rule on the Partial Rule 32 Petition
Filing Date
8/18/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
AND ADDITIONAL INFORMATION
Filing Date
7/21/2023
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2023
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO GRANT A RESENTENCING BASED ON FAILURE OF STATE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT’S ORDER AND REQUEST SETTING OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONSIDERATION OF SANCTIONS
Filing Date
6/30/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO REQUEST TO GRANT A RESENTENCING BASED ON FAILURE OF STATE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT’S ORDER AND REQUEST SETTING OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONSIDERATION OF SANCTIONS
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENT TO REQUEST TO GRANT A RESENTENCING BASED ON FAILURE OF STATE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT’S ORDER AND REQUEST SETTING OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONSIDERATION OF SANCTIONS
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO GRANT A RESENTENCING BASED ON FAILURE OF STATE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT’S ORDER AND REQUEST SETTING OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONSIDERATION OF SANCTIONS
Filing Date
6/16/2023
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
6/6/2023
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO STATE’S AMENDED RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO RULE 33.6(b)(1) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
5/11/2023
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C Transmission Receipt
Filing Date
5/11/2023
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Electronic Index of Record
Filing Date
5/11/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR REHEARING
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
TO FILE PETITION FOR POST
CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S AMENDED RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO RULE 33.6(b)(1) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDUREy
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION REQUESTING DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO RULE 33.6(B)(1)
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
PURSUANT TO RULE 33.6(B)(1) OF
THE ARIZONA RULES OF
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
2/13/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION REQUESTING DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO RULE 33.6(B)(1)
Filing Date
2/13/2023
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Post Conviction Relief
Filing Date
2/7/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
PURSUANT TO RULE 33.6(B)(1) OF
THE ARIZONA RULES OF
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION RE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW PCR
Filing Date
12/29/2022
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPOINTING NEW COUNSEL AND EXTENDING TIME TO FILE BRIEF
Filing Date
12/21/2022
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2022
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2022
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
TO FILE PETITION FOR POST
CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
12/10/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW PETITION
FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
12/5/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
11/18/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
023 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
11/17/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENT FOR PURPOSES OF PAROLE HEARING
Filing Date
11/17/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER PLACING MOTION AND LETTER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
10/27/2022
Description
657 – ME: PCR: Counsel Withdrawn - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2022
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTED COUNSEL
Filing Date
10/24/2022
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUBLIC DEFENDER
Filing Date
10/17/2022
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
10/17/2022
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: EXTENSION
Filing Date
10/13/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance
Filing Date
10/13/2022
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2022
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2022
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
10/12/2022
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2022
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY
OF RECORD
Filing Date
10/11/2022
Description
597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2022
Description
657 – ME: PCR: Counsel Withdrawn - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2022
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2022
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT
Filing Date
10/6/2022
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD
Filing Date
9/29/2022
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2022
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/28/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
Filing Date
9/27/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw and Appoint Counsel
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPOINTING NEW COUNSEL
Filing Date
9/23/2022
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2022
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PREPARE AND FILE PETITION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF 09 20 2022
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME and
REQUEST TO DETERMINE COUNSEL
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
130 - ME: Counsel Appt For Appeal - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
130 - ME: Counsel Appt For Appeal - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT OF APPEALS APPELLATE CLERK
Filing Date
9/1/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
8/29/2022
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Appeal, Request To Withdraw As Counsel Of Record, And Request To Appoint Appellate Counsel
Filing Date
8/29/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
8/26/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
8/23/2022
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appeal
Filing Date
8/19/2022
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2022
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2022
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PREPARE AND FILE PETITION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF 08 15 2022
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
LET - Letter - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
LETTER OF SUPPORT
Filing Date
8/11/2022
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sentencing Memorandum And Letters Of Support
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
8/8/2022
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
8/8/2022
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2022
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2022
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2022
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CONTINUE SENTENCING
Filing Date
7/6/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CONTINUE SENTENCING
Filing Date
7/5/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply To Motion For New Trial Pursuant To Rule 24 And Renewal Of Rule 20 Motion For Judgement Of Acquittal
Filing Date
7/5/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULE 24 AND RENEWAL OF RULE 20 MOTION FOR JUDGEMENT OF ACQUITTAL
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Continue Sentencing Hearing
Filing Date
6/27/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE
SENTENCING HEARING
Filing Date
6/27/2022
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2022
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AND RENEWAL OF RULE 20 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL
Filing Date
6/24/2022
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AND RENEWAL OF RULE 20 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL
Filing Date
6/22/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2022
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PREPARE AND FILE PETITION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF 06 22 2022
Filing Date
6/10/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULE 24 AND RENEWAL OF RULE 20 MOTION FOR JUDGEMENT OF ACQUITTAL
Filing Date
6/10/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion For New Trial Pursuant To Rule 24 And Renewal Of Rule 20 Motion For Judgement Of Acquittal
Filing Date
6/9/2022
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
6/7/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM AND ATTACHMENTS
Filing Date
6/6/2022
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2022
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
6/6/2022
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
6/6/2022
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
6/6/2022
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
6/2/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGGRAVATION PHASE
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGGRAVATION PHASE
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RANDOM
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RANDOM
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#1
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#1
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JURY TRIAL
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JURY TRIAL
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUETIONNAIRES JURORS 1 THROUGH 320
Filing Date
5/30/2022
Description
PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S PROPOSED AGGRAVATION PHASE JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
5/30/2022
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S PROPOSED AGGRAVATION PHASE JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#45
Filing Date
5/22/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#45
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S BENCH MEMORANDUM ON PROXIMATE CAUSE JURY INSTRUCTION
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S BENCH MEMORANDUM ON PROXIMATE CAUSE JURY INSTRUCTION
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#48
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#48
Filing Date
5/17/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#47
Filing Date
5/17/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#47
Filing Date
5/16/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#46
Filing Date
5/16/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2022
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S PROPOSED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
5/16/2022
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S PROPOSED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
5/16/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
46
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/12/2022
Filing Date
5/12/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
5/10/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#42
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#43
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#44
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
44
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#42
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#43
Filing Date
5/5/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTER FROM JURORS
Filing Date
5/3/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2022
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PREPARE AND FILE PETITION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
5/2/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WEITNESS
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE FOR OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#40
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#41
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#40
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#41
Filing Date
4/26/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#39
Filing Date
4/26/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#39
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2022
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2022
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2022
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2022
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
VACATING TRIAL SETTING ON APRIL 20, 2022
Filing Date
4/19/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Vacate April 20 Trial Setting
Filing Date
4/14/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#34
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#35
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#36
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#37
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#38
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#34
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#35
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#36
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#37
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#38
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#29
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#30
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#31
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#32
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#33
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#29
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#30
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#31
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#32
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#33
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2022
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#26
Filing Date
4/4/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#27
Filing Date
4/4/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#28
Filing Date
4/4/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#26
Filing Date
4/4/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#27
Filing Date
4/4/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#28
Filing Date
3/31/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#22
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#23
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#24
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#25
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#22
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#23
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#24
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#25
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#13
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#14
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#15
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#16
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#17
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#18
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#19
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#20
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#21
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#13
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#14
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#15
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#16
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#17
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#18
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#19
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#21
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
20
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#12
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#12
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#11
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#11
Filing Date
3/21/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/21/22
Filing Date
3/18/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
1/27/22
Filing Date
3/18/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
1/21/22
Filing Date
3/18/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
1/25/22
Filing Date
3/18/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
1/25/22
Filing Date
3/17/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#9
Filing Date
3/17/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#10
Filing Date
3/17/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#9
Filing Date
3/17/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#10
Filing Date
3/17/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#8
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
1/27/22
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
1/21/22
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
01/25/22
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
1/25/22
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 3-1-22
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 3-1-22
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/21/2022
Filing Date
3/14/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF
TRAVEL INTERRUPTION
Filing Date
3/14/2022
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO
PREPARE AND FILE PETITION FOR
POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#8
Filing Date
3/4/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#5
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#6
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#7
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#5
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#6
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#7
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#2
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#3
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#4
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#2
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#3
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#4
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
#1
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
1
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRELIMINARY
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRELIMINARY
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTER FROM JUROR 5
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGADING VICTIM TRIAL ATTENDANCE
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S JURY PRESENTATION
INDICTMENT
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S JURY PRESENTATION
INDICTMENT
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S JURY PRESENTATION
INDICTMENT
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ALLOW VICTIMS TO ATTEND COURT VIRTUALLY AND FOR ADDITIONAL VICTIMS TO ATTEND IN PERSON
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion In Limine Re States Witness Craig Berry
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Preserve Objection to Indictment re United States v Basurto
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion in Limine Re States Witness Craig Berry
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION IN LIMINE RE STATE'S WITNESSES EMPLOYMENT AND/OR ALLEGED MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ALLOW VICTIMS TO ATTEND COURT VIRTUALLY AND FOR ADDITIONAL VICTIMS TO ATTEND IN PERSON
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion In Limine Re States Witness Employment And/Or Alleged Mental Health Issues
Filing Date
2/17/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STIPULATION
REGARDING PROSPECTIVE JURORS
Filing Date
2/11/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STIPULATION
REGARDING PROSPECTIVE JURORS
Filing Date
2/10/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (006)
Docket Date
2/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION TO
CONTINUE SENTENCING
Filing Date
2/10/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STIPULATION
REGARDING PROSPECTIVE JURORS
Filing Date
2/10/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STIPULATION
REGARDING PROSPECTIVE JURORS
Filing Date
2/9/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/24/2022
Filing Date
2/8/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/24/2022
Filing Date
2/8/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/27/2022
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2022
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2022
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Hearing
Filing Date
1/31/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/25/22
Filing Date
1/27/2022
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING
Filing Date
1/25/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT
COCKHEARN’S MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING
Filing Date
1/25/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT
COCKHEARN’S MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING
Filing Date
1/24/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO INTRODUCTION OF PRIOR BAD ACT EVIDENCE
Filing Date
1/24/2022
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2022
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO INTRODUCTION OF PRIOR BAD ACT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/20/2022
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/20/22
Filing Date
1/20/2022
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/20/22
Filing Date
1/19/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO FILE STATE’S
RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO
INTRODUCTION OF PRIOR BAD ACT
EVIDENCE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTIN FOR SUPPLEMENTAL ORDERS REGARDING JUDGE HERRODS 12/10/18 ME AND MOTION O CONCLUDE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF ELDRIDGE GITTENS FILED 3/18/18
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply To States Response To Defendants Joint Motion For Supplemental Orders Regarding Judge Herrods 12/10/18 ME And Motion To Conclude Defendants Motion To Preclude The Testimony Of Eldridge Gittens Filed 3/18/18
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply To States Response Re: Joint Motion To Bar The State From Presenting Inconsistent Theories Of Prosecution
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply To States Response Re: Joint Motion To Bar The State From Presenting Inconsistent Theories Of Prosecution
Filing Date
1/15/2022
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ JOINT
MOTION REGARDING INCONSISTENT THEORIES OF PROSECUTION
Filing Date
1/15/2022
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ JOINT
MOTION REGARDING INCONSISTENT THEORIES OF PROSECUTION
Filing Date
1/15/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT OBJECTION TO DRUG PROFILE EVIDENCE
Filing Date
1/15/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT OBJECTION TO DRUG PROFILE EVIDENCE
Filing Date
1/14/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT
RESPONSE TO STATE’S
FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL
MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Filing Date
1/14/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Response To States First Supplemental Motions In Limine
Filing Date
1/14/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Supplemental Notice of Motion Exhibits and Hearing Witnesses re Defendants Request for Dessureault Hearing
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF POTENTIAL WITNESSES FOR DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
1/8/2022
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING SET FOR JANUARY 28, 2022
Filing Date
1/6/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT ROYALTYS REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY OR VIRTUALLY AT JANUARY 7 2022 STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
1/6/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT STATUS
REPORT FOR JANUARY 7, 2022
Filing Date
1/6/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT STATUS
REPORT FOR JANUARY 7, 2022
Filing Date
1/4/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request To Appear Telephonically Or Virtually At January 7, 2022 Status Conference
Filing Date
1/3/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Potential Rebuttal Witnesses
Filing Date
1/3/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Stay of Post-Conviction Relief
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2021
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO
PREPARE AND FILE PETITION FOR
POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
12/17/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S TRIAL BRIEF / FINAL
PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
12/17/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S TRIAL BRIEF / FINAL
PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Reply To States Response To Defendants Joint Motion To Continue Trial
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ JOINT
MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL ORDERS REGARDING JUDGE HERROD’S 12/10/18 ME;
STATE’S CONTEMPORANEOUS REQUEST FOR IN LIMINE ORDER AND SPECIFIC FINDING REGARDING MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S JOINT REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
v. DEFENDANT’S JOINT MOTION
TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
12/14/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CCMC STATEMENT
(12.14.21)
Filing Date
12/14/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Final Trial Management Statement
Filing Date
12/14/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Final Trial Management Statement
Filing Date
12/14/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CCMC STATEMENT
(12.14.21)
Filing Date
12/10/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS JOINT RESPONSE TO STATE'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE (1-4) FILED NOVEMBER 18, 2021
Filing Date
12/10/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTIONS IN LIMINE (1-4)
FILED NOVEMBER 18, 2021
Filing Date
12/9/2021
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ JOINT
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
12/9/2021
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ JOINT
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
12/6/2021
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL
MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Revised Notice of Defenses
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S JOINT OBJECTION TO DRUG PROFILE EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO BAR THE
STATE FROM PRESENTING. INCONSISTENT THEORIES
OF PROSECUTION
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT
OBJECTION TO
DRUG PROFILE EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Motion For Supplemental Orders Regarding Judge Herrods 12/10/18 ME And Motion To Conclude Defendants Motion To Preclude The Testimony Of Eldridge Gittens Filed 3/18/18
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Motion To Extend Time To Respond To States Motion In Limine And To Set Limited Interview With Detective Karl Martin
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL
MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT
REQUEST TO USE JURY QUESTIONNAIRE
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS JOINT
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO
RESPOND TO STATES MOTION IN
LIMINE AND TO SET LIMITED
INTERVIEW WITH DETECTIVE
KARL MARTIN
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.6 NOTICE OF ONGOING DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE; NOTICE OF WITNSESSES
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Objection To Introduction Of Prior Bad Act Evidence
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO BAR THE STATE FROM PRESENTING INCONSISTENT THEORIES OF PROSECUTION
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Motion For Supplemental Orders Regarding Judge Herrods 12/10/18 ME And Motion To Conclude Defendants Motion To Preclude The Testimony Of Eldridge Gittens Filed 3/18/18
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT
REQUEST TO USE JURY QUESTIONNAIRE
Filing Date
12/1/2021
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARN'S AND DEFENDANT ROYALTY'S JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
11/24/2021
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2021
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS CCMC
STATEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY
Filing Date
11/23/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS CCMC
STATEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY
Filing Date
11/23/2021
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE (11/22/21)
Filing Date
11/22/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE (11/22/21)
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Case Status Report And Notice Of Ongoing Discovery, Disclosure, Litigation and Investigation
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CCMC STATEMENT
(11.19.21)
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANS JOINT CASE STATUS REPORT AND NOTICE OF ONGOING DISCOVERY DISCLOSURE LITIGATION AND INVESTIGATION
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CCMC STATEMENT
(11.19.21)
Filing Date
11/18/2021
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Filing Date
11/18/2021
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Filing Date
11/9/2021
Description
ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PREPARE AND FILE PETITION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF 11 09 2021
Filing Date
10/27/2021
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2021
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2021
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S JOINT CASE STATUS REPORT AND NOTICE OF ONGOING DISCOVERY DISCLOSURE LITIGATIN AND NVESTIGATION
Filing Date
10/22/2021
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT CASE STATUS
REPORT AND NOTICE OF ONGOING
v. DISCOVERY, DISCLOSURE,
LITIGATION AND INVESTIGATION
Filing Date
10/21/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CCMC STATEMENT
(10.21.21)
Filing Date
10/21/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CCMC STATEMENT
Filing Date
10/21/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICT
[Local Rule §2.2]
Filing Date
10/21/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICT
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2021
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2021
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE
SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 CCMC
Filing Date
9/15/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE
SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 CCMC
Filing Date
9/13/2021
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2021
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
06/18/2021 BY LISA A BRADLEY
Filing Date
9/7/2021
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
11/6/2020 BY CSR LISA A. BRADLEY
Filing Date
8/31/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance
Filing Date
8/23/2021
Description
657 – ME: PCR: Counsel Withdrawn - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/28/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/28/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2021
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
7/22/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CCMC STATEMENT
(07.23.21)
Filing Date
7/22/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S JOINT CASE STATUS
REPORT AND NOTICE OF ONGOING DISCOVERY, DISCLOSURE,
LITIGATION AND INVESTIGATION
Filing Date
7/22/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CCMC STATEMENT
(07.23.21)
Filing Date
7/21/2021
Description
595 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: plea - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2021
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/12/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
Filing Date
6/28/2021
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2021
Description
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation
Filing Date
6/18/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S PARTIAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM AND MOTION TO FOLLOW THE TERMS OF THE PLEA AGREEMENT AND SENTENCE ACCORDING TO THE AGREED UPON FACTUAL BASIS
Filing Date
6/18/2021
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
6/18/2021
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/18/2021
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
6/16/2021
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM AND
MOTION TO FOLLOW THE TERMS
OF THE PLEA AGREEMENT AND
SENTENCE ACCORDING TO THE
AGREED UPON FACTUAL BASIS
Filing Date
6/15/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE TO THE COURT OF NON-FILING REGARDING “DEFENDANT’S JOINT REQUEST TO CLARIFY RE: ME RULING DATES 5/20/2021”
Filing Date
6/15/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE TO THE COURT OF NON-FILING REGARDING “DEFENDANT’S JOINT REQUEST TO CLARIFY RE: ME RULING DATES 5/20/2021
Filing Date
6/8/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2021
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT REQUEST
TO CLARIFY RE: ME RULING
DATES 5/20/2021
Filing Date
6/3/2021
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2021
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
CLARIFICATION REGARDING MINUTE ENTRY FROM 05.20.21
Filing Date
5/25/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
CLARIFICATION REGARDING MINUTE ENTRY FROM 05.20.21
Filing Date
5/21/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2021
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2021
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulated Motion to Continue Sentencing
Filing Date
5/14/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S JOINT CASE STATUS
REPORT AND NOTICE OF ONGOING DISCOVERY, DISCLOSURE,
LITIGATION AND INVESTIGATION
Filing Date
5/13/2021
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Case Status Report and Notice of Ongoing Discovery, Disclosure, Litigation and Investigation
Filing Date
5/13/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENT TO THE RECORD REFERENCE MINUTE ENTRY FROM 04.21.21
Filing Date
5/13/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENT TO THE RECORD REFERENCE MINUTE ENTRY FROM 04.21.21
Filing Date
5/13/2021
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S STATUS REPORT (05.13.21)
Filing Date
5/13/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Request To Clarify And Amend The 04/28/2021 Minute Entry Re: States Motion To Compel Specific Disclosure Re: Bryan Neumeister
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT REQUEST TO STAY
04/28/2021 DISCLOSURE ORDER
PENDING REVIEW OF
DEFENDANT’S JOINT REQUEST
TO CLARIFY AND AMEND THE
04/28/2021 MINUTE ENTRY RE:
STATE’S MOTION TO COMPEL
SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE:
BRYAN NEUMEISTER
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Request To Clarify And Amend The 04/28/2021 Minute Entry Re: States Motion To Compel Specific Disclosure Re: Bryan Neumeister
Filing Date
5/10/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT REQUEST TO CLARIFY AND AMEND THE 04/28/2021 MINUTE ENTRY RE: STATE'S MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE: BRYAN NEUMEISTER
Filing Date
5/10/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT REQUEST TO STAY 04/28/2021 DISCLOSURE ORDER PENDING REVIEW OF DEFENDANT'S JOINT REQUEST TO CLARIFY AND AMEND THE 04/28/2021 MINUTE ENTRY RE: STATE'S MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE: BRYAN NEUMEISTER
Filing Date
5/5/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2021
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE: BRYAN NEUMEISTER [Rule §15.7(a)]
Filing Date
4/5/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE: BRYAN NEUMEISTER [Rule §15.7(a)]
Filing Date
4/2/2021
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Response To States Motion To Compel Specific Disclosure Re: Bryan Neumeister
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Reply To States Response Re: Defendants Third Joint Motion To Dismiss For Continued Failure To Disclose Brady Material
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply To States Response And Opposition To Defendants Motion To Compel Specific Disclosure Re: Additional Witnesses With Brady Or Other Discipline History
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE AND OPPOSTION TO MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE: ADDITIONAL WITNESSES WITH BRADY OR OTHER DISCIPLINE HISTORY
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Reply To States Response Re: Joint Motion To Compel Specific Disclosure And Request For Specific Disclosure
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Reply to States Response Re Defendants Third Joint Motion to Dismiss for Continued Failure to Disclosure Brady Material
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT RESPONSE TO STATES MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE: BRYAN NEUMEISTER
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT REPLY
TO STATE’S RESPONSE RE:
JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL
SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR SPECIFIC
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/26/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE STAY OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
3/23/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response re: Motion to Enforce Court Order and Request for Supplemental Order
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S JOINT NOTICE OF
REVISED FILING DEADLINES
AND REQUEST TO RECONSIDER REINSTATEMENT OF THE 9/14/20
ORDER
Filing Date
3/15/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE AND PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
3/15/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE AND PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
3/15/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Case Status Report and Notice of Ongoing Discovery Disclosure Litigation and Investigation
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE: ADDITIONAL WITNESSES WITH BRADY OR OTHER DISCIPLINE HISTORY
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE: ADDITIONAL WITNESSES WITH BRADY OR OTHER DISCIPLINE HISTORY
Filing Date
3/9/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE: BRIAN NEUMEISTER [Rule §15.7(a)]
Filing Date
3/9/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE: BRIAN NEUMEISTER [Rule §15.7(a)]
Filing Date
3/5/2021
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS THIRD MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
3/4/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS THIRD MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
2/26/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO COURT’S ORDER REGARDING STEPS TAKEN TO WALL OFF DEPUTY COUNTY ATTORNEY RACHEL KULTALA
Filing Date
2/26/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO COURT’S ORDER REGARDING STEPS TAKEN TO WALL OFF DEPUTY COUNTY ATTORNEY RACHEL KULTALA
Filing Date
2/26/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER AND FOR SUPPLEMENTAL COURT ORDER
Filing Date
2/26/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER AND FOR SUPPLEMENTAL COURT ORDER
Filing Date
2/24/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS ON JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE ADDITIONAL WITNESSES WITH BRADY OR OTHER DISCIPLINE
Filing Date
2/22/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS ON DEFENDANTS THIRD JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR CONTINUED FAILURE TO DISCLOSE BRADY MATERIAL
Filing Date
2/22/2021
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNDER SEAL ORDER RE DEFENDANT COCKHEARN AND DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOINT MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER AND REQUEST FOR SUPPLMENTAL ORDER
Filing Date
2/22/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE COMPLEX CASE
MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR ONE
TO TWO WEEKS
Filing Date
2/22/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE COMPLEX CASE
MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR ONE
TO TWO WEEKS
Filing Date
2/22/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER AND REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER
Filing Date
2/22/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON DEFENDANT COCKHEARN'S AND DEFENDANT ROYALTY'S JOINT MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER AND REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER
Filing Date
2/19/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Case Status Report And Notice of Ongoing Discovery, Litigation And Investigation
Filing Date
2/19/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Exceed Page Limits On Defendants Third Joint Motion To Dismiss For Continued Failure To Disclose Brady Material
Filing Date
2/19/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Exceed Page Limits On Joint Motion To Compel Specific Disclosure Re: Additional Witnesses With Brady Or Other Discipline
Filing Date
2/19/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limits on Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss for Continued Failure to Disclose Brady Material
Filing Date
2/19/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS THIRD JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR CONTINUED FAILURE TO DISCLOSE BRADY MATERIAL
Filing Date
2/19/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S THIRD JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR CONTINUEDFAILURE TO DISCLOSED BRADY MATERIAL
Filing Date
2/19/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL
SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE:
ADDITIONAL WITNESSES
WITH BRADY OR OTHER
DISCIPLINE HISTORY
Filing Date
2/19/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limits on Joint Motion to Compel Specific Disclosure Re Additional Witnesses with Brady or Other Discipline
Filing Date
2/19/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL
SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE:
ADDITIONAL WITNESSES
WITH BRADY OR OTHER
DISCIPLINE HISTORY
Filing Date
2/19/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S JOINT CASE STATUS
REPORT AND NOTICE OF ONGOING DISCOVERY, DISCLOSURE,
LITIGATION AND INVESTIGATION
Filing Date
2/11/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/11/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/11/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2021
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE STATUS REPORT AND
NOTICE OF ONGOING
DISCOVERY, DISCLOSURE, LITIGATION AND INVESTIGATION
Filing Date
1/22/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Case Status Report And Notice Of Ongoing Discovery, Disclosure, Litigation And Investigation
Filing Date
1/22/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Unopposed Motion for Order Temporarily Unsealing Exhibits for Copying
Filing Date
1/15/2021
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2020
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report and Notice of Ongoing Discovery Disclosure Litigation and Investigation
Filing Date
12/4/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
12/4/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT AND
NOTICE OF ONGOING
DISCOVERY, DISCLOSURE, LITIGATION, AND INVESTIGATION
Filing Date
12/4/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
11/17/2020
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/19/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED 11/17/20
Filing Date
11/13/2020
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2020
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2020
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2020
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
11/6/2020
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2020
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/5/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2020
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2020
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/28/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
E-MAIL COMMUNICATIONS
Filing Date
10/23/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Stay of Post-Conviction Relief
Filing Date
10/21/2020
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2020
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2020
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2020
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/7/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/7/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED REPLY SUBMITTED TO THIS COURT VIA EMAIL ON 9/23/2020 AND HARD COPIES RECIVED ON 9/2020 FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
10/6/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE ABOVE CAPITIONED REPLY SUBMITTED TO THE COURT VIA EMAIL ON 9/23/2020 AND HARD COPIES RECIVED 9/2020 BE FILED UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
10/6/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS AND DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOIN REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE RE MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/6/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS AND DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOIN REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE RE MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/6/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE RE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/6/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE RE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/1/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2020
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2020
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2020
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply To States Response Re: Motion To Reconsider Denial Of Defendants Joint Motion To Dismiss
Filing Date
9/23/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
SUPPLEMENT AND NOTICE RE:
DEFENDANT’S SECOND JOINT MOTION
TO DISMISS FOR CONTINUED FAILURE TO
DISCLOSE Brady MATERIAL AND REQUEST
FOR DISCLOSURES
Filing Date
9/22/2020
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2020
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2020
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
4th Motion To Extend Time To Reply To States Response To Defendants Motion To Reconsider Denial Of Defendants Joint Motion To Dismiss And Motion To Extend Time To Reply To States Response To Defendants
Filing Date
9/17/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S 4TH
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF
DEFENDANT’S JOINT MOTION TO
DISMISS AND MOTION TO EXTEND TIME
TO REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
9/17/2020
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
4th Motion to Extend Time to Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion to Reconsider Denial of Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
9/16/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENT TO THE RECORD REGARDING STATE'S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW OF LAW ENFORCEMENT RECORDS TO DETERMINE IF RECORDS CONTAIN BRADY MATERIAL
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE STATE'S SUPPLEMENT TO THE RECORD REGARDING STATE'S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW OF LAW ENFORCEMENT RECORDS TO DETERMINE IN RECORDS CONTAIN BRADY MATERIAL UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER FILING STATE'S SUPPLEMENT TO THE RECORD REGARDING STATE'S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW OF LAW ENFORCEMENT RECORDS TO DETERMINE IF RECORDS CONTAIN BRADY MATERIAL UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/31/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/30/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/31/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS AND MOTION TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/30/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/31/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE (AND ATTACHMENTS)
Filing Date
7/23/2020
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2020
Description
136 - ME: Order Excluding Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2020
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
3rd MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF DEFENDANTS’ JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO PRECLUDE IMPEACHMENT UNLESS SPECIFICALLY AUTHORIZED BY THE COURT
Filing Date
7/10/2020
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2020
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Objection to States Motion for In Camera Review of Law Enforcement Records To Determine if Records Contain Brady Material
Filing Date
6/29/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental And Notice Re Defendants Second Joint Motion To Dismiss For Continued Failure To Disclose Brady Material And Request For Disclosures
Filing Date
6/29/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply To States Response Re: Joint Motion For Disclosures And Conflict Analysis Re Former Chandler Police Officer Kultala And Motion To Strike
Filing Date
6/29/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply To States Response To Defendants Second Joint Motion To Dismiss For Continued Failure To Disclose Brady Material
Filing Date
6/29/2020
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request For Disclosures Re: Motion To Dismiss For Continued Failure To Disclose Brady Material Or In The Alternative Court Order Pursuant To Rule 15.1(g)
Filing Date
6/25/2020
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO STATE'S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIE OF LAW ENFORCEMENT RECORDS TO DETERMINE IF RECORDS CONTAIN BRADY MATERIAL
Filing Date
6/22/2020
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2020
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Second Motion to Extend Time to Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion to Reconsider Denial of Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Preclude Impeachment Unless Specifically Authorized by the Court
Filing Date
6/19/2020
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2020
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
A PSB16-0119 REPORT PERTAINING TO JOSH CHAMPION-UNREDACTED
Filing Date
6/11/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
B PSB16-0119 REPORT PERTAINING TO JOSH CHAMPION-REDACTED
Filing Date
6/11/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response Re Joint Motion for Disclosures and Conflict Analysis Re Former Chandler Officer Kultala and Motion to Strike
Filing Date
6/10/2020
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Disclosure Re Motion to Dismiss For Continued Failure To Disclose Brady Material or in the Alternative for Court Order Pursuant to Rule 15.1(g)
Filing Date
6/10/2020
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time to Respond to States Response to Defendants Motion to Reconsider Denial of Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Preclude Impeachment Unless Specifically Authorized By the Court
Filing Date
6/10/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Defendants Second Joint Motion to Dismiss for Continued Failure to Disclose Brady Material
Filing Date
6/10/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplement and Notice Re Defendants Second Joint Motion to Dismiss For Continued Failure to Disclose Brady Material and Request for Disclosures
Filing Date
6/9/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DISCLOSURES AND CONFLICT ANALYSIS RE: FORMER CHANDLER POLICE OFFICER KULTALA AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Filing Date
6/9/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SEALING RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DISCLOSURES AND CONFLICT ANALYSIS RE: FORMER CHANDLER POLICE OFFICER KUTALA AND MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER SEAL AND TO SEAL DEFENDANT'S MOTION AND ALSO THEIR REPLY TO THE STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S JOINT
Filing Date
6/3/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE RESPONSE TO
DFENDANT’S MOTION FOR DISCLOSURES
AND CONFLICT ANALYSIS RE FORMER
CHANDLER POLICE OFFICER KULTALA
AND MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER SEAL
AND TO SEAL DEFENDANT’S MOTION
AND ALSO THEIR REPLY TO THE STATE’S
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S JOINT
MOTION TO DISMISS FILED ON 03/19/20
Filing Date
6/1/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2020
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Intent to Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion to Reconsider Denial of Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Request for Leave to File a Reply
Filing Date
5/29/2020
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS(INTEGRITY ISSUES)AND MOTION TO PRECLUDE IMPEACHMENT UNLESS SPECIFICALLY AUTHORIZED BY THE COURT
Filing Date
5/29/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SECOND JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR CONTINUED FAILURE TO DISCLOSE BRADY MATERIAL AND MOTON TO STRIKE
Filing Date
5/29/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF DEFENDANT'S JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
5/29/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SECOND JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
5/29/2020
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE
Filing Date
5/29/2020
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE
Filing Date
5/28/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO RECONSIDER
DENIAL OF DEFENDANTS’ JOINT MOTION
TO DISMISS (INTEGRITY ISSUES) AND
MOTION TO PRECLUDE IMPEACHMENT
UNLESS SPECIFICALLY AUTHORIZED BY
THE COURT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
5/28/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS FOR
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT MOTION TO
DISMISS (INTEGRITY ISSUES) AND
MOTION TO PRECLUDE IMPEACHMENT
UNLESS SPECIFICALLY AUTHORIZED BY
THE COURT
Filing Date
5/28/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Joining of Motions
Filing Date
5/28/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW OF
LAW ENFORCEMENT RECORDS TO
DETERMINE IF RECORDS CONTAIN BRADY
MATERIAL
Filing Date
5/27/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE REGARDING STATUS OF JOINT DEFENSE MOTIONS
Filing Date
5/27/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE REGARDING STATUS OF JOINT DEFENSE MOTIONS
Filing Date
5/27/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO NOTICE
REGARDING STATUS OF JOINT DEFENSE
MOTIONS
Filing Date
5/27/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO NOTICE
REGARDING STATUS OF JOINT DEFENSE
MOTIONS
Filing Date
5/27/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE
JURY TRIAL JUNE 2020
Filing Date
5/11/2020
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION FOR DISCLOSURES AND CONFLICT ANALYSIS RE FORMER CHANDLER POLICE OFFICE KULTALA
Filing Date
5/8/2020
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SECOND JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR STATE'S CONTINUED FAILURE TO DISCLOSE BRADY MATERIAL
Filing Date
5/8/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL
SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR SPECIFIC
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/5/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion to Compel Specific Disclosure and Request for Specific Disclosure
Filing Date
5/5/2020
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Second Joint Motion To Dismiss For States Continued Failure to Disclose Brady Material
Filing Date
5/5/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion for Disclosures and Conflict Analysis re Former Chandler Police Officer Kultala
Filing Date
5/4/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2020
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2020
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2020
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2020
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2020
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2020
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 3/31/20
Filing Date
4/6/2020
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER
v. DENIAL OF DEFENDANTS’
JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
4/6/2020
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Reconsider Denial of Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
4/3/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2020
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2020
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2020
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2020
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Filing Date
3/23/2020
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2020
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 3/20/2020
Filing Date
3/20/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2020
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2020
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/19/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
3/19/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/19/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply To States Response To Defendants Joint Motion To Dismiss
Filing Date
3/16/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE MARCH 18th,
2020 SENTENCING STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
3/10/2020
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2020
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2020
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/6/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2020
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/5/2020
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/5/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2020
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/5/2020
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/28/2020
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/28/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2020
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/27/2020
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/27/2020
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/25/2020
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SUPPLEMENT TO RECORD TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO DIMISS
Filing Date
2/19/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OR DESIGNEE ATTENDANCE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
2/18/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/18/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF
PLEADINGS MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
2/14/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF
PLEADINGS MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
2/13/2020
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Errata To Joint Reply To States Response To Motion To Compel Specific Disclosure And For Sanctions
Filing Date
2/12/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND ATTACHMENTS
Filing Date
2/12/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Reply To States Response to Motion to Compel Specific Disclosure and Sanctions
Filing Date
2/12/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT REPLY TO STATE’S
RESPONSE TO MOTON TO
COMPEL SPECIFIC
DISCLOSURE AND FOR
SANCTIONS
Filing Date
2/12/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS AND MOTION TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/7/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/7/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/7/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF
PLEADINGS
Filing Date
2/6/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF
PLEADINGS
Filing Date
2/6/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS AND MOTION TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/6/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE AND FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
1/29/2020
Description
905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ROYALTY’S AND
DEFENDANT COCKHEARN’S SUPPLEMENT TO STATE’S
JANUARY 28, 2020 RESPONSE REGARDING LACK OF STATE’S
RESPONSE
Filing Date
1/29/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENT TO THE RECORD
TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’
JOINT NOTICE REGARDING NO RESPONSE
TO DEFENDANTS’ JOINT MOTION TO
DISMISS AND TO COMPEL SPECIFIC
DISCLOSURE AND FOR SANCTIONS AND
REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR
FILING
Filing Date
1/29/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENT TO THE RECORD
TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’
JOINT NOTICE REGARDING NO RESPONSE
TO DEFENDANTS’ JOINT MOTION TO
DISMISS AND TO COMPEL SPECIFIC
DISCLOSURE AND FOR SANCTIONS AND
REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR
FILING
Filing Date
1/29/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENT TO THE RECORD TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ JOINT NOTICE REGARDING NO RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE AND FOR SANCTIONS AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING
Filing Date
1/28/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS JOINT NOTICE REGARDING NO RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE AND FOR SANCTIONS AND REQUESST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING
Filing Date
1/28/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT NOTICE REGARDING NO RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS ND TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/28/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS JOINT NOTICE REGARDING NO RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE AND FOR SANCTIONS AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILINGS
Filing Date
1/27/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S JOINT NOTICE REGARDING NO REPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S JOITNT MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE AND FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
1/27/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Notice Regarding No Response To Defendants Joint Motion To Compel Specific Disclosure And For Sanctions
Filing Date
1/27/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Notice Regarding No Response To Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
1/27/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Notice Regarding No Response to Defendants Joint Motion to Compel Specific Disclosure and for Sanctions
Filing Date
1/27/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Notice Regarding No Response To Defendants Joint Motion To Dismiss
Filing Date
1/27/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Notice Regarding No Response To Defendants Joint Motion To Dismiss
Filing Date
1/16/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF PROVIDED
TRANSCRIPT
Filing Date
1/15/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Notice of Facts and Procedural History re Joint Reply to Courts 12-19-19 Order Regarding Defendant Wrights Motion to Continue Jury Trial
Filing Date
1/15/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENT TO THE RECORD
REGARDING DEFENDANT ROYALTY AND
DEFENDANT COCKHEARN'S REPLIES TO
DEFENDANT WRIGHT'S MOTION TO
CONTINUE TRIAL AND TO COURT'S
12.19.19 ORDER REGARDING SAME
Filing Date
1/15/2020
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENT TO THE RECORD REGARDING DEFENDANT ROYALTY AND DEFENDANT COCKHEARN'S REPLIES TO DEFENDANT WRIGHT'S MOTION TO ONTINUE TRIAL AND TO COURT'S 12.19.19 PRDER REGARDING SAME
Filing Date
1/14/2020
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion To Compel Specific Disclosure And For Sanctions
Filing Date
1/8/2020
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Motion TO Dismiss
Filing Date
1/8/2020
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Motion To Dismiss
Filing Date
1/8/2020
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
1/8/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL
SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE AND
FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
1/8/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion To Compel Specific Disclosure And For Sanctions
Filing Date
1/7/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE JANUARY 15th,
2020 SENTENCING
Filing Date
1/6/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Reply To Courts Order Regarding Defendant Wrights Motion To Continue Jury Trial
Filing Date
1/6/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT REPLY TO COURTS'S 12.19.19 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT WRIGHT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL
Filing Date
12/31/2019
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/31/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/30/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/14/19
Filing Date
12/20/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2019
Description
REL - Reply - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Reply To Defendant Wrights Motion To Continue Jury Trial Of January 13th, 2020
Filing Date
12/20/2019
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT REPLY TO DEFENDANT WRIGHT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL OF JANUARY 13TH 2020
Filing Date
12/19/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL OF JANUARY 13TH 2020
Filing Date
12/12/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE
JURY TRIAL OF JANUARY 13TH, 2020
Filing Date
12/9/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 120419
Filing Date
12/3/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 112619
Filing Date
12/3/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 112619
Filing Date
11/13/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/12/2019
Filing Date
11/12/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNDER SEAL ORDER RE DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS AND DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE RE EVIDENCE OF FALSE TESTIMONY AND SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/12/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS AND DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE RE EVIDENCE OF FALSE TESTIMONY AND SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/12/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS AND DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE RE EVIDENCE OF FALSE TESTIMONY AND SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/12/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/12/2019
Filing Date
11/12/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS AND DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE RE EVIDENCE OF FALSE TESTIMONY AND SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/12/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNDER SEAL ORDER RE DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS AND DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE RE EVIDENCE OF FALSE TESTIMONY AND SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/12/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS AND DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE RE EVIDENCE OF FALSE TESTIMONY AND SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/8/2019
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
11/7/2019
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Royaltys Complex Case Status Report
Filing Date
11/7/2019
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Management Report
Filing Date
10/24/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2019
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING
Filing Date
9/30/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING
Filing Date
9/12/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2019
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2019
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REPRESENT MYSELF AS PROPRIA PERSONA AND TO APPOINT MY CURRENT COUNSEL DAVID COUTRER AS ADVISORY COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/28/2019
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/28/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/5/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/5/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/23/2019
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2019
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2019
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2019
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
7/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2019
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
7/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2019
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (006)
Docket Date
7/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING
Filing Date
7/2/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/5/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
NOTE:
MOTION TO REPRESENT MYSELF AS PROPRIA PERSONA AND TO APPOINT MY CURRENT COUNSEL DAVID COUTRER AS ADVISORY COUNSEL
Filing Date
6/19/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/19/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/19/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/10/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2019
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2019
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2019
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel
Filing Date
5/17/2019
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/7/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
5/1/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/7/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL/HEARING
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT SIGNED
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT SIGNED
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT SIGNED
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT SIGNED
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT SIGNED
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT SIGNED
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT SIGNED
Filing Date
4/25/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2019
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2019
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IMPASSE
Filing Date
4/24/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#49
Filing Date
4/24/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#48
Filing Date
4/24/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#47
Filing Date
4/24/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#46
Filing Date
4/23/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#45
Filing Date
4/23/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#44
Filing Date
4/19/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR MISTRIAL
Filing Date
4/18/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2019
Description
RES - Response - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR
MISTRIAL
Filing Date
4/17/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#43
Filing Date
4/17/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#42
Filing Date
4/17/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#41
Filing Date
4/16/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#40
Filing Date
4/16/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#39
Filing Date
4/10/2019
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2019
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#38
Filing Date
4/5/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE RE MOTION TO COMPEL INTERVIEWS WITH DETECTIVES ARBIZU AND BUGALLO
Filing Date
4/3/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON DEFENSE REPLY RE MOTION TO COMPEL INTERVIEWS WITH DETECTIVES ARBIU AND BUGALLO
Filing Date
4/3/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNDER SEAL ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON DEFENSE REPLY RE MOTION TO COMPEL INTERVIEWS WITH DETECTIVES ARBIZU AND BUGALLO
Filing Date
4/3/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#37
Filing Date
4/3/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#36
Filing Date
4/2/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#35
Filing Date
4/2/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#34
Filing Date
4/2/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#33
Filing Date
4/2/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#32
Filing Date
4/2/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#31
Filing Date
3/28/2019
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2019
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 03/21/19
Filing Date
3/26/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#30
Filing Date
3/26/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#29
Filing Date
3/25/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMAIL DATED MONDAY MARCH 25, 2019
Filing Date
3/22/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2019
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO THE RECORD REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR MISTRIAL/MOTION TO STRIKE WITNESS TESTIMONY OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO PLAY DEFENDANT JACKSON'S CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING MARCH 19TH, 2019
Filing Date
3/19/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#28
Filing Date
3/19/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#27
Filing Date
3/19/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#26
Filing Date
3/19/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#25
Filing Date
3/19/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#24
Filing Date
3/19/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#23
Filing Date
3/19/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#22
Filing Date
3/19/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#21
Filing Date
3/19/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
NOTE:
STIPULATION
Filing Date
3/18/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL INTERVIEWS WITH DETECTIVES ARBIZU AND BUGALLO
Filing Date
3/14/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL INTERVIEWS WITH DETECTIVES ARBIZU AND BUGALLO
Filing Date
3/13/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON DEFENSE MOTION TO COMPEL INTERVIEWS WITH DETECTIVES ARBIZU AND BUGALLO
Filing Date
3/13/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNDER SEAL ORDER RE:REQUEST TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON DEFENSE MOTION TO COMPEL INTERVIEWS WITH DETECTIVES ARBIZU AND BUGALLO
Filing Date
3/13/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL INTERVIEWS WITH DETECTIVES ARBIZU AND BUGALLO
Filing Date
3/11/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#20
Filing Date
3/7/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#18
Filing Date
3/7/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#15
Filing Date
3/7/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#19
Filing Date
3/7/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#7
Filing Date
3/7/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/7/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/6/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#16
Filing Date
3/6/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#17
Filing Date
2/27/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 02/21/19
Filing Date
2/20/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#14
Filing Date
2/20/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#13
Filing Date
2/20/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#12
Filing Date
2/19/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#11
Filing Date
2/15/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2019
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
2/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#10
Filing Date
2/14/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#9
Filing Date
2/14/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#8
Filing Date
2/13/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#6
Filing Date
2/13/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#5
Filing Date
2/13/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#4
Filing Date
2/13/2019
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2019
Description
LET - Letter - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
2/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#3
Filing Date
2/12/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#2
Filing Date
2/12/2019
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
#1
Filing Date
2/11/2019
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRELIMINARY
Filing Date
2/8/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2019
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 02/06/2019
Filing Date
2/7/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/7/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/7/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES PETITION TO SECURE THE ATTENDANCE OF PRISONER AS WITNESS
Filing Date
2/6/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO SECURE THE ATTENDANCE OF PRISONER AS WITNESS
Filing Date
2/6/2019
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR JURY PRESENTATION
Filing Date
2/6/2019
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ORDER REGARDING CLARIFICATION OF INDICTMENT
Filing Date
2/5/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/29/19
Filing Date
2/5/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/31/19
Filing Date
2/5/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/01/2019
Filing Date
2/5/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/01/19
Filing Date
1/31/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 1-28-19
Filing Date
1/23/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/17/19
Filing Date
1/15/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/9/2019
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2019
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/24/18
Filing Date
1/2/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial 2019
Filing Date
12/27/2018
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2018
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12-11-18
Filing Date
12/19/2018
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2018
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2018
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2018
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2018
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/3/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON DEFENSE REPLY RE MOTION TO STRIKE UNLAWFUL TESTIMONIAL AGREEMENT AND PLEA AGREEEMENT OF CO-DEFENDANT GITTENS
Filing Date
11/30/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/3/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE REQUEST TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON DEFENSE REPLY RE MOTION TO STRIKE UNLAWFUL TESTIMONIAL AGREEMENT AND PLEA AGREEMENT OF CO-DEFENDANT GITTENS / GRANTED
Filing Date
11/30/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY RE-MOTION TO STRIKE UNLAWFUL TESTIMONIAL AGREEMENT AND PLEA AGGREEMENT OF CO-DEFENDANT GITTENS
Filing Date
11/28/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF ERROR IN STATE’S
MOTION TO STRIKE
DEFENDANT’S EXHIBIT N AND
TO PRECLUDE PROFESSOR
BENNETT GERSHMAN AND
REQUEST TO STRIKE SENTENCE
Filing Date
11/28/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF STATE’S
MOTION TO STRIKE
DEFENDANT’S EXHIBIT N AND
TO PRECLUDE PROFESSOR
