Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Southeast  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Bizzozero, Gregory      
Robert Hank Van Brakel - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Barber, Bretton   Master Calendar  CR2008-031157-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Robert Hank Van Brakel  13-1103 (F2)  MANSLAUGHTER  12/28/2007  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  3/24/2010 
Robert Hank Van Brakel  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  12/28/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  5/18/2010 
Robert Hank Van Brakel  28-1381 (M1)  DUI-LIQUOR/DRUGS/VAPORS/COMBO  12/28/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  5/18/2010 
Robert Hank Van Brakel  28-1381 (M1)  DUI-LIQUOR/DRUGS/VAPORS/COMBO  12/28/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  5/18/2010 
Travis Jordon Aronica  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  12/28/2007  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  3/24/2010 
Travis Jordon Aronica  13-1201 (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  12/28/2007  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  3/24/2010 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
6/26/2017  OSJ - Order re: Setting Aside Judgment of Guilt - Party (002)  6/26/2017   
NOTE: GRANTED CIVIL RIGHTS/GRANTED GUN RIGHTS 
5/24/2017  CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (002)  5/24/2017   
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet 
5/4/2017  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  5/4/2017   
5/1/2017  ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (002)  5/2/2017   
NOTE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE THE JUDGMENT OF GUILT AND TO RESTORE ALL CIVIL RIGHTS, INCLUDING THE RIGHT TO BEAR ARMS 
4/7/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)  4/7/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
7/8/2016  DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet - Party (001)  7/11/2016   
12/17/2015  LED - 2.8 (d) Letter - Party (001)  12/18/2015   
4/20/2012  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (002)  4/26/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
4/20/2012  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (002)  4/26/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 2 
4/20/2012  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (002)  4/27/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
3/13/2012  ORD - Order - Party (002)  3/19/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 2/GRANTING PETITION FOR EARNED TIME CREDIT EFFECTIVE 03/12/12 
3/13/2012  ORD - Order - Party (002)  3/20/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 1/GRANTING PETITION FOR EARNED TIME CREDIT EFFECTIVE 03/12/12 
3/1/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)  3/1/2012   
2/23/2012  LET - Letter - Party (002)  2/28/2012   
2/23/2012  LET - Letter - Party (002)  2/28/2012   
2/23/2012  LET - Letter - Party (002)  2/28/2012   
2/23/2012  LET - Letter - Party (002)  2/28/2012   
2/23/2012  LET - Letter - Party (002)  2/28/2012   
2/23/2012  LET - Letter - Party (002)  2/28/2012   
2/23/2012  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (002)  2/27/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 1/ DENIED 
2/23/2012  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (002)  2/27/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 2 / DENIED 
1/13/2012  PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (002)  1/18/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
1/13/2012  PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (002)  1/18/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 2 
9/22/2011  571 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (no Monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)  9/22/2011   
9/22/2011  DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)  9/23/2011   
9/16/2011  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  9/27/2011   
9/16/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/23/2011   
NOTE: RE: SENTENCING DOCUMENTATION 
9/16/2011  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  9/22/2011   
9/16/2011  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  9/26/2011   
9/13/2011  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  9/13/2011   
NOTE: Sentencing memorandum 
9/12/2011  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  9/13/2011   
NOTE: States Submittal of Sentencing Documentation 
9/8/2011  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  9/12/2011   
9/1/2011  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  9/1/2011   
8/30/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/31/2011   
NOTE: TO VACATE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 
8/22/2011  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  8/22/2011   
8/11/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  8/12/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Continue Re-Sentencing Hearing 
8/1/2011  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  8/1/2011   
7/27/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  7/27/2011   
7/27/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/29/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS REVOCATION OF WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR TRANSPORT 
7/25/2011  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  7/25/2011   
7/25/2011  086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)  7/25/2011   
7/13/2011  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)  7/13/2011   
7/8/2011  WAV - Waiver - Party (001)  7/14/2011   
NOTE: OF PRESENCE AND REQUEST THAT HE NOT BE TRANSPORTED 
7/1/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  7/1/2011   
6/15/2011  597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001)  6/15/2011   
6/9/2011  REL - Reply - Party (001)  6/9/2011   
NOTE: Petitioners Reply Re: Petition for Post Conviction Relief 
5/25/2011  RPP - Response to Petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  5/25/2011   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF 
4/12/2011  197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)  4/12/2011   
4/12/2011  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  4/12/2011   
4/5/2011  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  4/5/2011   
NOTE: Motion for Temporary Removal of Official Court Files, Transcripts, or Exhibits and Order 
3/31/2011  PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  4/5/2011   
2/1/2011  197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)  2/1/2011   
1/24/2011  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (002)  1/26/2011   
NOTE: 5-18-10 SALLY STEARMAN 
1/12/2011  PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (001)  1/13/2011   
NOTE: 03/24/10 SALLY STEARMAN 
1/12/2011  PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (001)  1/13/2011   
NOTE: 05/18/10 SALLY STEARMAN 
12/2/2010  197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)  12/2/2010   
9/15/2010  REQ - Request - Party (001)  9/15/2010   
NOTE: Request for Transcript Preparation 
8/25/2010  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  8/25/2010   
8/9/2010  REQ - Request - Party (001)  8/10/2010   
NOTE: STATES / TO TRANSFER RULE 32 MATTERS TO THE PINAL COUNTY ATTORNEY 
7/16/2010  595 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: plea - Party (001)  7/16/2010   
7/16/2010  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  7/22/2010   
7/13/2010  NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  7/14/2010  Defendant (2)  
7/1/2010  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)  7/1/2010   
6/24/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  6/29/2010   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION RE: INCARCERATION REVIEW HEARING 
6/23/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  6/25/2010   
NOTE: FOR CLARIFICATION RE: INCARCERATION REVIEW HEARING 
6/9/2010  ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)  6/10/2010   
6/9/2010  ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (002)  6/10/2010   
6/7/2010  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  6/9/2010   
5/25/2010  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (002)  5/25/2010   
5/25/2010  571 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (no Monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)  5/25/2010   
5/24/2010  NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)  5/28/2010   
NOTE: $25,000 PAID TO MELISSA VAN BRAKEL 
5/18/2010  LET - Letter - Party (002)  6/1/2010   
5/18/2010  LET - Letter - Party (001)  6/1/2010   
5/18/2010  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)  5/28/2010   
5/18/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/19/2010   
NOTE: OF OBJECTIONS TO CONTINE OF PRESENTENCE REPORT 
5/18/2010  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  5/27/2010   
5/18/2010  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  5/27/2010   
5/18/2010  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)  5/26/2010   
5/18/2010  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  5/26/2010   
5/18/2010  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)  5/20/2010   
5/18/2010  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (002)  5/21/2010   
5/18/2010  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)  5/21/2010   
5/17/2010  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  5/20/2010   
4/28/2010  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  4/28/2010   
4/27/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  4/28/2010   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS 
4/21/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/23/2010   
NOTE: TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS 
3/30/2010  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)  3/30/2010   
3/30/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/31/2010   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE 
3/30/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  3/31/2010   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE 
3/30/2010  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  3/30/2010   
3/24/2010  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  3/29/2010   
3/23/2010  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  3/23/2010   
3/23/2010  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  3/23/2010   
3/23/2010  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)  3/26/2010   
3/18/2010  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  3/22/2010   
NOTE: LETTER 
3/18/2010  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  3/30/2010   
3/18/2010  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)  3/19/2010   
NOTE: SENTENCING LETTER(S) 
3/17/2010  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  3/19/2010   
NOTE: DEFENDANT VAN BRAKEL'S SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE/ 
3/9/2010  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  3/9/2010   
3/9/2010  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  3/9/2010   
3/3/2010  LET - Letter - Party (002)  3/8/2010   
2/4/2010  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  2/4/2010   
1/27/2010  NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (002)  1/29/2010   
1/27/2010  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)  1/27/2010   
1/26/2010  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  1/26/2010   
1/25/2010  088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (002)  1/25/2010   
1/21/2010  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)  1/21/2010   
1/20/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  1/20/2010   
1/20/2010  161 - ME: Guilty Plea Set Aside - Party (002)  1/20/2010   
12/15/2009  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)  4/2/2010   
12/14/2009  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)  4/2/2010   
12/2/2009  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  12/2/2009   
12/2/2009  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  12/2/2009   
11/19/2009  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  11/19/2009   
11/17/2009  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)  11/17/2009   
11/3/2009  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  11/3/2009   
10/30/2009  004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (002)  10/30/2009   
10/29/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  11/3/2009   
NOTE: TO RESET TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING 
10/27/2009  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)  10/27/2009   
10/27/2009  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  10/27/2009   
9/30/2009  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  9/30/2009   
9/30/2009  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (002)  9/30/2009   
9/22/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  9/28/2009   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE 
9/22/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/28/2009   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE 
9/22/2009  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (002)  9/28/2009   
NOTE: AMENDED 
9/22/2009  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  9/28/2009   
NOTE: AMENDED 
9/21/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/24/2009   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE 
9/21/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/24/2009   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE 
9/21/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  9/21/2009   
9/21/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/21/2009   
9/15/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  9/16/2009   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE 
9/15/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/16/2009   
NOTE: OF DICLOSURE 
8/27/2009  REL - Reply - Party (002)  8/31/2009   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL / TO STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SEVER 
8/26/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/1/2009   
NOTE: LIST OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS 
8/26/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  9/1/2009   
NOTE: LIST AGGRAVATING FACTORS 
8/26/2009  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (002)  9/1/2009   
NOTE: AMENDED 
8/26/2009  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  9/1/2009   
NOTE: AMENDED 
8/25/2009  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  8/25/2009   
8/25/2009  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/25/2009   
8/25/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  8/27/2009   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO RESPONSE TO MR. ARONICA'S MOTION TO SEVER 
6/30/2009  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  6/30/2009   
6/30/2009  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  6/30/2009   
6/25/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  6/25/2009   
6/22/2009  ORD - Order - Party (002)  6/25/2009   
NOTE: FOR PERMISSION TO TRAVEL 
6/1/2009  REQ - Request - Party (002)  6/2/2009   
NOTE: TO TRAVEL 
5/14/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/14/2009   
5/14/2009  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  5/14/2009   
5/14/2009  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  5/14/2009   
5/5/2009  REL - Reply - Party (002)  5/7/2009   
NOTE: TO DECEDENT'S NEXT OF KIN'S ATTORNEY'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO RECONSIDER 
5/4/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/5/2009   
NOTE: TO DELAY IMPLEMENTATION OF COURT ORDER FOR NON INVASIVE EXAMINATION OF EVIDENCE 
5/1/2009  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (002)  5/6/2009   
NOTE: MR ARONICAS SUPPLEMENT TO/ 
5/1/2009  RES - Response - Party (002)  5/1/2009   
NOTE: to Defendant Aronicas Motion to Reconsider 
4/30/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/30/2009   
4/27/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/29/2009   
NOTE: TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS TO PERMIT OUT OF STATE TRAVEL 
4/21/2009  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (002)  4/22/2009   
4/15/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  4/15/2009   
4/14/2009  RES - Response - Party (002)  4/15/2009   
NOTE: TO DECEDENT'S NEXT OF KIN'S (SECOND) MOTION FOR EXAMINATION OF VEHICLE 
4/10/2009  RES - Response - Party (002)  4/13/2009   
NOTE: TO MR ARONICA MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS 
3/26/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  3/26/2009   
3/26/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/26/2009   
3/24/2009  RES - Response - Party (001)  3/27/2009   
NOTE: VAN BRAKELS / TO MR. ARONICAS MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS 
3/24/2009  RES - Response - Party (001)  3/27/2009   
NOTE: DEFENDANT VAN BRAKEL'S / TO MOTION TO PERMIT NON INVASIVE EXAMINATION OF EVIDENCE 
3/23/2009  ORD - Order - Party (001)  3/25/2009   
NOTE: GRANTING PERMISSION FOR DR PELES, DR TREPETA, AND MR JAMES TO CONDUCE A NON INVASIVE NON DESTRUCTIVE INSPECTION OF THE VEHICLES 
3/19/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  3/20/2009   
NOTE: to Permit Non Invasive Examination of Evidence 
3/18/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  3/23/2009   
NOTE: TO SEVER DEFENDANTS 
3/17/2009  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  3/17/2009   
3/17/2009  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)  3/17/2009   
3/11/2009  ORD - Order - Party (002)  3/17/2009   
NOTE: THE FIRM TRIAL DATE CURRENTLY SET FOR 10/05/2009 BE RESET TO 10/26/2009 
3/11/2009  ORD - Order - Party (001)  3/17/2009   
NOTE: THAT THE FIRM TRIAL DATE CURRENTLY SET FOR 10/04/2009 BE RESET TO 10/26/2009 
3/5/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  3/6/2009   
NOTE: TO PERMIT NON INVASIVE EXAMINATION OF EVIDENCE 
3/5/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  3/6/2009   
NOTE: TO RESET FIRM TRIAL DATE 
3/5/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/6/2009   
NOTE: TO RESET FIRM TRIAL DATE 
2/25/2009  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)  2/25/2009   
2/25/2009  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  2/25/2009   
1/13/2009  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  1/13/2009   
1/13/2009  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  1/13/2009   
1/6/2009  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  1/7/2009   
1/6/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  1/7/2009   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE 
12/24/2008  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)  12/29/2008   
NOTE: $25,000 
11/20/2008  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/20/2008   
11/13/2008  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (002)  11/13/2008   
11/12/2008  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  11/12/2008   
11/5/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  11/6/2008   
NOTE: RULE 15 DISCLOSURE 
11/5/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/6/2008   
NOTE: RULE 15 DISCLOSURE 
11/5/2008  RES - Response - Party (002)  11/6/2008   
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AND MOTION TO COMPEL BY DATE CERTAIN 
10/27/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  10/28/2008   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE 
10/27/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/28/2008   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE 
10/23/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/23/2008   
10/15/2008  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  10/16/2008   
NOTE: TO FILE MOTION OF REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE 
10/9/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/27/2008   
10/9/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/27/2008   
10/9/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/27/2008   
10/9/2008  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  10/27/2008   
10/2/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  10/3/2008   
9/29/2008  179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (001)  9/29/2008   
9/29/2008  179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (002)  9/29/2008   
9/26/2008  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  9/30/2008   
9/26/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  9/30/2008   
9/26/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  9/30/2008   
9/25/2008  ROR - Release Order - Party (001)  9/30/2008   
NOTE: SECURED APPEARANCE BOND $25,000 09/25/08 
9/25/2008  ROR - Release Order - Party (002)  9/30/2008   
NOTE: SECURED APPEARANCE BOND $25,000 09/25/08 
9/25/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  9/26/2008   
NOTE: FOR DISCOVERY AND MOTION TO COMPEL BY DATE CERTAIN 
9/25/2008  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)  9/26/2008   
NOTE: TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
8/27/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  8/28/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
8/27/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  8/28/2008   
8/27/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  8/28/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
8/27/2008  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)  8/28/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
8/27/2008  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)  8/28/2008   
8/27/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (002)  8/28/2008  Plaintiff (1)  
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/25/2008  8:30   Initial Appearance 
9/25/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
9/25/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
9/25/2008  8:30   Initial Appearance 
11/6/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
11/6/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
1/9/2009  8:30   Status Conference 
1/9/2009  8:30   Status Conference 
2/20/2009  8:31   Status Conference 
2/20/2009  8:31   Status Conference 
6/26/2009  8:30   Oral Argument 
6/26/2009  8:30   Oral Argument 
8/21/2009  8:30   Oral Argument 
8/21/2009  8:30   Oral Argument 
9/25/2009  8:29   Status Conference 
9/25/2009  8:29   Status Conference 
9/28/2009  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
9/28/2009  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
10/5/2009  10:30   Trial 
10/5/2009  10:30   Trial 
10/19/2009  8:29   Trial Management Conference 
10/19/2009  8:29   Trial Management Conference 
10/26/2009  10:31   Trial 
10/26/2009  10:31   Trial 
11/12/2009  13:30   Settlement Conference 
11/16/2009  8:30   Status Conference 
11/16/2009  8:30   Status Conference 
12/14/2009  8:30   Status Conference 
1/11/2010  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
1/11/2010  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
1/15/2010  15:30   Settlement Conference 
1/19/2010  8:30   Sentencing 
1/21/2010  10:00   Status Conference 
1/28/2010  10:00   Status Conference 
3/3/2010  11:00   Status Conference 
3/18/2010  10:30   Settlement Conference 
3/18/2010  10:30   Status Conference 
3/24/2010  13:30   Change Of Plea 
3/24/2010  13:30   Status Conference 
5/18/2010  10:30   Sentencing 
5/18/2010  13:30   Sentencing 
7/8/2010  13:30   Review Hearing 
7/9/2010  8:30   Status Conference 
7/22/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
8/12/2011  13:30   Sentencing 
9/16/2011  13:30   Sentencing