« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Klepper, Faith
Judge
Case #
Party Name
John C Stuart - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Per, Pro
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2008-106594-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
John C Stuart
Crime Date
1/29/2008
Date
2/12/2008
Description
MURDER 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1104 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
John C Stuart
Crime Date
1/29/2008
Date
2/12/2008
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
John C Stuart
Crime Date
1/29/2008
Date
6/23/2008
Description
MURDER 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1104 (F1)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
John C Stuart
Crime Date
1/29/2008
Date
6/23/2008
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
John C Stuart
Crime Date
1/29/2008
Date
9/3/2013
Description
MURDER 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1104 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
John C Stuart
Crime Date
1/29/2008
Date
9/3/2013
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2023
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/28/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OBJECTION ORDER
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2022
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
10/24/2022
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2022
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2022
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILINGS OF PETITION FOR REVIEW
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REPLY-SUPPLEMENTAL TO STATES UNTIMELY AND BARRED RESPONSE
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO VACATE REVERSE AND DISMISS ALL CHARGES
Filing Date
8/9/2022
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S PETITION FOR DNA TESTING
Filing Date
6/20/2022
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2022
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SIXTY DAY NOTICE OF COURTS UNTIMELINESS
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DNA TESTING OF EVIDENCE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF DNA LABORATORY REPORTS UNDERLYING DATA AND NOTES
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DNA TESTING OF EVIDENCE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF DNA LABORATORY REPORTS UNDERLYING DATA AND NOTES
Filing Date
5/3/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
INDICIAL NOTICE OF ADJUDICATIVE FACTS RULE 201E HEARING DEMANDED
Filing Date
3/18/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OBJECTION & JURISDICTION CHALLENGE
Filing Date
2/25/2022
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING & FILING DATE OF JANUARY 6 2022
Filing Date
1/25/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER -OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE-EITHER AN AMENDED PCR OR NEW SUCCESSOR PCR
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
12/10/2021
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2021
Description
597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2021
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
1/24/2019
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2019
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2018
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF PETITION FOR REVIEW
Filing Date
12/21/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2017
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2017
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD
Filing Date
1/18/2017
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT
Filing Date
12/12/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO RULING DATED 11/16/16 AND THE LIES THEREIN
Filing Date
12/12/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
RULE 32.9 NOTICE OF PETITION FOR REVIEW
Filing Date
11/29/2016
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO RULE PURSUANT TO STARE DECISIS AND CEASE SUA SPONTE DENYING DEFENSE MOTIONS
Filing Date
10/26/2016
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2016
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO
PRESERVE EVIDENCE FOR DNA
AND OTHER TESTING BY THE
FEDERAL GOVERNMENT
PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. §3600-
3600A AND/OR THE INNOCENCE
PROTECTION ACT AND/OR
JUSTICE FOR ALL ACT OF 2004
Filing Date
10/19/2016
Description
597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2016
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
10/7/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION
Filing Date
9/28/2016
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2016
Description
RPP - Response to Petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO PETITION
FOR POST-CONVICTION
RELIEF
Filing Date
9/23/2016
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2016
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DECLARATION FOR CORRECTED PETITION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
9/16/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
STANDARD OF REVIEW
Filing Date
9/16/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
9/16/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
9/16/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OFFER OF PROOF OF JUDICIAL BIAS AND JUDICIAL INTENT TO PREJUDICE DEFENDANT
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
JUDICIAL / OF THE SIMILARITIES BETWEEN KYLES V WHITELY/OTHERS/THIS MATTER
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE IF THIS COURT CANNOT SUPPORT ITS FINDINGS WITH FACT AND LAW VACATE THE CONVICION AND DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/7/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE FOR DNA AND OTHER TESTING BY THE FEDERAL GOVERNMENT PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. § 3600-3600A AND/OR THE INNOCENCE PROTECTION ACT AND/OR JUSTICE FOR ALL ACT OF 2004
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2016
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CORRECTED PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Filing Date
8/5/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR AUTOMATIC REVERSAL AS REQUIRED BY SCOTUS IN DAVIS AND OTHER CASES
Filing Date
8/5/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXPAND PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENSE MOTION
Filing Date
7/13/2016
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2016
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF;MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Filing Date
6/27/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR DISCLOSURE AND FOR SANCTIONS FOR SUPPRESSING DISCOVERABLE BRADY MATERIAL
Filing Date
6/27/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
STATEMENT OF FACTS WITHIN DEFENDANTS PERSONAL KNOWLEDGE AND AFFIDAVIT OF JOHN STUART IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
5/31/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE PROSECUTOR CHARBEL
Filing Date
5/19/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER DEFENSE MOTION FOR EXTENSION
Filing Date
5/19/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER DEFENSE 32.4(E)MOTION-HEARING REQUESTED-
Filing Date
5/5/2016
Description
CCR - Confidential Criminal Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2016
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION A.R.CRIM.P. RULE 32.4(E)-WITH -OFFER OF PROOF
Filing Date
4/5/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND PAGE LIMITS
Filing Date
4/5/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PROCEED PRO SE WITH ADVISORY COUNSEL ONLY
Filing Date
3/22/2016
Description
596 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2016
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2016
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIRMED
Filing Date
3/7/2016
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/7/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF RECORD
Filing Date
1/7/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OFFER OF PROOF FOR DEFENDANTS PETITITION FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
12/28/2015
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR DISCLOSURE OF EXULPATORY AND/OR IMPEACHMENT EVIDENDCE CURRENTLY BEING UNLAWFULLY WITHHELD AND/OR CONCEALED BY THE STATE
Filing Date
3/13/2015
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
2/25/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/18/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S CHALLENGE TO THE
COURT’S UNSUBSTANTIATED
ALLEGATION OF JURISDICTION IN
THE SECOND TRIAL
-ANDMOTION
TO VACATE JUDGMENT
AND SENTENCE FOR LACK OF
JURISDICITON
Filing Date
2/13/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OFFER OF PROOF 1) CONSPIRACY AND 2) STRUCTURAL ERROR AND 3) FUNDAMENTAL ERROR
Filing Date
2/9/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S PLEADING
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
STATE'S PLEADING
Filing Date
1/26/2015
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2015
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2015
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
1/7/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PERFORM D.N.A. TEST OF GLOCK SWABS PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §13-4240
Filing Date
1/2/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CORRET THE MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/18/11 PURSUANT TO A R CRIM P RULE 24.4
Filing Date
1/2/2015
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2015
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PERFORM DNA TEST OF GLOCK SWABS PURSUANT TO ARS §13-4240
Filing Date
12/29/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2014
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2014
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PERFORM D.N.A.
TEST OF GLOCK SWABS
PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-4240
Filing Date
12/2/2014
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CORRECT THE
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/18/11
PURSUANT TO:
A.R.Crim.P. RULE 24.4
Filing Date
12/2/2014
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2014
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
08/01/2013 BY MARLA F ARNOLD
Filing Date
6/30/2014
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2014
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
08/14/2013 Marla Arnold
Filing Date
5/20/2014
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
08/08/13 BY MARLA F ARNOLD
Filing Date
5/19/2014
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
8-7-13 MARLA F ARNOLD
Filing Date
4/28/2014
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
07/31/2013 Marla Arnold
Filing Date
4/24/2014
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
07/30/2013 Marla Arnold
Filing Date
3/17/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUBLIC DEFENDER
Filing Date
3/14/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
3/11/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2014
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
3/3/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM PUBLIC DEFENDER
Filing Date
2/26/2014
Description
DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DESIGNATION OF RECORD
FOR APPEAL
Filing Date
2/25/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION
Filing Date
2/25/2014
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2014
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT OF APPEALS
Filing Date
2/11/2014
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2014
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO RESTITUTION
Filing Date
1/28/2014
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2014
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2014
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2014
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2014
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2014
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION TO COURT REPORTERS/NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
1/7/2014
Description
193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2014
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2014
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2014
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2014
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL
Filing Date
1/3/2014
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2014
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MITIGATION/
Filing Date
1/2/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/2/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
notice of filing letters
Filing Date
12/26/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/26/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2013
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
motion to continue sentencing
Filing Date
12/17/2013
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
motion to continue sentencing
Filing Date
12/16/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED 12-10-13
Filing Date
12/13/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
12/12/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED 12/10/13
Filing Date
12/3/2013
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
10/30/2013
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2013
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY
Filing Date
10/16/2013
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
motion to continue sentencing
Filing Date
9/20/2013
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR JUDGMENT JNOV and/or
MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
9/19/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#27
Filing Date
9/13/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR JUDGMENT JNOV and or
MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
9/6/2013
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING RELEASE OF THE DNA PACKETS CONTAINED IN TRIAL EXHIBITS
Filing Date
9/6/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2013
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2013
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2013
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2013
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
9/3/2013
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
9/3/2013
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
9/3/2013
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
9/3/2013
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
9/3/2013
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
9/3/2013
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL/HEARING
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
1
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
109
Filing Date
8/26/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
110
Filing Date
8/26/2013
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL
Filing Date
8/22/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2013
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
100
Filing Date
8/20/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
101
Filing Date
8/20/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
103
Filing Date
8/20/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
102
Filing Date
8/20/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
104
Filing Date
8/20/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
105
Filing Date
8/20/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
106
Filing Date
8/20/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
107
Filing Date
8/20/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
108
Filing Date
8/19/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
98
Filing Date
8/15/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
99
Filing Date
8/14/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
90
Filing Date
8/14/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
91
Filing Date
8/14/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
93
Filing Date
8/14/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
94
Filing Date
8/14/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
96
Filing Date
8/14/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
95
Filing Date
8/14/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
97
Filing Date
8/14/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
92
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
78
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
79
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
80
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
82
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
87
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
84
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
83
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
85
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
86
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
87
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
89
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
88
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
75
Filing Date
8/7/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
76
Filing Date
8/7/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
77
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
74
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
66
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
65
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
67
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
68
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
69
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
70
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
71
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
72
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
73
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#43
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#44
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/2/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#45
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
47
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
46
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
48
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
49
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
50
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
51
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
52
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
54
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
53
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
55
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
56
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
57
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
58
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
59
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
61
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
60
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
62
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
63
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
64
Filing Date
7/26/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE WITNESS CINDY
CANTRELL
Filing Date
7/11/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#41
Filing Date
7/9/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#42
Filing Date
7/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#35
Filing Date
7/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#36
Filing Date
7/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#37
Filing Date
7/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#38
Filing Date
7/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#40
Filing Date
7/8/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#39
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#31
Filing Date
7/2/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#33
Filing Date
7/2/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#32
Filing Date
7/2/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#34
Filing Date
7/1/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#29
Filing Date
7/1/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#30
Filing Date
6/27/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/25/13
Filing Date
6/27/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#28
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#23
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#24
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#25
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#26
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
#27
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
21
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
22
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
12
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
13
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
14
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
15
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
16
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
17
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
19
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
18
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
20
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
6
Filing Date
6/20/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
7
Filing Date
6/20/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
8
Filing Date
6/20/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
11
Filing Date
6/20/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
10
Filing Date
6/19/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
9
Filing Date
6/19/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
1
Filing Date
6/19/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
2
Filing Date
6/19/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
3
Filing Date
6/19/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
5
Filing Date
6/19/2013
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
4
Filing Date
6/19/2013
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRELIMINARY/
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-6-13
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-6-13
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-6-13
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/06/13
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-6-13
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-6-13
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-6-13
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-6-13
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 6-6-13
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/06/13
Filing Date
6/12/2013
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2013
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2013
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2013
Description
088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATUS OF PENDING MOTIONS
Filing Date
4/18/2013
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICT
Filing Date
3/15/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED
Filing Date
3/14/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED
Filing Date
3/13/2013
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED
Filing Date
3/12/2013
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED
Filing Date
3/5/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL
Filing Date
2/26/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
EMERGENCY__ EX PARTE MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND
SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL
Filing Date
2/25/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE
TO ADMIT THE ACCEPTED LEGAL
DEFINITIONS INTO EVIDENCE
Filing Date
2/22/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUESTED
JURY INSTRUCTIONS and RAJI
Filing Date
2/22/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S ADDITIONAL
JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
2/20/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENSE MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE
OF SARAH BANKS CONTACT
INFORMATION PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
2/19/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENSE CASE MANAGEMENT
CURRENT TO DATE
WITNESS LIST –and- TRIAL SCHEDULE
Filing Date
2/15/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S OFFER OF PROOF -and-
MOTION FOR THIS COURT TO TAKE
JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ADJUDICATIVE FACTS
PURSUANT TO:
ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 201
Filing Date
2/15/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
187 Case Management Addendum
Filing Date
2/15/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
189 MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE:
THE PROSECUTION FROM
OBFUSCATING FACTS and/or LAWS
and/or EVIDENCE
-and-
SUBORDING and/or SOLICITING
THE SAME PERJURIOUS TESTIMONY
SHE SUBORNED and/or SOLICITED
IN THE FIRST TRIAL
Filing Date
2/12/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENSE MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15 OF THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENTS RAW CASE FILE (#186)
Filing Date
2/12/2013
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENSE MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE
PURSUANT TO RULE 15
OF THE PHOENIX POLICE
DEPARTMENT’S RAW CASE FILE
(#186)
Filing Date
2/5/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO THE MANDATES IN BRADY AND ITS
PROGENY FOR THE STATE’S
INTENTIONAL REFUSAL TO COMPLY
WITH DISCOVERY
Filing Date
2/5/2013
Description
MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENAS
Filing Date
2/5/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
RULE 15 DISCOVERY
Filing Date
2/5/2013
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
2/4/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR INTENTIONAL DESTRUCTION OF EVIDENCE AND REFUSAL TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDERS
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS COMPUTER FORENSICS EXAMINATION DISCOVERIES
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/29/13
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/29/13
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/29/13
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/28/13
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/29/13
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/28/13
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/28/13
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/29/13
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/28/13
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/28/13
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/28/13
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM/SERVED 01/29/13
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/28/13
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SERVED 01/28/13
Filing Date
1/25/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENSE CASE MANAGEMENT
ADDENDUM (#180)
Filing Date
1/23/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE TO ADMIT BLOG
AND OTHER INTERNET POSTINGS OF:
CARLA BARTSCHI
-and-
ORVILLE THOMAS BEASELY, III
ACTIVITIES DISCOVERED BY
FORENSIC COMPUTER EXPERT
WITNESS LONNIE DWORKIN (#178)
Filing Date
1/23/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENSE CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT (#179)
Filing Date
1/21/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
RULE 15 REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY:
OF ALL NOTES
-and-
ALL INFORMATION
(#177)
Filing Date
1/18/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
RULE 15 REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY:
OF ALL NOTES
-and-
ALL INFORMATION
(#177)
Filing Date
1/17/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
RULE 15 REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY:
1. OF ALL OF THE PROSECUTION
NOTES -and-
2. OF ALL OF THE VICTIM
ADVOCATE’S NOTES -and-
3. ALL INFORMATION CONCERNING
REBUTTAL WITNESSES -and-
4. TO INTERVIEW THE VICTIM’S
ADVOCATE
(#173
Filing Date
1/16/2013
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION (#174) FOR THIS
COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF
ADJUDICATIVE FACTS PURSUANT TO:
ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 201
Filing Date
1/16/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION (#175) TO CLONE
ORIGINAL RECORDINGS PURSUANT TO:
DAUBERT STANDARDS AND A.R.E. RULES 702
AND 1001, ET SEQ.
Filing Date
1/15/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION DISMISS FOR THE STATE’S
REFUSAL TO PRESENT
DISCOVERABLE EXCULPATORY
EVIDENCE (173)
Filing Date
1/15/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION DISMISS FOR THE STATE’S
PURPOSEFUL DESTRUCTION OF
ANOTHER PIECE OF EXCULPATORY
EVIDENCE (#172)
Filing Date
1/9/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (#171)
Filing Date
1/8/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE TO ONLY ALLOW
PRINTED PICTURES THAT ARE
PRINTED ON PHOTOGRAPHY PAPER
TO BE USED AS EXHIBITS AND/OR
EVIDENCE (#170)
Filing Date
1/4/2013
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
1/3/2013
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPREME COURT/FIRST THREE MOTION DENIED - DECLINES TO ACCEPT JURISDICTION OF THE PETITION FOR SPECIAL ACTION
Filing Date
1/3/2013
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT ADDENDUM
NOTICE OF DISCOVERABLE ITEMS
THAT MUST BE PRESENTED TO THE
DEFENSE –AND OTHER
ACTS REQUIRED BY THE
STATE FOR THE DEFENSE TO BE
PREPARED FOR TRIAL
Filing Date
12/31/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/2/2013
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S ACQUIESCENCE
IN LIEU OF A WRITTEN RESPONSE
-ANDMOTION
FOR ORDER ADMITTING THE
COMPUTER SIMULATION AS
SUBSTANTIVE EVIDENCE (#168)
Filing Date
12/27/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/28/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INTENT NOT TO DISCLOSE
FURTHER MATERIAL
–and-
MOTION TO DISMISS IF THE STATE
CONTINUES TO REFUSE TO COMPLY
WITH COURT ORDERS AND/OR ABIDE
BY THE RULES OF COURT (#167)
Filing Date
12/26/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LIST OF BAD ACTS AND OBJECTIONS
AND GROUNDS FOR ANY AND ALL
APPEALS (#166)
Filing Date
12/14/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE TO ADMIT
COMPUTER ANIMATION /
SIMULATION
Filing Date
12/14/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT’S
COMPUTER ANIMATION / SIMULATION
Filing Date
12/14/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENSE CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO THIS
COURT’S MINUTE ENTRY DATED
12/03/12 (#164)
Filing Date
12/11/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CLONE ORIGINAL
RECORDINGS PURSUANT TO
DAUBERT STANDARDS AND
A.R.E. RULES 702 AND 1001, ET SEQ.
(#162)
Filing Date
12/5/2012
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
ADDENDUM
DEFENSE CASE MANAGEMENT
CASE-IN-CHIEF
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT
Filing Date
11/29/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S OBJECTION TO THE
CONSTITUTIONALLY
AND/OR
STATUTORILY
DEFECTIVE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
10/31/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENSE CASE MANAGEMENT CASE-IN-CHIEF DISCLOSURE /
Filing Date
10/31/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND DECREED THE OPDS SHALL PAY FOR COMPLETE TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATIONS, ALL OF DEFENSE EXPERTS WITNESSES TESTIMONY WITHOUT LIMITATIONS AND/OR REQUIREMENTS TAHT TRANSCRIPTS BE ORDERED BY AND/OR SUPPLIED TO THE STATE FIRST
Filing Date
10/22/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR THIS COURT TO ORDER OPDS TO PAY FOR THE
REMAINING TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
10/22/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / FOR THIS COURT TO ORDER OPDS TO PAY FOR FINAL NOTICE INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES
GROUP
Filing Date
10/19/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION (#157) FOR THIS COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF
ADJUDICATIVE FACTS PURSUANT TO: ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 201
-and- TO ENTER PUBLICIZED WRITINGS AS EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO: ARIZONA
RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 902(6)
Filing Date
10/16/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
(#156) FOR THIS
COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF
ADJUDICATIVE FACTS PURSUANT TO:
ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 201 -and-
MOTION TO ORDER THE STATE TO INTERVIEW DEFENSE EXPERT WITNESSES
Filing Date
10/8/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION (#155) FOR THIS COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF
ADJUDICATIVE FACTS PURSUANT TO: ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 201
-and- TO ENTER PUBLICIZED WRITINGS AS EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO: ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 902(6)
Filing Date
10/8/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL PROSECUTOR SUSIE CHARBEL TO SCHEDULE A DEFENSE
INTERVIEW OF CARLA BARTSCHI
Filing Date
10/5/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
(#153) TO ATTACH JEOPARDY
FOR PROSECUTOR’S PURPOSEFUL ACT OF INVITED ERROR AND/OR SUBORDINATION AND/OR
SOLICITATION OF PERJURY
Filing Date
10/2/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION (#152) TO ATTACH JEOPARDY
FOR PROSECUTOR’S PURPOSEFUL ACT OF INVITED ERROR AND/OR SUBORDINATION AND/OR
SOLICITATION OF PERJURY
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE ALL
STATE WITNESSES FROM DISCUSSING
ANY AND ALL ASPECTS AND EVIDENCE
OF THE INSIDE OF DEFENDANT’S FJ
CRUISER
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS OBJECTION
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION (#151) FOR THIS
COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF
ADJUDICATIVE FACTS PURSUANT TO
ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 201:
THAT THIS STATE IS BARRED FROM
CHANGING ITS THEORY OF THE CASE
Filing Date
9/28/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
PETITION FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING PROSECUTOR SUSIE CHARBEL TO NOT INTERFERE WITH DEFENSE INTERVIEW OF CARLA BARTSCHI
Filing Date
9/28/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S OBJECTION TO ALL SUA SPONTE DENIALS OF DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS
Filing Date
9/27/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ATTACH JEOPARDY FOR
PROSECUTOR’S PURPOSEFUL ACT OF
INVITED ERROR AND/OR
SUBORDINATION AND/OR
SOLICITATION OF PERJURY
Filing Date
9/25/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENSE CASE MANAGEMENT
CASE-IN-CHIEF SCHEDULE
DISCLOSURE/ AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Filing Date
9/23/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENSE CASE MANAGEMENT CASE-IN-CHIEF SCHEDULE DISCLOSURE / AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Filing Date
9/10/2012
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
EFILING ID 1433488 - DEFENSE CASE MANAGEMENT CASE-IN-CHIEF SCHEDULE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Filing Date
9/5/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Filing ID 1433489 - MOTION TO DISMISS FOR THE STATE’S VIOLATION OF RULE 6.3(C) and LOCAL RULE 4.5(B)(1 & 2) and 4.1 and SPEEDY TRIAL RIGHTS
Filing Date
8/29/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR MOTION IN LIMINE (#141)
Filing Date
8/29/2012
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / (#141) TO PRECLUDE BRYAN KORUS FROM TESTIFYING
Filing Date
8/22/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S/ (#139) FOR THIS
COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ADJUDICATIVE FACTS PURSUANT TO:
ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 201
-and-
TO ENTER PUBLICIZED WRITINGS AS EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO: ARIZONA
RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 902(6)
Filing Date
8/21/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR INVESTIGATOR TO
BE PRESENT DURING TRIAL
Filing Date
8/21/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO THIS COURT
Filing Date
8/20/2012
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE/ AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Filing Date
8/14/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR STATE AGENTS PURPOSEFUL
AND/OR OTHERWISE DESTRUCTION OF
EVIDENCE AND VIOLATION(S) OF
ARIZONA LAW
Filing Date
7/26/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2012
Description
MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY ADULT PROBATION DEPT / OR MODIFY DEFENDANTS SUBPOENA FOR PRETRIAL SERVICES RECORDS; REQUEST FOR IN CAMERA INSPECTION
Filing Date
7/11/2012
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE/ WITNESS LIST
Filing Date
7/10/2012
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE THE STATE AND THIS COURT FROM MAKING ANY “ANTI-CSI EFFECT” CLAIMS DURING TRIAL AND/OR THE JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
7/6/2012
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2012
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE
THE STATE FROM MAKING ANY CLAIMS
THAT DEFENDANT VERBALLY
PROVOKED DECEDENT AND/OR THAT
VERBAL PROVOCATION JUSTIFIED
DECEDENT’S ATTACK UPON DEFENDANT
Filing Date
6/25/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / FOR THIS COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ADJUDICATIVE FACTS
Filing Date
6/24/2012
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE
THE STATE FROM VIOLATING THE
PRESUMPTIONS, REQUIREMENTS,
AND/OR DEFINITIONS CODIFIED INTO
ARIZONA LAW
Filing Date
6/24/2012
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE REBECCA BEASELY FROM TESTIFYING
Filing Date
6/23/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S/ (#127) FOR THIS COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ADJUDICATIVE FACTS PURSUANT TO: ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 201
Filing Date
6/22/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER THE STATE TO:
A. AVER AND AVOW UNDER PENALTY OF
PERJURY:
1. THEY HAVE COMPLIED FULLY WITH
DISCOVERY; - and -
2. ARE NO LONGER CONCEALING AND/OR
WITHOLDING DISCOVERABLE ITEMS
AND/OR INFORMATION; - and -
3. THEY WILL NOT MAKE FALSE AND/OR
MISLEADING STATEMENTS TO THE JURY
AND/OR THIS COURT; -or-
B. DISMISS THIS CASE WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
6/19/2012
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE
THE PROSECUTOR FROM USING:
“IMPROPER METHODS CALCULATED TO
PRODUCE A WRONGFUL CONVICTION”
Filing Date
6/19/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF A
COMPLETE AND CORRECT
ACCOUNTING FOR THIS CASE
Filing Date
6/18/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / FOR THIS COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ADJUDICATIVE FACTS
Filing Date
6/18/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF CORRECT AND COMPLETE COPIES OF ANY AND ALL ARREST WARRANTS EVER ISSUED FOR CARLA BARTSCHI
Filing Date
6/18/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY / FOR THIS COURT TO ISSUE AN ORDER DIRECTING O.P.D.S. TO PAY IN FULL DR. WALKER OF FNISG
Filing Date
6/16/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF
DECEDENT’S HAIR SAMPLE
FOR TESTING
Filing Date
6/16/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF WARRANT &
AFFIDAVIT(s) & STATEMENT(S) USED
TO OBTAIN WARANT
Filing Date
6/16/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF ALL
DOCUMENTS, STATEMENTS AND ALL
INFORMATION RELEVANT TO THE
PROSECUTOR AND/OR STATE ASSISTING
CARLA BARTSCHI
Filing Date
6/15/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR
RELEASE OF RUBBER GLOVE
FOR TESTING
Filing Date
6/15/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR THIS COURT TO ISSUE AN
ORDER PURSUANT TO THIS COURT’S RULING AND THE MINUTE ENTRIES
EVIDENCING THE ORDER AND
AGREEMENTS THAT THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
6/15/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF DEFENDANT’S CLOTHING
FOR TESTING
Filing Date
6/15/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF DEFENDANT’S BLOOD
AND URINE SAMPLES FOR TESTING
Filing Date
6/15/2012
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF
DECEDENT’S CHIPPED TOOTH
FOR TESTING
Filing Date
6/13/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S/ FOR THIS COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ADJUDICATIVE FACTS PURSUANT TO:
ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 201
Filing Date
6/13/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S/ FOR THIS COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ADJUDICATIVE FACTS PURSUANT TO:
ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 201
Filing Date
6/12/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / FOR THIS COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ADJUDICATIVE FACTS
Filing Date
6/11/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
QUASH SUBPOENA AND SUBPOENA
DUCES TECUM –and- MOTION TO ARREST
THOMAS FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT
Filing Date
6/11/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / FOR THIS COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ADJUDCATIVE FACTS
Filing Date
6/8/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUDICIAL/ OF
ADJUDICATIVE FACTS
PURSUANT TO:
ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 201
Filing Date
6/6/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO A.R.Crim.P 201(d)
Filing Date
6/5/2012
Description
MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA AND SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Filing Date
6/1/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO A.R.Crim.P 201(d
Filing Date
5/31/2012
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE/ WITNESS LIST
Filing Date
5/28/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
5/28/2012
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ (#B1)
TO PRECLUDE PROSECUTOR FROM:
PRESENTING MIS-REPRESENTATIONS
OF FACTS and/or EVIDENCE;
and/or PRESENTING FALSE TESTIMONY;
- PURSUANT TO ARIZONA LAW -
Filing Date
5/28/2012
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ (#B2)
TO PRECLUDE PROSECUTOR FROM:
ALTERING AND/OR REPLACING
THEORIES AND/OR EXPLANATIONS
Filing Date
5/23/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ FOR THIS COURT TO ISSUE AN ORDER DIRECTING O.P.D.S. TO
PAY FOR COMPLETE TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Filing ID 1296240 - ADDENDUM TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR THIS COURT TO ISSUE AN ORDER
DIRECTING O.P.D.S. TO PAY IN FULL DR. WALKER DATED APRIL 9, 2012; IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE JUDGE’S DIRECTIONS
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 04/28/12
Filing Date
5/15/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/04/12
Filing Date
5/9/2012
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS FIRST SEPARATE CASE MANAGEMENT
Filing Date
5/6/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
To Allow Out Of State Travel For Work
Filing Date
4/29/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFER OF PROOF
-and- JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO: ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE 201
Filing Date
4/18/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE
SUPREME COURT’S RULING
CONCERNING ANDREW THOMAS
AND THE AG OFFICE CORRUPTION
Filing Date
4/9/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ FOR THIS COURT TO ISSUE AN ORDER DIRECTING O.P.D.S. TO
PAY IN FULL DR. WALKER
Filing Date
4/5/2012
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATIONS AND/OR DECISIONS
Filing Date
3/27/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FILING ID 1226980 - DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR A FINDING OF FACT AND CONCLUSION OF LAW FOR ANY AND ALL RULINGS ON DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR THIS COURT TO ADHERE TO ARIZONA LAW AND HIGHER COURT MANDATES AND DISMISS THIS CASE WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/26/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ FOR A FINDING OF
FACT AND CONCLUSION OF LAW FOR ANY
AND ALL RULINGS ON DEFENDANT’S
PLEADINGS; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR THIS COURT
TO ADHERE TO ARIZONA LAW AND
HIGHER COURT MANDATES AND DISMISS
THIS CASE WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/21/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO:
JUDICIAL ESTOPPEL and/or
COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL DOCTRINE and/or
ISSUE PRECLUSION and/or
JUDGMENT, ESTOPPEL BY and/or RES JUDICATA and/or
DIRECT ESTOPPEL
Filing Date
3/15/2012
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DIRECTING THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT TO ALLOW ACCESS TO DEFENDANTS VEHICLE TO THE DEFENSES EXPERT WITNESS
Filing Date
3/9/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DIRECTING THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT OT ALLOW ACCESS TO DEFENDANT'S VEHICLE TO DEFENSE'S EXPERT WITNESS, AND THAT JIM TAVERNETTI BE ALLOWED TO VIDEO RECORD THE INSIDE OF THE DEFEDANT'S VEHICLE AT THE PHOENIX POLICE IMPOUND LOCATION
Filing Date
3/1/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY/ FOR A SUA SPONTE
ORDER ALLOWING PHYSICAL
EXAMINATION OF EVIDENCE
Filing Date
2/20/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ORDER PROSECUTORS
AND/OR THE PROSECUTOR’S
OFFICE TO NOT INTERFERE WITH
CASES AGAINST CARLA BARTSCHI
Filing Date
2/16/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ENTER CASES AND
WARRANTS INTO EVIDENCE
Filing Date
2/13/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2012
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/9/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCLOSURE OF EXCULPATORY
AND IMPEACHMENT EVIDENCE
PURSUANT TO: A.R.CRIM.P. RULE
15 –and- THE STATE’S CLAIMS –and-
JUDGE KREAMER’S ORDER
Filing Date
2/2/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO THE CORPUS DELICTI RULE
–and/or- PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
1/25/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S COMPLIANCE WITH REQUIREMENT TO NOTICE THIS
COURT FOR STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
1/17/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MOVES THIS COURT TO
TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO
A.R.Crim.P. 201(d) OF: PROSECUTORIAL
AND POLICE MISCONDUCT
–and-
OFFER OF PROOF
Filing Date
1/12/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS EX PARTE/ TO HAVE THIS COURT COMPEL OPDS TO
PAY DR. WALKER FOR SERVICES
RENDERED AND SERVICES NEEDED
Filing Date
1/11/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MOVES THIS COURT
TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT
TO A.R.Crim.P. 201(d) OF:
PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT OF
FALSLEY CLAIMING THE STATE
CANNOT AFFORD TO TEST
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
1/6/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MOVES THIS COURT
TAKE JUDICIAL/ OF A RECENT CASTLE DOCTRINE CASE PURSUANT TO A.R.Crim.P. 201(d)
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SPECIAL VERDICT PURSUANT TO DEFENDANT’S PREVIOUS PLEADING –and- A.R.Crim.P. RULE 16.1
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MOVES THIS COURT TO LIMIT THE STATE TO USING ONLY ADJUDICATED FACTS AND SWORN
EYE-WITNESS TESTIMONY IN ITS RECREATION / REENACTMENT –and- PROHIBIT THE USE OF INVESTIGATORS
STATEMENTS AND/OR NOTES
PURSUANT TO DEFENDANT’S PREVIOUS PLEADING –and-
A.R.Crim.P. RULE 16.1
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CHANGE OF VENUE PURSUANT TO DEFENDNTS PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE CARLA BARTSCHI FROM TESTIFYING DUE TO HER PREVIOUS ACS OF PERJURY PURSUANT TO DEFENDNTS PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUE TO THE CRIMINAL AND/OR UNETHICAL ACTS COMMITTED BY THE PROSECUTOR PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE BRYAN KORUS FROM TESTIFYING DUE TO HIS PREVIOUS ACTS OF PERJURY PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR UNLAWFUL SELECTIVE PROSECUTION OF DEFENDANTS EYEWITNESS AS A FORM OF WITNESS TAMPERING PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR A FRYE HEARING CONCERNING DETECTIVE DALTONS THEORY THAT BLOOD SQUIRTS FROM HEAD WOUNDS PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES MOTION TO CONTINUE RE-TRIAL DOCKET ID #1108080 FILED: DEC. 15 2011 AND DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCLOSURE OF EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO A.R. CRIM.P. RULE 15 AND THE STATES CLAIMS PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
1/4/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE FOR THE STATE’S PURPOSEFUL
DEPRIVATION OF DEFENDANT’S
SUBSTANTIVE RIGHTS AND DENIAL OF DUE PROCESS OF LAW
Filing Date
12/31/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING AND A.R.CRIM.P. RULE 16.1
Filing Date
12/31/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ENTER THE FULL POLICE REPORT INTO EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING AND A.R.Crim.P. RULE 16.1
Filing Date
12/31/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS PETITION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE NOT DISMISSED PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING AND A.R.Crim.P. RULE 16.1
Filing Date
12/31/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO INVOKE RULES PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING AND A.R.Crim.P. RULE 16.1
Filing Date
12/31/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ENTER AEGIS LAB RESULTS INTO EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
12/31/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPRESS THE FRUITS OF HIS UNCONSTITUTIONAL DETENTION AND ARREST PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
12/31/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS OBTAINED IN VIOLATION OF DEFENDANTS CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
12/31/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / TO COMPEL LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICIALS TO TURN OVER AND ADVISE THE PROSECUTING ATTORNEY OF ALL INFORMATION ACQUIRED DURING THE COURSE OF INVESTIGATION PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
12/31/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ENTER CASE FN2011-050784 Bartschi Vs. Stuart INTO EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
12/31/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MOVES THIS COURT TAKE JUDICIAL / OF THE UNCONTESTED FACTS PURSUANT TO A.R.Crim.P. 201(d) PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS PREVIOUS PLEADING AND A.R.Crim.P. RULE 16.1
Filing Date
12/30/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE DUE TO
PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT WHICH
PREVENTS DEFENDANT FROM PUTTING
FORTH AN ADEQUATE DEFENSE
Filing Date
12/30/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S OFFER OF PROOF FOR
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS
WITH PREJUDICE FOR INABILITY TO
PUT FORTH AN ADEQUATE DEFENSE
Filing Date
12/30/2011
Description
MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE SEARCH
WARRANT PURSUANT TO
DEFENDANT’S PREVIOUS PLEADING
–and- A.R.Crim.P. RULE 16.1
Filing Date
12/30/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO / PURSUANT TO THE 14TH AMENDMENT
–and- ARTICLE 2 § 13 OF THE ARIZONA
CONSTITUTION -and- PUBLIC POLICY
–and- A.R.Crim.P. RULE 16.1
Filing Date
12/30/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ENTER BLOG AS EVIDENCE
OF DECEDENT’S ROUTINES AND
HABITS PURSUANT TO
DEFENDANT’S PREVIOUS PLEADING
–and- A.R.Crim.P. RULE 16.1
Filing Date
12/30/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ENTER THE FJ CRUISER
INTO EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO
DEFENDANT’S PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
12/30/2011
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE:
DETECTIVE PAUL DALTON FROM
TESTIFYING ON BLOOD EVIDENCE
PURSUANT TO DEFENDANT’S
PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
12/30/2011
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE:
1. PROSECUTORIAL VOUCHING;
2. THE WEARING OF UNIFORMS
DURING TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO
DEFENDANT’S PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
12/30/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR
DISCLOSURE OF EVIDENCE
PURSUANT TO DEFENDANT’S
PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
12/30/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL
DISCLOSURE OF AGGRAVATING
FACTORS AND INFORMATION
RELATING TO MITIGATING FACTORS
PURSUANT TO DEFENDANT’S
PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
12/30/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR
DISCLOSURE OF THE JUVENILE
RECORDS OF PLAINTIFF’S WITNESSES
PURSUANT TO DEFENDANT’S
PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
12/30/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL
DISCLOSURE OF PLAINTIFF’S JURY
SELECTION DATA PURSUANT TO
DEFENDANT’S PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
12/30/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PROPERLY
PRESERVE AND CATALOG ALL
PHYSICAL EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO
DEFENDANT’S PREVIOUS PLEADING
Filing Date
12/21/2011
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2011
Description
MFH - Motion For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S / A FRYE
CONCERNING DETECTIVE
DALTON’S THEORY THAT BLOOD
SQUIRTS FROM HEAD WOUNDS
Filing Date
12/20/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCLOSURE OF EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO A.R.CRIM.P. RULE 15 AND THE STATE’S CLAIMS
Filing Date
12/19/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO STATES MOTION TO CONTINUE RE-TRIAL
Filing Date
12/19/2011
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO
PRECLUDE REBECCA BEASLEY FROM
TESTIFYING DUE TO HER PREVIOUS
ACTS OF PERJURY
Filing Date
12/19/2011
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO
PRECLUDE PAUL DALTON FROM
TESTIFYING DUE TO HIS PREVIOUS
ACTS OF PERJURY
Filing Date
12/19/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ FOR SELECTIVE PROSECUTION OF DEFENDANTS EYE-WITNESS AS A FORM OF UNLAWFUL WITNESS TAMPERING
Filing Date
12/19/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Offer of Proof
Filing Date
12/19/2011
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO PRECLUDE BRYAN KORUS FROM TESTIFYING DUE TO HIS PREVIOUS ACTS OF PERJRY
Filing Date
12/19/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUE TO THE
CRIMINAL AND/OR UNETHICAL
ACTS COMMITTED BY THE
PROSECUTOR
Filing Date
12/19/2011
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO
PRECLUDE CARLA BARTSCHI FROM
TESTIFYING DUE TO HER PREVIOUS
ACTS OF PERJURY
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ FOR A CHANGE OF VENUE
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO HAVE REASONS FOR DEFENSE OBJECTIONS AND REASONS FOR OVERRULING DEFENSE OBJECTIONS PLACED ON THE RECORD
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ FOR SPECIAL VERDICT
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / MOVES THIS COURT TO
LIMIT THE STATE TO USING ONLY
ADJUDICATED FACTS AND SWORN
EYE-WITNESS TESTIMONY IN ITS
RECREATION / REENACTMENT –and-
PROHIBIT THE USE OF INVESTIGATORS
STATEMENTS AND/OR NOTES
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ RE TRIAL
Filing Date
12/14/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ENTER CASE FN2011-050784 : Bartschi Vs. Stuart
INTO EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/14/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / TO COMPEL LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICIALS
TO TURN OVER AND ADVISE THE
PROSECUTING ATTORNEY OF ALL
INFORMATION ACQUIRED DURING
THE COURSE OF INVESTIGATION
Filing Date
12/14/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS OBTAINED IN VIOLATION
OF DEFENDANT’S CONSTITUTIONAL
RIGHTS
Filing Date
12/14/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO SUPPRESS THE FRUITS OF HIS
UNCONSTITUTIONAL DETENTION
AND ARREST
Filing Date
12/14/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ENTER AEGIS LAB RESULTS INTO EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/14/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO INVOKE RULES
Filing Date
12/14/2011
Description
PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED
Filing Date
12/13/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ENTER THE FULL POLICE REPORT INTO EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/13/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MOVES THIS COURT
TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE
UNCONTESTED FACTS PURSUANT
TO A.R.Crim.P. 201(d)
Filing Date
12/13/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Filing Date
12/13/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / TO PROPERLY PRESERVE AND CATALOG ALL PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/13/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ FOR ALL MOTIONS TO BE HEARD ON THE RECORD
Filing Date
12/13/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
12/13/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE OF PLAINTIFFS JURY SELECTION DATA
Filing Date
12/13/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ FOR DISCLOSURE OF THE JUVENILE RECORDS OF PLAINTIFFS WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/13/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE OF AGGRAVATING
FACTORS AND INFORMATION
RELATING TO MITIGATING FACTORS
Filing Date
12/12/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR
DISCLOSURE OF EXCULPATORY
AND IMPEACHMENT EVIDENCE
PURSUANT TO A.R.CRIM.P. RULE 15
AND THE STATE’S CLAIMS
Filing Date
12/12/2011
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE:
1. PROSECUTORIAL VOUCHING;
2. THE WEARING OF UNIFORMS
DURING TESTIMONY
Filing Date
12/12/2011
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE:
DETECTIVE PAUL DALTON FROM
TESTIFYING ON BLOOD EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/12/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ENTER THE
FJ CRUISER INTO EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/12/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ENTER BLOG AS
EVIDENCE OF DECEDENT’S
ROUTINES AND HABITS
Filing Date
12/7/2011
Description
MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO QUASH THE SEARCH
WARRANT AB INITIO AND
NUNC PRO TUNC -and-
SUPPRESS ALL EVIDENCE DISCOVERED
PURSUANT TO THE SEARCH WARRANT
–and- DISMISS THE INDICTMENT
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
12/7/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO
THE 14TH AMENDMENT TO THE
FEDERAL CONSTITUTION –and-
ARTICLE 2 § 13 OF THE
ARIZONA CONSTITUTION -and-
PUBLIC POLICY
Filing Date
12/7/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO DEFENDANT’S PREVIOUS PLEADING
–and- A.R.Crim.P. RULE 16.1
Filing Date
11/22/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF LOCATION
AND CONTACT INFORMATION
Filing Date
11/21/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MOVES THIS COURT
TO PRECLUDE THE REMOVAL OF
JEOPARDY FROM THE MISTRIAL DUE
TO PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT AND THE IRREBUTTABLE PRESUMPTIONS
CODIFIED INTO ARIZONA LAW IN:
A.R.S. §§ 13- 419, 404, 405, 406, 407, 408, 418,
205, 402, 403, 409, 410, 1304 and/or 411
Filing Date
11/21/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#16
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#15
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#14
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO CORRECT JURY INSTRUCTION
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY DEFENDANTS / TO CLARIFY JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND ISSUE RULE 20
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRELIMINARY
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE STATE'S CLOSING ARGUMENT POWERPOINT
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE STATE'S OPENING POWER POINT
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#13
Filing Date
11/17/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#12
Filing Date
11/17/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#11
Filing Date
11/16/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#7
Filing Date
11/16/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#10
Filing Date
11/16/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#9
Filing Date
11/16/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#8
Filing Date
11/16/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#11
Filing Date
11/16/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#4
Filing Date
11/16/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#5
Filing Date
11/16/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DELIBERATION/ #6
Filing Date
11/15/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#3
Filing Date
11/15/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#2
Filing Date
11/14/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2011
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
EMERGENCY DEFENDANT'S CONTINUED/TO JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND MOTION TO AMEND JURY INSTRUCTIONS TO COMPORT WITH RECENT CHANGES IN THE ARIZONA REVISED STATUTES
Filing Date
11/14/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR PROSECUTOR'S FALSE STATEMENTS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO PERMIT JURY'S ACCESS TO EVIDENCE OF MR. BEASLEY'S CONDUCT
Filing Date
11/14/2011
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2011
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY DEFENDANTS CONTINUED / TO JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND MOTION TO AMEND JURY
INSTRUCTIONS TO COMPORT WITH
RECENT CHANGES IN THE
ARIZONA REVISED STATUTES
Filing Date
11/10/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR
PROSECUTOR’S FALSE
STATEMENTS or in the alternative
MOTION TO PERMIT JURY’S ACCESS
TO EVIDENCE OF MR. BEASLEY’S
CONDUCT
Filing Date
11/9/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#15
Filing Date
11/8/2011
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL
Filing Date
11/8/2011
Description
JNO - Jury Note - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2011
Description
JNO - Jury Note - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2011
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2011
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT TO MOTION TO ADD VERBIAGE TO JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUDICIAL / CASTEL DOCTRINE REPORT
Filing Date
11/3/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ADD VERBIAGE TO JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPRESS
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#324
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#323
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#326
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#325
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#322
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#332
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#331
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#330
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#329
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#328
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#327
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#277
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#276
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#275
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#274
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#273
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#272
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#301
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#302
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#303
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#304
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#305
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#306
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#307
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#308
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#283
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#282
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#281
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#280
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#279
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#309
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#312
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#311
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#310
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#313
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#278
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#321
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#320
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#319
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#316
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#315
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#314
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#216
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#217
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#314
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#317
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#318
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR JON MCCAINE
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
164 Jury Instructions
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#299
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#300
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#297
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#296
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#295
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#294
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#293
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#292
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#291
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#290
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#289
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#298
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#286
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#288
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#285
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#284
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#287
Filing Date
10/30/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE’S MOTION
TO PRECLUDE DR. GEORGE
WALKER’S TESTING, TEST
RESULTS, REPORT AND
TESTIMONY
Filing Date
10/30/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO HAVE JURY INSTRUCTIONS READ BEFORE CLOSING ARGUMENTS
Filing Date
10/28/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#252
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#251
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#271
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#270
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#269
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#268
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#267
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#266
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#265
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#264
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#263
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#262
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#261
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#260
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#259
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#258
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#257
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#256
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#255
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#254
Filing Date
10/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#253
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#237
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#250
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#227
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#226
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#225
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#234
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#233
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#232
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#231
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#230
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#229
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#228
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#236
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#235
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#249
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#224
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#223
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#246
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#245
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#244
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#243
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#242
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#241
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#240
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#239
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#238
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#222
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#221
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#220
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#219
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#218
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#248
Filing Date
10/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#247
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#197
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#196
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#195
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#194
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#215
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#207
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#214
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#213
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#212
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#200
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#199
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#202
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#203
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#198
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#211
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#210
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#209
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#208
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#207
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#206
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#205
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#204
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO PRECLUDE
DR. GEORGE WALKER’S TESTING, TEST RESULTS, REPORT, AND TESTIMONY
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL
Filing Date
10/24/2011
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF
DEFENDANT’S OBJECTION TO
STATE’S CLAIMS DEFENDANT
COULD HAVE DONE TESTING
AND ASSISTED WITH THE
INVESTIGATION
Filing Date
10/23/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ISSUE AN ORDER
PREVENTING CARLA BARTSCHI
FROM ACTING AS AN
INVESTIGATOR FOR THE STATE
AND PRECLUDE ANY AND ALL
DISCOVERIES BY BARTSCHI
Filing Date
10/21/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFER OF PROOF
Filing Date
10/21/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE CASE IN CHIEF SCHEDULE
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT’S
OBJECTION TO STATE’S CLAIMS
DEFENDANT COULD HAVE DONE
TESTING AND ASSISTED WITH THE
INVESTIGATION-and-REQUEST FOR
SANCTIONS
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#279
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#150
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#178
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#177
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#176
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#175
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#171
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#170
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#169
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#168
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#167
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#166
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#165
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#164
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#163
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#162
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#161
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#193
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#192
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#191
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#190
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#189
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#188
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#187
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#186
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#185
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#184
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#183
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#182
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#181
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#180
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#160
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#159
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#158
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#157
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#156
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#155
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#154
Filing Date
10/20/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#173
Filing Date
10/19/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#172
Filing Date
10/19/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#175
Filing Date
10/19/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#174
Filing Date
10/19/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ AND ORDER FOR NOTES REPORTS AND RAW DATA PRODUCED BY MR ERIK BROWN TO BE PROVIDED TO THE STATE
Filing Date
10/19/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE CASE IN CHIEF SCHEDULE
Filing Date
10/19/2011
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR NOTES REPORTS AND RAW DATA PRODUCED BY MR ERIK BROWN TO BE PROVIDED TO THE STATE
Filing Date
10/18/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#151
Filing Date
10/18/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#149
Filing Date
10/18/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#148
Filing Date
10/18/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#147
Filing Date
10/18/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#146
Filing Date
10/18/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#145
Filing Date
10/18/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#153
Filing Date
10/18/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#152
Filing Date
10/17/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#144
Filing Date
10/17/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#143
Filing Date
10/17/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#142
Filing Date
10/17/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#141
Filing Date
10/17/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#140
Filing Date
10/17/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#139
Filing Date
10/17/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#138
Filing Date
10/17/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE VIDEO TAPED RE CREATION AND ANY TESTIMONY REGARDING SAID RE CREATION
Filing Date
10/16/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE
TO PRECLUDE DARRELL
MARTIN’S TESTIMONY
Filing Date
10/14/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE AND SUPPRESS TESTIMONY OF AND ALL STATEMENTS BY DARRYL MARTIN
Filing Date
10/14/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF TEST RESULTS
Filing Date
10/14/2011
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO THE STATE KNOWINGLY PRESENTING A FALSE THEORY TO THIS COURT AND THE JURY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
10/14/2011
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO THE STATES PURPOSEFUL ACT OF INVITED ERROR AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
10/12/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/05/11
Filing Date
10/11/2011
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE /
Filing Date
10/10/2011
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE AND SUPPRESS TESTIMONY OF AND ALL STATEMENTS BY DARRYL MARTIN
Filing Date
10/10/2011
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES CLAIMS DEFENDANT COULD HAVE DONE TESTING AND ASSISTED WITH THE INVESTIGATION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
10/8/2011
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
10/7/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONCERNING DR HERMISSILO ROMO
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#137
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#136
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#135
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#125
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#124
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#134
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#133
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#132
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#131
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#130
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#129
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#128
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#127
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#126
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#122
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#121
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#120
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#119
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#118
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#123
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#117
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#116
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#115
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#114
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#113
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#96
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#95
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#94
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#93
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#92
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#91
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#90
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#89
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#88
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#102
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#112
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#111
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#110
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#109
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#108
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#107
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#106
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#105
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#104
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#103
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#101
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#100
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#99
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#98
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#97
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#87
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#86
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#85
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#84
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#83
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#82
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#81
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#80
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#79
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#78
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#77
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#76
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#75
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#74
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#73
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#72
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#71
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#70
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#69
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#68
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#67
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#66
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO NEW EVIDENCE
Filing Date
10/3/2011
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE
A) MOTION SHOULD BE 58
SEPARATE MOTIONS
B) MOTION IS UNTIMELY -and-
2) REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#65
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#64
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#63
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#62
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#61
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#60
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#59
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#58
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#57
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#56
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#45
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#44
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#43
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#42
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#41
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#40
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#39
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#38
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#37
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#36
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#35
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#34
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#33
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#51
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#50
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#49
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#48
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#47
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#46
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#55
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#54
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#53
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#52
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#32
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#31
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#30
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE
OF DISCLOSURE AS UNTIMELY
AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULING ON DVD
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#28
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#27
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#29
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#26
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#16
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#15
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#20
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#19
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#18
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#17
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#25
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#24
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#23
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#22
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#21
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#14
Filing Date
9/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#13
Filing Date
9/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#12
Filing Date
9/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#11
Filing Date
9/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#10
Filing Date
9/26/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#9
Filing Date
9/26/2011
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF JAY LEVINE
Filing Date
9/26/2011
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2011
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO STATE’S MOTION FOR MENTAL
HEALTH EXAMINATION BY A
STATE-RETAINED EXPERT AND
DISCLOSURE OF ALL NOTES AND RAW DATA
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/15/11
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/14/11
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/14/11
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/14/11
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/14/11
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/14/11
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/14/11
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#8
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#7
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#6
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#5
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#4
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#2
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#3
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
#1
Filing Date
9/21/2011
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2011
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ FOR MENTAL HEALTH
EXAMINATION BY A STATE-RETAINED
EXPERT AND DISCLOSURE OF ALL
NOTES AND RAW DATA
Filing Date
9/19/2011
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO PRECLUDE CERTAIN CONDUCT AT TRIAL
Filing Date
9/19/2011
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO HAVE HIS INVESTIGATOR PRESENT AT TRIAL AND SENTENCING IF NEEDED
Filing Date
9/14/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUDICIAL / PURSUANT TO RULE 201
Filing Date
9/14/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/14/11
Filing Date
9/14/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/09/11
Filing Date
9/13/2011
Description
905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2011
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES PRETRIAL
Filing Date
9/13/2011
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE PRETRIAL/
Filing Date
9/12/2011
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / PRELIMINARY
Filing Date
9/12/2011
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/12/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF WITNESSES AND PERSONS INSPECTING AND TESTING VEHICLE PURSUANT TO ORDER BY JUDGE KREAMER
Filing Date
9/11/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR BAD FAITH DESTRUCTION OF EXCULPATORY EVIDENCE
Filing Date
9/9/2011
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL/ OF WITNESSES AND EVIDENCE
Filing Date
9/8/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL THE
PHSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION
REPORT OF CARLA BARTSCHI BY
DR. JOHN DIBACCO IN CASE
DR1998-020942
Filing Date
9/7/2011
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2011
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFER OF PROOF DEFENDANTS/ AS WILL BE MADE ON 9-6-11 IN OPEN COURT ON AND FOR THE RECORD
Filing Date
9/7/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF WITNESSES AND PERSONS INSPECTING AND TESTING VEHICLE PURSUANT TO ORDER BY JUDGE KREAMER
Filing Date
9/7/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REQUEST SUBPOENA FOR RECORDS OF REPORT OF DR JOHN DIBACCO
Filing Date
9/7/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ALLOW DEFENSE
WITNESS JASMINE BARTSCHI TO APPEAR AND TESTIFY
TELEPHONICALLY
Filing Date
9/7/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF EMAIL
Filing Date
9/7/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF EMAIL
Filing Date
9/6/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ OF WITNESSES AND PERSONS INSPECTING AND TESTING VEHICLE
Filing Date
9/6/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFER OF PROOF DEFENDANTS STATEMENT AS WILL BE MADE ON 09/06/2011, IN OPEN COURT ON AND FOR THE RECORD
Filing Date
9/2/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFER OF PROOF STATES WITNESS CARLA BARTSCHI IS A PARALEGAL
Filing Date
9/2/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/25/11
Filing Date
9/2/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/24/11
Filing Date
9/2/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/24/11
Filing Date
9/2/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/23/11
Filing Date
9/2/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/23/11
Filing Date
9/2/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/23/11
Filing Date
9/2/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/23/11
Filing Date
9/2/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/23/11
Filing Date
9/2/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/23/11
Filing Date
9/2/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/23/11
Filing Date
9/2/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/23/11
Filing Date
9/1/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL/ OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
9/1/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / TO : STATES MOTION TO STRIKE AND REMOVE FROM DOCKET EVERY ONE OF THE DEFENDANTS MOTIONS AND PLEADINGS FILED AFTER 08/17 UNTIL THE PRESENT AND FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
9/1/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND EMERGENCY / TO COMPEL THIS COURT TO SCHEDULE DATES FOR DEFENDANTS EXPERTS TO EXAMINE EVIDENCE AND AS AN OFFER OF PROOF OF PURPOSEFUL DESTRUCTION OF EXCULPATORY EVIDENCE BY STATE AGENTS
Filing Date
9/1/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF GASTRIC FLUIDS SAMPLE FOR TESTING
Filing Date
8/31/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE AND
REMOVE FROM DOCKET EVERY ONE OF
THE DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS AND
PLEADINGS FILED AFTER AUGUST 17
UNTIL THE PRESENT AND FOR
SANCTIONS
Filing Date
8/30/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY/THIS COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE THAT PROSECUTION WITNESS CARLA BARTSCHI HAS SCARED DEFENSE WITNESS JASMINE BARTSCHI INTO NOT TESTIFYING
Filing Date
8/30/2011
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
117 Defendants exhibit list
Filing Date
8/30/2011
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
118 Witness list
Filing Date
8/30/2011
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
121 Rule 15 Certificate
Filing Date
8/30/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO NEW EVIDENCE
THE TAPED CONFESSION OF
THE PROSECUTOR THAT HER
TEAM CONCEALED AND/OR
DESTROYED EXCUPATORY
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
8/29/2011
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO THE RULING ENTERED 08/23/11
Filing Date
8/29/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY/ AND OFFER OF PROOF
Filing Date
8/29/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY/ BASED ON THE RECENT APPELLATE DECISION IN DROEGEMEIER
Filing Date
8/29/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SANCTION PROSECUTOR SUSIE CHARBEL FOR THE OFFENSES SHE COMMITTED AND CONFESSED TO
Filing Date
8/29/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EQUAL TREATMENT OF DEFENDANT
Filing Date
8/23/2011
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS ABRIDGED LIST OF OBJECTIONS
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO A.R.Crim.P 201(d) DEFENDANTS/ THIS COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE UNCONTESTED FACTS
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEREBY ENTERS INTO EVIDENCE IN THIS MATTER THE LISTED ITEMS
Filing Date
8/19/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO A.R.Crim.P 201(d)
DEFENDANT/ THIS COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE FOLLOWING FOR THIS MATTE AND ANY APPEAL
Filing Date
8/18/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY/TO COMPEL THIS COURT TO SCHEDULE DATES FOR DEFENDANTS EXPERTS TO EXAMINE EVIDENCE
Filing Date
8/18/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR INVESTIGATOR TO BE PRESENT DURING TRIAL
Filing Date
8/17/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION OF EVIDENCE
Filing Date
8/17/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO A.R.Crim.P 201(d)
DEFENDANT REQUESTS THIS
COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE
OF THE DEFINITION OF THE
WORDS SHALL –and- IS
Filing Date
8/16/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL CHANGE OF VENUE
Filing Date
8/15/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL CHANGE OF VENUE
Filing Date
8/15/2011
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY
Filing Date
8/15/2011
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY DEFENDANT’S PETITION FOR AN
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY
THIS COURT HAS NOT CHANGED
VENUE AS REQUIRED BY
ARIZONA LAW
Filing Date
8/14/2011
Description
PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY PETITION DEFENDANTS/ WHY THIS MATTER HAS NOT BEEN DISMISSED AS REQUIRED BY ARIZONA LAW
Filing Date
8/14/2011
Description
PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY/WHY THE PROSECUTOR HAS NOT BEEN SANCTIONED FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT
Filing Date
8/8/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / THIS COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE SIMILARITIES BETWEEN EVENTS IN THIS MATTER AND THE WIKIPEDIA DEFINITION OF KANGAROO COURT &/OR TRIAL
Filing Date
8/4/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISMISS FOR THE STATES PURPOSEFUL REFUSAL TO SUPPLY DISCOVERY MATERIALS TIMELY AND OR FIFTH MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
8/4/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ THIS COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE
OF THE MEANING OF EX POST
FACTO AND HOW A.R.S. § 13-419
AFFECTS THIS MATTER
Filing Date
8/4/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
DISMISS FOR THE STATE’S
PURPOSEFUL REFUSAL TO
SUPPLY DISCOVERY MATERIALS
TIMELY –and/or- FIFTH MOTION
FOR DISCOVERY.
Filing Date
8/3/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ORDER MC OPDS TO PAY FOR DEFENDNTS NECESSARY EXPENSES
Filing Date
8/3/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL CHANGE OF VENUE
Filing Date
8/3/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION T ORDER MC-OPDS TO PAY FOR DEFENDANTS NECESSARY EXPENSES
Filing Date
8/2/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL/ OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/2/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT’S
EMERGENCY MOTION TO DIMISS PURSUANT TO THE LEGISLATIVE
INTENT OF: A.R.S. §§ 13-419 AND
13-418
Filing Date
8/2/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
8/1/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RETRACT
TESTIMONY AGAINST SHERIFF
JOE ARPAIO IN USDC –and-
THEREFORE ALLOW THE STATE
TO DISMISS THIS CASE WITH
PREJUDICE
Filing Date
8/1/2011
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY/ FOR OMNIBUS HEARING AND ORAL ARGUMENT
Filing Date
7/27/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S PURPOSEFUL REFUSAL
TO SUPPLY DISCOVERY
MATERIALS TIMELY –and/or-
FIFTH MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
7/27/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ORDER MC-OPDS TO PAY FOR DEFENDANT’S
NECESSARY SERVICES
Filing Date
7/26/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS PLEADING ENTITLED: DOCUMENT TO BE ENTERED AS EVIDENCE
Filing Date
7/26/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Filing Date
7/25/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY
Filing Date
7/18/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS PLEADING ENTITLED DOCUMENT TO BE ENTERED AS EVIDENCE FOR JURORS TO READ AND PRESS RELEASE
Filing Date
7/18/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Filing Date
7/18/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ALL PARTIES AGREEMENT DEFENDANT BELIEVES HE CANNOT RECEIVE A FAIR TRIAL
Filing Date
7/18/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS / THAT DEFENDANT WILL BE OUT OF THE STATE FROM 07/19/11 UNTIL 07/23/11
Filing Date
7/15/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ALLOW OUT OF STATE TRAVEL
Filing Date
7/15/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ALLOW OUT OF STATE TRAVEL
Filing Date
7/14/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS JUDICIAL NOTICE
Filing Date
7/14/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CLAIM AND EXERCISE
CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS , etc.
Filing Date
7/14/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO DEMAND THIS COURT READ
ALL PLEADINGS, etc.
Filing Date
7/14/2011
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR THIS COURT TO
TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE
STATE AGENTS’ CONSPIRACY TO
DESTROY EXCULPATORY
EVIDNECE
Filing Date
7/13/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST
THIS COURT TAKE JUDICIAL
NOTICE OF PROSECUTOR
CHARBEL’S PERJURY, etc.
Filing Date
7/13/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CLAIM AND EXERCISE
CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS AND
REQUIRE THE PRESIDING JUDGE
TO RULE UPON THIS MOTION, and
ALL PUBLIC OFFICERS OF THIS
COURT TO UPHOLD SAID RIGHTS
Filing Date
7/13/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS JUDICIAL NOTICE
Filing Date
7/13/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEMAND THIS COURT READ ALL PLEADINGS DEFENDANT FILES WITH THIS COURT AND ADHERE ONLY TO CONSTITUTIONALLY COMPLAINT LAW AND CASE LAW AND MORE PARTICULARLY THE BILL OF RIGHTS IN ITS RULINGS
Filing Date
7/12/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST THIS COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF PROSECUTOR CHARBELS PERJURY DESTRUCTION OF EVIDENCE AND CONFESSION
Filing Date
7/12/2011
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
DIMISS WITH PREJUDICE
PURSUANT TO THE DOUBLE
JEOPARDY CLAUSES
Filing Date
7/11/2011
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO THE
UNLAWFUL RULINGS IN JUDGE
DAVIS’ ORDER / MINUTE ENTRY
DATED JULY 7, 2011
Filing Date
7/11/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ALLOW OUT OF STATE TRAVEL TO DO REPAIRS AND MAINTENANCE ON THE REAL PROPERTY USED FOR BOND
Filing Date
7/11/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND APPROPRIATE ACTION BY THIS COURT AGAINST THE STATE FOR DISCOVERY VIOLATIONS
Filing Date
7/11/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO HAVE THIS COURT ORDER THE STATE TO ISSUE A COUNT ON AND FOR THE RECORD
Filing Date
7/11/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISMISS FOR VIOLATION OF: ARIZONA CONSTITUTION ARTICLE 6 SECTION 25
Filing Date
7/11/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL THIS COURT TO RULE IN FAVOR OF DEFENDNATS PLEADINGS THE STATE HAS FAILED TO RESPONDED TO TIMELY
Filing Date
7/11/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL THIS COURT TO RULE IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS PLEADINGS THE STATE HAS FAILED TO RESPONDED TO TIMELY
Filing Date
7/7/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DOCUMENT TO BE ENTERED AS EVIDENCE FOR THE JURORS TO READ AND PRESS RELEASE
Filing Date
7/5/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO THE DOUBLE JEOPARDY
CLAUSES OF THE STATE AND
FEDERAL CONSTITUTIONS
Filing Date
7/1/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO THE STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR MALICIOUS PROSECUTION
Filing Date
7/1/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO THE STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS OFFER OF PROOF OF CONSPIRACY TO COMMITT MURDER
Filing Date
7/1/2011
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LAW
Filing Date
6/30/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT’S OFFER
OF PROOF OF CONSPIRACY TO
COMMITT MURDER
Filing Date
6/29/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEMAND THIS COURT
READ ALL PLEADINGS DEFENDANT
FILES WITH THIS COURT, AND ADHERE
ONLY TO CONSTITUTIONALLY
COMPLIANT LAW AND CASE LAW, AND
MORE PARTICULARLY, THE BILL OF
RIGHTS, IN ITS RULINGS
Filing Date
6/29/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CLAIM AND EXERCISE
CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS and
REQUIRE THE PRESIDING JUDGE TO
RULE UPON THIS MOTION, and ALL
PUBLIC OFFICERS OF THIS COURT TO
UPHOLD SAID RIGHTS
Filing Date
6/29/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
68 Judicial Notice
Filing Date
6/29/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DIMISS FOR MALICIOUS PROSECUTION
Filing Date
6/28/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE/REPLY OT THE STATES RESPONSES 920300, 920302, 920303 AND DUE PROCESS LAW AND THIS COURTS PREVIOUS RULING
Filing Date
6/28/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIS COURT TAKE JUDICAL NOTICE OF PROSECUTOR CHARBELS PERJURY, DESTRUCTION OF EVIDENCE AND CONFESSION
Filing Date
6/27/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO HAVE THIS COURT ORDER THE STATE TO ISSUE A COUNT ON AND FOR THE RECORD
Filing Date
6/27/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISMISS DUE DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE
16.1 (c); DUE PROCESS;
DEFENDANT’S SUBSTANTIVE RIGHTS;
and LACK OF CONTROVERSY
Filing Date
6/27/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL THIS COURT TO RULE PURSUANT TO ARIZONA LAW and
ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL
PROCEDURES and PRECEDENTS
Filing Date
6/27/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONPEL THE STATE
Filing Date
6/27/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR VIOLATION OF ARIZONA CONSTITUTION ARTICLE 6-25
Filing Date
6/27/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL THIS COURT TO RULE IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS PLEADINGS THE STATE HAS FAILED TO RESPOND TO TIMELY
Filing Date
6/23/2011
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO THE
DOUBLE JEOPARDY CLAUSES OF
THE STATE AND FEDERAL
CONSTITUTIONS
Filing Date
6/18/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFER OF PROOF OF CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT MURDER
Filing Date
6/17/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISMISS FOR MALICIOUS PROSECUTION
Filing Date
6/14/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE THE STATE FROM PRESENTING ANY AND ALL THEORIES THAT WOULD HAVE BEEN DISPROVEN BY THE MISSING EVIDENCE
Filing Date
6/13/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CRIMINAL COMPLAINT FILED AGAINST CARLA BARTSCHI
Filing Date
6/13/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CRIMINAL COMPLAINT FILED AGAINST PAUL DALTON
Filing Date
6/8/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ THIS COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE
Filing Date
6/8/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF APPEALABLE ISSUES
-and- FUNDAMENTAL – HARMFUL -
REVERSIBLE ERRORS
Filing Date
6/8/2011
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY/ FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN
ARREST WARRANT FOR
PROSECUTION WITNESS
CARLA BARTSCHI FOR
WITNESS TAMPERING
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT/ AS A MATTER OF RIGHT BY RIGHT
–and- COMPELS THIS COURT TO
ISSUE A FINDING OF FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEMAND AS A MATTER OF RIGHT BY RIGHT A CHANGE OF VENUE
Filing Date
6/6/2011
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT/ AS A
MATTER OF RIGHT BY RIGHT
–and- COMPELS THIS COURT TO
ISSUE A FINDING OF FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
6/6/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO THE STATES UNTIMELY RESPONSE DOCKET ID #897900
Filing Date
6/6/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO THE STATES UNTIMELY RESPONSE DOCKET ID #897901
Filing Date
6/6/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO THE STATES UNTIMELY RESPONSE DOCKET ID #897902
Filing Date
6/6/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO THE STATES UNTIMELY RESPONSE DOCKET ID #897903
Filing Date
6/6/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO THE STATES UNTIMELY RESPONSE DOCKET ID #897904
Filing Date
6/6/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO THE STATES UNTIMELY RESPONSE DOCKET ID #897905
Filing Date
6/6/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO THE STATES UNTIMELY RESPONSE DOCKET ID #897899
Filing Date
6/6/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO THE STATES NOTICE DOCKET ID #897906
Filing Date
6/6/2011
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FILING ID 899975 - DEFENDANT DEMANDS AS A MATTER OF RIGHT BY RIGHT and COMPELS THIS COURT TO ISSUE A FINDING OF FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO THE STATES RESPONSES ID #S 897899 THROUGH 897906
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE BOOK AND LETTERS WRITTEN BY DEFENDANT
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE
TO STATE’S MOTIONS TO PRECLUDE
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ENTITLED “DEFENDANT DENIES THIS
COURT HAS JURISDICTION IN
AND/OR OF THIS MATTER
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO BAR CARLA BARTSCHI
FROM THE COURT AND PROTECT
DEFENDANT FROM THE STATE’S
WITNESS
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT’S
REQUEST FOR CLARIFICSTION OF
JUDGE DAVIS’ RULING;
CLARIFICATION MUST BE
INCLUSIVE OF FINDINGS OF
FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW.
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE AND STRIKE EVERYTHING OBTAINED FROM CARLA BARTSCHI
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO
STATE’S CLAIMS IN OPEN COURT ON
APRIL 13, 2011.
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT STATES COUNSEL WILL BE OUT OF THE
STATE AND OUT OF THE COUNTRY FROM June 8, 2011 UNTIL JUNE 23, 2011.
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT’S RULLING IS VOID:
THIS COURT’S MAY 31, 2011
RULING VIOLATES DEFEDNAT’S
DUE PROCESS AND HAS NO
BASES IN LAW
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL THIS
COURT TO ISSUE A FINDING OF
FACTS AND CONCLUSION OF
LAW FOR THIS COURT’S MAY 31,
2011 RULING
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ABRIDGED LIST OF VIOLATIONS
THE STATE HAS CONFESSED TO
BY TACIT ACQUUIESCENCE TO
DEFENDANT’S ALLEGATIONS
Filing Date
6/3/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL:
DISCOVERY --and- APPROPRIATE
ACTION BY THIS COURT
AGAINST THE STATE FOR
DISCOVERY VIOLATIONS
Filing Date
6/1/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT DEMANDS AS A MATTER OF RIGHT –and- COMPELS THIS COURT TO: DISMISS THIS CASE WITH
PREJUDICE FORTHWITH
Filing Date
5/31/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
LAWFUL/ OF FRAUD UPON THE COURT BY THE STATE AND THE COURT
Filing Date
5/31/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO THE
LEGISLATIVE INTENT OF
A.R.S. §§ 13-418 AND 13-419
Filing Date
5/30/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS CASE AND ANY FUTURE APPEAL
Filing Date
5/30/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUDICIAL/ OF AJUDICATED FACTS
PURSUANT TO: THE STATE’S &
THIS COURT’S ACQUIESCENCE
& ARIZONA LAW
Filing Date
5/27/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REVERSE ORDER AND DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/27/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND DEMAND; JURISDICTION IS NEVER PRESUMED
Filing Date
5/25/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT NOVES THIS COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL / AND LAWFULLY NOTICES THIS COURT FOR THIS CASE AND ANY FUTURE APPEAL
Filing Date
5/25/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPELS AND/OR REQUESTS ALL ATTORNEYS OF THE SUPERIOR COURT TO PRESENT THESE ALLEGATIONS TO A FEDERAL GRAND JURY
Filing Date
5/24/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COMMANDS THIS COURT / THIS CASE WITH PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF CONTROVERSY DUE TO STATES AGREEMENT WITH DEFENDANT
Filing Date
5/23/2011
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2011
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURTS FALSE CLAIM DEFENDANT WAIVED RIGHT TO COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/23/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT COMPELS THIS COURT ISSUE AN ORDER DISMISSING THIS CASE WITH PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION
Filing Date
5/21/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL THE STATE
Filing Date
5/21/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL THIS COURT
Filing Date
5/20/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND APPROPRIATE ACTION BY THIS COURT FOR DISCOVERY VIOLATIONS BY THE STATE
Filing Date
5/20/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL THIS COURT TO RULE PURSUANT TO ARIZONA LAWS AND ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCESURES AND PRECEDENTS
Filing Date
5/18/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/17/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ TO STRIKE THE STATES MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
5/16/2011
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2011
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DECLINNING JURISDICTION
Filing Date
5/13/2011
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR THE ISSUANCE OF
AN ARREST WARRANT FOR
FELONIOUS ACTS KNOWN BY
THIS COURT
Filing Date
5/13/2011
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND INSISTANCE PURSUANT TO ASHWANDER AND OTHERS -and- DEFENDANT’S INVOCATION OF ESTOPPELS
Filing Date
5/13/2011
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES/ TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS PRO PER MOTIONS
Filing Date
5/12/2011
Description
PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE NOT DISMISSED
Filing Date
5/9/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF INCORRECT ADDRESS USED BY COURT
Filing Date
5/9/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED/ AND LAWFUL NOTICE
THIS COURT TAKE JUDICIAL
NOTICE FOR THIS CASE AND
ANY FUTURE APPEAL
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Compell Discovery and Disclosure
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND LAWFUL NOTICE THIS COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS CASE AND ANY FUTURE APPEAL
Filing Date
5/5/2011
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY / TO BAR CARLA BARTSCI FROM THE COURT AND PROTECT DEFENDANT FROM THE STATE'S WITNESS
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR THE STATE'S PATTERN OF OUTRAGEOUS AND PERVASIVE MISCONDUCT WHITH HAVE DEPRIVED DEFENDANT OF DUE PROCESS & SUBSTANTIVE RIGHTS
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MTD Brady material
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CONTINUOUS DEPRIVATION OF DEFENDANT'S SUBSTANTITIVE RIGHTS AND VIOLATIONS OF DUE PROCESS OF LAW
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE BOOK AND LETTERS WRITTEN BY DEFENDANT
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CLARIFICATION OF JUDGE DAVIS'S RULING; CLARIFICATION MUST BE INCLUSIVE OF FINDINGS OF FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE'S MOTOINS TO PRECLUDE ID #815709 AND 815712
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE AND STRIKE EVERYTHING OBTAINED FROM CARLA BARTSCHI
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT DENIES THIS COURT HAS JURSIDICTION IN AND/OR OF THIS MATTER
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND OBJECTIONS TO STATE'S CLAIMS IN OPEN COURT ON 04/13/11
Filing Date
5/4/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY / TO BAR CARLA BARTSCI FROM THE COURT AND PROTECT DEFENDANT FROM WITNESS
Filing Date
5/3/2011
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/21/2011
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATES MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT CHARGES
Filing Date
4/18/2011
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2011
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2011
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/15/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR REMOVAL OF THE MOST RECENT PRO PER FILINGS BY DEFENDANT AND FOR SANCTIONS AND FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT CHARGES
Filing Date
4/15/2011
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE 0F WITNESSES
Filing Date
4/13/2011
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT DENIES THIS COURT HAS JURISDICITION IN AND/OR OF THIS MATTER
Filing Date
4/12/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO STATES MOTION TO PRECLUDE 815709 AND 815712
Filing Date
4/12/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PROCEED SUI JURIS/PRO PER/PRO SE WITH JEFF SWIERSKI AS ADVISORY COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/12/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR CONTINUOUS DEPRIVATION OF DEFENDANT'S SUBSTANTIVE RIGHTS AND VIOLATIONS OF DUE PROCESS OF LAW
Filing Date
4/12/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR CLARIFICATION OF JUDGE DAVIS' RULING; CLARIFICATION MUST BE INCLUSIVE OF FINDING OF FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
4/12/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE BOOK AND LETTERS WRITTEN BY DEFENDANT
Filing Date
4/12/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE AND STRIKE EVERYTHING OBTAINED FROM CARLA BARTSCHI
Filing Date
4/11/2011
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
4/6/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 04/04/11
Filing Date
4/5/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE AND
REMOVE FROM DOCKET EVERY ONE OF
THE DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS AND
PLEADINGS WRITTEN BY HIM UNDER
THE LETTER HEAD OF DEFENSE
COUNSEL JEFF SWIERSKI
Filing Date
4/1/2011
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SPECIAL ACTION
Filing Date
4/1/2011
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SPECIAL ACTION
Filing Date
4/1/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORAL AGRUMENT ON PETITION FOR SPECIAL ACTION
Filing Date
4/1/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR INTERLOCUTORY STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
4/1/2011
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING DATES DIRECTING SERVICE AND FIXING TIME FOR RESPONSE
Filing Date
3/22/2011
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/14/11
Filing Date
3/21/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/17/11
Filing Date
3/21/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/14/11
Filing Date
3/21/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/14/11
Filing Date
3/21/2011
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/14/11
Filing Date
3/18/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR INTERLOCUTORY STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
3/16/2011
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE TO STRIKE AFFIDAVIT AND LETTERS PRESENTED BY CARLA BARTSCHI AND PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF CARLA BARTSCHI
Filing Date
3/14/2011
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/14/2011
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
3/8/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND REVERSE ORDER AND DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/7/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE FROM ASKING ANY WITNESSES ABOUT SPECIFIC INSTANCES OF VICTIM CONDUCT
Filing Date
3/7/2011
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY AND
NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION
BY DR. DAVID HERMOSILLO-ROMO
Filing Date
3/7/2011
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE COLLATERAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/7/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE
DEFENSE FROM ASKING ANY
WITNESSSES ABOUT SPECIFIC
INSTANCES OF VICTIM CONDUCT
Filing Date
3/3/2011
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2011
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/28/2011
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2011
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/24/2011
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/18/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
2/16/2011
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE FOR PURPOSEFUL DEPRIVATION OF DEFENDANTS RIGHTS
Filing Date
2/11/2011
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE FOR PURPOSEFUL DEPRIVATION OF DEFENDANTS RIGHTS
Filing Date
1/31/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE ID 781885 TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
1/31/2011
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE ID 781886 TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
1/25/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISMISS
Filing Date
1/25/2011
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE FOR PROSECUTORIAL AND POLICE MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
1/24/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2011
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2011
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DIRECTING THE MEDICAL EXAMINER TO RELEASE A SAMPLE OF THOMAS BEASLEY'S BLOOD TO CHROMOSOMAL LABORATORIES
Filing Date
1/20/2011
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT EXPERT ERIK BROWN SHALL RELEASE THE BLACK NYLON HOLSTER DIRECTLY TO CHROMOSOMAL LABORATORIES, INC.
Filing Date
1/12/2011
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2011
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2011
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2011
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2011
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RELEASE EVIDENCE DIRECTLY FROM EXPERT TO CHROMOSOMAL LABORATORIES, INC.
Filing Date
1/6/2011
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RELEASE OF BLOOD FOR TESTING
Filing Date
1/3/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO A.R.CRIM.P. RULE 16.1(b) (c)
Filing Date
1/3/2011
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
12/27/2010
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE FOR PROSECUTORIAL AND POLICE MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
12/20/2010
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES PLEADING TO ASSERT VICTIMS RIGHTS
Filing Date
12/20/2010
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE COLLATERAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/15/2010
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
11/15/2010
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION OF EVIDENCE
Filing Date
10/22/2010
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2010
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
9/30/2010
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
9/24/2010
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2010
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
9/9/2010
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2010
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/3/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2010
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2010
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2010
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2010
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REMOVED FILINGS FROM THE COURT RECORD
Filing Date
8/18/2010
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ALLOW TRAVEL FOR TESTING
Filing Date
8/2/2010
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF
Filing Date
7/22/2010
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2010
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
7/13/2010
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
7/13/2010
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
6/30/2010
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2010
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
6/17/2010
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND THE LAST DAY AND CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
6/9/2010
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
6/3/2010
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
5/19/2010
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2010
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
4/9/2010
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2010
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
2 VOL
Filing Date
4/2/2010
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2010
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2010
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2010
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
2 VOL
Filing Date
3/24/2010
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
3/23/2010
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE RESPONSE TO STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO RETURN PREVIOUSLY REMOVED FILINGS TO THE COURT RECORD
Filing Date
3/22/2010
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO RETURN PREVIOUSLY REMOVED FILING TO THE COURT RECORD
Filing Date
3/16/2010
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RETURN PREVIOUSLY REMOVED FILINGS TO THE COURT RECORD
Filing Date
3/5/2010
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2010
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2010
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ALLOW OUT OF STATE TRAVEL FOR EDUCATION IN LAW AND COURT PROCEDURE
Filing Date
2/26/2010
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ALLOW OUT OF STATE TRAVEL FOR EDUCATION IN LAW AND COURT PROCEDURES
Filing Date
2/26/2010
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISMISSING SPECIAL ACTION
Filing Date
2/26/2010
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2010
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2010
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/17/2010
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
2/10/2010
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/10/2010
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/9/2010
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2010
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2010
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2010
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2010
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR SPECIAL ACTION
Filing Date
1/19/2010
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplement to motion for withdrawal of counsel
Filing Date
1/15/2010
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND MOTION TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TO PROCEED PRO SE
Filing Date
1/11/2010
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion in Limine political ideology
Filing Date
1/8/2010
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2010
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/16/2009
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2009
Description
123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2009
Description
SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2009
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2009
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL / OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/4/2009
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MEMORIALIZATION OF PRIVATE SERVICE AGREEMENTS WITH DR. PARKER DATED 10/20/09 AND DR. SINDELEAR DATED 10/22/09
Filing Date
10/20/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CONDITIONAL ACCEPTANCE
Filing Date
10/9/2009
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2009
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2009
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2009
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Notice of Witnesses
Filing Date
9/23/2009
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2009
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO SHOW CAUSE
Filing Date
9/21/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CONDITIONAL ACCEPTANCE RULE 11 / OF APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
9/18/2009
Description
122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2009
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2009
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
9/8/2009
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
GREEMENT TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE CASE CR2008-106594-001 AND ALL RELATED CHARGES THEREWITH
Filing Date
9/8/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CONDITIONAL ACCEPTANCE TO RULE 11 ORDER GRANTING FULL RULE 11 EVALUATION
Filing Date
9/4/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CONDITIONAL ACCEPTANCE OF HEARING DATED SEPTEMBER 4, 2009
Filing Date
9/4/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CONDITIONAL ACCEPTANCE OF HEARING DATED SEPTEMBER 4, 2009
Filing Date
9/4/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CONDITIONAL ACCEPTANCE OF HEARING DATED 09/04/09
Filing Date
8/27/2009
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Request for Physical Examination of Evidence
Filing Date
8/26/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF FAULT OPPORTUNITY TO CURE
Filing Date
8/19/2009
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
for physical examination of evidence
Filing Date
8/12/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CONSTRUCTIVE NOTIC OF CONDITIONAL ACCEPTANCE AND COMMERCIAL AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
8/5/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF CONDITIONAL ACCEPTANCE OF INDICTMENT
Filing Date
7/21/2009
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2009
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF CONTACT INFORMATION
Filing Date
7/9/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF CONDITIONAL ACCEPTANCE OF OFFER OF SERVICES OF MR. JOHN JOHNSON
Filing Date
7/8/2009
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
7/6/2009
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR ABATEMENT OF PROCEEDING PENDING AN ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDING TO SETTLE THE MATTER BEFORE THE COURT
Filing Date
6/15/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/15/09
Filing Date
5/21/2009
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2009
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
DIRECTING MARICOPA COUNTY MEDICAL EXAMINER TO RELEASE A SAMPLE OF THOMAS BEASLEY'S URINE AND/OR BLOOD SUFFICIENT FOR DRUG TESTING TO NMS LABS
Filing Date
5/20/2009
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2009
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2009
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
for entry of discovery order
Filing Date
2/18/2009
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2009
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2009
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2009
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2009
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ALLOW FILING OF SEALED MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
1/27/2009
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE LAW OFFICES OF DAVID MICHAEL CONTOR AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD
Filing Date
1/27/2009
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING DOCUMENT TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/23/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ALLOW FILING OF SEALED MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
1/23/2009
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#8, MOTION TO PRECLUDE ADMISSION/REFERENCE TO FELONY STOP
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#14, MOTION TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO/ARGUMENT /INSTRUCTION REGARDING "FLIGHT" FROM SCENE
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#13, MOTION TO PRECLUDE ARGUMENT REGARDING FIGHTING WORDS
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#12, MOTION TO PRECLUDE AGRUEMENT REGARDING LEGISLATIVE INTENT
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#11, MOTION TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO MR BEASLEY AS THE VICTIM OF A CRIME
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#9, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PRRSERVE
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Discovery Deadline
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRE-TRIAL MOTIONS DEADLINE
Filing Date
1/13/2009
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2009
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / DIRECTING THE PHOENIX PD TO RELEASE THE EVIDENTIARY ITEMS LISTED BELOW TO THE DEFENSE EXPERT
Filing Date
1/7/2009
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED/ FOR ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER
Filing Date
12/19/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2008
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCOVERY DEADLINE
Filing Date
12/10/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2008
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $184,000 SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY INC
Filing Date
12/2/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL / OF EXHIBITS
Filing Date
12/2/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RELEASE OF PROPERTY BOND
Filing Date
11/24/2008
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
2 VOL
Filing Date
11/20/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2008
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DENIAL OF MOTION TO PRESERVE/PREVENT TAINT
Filing Date
11/13/2008
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2008
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN LIMINE #3 MOTION TO SUPPRESS PRECLUDE OTHER ACT EVIDENCE ACQUIRED DURING SEARCH OF FJ CRUISER
Filing Date
11/13/2008
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN LIMINE #2 MOTION TO SUPRRESS SEARCH OF RESIDENCE
Filing Date
11/13/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY / FOR EXPEDITED RULING OR HEARING ON MOTION TO PRESERVE/PREVENT TAINT
Filing Date
11/13/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: GRAND JURY REMAND
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN LIMINE #4 MOTION TO PRECLUDE ADMISSION REFERENCE TO MONEY FOUND DURING SEARCH INCIDENT TO ARREST
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN LIMINE #1 MOTION TO SUPPRESS PRECLUDE RESULTS OF SEARCH OF GOLD JAGUAR
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN LIMINE #7 MOTION TO PRECLUDE IDENTIFICATION AND REQUEST FOR A DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
11/10/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE/PREVENT TAINT
Filing Date
11/7/2008
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES MOTION TO STRIKE NOTICE OF POSTING OF PROPERTY BOND IN LIEU OF SURETY OR CASH BOND
Filing Date
11/7/2008
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
11/5/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE DEFENDANT NOTICE OF POSTING OF PROPERTY BOND IN LIEU OF SURETY OR CASH BOND
Filing Date
11/3/2008
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2008
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
to dismiss or in the alternative remand to the grand jury for redetermination of probable cause
Filing Date
10/31/2008
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF 10/31/08, ORAL ARGUMENT: REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL MOTIONS DEADLINE
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
to States Response to Motion to Continue Grand Jury Remand argument
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
#1 AND MOTION TO SUPPRESS/PRECLUDE RESULTS OF SEARCH OF GOLD JAGUAR
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
#2, MOTION TO SUPPRESS SEARCH OF RESIDENCE
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
#3, MOTION TO SUPPRESS/PRECLUDE OTHER ACT EVIDENCE ACQUIRED DURING SEARCH OF FJ CRUISER
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
#4, MOTION TO PRECLUDE ADMISSION/REFERENCE TO MONEY FOUND FURING SEARCH INCIDENT TO ARREST
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
#7, MOTION TO PRECLUDE IDENTIFICATION
Filing Date
10/28/2008
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2008
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRE-TRIAL MOTIONS DEADLINE
Filing Date
10/28/2008
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CONTINUANCE OF OCTOBER 31, 2008, ORAL ARGUMENT REGARDING REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
10/24/2008
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DIRECTING THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT TO RELEASE THE EVIDENTIARY ITEMS LISTED BELOW TO THE DEFENSE EXPERT ERIK BROWN
Filing Date
10/16/2008
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER
Filing Date
10/3/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2008
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2008
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2008
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPOINT INVESTIGARTOR
Filing Date
9/16/2008
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2008
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT
Filing Date
9/8/2008
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE
Filing Date
9/8/2008
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
9/8/2008
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2008
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
9/5/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
8/27/2008
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE MOTION FOR REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR REDTERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
8/27/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
8/21/2008
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2008
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ORDER
Filing Date
8/15/2008
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ORDER
Filing Date
8/15/2008
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ORDER
Filing Date
8/6/2008
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2008
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ORDER
Filing Date
8/5/2008
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ORDER
Filing Date
8/5/2008
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2008
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2008
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2008
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
7/29/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPOINT INVESTIGATOR
Filing Date
7/28/2008
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PROCEED AS INDIGENT
Filing Date
7/25/2008
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2008
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 7/22/08
Filing Date
7/22/2008
Description
612 - ME: Gj Quash Summons/Issue Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2008
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 7/15/08
Filing Date
7/11/2008
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
REMAND
Filing Date
7/11/2008
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2008
Description
065 - ME: Order Exonerating Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2008
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASING SURETY BOND
Filing Date
6/9/2008
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2008
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CHANGE OF JUDGE FOR CAUSE
Filing Date
5/14/2008
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL / FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
5/13/2008
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2008
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2008
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2008
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2008
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2008
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2008
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2008
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2008
Description
AEB - Affidavit for Exoneration of Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2008
Description
AEB - Affidavit for Exoneration of Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2008
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
4/22/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPLEMENT MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY
Filing Date
4/22/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPLEMENT MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY
Filing Date
4/17/2008
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
4/14/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL
Filing Date
4/10/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL
Filing Date
4/9/2008
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT
Filing Date
4/9/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
4/7/2008
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL / FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/7/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION
Filing Date
4/7/2008
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR A REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
4/1/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
3/28/2008
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2008
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPERSEDE AND RETIRE ALL PREVIOUS BONDS AND RELEASE REAL PARTY IN INTEREST 3RD PARTY INTERVENER
Filing Date
3/26/2008
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO SUPERSEDE AND RETIRE ALL PREVIOUS BONDS AND RELEASE REAL PARTY IN INTEREST 3RD PARTY INTERVENER
Filing Date
3/24/2008
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2008
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE A MOTION FOR REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY
Filing Date
3/21/2008
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
$46,000 PAID TO CYNTHIA CONRELL
Filing Date
3/20/2008
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2008
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE MOTION FOR REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
3/19/2008
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2008
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $184,000 AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY
Filing Date
3/18/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2008
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2008
Description
MEB - Motion to Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2008
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING
Filing Date
3/11/2008
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPERVISED RELEASE BOND $230,000 3-11-08
Filing Date
3/11/2008
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2008
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING VICTIM TESTIMONY AT HEARING ON MOTION TO RECONSIDER BOND AMOUNT AND DETERMINE SOURCE OF BOND MONEY
Filing Date
3/6/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/5/2008
Description
ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/5/2008
Description
ADN - Allegation of Dangerous Nature Felony - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/5/2008
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/4/2008
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASE OF LEVY RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM LEVY
Filing Date
2/29/2008
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S HEARING/
Filing Date
2/29/2008
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/29/2008
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/29/2008
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2008
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2008
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2008
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2008
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2008
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO RECONSIDER BOND AMOUNT AND DETERMINE SOURCE OF BOND MONEY
Filing Date
2/19/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2008
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $46,000 FINANCIAL CASUALTY & SURETY INC
Filing Date
2/14/2008
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2008
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPERVISED RELEASE; SECURED APPEARANCE BOND $46,000 02/13/08
Filing Date
2/13/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DETERMINE SOURCE OF BOND MONEY
Filing Date
2/13/2008
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS BOND AMOUNT
Filing Date
2/12/2008
Description
PSO - Pretrial Services Order Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WARRANT ISSUED
Filing Date
2/11/2008
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2008
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/11/2008
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2008
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2008
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASH BAIL RECEIPT $46,000
Filing Date
2/8/2008
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
$46,000
Filing Date
2/7/2008
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2008
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
VACATE
Filing Date
2/1/2008
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2008
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2008
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/6/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/11/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/13/2008
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/19/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/20/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/20/2008
Time
10:00
Event
Initial Appearance/Prelim Hrg
Date
2/20/2008
Time
10:5
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/25/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/3/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/11/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/20/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/26/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/25/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/30/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/16/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/19/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/23/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/30/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/12/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
10/1/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/31/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/10/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/24/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
12/1/2008
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/30/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/19/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/20/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/20/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
2/25/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/3/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
3/9/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/11/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
7/13/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
7/20/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/4/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/14/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/9/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
10/15/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/29/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
11/16/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/3/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
12/9/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
12/14/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
12/14/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
1/25/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/1/2010
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/26/2010
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/29/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/14/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/28/2010
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/29/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/6/2010
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/20/2010
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/30/2010
Time
8:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/20/2010
Time
8:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/2/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/8/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/21/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/21/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/28/2010
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/13/2010
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/20/2010
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/4/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/18/2011
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/4/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/18/2011
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/23/2011
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/14/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/18/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/21/2011
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/13/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/20/2011
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/3/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/6/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/6/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/16/2011
Time
15:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/19/2011
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/19/2011
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/20/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/21/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/22/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/26/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/27/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/28/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/29/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/4/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/5/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/6/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/17/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/18/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/19/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/20/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/21/2011
Time
15:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/24/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/25/2011
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/26/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/27/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/31/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/1/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/2/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/3/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/4/2011
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/7/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/8/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/9/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/14/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/15/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/16/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/17/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/18/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/16/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/12/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/26/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/30/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/10/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/15/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/17/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/13/2012
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/23/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/24/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/1/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/31/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/24/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/9/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/29/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/5/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/6/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/6/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/14/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/28/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/15/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/9/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/4/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/4/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/10/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/11/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/12/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/19/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/20/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/21/2013
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/24/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/25/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/1/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/2/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/8/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/9/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/29/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/30/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/31/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/1/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/5/2013
Time
13:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/6/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/7/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/8/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/12/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/13/2013
Time
10:45
Event
Trial
Date
8/14/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/15/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/19/2013
Time
10:15
Event
Trial
Date
8/20/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/21/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/22/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/26/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/27/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/28/2013
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/3/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/24/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
12/13/2013
Time
14:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
12/20/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/3/2014
Time
8:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
2/7/2014
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/20/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/14/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/20/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference