Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | County Attorney, Maricopa | ||
Jerald Allen Payne - (2) |
Defendant | M | Defender, Public | Master Calendar | CR2009-007211-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Jerald Allen Payne | 13-3405 (F3) | MARIJUANA VIOLATION | 6/14/2009 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 2/12/2010 |
Jerald Allen Payne | 13-3405 (F3) | MARIJUANA VIOLATION | 6/18/2009 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 2/12/2010 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
2/19/2010 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 2/23/2010 | |
2/16/2010 | 193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001) | 2/16/2010 | |
2/12/2010 | SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001) | 2/22/2010 | |
2/12/2010 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 2/24/2010 | |
2/12/2010 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 2/18/2010 | |
2/12/2010 | PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001) | 2/18/2010 | |
2/9/2010 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001) | 2/9/2010 | |
1/6/2010 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 1/6/2010 | |
1/6/2010 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 1/6/2010 | |
1/5/2010 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 1/6/2010 | |
12/30/2009 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 1/8/2010 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE / | |||
12/8/2009 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 12/8/2009 | |
11/27/2009 | 123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001) | 11/27/2009 | |
11/12/2009 | AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001) | 11/12/2009 | |
NOTE: | |||
10/22/2009 | 122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001) | 10/22/2009 | |
10/13/2009 | 120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001) | 10/13/2009 | |
10/7/2009 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 10/7/2009 | |
10/6/2009 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 10/6/2009 | |
NOTE: FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES/TRANSCRIPTS/EXHIBITS | |||
10/6/2009 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 10/6/2009 | |
10/6/2009 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 10/6/2009 | |
10/5/2009 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 10/5/2009 | |
NOTE: for Rule 11 evaluation | |||
9/24/2009 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 9/24/2009 | |
9/22/2009 | AOP - Allegation of Prior Dangerous and /or More Than Two or More Prior Convictions - Party (001) | 9/22/2009 | |
NOTE: | |||
9/22/2009 | AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001) | 9/22/2009 | |
NOTE: | |||
9/22/2009 | RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001) | 9/22/2009 | |
NOTE: RULE 609 | |||
9/22/2009 | ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001) | 9/22/2009 | |
NOTE: | |||
9/22/2009 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001) | 9/22/2009 | |
NOTE: | |||
9/22/2009 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 9/22/2009 | |
NOTE: | |||
9/14/2009 | MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001) | 9/14/2009 | |
NOTE: | |||
9/14/2009 | RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001) | 9/14/2009 | |
NOTE: | |||
9/14/2009 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 9/14/2009 | |
NOTE: rule 15.2 / of defenses and disclosure | |||
8/27/2009 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 8/27/2009 | |
8/26/2009 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 8/26/2009 | |
8/17/2009 | WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001) | 8/17/2009 | |
NOTE: SERVED 8/14/09 | |||
8/13/2009 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 8/17/2009 | |
8/13/2009 | 604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001) | 8/17/2009 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
8/24/2009 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
10/6/2009 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
11/24/2009 | 13:30 | Rule 11 Hearing |
12/1/2009 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/30/2009 | 8:16 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/5/2010 | 9:15 | Settlement Conference |
2/4/2010 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/4/2010 | 8:45 | Sentencing |
2/10/2010 | 8:00 | Trial |
2/12/2010 | 9:00 | Sentencing |