BENNETT GERSHMAN
Filing Date
11/27/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE UNLAWFUL TESTIMONIL AGREEENT AND PLEA AGREEMENT OF CO-DEFENDANT GITTENS
Filing Date
11/20/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARN'S RESPONSE TO THE STATE'S MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBIT N AND TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PROF. BENNETT GERSHMAN
Filing Date
11/20/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES / TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/20/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON DEFENSE TO STATES MOTION TO PRECLUDE EXHIBIT N
Filing Date
11/20/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE UNLAWFUL TESTIMONIAL AGREEMENT AND PLEA AGREEMENT OF THE CO DEFENDANT GITTENS IS SEALED
Filing Date
11/20/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE ABOVE CAPITENED MOTION SUBMITTED TO THIS COURT AND HAND DELIVERED ON THE 19TH DAY OF NOVEMBER 2018 BE FILED UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/19/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/16/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2018
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2018
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2018
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2018
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBIT N AND TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PROF BENNETT GERSHMAN
Filing Date
11/9/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING STATE'S MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBIT N AND TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PROF. BENNETT GERSHMAN
Filing Date
11/9/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES / TO SEAL STATES / TO STRIKE EXHIBIT N AND TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PROF BENNETT GERSHMAN
Filing Date
11/7/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Motion to Seal States Motion to Strike Exhibit N and to Preclude the Testimony of Prof. Bennett Gershman
Filing Date
11/5/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/5/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR FUNDING TO TRANSCRIBE CDS AND EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING DEADLINE
Filing Date
11/1/2018
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT N RE MOTION TO PRECLUDE GITTENS AFFIDAVIT OF PROF BENNETT GERSHMAN
Filing Date
11/1/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBIT N: AFFIDAIT OF PROF. BENNETT GERSHMAN AND CV
Filing Date
11/1/2018
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/1/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2018
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2018
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2018
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/22/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
CO-DEFENDANT GONZALES’
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH
COURT’S ORDER DATED 9/25/18
Filing Date
10/19/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/22/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance with Courts Order
Filing Date
10/19/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/22/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S BENCH BRIEF REGARDING POLYGRAPH EVIDENCE
Filing Date
10/19/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/22/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
CO-DEFENDANT GONZALES’
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH
COURT’S MINUTE ENTRY DATED
9/25/18
Filing Date
10/19/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF PENDING BRIEFS AND REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT ON OCTOBER 24,2018
Filing Date
10/19/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON NOTICE OF PENDING BRIEFS AND REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT ON OCTOBER 24 2018
Filing Date
10/19/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: REQUEST TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL on NOTICE OF PENDING BRIEFS AND REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT
Filing Date
10/17/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS THIRD MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
10/16/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S THIRD MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
10/16/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS THIRD MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
10/12/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 09/25/2018
Filing Date
10/12/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 09/25/2018
Filing Date
10/12/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 09/25/2018
Filing Date
10/12/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBIT M RE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE GITTENS: SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT HEIDI HARRALSON
Filing Date
10/5/2018
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT M RE MOTION TO PRECLUDE GITTENS SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT HEIDI HARRALSON
Filing Date
10/1/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 9/20/18
Filing Date
10/1/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
9/24/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: OBJECTION TO STATE REQUESTED WITNESS/EVIDENTIARY HEARING, REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION AND FOR BRIEFING
Filing Date
9/21/2018
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2018
Description
NRE - Notice of Completion of Post Conviction Relief Request for Extension of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF RECORD; NOTICE OF NON-FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION PURSUANT TO ARIZ. R. CRIM. P. 32.4(d)(2)(a)
Filing Date
8/30/2018
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2018
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO STATE REQUESTED WITNESS/EVIDENTIARY HEARING, REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION AND FOR BRIEFING
Filing Date
8/17/2018
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2018
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2018
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE'S BENCH BRIEF REGARDING THE ADMISSIBILITY OF POLYGRAPH EXAMINATIONS
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE UNLAWFUL TESTIMONIAL AGREEMENT AND PLEA AGREEMENT OF CO-DEFENDANT GITTENS
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY RE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF ELDRIDGE GITTENS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A RELIABILITY HEARING
Filing Date
8/7/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF
TRIAL CONFLICT
Filing Date
8/7/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF
TRIAL CONFLICT
Filing Date
8/6/2018
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2018
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2018
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION; MOTION FOR RELEASE OF MITIGATION SPECIALIST REPORT
Filing Date
7/26/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
7/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2018
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2018
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2018
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT L RE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE GITTENS: SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT HEIDI HARRALSON
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBIT L - SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT EXAMINATION RE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE ELDRIDGE GITTENS
Filing Date
7/11/2018
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2018
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2018
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2018
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/3/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2018
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/28/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT ON ITS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO STATES BENCH BREIF REGARDING NEED FOR 404 HEARING
Filing Date
6/27/2018
Description
RES - Response - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO INSTRUCT
JURY ON UNCONSCIOUS BIAS AND
REQUEST TO MODIFY JURY INSTRUCTIONS
ACCORDINGLY
Filing Date
6/27/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO STATES BENCH BRIEF REGARDING NEED FOR 404(B) EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
6/26/2018
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2018
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Motion to Reconsider Ruling on Presentence Incarceration Credit
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2018
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2018
Description
RES - Response - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT WRIGHT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S BENCH BRIEF REGARDING NEED FOR 404(B) EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
5/30/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2018
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2018
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2018
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/31/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
5/30/2018
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/31/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
5/29/2018
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION
Filing Date
5/22/2018
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2018
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/22/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
5/17/2018
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/22/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/AS WITNESS
Filing Date
5/17/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/17/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/17/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S BENCH BRIEF REGARDING NO
NEED FOR A 404(b) EVIDENTIARY
HEARING
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
BENCH BRIEF REGARDING THE
INADMISSIBILTY OF POLYGRAPH
EXAMINATIONS
Filing Date
4/30/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER RULING ON PRESENTENCE INCACERATION CREDIT
Filing Date
4/27/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
4/25/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/25/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER ABATING RULE 32 PENDING COMPLETION OF TRIAL PROCEEDCINGS
Filing Date
4/23/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2018
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS JOINT MOTION TO CLARIFY INDICTMENT AND TO DISMISS COUNTS2 THROUGH 10
Filing Date
4/11/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT COCKHEARN'S UNDER SEAL MOTION TO CLARIFY INDICTMENT AND TO DISMISS COUNTS 2 THROUGH 10
Filing Date
4/11/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
4/11/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
motion to preclude the testimony of eldridge gittens or in the alternative for a reliability hearing
Filing Date
4/6/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON NOTICE OF ON GOING DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE AND SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS
Filing Date
4/6/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOINT MOTION IN LIMINE RE GANG AFFILIATION AND GMIC EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/6/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOINT MOTION TO CLARIFY THE INDICTMENT AND TO DISMISS COUNTS 2 THROUGH 10
Filing Date
4/6/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OR ELDRIDGE GITTENS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A RELIABILITY HEARING
Filing Date
4/6/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS JOINT MOTION TO CLARIFY THE INDICMENT AND TO DISMISS COUNTS 2 THROUGH 10
Filing Date
4/6/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS JOINT MOTION IN LIMINE RE GANG AFFILIATION AND GMIC EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/3/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/3/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/3/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/3/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/3/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/3/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging Order Under Seal
Filing Date
4/2/2018
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/28/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/28/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/28/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MCSO Legal Liaison
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
01/06/16 BY JEANNE A KAPPEDAL
Filing Date
3/21/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE
Filing Date
3/20/2018
Description
REQ - Request - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO INSTRUCT JURY ON UNCONSCIOUS BIAS and REQUEST TO MODIFY JURY INSTRUCTIONS ACCORDINGLY
Filing Date
3/19/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS UNDER SEAL MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
3/19/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/19/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Witnesses And Evidence
Filing Date
3/19/2018
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/16/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Royalty
Filing Date
3/15/2018
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/15/2018
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/12/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER TRIAL COUNSEL TO PROVIDE TRIAL FILE TO POST-CONVICTION COUNSEL FOR REVIEW
Filing Date
3/7/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2018
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2018
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS AND DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOINT MOTION TO SEVER FROM DEFENDANT WRIGHT AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS RENEWAL OF MOTION TO SEVER
Filing Date
3/1/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS AND DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOINT MOTION TO SEVER FROM DEFENDANT WRIGHT AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS RENEWAL OF MOTION TO SEVER
Filing Date
2/20/2018
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 02/20/18
Filing Date
2/7/2018
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2018
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/31/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2018
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/31/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2018
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/31/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Corey Rydell Royalty
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS AND DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOINT MOTION TO CLARIFY RECORD
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY MOTION TO RECONSIDER RULING RE DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS AND DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS AND DEFENDANT ROYALTYS JOINT MOTION TO CLARIFY RECORD
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON JOINT MOTION TO CLARIFY THE RECORD
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON JOINT MOTION TO CLARIFY THE RECORD
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON JOINT MOTION TO CLARIFY THE RECORD
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL ON JOINT MOTION TO CLARIFY THE RECORD
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
07/21/16 BY KRISTI K WEEK
Filing Date
1/24/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED 01/23/18
Filing Date
1/24/2018
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 01/24/18
Filing Date
1/19/2018
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2018
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2018
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO: DEFENDANT COCKHEARN'S AND DEFENDANT ROYALTY'S JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL-- TRIAL PREPARATION ROADMAP
Filing Date
1/17/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED 01/16/18
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/19/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(8)
NOTE:
CONTINUE TRIAL/ TRIAL PREPARATION ROADMAP
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION ROADMAP
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/16/2018
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/12/2018
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS COCKHERN'S AND DEFENDANT ROYALTY'S JOINT REQUEST TO DISQUALIFY
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION TO MS. PHILLIS ON NOVEMBER 22, 2017
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION TO MS. PHILLIS ON NOVEMBER 22, 2017
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARNS'S AND DEFENDANT ROYALTY'S JOINT REQUEST TO DISQUALIFY
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION TO MS. PHILLIS ON NOVEMBER 22, 2017
Filing Date
1/12/2018
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2018
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2018
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARN'S AND DEFENDANT ROYALTY'S JOINT MOTION TO REMOVE JUDGE FOR CAUSE AND AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
1/12/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARN'S AND DEFENDANT ROYALTY'S JOINT MOTION TO REMOVE JUDGE FOR CAUSE AND AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
1/12/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF FACTS AND CORRECTION OF FACTS FOR THE RECORD AND STATEMENT OF LAW
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Stay of Post-Conviction Relief
Filing Date
12/18/2017
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2017
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2017
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2017
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2017
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION REQUESTING THE COURT UNSEAL THE SENTENCING HEARING HELD ON 07/05/2017 FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF TRANSCRIPTION AND DISCLOSURE TO CODEFENDANTS
Filing Date
11/28/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING STATE'S MOTION REQUESTING THE COURT UNSEAL THE SENTENCING HEARING HELD ON 07/05/17 FOR LIMITED PURPOSE OF TRANSCRIPTION AND DISCLOSURE TO CODEFENDANTS
Filing Date
11/28/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL THE COURT REPORTER'S RECORD TO TRANSCRIBE AND DISCLOSE TO CODEFENDANTS; RECORDS SHALL NOT BE LEFT WITH CODEFENDANTS AND ANYONE ELSE AT THE JAIL
Filing Date
11/28/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS CHANGE OF PLEA/SENENTCING
Filing Date
11/27/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARN'S AND DEFENDANT ROYALTY'S JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
11/21/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/07/2017
Filing Date
11/21/2017
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARN'S AND DEFENDANT ROYALTY'S JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
11/21/2017
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S COCLHEARN'S AND DEFENDANT ROYALTY'S JOINT MOTIN TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
11/2/2017
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/3/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
NOTE:
REQUEST EX PARTE HEARING NOT TO REMOVE COUNSEL TO REPRESENT SELF IN ALL MATTERS DEALING WITH ARREST IN CHICAGO AND INCARCERATION
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/25/17
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL
Filing Date
10/27/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE'S CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
10/27/2017
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/27/2017
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/27/2017
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/26/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO UNSEAL
DEFENSE COUNSEL’S MOTION TO
HOLD IN ABEYANCE THE COURT’S
ORDER TO TURN OVER CASE FILE TO
PCR COUNSEL MADE ON AUGUST, 16
2017 FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF
DISCLOSURE TO CODEFENDANTS
Filing Date
10/26/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR 10/27/17 STATUS
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/23/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR PREPARATION OF
TRANSCRIPT
Filing Date
10/12/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/12/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice re Continued Stay of Post-Conviction Relief
Filing Date
10/10/2017
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reporters Transcript - 07/05/2017- PRT - Brigid M. Donovan
Filing Date
10/9/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2017
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2017
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/4/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION
Filing Date
10/2/2017
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER
RULING ON PRESENTENCE
INCARCERATION CREDIT
Filing Date
9/29/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DEPOSITION
Filing Date
9/28/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DEPOSITION
Filing Date
9/28/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DEPOSITION
Filing Date
9/22/2017
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2017
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR DEPOSITION
Filing Date
9/14/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARN’S
MOTION TO JOIN DEFENDANT
WRIGHT’S: MOTION TO DISMISS
WITH PREJUDICE FOR
VIOLATION OF RULE 8 AND
SPEEDY TRIAL
Filing Date
9/14/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Royaltys Motion To Join Defendant Wrights Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice For Violation Of Rule 8 And Speedy Trial Rights
Filing Date
9/11/2017
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2017
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2017
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION
Filing Date
9/5/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S RULE
8 MOTION1
Filing Date
8/31/2017
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
8/31/2017
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2017
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2017
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2017
Description
189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2017
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
8/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT WRIGHT’S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE FOR VIOLATION OF RULE 8, A.R.C.P. AND SPEEDY TRIAL PROVISIONS UNDER FEDERAL AND ARIZONA CONSTITUTIONS AND REQUEST FOR HEARING: DETERMINE THE CONSTITUTIONALITY OF MCSO’S HOUSING OF MR. WRIGHT IN SOLITARY CONFINEMENT FOR THE LAST SIX YEARS AND COUNTING
Filing Date
8/24/2017
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
8/24/2017
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
8/24/2017
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
8/24/2017
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
8/24/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Management Report for August 25 Status Hearing
Filing Date
8/24/2017
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
8/24/2017
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
8/24/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
8/21/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
8/16/2017
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging - Motion to File This Pleading Under Seal - "MOTION IN ABEYANCE"
Filing Date
8/11/2017
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2017
Description
595 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2017
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS
WITH PREJUDICE FOR VIOLATION OF
RULE 8, A.R.C.P. AND SPEEDY TRIAL
PROVISIONS UNDER FEDERAL AND
ARIZONA CONSTITUTIONS
AND
REQUEST FOR HEARING: DETERMINE
THE CONSTITUTIONALITY OF MCSO’S
HOUSING OF MR. WRIGHT IN
SOLITARY CONFINEMENT FOR THE
LAST SIX YEARS AND COUNTING
Filing Date
8/7/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2017
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2017
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2017
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2017
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2017
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2017
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/27/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
7/26/2017
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2017
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION
Filing Date
7/24/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2017
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2017
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2017
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
7/21/2017
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2017
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
CD ENTITLED STATE VS ELDRIDGE GITTENS VIDEO PRESENTATION PREPARED BY SHERRY LEDESMA
Filing Date
7/21/2017
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCE OF IMPRISONMENT
Filing Date
7/12/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2017
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2017
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2017
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2017
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2017
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TESTIMONIAL AGREEMENT ADDENDUM
Filing Date
7/5/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
7/5/2017
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2017
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
7/3/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DESCLOSURE OF PHONE AND VISITATION RECORDINGS
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE JAIL PHONE AND VISITATION RECORDINGS
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR STATUS
CONFERENCE WITH PRESIDING
CRIMINAL JUDGE
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE WITH PRESIDING CRIMINAL JUDGE
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY REGARDING ITEM #133
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE THAT STATE WILL NOT BE FILING A SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE RE: DESSUREAULT
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE’S COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 15.1 RE EVIDENCE OF GANG ASSOCIATION OR AFFILIATION
Filing Date
6/22/2017
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL/HEARING
Filing Date
6/21/2017
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 06/16/17
Filing Date
6/15/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2017
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2017
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/14/2017
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/14/2017
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/9/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ROYALTY’S
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
6/9/2017
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2017
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/8/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR 6/9/17 STATUS
Filing Date
6/7/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case status report
Filing Date
6/6/2017
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIFTH SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
5/30/2017
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2017
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2017
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2017
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2017
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2017
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2017
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2017
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Maricopa County Sheriffs Written Closing Argument on "Jail Search" Issue-Response to "Motion P"
Filing Date
5/26/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Closing Argument on Jail Search Issue
Filing Date
5/26/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S WRITTEN CLOSING ARGUMENT ON MOTION TO DISMISS DUE TO JAIL SEARCH/MOTION P
Filing Date
5/25/2017
Description
657 – ME: PCR: Counsel Withdrawn - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/25/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSES AMENDED REQUEST FOR DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
5/24/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
5/22/2017
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR NEW PCR COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2017
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2017
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Motion for Truly Bifurcated Capital Trial
Filing Date
5/10/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL
Filing Date
5/10/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF CRIMINAL HISTORY OF STATES WITNESSES
Filing Date
5/10/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING BOTH DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL SUBMITTED TO COURT ON 05/09/17 AND THE "MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF CRIMINAL HISTORY OF STATE'S WITNESSES" FILED ON 05/09/17
Filing Date
5/8/2017
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO RECONSIDER RULING ADMITTING TRANSCRIPT (EXHIBIT #18) INTO EVIDENCE DURING “JAIL SEARCH” HEARING
Filing Date
5/5/2017
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE
TO MOTION IN LIMINE TO
PROHIBIT THE STATE FROM
ARGUING THE LAW REQUIRES A
DEATH SENTENCE
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMAIL SERVED 05/02/17
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMAIL SERVED 05/02/17
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMAILED 05/02/17
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA SERVED 05/02/17
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA SERVED 05/02/17
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA SERVED 05/02/17
Filing Date
4/28/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION FOR TRULY BIFURCATED CAPITAL TRIAL
Filing Date
4/28/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION TO RECONSIDER RULING ADMITTING TRANSCRIPT (EXHIBIT #18) INTO EVIDENCE DURING “JAIL SEARCH” HEARING
Filing Date
4/24/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PROHIBIT THE STATE FROM ARGUING THE LAW REQUIRES A DEATH SENTENCE
Filing Date
4/17/2017
Description
129 – ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Retained re: plea - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Fourth supplemental Notice of Witnesses
Filing Date
4/17/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER
RULING ADMITTING
TRANSCRIPT (EXHIBIT #18) INTO
EVIDENCE DURING “JAIL
SEARCH” HEARING
Filing Date
4/17/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR TRULY BIFURCATED CAPITAL TRIAL
Filing Date
4/13/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO STATE'S NOTICE AND MOTION TO ADMIT 404(b) EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/11/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO SEAL STATE’S REPLY TO RESPONSE TO STATE’S NOTICE AND MOTION TO ADMIT 404(b) EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/6/2017
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF POST CONVICTION-RELIEF
Filing Date
4/5/2017
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE TO
PROHIBIT THE STATE FROM
ARGUING THE LAW REQUIRES A
DEATH SENTENCE
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE STATE'S MOTION TO ADMIT 404(B) DATED FEBRUARY 22 2017 IN THE ABOVE NAMED AND NUMBERED CAUSE BE SEALED
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL STATES MOTION TO ADMIT 404(b) EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE RESPONSE TO STATES NOTICE AND MOTION TO ADMIT 404(B) EVIDENCE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE'S NOTICE AND MOTION TO ADMIT 404(B) EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/31/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE AND MOTION TO ADMIT 404(B) EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/30/2017
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ROYALTYS CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR 3/31/17 STATUS
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
REL - Reply - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Motion to Strike States Untimely and Inadequately Pled 404(B) Notice
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2017
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
2/21/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 9 AND 10
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 9 AND 10
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING THE DEFENDANT'S / COUNTS 9 & 10
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S / COUNTS 9 & 10
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING THE STATE'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S / COUNTS 9 & 10
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUESTING THAT STATES RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 9 AND 10
Filing Date
2/7/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR 2/10/17 STATUS
Filing Date
2/7/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Royaltys Case Status Report
Filing Date
2/7/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
2/3/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA SERVED 02/03/17
Filing Date
2/3/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA SERVED 02/03/17
Filing Date
2/3/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA SERVED 02/03/17
Filing Date
2/3/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/03/17
Filing Date
2/3/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/03/17
Filing Date
2/3/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Darnell Jackson
Filing Date
2/1/2017
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
1/31/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF ELDRIDGE GITTENS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE DISMISS THE DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
1/30/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/2/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 12/29/16
Filing Date
1/27/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 01/13/2017
Filing Date
1/24/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR UNREDACTED COMMUNICATIONS RECORDS
Filing Date
1/24/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCOVERY REQUEST: OUTSTANDING FORENSIC REPORT
Filing Date
1/23/2017
Description
189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/23/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2017
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2017
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2017
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
REQUEST FOR PROBABLE CAUSE
HEARING ON ENMUND/TISON
FINDING
Filing Date
1/13/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS COUTS 9 AND 10 UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/12/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2017
Description
189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2017
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
VICTIM IMPACT LETTERS
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUESTING THAT STATES SENTENCING INFORMATION PROVIDED TO THE COURT BE PLACED UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/23/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MITIGATION REPORT
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SENTENCING INFORMATION PROVIDED TO THE COURT
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/12/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTER CAPTIONED PLEA WITHDRAWAL REQUEST
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/12/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTER CAPTIONED SENTENCING REQUEST
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
CCR - Confidential Criminal Report - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Restitution Ledger Confidential (Restricted)
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
CCR - Confidential Criminal Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Restitution Ledger Confidential (Restricted)
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
CCR - Confidential Criminal Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Restitution Ledger Confidential (Restricted)
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
1/3/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
12/29/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/2/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
12/29/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/2/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF MATERIALITY FOR TESTIMONY OF OUT-OF-STATE MATERIAL WITNESS
Filing Date
12/29/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/2/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF MATERIALITY FOR TESTIMONY OF OUT-OF-STATE MATERIAL WITNESS
Filing Date
12/29/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/2/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CERTIFICATES OF MATERIALITY
Filing Date
12/22/2016
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2016
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUESTING THAT STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF ELDRIDGE GITTENS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE DISMISS THE DEATH PENALTY BE SEALED
Filing Date
12/21/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL
Filing Date
12/21/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF ELDRIDGE GITTENS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE DISMISS THE DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
12/20/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2016
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO APPLY VERSION OF
A.R.S. §13-752(G) THAT WAS IN
EFFECT AT TIME OF OFFENSES
Filing Date
12/15/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA SERVED 12/07/16
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/07/2016
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Darnell Jackson
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Management Report
Filing Date
12/7/2016
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
12/7/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
12/7/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
12/7/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
12/7/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
12/7/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO APPLY VERSION OF A.R.S. 13-752(G) THAT WAS IN EFFECT AT TIME OF OFFENSES
Filing Date
12/6/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
12/5/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS THE ALLEGATIONS OF DANGEROUSNESS ON COUNTS 2, 3, AND 4
Filing Date
12/5/2016
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2016
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S NOTICE INVOKING RULE OF EXCLUSION
Filing Date
12/1/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/1/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2016
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/1/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE WITNESS TESTIMONY PER RULES 401, 402 & 403 OF THE ARIZ R OF EVID
Filing Date
11/29/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MAILING LIST
Filing Date
11/29/2016
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING
Filing Date
11/29/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR PAGE LIMIT EXTENSION OF SUPP. BRIEF TO SUPPORT M.T.W.
Filing Date
11/22/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice Invoking Rule of Exclusion
Filing Date
11/7/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW FROM PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
11/4/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL: MOTION TO WITHDRAW FROM PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
11/4/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTON FOR PAGE LIMIT EXTENSION
Filing Date
11/3/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FROM PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
10/31/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/1/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REPLY TO THE STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW FROM PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
10/26/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/25/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO AMEND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW :FILED ON 10/21/2016
Filing Date
10/14/2016
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ROYALTY’S CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
10/12/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS
Filing Date
10/12/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
10/12/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR 10/14/16 STATUS
Filing Date
10/12/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
10/12/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
10/12/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
10/10/2016
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Maricopa County Sheriffs Notice of Supplemental Citations RE: Response to Defendants Motion Objecting to the Use of Physical Restraints at Trial
Filing Date
10/7/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/10/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
NOTICE AND REQUEST FOR TIME EXTENSION
Filing Date
10/5/2016
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR PROBABLE CAUSE HEARING ON ENMUND/TISON FINDING
Filing Date
10/5/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MCSO RESP TO DEF MT OBJ TO USE PHYS RESTRAINTS AT TRIAL
Filing Date
10/5/2016
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PROBABLE CAUSE HEARING ON ENMUND/TISON FINDING
Filing Date
10/4/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Motion Re "Jail Search" Issue
Filing Date
10/4/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION
OF TIME FOR FILING ITS RESPONSE
TO SOME OF DEFENDANT
JACKSON’S MOTIONS
Filing Date
10/3/2016
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2016
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2016
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2016
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2016
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
9/28/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/28/16
Filing Date
9/28/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2016
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR TRIAL WITNESS
Filing Date
9/27/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2016
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2016
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL
Filing Date
9/22/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF ELDRIDGE GITTENS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE DISMISS THE DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
9/22/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/22/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
9/19/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE RESP TO DEF MT OBJ TO USE OF PHYS RESTRAINTS AT TRIAL
Filing Date
9/19/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY REGARDING JAIL CALLS
Filing Date
9/19/2016
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2016
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ROYALTY’S CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION IN
LIMINE OBJECTING TO MEDICAL
EXAMINER’S TESTIMONY
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
REQUEST FOR THIRD PARTY
DISCLOSURE OF MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 13
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 13
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
9/14/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Management Report
Filing Date
9/14/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY RE EVIDENCE OF GANG ASSOCIATION OR AFFILIATION
Filing Date
9/13/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/14/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER TO CHANGE COUNSEL AND/OR MOTION TO REPRESENT SELD AS PROPIA PERSONAL
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/2016
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPRESS CONFESSION
Filing Date
9/2/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/29/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/30/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
INTERIM CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
8/23/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2016
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
8/18/2016
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR PROBABLE CAUSE HEARING ON ENMUND/TISON FINDING
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION OBJECTING TO THE USE OF PHYSICAL RESTRAINTS AT TRIAL
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO APPLY VERSION OF A.R.S.13-752 (G) THAT WAS IN EFFECT AT TIME OF OFFENSES
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS THE ALLEGATION OF DANGEROUSNESS ON COUNT 2,3 AND 4
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY RE JAIL CALLS
Filing Date
8/16/2016
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2016
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 13
Filing Date
8/16/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY RE LUIS VILLALOBOS
Filing Date
8/16/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR THIRD PARTY
DISCLOSURE OF MEDICAL
RECORDS
Filing Date
8/16/2016
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE OBJECTING TO MEDICAL EXAMINERS TESTIMONY
Filing Date
8/16/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESS
Filing Date
8/8/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DIGNITY HEALTHS/OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Filing Date
8/8/2016
Description
RES - Response - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/11/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DIGNITY HEALTHS/AND OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT JOHN H WEBBER III'S MOTION TO PRODUCE MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
8/2/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/25/16
Filing Date
7/29/2016
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
7/29/2016
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
7/29/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
7/29/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
7/29/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
7/29/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: GANG AFFILIATION
Filing Date
7/28/2016
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (006)
Docket Date
7/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2016
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERS
Filing Date
7/28/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
7/28/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Wrights Case Status Report
Filing Date
7/27/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/28/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR RULING ON PENDING MOTIONS FOR PURPOSES OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
7/27/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ROYALTY'S CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
7/27/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT FOR 7/29/16 STATUS
Filing Date
7/25/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/26/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/21/2016
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2016
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2016
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
926 MINUTE ENTRY DATED 07/18/16
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
926 MINUTE ENTRY DATED 07/18/16
Filing Date
7/15/2016
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2016
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/15/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/11/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/12/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/8/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/11/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE BAR COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT
Filing Date
7/8/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/11/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT TO ORDER THE PRODUCTION OF PHONE RECORDS
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CR 2010-007912-005
Defendant.
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/24/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/24/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/24/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/24/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
OF DISCLOSURE PER RULE 15.2
Filing Date
6/24/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/27/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE PER RULE 15.2
Filing Date
6/23/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/24/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SECOND NOTICE
Filing Date
6/23/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/24/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT'S 2ND MOTION NOT TO DISCLOSE WORK-PRODUCT
Filing Date
6/23/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/24/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION TO NOT DISCLOSURE WORK PRODUCT
Filing Date
6/23/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/24/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SCHEDUAL CONFLICT OF ADVISOR AND INVESTIGATOR
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/22/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL
Filing Date
6/21/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 06/07/16
Filing Date
6/21/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/21/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OF JULY 20, 2016
Filing Date
6/20/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/20/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/20/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/20/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/20/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/20/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/17/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL
Filing Date
6/13/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/14/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OF 7-20-16
Filing Date
6/10/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL SUPP. REPLY AND SINGLETON'S OPPOSITION TO SEVER.
Filing Date
6/10/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEVER
Filing Date
6/9/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/9/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANTS REPLY DATED 06/02/16
Filing Date
6/6/2016
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR WITNESS ADORNO DUE TO CONFLICT
Filing Date
6/3/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
6/3/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
6/3/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
6/3/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/3/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FORM JUNE 3,2016
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT WRIGHT'S CASE STATUS REPORT FOR JUNE 3, 2016
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR 6/3/16 STATUS
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Notice of Witnesses and Mitigating Factors
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR
NOTICE OF ANY “OTHER ACT”
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ROYALTY’S
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
6/1/2016
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
6/1/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
5/24/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR XTENSION TO REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE FILED 05/11/16
Filing Date
5/24/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL: MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL / WITH MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL ATTACHED
Filing Date
5/23/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses and List of Witnesses and Exhibits
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED NOTICE OF DEFENSES
AND LIST OF WITNESSES AND
EXHIBITS
Filing Date
5/13/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/16/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO STATES THIRD MOTION TO UNSEAL HEARING
Filing Date
5/12/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS WEBBERS MOTION TO SEVER AND REQUEST FOR SEPARATE JURIES
Filing Date
5/10/2016
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
5/5/2016
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/5/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2016
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/5/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2016
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/5/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2016
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2016
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/5/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2016
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/5/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/5/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE
Filing Date
5/4/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/9/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL/MOTION TO AMEND MOTION TO SET TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
5/4/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S THIRD MOTION TO UNSEAL HEARING TO OBTAIN COPIES OF THE FOR THE RECORD RECORDINGS
Filing Date
5/4/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
5/4/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
5/4/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
5/4/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
5/4/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
5/4/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
5/3/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/4/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSER
Filing Date
5/3/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/3/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
OF DISCLOSURE PER RULE 15.2
Filing Date
4/29/2016
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2016
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2016
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2016
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2016
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2016
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/25/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 04/25/2016
Filing Date
4/22/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/25/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT TO 12 PAGES FOR MOTION TO SEVER
Filing Date
4/22/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/25/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEVER
Filing Date
4/22/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/25/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL/MOTION TO SEVER
Filing Date
4/20/2016
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO UNSEAL SEARCH WARRANTS AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
4/18/2016
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO JERRY COCKHEARN’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND EXTEND LAST DAY
Filing Date
4/14/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/14/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/14/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/14/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/14/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/14/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
4/14/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
4/13/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS ROYALTYS CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
4/13/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT FOR 4/15/16 STATUS
Filing Date
4/13/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
4/13/2016
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES NOTICE OF FILING EMAIL PURSUANT TO COURT REQUEST
Filing Date
4/11/2016
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND FOR
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/11/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
4/11/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/12/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR 4/15/16
Filing Date
4/11/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL
Filing Date
4/11/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO UNSEAL AND GRANT ACCESS TO DEA FORM 512
Filing Date
4/8/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/11/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRODUCE MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
4/8/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/11/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT ORDER RE TRANSCRIPTIONS AND DIRECT NOTICE OF DEFENSE INTERVIEWS
Filing Date
4/7/2016
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2016
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CR2010-007912-003, CR2010-007912-004, CR2010-007912-005, CR2010-007912-007
Filing Date
4/4/2016
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION AND DENYING STAY AS MOOT W/RELATED CASES CR2010-007912-003, CR2010-007912-004, CR2010-007912-005, CR2010-007912-007
Filing Date
4/4/2016
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
W/RELATED CASES CR2010-007912-008, CR2010-007912-007, CR2010-007912-4, CR2010-007912-005
Filing Date
4/4/2016
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION AND DENYING STAY AS MOOT W/RELATED CASES CR2010-007912-004, CR2010-007912-005, CR2010-007912-007, CR2010-007912-008
Filing Date
4/4/2016
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
W/RELATED CASES CR2010-007912-008, CR2010-007912-003, CR2010-007912-004, CR2010-007912-005
Filing Date
4/4/2016
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION AND DENYING STAY AS MOOT W/RELATED CASES CR2010-007912-003, CR2010-007912-004, CR2010-007912-005, CR2010-007912-008
Filing Date
4/4/2016
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
W/RELATED CASES CR2010-007912-003, CR2010-007912-005, CR2010-007912-007, CR2010-007912-008
Filing Date
4/4/2016
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION AND DENYING STAY AS MOOT W/RELATED CASES CR2010-007912-003, CR2010-007912-005, CR2010-007912-007, CR2010-007912-008
Filing Date
4/4/2016
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
W/RELATED CASES CR2010-007912-008, CR2010-007912-003, CR2010-007912-007, CR2010-007912-004
Filing Date
4/4/2016
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION AND DENYING STAY AS MOOT W/RELATED CASES CR2010-007912-003, CR2010-007912-004, CR2010-007912-007, CR2010-007912-008
Filing Date
4/1/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/4/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SET TRIAL DATE FOR JANUARY 2017
Filing Date
3/23/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Royaltys Response To Defendant Cockhearns Motion To Continue And Extend Last Day And Motion To Continue
Filing Date
3/23/2016
Description
RES - Response - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Co-Defendant Cockhearns Motion to Continue and Extend Last Day
Filing Date
3/22/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING COUNSEL TO COPY THE CDS ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE IN MR GITTENS CASE AT THE CLERKS OFFICE
Filing Date
3/21/2016
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE RE: GANG AFFILIATION
Filing Date
3/21/2016
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Co-Defendant Jerry Cockhearns Motion to Continue Trial and Extend Last Day
Filing Date
3/16/2016
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Appearance
Filing Date
3/11/2016
Description
RES - Response - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/11/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Defendant Jerry Cockhearn Motion to Continue Trial and Extend last day
Filing Date
3/10/2016
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND EXTEND LAST DAY
Filing Date
3/7/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE PROPOSED PROCTECTIVE ORDER WITH REGARD TO ANY JAIL CALLS THAT MAY BE DISLCOSED BY THE STATE
Filing Date
3/4/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH REGARD TO ANY JAIL CALLS THAT MAY BE DISCLOSED BY THE STATE
Filing Date
3/4/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH REGARD TO ANY JAIL CALLS THAT MAY BE DISCLOSED BY THE STATE
Filing Date
3/4/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH REGARD TO ANY JAIL CALLS THAT MAY BE DISLOSED BY THE STATE
Filing Date
3/4/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH REGARD TO ANY JAIL CALLS THAT MAY BE DISCLOSED BY THE STATE
Filing Date
3/4/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH REGARD TO ANY JAIL CALLS THAT MAY BE DISCLOSED BY THE STATE
Filing Date
3/4/2016
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/4/2016
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/4/2016
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/4/2016
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/4/2016
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/4/2016
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/4/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
3/3/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS WRIGHTS CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
3/2/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
3/2/2016
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Royaltys Case Status Report
Filing Date
3/2/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR 3/4/16 STATUS
Filing Date
3/2/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
3/2/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
3/2/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
3/2/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
3/2/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
3/1/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
2/26/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/29/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR 3.4.16
Filing Date
2/16/2016
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2016
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2016
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2016
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2016
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2016
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2016
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (006)
Docket Date
2/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Discovery RE: Chandler Police Department Unredacted Policies
Filing Date
1/22/2016
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND TIME FOR BALLISTICS EXAMINATION AN ADDITIONAL THIRTY DAYS
Filing Date
1/22/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR BALLISTICS EXAMINATION AN ADDITIONAL THIRTY 30 DAYS
Filing Date
1/22/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
1/22/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
1/22/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
1/22/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
1/22/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
1/22/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
1/22/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
1/22/2016
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT WRIGHT'S CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
1/20/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Management Report
Filing Date
1/19/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2016
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2016
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2016
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2016
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2016
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2016
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/14/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR: 01-08-16
Filing Date
1/7/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ROYALTY'S CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
1/5/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
12/22/2015
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S AMENDED REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
12/22/2015
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S AMENDED ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
12/21/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2015
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S AMENDED ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
12/18/2015
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S AMENDED REQUEST FOR
RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
12/17/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
12/17/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
12/17/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
12/17/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
12/17/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
12/17/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE DOCUMENTS BATES STAMPED WADE 001-284 DISCLOSED BY THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTY OFFICE SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT
Filing Date
12/17/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT DISCLOSED DOCUMENTS SHALL NOT BE DISSIMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAT COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT
Filing Date
12/17/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
12/17/2015
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE EX PARTE MOTION TO WITHDRAW UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
12/17/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO SEAL
Filing Date
12/16/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2015
Description
MEB - Motion to Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2015
Description
AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES
COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM
CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §
13-604.02(B)
Filing Date
12/15/2015
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/14/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/15/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS TO TAKE SPECIAL ACTION TO THE COURT OF APPEALS DIV 1 RE DENIAL OF MATION TO DISMISS FILED 11-20-14
Filing Date
12/9/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
12/9/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
12/9/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
12/9/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
12/9/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
12/9/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
12/7/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2015
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY RE:
CHANDLER POLICE DEPARTMENT
WAREHOUSE
Filing Date
12/2/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/2/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/2/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/2/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/2/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/2/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/23/15
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/19/15
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE STIPULATION TO ALLOW EXAMITAION OF BALLISTIC EVIDENCE
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE STIPULATION TO ALLOW EXAMINATION OF BALLISTIC EVIDENCE
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE STIPULATION TO ALLOW EXAMINATION OF BALLISTIC EVIDENCE
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE STIPULATION TO ALLOW EXAMINATION OF BALLISTIC EVIDENCE
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE STIPULATION TO ALLOW EXAMINATION OF BALLISTIC EVIDENCE
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE STIPULATION TO ALLOW EXAMINATION OF BALLISTIC EVIDENCE
Filing Date
11/19/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT TO SET AND ORDER ADVISORY COUNSEL PARAMETERS
Filing Date
11/19/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL: MOTION FOR COURT TO SET AND ORDER ADVISORY COUNSEL ACTIVITY PARAMETERS
Filing Date
11/19/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
11/18/2015
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO VIEW CHANDLER
POLICE DEPARTMENT
WAREHOUSE
Filing Date
11/17/2015
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
11/17/2015
Description
AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES
COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM
CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §
13-604.02(A)
Filing Date
11/17/2015
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
11/16/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Allow Examination of Ballistic Evidence
Filing Date
11/13/2015
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO VIEW CHANDLER POLICE DEPARTMENT WAREHOUSE
Filing Date
11/12/2015
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ROYALTYS CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
11/12/2015
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO PRESERVE MEDICAL
RECORDS
Filing Date
11/12/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT WRIGHTS STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
11/12/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Singleton Case Status Report
Filing Date
11/10/2015
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
11/9/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/10/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR 11/13/15
Filing Date
11/9/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/12/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL MOTION TO RECONSIDER MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
11/9/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/12/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF PAGE LIMIT FOR MOTION TO RECONSIDER MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
11/9/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL AND SEALING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER: MOTION TO DISMISS, NOT TO BE UNSEALED WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER FROM COURT
Filing Date
11/9/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S,
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
11/6/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
11/5/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/10/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANTS REPLY TO THE STATES RESPONSE FOR DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER RULE 15.5
Filing Date
11/5/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANT MOTION TO SEAL AND SEALING DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO THE STATE'S RESPONSE FOR DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER RULE 15.15 NOT TO BE UNSEALED WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER FROM THIS COURT
Filing Date
11/3/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to View Chandler Police Department Warehouse
Filing Date
10/28/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/28/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/28/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/28/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/28/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/28/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/28/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO ITEM # 10 FROM DEFENDANTS MOTION TO RE-CONSIDER
Filing Date
10/23/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/21/2015
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S REPSONSE TO
JOINT MOTION REQUESTING
HEARING REGARDING LUIS
VILLALOBOS DEPOSITION
Filing Date
10/20/2015
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION REQUESTING HEARING REGARDING LUIS VILLALOBOS DEPOSITION
Filing Date
10/20/2015
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION REQUESTING HEARING REGARDING LUIS VILLALOBOS DEPOSITION
Filing Date
10/16/2015
Description
MFH - Motion For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION REQUESTING HEARING REGARDING LUIS VILLALOBOS DEPOSITION
Filing Date
10/16/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION REQUESTING
HEARING REGARDING LUIS
VILLALOBOS DEPOSITION
Filing Date
10/16/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/19/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER STATES WITNESS TO COMPLY TO DEPOSITION DATED 10/30/15 AND 11/06/15
Filing Date
10/15/2015
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
ITEM #10 FROM DEFENDANT
(WEBBER’S) MOTION TO
RECONSIDER MOTION TO
COMPEL
Filing Date
10/8/2015
Description
RES - Response - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO ITEM #10 FROM
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
RECONSIDER MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL ITEM #10
Filing Date
10/5/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL
Filing Date
10/5/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE / TO APPOINT COUNSEL
Filing Date
10/2/2015
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING
VICTIM IMPACT EVIDENCE
Filing Date
9/28/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/28/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2015
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2015
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2015
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING VICTIM IMPACT EVIDENCE
Filing Date
9/25/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SEPARATE
INTERVIEWS FROM DEFENDANT
WEBBER OR AN ORDER THAT
ADVISORY COUNSEL CONDUCT
INTERVIEW OF LUIS VILLALOBOS
Filing Date
9/24/2015
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SEVER COUNT 14 OF THE GRAND JURY INDICTMENT
Filing Date
9/24/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ANTHONY WRIGHTS CASE STATUS REPORT & MOTION TO JOIN CODEFENDANT JOHN WEBBERS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FILED ON 08/26/2015 MOTION TO JOIN CODEFENDANT DOARNELL JACKSONS MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING VICTIM IMPACT EVIDENCE FILED ON 028/26/2015 & MOTION TO JOIN CODEFENDANT DOARNELL JACKSONS MOTION TO SEVER COUNT 14 OF THE GRAND JURY INDICTMENT FILED ON 07/01/2015
Filing Date
9/24/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT SINGLETON CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
9/24/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/28/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRESERVE MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
9/24/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/28/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR 9/25/15
Filing Date
9/22/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
9/21/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S,
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
9/18/2015
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/18/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2015
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/18/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2015
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2015
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/18/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2015
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/18/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2015
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/18/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL MINUTE ENTRY DATED 8/31/15 AND FILED 9/1/15
Filing Date
9/17/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/24/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL DATED: 9-14-15
Filing Date
9/17/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEAL MINUTE ENTRY DATED 8-31-15 AND FILED 9-1-15 NOT TO BE UNSEALED WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER FROM THIS COURT
Filing Date
9/16/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
023 ME DATED 09/11/15
Filing Date
9/15/2015
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE EX PARTE MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL
Filing Date
9/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE MOTION TO FILE EX PARTE MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL
Filing Date
9/9/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/9/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ME-926 RULING DATED 08/31/15
Filing Date
8/27/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANT
JOHN WEBBER’S MOTION TO
COMPEL DISCOVERY
Filing Date
8/26/2015
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion in Limine Regarding Victim Impact Evidence
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CORRECTED NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICTS AND REQUEST FOR DIRECTION FROM THE COURT
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CORRECTED NOTICE OF TRIAL
CONFLICTS AND REQUEST FOR
DIRECTION FROM THE COURT
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CORRECTED NOTICE OF TRIAL
CONFLICTS AND REQUEST FOR
DIRECTION FROM THE COURT
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CORRECTED NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICTS AND REQUEST FOR DIRECTION FROM THE COURT
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CORRECTED NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICTS AND REQUEST FOR DIRECTION FROM THE COURT
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CORRECTED NOTICE OF TRIAL
CONFLICTS AND REQUEST FOR
DIRECTION FROM THE COURT
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CORRECTED NOTICE OF TRIAL
CONFLICTS AND REQUEST FOR
DIRECTION FROM THE COURT
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CORRECTED NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICTS AND REQUEST FOR DIRECTION FROM THE COURT
Filing Date
8/25/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CORRECTED NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICTS AND REQUEST FOR DIRECTION FROM THE COURT
Filing Date
8/23/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICTS AND REQUEST FOR DIRECTION FROM THE COURT
Filing Date
8/23/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICTS AND REQUEST FOR DIRECTION FROM THE COURT
Filing Date
8/23/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICTS AND REQUEST FOR DIRECTION FROM THE COURT
Filing Date
8/23/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICTS
AND REQUEST FOR DIRECTION FROM
THE COURT
Filing Date
8/23/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICTS
AND REQUEST FOR DIRECTION FROM
THE COURT
Filing Date
8/23/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICTS AND REQUEST FOR DIRECTION FROM THE COURT
Filing Date
8/21/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION OF REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
8/21/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUESTING THAT STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION OF REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER RULE 15.5 OF THE ARCP BE SEALED
Filing Date
8/21/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL
Filing Date
8/20/2015
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF ERRATA WITH ATTACHED CD
Filing Date
8/19/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/19/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (006)
Docket Date
8/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION OF REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
8/14/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/18/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL
Filing Date
8/14/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/18/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT OF RULE 35 OF ARCP
Filing Date
8/13/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION REQUESTING THAT STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE CO-DEFENDANT ELDRIDGE GITTENS FROM TESTIFYING AND/OR TO DISMISS STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY BE SEALED
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/11/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL SHERIFF ARPAIO'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCUSE WEARING OF RESTRAINTS DURING TRIAL
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/11/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL THE STATE'S RESPONSE FILED 11/14/14
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/11/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE FILED 11/11/14
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/11/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO THE STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTIOIN TO AMEND NOTICE OF DEFENSE
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO SEAL ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND DEFENSES
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/11/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL RELY TO SHERIFF ARPAIO'S SUPP. RESPONSE FILED 12/4/14
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/11/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO SHERIFF ARPAIO'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE FILED 12/4/14
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE CO-DEFENDANT ELDRIDGE GITTENS FROM TESTIFYING AND/OR TO DISMISS STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S /TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PURSUANT TO RULE 35.1 ARCP
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING THE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LIMITED USE OF LAPTOP AND RESEARCH MATERIALS NOT TO BE UNSEALED WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER FROM THIS COURT
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE STATES MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PURSUANT TO RULE 35.1 ARCP
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CHANGE OF JUDGE FOR CAUSE
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL MOTION TO CHANGE OF JUDGE FOR CAUSE
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR DIRECTION
FROM COURT REGARDING DEFINITION
OF “STATEMENT” PURSUANT TO RULE
15
Filing Date
8/5/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2015
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE MOTION TO COMPEL FILED MARCH 31, 2015
Filing Date
7/31/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/31/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT SINGLETO’S CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
7/30/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/31/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
Case Complex Management Report for July 31, 2015
Filing Date
7/29/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/28/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Royaltys Case Status Report
Filing Date
7/27/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE DEFENDANTS MOTION/NOTICE OF WITHDRAW OF MOTION TO DISMISS GRAND JURY INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE FILED 02/05/14
Filing Date
7/27/2015
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/28/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S, CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
7/23/2015
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
7/21/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/22/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE MOTION TO COMPEL FILED 3-31-15
Filing Date
7/15/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 7-8-15
Filing Date
7/14/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/15/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION/NOTICE OF WITHDRAW OF MOTION TO DISMISS GRAND JURY INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE FILED FEB 5TH,2014
Filing Date
7/9/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2015
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION AND DENYING STAY AS MOOT
Filing Date
7/9/2015
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION AND DENYING STAY AS MOOT
Filing Date
7/9/2015
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION AND DENYING STAY AS MOOT
Filing Date
7/9/2015
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION AND DENYING STAY AS MOOT
Filing Date
7/9/2015
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION AND DENYING STAY AS MOOT
Filing Date
7/8/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-30-15
Filing Date
7/8/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-30-15
Filing Date
7/8/2015
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2015
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Sever Count 14 of the Grand Jury Indictment
Filing Date
7/1/2015
Description
NTF - Notice to the File - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED EX PARTE / TO FILE ACTUAL AUDIO VIDEO FTR CDS FOR PREVIOUSLY REFERENCED FTR CDS
Filing Date
6/30/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/7/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING THE STATE TO FILE AUDIO VIDEO FTR CDS IN PLACE OF PREVIOUSLY FILED REFERENCES TO THOSE CDS
Filing Date
6/30/2015
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2015
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO LIFT SEAL FROM THE LISTED SEALED DOCUMENTS AND THEN TO RE-SEAL THOSE DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
6/25/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO AN ORDER FROM DIVISION ONE COURT OF APPEALS THE STATE REQUESTS AN ORDER UNSEALING THREE DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
6/23/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2015
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2015
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2015
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2015
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2015
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2015
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2015
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2015
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2015
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY/MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING MOTION TO CLARIFY RULING
Filing Date
5/22/2015
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FILED 11/20/14
Filing Date
5/19/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF PAGES TO BE REVIEWED FOR ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS GRAND JURY INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/19/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL
Filing Date
5/19/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL THE STATE'S NOTICE OF PAGES TO BE REVIEWED FOR ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS GRAND JURY INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE FILE ON 5/2/2015
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ANTHONY WRIGHT'S CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
5/14/2015
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/14/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Royaltys Case Status Report
Filing Date
5/13/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Singleton Case Status Report
Filing Date
5/12/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
5/12/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S,
MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/12/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/14/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDNAT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FILED 11/20/14
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANTS REQUEST SEALING DEFENDANTS REPLY TO SHERIFF ARPAIOS RESPONSE FOR DEFENDANTS LIMITED USE OF LAPTOP AND RESEARCH MATERIAL DATED 5-4-15 NO TO BE OPENDED WITHOUT FURTHER COURT ORDER
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT/FOR MAY 15, 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE AND REQUEST TO FILE MOTION UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO SHERIFF ARPAIO'S RESPONSE FOR DEFENDANT'S LIMITED USE OF LAPTOP AND RESEARCH MATERIAL
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANTS REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FILED 11-20-14
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE UNDER RULE 15.2
Filing Date
5/8/2015
Description
RES - Response - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Arizona Department of Corrections Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel
Filing Date
5/6/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL: IN RESPONSE TO ADOC'S MOTION TO QUASH
Filing Date
5/5/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL: MOTION TO COMPEL IN RESPONSE TO ADOC'S MOTION TO QUASH
Filing Date
5/4/2015
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/4/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2015
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIFF JOE ARPAIO'S RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT JOHN HOWARD WEBBER'S MOTION FOR LIMITED USE OF LAPTOP COMPUTER AND ACCESS TO RESEARCH MATERIAL ON TOPIC OF INFORMANT USE
Filing Date
4/29/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLEADINGS RE MOTOIN FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STIKE NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
4/29/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
Filing Date
4/29/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Royaltys Motion To Join Defendant Jacksons Motion To Dismiss Counts 8, 9, And 10 Of The Grand Jury Indictment
Filing Date
4/24/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN
Filing Date
4/23/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion Join Doarnell Reuna Jacksons Motion to Dismiss counts 8,9 and 10 of the Grand Jury Indictment
Filing Date
4/22/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
4/17/2015
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY RE: ELDRIDGE AUZZELE GITTENS
Filing Date
4/14/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/14/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUESTING THAT STATES RESPONSE TO MEMORANDUM OF LAW ON THE APPROPRIATE SANCTION FOR 15.1 VIOLATION BE SEALED
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO MEMORANDUM OF LAW ON THE APPROPRIATE SANCTION FOR 15.1 VIOLATION
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2015
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR
VIOLATION OF RULE 8 OF THE
ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL
PROCEDURE
Filing Date
4/6/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CLARIFY RULING
Filing Date
4/3/2015
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR VIOLATION OF
RULE 8 OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
4/2/2015
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/3/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR
FILING ON ITS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO
STRIKE STATE’S UNTIMELY AND
INADEQUATELY PLED 404(B) NOTICE
Filing Date
4/2/2015
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/3/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION
OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
4/1/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ROYALTY’S CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
4/1/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
WRIGHT'S CASE STATUS
Filing Date
3/31/2015
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/31/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S,
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
3/31/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/2/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR APRIL 2, 2015
Filing Date
3/30/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
3/25/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2015
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR VIOLATION OF RULE 8 OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
3/13/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/18/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY ITEMS
Filing Date
3/12/2015
Description
MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Arizona Department of Corrections Objection and Motion To Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum
Filing Date
3/11/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE STATE=S UNTIMELY AND INADEQUATELY
PLED 404(B) NOTICE
Filing Date
3/10/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2015
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2015
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/26/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2015
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/26/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY MOTION TO SET TRIAL
DATE PRIOR TO LAST DAY
Filing Date
2/19/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY MOTION TO SET TRIAL
DATE PRIOR TO LAST DAY
Filing Date
2/19/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY MOTION TO SET TRIAL DATE PRIOR TO LAST DAY
Filing Date
2/19/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY MOTION TO SET TRIAL DATE PRIOR TO LAST DAY
Filing Date
2/19/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY MOTION TO SET TRIAL DATE PRIOR TO LAST DAY
Filing Date
2/19/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY MOTION TO SET TRIAL
DATE PRIOR TO LAST DAY
Filing Date
2/19/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY MOTION TO SET TRIAL DATE PRIOR TO LAST DAY
Filing Date
2/12/2015
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
2/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARN’S NOTICE OF IMPENDING EXPIRATION OF LAST DAY IN NON-CAPITAL CASE
Filing Date
2/3/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF IMPENDING
EXPIRATION OF LAST DAY IN
CAPITAL CASE
Filing Date
1/30/2015
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2015
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2015
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2015
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2015
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2015
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2015
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2015
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2015
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S PRO PER COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM FOR JANUARY 30, 2015
Filing Date
1/21/2015
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S PRO PER MOTION TO SEAL COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM FOR JANUARY 30, 2015
Filing Date
1/15/2015
Description
REL - Reply - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Memorandum of Law on the States Failure to Comply with Rule 15.1, A.R.C.P. and Whether a Severance Should Have Been Granted
Filing Date
1/14/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/14/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF OTHER ACTS EVIDENCE AND SUPPLEMENTAL 15.1
Filing Date
1/14/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF OTHER ACTS EVIDENCE AND SUPPLEMENTAL 15.1
Filing Date
1/13/2015
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARN’S REPLY TO
THE STATE’S RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW ON THE APPROPRIATE SANCTION FOR THE FAILURE OF THE STATE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 15.1, A.R.C.P.
Filing Date
1/6/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/2/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE DEFENDANT’S PRESENCE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
12/22/2014
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Motion to Preclude Eldridge Gittens From Testifying and/or to Dismiss the States Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty
Filing Date
12/18/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2014
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/17/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN CO DEFENDANTS REPLY AND RESPONSE FILED 12/09/14
Filing Date
12/16/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/16/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARN’S MOTION TO
JOIN DOARNELL REUNA JACKSON’S
MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 8, 9, AND 10
OF THE GRAND JURY INDICTMENT
Filing Date
12/16/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S PRO PER MOTION TO SEAL MOTION TO DISMISS FILED 12/2/14
Filing Date
12/16/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S PRO PER MOTION TO DISMISS FILED 12/2/14
Filing Date
12/16/2014
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/24/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS NOT TO BE UNSEALED WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER FROM THIS COURT
Filing Date
12/15/2014
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2014
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2014
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2014
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Motion to Strike Intent to Seek the Death Penalty
Filing Date
12/15/2014
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Motion to Suppress Confession
Filing Date
12/15/2014
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
REQUEST FOR DESSUREAULT
HEARING
Filing Date
12/10/2014
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2014
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO DISMISS
COUNTS 8, 9 AND 10 OF THE
GRAND JURY INDICTMENT AND
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO AMEND
THE INDICTMENT TO
CONSOLIDATE THOSE THREE
COUNTS INTO ONE
Filing Date
12/5/2014
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
12/5/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/16/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S PRO PER MOTION FOR LIMITED USE OF LAPTOP COMPUTER AND ACCESS TO RESEARCH MATERIAL ON TOPIC OF INFORMANT USE
Filing Date
12/5/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/16/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S PRO PER MOTION TO SEAL MOTION FOR LIMITED USE OF LAPTOP AND RESEARCH MATERIALS
Filing Date
12/5/2014
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/5/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2014
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEMORANDUM OF LAW ON THE APPROPRIATE SANCTION FOR THE STATE=S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 15.1, A.R.C.P. AND WHETHER A SEVERANCE SHOULD HAVE BEEN GRANTED
Filing Date
12/5/2014
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Memorandum of Law on the Appropriate Sanction for the Failure of the State to Comply with Rule 15 .1
Filing Date
12/5/2014
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO POINT OUT FOR THE COURT WHICH PAGES THE STATE FEELS ARE MOST RELEVANT IN THE ATTACHMENTS FROM DEFENDANT WEBBER’S MOTION TO DISMISS G.J. INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE AND THE STATE’S RESPONSE
Filing Date
12/5/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/8/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROYALTY'S / TO JOIN DEFENDANT WRIGHT'S AND COCKHEARN'S MEMORANDUMS OF LAW REGARDING SANCTIONS FOR DISCOVERY VIOLATIONS
Filing Date
12/4/2014
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION REGARDING TRIAL READINESS
Filing Date
12/4/2014
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
12/4/2014
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Thandika Singletons Joint Case Status Report
Filing Date
12/4/2014
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE STATUS MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
12/4/2014
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE STATUS MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
12/4/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
12/4/2014
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CASE STATUS MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
12/4/2014
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE INTENT
TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
12/4/2014
Description
REL - Reply - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
12/4/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/16/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIFF ARPAIO'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DEFENDANT TO BE TRANSPORTED VIA SRT
Filing Date
12/4/2014
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS
Filing Date
12/4/2014
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS
Filing Date
12/4/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIFF ARPAIO'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BE TRANSPORTED VIA SRT FILED 12/4/14
Filing Date
12/3/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing
Filing Date
12/3/2014
Description
REP - Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ROYALTY'S CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
12/3/2014
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S,
JOINT CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
12/3/2014
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 8, 9 and 10 OF THE GRAND JURY INDICTMENT AND MOTION TO AMEND THE INDICTMENT TO CONSOLIDATE THOSE THREE COUNTS INTO ONE
Filing Date
12/3/2014
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS
Filing Date
12/3/2014
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S WRIGHT'S CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
12/2/2014
Description
ORD - Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF
Filing Date
12/1/2014
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPRESS CONFESSION
Filing Date
11/26/2014
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/26/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2014
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time to File Supplemental Brief
Filing Date
11/25/2014
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/10/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
Filing Date
11/24/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/21/14, FILED 11/24/14, ISSUED BY THE HON. JOSEPH C. WELTY
Filing Date
11/24/2014
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/24/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARN’S MOTION FOR
AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION
REGARDING TRIAL READINESS
Filing Date
11/18/2014
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2014
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS, ALTERNATIVELY, TO PRECLUDE CO-DEFENDANT GITTENS FROM TESTIFYING
Filing Date
11/13/2014
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/13/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/14/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIFF ARPAIO'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DEFENDANT TO BE TRANSPORTED VIA SRT
Filing Date
11/10/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/15/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIFF ARPAIO'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT JOHN HOWARD WEBBER'S MOTION TO AMEND CUSTODY ORDERS FILED JULY 11, 2013
Filing Date
11/10/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Strike Death Notice on the Basis that A.R.S. 13-751 Is Unconstitutional and Motion to Join Pending Cases Consolidated in Judge Kreamers Court
Filing Date
10/31/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRO PER DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REQUEST AN EXTENSION OF PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT'S REPLY, AND SUPP. TO STATES RESPONSE TO M.T.D.W.P.
Filing Date
10/31/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRO PER DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENT OF REFERENCE FOR MOST RELEVANT PARTS OF EXHIBITS A-Q OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS G.J. INDICTMENT W/PREJUDICE
Filing Date
10/31/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRO PER DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO THE STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS GRAND JURY INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE (ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED)
Filing Date
10/31/2014
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/31/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE IT’S RESPONSE TO THE REQUEST FOR PAGE NUMBERS DUE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE GRAND JURY INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE AND MOTION TO AMMEND NOTICE OF DEFENSE
Filing Date
10/31/2014
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION
OF TIME FOR FILING ITS RESPONSE
TO DEFENDANT JACKSON’S
MOTIONS
Filing Date
10/31/2014
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2014
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING
Filing Date
10/29/2014
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/23/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ITS REPLY TO THE STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS GRAND JURY INDICTMENT
Filing Date
10/22/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/22/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
Motion to Join Motion to Dismiss Counts 8, 9 and 10 of the Grand Jury Indictment
Filing Date
10/22/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/23/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ITS REPLY TO THE STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS GRAND JURY INDICTMENT
Filing Date
10/17/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2014
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss Counts 8, 9, and 10 of the Grand Jury Indictment
Filing Date
9/30/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/1/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO AMEND BOND AND CUSTODY ORDER FILED ON 07/11/13
Filing Date
9/29/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/16/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REPLY TO SHERIFF ARPAIOS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO BE TRANSPORTED VIA S.R.T
Filing Date
9/29/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2014
Description
REL - Reply - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/16/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE: MOTION TO DISMISS, ALTERNATIVELY TO PRECLUDE CO DEFENDANT GITTENS FROM TESTIFYING
Filing Date
9/15/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2014
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS GRAND JURY INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE FILED 09/10/2014
Filing Date
9/10/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/19/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATIONRE MOTION TO DISMISS ALTERNATIVELY TO PRECLUDE CO DEFENDANT GITTENS FROM TESTIFYING
Filing Date
9/3/2014
Description
RES - Response - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIFF ARPOAIO'S / TO DEFENDANT WEBBER MOTION TO SEAL SHERIFF ARPAIO’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO EXCUSE WEARING OF RESTRAINTS DURING TRIAL
Filing Date
8/26/2014
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/26/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2014
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Dessureault Hearing
Filing Date
8/19/2014
Description
RES - Response - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/19/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIFF ARPAIO'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT WEBBER MOTION TO EXCUSE WEARING OF RESTRAINTS DURING TRIAL FILED FEBRUARY 6, 2013
Filing Date
8/19/2014
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISMISS NOTICE OF INTENT
TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY BASED UPON
ARBITRARINESS
Filing Date
8/19/2014
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF
INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY
BASED UPON ARBITRARINESS
Filing Date
8/15/2014
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/15/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING ON ITS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE: MOTION TO DISMISS, ALTERNATIVELY TO PRECLUDE CO DEFENDANT GITTENS FROM TESTIFYING
Filing Date
8/15/2014
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR
FILING ON ITS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO
DISMISS NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH
PENALTY BASED UPON ARBITRARINESS
Filing Date
8/14/2014
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (006)
Docket Date
8/14/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2014
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/5/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2014
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ROYALTY’S MOTION TO JOIN “MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE: MOTION TO DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO PRECLUDE CO-DEFENDANT GITTENS FROM TESTIFYING”
Filing Date
7/25/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE CO-
DEFENDANT ELDRIDGE GITTENS
FROM TESTIFYING AND/OR TO
DISMISS STATE’S NOTICE OF
INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH
PENALTY
Filing Date
7/25/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COCKHEARN’S JOINT
MOTION TO JOIN ANTHONY WRIGHT’S
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE:
MOTION TO DISMISS, ALTERNATIVELY
TO PRECLUDE CO-DEFENDANT GITTENS
FROM TESTIFYING
Filing Date
7/22/2014
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/22/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR
FILING ON ITS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR
RECONSIDERATION RE: MOTION TO
DISMISS, ALTERNATIVELY TO PRECLUDE CO
DEFENDANT GITTENS FROM TESTIFYING
Filing Date
7/22/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/22/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/21/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/21/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
Motion to Join Motion for Reconsideration re Motion to Dismiss Alternatively to Preclude Codefendant Gittens from Testifying
Filing Date
7/21/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/21/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT ON ITS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE: MOTION TO DISMISS, ALTERNATIVELY TO PRECLUDE CO DEFENDANT GITTENS FROM TESTIFYING
Filing Date
7/18/2014
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/18/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Royaltys Joint Case Status Report
Filing Date
7/18/2014
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
7/14/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/15/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE
LIMIT ON ITS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR
RECONSIDERATION RE: MOTION TO
DISMISS, ALTERNATIVELY TO PRECLUDE CO
DEFENDANT GITTENS FROM TESTIFYING
Filing Date
7/11/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/14/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
7/11/2014
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/14/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JOINT CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
7/10/2014
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S, JOINT CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
7/10/2014
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT FOR DEFENDANT ANTHONY WRIGHT
Filing Date
7/9/2014
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
7/1/2014
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Reconsideration re: Motion to Dismiss, Alternatively to Preclude Co-Defendant Gittens from Testifying
Filing Date
6/17/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2014
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/20/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION
Filing Date
6/17/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2014
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION
Filing Date
6/16/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2014
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2014
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS PROPER COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT
Filing Date
6/3/2014
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S,
JOINT CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
6/3/2014
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S CASE STATUS MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
5/30/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISMISSING THIS APPEAL
Filing Date
5/30/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISMISSING APPEAL
Filing Date
5/30/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISMISSING THIS APPEAL
Filing Date
5/30/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISMISSING THIS APPEAL
Filing Date
5/30/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISMISSING THIS APEAL
Filing Date
5/30/2014
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISMISSING THIS APPEAL
Filing Date
5/30/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Determine Judge and Request for Hearing in Capital Case
Filing Date
5/8/2014
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/13/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM/SERVED 05/07/14
Filing Date
5/7/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CHANGE JUDGE
Filing Date
4/29/2014
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2014
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2014
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2014
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2014
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2014
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/29/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER RECUSAL/DISQUALIFICATION
Filing Date
4/23/2014
Description
REL - Reply - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
4/22/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/22/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2014
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/23/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
4/21/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2014
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/16/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion For Change of Judge
Filing Date
4/7/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2014
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2014
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2014
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2014
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2014
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2014
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2014
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2014
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2014
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2014
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL HEARING TO OBTAIN COPIES OF THE FOR THE RECORD RECORDING
Filing Date
3/24/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL HEARINGS TO OBTAIN COPIES OF THE FOR THE RECORD RECORDINGS
Filing Date
3/24/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL HEARINGS TO OBTAIN COPIES OF THE FOR THE RECORD RECORDINGS
Filing Date
3/18/2014
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/18/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2014
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2014
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2014
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2014
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2014
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2014
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2014
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2014
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING CHANGE OF
PLEA TRANSCRIPT REGARDING
DEFENDANT ELDRIDGE GITTENS
FOR MOTION TO REMOVE JUDGE
FOR CAUSE
HEARING REQUESTED
Filing Date
3/3/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/3/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RESPONCE TO STATE REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND
Filing Date
3/3/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/3/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RESPONCE TO STATE'S MOTION TO UNSEAL HEARINGS
Filing Date
3/3/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2014
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2014
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING
Filing Date
2/28/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/28/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SECOND MOTION TO UNSEAL
HEARING TO OBTAIN COPIES OF THE
FOR THE RECORD RECORDINGS
Filing Date
2/26/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/27/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RESPONCE TO STATE REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND
Filing Date
2/26/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/27/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RESPONCE TO STATE'S MOTION TO UNSEAL HEARINGS
Filing Date
2/25/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTY ATTORNEY
Filing Date
2/25/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTY ATTORNEY
Filing Date
2/25/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTY ATTORNEY
Filing Date
2/25/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTY ATTORNEY
Filing Date
2/25/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTY ATTORNEY
Filing Date
2/25/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTY ATTORNEY
Filing Date
2/20/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/20/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING KENNY COUNTRYMAN AFFIDAVIT/VERIFICATION OF REGINALD COOK FOR MOTION TO REMOVE JUDGE FOR CAUSE
Filing Date
2/18/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/18/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT/VERIFICATION OF REGINALD COOK FOR MOTION TO REMOVE JUDGE FOR CAUSE HEARING REQUESTED
Filing Date
2/14/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
2/14/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/13/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS COCKHEARN WRIGHT ROYALTY AND SINGLETONS MOTION TO REMOVE JUDGE FOR CAUSE
Filing Date
2/12/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO UNSEAL HEARINGS
TO OBTAIN COPIES OF THE FOR THE
RECORD RECORDINGS
Filing Date
2/11/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO UNSEAL HEARINGS
TO OBTAIN COPIES OF THE FOR THE
RECORD RECORDINGS
Filing Date
2/11/2014
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2014
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2014
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2014
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2014
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2014
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO UNSEAL HEARINGS
TO OBTAIN COPIES OF THE FOR THE
RECORD RECORDINGS
Filing Date
2/10/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO UNSEAL HEARINGS
TO OBTAIN COPIES OF THE FOR THE
RECORD RECORDINGS
Filing Date
2/10/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/20/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
"EX PARTE HEARING" MINUTE ENTRY DATED 02/06/2014
Filing Date
2/7/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2014
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS GRAND JURY INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
2/7/2014
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE CO-DEFENDANT TESTIFYING
Filing Date
2/7/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
2/6/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/12/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS GRAND JURY INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE MOTION TO AMEND PREVIOUSLY FILED MOTION REQUESTING MODIFICATION OF BOND AND CUSTODY
Filing Date
2/6/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
2/5/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
2/5/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
2/5/2014
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S, MEMORANDUM REGARDING A REALISTIC TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
2/5/2014
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/7/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
2/4/2014
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEMORANDUM RELATED TO A REALISTIC TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
2/3/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Be Copied On Motions Filing Concerning Mr Gittens
Filing Date
2/3/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/4/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/4/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/4/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/4/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/4/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2014
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD
Filing Date
2/3/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT/ACCEPT
Filing Date
2/3/2014
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD
Filing Date
2/3/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT / ACCEPT
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Dismiss Notice of Intent To Seek Death Penalty Based Upon Arbitrariness
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION
Filing Date
1/31/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION
Filing Date
1/30/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2014
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2014
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2014
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2014
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEFNDANT TO BE TRANSPORTED VIA S.R.T.
Filing Date
1/23/2014
Description
REL - Reply - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/23/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO DISMISS,
ALTERNATIVELY TO PRECLUDE
CO DEFENDANT
GITTENS FROM TESTIFYING
Filing Date
1/21/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/21/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Preclude Co-Defendant Eldridge Gittens Testifying
Filing Date
1/17/2014
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2014
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2014
Description
LET - Letter - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2014
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2014
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2014
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2014
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS,
ALTERNATIVELY TO PRECLUDE
CO DEFENDANT
GITTENS FROM TESTIFYING
Filing Date
1/7/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/8/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/8/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/31/2013
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT REPORTER NOTIFICATION
Filing Date
12/23/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION TO COURT REPORTERS/NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
12/20/2013
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2013
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION TO COURT REPORTERS/NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
12/20/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION TO COURT REPORTERS/NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
12/19/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION TO COURT REPORTERS/NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
12/19/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION TO COURT REPORTERS/NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
12/19/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION TO COURT REPORTERS/NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
12/18/2013
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Notice of Appeal
Filing Date
12/18/2013
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Notice of Appeal
Filing Date
12/18/2013
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF APPEAL
Filing Date
12/18/2013
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF APPEAL
Filing Date
12/18/2013
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF APPEAL
Filing Date
12/18/2013
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Notice of Appeal
Filing Date
12/17/2013
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, ALTERNATIVELY TO PRECLUDE CO DEFENDANT GITTENS FROM TESTIFYING
Filing Date
12/16/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Advisement
Filing Date
12/13/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2013
Description
RES - Response - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO STRIKE
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
MATERIALS FILING
Filing Date
11/27/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL MATERIALS FILING
Filing Date
11/27/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/21/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Supplemental Materials in Support Of Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss Counts 2 3 4 9 10 11 and 12 of the indictment as A Matter of Law
Filing Date
11/15/2013
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2013
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2013
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2013
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2013
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2013
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2013
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2013
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/4/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2013
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES SUBMITTED LIST OF FACTS
Filing Date
10/25/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLEA AGREEMENT; PLEA AGREEMENT/CHANGE OF PLEA MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/21/13; ORDER OF CONFINEMENT; SENTENCE OF IMPRISONMENT MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/21/13
Filing Date
10/24/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2013
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2013
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2013
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2013
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2013
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2013
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2013
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION
OF TIME TO FILE IT’S NOTICE OF FACTS
Filing Date
10/9/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/23/13
Filing Date
10/9/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/23/13
Filing Date
10/9/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/19/13
Filing Date
10/7/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2013
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2013
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2013
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/3/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S, JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL -ORREJOIN CO-DEFENDANTS WEBBER AND SINGLETON
Filing Date
9/30/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/30/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN DEFENDANT
DARRNELL REUNA JACKSON’S
MOTION TO DISMISS
COUNTS 2, 3, 4, 8, 9 AND 10,
AND DEFENDANT
JOHN HOWARD WEBBER’S
MOTION TO DISMISS
COUNTS 2, 3, 4, 9, 11 AND 12
Filing Date
9/27/2013
Description
RES - Response - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE'S MOTION FOR RULE 11 EVALUATION
Filing Date
9/27/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2013
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2013
Description
ORD - Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO TRANSPORT
Filing Date
9/23/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/11/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RULE 11 EVALUATION
Filing Date
9/13/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2013
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2013
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO AMEND BOND AND
CUSTODY ORDERS
Filing Date
9/12/2013
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2013
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO DIRECT MARICOPA COUNTY
SHERIFF TO TRANSPORT
DEFENDANT THANDIKA
SINGELTON ON THE DATE OF THE
SCHEDULED APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
9/9/2013
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2013
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2013
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2013
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2013
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2013
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2013
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2013
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2013
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO MOTION TO DEPOSE; ALTERNATIVELY PRECLUDE AND ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM WITNESS LUIS VILLALOBOS
Filing Date
9/5/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2013
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2013
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2013
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL FOR A
MATERIAL WITNESS
Filing Date
9/4/2013
Description
REL - Reply - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Motion to Depose; Alternatively Preclude and Order for Production of Documents from Witness Luis Villalobos
Filing Date
9/4/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/24/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/24/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/24/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2013
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/3/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
8/29/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT THANDIKA
SINGLETON’S MOTION TO JOIN:
JOHN WEBBER’S MOTION TO
DISMISS COUNTS 2, 3, 4, 9, 11 AND
12 OF THE GRAND JURY
INDICTMENT
AND
DOARNELL JACKSON’S MOTION
TO DISMISS COUTNS2, 3, 4, 8, 9
AND 10 OF THE GRAND JURY
INDICTMENT
Filing Date
8/29/2013
Description
REQ - Request - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/3/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE IT'S RESPONSE TO ALL PENDING MOTIONS FROM DEFENDANT
Filing Date
8/29/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/24/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO OPEN,INSPECT AND REVIEW EVIDENCE
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ANTHONY WRIGHTS / TO JOIN JOHN WEBBERS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 2,3,4,9,11 AND 12 OF THE GRAND JURY INDICTMENT AND DOARNELL JACKSONS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 2,3,4,8,9 AND 10 OF THE GRAND JURY INDICTMENT
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISCLOSE CO-DEFENDANT'S FREE TALK INTERVIEW
Filing Date
8/27/2013
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DEPOSE; ALTERNATIVELY PRECLUDE AND ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM WITNESS LUIS VILLALOBOS (FILED UNDER SEAL)
Filing Date
8/27/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/24/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2013
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/27/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S, MOTION TO JOIN: JOHN WEBBER’S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 2, 3, 4, 9, 11, AND 12 OF THE GRAND JURY INDICTMENT AND DOARNELL JACKSON’S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 2, 3, 4, 8, 9 AND 10 OF THE GRAND JURY INDICTMENT
Filing Date
8/21/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/15/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
8/13/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/15/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/27/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2013
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Filing Date
8/1/2013
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S,
SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT
REQUEST/JOINT MOTION FOR
DISCOVERY
Filing Date
8/1/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S, JOINT MOTION TO OPEN, INSPECT AND REVIEW EVIDENCE
Filing Date
8/1/2013
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO DEPOSE; ALTERNATIVELY TO PRECLUDE AND ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM WITNESS LUIS VILLALOBOS
Filing Date
8/1/2013
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO FILE MOTION TO DEPOSE LUIS VILLALOBOS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/31/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/31/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/31/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2013
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/31/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIFF ARPAIO RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL JAIL RECORDS OF SEIZED LEGAL MATERIALS
Filing Date
7/30/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/1/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 2,3,4,9,11 &12 OF THE INDICTMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW
Filing Date
7/29/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/27/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2013
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 2/3/4/8/9/10 OF THE GRAND JURY INDICTMENT
Filing Date
7/25/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO VACATE AND RESET DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
7/24/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/24/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2013
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Reconsideration
Filing Date
7/23/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2013
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 2, 3, 4, 8, 9
AND 10 OF THE GRAND JURY IDICTMENT
Filing Date
7/23/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2013
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE TO RENEWED MOTION TO PHOTOGRAPH CELL
Filing Date
7/17/2013
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO VIEW EVIDENCE
AND BAR THE STATE FROM
OBSERVING
Filing Date
7/16/2013
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT GITTENS’
MOTION TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY RE JAIL SEARCH
Filing Date
7/16/2013
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF PROPOSED
EVIDENTIARY HEARING FOR
MOTION TO WAIVE THE JURY IN
THE PENALTY PHASE
Filing Date
7/11/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/11/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/11/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/11/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/11/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S, SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S,
MOTION TO RECONSIDER MOTION TO
SEVER DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S,
RULE 15.2 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE
OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 2, 3, 4
8, 9 AND 10 OF THE GRAND JURY
INDICTMENT
Filing Date
7/9/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRODUCE
DISCOVERY RE: JAIL SEARCH
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/21/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SIGNED JUNE 17, 2013
Filing Date
7/2/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANT
JACKSON’S MOTION TO STRIKE
AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND TO
DISMISS NOTICE OF INTENT TO
SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
7/1/2013
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING VICTIM STATUS
Filing Date
7/1/2013
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/8/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT BUREAU PROVIDE KIRSTEN VALENZUELA/MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, A COPY OF ALL IMPOUND ITEM HISTORY SHEETS, IMPOUND PROPERTY SIGNATURE RELEASE FORMS, AND ANNEX PROPERTY RETRIEVAL LOGS FOR
Filing Date
7/1/2013
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
7/1/2013
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SIGNED JUNE 17, 2013
Filing Date
6/26/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2013
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIFF ARPAIO’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S RENEWED MOTION TO PHOTOGRAPH CELL
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/24/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL MITITGATION DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/25/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL JAIL TO DISCLOSE RECORDS OF SEIZED LEGAL MATERIALS
Filing Date
6/20/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2013
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/21/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION
OF TIME TO FILE IT’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL
DISCOVERY
Filing Date
6/14/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion For Stay
Filing Date
6/14/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/14/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/14/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO VIEW EVIDENCE AND BAR
THE PROSECUTION FROM OBSERVING
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S,
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2013
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT HERMAN JOSEPH BE APPOINTED AS MITIGATION SPECIALIST
Filing Date
6/11/2013
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/14/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Renewed Motion to Allow the Defense to Photograph Mr. Gitten's Conditions of Confinement
Filing Date
6/10/2013
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR
MITIGATION DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/10/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/14/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENSE WITNESSES
Filing Date
6/6/2013
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/12/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
TO COMPEL DISCLOSER OF SEIZED EVIDENCE BY THE STATE
Filing Date
6/3/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE FOR SENTENCING PHASE OF TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
5/29/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2013
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/31/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO APPOINT HERMAN
JOSEPH AS MITIGATION
SPECIALIST
Filing Date
5/23/2013
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sheriff Arpaios Objection to Defendants Request to Interview Deputies
Filing Date
5/23/2013
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
INTERVIEW STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
5/23/2013
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
INTERVIEW STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
5/23/2013
Description
REP - Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
INTERVIEW STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2013
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
AND
REQUEST TO INTERVIEW
DEPUTIES
Filing Date
5/16/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
5/16/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
5/16/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to View Evidence and Bar the Prosecution from Observing
Filing Date
5/15/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2013
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ANTHONY WRIGHT'S/
Filing Date
5/14/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
5/13/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2013
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S,
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
5/6/2013
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2013
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2013
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
5/3/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
5/1/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2013
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR FINDINGS OF FACTS AND ORDERS re Furman MOTION, PURSUANT TO ARIZ. R. CRIM. P. 35.7
Filing Date
4/30/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND MOTION TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
Filing Date
4/29/2013
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2013
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINED DEFENDANT ABEL HIDALGO'S DEMAND TO BE PRESENT AT APRIL 19, 2013 "FURMAN" HEARING
Filing Date
4/25/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2013
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INTENT TO WAIVE DEFENDANT’S PRESENCE
Filing Date
4/22/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN MR. JACKSON’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING VICTIM STATUS
Filing Date
4/19/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING VICTIM STATUS
Filing Date
4/18/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE THAT DEFENDANT WAIVES HIS APPEARANCE
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE THAT DEFENDANT WAIVES HIS APPEARANCE
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE AT APRIL 19, 2013 ORAL ARGUMENT
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINED DEFENDANT RUDOLPH CANO'S WAIVER OF PRESENCE AT APRIL 19, 2013 "FURMAN" HEARING
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINED DEFENDANT ABEL
HIDALGO’S WAIVER OF
PRESENCE AT APRIL 19, 2013
“FURMAN” HEARING
Filing Date
4/11/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF ASSERTION OF RIGHT TO BE PRESENT AT EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
4/11/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANT RYAN FOOTE’S APPEARANCE AT APRIL 19, 2013 ORAL ARGUMENT
Filing Date
4/11/2013
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINED DEFENDANT JOSE ACUNA'S REQUEST TO BE PRESENT FOR "FURMAN" HEARING APRIL 19, 2013
Filing Date
4/11/2013
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINED DEFENDANT CRAIG DEVINES REQUEST TO BE PRESENT FOR "FURMAN" HEARING APRIL 19, 2013
Filing Date
4/10/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2013
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINED DEFENDANT DENNIS LEVIS WAIVER OF PRESENCE AT APRIL 19, 2013 "FURMAN" HEARING
Filing Date
4/10/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANT JESUS ARTURO MARTINEZ’ APPEARANCE AT APRIL 19, 2013 ORAL ARGUMENT
Filing Date
3/26/2013
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED MOTION TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
Filing Date
3/21/2013
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2013
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
Filing Date
3/12/2013
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO WAIVE JURY
IN THE PENALTY PHASE
Filing Date
3/8/2013
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2013
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/4/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2013
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/4/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2013
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2013
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2013
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2013
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/27/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Pleading on The Constitutionality of Arizonas Death Penalty Statute
Filing Date
2/19/2013
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2013
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2013
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON CONSITUTIONALITY OF
STATE’S CAPITAL SENTENCING SCHEME
Filing Date
2/19/2013
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON CONSITUTIONALITY OF
STATE’S CAPITAL SENTENCING SCHEME
Filing Date
2/19/2013
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO WAIVE
THE JURY IN THE PENALTY PHASE
Filing Date
2/14/2013
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2013
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/13/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION AND MEMORANDUM REGARDING JAIL VIOLATIONS THAT IMPACT DEFENDANTS DUE PROCESS RIGHTS
Filing Date
2/6/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/7/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCUSE DEFENDANT FROM WEARING RESTRAINTS AT TRIAL AND LIMIT COURT SECURITY AT TRIAL
Filing Date
2/6/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Waive The Jury In The Penalty Phase (Oral Argument And Evidentiary Hearing Requested)
Filing Date
2/5/2013
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/4/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/30/13
Filing Date
1/31/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/4/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/30/13
Filing Date
1/30/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2013
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S,
JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE
TRIAL
Filing Date
1/25/2013
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2013
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2013
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2013
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPREME COURT ORDER
Filing Date
1/22/2013
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPREME COURT ORDER
Filing Date
1/18/2013
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/22/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
Filing Date
1/15/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
1/15/2013
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
1/15/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
1/4/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 1-4-13
Filing Date
12/20/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2012
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2012
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2012
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2012
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2012
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Disclosure of Witnesses
Filing Date
12/11/2012
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/7/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEFENDANT JOHN WEBBER'S/ TO SEVER
Filing Date
12/7/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/13/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
12/7/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEFENDANT JOHN
WEBBER’S MOTION TO SEVER
Filing Date
12/3/2012
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/7/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2012
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2012
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Evidentiary Hearing for Motion to Dismiss the Death Penalty
Filing Date
11/26/2012
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Filing Disclosure For Motion To Dismiss The Death Penalty
Filing Date
11/26/2012
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply To State's Response To Supplementary Motion To Continue Disclosure Deadline
Filing Date
11/21/2012
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’s
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/21/2012
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2012
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2012
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/20/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO AMEND
Filing Date
11/15/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/20/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
11/15/2012
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DISCLOSURE OF EVIDENCE FOR DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS THE DEATH PENALTY FOR FURMAN AND EQUAL PROTECTION VIOLATIONS
Filing Date
11/14/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2012
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2012
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2012
Description
NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CAUSE
Filing Date
11/9/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/16/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SPECIFICITY OF STATE'S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/8/2012
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/7/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/7/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/8/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2012
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
For Disclosure Of Evidence For Defendant’s Motion To Dismiss The Death Penalty For Furman And Equal Protection Violations
Filing Date
10/29/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2012
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION (UNDER SEAL)TO NOT DISSEMINATE DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/29/2012
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
10/29/2012
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION (UNDER SEAL) TO NOT DISSEMINATE DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 10-23-12
Filing Date
10/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 10-23-12
Filing Date
10/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 10-23-12
Filing Date
10/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 10-23-12
Filing Date
10/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 10-23-12
Filing Date
10/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 10-23-12
Filing Date
10/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 10-23-12
Filing Date
10/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/24/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM / SERVED 10/23/12
Filing Date
10/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/24/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM / SERVED 10/23/12
Filing Date
10/23/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/24/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of name Change For Counsel
Filing Date
10/18/2012
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Document Under Seal
Filing Date
10/17/2012
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to State’s Response to Motion to Dismiss Death Penalty
Filing Date
10/15/2012
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/16/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S/ TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
10/8/2012
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/4/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL / OF DEFENSES
Filing Date
9/28/2012
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2012
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2012
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sheriff Arpaios Renewed Objection to Defendant Gittens Motion to Permit Jail Inspection and Photography of Jail Conditions
Filing Date
9/25/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion Specifying Photographs Requested
Filing Date
9/21/2012
Description
REL - Reply - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/28/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
TO STATES RESPONSE TO THIS DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
9/20/2012
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2012
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2012
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2012
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2012
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2012
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2012
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY to States Response to Mr Gittens Motion to Continue
Filing Date
9/13/2012
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY to States Response to Motion to Permit Photos of Jail Conditions
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/25/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sheriff Arpaios / to Defendant Gittens Motion to Permit Photography of Jail Conditions
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO SEVER
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO SEVER
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO SEVER
AND RESPONSE TO MOTION TO
CONTINUE
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO DEFENDANT’S
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH
DEADLINE REGARDING MOTION TO
SEVER
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO DEFENDANT’S
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH
DEADLINE REGARDING MOTION TO
SEVER
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES / TO CONTINUE CAPITAL CASE TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES / TO CONTINUE CAPITAL CASE TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
9/7/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPRESS CONFESSION
Filing Date
9/5/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2012
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2012
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
To Permit Photographs Of Mr. Gittens’ Cell, Cell Environment And Other Conditions Of Confinement Including Restraints And Manner In Which He Is Transported To Court
Filing Date
8/29/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/29/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/29/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/29/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/29/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS
Filing Date
8/29/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO DISMISS THE DEALTH PENALTY
Filing Date
8/29/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO DISMISS THE DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
8/28/2012
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND SEVER
Filing Date
8/28/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/28/2012
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Trial Date of December 12, 2012
Filing Date
8/28/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/28/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S, MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
8/28/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLIANCE WITH DEADLINE REGARDING MOTION TO SEVER
Filing Date
8/28/2012
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAPITAL CASE TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
8/28/2012
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (006)
Docket Date
8/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S/
Filing Date
8/28/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARNS/ TO SET TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
8/28/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
To Sever
Filing Date
8/27/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Service and Subpoena Duces Tecum
SERVED 8/09/12
Filing Date
8/27/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Service and Subpoena Duces Tecum
SERVED 08/09/12
Filing Date
8/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/23/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/22/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/22/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Service and Subpoena Duces Tecum
SERVED 08/09/12
Filing Date
8/21/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Service and Subpoena Duces Tecum
Filing Date
8/21/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-8-12
Filing Date
8/21/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/21/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/21/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/21/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 8-9-12
Filing Date
8/20/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/10/12
Filing Date
8/20/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Service and Subpoena Duces Tecum, SERVED 08/10/12
Filing Date
8/20/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED DUCES TECUM 8-10-12
Filing Date
8/17/2012
Description
MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Subpoena Duces Tecum, or in the alternative, Request for Clarification
Filing Date
8/17/2012
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Service and Subpoena Duces Tecum
Filing Date
8/17/2012
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2012
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2012
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
8/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S/ FOR CONTINUANCE TO REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
8/9/2012
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES / TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS THE DEATH PENALTY AND MOTION TO RELEASE
Filing Date
8/9/2012
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S, CASE STATUS
Filing Date
8/9/2012
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
8/9/2012
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS/
Filing Date
8/8/2012
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS
Filing Date
8/6/2012
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/6/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS JERRY COCKHEARN'S / DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
7/26/2012
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIFF ARPAIO’S / TO DEFENDANT GITTENS’ MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS THE DEATH PENALTY AND MOTION TO RELEASE
Filing Date
7/19/2012
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2012
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/18/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE CONSENTED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO DISMISS DEATH PENALTY AND MOTION TO RELEASE
Filing Date
7/16/2012
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/16/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (006)
Docket Date
8/7/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2012
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONSENTED / TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT GITTEN'S MOTION TO DISMIS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS THE DEATH PENALTY AND MOTION TO RELEASE
Filing Date
7/10/2012
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
7/10/2012
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FILING ID: 1353529
Filing Date
7/9/2012
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO EXTEND
TIME TO FILE RESPONSE
Filing Date
7/6/2012
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/6/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
7/3/2012
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Status Conference
Filing Date
6/29/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
The Death Penalty
Filing Date
6/27/2012
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
6/22/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OR,IN THE ALTERNATIVE,MOTION TO DISMISS THE DEATH PENALTY AND MOTION TO RELEASE
Filing Date
6/18/2012
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/2/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (006)
Docket Date
7/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/16/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CHANGE COUNSEL
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT FORM
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS /
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S,
CASE STATUS
Filing Date
6/13/2012
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS/
Filing Date
5/31/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/15/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/29/2012
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Withdraw
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/11/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/11/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/11/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2012
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S/ TO DISMISS NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY AND SET A REASONABLE BOND
Filing Date
5/10/2012
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S/ TO STRIKE AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES AND TO DISMISS NOTICE OF STATE'S INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY BASED UPON VIOLATION OF DUE PROCESS
Filing Date
5/9/2012
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2012
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2012
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2012
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2012
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2012
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2012
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2012
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2012
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/30/2012
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2012
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2012
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2012
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2012
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2012
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2012
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2012
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2012
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR FILING ITS RESPONSE
TO DEFENDANT JACKSON’S MOTION
TO STRIKE AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES AND TO DISMISS
NOTICE OF STATE’S INTENT TO
SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY BASED
UPON VIOLATION OF DUE PROCESS
Filing Date
4/30/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sheriff Arpaios / to Defendant Jacksons Motion to Dismiss States Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty and Set a Reasonable Bond
Filing Date
4/27/2012
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2012
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2012
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2012
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2012
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2012
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE
DEATH PENALTY AND SET A
REASONABLE BOND
Filing Date
4/23/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/18/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/18/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/18/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/18/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2012
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARNS/ TO STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO REMAND FOR FOURTH TIME
FOR NEW FINDING OF
PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
4/18/2012
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY
COCKHEARN’S,/ TO
STATES’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO DISMISS
INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE
OR
IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO
REMAND FOR FOURTH TIME
FOR NEW FINDING OF
PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
4/13/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES / OF COMMUNICATION IN REGARDS TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY (VII) UNDER RULE 15.1(e) RE: DNA TESTING
Filing Date
4/13/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES AND TO DISMISS NOTICE OF STATES INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY BASED UPON VIOLATION OF DUE PROCESS
Filing Date
4/10/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
4/4/2012
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISMISS INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO REMAND FOR FOURTH TIME FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
4/2/2012
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
to State’s Response to Mr Gittens Motion to Extend the Mitigation Deadline
Filing Date
3/30/2012
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Mr. Gittens Motion to Dismiss Counts Eight and Nine as Multiplicitous
Filing Date
3/26/2012
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY (VII)
UNDER RULE 15.1(e) RE:
DNA TESTING
Filing Date
3/23/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2012
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
To Reply To State’s Response To Multiplicity Motion
Filing Date
3/23/2012
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
To Reply To State’s Response To Request To Extend Mitigation Deadline
Filing Date
3/21/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 15 AS IT RELATES TO DOARNELL JACKSON
Filing Date
3/20/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2012
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
REQUEST TO DEFER SETTING
MITIGATION DISCLOSURE
DEADLINE
Filing Date
3/20/2012
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARNS/ TO STATES RESPONSE TO HIS JOINDER TO ELDRIDGE
GITTENS’ MOTION TO DISMISS
INDICTMENT AS
MULTIPLICITOUS
Filing Date
3/19/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT’S
REQUEST TO DEFER SETTING
MITIGATION DISCLOSURE DEADLINE
Filing Date
3/19/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT’S
REQUEST TO DEFER SETTING
MITIGATION DISCLOSURE DEADLINE
Filing Date
3/19/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT’S
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY (VII) UNDER
RULE 15.1(e) RE: DNA TESTING
Filing Date
3/7/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES / TO MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 8 AND 9 OF THE INDICTMENT AS A MULTIPLICITOUS
Filing Date
3/7/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES / TO MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 8 AND 9 OF THE INDICTMENT AS MULTIPLICITOUS
Filing Date
3/6/2012
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/6/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY (VII)
UNDER RULE 15.1(e) RE:
DNA TESTING
Filing Date
2/23/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/24/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
TO SEAL THIS MOTION AND MOTION TO SEVER
Filing Date
2/23/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/24/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
TO SEVER
Filing Date
2/23/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/24/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
TO SEAL THIS MOTION TO SEAL AND MOTION TO DISCLOSE CO-DEFENDANT'S FREE TALK INTERVIEW
Filing Date
2/23/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/24/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
TO DISCLOSE CO-DEFENDANT'S FREE TALK INTERVIEW
Filing Date
2/17/2012
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request To Defer Setting Mitigation Disclosure Deadline
Filing Date
2/15/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFER SETTING MITIGATION DISCLOSURE DEADLINE
Filing Date
2/14/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
2/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/15/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
Filing Date
2/9/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/3/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
Filing Date
1/27/2012
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2012
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2012
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2012
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2012
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2012
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2012
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2012
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/25/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY
COCKHEARN’S JOINDER TO
ELDRIDGE GITTENS’ MOTION
TO DISMISS INDICTMENT AS
MULTIPLICITOUS
Filing Date
1/18/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPREME COURT/ DECLINING JURISDICTION OF SPECIAL ACTION
Filing Date
1/17/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2012
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARNS, MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION
Filing Date
1/11/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Counts 8 and 9 of The Indictment as Multiplicitous
Filing Date
1/9/2012
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
For Filing Motion On Multiplicity/Duplicity And Extend Time To Reply To State’s Response To Discovery Order
Filing Date
1/9/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE’S
OBJECTIONS AND AGREEMENTS
TO PARTS OF DEFENDANT’S
ORDER AND NOTICE OF
COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
1/9/2012
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARNS/ TO FILE REPLY
Filing Date
1/9/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARNS/ INDICTMENT BASED UPON DUPLICITY OF CHARGES
Filing Date
1/9/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO REMAND FOR FOURTH TIME FOR NEW FIDNING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
1/9/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION
Filing Date
1/9/2012
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/18/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2012
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/18/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2012
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/18/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/2011
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/29/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT BASED UPON DUPLICITY AND MULTIPLICITY OF CHARGES
Filing Date
12/13/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 12.9 DEADLINE
Filing Date
12/1/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM/ SERVED 11/21/11
Filing Date
11/29/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY BASED UPON LACK OF PROBABLE CAUSE HEARING ON ENMUND TISON FINDINGS IN CAPITAL CASE
Filing Date
11/22/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO DISMISS
INDICTMENT BASED UPON DUPLICITY AND MULTIPLICTY OF CHARGES
Filing Date
11/21/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO DISMISS
NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH
PENALTY BASED UPOND LACK OF PROBABLE
CAUSE HEARING ON ENMUND TISON
FINDINGS IN CAPITAL CASE
Filing Date
11/15/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE STATE’S OBJECTIONS AND
AGREEMENTS TO PARTS OF
DEFENDANT’S ORDER AND
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE TO
PARTS OF ORDER
Filing Date
11/10/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/10/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS ON ITS OBJECTIONS TO ORDER
Filing Date
11/8/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS ON ITS OBJECTIONS TO ORDER
Filing Date
11/8/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS ON ITS OBJECTION TO ORDER
Filing Date
11/8/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS ON OBJECTIONS TO ORDER
Filing Date
11/7/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ FOR PRODUCTION OF EXCULPATORY EVIDENCE
Filing Date
11/7/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS
ON ITS OBJECTIONS TO ORDER
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND AGREEMENTS TO PARTS OF DEFENDANT'S "ORDER" AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE TO PARTS OF ORDER
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND AGREEMENTS TO PARTS OF DEFENDANT'S "ORDER" AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE TO PARTS OF ORDER
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF
INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH
PENALTY BASED UPON
LACK OF PROBABLE CAUSE
HEARING ON ENMUND/TISON
FINDINGS IN CAPITAL CASE
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
INDICTMENT
BASED UPON DUPLICITY AND
MULTIPLICITY OF CHARGES
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
LET - Letter - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED/DISMISSING THIS SPECIAL ACTION
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/27/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISMISSING SPECIAL ACTION
Filing Date
10/13/2011
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND RULE 12 9 DEADLINE
Filing Date
10/11/2011
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2011
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2011
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: CHANDLER POLICE DEPARTMENT RECORDS
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/4/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
FOR PRODUCTION OF EXCULPATORY EVIDENCE
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/4/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
TO SEAL
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/29/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE CHANDLER POLICE DEPARTMENT PROVIDE TO THE DEFENSE THE SHOOTING REVIEW BOARD FINDINGS, THE STANDARD OPERATING PROCEDURES FOR THE CHANDLER POLICE DEPARTMENT FOR UNDERCOVER DRUG OPERATION, INFORMATION ON ALL PREVIOUS ARRESTS AND BENEFITS GIVEN
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2011
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/23/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2011
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2011
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2011
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
9/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
9/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
9/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2011
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
served 9/15/2011
Filing Date
9/14/2011
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
REMANDED
Filing Date
9/14/2011
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2011
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2011
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/1/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSE INVESTIGATOR
Filing Date
8/30/2011
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COUNCEL
Filing Date
8/29/2011
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Trebus Letter
Filing Date
8/26/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPEAR AT GRAND JURY
Filing Date
8/24/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/23/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
TO CHANGE COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/22/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
8/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2011
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2011
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/29/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/31/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
9/14/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/22/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/08/11
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/08/11
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/10/11
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/08/11
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/10/11
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/08/11
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/08/11
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/08/11
Filing Date
8/16/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S, REQUEST FOR DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
8/16/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S, REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO REMAND FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
8/9/2011
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
8/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2011
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2011
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2011
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE INDIVIDUALS AND AGENCIES SHALL DISCLOSE AND RELEASE ANY AND ALL RECORDS DATING FROM JULY 28, 2010 THROUGH AUGUST 30, 2010
Filing Date
8/5/2011
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE INDIVIDUALS AND AGENCIES SHALL DISCLOSE AND RELEASE ANY AND ALL RECORDS DATING FROM 07/28/10 THROUGH 08/30/10
Filing Date
8/4/2011
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2011
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (008)
Docket Date
8/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SUPPLEMENTAL/ TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO RELEASE
Filing Date
7/26/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ FOR FILING RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
7/26/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO DISMISS THE DEATH PENALTY OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
7/26/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response To State’s Request For Additional Time To Respond To Motion To Remand, Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Dismiss The Death Penalty
Filing Date
7/18/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
7/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
7/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/14/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/14/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
7/14/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2011
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
7/12/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
For Disclosure Of Handwritten Notes By Detective Mejia
Filing Date
7/12/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
For Appointment Of An Investigator
Filing Date
7/11/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE REPLY AND CONTINUE HEARING
Filing Date
7/7/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
the Death Penalty or, in the Alternative, Motion to Remand
Filing Date
7/7/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/28/11
Filing Date
7/7/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/28/11
Filing Date
6/22/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/17/11
Filing Date
6/21/2011
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF REQUESTING JUDGE FOR OUT-OF-STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
6/14/2011
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2011
Description
MFH - Motion For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHRONIS
Filing Date
6/10/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/10/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
6/10/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/10/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/10/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2011
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2011
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2011
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2011
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
6/8/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/8/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
6/8/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF REQUESTING JUDGE
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT'S REMAND FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO EXCEED RULE 35.1 PAGE LIMIT RE STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR REMAND
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO REMAND FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 06/03/11
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 06/03/11
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 6-3-11
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 06/03/11
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 6-3-11
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM/SERVED 06/03/11
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR FILING RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO REMAND AND MOTION FOR DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR FILING RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO REMAND AND MOTION FOR DESSUREAULT HEARING AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARNS MOTION FOR RULING GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO EXCEED RULE 35.1 PAGE LIMIT RE STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
6/6/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time to File Motion to Remand
Filing Date
6/6/2011
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
05/23/11 BARBARA MANNING
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Additional Discovery
Filing Date
6/2/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)
Docket Date
6/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/27/11
Filing Date
5/27/2011
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2011
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/26/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF CERTIFICATE OF JUDGE REQUESTING ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESSES
Filing Date
5/25/2011
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2011
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2011
Description
LET - Letter - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/27/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2011
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF REQUESTING JUDGE FOR OUT OF STATE WITNESSES
Filing Date
5/23/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
5/23/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/17/11
Filing Date
5/20/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL / FOR OUT OF STATE SUBPOENA
Filing Date
5/19/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ISSUANCE OF CERTIFICATE FOR ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESSES
Filing Date
5/18/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2011
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/12/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/12/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2011
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TRANSCRIPTION OF SPANISH TAPES BY OFFICE OF COURT INTERPRETATION AND TRANSLATION SERVICES
Filing Date
5/10/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR FILING RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO REMAND AND MOTION FOR DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
5/9/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SUGGESTION FOR INITIAL TRIAL GROUPINGS
Filing Date
5/9/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SUGGESTION FOR INITIAL TRIAL GROUPINGS
Filing Date
5/9/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SUGGESTION FOR INITIAL TRIAL GROUPINGS
Filing Date
5/9/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SUGGESTION FOR INITIAL TRIAL GROUPINGS
Filing Date
5/9/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SUGGESTION FOR INITIAL TRIAL GROUPINGS
Filing Date
5/9/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (006)
Docket Date
5/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SUGGESTION FOR INITIAL TRIAL GROUPINGS
Filing Date
5/9/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
5/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SUGGESTION FOR INITIAL TRIAL GROUPINGS
Filing Date
5/9/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SUGGESTION FOR INITIAL TRIAL GROUPINGS
Filing Date
5/9/2011
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF REQUESTING JUDGE
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY UNDER RULE 15.1(B) RE: ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/02/11
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/02/11
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/02/11
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/02/11
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/02/11
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/02/11
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/03/11
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/03/11
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TRANSLATION AND TRANSCRIPTION OF SPANISH TAPES BY OFFICE OF THE COURT INTERPRETATION AND TRANSLATION SERVICES AND ORDER
Filing Date
5/3/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Advisement
Filing Date
5/2/2011
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2011
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (008)
Docket Date
5/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses
Filing Date
4/29/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2011
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/27/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2011
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2011
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (005)
Docket Date
5/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO DEFENDANT’S “REQUEST (I) FOR
DISCOVERY UNDER RULE 15.1(b)
REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL
INFORMANT” AND TO “III REQUEST
FOR DISCOVERY RE: IMMIGRATION
STATUS OF CONFIDENTIAL
INFORMANT
Filing Date
4/22/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
4/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2011
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (005)
Docket Date
4/19/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limitation
Filing Date
4/14/2011
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN/ FOR DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
4/13/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Jerry Cockhearns Motion to Remand for New Finding of Probable Cause
Filing Date
4/11/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Vacate Status Conference and Request for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand
Filing Date
4/8/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO REVIEW MARICOPA COUTNY 4TH AVENUE JAIL CLASSIFICATION
Filing Date
4/5/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to State’s Response to Mr. Gittens Motion for Discovery
Filing Date
3/31/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
4/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REVIEW MARICOPA COUNTY 4TH AVENUE JAIL CLASSIFICATION
Filing Date
3/28/2011
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2011
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2011
Description
960 ME: Capital Case Assignment and Scheduling Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2011
Description
960 ME: Capital Case Assignment and Scheduling Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
3/25/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
(II) FOR DISCOVERY UNDER RULE 15.1 (b) REGARDING MEDICAL RECORDS OF PARTICIPANTS
Filing Date
3/22/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
(III) FOR DISCOVERY RE: IMMIGRATION STATUS OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMANT
Filing Date
3/21/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2011
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (007)
Docket Date
3/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
3/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2011
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DEPOSITION
Filing Date
3/16/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DEPOSITION
Filing Date
3/16/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
3/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DEPOSITION
Filing Date
3/15/2011
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/16/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Discovery for Grand Jury Info
Filing Date
3/15/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/16/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time to File Challenge to Grand Jury Indictment
Filing Date
3/14/2011
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND FOR A NEW DETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
3/14/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE REMAND MOTION
Filing Date
3/10/2011
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM/SERVED 03/02/11
Filing Date
3/3/2011
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2011
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2011
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2011
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND
JURY IN ACCORDANCE WITH
RULE 12.9 OF THE ARIZONA
RULES OF CRIMINAL
PROCEDURE
Filing Date
2/24/2011
Description
ORD - Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
3/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT ANTHONY JEROME WRIGHT SUBMIT TO THE TAKING OF BUCCAL SWABS
Filing Date
2/23/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR FILING RESPONSE AND TO EXCEED RULE 35.1 PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
2/23/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REMAND
Filing Date
2/17/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF WITHDRAWAL OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Filing Date
2/17/2011
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MITIGATION
Filing Date
2/15/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM/SERVED 02/09/11
Filing Date
2/14/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR FILING RESPONSE
Filing Date
2/11/2011
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
NO OBJECTION TO STATES / FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
2/3/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (006)
Docket Date
2/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2011
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM/SERVED 01/28/11
Filing Date
2/2/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM/SERVED 01/31/11
Filing Date
2/1/2011
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $3,000,000
Filing Date
2/1/2011
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/1/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2011
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/1/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2011
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/1/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR NEBBIA HEARING TO DETERMINE THE SOURCE OF BOND MONIES
Filing Date
1/28/2011
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2011
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Discovery/Motion in Limine
Filing Date
1/19/2011
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2011
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2011
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2011
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2011
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/19/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/19/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
TO CHANGE COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/18/2011
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
1/18/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO WAIVE DEFENDANTS PRESENCE FOR ALL COURT APPEARANCES
Filing Date
1/18/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
1/14/11 – Motion to Extend Time for Filing Challenge to Grand Jury Proceedings
Filing Date
1/14/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 12.9 OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
1/14/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
1/14/2011
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT JERRY COCKHEARN’S,
SECOND MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE CHALLENGE TO GRAND
JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
1/13/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST (I) FOR DISCOVERY
UNDER RULE 15.1(b) REGARDING
CONFIDENTIAL INFORMANT
Filing Date
1/12/2011
Description
NID - Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND NOTICE OF AGGRAVATING FACTORDS AND WITNESSES
Filing Date
1/11/2011
Description
NID - Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND WITNESSES
Filing Date
1/10/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL THROUGH OPDS
Filing Date
1/7/2011
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2011
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2011
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2011
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2011
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2011
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2011
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2011
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
GJ time Ext
Filing Date
1/4/2011
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2011
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2011
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2011
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Knapp Association
Filing Date
1/4/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time to File Grand Jury Remand
Filing Date
1/4/2011
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/30/2010
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/30/2010
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/30/2010
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2010
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/30/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2010
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/30/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2010
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/30/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2010
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/30/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2010
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2010
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/22/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
GJ Time Ext
Filing Date
12/22/2010
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2010
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2010
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2010
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/29/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2010
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR FILING MOTION TO REMAND FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
12/21/2010
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/21/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/21/2010
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/21/2010
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/21/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/21/2010
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/21/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/21/2010
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/21/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/21/2010
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/21/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/21/2010
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/21/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/21/2010
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/21/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/21/2010
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/21/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RELEASE
Filing Date
12/17/2010
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/17/2010
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/17/2010
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/10/2010
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/10/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE CHALLENGE TO GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
12/10/2010
Description
MRD - Motion to Release Defendant on Own Recognizance, Reduce Bond and/or Release to a Third Party - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/13/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2010
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9 OF ARCP
Filing Date
12/8/2010
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/8/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2010
Description
REQ - Request - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/8/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Automatic Disclosure
Filing Date
12/8/2010
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/8/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/8/2010
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/8/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time to File
Filing Date
12/7/2010
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/8/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASH BOND $3,000,000
Filing Date
12/7/2010
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/8/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASH BOND $3,000,000
Filing Date
12/7/2010
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/7/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2010
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/7/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2010
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/7/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2010
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/7/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2010
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/7/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2010
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/6/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2010
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/6/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2010
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/6/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2010
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/6/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2010
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2010
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/6/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2010
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/6/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2010
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2010
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/3/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
RAD
Filing Date
12/3/2010
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/3/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2010
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/2/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2010
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/2/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2010
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2010
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/2/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/2/2010
Description
REQ - Request - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/2/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
12/2/2010
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/2/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE CHALLENGE TO GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
12/2/2010
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/2/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
12/1/2010
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/1/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2010
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/1/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ORIGINAL ARRAIGNMENT HEARING
Filing Date
11/30/2010
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/1/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Remove Grand Jury Transcript
Filing Date
11/26/2010
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/26/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/22/10
Filing Date
11/23/2010
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/22/2010
Filing Date
11/23/2010
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/22/2010
Filing Date
11/23/2010
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/22/2010
Filing Date
11/23/2010
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/22/2010
Filing Date
11/23/2010
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/22/2010
Filing Date
11/23/2010
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/22/2010
Filing Date
11/23/2010
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/22/2010
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/26/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/26/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/29/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
11/30/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/1/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/1/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/1/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/1/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/1/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/1/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/2/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/13/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/14/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/18/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/18/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/18/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/18/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/18/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/20/2011
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/26/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/26/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/28/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/28/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/28/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/28/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/28/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/28/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/28/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
2/1/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/1/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/9/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/25/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/25/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/28/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/15/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/15/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/16/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/16/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/16/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/18/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/22/2011
Time
15:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/22/2011
Time
15:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/23/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/12/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/12/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/12/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/15/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/19/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/20/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/20/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/26/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/26/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/26/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/27/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/28/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/10/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/10/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/11/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/11/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/12/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/12/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/12/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/23/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/24/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/7/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/7/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/7/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/7/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/8/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/8/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/8/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/8/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/12/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/12/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/12/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/12/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/14/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/14/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/14/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/14/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/15/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/15/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/15/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/2/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/5/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/19/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/19/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/19/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/19/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/30/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/1/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/16/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/16/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/16/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/16/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/16/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/16/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/16/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/20/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/22/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/28/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
11/2/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/2/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/2/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/2/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/2/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/2/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/2/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/2/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
11/3/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/13/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/13/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/13/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/13/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/13/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/13/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/13/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/14/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/7/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/10/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/10/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/10/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/10/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/10/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/10/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/10/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/16/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/16/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/16/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/16/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/16/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/16/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/16/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/24/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/24/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/25/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/25/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/25/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/25/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/25/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/25/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/27/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/27/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/27/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/27/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/27/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/27/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/27/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/27/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/11/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/11/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/11/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/11/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/11/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/11/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/11/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/11/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/25/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/25/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/15/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/15/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/15/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/15/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/15/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/15/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/15/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/15/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/27/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/12/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/13/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
7/17/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/17/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/10/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/10/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/10/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/10/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/10/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/10/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/10/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/10/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/15/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/15/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/15/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/24/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Dessureault Hearing
Date
8/31/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/7/2012
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/14/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/14/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/14/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/14/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/14/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/26/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/27/2012
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/28/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/28/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/19/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/9/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/9/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/19/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/19/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/30/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/30/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/7/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/7/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/10/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/12/2012
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/12/2012
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/14/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/14/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/14/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/14/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/14/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/20/2012
Time
15:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/10/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/18/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/18/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/18/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/18/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/25/2013
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/25/2013
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/28/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/28/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/28/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/28/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/4/2013
Time
8:29
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/8/2013
Time
14:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/8/2013
Time
14:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/13/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/13/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/13/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/14/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/26/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/26/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/26/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/26/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/26/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/26/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/27/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/27/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/27/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/27/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/4/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/4/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/4/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/4/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/4/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/4/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/18/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/11/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/11/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/11/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/12/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/12/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/16/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/16/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/19/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/19/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/30/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/30/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/3/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/3/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/6/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/6/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/14/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/14/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/14/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/28/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/28/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/28/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/28/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/28/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/4/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/10/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/10/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/13/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/13/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/13/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/13/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/13/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/14/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/14/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/1/2013
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/1/2013
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/2/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/2/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/3/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/3/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/3/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/12/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/12/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/12/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/19/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/19/2013
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/19/2013
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/30/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/30/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/2/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/2/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/2/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/9/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Dessureault Hearing
Date
8/13/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/13/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/13/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/15/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/20/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/20/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/20/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/21/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/28/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/28/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/28/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/29/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/29/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/30/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/30/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/5/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/5/2013
Time
15:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/10/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/16/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/16/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/16/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/16/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/16/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/2/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/2/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/3/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/3/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/3/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/3/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/3/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/3/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/3/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/8/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/8/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/15/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/15/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/17/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/17/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/17/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/17/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/17/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/17/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/17/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/17/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/17/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/21/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/21/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/21/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/21/2013
Time
11:10
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
10/21/2013
Time
11:35
Event
Sentencing
Date
10/28/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/1/2013
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/12/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/12/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/12/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/12/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/12/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/12/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/12/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/22/2013
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/22/2013
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/6/2013
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/6/2013
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/6/2013
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/6/2013
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/6/2013
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/6/2013
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/18/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/18/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/18/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/6/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/6/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/7/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/7/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/8/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/13/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/13/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/13/2014
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/13/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/21/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/21/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/21/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/24/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/24/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/24/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/24/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/24/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/29/2014
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/29/2014
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/3/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/3/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/3/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/3/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/3/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/3/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/3/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/3/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/5/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/5/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/6/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/6/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/6/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/6/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/6/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/12/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/14/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/14/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/6/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/6/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/6/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/6/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/6/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/6/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/14/2014
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/20/2014
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/24/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/24/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/24/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/24/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/16/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/16/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/16/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/16/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/16/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/16/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/5/2014
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/5/2014
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/12/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/12/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/14/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/20/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/20/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/20/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/20/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/20/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/20/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/20/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/20/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/23/2014
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/4/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/10/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/18/2014
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/18/2014
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/18/2014
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/18/2014
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/18/2014
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/18/2014
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/25/2014
Time
15:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/25/2014
Time
15:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/31/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/31/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/11/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/25/2014
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/25/2014
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/12/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/12/2014
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/3/2014
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/31/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/31/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
11/6/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/6/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/6/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/6/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/6/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/6/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/12/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/5/2014
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/5/2014
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/5/2014
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/5/2014
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/5/2014
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/5/2014
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/16/2014
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/23/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/30/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/30/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/30/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/30/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/30/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/30/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/6/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/11/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/23/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/23/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/23/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/23/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/23/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/23/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/2/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/2/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/2/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/2/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/2/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/2/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/10/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/10/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/10/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/10/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/10/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/10/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/14/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/24/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/1/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/1/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/1/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/1/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/1/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/1/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/1/2015
Time
15:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/1/2015
Time
15:45
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/8/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/11/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/11/2015
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/15/2015
Time
13:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/15/2015
Time
13:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/15/2015
Time
13:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/15/2015
Time
13:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/15/2015
Time
13:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/15/2015
Time
13:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/2/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/2/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/2/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/2/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/2/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/2/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/5/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/11/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/24/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/24/2015
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/17/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/31/2015
Time
9:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/31/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/31/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/31/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/31/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/31/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/31/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/11/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/11/2015
Time
14:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/11/2015
Time
14:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/11/2015
Time
14:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/11/2015
Time
14:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/11/2015
Time
14:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/11/2015
Time
14:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/18/2015
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/25/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/25/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/25/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/25/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/25/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/25/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/6/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/6/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/6/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/6/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/6/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/6/2015
Time
8:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/30/2015
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/6/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/13/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/13/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/13/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/13/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/13/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/13/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/11/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/8/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/8/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/8/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/8/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/8/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/8/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/8/2016
Time
11:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/8/2016
Time
11:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/12/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/12/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/12/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/12/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/12/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/12/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/22/2016
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/22/2016
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/22/2016
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/22/2016
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/22/2016
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/22/2016
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/5/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/2/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/2/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/2/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/2/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/2/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/4/2016
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/4/2016
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/4/2016
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/4/2016
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/4/2016
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/4/2016
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/16/2016
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/16/2016
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/16/2016
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/16/2016
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/16/2016
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/1/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/4/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
4/14/2016
Time
8:45
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/15/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/15/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/15/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/15/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/15/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/15/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/18/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
6/3/2016
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/3/2016
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/3/2016
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/3/2016
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/3/2016
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/3/2016
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/7/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/10/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/17/2016
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/17/2016
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/17/2016
Time
16:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/17/2016
Time
16:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/17/2016
Time
16:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/20/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/5/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/15/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
7/18/2016
Time
15:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
7/20/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/20/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/21/2016
Time
9:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/29/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/29/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/29/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/29/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/29/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/29/2016
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/16/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/19/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/19/2016
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/22/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/22/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/22/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/25/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/26/2016
Time
14:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/16/2016
Time
15:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/16/2016
Time
15:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/16/2016
Time
15:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/16/2016
Time
15:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/21/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
9/23/2016
Time
16:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/7/2016
Time
14:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/14/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/14/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/14/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/14/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/14/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/20/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/21/2016
Time
9:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
10/28/2016
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
10/31/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/4/2016
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/4/2016
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/4/2016
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
11/8/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
11/29/2016
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/29/2016
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/9/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/9/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/9/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/9/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/9/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/9/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/19/2016
Time
10:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/6/2017
Time
7:59
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/6/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/6/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/13/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/22/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/10/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/10/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/10/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/10/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/10/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/10/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/10/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/3/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/3/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/3/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/3/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/13/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/20/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/20/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/20/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/20/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/31/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/31/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/31/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/31/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/12/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
4/28/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/5/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/19/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/19/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/19/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/19/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/22/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Informal Conf Re: Petition For Pcr
Date
5/26/2017
Time
15:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/31/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/31/2017
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/9/2017
Time
15:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/9/2017
Time
15:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/9/2017
Time
15:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/9/2017
Time
15:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/16/2017
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/29/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/29/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/29/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/29/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/5/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/7/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/7/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/7/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/7/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/7/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/11/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/11/2017
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/19/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/21/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/21/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/21/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/21/2017
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/21/2017
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/21/2017
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/21/2017
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/24/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/25/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/26/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/27/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/31/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/31/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/31/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/31/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/31/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/31/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/31/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/31/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/18/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/24/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/25/2017
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/25/2017
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/25/2017
Time
15:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/29/2017
Time
8:29
Event
Sentencing
Date
9/20/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/2/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/4/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/4/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/4/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/27/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/27/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/27/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/27/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/27/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/27/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/15/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/15/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/15/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/21/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/21/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/8/2018
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/8/2018
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/10/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/10/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/10/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/16/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/16/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/16/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/16/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/16/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/16/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/18/2018
Time
14:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/18/2018
Time
14:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/18/2018
Time
14:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/18/2018
Time
14:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/19/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/19/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/19/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/22/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/22/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/22/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/27/2018
Time
8:29
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/9/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/9/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/9/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/21/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/21/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/21/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/3/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/3/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/3/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/6/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/6/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/6/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/11/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/11/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/11/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/11/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/16/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/16/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/16/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/20/2018
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/20/2018
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/20/2018
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/24/2018
Time
8:29
Event
Sentencing
Date
4/30/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/23/2018
Time
11:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/23/2018
Time
11:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/23/2018
Time
11:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/4/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/4/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/4/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/4/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/8/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/8/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/8/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/11/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/14/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/14/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/14/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/18/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/18/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/18/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/25/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/9/2018
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/9/2018
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/9/2018
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/10/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/11/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/13/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/13/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/13/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/24/2018
Time
8:29
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/30/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/30/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/30/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/13/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/13/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/13/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/13/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/13/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/20/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/21/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/21/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/18/2018
Time
8:29
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/25/2018
Time
13:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/25/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/25/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/25/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/1/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/24/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/24/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/24/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/5/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/5/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/5/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/5/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/5/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/5/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/5/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/15/2018
Time
8:29
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/29/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/3/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/3/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/3/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/3/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/3/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/3/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/18/2018
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/7/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/29/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/1/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/4/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/5/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/6/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/7/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/7/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/7/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/7/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/11/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/12/2019
Time
8:29
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/12/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/13/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/14/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/19/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/20/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/21/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/4/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/5/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/6/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/7/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/11/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/12/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/18/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/19/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/20/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/21/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/22/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/22/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/22/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/25/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/26/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/27/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/28/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/1/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/2/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/3/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/4/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/5/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/5/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/5/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/8/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/9/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/10/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/11/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/12/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/15/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/16/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/17/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/18/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/22/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/22/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/23/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/24/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/29/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/3/2019
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/3/2019
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/3/2019
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/5/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/5/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/5/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/26/2019
Time
14:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
7/1/2019
Time
8:29
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/8/2019
Time
8:29
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/19/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/19/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/19/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/14/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/29/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/30/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/30/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/30/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/24/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/2/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/18/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/8/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/8/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/8/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/12/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/12/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/12/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/13/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/15/2020
Time
8:29
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/20/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/2/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/2/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/4/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/5/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/17/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/18/2020
Time
8:29
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/6/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/7/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/8/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/9/2020
Time
9:20
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/9/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/13/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/14/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/15/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/16/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/20/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/21/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/22/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/23/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/27/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/28/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/29/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/30/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/7/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/11/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/12/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/13/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/18/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/19/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/20/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/27/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/28/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/9/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/10/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/11/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/15/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/16/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/17/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/18/2020
Time
8:29
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/18/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/22/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/23/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/8/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/8/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/9/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/13/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/6/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/10/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/3/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/10/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/21/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/23/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/23/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/24/2020
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/24/2020
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/24/2020
Time
14:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/28/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/28/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/28/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/30/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/30/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/12/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/19/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/19/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/6/2020
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/9/2020
Time
14:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/10/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/7/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/7/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/14/2020
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/25/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/25/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/5/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
2/22/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/22/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/5/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
3/15/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/15/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/15/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/30/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/30/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/13/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
4/15/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
4/23/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
5/14/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/14/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/14/2021
Time
13:31
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/14/2021
Time
13:31
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/17/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
5/28/2021
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/18/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/23/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/23/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/17/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/17/2021
Time
13:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/22/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/22/2021
Time
13:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/19/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/19/2021
Time
13:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/24/2021
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/24/2021
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/15/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
12/15/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
12/17/2021
Time
9:2
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/17/2021
Time
9:3
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/7/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
1/7/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/7/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
1/7/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/10/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/10/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/14/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/14/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/20/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/20/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/28/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
1/28/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
1/31/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/31/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/1/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/1/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/2/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/2/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/2/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/2/2022
Time
10:31
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/3/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/3/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/7/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/7/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/7/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/10/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/10/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/11/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/11/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/14/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/14/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/14/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/15/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/15/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/22/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/22/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/23/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/23/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/24/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/24/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/28/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/28/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/1/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/1/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/2/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/2/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/14/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/14/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/17/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/17/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/21/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/21/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/22/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/22/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/23/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/23/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/24/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/24/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/28/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/28/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/29/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/29/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/30/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/30/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/31/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/4/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/4/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/5/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/5/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/6/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/6/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/11/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/11/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/12/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/12/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/20/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/20/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/25/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/25/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/26/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/26/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/27/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/27/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/28/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/28/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/2/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/2/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/3/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/3/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/4/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/4/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/5/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/5/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/9/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/9/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/10/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/10/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/11/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/11/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/12/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/12/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/16/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/16/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/17/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/17/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/18/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/18/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/19/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/19/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/23/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/23/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/23/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/23/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/23/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/24/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/24/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/25/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/25/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/26/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/26/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/31/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/31/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/6/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
6/6/2022
Time
8:40
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/7/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/7/2022
Time
9:16
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/12/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/12/2022
Time
13:31
Event
Sentencing
Date
2/2/2024
Time
11:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
4/19/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing