« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, Maricopa
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Robert Lee GuentherSr. - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Rodriguez, Diego
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2009-117906-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2009-117906-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Robert Lee Guenther Sr. 
Crime Date
1/12/2009
Date
12/10/2009
Description
AGGRAVATED HARASSMENT
ARSCode
13-2921.01 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Robert Lee Guenther Sr. 
Crime Date
1/7/2009
Date
10/27/2009
Description
HARASSMENT
ARSCode
13-2921 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2012
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2012
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2012
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
12/17/2009
Description
110 - ME: Suspension Of Sentence - Unsupervised Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2009
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2009
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2009
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2009
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2009
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2009
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2009
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/18/2009
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2009
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2009
Description
WPH - Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2009
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/22/2009
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2009
Description
179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2009
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2009
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2009
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2009
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2009
Description
SUM - Summons - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/14/2009
Time
8:29
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/12/2009
Time
8:29
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
6/15/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/15/2009
Time
8:31
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/23/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/27/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/24/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/27/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/10/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt