« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Southeast  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Martin, Lisa      
Ernesto Flores-Ayala - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Kanu, Solomon   Duncan  CR2008-136210-007  
Erika Fabiola Ibarra-Cerda - (3)
 
Defendant  F   Alcock, Nicholas   Duncan  CR2008-136210-005  
Eduardo Franco-Robles - (4)
 
Defendant  M   Swierski, Jeffrey   Duncan  CR2008-136210-003  
Monica Ibanez-Aranda - (5)
 
Defendant  F   To Be Determined   Duncan  CR2008-136210-004  
Maria Del Pilar-Baez - (6)
 
Defendant  F   Allen, Glenn   Duncan  CR2008-136210-002  
Imelda Villegas Castro - (7)
 
Defendant  F   Defender, Public   Duncan  CR2008-136210-001  
Victor Manuel Galaviz - (8)
 
Defendant  M   De Costa, David   Duncan  CR2008-136210-006  
Eloiza Bojorquez Ayala - (9)
 
Defendant  F   Wallin, D   Duncan  CR2008-136210-009  
German Ruben Vidaurrazaga-Sotelo - (10)
 
Defendant  M   De Costa, David   Duncan  CR2008-136210-008  
Mirna Lorena Alonso-Borrayo - (11)
 
Defendant  F   GARCIA, JOANN   Duncan  CR2008-136210-010  
Clerk Of The Court - (12)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Guadalupe Garcia-De Rayos - (13)
 
Defendant  F   Ybarra, Ray   Master Calendar  CR2008-136210-012  
Maria Del Carmen Pina-Guerrero - (14)
 
Defendant  F   Skupin, R   Z Unassigned  CR2008-136210-011  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Ernesto Flores-Ayala  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/10/1999  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Ernesto Flores-Ayala  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/10/1999  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Erika Fabiola Ibarra-Cerda  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  3/12/2008  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Erika Fabiola Ibarra-Cerda  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  3/12/2008  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Eduardo Franco-Robles  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/19/2004  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Eduardo Franco-Robles  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/19/2004  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Monica Ibanez-Aranda  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/10/1999  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Monica Ibanez-Aranda  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/10/1999  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Maria Del Pilar-Baez  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/21/2008  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Maria Del Pilar-Baez  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/21/2008  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Imelda Villegas Castro  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/28/2004  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Imelda Villegas Castro  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/28/2004  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Victor Manuel Galaviz  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/10/1999  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Victor Manuel Galaviz  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/10/1999  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Eloiza Bojorquez Ayala  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  3/10/2008  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Eloiza Bojorquez Ayala  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  3/10/2008  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
German Ruben Vidaurrazaga-Sotelo  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/19/2004  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
German Ruben Vidaurrazaga-Sotelo  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/19/2004  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  6/23/2008 
Imelda Villegas Castro  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/28/2004  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  10/7/2008 
Imelda Villegas Castro  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/28/2004  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  10/7/2008 
Imelda Villegas Castro  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/28/2004  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  10/7/2008 
Maria Del Pilar-Baez  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/21/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/15/2008 
Maria Del Pilar-Baez  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/21/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/15/2008 
Maria Del Pilar-Baez  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/21/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/15/2008 
Maria Del Pilar-Baez  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/30/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/15/2008 
Maria Del Pilar-Baez  13-2009 (F3)  AGG TAKING ID-PERSON/ENTITY  2/21/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/15/2008 
Eduardo Franco-Robles  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  1/14/1992  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/10/2008 
Eduardo Franco-Robles  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  1/28/1992  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/10/2008 
Eduardo Franco-Robles  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  1/28/1992  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/10/2008 
Eduardo Franco-Robles  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  1/28/1992  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/10/2008 
Eduardo Franco-Robles  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/10/1999  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/10/2008 
Eduardo Franco-Robles  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/10/1999  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/10/2008 
Eduardo Franco-Robles  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/19/2004  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/10/2008 
Eduardo Franco-Robles  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/19/2004  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/10/2008 
Eduardo Franco-Robles  13-2708 (F5)  TAKING IDENTY OF ANOTHER  1/14/1992  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/10/2008 
Monica Ibanez-Aranda  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  7/2/1995  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  9/9/2008 
Monica Ibanez-Aranda  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  7/2/1995  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  9/9/2008 
Monica Ibanez-Aranda  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  3/12/1997  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  9/9/2008 
Monica Ibanez-Aranda  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/10/1999  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  9/9/2008 
Monica Ibanez-Aranda  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/10/1999  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  9/9/2008 
Monica Ibanez-Aranda  13-2708 (F5)  TAKING IDENTY OF ANOTHER  7/2/1995  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  9/9/2008 
Erika Fabiola Ibarra-Cerda  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  3/12/2008  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  9/3/2008 
Erika Fabiola Ibarra-Cerda  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  3/12/2008  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  9/3/2008 
Erika Fabiola Ibarra-Cerda  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  3/12/2008  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  9/3/2008 
Erika Fabiola Ibarra-Cerda  13-2009 (F3)  AGG TAKING ID-PERSON/ENTITY  3/12/2008  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  9/3/2008 
Victor Manuel Galaviz  13-2006 (F6)  CRIMINAL IMPERSONATION  3/10/1992  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  10/6/2008 
Victor Manuel Galaviz  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/15/2004  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/6/2008 
Victor Manuel Galaviz  13-2708 (F5)  TAKING IDENTY OF ANOTHER  3/10/1992  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/6/2008 
Ernesto Flores-Ayala  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  6/2/1997  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  11/4/2008 
Ernesto Flores-Ayala  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  6/2/1997  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  11/4/2008 
Ernesto Flores-Ayala  13-2006 (F6)  CRIMINAL IMPERSONATION  2/10/1999  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  11/4/2008 
Ernesto Flores-Ayala  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/10/1999  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  11/4/2008 
German Ruben Vidaurrazaga-Sotelo  13-2006 (F6)  CRIMINAL IMPERSONATION  4/19/2004  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  10/14/2008 
German Ruben Vidaurrazaga-Sotelo  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/19/2004  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/14/2008 
German Ruben Vidaurrazaga-Sotelo  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/29/2000  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/14/2008 
Eloiza Bojorquez Ayala  13-2006 (F6)  CRIMINAL IMPERSONATION  3/10/2008  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  10/28/2008 
Eloiza Bojorquez Ayala  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  3/10/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/28/2008 
Eloiza Bojorquez Ayala  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  3/10/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/28/2008 
Eloiza Bojorquez Ayala  13-2009 (F3)  AGG TAKING ID-PERSON/ENTITY  3/10/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/28/2008 
Mirna Lorena Alonso-Borrayo  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/4/2006  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/18/2008 
Mirna Lorena Alonso-Borrayo  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/4/2006  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/18/2008 
Mirna Lorena Alonso-Borrayo  13-2006 (F6)  CRIMINAL IMPERSONATION  4/4/2006  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  10/28/2008 
Mirna Lorena Alonso-Borrayo  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/4/2006  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/28/2008 
Mirna Lorena Alonso-Borrayo  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/3/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/28/2008 
Mirna Lorena Alonso-Borrayo  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/3/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/28/2008 
Mirna Lorena Alonso-Borrayo  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/12/2007  Remove Amended Info  Removed By Amended Information  10/28/2008 
Mirna Lorena Alonso-Borrayo  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  4/12/2007  Remove Amended Info  Removed By Amended Information  10/28/2008 
Guadalupe Garcia-De Rayos  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/6/2008  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  12/24/2008 
Guadalupe Garcia-De Rayos  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/6/2008  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  12/24/2008 
Guadalupe Garcia-De Rayos  13-2009 (F3)  AGG TAKING ID-PERSON/ENTITY  9/19/2007  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  12/24/2008 
Maria Del Carmen Pina-Guerrero  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  7/20/1998  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  12/23/2008 
Maria Del Carmen Pina-Guerrero  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  7/20/1998  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  12/23/2008 
Maria Del Carmen Pina-Guerrero  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  7/20/1998  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  12/23/2008 
Maria Del Carmen Pina-Guerrero  13-2009 (F3)  AGG TAKING ID-PERSON/ENTITY  9/19/2007  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  12/23/2008 
Maria Del Carmen Pina-Guerrero  13-2009 (F3)  AGG TAKING ID-PERSON/ENTITY  9/19/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  3/16/2009 
Maria Del Carmen Pina-Guerrero  13-2006 (F6)  CRIMINAL IMPERSONATION  7/20/1998  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  3/16/2009 
Maria Del Carmen Pina-Guerrero  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  7/20/1998  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  3/16/2009 
Maria Del Carmen Pina-Guerrero  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  7/20/1998  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  3/16/2009 
Guadalupe Garcia-De Rayos  13-2009 (F3)  AGG TAKING ID-PERSON/ENTITY  9/19/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  3/16/2009 
Guadalupe Garcia-De Rayos  13-2006 (F6)  CRIMINAL IMPERSONATION  2/6/2008  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  3/16/2009 
Guadalupe Garcia-De Rayos  13-2002 (F4)  FORGERY  2/6/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  3/16/2009 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
8/27/2018  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (012)  8/30/2018   
8/17/2018  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (012)  8/17/2018   
6/28/2018  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (012)  6/28/2018   
4/18/2018  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (012)  4/18/2018   
4/10/2018  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (012)  4/10/2018   
4/3/2018  597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (012)  4/3/2018   
3/20/2018  REL - Reply - Party (012)  3/20/2018   
NOTE: REPLY FOR PETITION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF
3/5/2018  RES - Response - Party (012)  3/6/2018   
NOTE: Response to Petition for Post-Conviction Relief
3/5/2018  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (012)  3/7/2018   
NOTE: PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E)
2/27/2018  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (012)  3/5/2018   
2/27/2018  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (012)  3/5/2018   
2/27/2018  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (012)  3/5/2018   
NOTE: OR TAPES PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E)
1/18/2018  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (012)  1/18/2018   
1/12/2018  PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (012)  1/12/2018   
NOTE: Petition for Post Conviction Relief
12/1/2017  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (012)  12/4/2017   
NOTE: 03/16/09 BY VERBATIM REPORTING & TRANSCRIPTION, LLC
11/14/2017  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (012)  11/14/2017   
11/10/2017  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (012)  11/13/2017   
NOTE: 03/16/2009 BY BRANDON SMITH
8/11/2017  NOT - Notice - Party (012)  8/11/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
7/31/2017  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (012)  7/31/2017   
7/19/2017  597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (012)  7/19/2017   
6/15/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (012)  6/16/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance
6/15/2017  NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (012)  6/16/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Post Conviction Relief Pursuant to Rules 32.1(a), 32.1(e), 32.1(g) and 32.8
10/22/2013  ORD - Order - Party (007)  10/22/2013   
NOTE: DENIED SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT
9/19/2013  WSH - Worksheet - Party (007)  9/19/2013   
NOTE: CFO INFO
8/28/2013  ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (007)  8/29/2013   
8/28/2013  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (007)  8/29/2013   
7/2/2013  DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet - Party (007)  7/4/2013   
4/10/2013  MPL - Modification of Probation Level - Party (010)  4/12/2013   
7/6/2012  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (011)  7/16/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 5/OFFENSE TO BE DESIGNATED AS A FELONY
5/23/2012  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (008)  6/1/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 4/OFFENSE DESIGNATED A FELONY
5/23/2012  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (009)  6/1/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 38/OFFENSE DESIGNATED A FELONY
12/15/2010  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (006)  12/17/2010   
NOTE: COUNT 1/OFFENSE DESIGNATED A FELONY
8/16/2010  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (007)  8/20/2010   
NOTE: COUNT 9
7/9/2010  PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (007)  7/14/2010   
NOTE: COUNT 9
6/15/2010  ORD - Order - Party (012)  6/16/2010   
NOTE: DENIED VACATE JUDGMENT/DISMISS CHARGES
4/30/2010  WSH - Worksheet - Party (012)  4/30/2010   
NOTE: CFO INFO
4/20/2010  AVJ - Application to Vacate Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (012)  4/20/2010  Defendant (13)  
3/10/2010  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (012)  3/16/2010   
NOTE: COUNT 2
2/16/2010  PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (012)  3/5/2010   
NOTE: COUNT 2
1/28/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  1/28/2010   
1/13/2010  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (004)  1/14/2010   
11/19/2009  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (010)  11/19/2009   
11/19/2009  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (011)  11/19/2009   
11/19/2009  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (012)  11/19/2009   
6/15/2009  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (012)  6/16/2009   
6/11/2009  098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (004)  6/11/2009   
5/28/2009  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (004)  6/3/2009   
NOTE: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BY STIPULATION
4/24/2009  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (011)  4/29/2009   
3/17/2009  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (011)  3/17/2009   
3/17/2009  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (012)  3/17/2009   
3/17/2009  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (012)  3/17/2009   
3/17/2009  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (011)  3/17/2009   
3/16/2009  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (012)  3/18/2009   
3/16/2009  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (011)  3/18/2009   
3/16/2009  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (012)  3/18/2009   
3/16/2009  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (011)  3/18/2009   
3/16/2009  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (011)  3/20/2009   
3/16/2009  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (012)  3/20/2009   
3/2/2009  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (011)  3/3/2009   
2/26/2009  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (011)  3/11/2009   
2/26/2009  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (011)  3/11/2009   
2/26/2009  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (011)  3/11/2009   
2/26/2009  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (012)  2/26/2009   
2/26/2009  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (011)  2/26/2009   
2/11/2009  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (012)  2/11/2009   
2/11/2009  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (011)  2/11/2009   
2/6/2009  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (012)  2/6/2009   
NOTE:
2/6/2009  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (012)  2/6/2009   
NOTE:
2/6/2009  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (011)  2/6/2009   
NOTE:
2/6/2009  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (011)  2/6/2009   
NOTE:
2/4/2009  RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (011)  2/6/2009   
2/4/2009  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (011)  2/6/2009   
1/26/2009  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (011)  1/27/2009   
1/26/2009  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (012)  1/28/2009   
1/23/2009  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (011)  1/23/2009   
1/22/2009  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)  1/26/2009   
1/13/2009  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (010)  1/14/2009   
1/12/2009  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (011)  1/14/2009   
NOTE: TO CHALLENGE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
1/9/2009  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (010)  1/14/2009   
1/9/2009  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (010)  1/14/2009   
NOTE: PROPOSED
1/9/2009  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (010)  1/14/2009   
1/9/2009  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (012)  1/9/2009   
1/9/2009  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (011)  1/9/2009   
1/9/2009  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (007)  1/9/2009   
1/9/2009  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (012)  1/9/2009   
NOTE:
1/9/2009  REQ - Request - Party (012)  1/9/2009   
NOTE: FOR DISCLOSURE
1/9/2009  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (004)  1/13/2009   
1/9/2009  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (005)  1/13/2009   
1/8/2009  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (007)  1/14/2009   
1/8/2009  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (007)  1/14/2009   
NOTE: PROPOSED
1/8/2009  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (007)  1/14/2009   
1/8/2009  RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (011)  1/12/2009   
NOTE: 01/02/2009
1/8/2009  RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (012)  1/12/2009   
NOTE: 01/02/2009
1/2/2009  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (011)  1/8/2009   
1/2/2009  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (012)  1/8/2009   
12/29/2008  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (012)  12/29/2008   
12/29/2008  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (011)  12/29/2008   
12/24/2008  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (003)  12/30/2008   
12/23/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (011)  12/24/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
12/23/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (011)  12/24/2008   
12/23/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (011)  12/24/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
12/23/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (012)  12/24/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
12/23/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (012)  12/24/2008   
12/23/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (012)  12/24/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
12/18/2008  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (011)  12/18/2008   
12/18/2008  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (012)  12/18/2008   
12/17/2008  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (003)  12/17/2008   
11/24/2008  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (003)  11/24/2008   
NOTE:
11/24/2008  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (003)  11/24/2008   
NOTE:
11/17/2008  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (007)  11/19/2008   
11/12/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (003)  11/12/2008   
NOTE: supplemental / of disclosure
11/10/2008  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (007)  11/10/2008   
11/7/2008  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (009)  11/13/2008   
11/7/2008  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (007)  11/7/2008   
11/4/2008  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (007)  11/4/2008   
11/4/2008  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (007)  12/3/2008   
11/4/2008  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (007)  11/10/2008   
11/4/2008  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (007)  11/10/2008   
11/4/2008  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (007)  11/10/2008   
11/3/2008  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (010)  11/3/2008   
11/3/2008  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (009)  11/3/2008   
11/3/2008  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (006)  11/3/2008   
10/31/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (005)  11/3/2008   
NOTE: FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ANTHONY NOVITSKY VIKKI KRATOVIL AND TOM HARRIS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT
10/31/2008  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (010)  10/31/2008   
10/31/2008  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (009)  10/31/2008   
10/30/2008  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (005)  10/30/2008   
10/30/2008  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (003)  10/30/2008   
10/28/2008  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (009)  11/4/2008   
10/28/2008  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (010)  11/4/2008   
10/28/2008  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (009)  11/5/2008   
10/28/2008  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (010)  11/5/2008   
10/28/2008  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (009)  8/24/2009   
10/28/2008  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (010)  8/24/2009   
10/27/2008  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (006)  11/13/2008   
10/27/2008  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  10/28/2008   
10/23/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007)  10/23/2008   
10/23/2008  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (008)  10/24/2008   
10/15/2008  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (008)  10/15/2008   
10/15/2008  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (008)  10/15/2008   
10/14/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (010)  10/14/2008   
10/14/2008  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (008)  10/21/2008   
10/14/2008  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (008)  10/22/2008   
10/14/2008  REL - Reply - Party (001)  10/15/2008   
NOTE: TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
10/14/2008  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (008)  10/22/2008   
10/10/2008  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (006)  10/10/2008   
10/10/2008  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)  10/10/2008   
10/10/2008  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (006)  10/10/2008   
10/10/2008  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (008)  10/10/2008   
10/10/2008  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (003)  10/10/2008   
10/10/2008  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (010)  10/10/2008   
10/10/2008  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (009)  10/10/2008   
10/10/2008  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (007)  10/10/2008   
10/10/2008  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (007)  10/10/2008   
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS AND DISMISS
10/9/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (010)  10/9/2008   
10/9/2008  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (010)  10/15/2008   
10/9/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (010)  10/15/2008   
10/9/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (010)  10/15/2008   
10/7/2008  ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)  10/15/2008   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE
10/7/2008  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  10/14/2008   
10/7/2008  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (006)  10/7/2008   
10/7/2008  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  10/7/2008   
10/7/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (010)  10/7/2008   
10/7/2008  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  10/7/2008   
10/7/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (010)  10/7/2008   
10/7/2008  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  10/7/2008   
10/7/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/7/2008   
NOTE: TO SEAL THE PLEA AGREEMENT AND ADDENDUM
10/7/2008  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (010)  10/8/2008   
10/7/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (010)  10/8/2008   
10/7/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (010)  10/8/2008   
10/6/2008  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (010)  10/7/2008   
10/6/2008  RES - Response - Party (001)  10/7/2008   
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
10/6/2008  ORD - Order - Party (001)  10/15/2008   
NOTE: TO SHOW CAUSE
10/6/2008  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (006)  10/15/2008   
10/6/2008  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (006)  10/15/2008   
10/6/2008  RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (010)  10/6/2008   
NOTE:
10/6/2008  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (006)  10/14/2008   
10/3/2008  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (007)  10/6/2008   
10/3/2008  RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (010)  10/3/2008   
NOTE:
10/3/2008  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (010)  10/3/2008   
NOTE: To Challenge the Grand Jury Proceedings
10/1/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (007)  10/1/2008   
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS FRUITS FROM AN ILLEGAL ARREST OR CONVERTIBLY MOTION TO DISMISS
9/26/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/29/2008   
NOTE: FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ANTHONY NOVITSKY, VIKKI KRATOVIL AND TOM HARRIS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT
9/22/2008  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (010)  9/22/2008   
NOTE:
9/17/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  9/18/2008   
NOTE: OF REFERENCE LETTERS
9/12/2008  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (004)  9/12/2008   
9/12/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  9/12/2008   
9/11/2008  ORD - Order - Party (004)  9/23/2008   
NOTE: BE RELEASED FROM CUSTODY ON HER OWN REGONIZANCE
9/11/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  9/23/2008   
NOTE: FOR RELEASE
9/10/2008  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (005)  9/10/2008   
9/9/2008  ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (004)  9/17/2008   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE
9/9/2008  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (004)  9/17/2008   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE
9/4/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/4/2008   
9/3/2008  ORD - Order - Party (005)  9/10/2008   
NOTE: /DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 09/03/2008
9/3/2008  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (005)  9/10/2008   
NOTE: /AND PROPOSED ORDER
8/28/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (010)  8/28/2008   
8/28/2008  ROR - Release Order - Party (010)  8/28/2008   
NOTE: NO BOND 08/25/08
8/26/2008  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (008)  8/28/2008   
8/26/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (008)  8/28/2008   
8/26/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (008)  8/28/2008   
8/26/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  8/26/2008   
8/25/2008  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  8/27/2008   
8/25/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  8/27/2008   
8/25/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  8/27/2008   
8/22/2008  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (005)  8/25/2008   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO ASSOCIATE AS COUNSEL KATHLEEN CAREY, ET AL
8/20/2008  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (010)  8/20/2008   
8/19/2008  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (002)  8/19/2008   
8/18/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (010)  8/21/2008   
NOTE: TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
8/18/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (010)  8/21/2008   
8/18/2008  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (004)  8/18/2008   
NOTE: TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RULE 12.9 MOTION FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
8/15/2008  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)  8/25/2008   
8/15/2008  ORD - Order - Party (002)  8/27/2008   
NOTE: DISMISSING CR2008-136210-002DT AGAINST MARIA DEL PILAR-BAEZ AKS ELDIA ESTRADA WITHOUT PREJUDICE
8/15/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (010)  8/18/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
8/15/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (010)  8/18/2008   
8/15/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (010)  8/18/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
8/15/2008  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  8/15/2008   
8/15/2008  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (006)  8/15/2008   
8/15/2008  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (008)  8/15/2008   
8/15/2008  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (004)  8/15/2008   
8/15/2008  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  8/15/2008   
8/15/2008  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (005)  8/15/2008   
8/15/2008  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/15/2008   
8/15/2008  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (007)  8/15/2008   
8/15/2008  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (009)  8/15/2008   
8/14/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)  8/15/2008   
8/14/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005)  8/14/2008   
8/13/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (005)  8/14/2008   
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  8/14/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS KNAPP COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (005)  8/14/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS KNAPP COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (006)  8/14/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS KNAPP COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (007)  8/14/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS KNAPP COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (009)  8/14/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS KNAPP COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (008)  8/14/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS KNAPP COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/14/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  8/14/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (005)  9/17/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (006)  9/17/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (007)  9/17/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (008)  9/17/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (009)  9/17/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  9/17/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  9/17/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  9/25/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS COUNSEL
8/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/25/2008   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE AS COUNSEL
8/11/2008  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)  8/12/2008   
NOTE: FOR FILING RULE 12.9 MOTION FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
8/11/2008  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (010)  8/11/2008   
8/8/2008  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (006)  8/11/2008   
8/8/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)  8/11/2008   
8/8/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)  8/11/2008   
8/7/2008  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (006)  8/12/2008   
8/7/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)  8/12/2008   
8/7/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)  8/12/2008   
8/7/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)  8/11/2008   
8/6/2008  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (007)  8/6/2008   
8/6/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (006)  8/6/2008   
NOTE:
8/6/2008  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (006)  8/6/2008   
NOTE: RULE 609
8/6/2008  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (006)  8/6/2008   
NOTE:
8/6/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (008)  8/6/2008   
NOTE:
8/6/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (007)  8/6/2008   
NOTE:
8/6/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (005)  8/6/2008   
NOTE:
8/6/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (003)  8/6/2008   
NOTE:
8/6/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (004)  8/6/2008   
NOTE:
8/6/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)  8/6/2008   
NOTE:
8/6/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  8/6/2008   
NOTE:
8/6/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (009)  8/6/2008   
NOTE:
8/5/2008  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (007)  8/5/2008   
8/1/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (009)  8/5/2008   
7/31/2008  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (009)  7/31/2008   
7/31/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (009)  7/31/2008   
7/31/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (009)  7/31/2008   
7/29/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (006)  7/30/2008   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE AND NOTICE OF DEFENSES
7/29/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (008)  7/30/2008   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE AND NOTICE OF DEFENSES
7/28/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  7/28/2008   
7/28/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  7/28/2008   
7/28/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (006)  7/28/2008   
7/28/2008  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (007)  7/28/2008   
7/25/2008  OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel - Party (002)  7/31/2008   
NOTE: AND RELIEVING ROBYN VARCOE FROM ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS IN THIS MATTER
7/25/2008  OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel - Party (004)  7/31/2008   
NOTE: TO SERVE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PURPOSES OF REPRESENTING DEFENDANT IN THE ABOVE MATTER
7/25/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (007)  7/25/2008   
NOTE:
7/25/2008  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (007)  8/13/2008   
7/23/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (005)  7/24/2008   
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
7/23/2008  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (005)  7/24/2008   
7/23/2008  REQ - Request - Party (005)  7/24/2008   
NOTE: FOR DISCLOSURE
7/16/2008  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (007)  7/17/2008   
NOTE: RE: NON-BONDABLE STATUS
7/14/2008  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (006)  7/14/2008   
NOTE: TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
7/14/2008  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (006)  7/14/2008   
NOTE:
7/14/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (006)  7/14/2008   
NOTE: TO PRESERVE AND REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(a) AND (b) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(c)
7/14/2008  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (004)  7/15/2008   
NOTE: BY STIPULATION
7/10/2008  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  7/11/2008   
7/10/2008  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)  7/11/2008   
7/10/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/11/2008   
NOTE: FOR DISCLOSURE OF SPECIFIC ITEMS OF EVIDENCE
7/8/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  7/9/2008   
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
7/8/2008  REQ - Request - Party (002)  7/9/2008   
NOTE: FOR PRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE
7/8/2008  STA - Statement - Party (002)  7/9/2008   
NOTE: RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE
7/1/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (008)  7/1/2008   
7/1/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (006)  7/1/2008   
7/1/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (003)  7/1/2008   
7/1/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)  7/1/2008   
7/1/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (005)  7/1/2008   
7/1/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (004)  7/1/2008   
7/1/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (007)  7/1/2008   
7/1/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  7/1/2008   
7/1/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (009)  7/1/2008   
7/1/2008  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)  7/1/2008   
NOTE: TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
7/1/2008  RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (002)  7/1/2008   
NOTE:
6/30/2008  ROR - Release Order - Party (002)  7/1/2008   
NOTE: NO BOND 06/30/08
6/30/2008  ROR - Release Order - Party (003)  7/1/2008   
NOTE: NO BOND 06/30/08
6/30/2008  ROR - Release Order - Party (004)  7/1/2008   
NOTE: NO BOND 06/30/08
6/30/2008  ROR - Release Order - Party (005)  7/1/2008   
NOTE: NO BOND 06/30/08
6/30/2008  ROR - Release Order - Party (007)  7/1/2008   
NOTE: NO BOND 06/30/08
6/30/2008  ROR - Release Order - Party (001)  7/1/2008   
NOTE: NO BOND 06/30/08
6/30/2008  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (006)  7/2/2008   
6/30/2008  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (008)  7/2/2008   
6/30/2008  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (003)  6/30/2008   
NOTE:
6/30/2008  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (003)  6/30/2008   
NOTE:
6/25/2008  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (008)  6/25/2008   
6/25/2008  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (009)  6/25/2008   
6/25/2008  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (007)  6/25/2008   
6/25/2008  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (003)  6/25/2008   
6/25/2008  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  6/25/2008   
6/25/2008  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)  6/25/2008   
6/25/2008  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (006)  6/25/2008   
6/25/2008  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (004)  6/25/2008   
6/25/2008  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (005)  6/25/2008   
6/20/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  6/23/2008   
6/20/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)  6/23/2008   
6/20/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (002)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (003)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (003)  6/23/2008   
6/20/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (003)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (004)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (004)  6/23/2008   
6/20/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (004)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (005)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (005)  6/23/2008   
6/20/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (005)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (006)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (006)  6/23/2008   
6/20/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (006)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (007)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (007)  6/23/2008   
6/20/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (007)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (008)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (008)  6/23/2008   
6/20/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (008)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (009)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/20/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (009)  6/23/2008   
6/20/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (009)  6/23/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
6/17/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  6/17/2008   
6/17/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)  6/17/2008   
6/17/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (003)  6/17/2008   
6/17/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (004)  6/17/2008   
6/17/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (005)  6/17/2008   
6/17/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (006)  6/17/2008   
6/17/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (007)  6/17/2008   
6/17/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (008)  6/17/2008   
6/17/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (009)  6/17/2008   
6/13/2008  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (007)  6/13/2008   
6/13/2008  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (005)  6/13/2008   
6/13/2008  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (003)  6/13/2008   
6/13/2008  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (004)  6/13/2008   
6/13/2008  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)  6/13/2008   
6/13/2008  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  6/13/2008   
6/13/2008  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (006)  6/13/2008   
6/13/2008  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (009)  6/13/2008   
6/13/2008  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (008)  6/13/2008   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
6/18/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
6/18/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
6/18/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
6/18/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
6/18/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
6/18/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
6/18/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
6/18/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
6/18/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
6/23/2008  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
6/23/2008  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
6/23/2008  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
6/23/2008  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
6/23/2008  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
6/23/2008  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
6/23/2008  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
6/23/2008  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
6/23/2008  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
6/30/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
6/30/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
6/30/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
6/30/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
6/30/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
6/30/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
6/30/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
6/30/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
6/30/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
7/25/2008  10:00   Oral Argument 
7/29/2008  10:30   Oral Argument 
8/12/2008  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
8/12/2008  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
8/12/2008  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
8/12/2008  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
8/12/2008  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
8/12/2008  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
8/12/2008  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
8/12/2008  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
8/12/2008  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
8/12/2008  8:30   Oral Argument 
8/14/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
8/18/2008  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
8/25/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
9/24/2008  13:30   Settlement Conference 
10/3/2008  13:30   Change Of Plea 
10/3/2008  13:30   Change Of Plea 
10/6/2008  8:30   Change Of Plea 
10/6/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
10/6/2008  8:31   Sentencing 
10/7/2008  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
10/7/2008  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
10/7/2008  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
10/7/2008  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
10/7/2008  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
10/7/2008  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
10/7/2008  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
10/7/2008  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
10/7/2008  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
10/14/2008  8:30   Sentencing 
10/14/2008  8:30   Change Of Plea 
10/22/2008  14:30   Order To Show Cause 
10/22/2008  14:30   Order To Show Cause 
10/28/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
10/28/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
10/28/2008  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
10/28/2008  8:31   Change Of Plea 
10/28/2008  8:31   Change Of Plea 
10/28/2008  8:32   Sentencing 
10/28/2008  8:32   Sentencing 
10/31/2008  13:30   Change Of Plea 
11/4/2008  8:30   Change Of Plea 
11/4/2008  13:30   Change Of Plea 
11/4/2008  13:31   Sentencing 
12/10/2008  8:15   Change Of Plea 
12/15/2008  8:30   Trial 
12/23/2008  8:35   Status Conference 
12/23/2008  8:35   Status Conference 
12/26/2008  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
12/26/2008  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
1/2/2009  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
1/2/2009  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
2/9/2009  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
2/9/2009  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
2/23/2009  9:30   Status Conference 
2/23/2009  9:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
3/16/2009  13:30   Settlement Conference 
3/16/2009  13:31   Sentencing 
3/16/2009  15:00   Settlement Conference 
3/16/2009  15:1   Sentencing 
3/30/2009  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/30/2009  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/17/2018  11:00   Status Conference 
6/14/2018  9:00   Pcr 
click here for Law Library Resource Center