Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Maricopa      
Shawn Michael Chock - (2)
 
Defendant  M   LEGAL DEFENDER'S OFFICE,   Phillips  CR2010-006817-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Shawn Michael Chock  28-1383 (F4)  AGGRAVATED DUI  11/10/2009  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  7/20/2010 
Shawn Michael Chock  28-1383A1 (F4)  AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI  11/10/2009  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/17/2010 
Shawn Michael Chock  28-1383A2 (F4)  AGGRAVATED DUI-THIRD DUI  11/10/2009  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/17/2010 
Shawn Michael Chock  28-1383A2 (F4)  AGGRAVATED DUI-THIRD DUI  11/10/2009  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/17/2010 
Shawn Michael Chock  13-1204 (F6)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  11/10/2009  Pled No Contest  Pled No Contest  7/20/2010 
Shawn Michael Chock  13-1805 (M1)  SHOPLIFTING  11/10/2009  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  7/20/2010 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/16/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/16/2013   
10/1/2013  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  10/2/2013  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION FOR FINAL DISPOSTIION OF ANY UNTRIED "INDICTMENT", "INFORMATION", OR "COMPLAINTS", WHICH MAY BE PENDING WITHIN THE STATE OF ARIZONA 
10/1/2013  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  10/2/2013  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: REQUEST FOR REPRESENTATION BEFORE THE GRAND JURY ATTACHMENT SEE: "MOTION FOR FINAL DISPOSITION" 
5/24/2013  DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)  5/29/2013   
5/20/2013  911 - ME: Dispo-Revoke Prison;Revoke Jail - Party (001)  5/20/2013   
5/20/2013  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  5/20/2013   
5/20/2013  112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)  5/20/2013   
5/15/2013  PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)  5/16/2013   
5/15/2013  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  5/31/2013   
5/15/2013  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  5/23/2013   
5/14/2013  PVW - Probation Violation Bench Warrant - Party (001)  5/20/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 5/8/13 
5/9/2013  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  5/10/2013   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
5/9/2013  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  5/10/2013   
NOTE: IA Packet 
3/4/2013  PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001)  3/22/2013   
NOTE: COUNT 6/WARRANT ISSUED/BOND $5400 
3/4/2013  PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001)  3/22/2013   
NOTE: COUNT 1/WARRANT ISSUED/BOND $5400 
3/4/2013  PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001)  3/22/2013   
NOTE: COUNT 5/WARRRANT ISSUED/BOND $5400 
1/24/2013  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)  1/28/2013   
1/24/2013  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)  2/13/2013   
1/7/2013  DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)  1/9/2013   
12/28/2012  114 - ME: Dispo-Reinstate - Party (001)  12/28/2012   
12/24/2012  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  1/2/2013   
12/24/2012  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  1/2/2013   
NOTE:  
12/24/2012  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  1/2/2013   
12/24/2012  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  12/28/2012   
12/24/2012  PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)  12/31/2012   
12/18/2012  113 - ME: Violation Hearing - Party (001)  12/18/2012   
12/5/2012  004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)  12/5/2012   
11/14/2012  112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)  11/14/2012   
11/13/2012  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  11/19/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 6 
11/13/2012  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  11/19/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 5 
11/13/2012  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  11/19/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
11/13/2012  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)  11/20/2012   
NOTE: $2500 
11/6/2012  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  11/6/2012   
NOTE: IA Packet 
11/6/2012  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  11/6/2012   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
8/30/2012  PVS - Probation Violation Summons - Party (001)  9/5/2012   
8/16/2012  580 - ME: Dispo Reinst-Rev Arr/Hrg - Party (001)  8/16/2012   
8/14/2012  PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)  8/24/2012   
8/14/2012  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  8/20/2012   
8/14/2012  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  8/21/2012   
8/14/2012  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  8/21/2012   
8/14/2012  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  8/21/2012   
7/23/2012  PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001)  8/1/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 1/SUMMONS ISSUED 
7/9/2012  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)  7/13/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 6 
7/9/2012  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)  7/13/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 5 
7/9/2012  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)  7/13/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
11/2/2010  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)  11/8/2010   
9/1/2010  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  9/2/2010   
9/1/2010  ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)  9/2/2010   
8/24/2010  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  8/24/2010   
8/19/2010  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  8/19/2010   
8/17/2010  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  8/25/2010   
8/17/2010  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  8/25/2010   
8/17/2010  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  8/19/2010   
8/17/2010  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  8/21/2010   
8/5/2010  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  8/5/2010   
8/3/2010  ARC - Adult Probation Request for Continuation - Party (001)  8/9/2010   
7/22/2010  102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)  7/22/2010   
7/21/2010  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  7/21/2010   
7/20/2010  WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)  7/22/2010   
7/20/2010  ORD - Order - Party (001)  7/28/2010   
NOTE: THAT THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED FRO THE OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER TO THE OFFICE OF THE LEGAL DEFENDER 
7/20/2010  INF - Information - Party (001)  7/28/2010   
7/14/2010  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)  7/14/2010   
7/13/2010  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  7/15/2010   
NOTE: SERVED 07/02/10 
7/13/2010  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  7/13/2010   
7/9/2010  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  7/9/2010   
7/8/2010  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)  7/13/2010   
6/17/2010  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)  6/18/2010   
6/2/2010  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  6/2/2010   
5/25/2010  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)  5/26/2010   
4/26/2010  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  4/26/2010   
4/26/2010  SUM - Summons - Party (001)  4/27/2010   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
5/26/2010  13:30   Initial Appearance 
7/8/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
7/12/2010  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
7/20/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
7/20/2010  8:31   Original Arraignment Hearing 
7/23/2010  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
8/3/2010  8:30   Acceptance Of Plea/Snt 
8/17/2010  8:30   Acceptance Of Plea/Snt 
8/14/2012  8:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
8/14/2012  8:31   Disposition Hearing 
11/5/2012  17:00   Initial Appearance 
11/13/2012  10:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
12/3/2012  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
12/17/2012  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
12/24/2012  8:30   Disposition Hearing 
12/24/2012  13:30   Witness Violation Hearing 
5/9/2013  8:00   Initial Appearance 
5/15/2013  10:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
5/15/2013  10:35   Disposition Hearing