Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Wood, Krista      
Jodi Ann Arias - (2)
 
Defendant  F   Stavris, Christopher   Palmer  CR2008-031021-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Jodi Ann Arias  13-1105 (F1)  MURDER 1ST DEGREE  6/4/2008  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  3/5/2015 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/6/2023  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/6/2023   
10/6/2023  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  10/6/2023   
9/21/2023  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  9/21/2023   
9/19/2023  ORD - Order - Party (001)  9/28/2023   
NOTE: PERMITTING DEFENSE COUNSEL TO PROVIDE KNAPP COUNSEL WITH COPY OF DEFENDANT'S CASE FILE 
9/13/2023  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  9/15/2023   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance as Knapp Counsel 
9/13/2023  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/18/2023   
NOTE: MOTION TO ALLOW DEFENSE COUNSEL TO PROVIDE KNAPP COUNSEL WITH COPY OF DEFENDANT’S CASE FILE 
7/12/2023  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  7/12/2023   
7/5/2023  REP - Report - Party (001)  7/7/2023   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S STATUS REPORT TO THE COURT  
5/23/2023  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  5/23/2023   
5/5/2023  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  5/5/2023   
4/7/2023  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  4/7/2023   
NOTE: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE 
4/4/2023  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  4/4/2023   
3/29/2023  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  3/29/2023   
3/28/2023  ORD - Order - Party (001)  4/10/2023   
NOTE: PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISTRIBUTION AND DISSEMINATION OF SEALED MATERIAL 
3/1/2023  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  3/1/2023   
2/1/2023  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  2/1/2023   
12/1/2022  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  12/1/2022   
11/21/2022  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  11/22/2022   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE 
10/26/2022  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  10/26/2022   
8/17/2022  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  8/17/2022   
6/30/2022  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/30/2022  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: COURTS ORDER GRANTING JODI ARIAS MOTIONS TO INTERVENE TO UNSEAL PRIOR REQUESTS TO SEAL ITEMS AND CORRESPONDING ORDERS AND TO CONDUCT AN IN-CAMERA INSPECTION 
6/30/2022  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/30/2022  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: JODI ARIAS REPLY TO STATE BAR OF ARIZONAS OBJECTION 
6/30/2022  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/30/2022  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: JODI ARIAS REPLY TO RESPONDENT MARTINEZS RESPONSE 
6/16/2022  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  6/16/2022   
4/22/2022  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  4/22/2022   
4/6/2022  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/11/2022   
NOTE: MOTION TO VACATE BRIEFING SCHEDULE 
3/23/2022  004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)  3/23/2022   
3/23/2022  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  3/23/2022   
3/14/2022  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  3/17/2022   
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE PCR STATUS CONFERENCE FOR 90 DAYS 
3/10/2022  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  3/10/2022   
3/8/2022  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  3/8/2022   
3/2/2022  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/4/2022   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS IMPOSED BY RULE 1.9(c), ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE  
3/2/2022  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/7/2022   
NOTE: MOTION TO UNSEAL ITEMS 
2/10/2022  RES - Response - Party (001)  2/14/2022   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PRE-PETITION DISCOVERY 
1/27/2022  REL - Reply - Party (001)  1/28/2022   
NOTE: REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PRE-PETITION DISCOVERY  
12/17/2021  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  12/17/2021   
12/15/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/17/2021   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PRE-PETITION DISCOVERY UNDER SEAL 
12/15/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/17/2021   
NOTE: FOR PRE-PETITION DISCOVERY AND REQUEST TO FILE INSTANT MOTION UNDER SEAL 
11/17/2021  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  11/17/2021   
10/26/2021  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  10/26/2021  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT IN PERSON,WITHOUT A MASK AND RECOGNIZED AS A VIABLE PARTICIPANT 
10/21/2021  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  10/21/2021   
9/21/2021  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  9/21/2021   
8/12/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/13/2021   
NOTE: MOTION FOR THE ADDITION/UPLOAD OF ALL VOLUMES OF TRANSCRIPTS TO ELECTRONIC COURT RECORDS; MOTION TO UNSEAL ALL TRANSCRIPTS AND PORTIONS THEREOF 
7/13/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/14/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO VACATE CURRENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MOTION TO SET STATUS CONFERENCE 
5/13/2021  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: Notice Of Compliance Re Transfer Of Defendants Appellate File 
5/12/2021  197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 01/08/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 01/08/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 01/15/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 01/20/2015 BY MICHAEL A. BABICKY 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 01/21/2015 BY MICHAEL A. BABICKY 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 01/22/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 01/22/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 01/22/2015 BY MICHAEL A. BABICKY 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 01/26/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 01/26/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 01/28/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 02/03/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 02/04/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 02/09/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 02/11/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 02/18/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 02/18/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 02/19/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 02/19/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 02/24/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 02/25/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/7/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 03/26/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 06/05/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 06/20/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 7/11/2014 BY PATRICIA NUNES KATARBA 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 07/28/2014 BY LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 07/29/2014 BY LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 07/30/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 09/03/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 09/16/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 09/16/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 09/16/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 09/17/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 10/01/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 10/07/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 10/22/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 10/28/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 10/30/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 11/04/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 11/05/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 11/20/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 11/25/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 12/11/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 12/16/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 12/17/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 12/18/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 10/08/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
5/6/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 10/16/2014 BY KAREN BOLTON 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 11/07/2012 BY DENISE R. VAISHVILLE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 02/18/2009 by TERRY LYNN MASSCIOLA 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 12/07/2012 BY DOTTY REAUME 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 12/12/2012 BY BARBARA H. STOCKFORD 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 01/15/2013 BY BARBARA H. STOCKFORD 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 02/04/2013 BY JANELL ROSE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 02/13/2013 BY JANELL ROSE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 02/28/2013 BY BARBARA H. STOCKFORD 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 03/04/2013 BY BARBARA H. STOCKFORD 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRAANSCRIPT DATED 03/05/2013 BY BARBARA H. STOCKFORD 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 03/13/2013 BY JANELL ROSE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 03/19/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 03/21/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 03/21/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 03/21/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 03/27/2013 BY TREVA B. COLWELL 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 03/27/2013 BY LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 03/27/2013 BY LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 03/28/2013 BY TREVA B. COLWELL 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/03/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/04/2013 BY BARBARA H. STOCKFORD 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/10/2013 BY BARBARA H. STOCKFORD 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/10/2013 BY BARBARA H. STOCKFORD 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/11/2013 BY BARBARA H. STOCKFORD 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/12/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/12/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/17/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/17/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/17/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/18/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRASNCRIPT DATED 04/24/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/24/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/25/2013 BY ROBIN BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/30/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 04/30/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 05/01/2013 BY BARBARA H. STOCKFORD 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 05/09/2013 BY ROBIN BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 05/09/2013 BY ROBIN G. BOBBIE 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 05/16/2013 BY BARBARA H. STOCKFORD 
5/5/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT DATED 06/18/2013 BY LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY 
5/3/2021  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  5/3/2021   
4/26/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/27/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO VACATE CURRENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MOTION TO SET SUBSEQUENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE UPON FILING OF NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE BY PRIOR COUNSEL  
4/22/2021  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  4/22/2021   
4/13/2021  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  4/14/2021   
NOTE: Motion For Extension Of Time To Provide Appellate File To Post Conviction Relief Counsel 
3/22/2021  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  3/22/2021   
3/12/2021  RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)  3/12/2021   
NOTE:  
3/11/2021  ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  3/12/2021   
NOTE: Motion For Extension Of Time To Provide Appellate File To Post Conviction Relief Counsel 
3/1/2021  596 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: trial - Party (001)  3/1/2021   
3/1/2021  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/1/2021   
NOTE: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE 
2/11/2021  NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  2/11/2021   
NOTE: Notice of Post Conviction Relief 
2/2/2021  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)  2/2/2021   
2/2/2021  MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)  2/2/2021   
NOTE: AFFIRMED 
6/16/2020  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  6/16/2020   
6/5/2020  RES - Response - Party (001)  6/5/2020   
NOTE: Response to Renewed Motion to Unseal Transcript 
6/2/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/9/2020   
NOTE: TO UNSEAL TRANSCRIPT 
6/1/2020  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  6/1/2020   
5/11/2020  REL - Reply - Party (001)  5/12/2020   
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO UNSEAL TRANSCRIPT 
5/4/2020  RES - Response - Party (001)  5/5/2020   
NOTE: Response to Motion to Unseal Transcript 
4/29/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/1/2020   
NOTE: TO UNSEAL TRANSCRIPT 
1/17/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  1/18/2019   
11/19/2018  LET - Letter - Party (001)  11/21/2018   
3/14/2018  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  3/14/2018   
7/5/2017  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/5/2017   
8/23/2016  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  8/24/2016   
NOTE: FROM ATTORNEY GENERAL 
8/22/2016  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  8/23/2016   
NOTE: FROM PUBLIC DEFENDER 
8/10/2016  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)  8/15/2016   
8/10/2016  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  8/15/2016   
8/4/2016  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  8/4/2016   
7/27/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  7/27/2016   
NOTE: ORDER:GRANTING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD 
7/20/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/20/2016   
7/18/2016  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  7/18/2016   
6/8/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/10/2016   
NOTE: POST MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/TO SUPPLEMENT #3 
3/8/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/8/2016   
1/13/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/13/2016   
12/23/2015  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  12/23/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF MOTION TO STRIKE 
12/17/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/17/2015   
11/25/2015  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  11/25/2015   
11/16/2015  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  11/16/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 
11/10/2015  REL - Reply - Party (001)  11/12/2015   
NOTE: REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE 
11/6/2015  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  11/9/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 12/18/2008 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 05/22/2009 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 03/04/2010 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 03/11/2010 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 09/14/2010 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 03/25/2009 SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 10/27/2009 SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 04/16/2010 SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 10/26/2010 SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 03/08/2011 SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 04/11/2011 SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 10/22/2008 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 11/30/2009 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 11/13/2009 SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 08/11/2010 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 11/18/2010 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 05/03/2011 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 07/02/2010 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 08/05/2010 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 01/20/2011 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
11/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/3/2015   
NOTE: 05/25/2011 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
10/30/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  10/30/2015   
NOTE: 1-15-13 BARBARA H STOCKFORD 
10/27/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/27/2015   
10/26/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/27/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE 
10/26/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  10/26/2015   
NOTE: 02/10/09 BY AMY C FULLER  
10/22/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  10/23/2015   
NOTE: MOTION 
10/22/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  10/23/2015   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/13/15 
10/22/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/26/2015   
NOTE: TO SEAL PLEADING 
10/22/2015  ORD - Order - Party (001)  10/27/2015   
NOTE: PROPOSED/SEALING PLEADING 
10/18/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  10/19/2015   
NOTE: Reporters Transcript 4-4-13 COPY Trial (Barbara Stockford) 
10/18/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  10/19/2015   
NOTE: 05/16/13 BY BARBARA H STOCKFORD  
10/6/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  10/7/2015   
NOTE: REDACTED/02/28/13 BY BARBARA H STOCKFORD 
10/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  10/5/2015   
NOTE: 04/11/2013 by BARBARA H. STOCKFORD 
10/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  10/5/2015   
NOTE: 04/10/13 BY BARBARA H STOCKFORD 
10/1/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/1/2015   
10/1/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  10/1/2015   
NOTE: 12/12/2012 BY BARBARA H. STOCKFORD 
10/1/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  10/1/2015   
NOTE: 05/01/2013 BY BARBARA H. STOCKFORD 
10/1/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  10/1/2015   
NOTE: 3-4-13 BARBARA H STOCKFORD 
10/1/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  10/1/2015   
NOTE: 03/05/13 BY BARBARA H STOCKFORD  
10/1/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  10/1/2015   
NOTE: 07/15/2011 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
9/29/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/29/2015   
9/3/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  9/3/2015   
NOTE: 01/26/15 BY MARLA F ARNOLD CR, RPR  
9/3/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  9/3/2015   
NOTE: 02/19/15 BY MARLA F ARNOLD, CR, RPR  
9/3/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  9/3/2015   
NOTE: 02/18/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
9/3/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  9/4/2015   
NOTE: 01/22/2015 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
9/2/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  9/2/2015   
NOTE: 01/14/2013 BY LORI REINHARDT 
8/28/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/28/2015   
NOTE: 11/04/15 BY MARLA F ARNOLD, CR. RPR  
8/28/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/28/2015   
NOTE: Reporters Transcript - 11-05-2014 - Trial Day 14 - A.M. (Marla Arnold) 
8/28/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/28/2015   
NOTE: Reporters Transcript - 12-18-2014 - Trial Day 25 - P.M. (Marla Arnold) 
8/28/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/28/2015   
NOTE: 10/01/2014 BY MARLA F. ARNOLD 
7/30/2015  DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (001)  7/30/2015   
NOTE: Designation of Record for Appeal 
7/21/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  7/22/2015   
NOTE: JUROR BIOGRAPHICAL INFORMATIONS 
7/9/2015  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  7/9/2015   
NOTE: FROM ATTORNEY GENERAL 
7/8/2015  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  7/9/2015   
NOTE: FROM PUBLIC DEFENDER 
6/24/2015  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  6/24/2015   
6/17/2015  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  6/17/2015   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
6/17/2015  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)  6/17/2015   
6/15/2015  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  6/15/2015   
NOTE: FOR EXHIBITS 
6/15/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  6/16/2015   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO STATE'S MOTION FOR RESTITUTION 
6/11/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/11/2015   
NOTE: Motion for Disclosure 
6/2/2015  WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)  6/2/2015   
NOTE: EXHIBIT/ 
5/20/2015  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  5/20/2015   
5/15/2015  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  5/15/2015   
NOTE: COURT REPORTER NOTIFICATION 
5/11/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/11/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO RESET RESTITUTION HEARING 
5/6/2015  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/6/2015   
NOTE: NOTIFICATION NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED 
5/4/2015  130 - ME: Counsel Appt For Appeal - Party (001)  5/4/2015   
4/30/2015  NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)  4/30/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Appeal from Superior Court and Designation of Record for Appeal 
4/28/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/28/2015   
NOTE: Motion to preserve juror biographical information  
4/22/2015  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  4/23/2015   
4/17/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/17/2015   
4/16/2015  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  4/16/2015   
4/14/2015  193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)  4/14/2015   
4/13/2015  LET - Letter - Party (001)  4/14/2015   
4/13/2015  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  4/14/2015   
4/13/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  4/15/2015   
NOTE: MOTION FOR RESTITUTION 
4/13/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  4/15/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING LETTERS FOR SENTENCING 
4/13/2015  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  4/14/2015   
4/13/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/13/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW FROM OMNIBUS HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS DEATH PENALTY 
4/10/2015  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  4/10/2015   
NOTE: Sentencing Memorandum 
4/10/2015  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  4/13/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Letters for Sentencing 
4/10/2015  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  4/13/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Letters for Sentencing 
4/7/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/7/2015   
4/1/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/1/2015   
3/26/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  3/30/2015   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 3/26/15 
3/24/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  3/26/2015   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 3/24/15 
3/23/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  3/26/2015   
NOTE: EX PARTE SUPPLEMENTAL TO MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL 
3/11/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/11/2015   
3/11/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/11/2015   
3/10/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/10/2015   
3/5/2015  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
3/5/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: DELIBERATION/8 
3/5/2015  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: NOT SIGNED 
3/5/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: DELIBERATION/9 
3/5/2015  WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING/ 
3/5/2015  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
3/4/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  3/17/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER STATE'S MOTION TO STRIKE 
3/4/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  3/17/2015   
NOTE: MOTION FOR MISTRIAL; JUROR COERCION 
3/4/2015  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)  3/6/2015   
NOTE: MANDATE & OPINION 
3/4/2015  MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)  3/6/2015   
NOTE: JURISDICTION ACCEPTED AND RELIEF GRANTED 
3/4/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  3/11/2015   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 3/4/15 
3/4/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  3/17/2015   
NOTE: COMPUTER SCREEN SHOT 
3/4/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  3/17/2015   
NOTE: COMPUTER SCREENSHOT 
3/4/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/4/2015   
3/4/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/4/2015   
3/3/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  3/17/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE JUROR NUMBER 17 
3/3/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  3/11/2015   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 3/3/15 
3/3/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: DELIBERATION/6 
3/3/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: DELIBERATION/5 
3/3/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: DELIBERATION/7 
3/2/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/2/2015   
3/2/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/2/2015   
2/26/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/26/2015   
2/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: DELIBERATION/2 
2/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: DELIBERATION/4 
2/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: DELIBERATION/3 
2/25/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: DELIBERATION/1 
2/25/2015  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: FINAL/PENALTY PHASE 
2/25/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/25/2015   
2/25/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/25/2015   
2/24/2015  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  2/24/2015   
2/24/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  2/26/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS RELATED TO SEALED BENCH CONFERENCE BEING LEAKED VIA TWITTER 
2/24/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  2/26/2015   
NOTE: GENERAL AFFIDAVIT 
2/24/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  2/26/2015   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF FILING OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING MS. ARIAS' TESTIMONY 
2/24/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  3/6/2015   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 2/23/15 
2/23/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  2/24/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS RELATED TO HARASSMENT OF MITIGATION SPECIALIST MARIA DE LA ROSA 
2/23/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  2/24/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS RELATED TO HARASSMENT OF WITNESS MARC MCGEE 
2/23/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  2/24/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING MS. ARIAS' TESTIMONY 
2/22/2015  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  2/23/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO THE STATE MAKING ARGUMENT RELATED TO AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES FOR WHICH PROBABLE CAUSE HAS NOT BEEN FOUND AND/OR ASSERTING THAT A LIFE SENTENCE COULD LEAD TO MS. ARIAS' BEING RELEASED FROM PRISON  
2/20/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/20/2015   
2/20/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/20/2015   
2/20/2015  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  3/16/2015   
2/19/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/23/2015   
2/19/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/19/2015   
2/19/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 79 
2/19/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 81 
2/19/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 80 
2/19/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 83 
2/19/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 82 
2/19/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 74 
2/19/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 75 
2/19/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 76 
2/19/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 78 
2/19/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 77 
2/13/2015  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  2/13/2015   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR MISTRIAL; PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT THAT OCCURRED DURING THE CROSS EXAMINATION OF DR. ROBERT GEFFNER 
2/12/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/12/2015   
2/12/2015  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/12/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF PENALTY PHASE REBUTTAL WITNESSES 
2/12/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 73 
2/11/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 72 
2/11/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/11/2015   
2/10/2015  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  2/11/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF MESA PD DET. SMITH FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY DISCLOSE REPORT PRIOR TO TESTIMONY 
2/9/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/9/2015   
2/9/2015  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  2/12/2015   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 02/09/15 
2/9/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 69 
2/9/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 68 
2/9/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 67 
2/9/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 66 
2/9/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 70 
2/9/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 71 
2/7/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/9/2015   
NOTE: MOTION FOR MISTRIAL; PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT THAT OCCURRED DURING THE CROSS EXAMINATION OF DR. ROBERT GEFFNER (SUPPLEMENTAL RELATED TO MISCONDUCT THAT OCCURRED ON JANUARY 26, 2015)  
2/6/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/6/2015   
2/6/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/6/2015   
2/4/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/4/2015   
2/4/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  2/25/2015   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 2/4/15 
2/3/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  2/25/2015   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 2/3/15 
2/3/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/3/2015   
2/3/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 15 
2/3/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 16 
2/3/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 17 
2/2/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/3/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Preclude Testimony of Dr. Janeen DeMarte for Failure to Timely Disclose Report 
2/2/2015  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  2/5/2015   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 02/02/2015 
2/2/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 65 
2/2/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 64 
1/30/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/2/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF MESA PD DET. SMITH FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY DISCLOSE REPORT PRIOR TO TESTIMONY 
1/29/2015  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  1/29/2015   
1/29/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/29/2015   
1/28/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/28/2015   
1/28/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 63 
1/28/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 62 
1/28/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: #61 
1/27/2015  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  2/4/2015   
NOTE: HEARING MINUTE ENTRY DATED 1-27-15 NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT FURTHER COURT ORDER 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: #53 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 38 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 37 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 36 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 35 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 34 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 33 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 32 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 31 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 60 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 58 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 40 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 41 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 42 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 55 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 56 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 57 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 52 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 59 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 43 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 44 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 39 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 54 
1/26/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 51 
1/26/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/26/2015   
1/25/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/26/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE WITNESS CONTAINED IN THE STATE'S TWENTIETH SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES  
1/25/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/26/2015   
NOTE: MOTION FOR MISTRIAL; PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT THAT OCCURRED DURING THE CROSS EXAMINATION OF DR. ROBERT GEFFNER 
1/23/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/23/2015   
1/23/2015  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  1/26/2015   
NOTE: STATE'S TWENTIETH SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES 
1/22/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/22/2015   
1/22/2015  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  2/4/2015   
NOTE: COPY OF EMAIL CAPTIONED: TIME TO VENT; COPY OF EMAIL DATED 4-19-13 
1/22/2015  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  2/4/2015   
NOTE: STATEMENT OF DEPUTY COUNTY ATTORNEY ERIC BASTA 
1/21/2015  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/22/2015   
NOTE: EMAIL FROM DEFENSE AND PHOTO FROM TWITTER 
1/20/2015  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  1/20/2015   
1/16/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/16/2015   
1/15/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/15/2015   
1/15/2015  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  1/15/2015   
1/14/2015  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/21/2015   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 1/12/15 
1/14/2015  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  1/14/2015   
1/14/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 45 
1/14/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 46 
1/14/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 47 
1/14/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 48 
1/14/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 49 
1/12/2015  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 50 
1/9/2015  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  1/9/2015   
1/9/2015  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/9/2015   
1/8/2015  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  1/8/2015   
1/8/2015  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)  1/8/2015   
1/8/2015  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  1/8/2015   
1/7/2015  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  1/8/2015   
NOTE: Motion in Limine to Preclude the State from Eliciting Testimony Regarding Work Drives 
1/7/2015  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/8/2015   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO STATE'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND MOTION TO DISMISS 
1/7/2015  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/22/2015   
NOTE: SEALED HEARING MINUTE ENTRY DATED 1/7/15, NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT 
1/6/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/6/2015   
1/6/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/6/2015   
1/5/2015  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)  1/6/2015   
1/5/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/5/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL; COPY OF EO1 FILE CREATED BY MESA POLICE DEPARTMENT ON OR ABOUT JUNE 11, 2008  
1/5/2015  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/8/2015   
NOTE: ATTACHMENT TO DEFENSE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED 11/26/14 
1/4/2015  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/5/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE WITNESS 
12/31/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/31/2014   
NOTE: TO COMPEL 
12/22/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/22/2014   
12/22/2014  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  12/22/2014   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CHARGES WITH PREJUDICE AND OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISS THE STATES NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO RECENTLY DISCOVERED PURPOSEFUL AND EGROGIOUS PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT 
12/22/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/22/2014   
NOTE: MOTION FOR COURT ORDERED INTERVIEW OF WITNESSES WHO ASSISTED BRYAN NEUMEISTER 
12/18/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/18/2014   
12/18/2014  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  12/18/2014   
12/18/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/18/2014   
12/17/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/17/2014   
12/16/2014  REL - Reply - Party (001)  12/16/2014   
NOTE: News Organizations Reply in Support of Request for Order Unsealing Transcript of October 30, 2014 Witness Testimony and Related Proceedings 
12/15/2014  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  12/17/2014   
NOTE: SERVED 12-11-14 
12/14/2014  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  12/15/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL; MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CHARGES WITH PREJUDICE AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISS THE STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO RECENTLY DISCOVERED PURPOSEFUL AND EGREGIOUS PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT 
12/12/2014  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  12/12/2014   
12/11/2014  WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)  12/16/2014   
NOTE: TRIAL HEARING 
12/10/2014  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  12/15/2014   
NOTE: EIGHTEENTH SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES 
12/10/2014  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  12/10/2014   
12/10/2014  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  12/10/2014   
12/9/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  12/12/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF SELF DISCLOSURE 
12/9/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/9/2014   
12/2/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 23 
12/2/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 18 
12/2/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 19 
12/2/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 20 
12/2/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 21 
12/2/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 22 
12/2/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 30 
12/2/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 29 
12/2/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 28 
12/2/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 27 
12/2/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 26 
12/2/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 25 
12/2/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 24 
12/1/2014  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  12/1/2014   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION: MOTION TO DISMISS STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO DEFENDANT'S INABILITY TO PRESENT A COMPLETE CASE FOR LIFE 
12/1/2014  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/2/2014   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESS FOR PENALTY PHASE 
12/1/2014  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  12/3/2014   
12/1/2014  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  12/3/2014   
11/26/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/26/2014   
11/26/2014  REQ - Request - Party (001)  11/26/2014   
NOTE: News Organizations Request for Order Unsealing Transcript of October 30, 2014 Witness Testimony and Related Proceedings 
11/26/2014  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  12/1/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION: MOTION TO DISMISS STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO DEFENDANT'S INABILITY TO PRESENT A COMPLETE CASE FOR LIFE  
11/25/2014  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  11/25/2014   
11/25/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/25/2014   
11/24/2014  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  11/24/2014   
11/24/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/24/2014   
11/21/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/21/2014   
11/21/2014  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  3/16/2015   
11/20/2014  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  11/21/2014   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CHARGES WITH PREJUDICE AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISS THE STATES NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO RECENTLY DISCOVERED PURPOSEFUL AND EGREGIOUS PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT  
11/20/2014  RES - Response - Party (001)  11/20/2014   
NOTE: TO STATE'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND STATE'S MOTION TO STRIKE  
11/19/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/19/2014   
11/18/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/19/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE (COMPAQ PRESARIO COMPUTER) 
11/18/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/18/2014   
11/18/2014  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  11/18/2014   
11/18/2014  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  11/18/2014   
11/17/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/17/2014   
11/16/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/17/2014   
NOTE: MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (COMPAQ PRESARIO COMPUTER) 
11/13/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  11/25/2014   
NOTE: AFTERNOON TRIAL MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/6/14 
11/13/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/13/2014   
11/13/2014  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)  11/13/2014   
NOTE: MOTION FOR DISCOVERY (COMPAQ PRESARIO COMPUTER) 
11/12/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  11/20/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY FROM SEALED HEARING ON 11/12/14, NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT FURTHER COURT ORDER 
11/12/2014  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  3/16/2015   
11/11/2014  RES - Response - Party (001)  11/12/2014   
NOTE: RESPONSE BY NEWS ORGANIZATIONS TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 
11/11/2014  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  11/12/2014   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING IMAGES ON COMPAQ PRESARIO COMPUTER 
11/10/2014  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  11/12/2014   
NOTE: ALL CHARGES WITH PREJUDICE AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISS THE STATES NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO RECENTLY DISCOVERED PURPOSEFUL AND EREGIOUS PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT 
11/10/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  11/10/2014   
11/10/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/10/2014   
NOTE: MOTION FOR SANCTIONS  
11/10/2014  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  11/12/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CHARGES WITH PREJUDICE AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISS THE STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO RECENTLY DISCOVERED PURPOSEFUL AND EGREGIOUS PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT 
11/6/2014  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  11/6/2014   
11/6/2014  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  11/6/2014   
11/6/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/6/2014   
11/5/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/6/2014   
NOTE: MOTION FOR JOINDER AND FOR OMNIBUS HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS DEATH PENALTY 
11/3/2014  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  11/4/2014   
NOTE: UNSEAL THEN SEAL RECORD 
11/3/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  11/10/2014   
NOTE: TRIAL MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/3/14, NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT FURTHER COURT ORDER 
10/31/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  11/4/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/31/14 
10/31/2014  RES - Response - Party (001)  10/31/2014   
NOTE: MS. ARIAS' RESPONSE; MOTION BY NEWS ORGINIZATIONS TO STAY CLOSED PORTIONS OF THE TRIAL  
10/30/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/31/2014   
NOTE: Motion by News Organizations to Stay Closed Portions of Trial 
10/29/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/29/2014   
10/28/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/30/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED OCTOBER 20, 2014 RE EX PARTE MOTION AND RULING CAPITOL CASE 
10/28/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/28/2014   
10/28/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE:
10/28/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 11 
10/28/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 12 
10/28/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 13 
10/28/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 14 
10/24/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/24/2014   
10/24/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/24/2014   
10/24/2014  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  10/24/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO CONTINUED STATE MISCONDUCT;  
10/23/2014  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  10/23/2014   
10/23/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/23/2014   
10/23/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE:
10/23/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: 10 
10/22/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE:
10/22/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE:
10/22/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE:
10/22/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE:
10/22/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE:
10/22/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE:
10/22/2014  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  10/22/2014   
10/21/2014  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  10/21/2014   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION IN LIMINE PRECLUDE DR HORN FROM TESTIFYING REGARDING INCAPACITATION OF MR ALEXANDER DUE TO LACK OF EXPERT KNOWLEDGE 
10/21/2014  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE:
10/21/2014  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: PRELIMINARY PENALTY PHASE 
10/20/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/30/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL (FILED UNDER SEAL EX PARTE) FILED BY DEFENDANT PRO SE 
10/20/2014  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  10/20/2014   
10/20/2014  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  10/20/2014   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE:PRECLUDE DR. HORN FROM TESTIFYING REGARDING INCAPACITATION OF MR. ALEXANDER DUE TO LACK OF EXPERT KNOWLEDGE 
10/17/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/31/2014   
NOTE: STATES OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY DUE TO CONTINUED STATE MISCONDUCT 
10/16/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/31/2014   
NOTE: SEALED HEARING MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/16/14 
10/16/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/31/2014   
NOTE: STATES OBJECTION TO MOTION TO COMPEL, STATES OBJECTION TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE 
10/14/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/21/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/14/14 
10/10/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/23/2014   
NOTE: STATES PLEADING ENTITLED OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO CONTINUED STATE MISCONDUCT AND ATTACHMENTS 
10/10/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/15/2014   
NOTE: TO SEAL PLEADING FILED ON OCTOBER 10, 2014 
10/10/2014  ORD - Order - Party (001)  10/15/2014   
NOTE: THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT FILE UNDER SEAL THE PLEADING ENTITLED OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY DUE TO CONTINUED STATE MISCONDUCT 
10/9/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/9/2014   
10/9/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/9/2014   
10/9/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/9/2014   
10/8/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/16/2014   
NOTE: EX PARTE HEARING MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/08/14 
10/8/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/8/2014   
10/8/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/8/2014   
10/8/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/13/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED & FILED 10/08/14 
10/8/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/21/2014   
NOTE: SEALED HEARING MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/08/14 
10/6/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/6/2014   
10/3/2014  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  10/3/2014   
10/1/2014  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  10/1/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO CONTINUED STATE MISCONDUCT 
10/1/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/10/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE 
10/1/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/10/2014   
NOTE: REPLY 
10/1/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/10/2014   
NOTE: SEALED HEARING MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/01/14 WITH DOCKET CODE 027 
10/1/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/10/2014   
NOTE: SEALED HEARING MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/01/14 WITH DOCKET CODE 005 
10/1/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  3/12/2015   
NOTE: JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES 
9/30/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  9/30/2014   
9/29/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/10/2014   
NOTE: SEALED HEARING MINUTE ENTRY DATED 09/29/14 
9/29/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/10/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 09/29/14 
9/29/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  3/12/2015   
NOTE: JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES 
9/29/2014  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/19/2015   
NOTE: BLANK JURY QUESTIONNAIRE 
9/26/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/10/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL 
9/26/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/10/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION 
9/26/2014  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  10/30/2014   
9/26/2014  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)  9/30/2014   
9/25/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/26/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE WITNESSES CONTAINED IN THE "NOTICE OF POTENTIAL PENALTY PHASE WITNESSES" FILED BY THE STATE ON SEPTEMBER 19, 2014  
9/24/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  9/24/2014   
9/22/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/25/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 09/22/14 1ST SEALED HEARING 
9/22/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/25/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 09/22/2014 2ND SEALED HEARING 
9/22/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/25/2014   
NOTE: EMAIL DATED 09/22/2014 
9/22/2014  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  9/22/2014   
9/22/2014  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  10/21/2014   
9/19/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  9/19/2014   
9/19/2014  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/19/2014   
NOTE: OF POTENTIAL PENALTY PHASE WITNESSES 
9/18/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  9/18/2014   
9/17/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/25/2014   
NOTE: EXPARTE DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION 
9/17/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/25/2014   
NOTE: EXPARTE PRO PER MOTION AND SUPPLEMENT 
9/17/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/25/2014   
NOTE: EXPARTE SUPPLEMENTAL 
9/17/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/25/2014   
NOTE: EXPARTE MOTION TO SEAL, MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA, ORDER 
9/17/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/25/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 09/17/14 
9/16/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/25/2014   
NOTE: 2 MINUTE ENTRIES DATED 09/16/14 
9/10/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/19/2014   
NOTE: DEF'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER; CORRESPONDING RULING MINUTE ENTRY DATED AND FILED 09/10/2014 
9/10/2014  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/10/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING 
9/10/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/11/2014   
NOTE: Motion to Compel Access to Evidence 
9/5/2014  LET - Letter - Party (001)  9/9/2014   
9/5/2014  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  9/5/2014   
9/5/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/5/2014   
9/3/2014  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  9/3/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATE 8/13/14- FILE DATE 8/13/14 
9/3/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/16/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 09/03/2014; NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT FURTHER COURT ORDER 
9/2/2014  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  9/9/2014  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION TO RELEASE PROPERTY 
8/29/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/29/2014   
NOTE: MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 
8/28/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/28/2014   
8/22/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/29/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY SEALED EX PARTE RULING DATED 08/21/14, FILED 08/22/14 
8/21/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/29/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL 
8/21/2014  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  8/29/2014  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: LETTER 
8/21/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/29/2014   
NOTE: MS ARIAS PROSE MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE MOTION FOR EX PARTE HEARING TO DETERMINE COUNSEL AND REQUEST TO APPOINT INDEPENDENT COUNSEL, SUBMITTED 08/18/14 
8/21/2014  REQ - Request - Party (001)  8/21/2014   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR CAMERA COVERAGE AND MODIFICATION OF MAY 21, 2014 RULING 
8/21/2014  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  8/21/2014   
8/20/2014  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  8/20/2014   
8/19/2014  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  8/12/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 08/04/14 FILED 08/04/14 
8/19/2014  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  8/21/2014  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL CURENTLY SET FOR 09/08/2014 
8/14/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/14/2014   
8/13/2014  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  8/15/2014  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
8/13/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/18/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION 
8/13/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/18/2014   
NOTE: LETTER 
8/13/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/18/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 08/13/2014 NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT FUTHER COURT ORDER 
8/11/2014  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  8/13/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 07/30/14 FILED 07/30/14 
8/8/2014  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/8/2014   
8/7/2014  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  8/7/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW  
8/6/2014  LET - Letter - Party (001)  8/11/2014   
8/4/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/21/2014   
NOTE: EMAIL DATED 08/01/2014 
8/4/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/21/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 08/04/2014 NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT FURTHER COURT ORDER 
8/4/2014  WAV - Waiver - Party (001)  8/11/2014   
NOTE: OF COUNSEL 
8/4/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/22/2014   
NOTE: THE CONTENTS OF THIS ENVELOPE WERE NOT READ BY THE COURT FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE EX PARTE, SEALED HEARING CONDUCTED 08/04/2014 
8/1/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/1/2014   
8/1/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/15/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY SEALED EX PARTE (EX PARTE FROM THE STATE) RULING 
7/31/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/15/2014   
NOTE: MOTION FOR EX PARTE HEARING 
7/30/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/14/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 7/30/14 NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT FURTHER COURT ORDER 
7/30/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/4/2014   
7/30/2014  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  8/5/2014   
7/30/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/15/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 7/29/14 RE: CLOSED EX PARTE PROCEEDING / MATTER TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT 
7/29/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/15/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY RE: CLOSED EX PARTE PROCEEDING DATED 7/28/14 
7/15/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  7/15/2014   
7/15/2014  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  7/16/2014   
NOTE: OFFLINE MINUTE ENTRY DATED 05/29/14 - FILED 05/30/14 
7/8/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/18/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY RULING DATED 7/8/14 NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT FURTHER COURT ORDER 
7/8/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/18/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY EX PARTE RULING NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT FURTHER COURT ORDER 
7/8/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/18/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MEMO FILED EX PARTE AND UNDER SEAL 
7/8/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/18/2014   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST 
6/30/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/9/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS REQUEST 
6/23/2014  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  6/16/2014   
NOTE: OFFLINE MINUTE ENTRY DATED 6/5/14, FILED 6/5/14 
6/20/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/3/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 06/20/14; NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT 
6/13/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  6/24/2014   
NOTE: DEFENSE REQUESTED (EX PARTE UNDER SEAL) 
6/13/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  6/24/2014   
NOTE: CERTIFICATE 
6/5/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  6/24/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 06/05/14 NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT 
5/30/2014  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  6/3/2014   
5/30/2014  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  5/30/2014   
5/27/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/27/2014   
5/22/2014  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  5/22/2014   
5/22/2014  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  5/22/2014   
5/21/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  6/2/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS 
5/21/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  6/2/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY RULING DATE 05/21/14, NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT 
5/19/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  6/2/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE; CNN’S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF 
5/19/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  6/2/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS REVISED LIST OF WITNESSES 
5/16/2014  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  5/29/2014   
5/14/2014  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/14/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S REVISED LIST OF MITIGATING FACTORS AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE  
5/9/2014  RES - Response - Party (001)  5/9/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE; CNN'S (1) MOTION TO UNSEAL COURT'S NOV. 14, 2103 MINUTE ENTRY RE CAMERA COVERAGE, SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS OF CNN AND PARTIES RE VIDEO CAMERA COVERAGE, AND (2)REQUEST FOR OPEN HEARING ON MAY 16, 2014 CONCERNING CAMERA COVERAGE ISSUES  
5/8/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  5/16/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY ORDER DATED 05/08/2014; NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT 
5/5/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  5/14/2014   
NOTE: CNN’S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF 
5/5/2014  ORD - Order - Party (001)  5/8/2014   
NOTE: AUTHORIZING CNN TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS 04/25/2014 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR VIDEO CAMERA COVERAGE OF SENTENCING PHASE RETRIAL AND RECONSIDERATION OF 11/14/2013 MINUTE ENTRY IN LIGHT OF AMENDMENTS TO ARIZ. R. SUP. CT. 122 
4/28/2014  REQ - Request - Party (001)  4/28/2014   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF UNDER SEAL IN COMPLIANCE WITH COURT’S NOVEMBER 14, 2013 SEALED MINUTE ENTRY AND RELATED ORDERS 
4/28/2014  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  4/29/2014   
NOTE: SERVED 04/21/2014 
4/25/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/25/2014   
NOTE: CNN'S (1) MOTION TO UNSEAL COURT'S NOV. 14, 2013 MINUTE ENTRY RE CAMERA COVERAGE, SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS OF CNN AND PARTIES RE VIDEO CAMERA COVERAGE, AND (2) REQUEST FOR OPEN HEARING ON MAY 16, 2014 CONCERNING CAMERA COVERAGE ISSUES 
4/23/2014  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  4/23/2014   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE: PRECLUDE EVIDENCE RELATED TO THE ASSERTION THAT MS. ARIAS HAS ATTEMPTED TO SMUGGLE OUT CONTRABAND FROM THE MARICOPA COUNTY JAIL  
4/15/2014  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  4/15/2014   
4/14/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  4/21/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 04/11/14 WITH DOCKET CODE 027 NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT PRIOR ORDER OF THE COURT 
4/14/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  4/21/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 04/11/14 WITH DOCKET CODE 095 NOT TO BE OPENED WITHOUT PRIOR ORDER OF THE COURT 
4/10/2014  REL - Reply - Party (001)  4/11/2014   
NOTE: Reply to States Objection to Motion to Reconsider and Re-Urge Request for Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Dismiss States Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty Due to States Preclusion of Mitigation Specialist 
4/9/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  4/21/2014   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL FILING IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA 
4/7/2014  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  4/7/2014   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND RE-URGE REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO STATE'S PRECLUSION OF MITIGATION SPECIALIST 
4/7/2014  REL - Reply - Party (001)  4/7/2014   
NOTE: CNN’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR VIDEO CAMERA COVERAGE OF SENTENCING PHASE RETRIAL AND RECONSIDERATION OF NOVEMBER 14, 2013 MINUTE ENTRY IN LIGHT OF AMENDMENTS TO ARIZ. R. SUP. CT. 122 
4/1/2014  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  4/1/2014   
3/31/2014  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  4/1/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND RE-URGE REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO STATE’S PRECLUSION OF MITIGATION SPECIALIST 
3/31/2014  RES - Response - Party (001)  3/31/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE; CNN'S REQUEST FOR VIDEO CAMERA COVERAGE OF SENTENCING PHASE RETRIAL AND RECONSIDERATION OF NOVEMBER 14, 2013 MINUTE ENTRY IN LIGHT OF AMENDMENTS TO ARIZ. R. SUP. CT. 122 
3/25/2014  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  3/25/2014   
3/25/2014  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)  3/25/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE HER RESPONSE TO "CNN'S REQUEST FOR VIDEO CAMERA COVERAGE OF SENTENCING PHASE RETRIAL AND RECONSIDERATION OF NOVEMBER 14, 2013 MINUTE ENTRY IN LIGHT OF AMENDMENTS TO ARIZ. R. SUP. CT. 122 
3/20/2014  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  3/20/2014   
3/20/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  3/31/2014   
NOTE: STIPULATION BETWEEN COUNSEL & MCSO 
3/18/2014  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  3/19/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO STATE'S PRECLUSION OF MITIGATION SPECIALIST 
3/17/2014  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/18/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO EXTEND THE PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO STATE'S PRECLUSION OF MITIGATION SPECIALIST 
3/14/2014  REQ - Request - Party (001)  3/17/2014   
NOTE: CNNs Request for Video Camera Coverage of Sentencing Phase Retrial and Reconsideration of November 14, 2013 Minute Entry in Light of Amendments to Ariz. R. Sup. Ct. 122 
3/7/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  3/17/2014   
NOTE: INTERVENOR'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/19/2014 
2/28/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/28/2014   
2/27/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  3/3/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 2/19/14 FILED 2/21/14 
2/21/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  2/28/2014   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL FILING IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS EXPERT WITNESS AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA; NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS EXPERT WITNESS AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA; NOTICE OF FILING 
2/21/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  2/28/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE DISCLOSURE DEADLINE; DEFENDANTS RESPONSE; OBJECTING TO CONDUCTING TRIAL (PENALTY PHASE) IN SECRET AND ALLOWING WITNESSES TO TESTIFY UNDER A PSEUDONYM; SENTENCING MEMORANDUM 
2/20/2014  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  2/20/2014   
2/19/2014  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  2/19/2014   
2/19/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  2/28/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO SEAL EXPERT WITNESS CHERYL KARPS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE PENALTY PHASE REBUTTAL EVIDENCE; EXPERT WITNESS CHERYL KARPS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE PENALTY PHASE REBUTTAL EVIDENCE 
2/18/2014  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  2/18/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 19, 2014 
2/13/2014  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  2/13/2014   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE: PRECLUDE EVIDENCE RELATED TO MS. ARIAS' MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL  
2/13/2014  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  2/13/2014   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE: PRECLUDE ANY AND ALL EVIDENCE RELATED TO THE CLAIMS THAT MS. ARIAS' MADE THREATS AGAINST TRIAL PARTICIPANTS AND THAT SHE LACKS REMORSE  
2/11/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  2/19/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 02/07/14 AND FILED ON 02/11/14, NOT TO BE OPENED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT 
2/7/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/7/2014   
2/7/2014  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  2/7/2014   
2/3/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  2/7/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE PUBLIC ACCESS TO MS ARIAS VISITATION LOGS FILED 02/03/14 NOT TO BE OPENED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT / MINUTE ENTRY DATED 02/03/14 NOT TO BE OPENED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT 
1/30/2014  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  1/30/2014   
1/27/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/27/2014   
1/27/2014  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  1/27/2014   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION TO DISMISS DEATH; CRUEL AND UNUSUAL PUNISHMENT 
1/17/2014  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  1/17/2014   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS DEATH; CRUEL AND UNUSUAL PUNISHMENT  
1/13/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/27/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 01/13/14 
1/3/2014  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/17/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTY DATED 1/3/2014 
12/26/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/10/2014   
NOTE: MISCELLANEOUS 
12/26/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/10/2014   
NOTE: JUROR MATTER 
12/26/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/10/2014   
NOTE: SECURITY MATTERS 
12/26/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/10/2014   
NOTE: PATRICIA WOMACK 
12/26/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/10/2014   
NOTE: JURY MATTERS 
12/26/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/10/2014   
NOTE: JUROR MATTER 
12/26/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/10/2014   
NOTE: PERSONAL MATTER 
12/26/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/10/2014   
NOTE: IN SESSION LETTER AND CD 
12/26/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/10/2014   
NOTE: ALYCE LAVIOLETTE 
12/26/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/10/2014   
NOTE: TRIAL JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES 
12/17/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  12/31/2013   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/26/13 FILED 11/27/13 
12/13/2013  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  2/24/2014   
12/13/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/10/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S OBJECTION TO CONDUCTING TRIAL (PENALTY PHASE) IN SECRET AND ALLOWING WITNESS TO TESTIFY UNDER PSEUDONYM 
12/13/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/10/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 12/13/13 
12/9/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/9/2013   
12/6/2013  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  2/24/2014   
12/6/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/3/2014   
NOTE: LETTER RE: EXPERT WITNESS 
12/6/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/3/2014   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 12/06/13 
12/4/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/4/2013   
12/1/2013  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  12/2/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER; CHANGE OF VENUE AND REQUEST FOR INDIVUDALIZED VOIR DIRE  
11/27/2013  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)  11/27/2013   
11/27/2013  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  11/27/2013   
11/27/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  12/16/2013   
NOTE: "OBJECTION TO MOTION TO DISMISS DEATH OR TO CONTINUE SENTENCING PHASE RETRIAL" 
11/27/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  12/16/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO THE "REQUEST OF CNN AND PNI FOR UNSEALING OF TRANSCRIPT" 
11/26/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  12/16/2013   
NOTE: "MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/26/13" 
11/26/2013  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  12/2/2013   
NOTE: 10-4-13 MICHAEL A BABICKY 
11/22/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/22/2013   
11/19/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/3/2014   
NOTE: STATE'S PROPOSED JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES 
11/15/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/15/2013   
11/15/2013  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  11/15/2013   
11/15/2013  018 - ME: Findings Of Fact And Conclusion Of Law - Party (001)  11/15/2013   
11/15/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/15/2013   
11/14/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  12/31/2013   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/14/13 
11/6/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/3/2014   
NOTE: LETTERS 
11/6/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  11/6/2013   
10/31/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  11/6/2013   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/21/13 FILED 10/23/13 
10/30/2013  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  10/30/2013   
10/25/2013  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  10/28/2013  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL 
10/24/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  11/6/2013   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/24/13 
10/22/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  10/22/2013   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPTION OF THE OCTOBER 24, 2013 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, AND FOR THE TIMELY RELEASE OF A TRANSCRIPT THEREOF 
10/21/2013  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  10/21/2013   
10/16/2013  REL - Reply - Party (001)  10/16/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S REPLY; OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S RENEWDED REQUEST TO SEQUESTER HER JURY  
10/7/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  10/7/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS RENEWED REQUEST TO SEQUESTER HER JURY  
10/7/2013  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)  10/7/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION AND TO THAT ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS REMAIN UNDER SEAL PRIOR TO RULING  
10/4/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  10/4/2013   
NOTE: REQUEST OF CNN AND PNI FOR UNSEALING OF TRANSCRIPT  
10/4/2013  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  11/6/2013   
10/4/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  11/4/2013   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY 
10/3/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  10/3/2013   
NOTE: CNN'S REQUEST FOR OPEN PROCEEDING 
10/2/2013  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  10/2/2013   
9/27/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/11/2013   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY 
9/27/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/11/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION AND ORDER 
9/27/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/11/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION AND ORDER 
9/25/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  9/26/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO KPHO'S MEDIA REQUEST  
9/25/2013  REL - Reply - Party (001)  9/26/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S REPLY; MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE 
9/25/2013  REL - Reply - Party (001)  9/26/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S REPLY; OBJECTION TO MS. ARIAS' RENEWED REQUEST FOR INDIVIDUALIZED VOIR DIRE BY COUNSEL  
9/19/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  9/19/2013   
9/19/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/15/2013   
NOTE: EMAIL DATED 9/19/13 
9/19/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/15/2013   
NOTE: MOTION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE 9/16/13 HEARING, MOTION AND ORDER TO SEAL MOTION TO CONTINUE 9/16/13 HEARING, MOTION AND ORDER TO INTERVENE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE AND MOTION AND ORDER TO SEAL MOTION TO INTERVENE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE 
9/18/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  9/18/2013   
9/13/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/13/2013   
9/12/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  9/13/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MS ARIAS RENEWED REQUEST FOR INFIVIDUALIZED VOIR DIRE BY COUNSEL 
9/12/2013  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  9/12/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 16, 2013  
9/12/2013  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  9/17/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE PENALTY PHASE REBUTTAL EVIDENCE RELATED TO EXPERT WITNESS DR. CHERYL KARP FILED 9/11/13 
9/12/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  10/3/2013   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 9/9/13, LETTER DATED 8/21/13 AND MOTION FOR EX PARTE HEARING 
9/11/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
9/11/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  9/12/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE 
9/9/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/9/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S; MOTION TO PRECLUDE OR LIMIT LIVE MEDIA COVERAGE OF SENTENCING PHASE RETRIAL 
9/9/2013  RES - Response - Party (001)  9/9/2013   
NOTE: CNNs Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Preclude or Limit Live Media Coverage of Sentencing Phase Retrial 
8/30/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  8/30/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S; [SIC] MOTION TO COMPEL JUROR TWITTER ACCOUNTS 
8/29/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  8/29/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RENEWDED REQUEST TO SEQUESTER HER JURY  
8/28/2013  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/28/2013   
8/27/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/27/2013   
NOTE: MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE 
8/27/2013  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/27/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 08/27/13 
8/27/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/24/2013   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 8/26/2013 AND FILED 8/27/2013 
8/22/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/23/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S; MOTION TO PRECLUDE OR LIMIT LIVE MEDIA COVERAGE OF SENTENCING PHASE RETRIAL 
8/21/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/21/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL JUROR TWITTER ACCOUNTS 
8/21/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  8/21/2013   
NOTE: MS. ARIAS’ RENEWED REQUEST FOR INDIVIDUALIZED VOIR DIRE FOR BY COUNSEL 
8/14/2013  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  8/14/2013   
8/2/2013  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/9/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ MOTION TO VACATE AGGRAVATION PHASE VERDICT 
7/30/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/27/2013   
7/30/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/27/2013   
7/22/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  7/22/2013   
7/17/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/17/2013   
7/16/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/28/2013   
7/9/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  7/10/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER FOR RETENTION OF PSYCHOLOGICAL EXPERTS WHO TESIFIED IN THE FIRST TRIAL AS WELL AS PROSPECTIVE ORDER FOR THOSE WHO WILL TESTIFY IN THE UPCOMING PENALTY PHASE 
7/8/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  7/8/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION TO VACATE AGGRAVATION PHASE VERDICT PURSUANT TO RULE 24.2 ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 
7/3/2013  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  7/5/2013   
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE 
7/3/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/15/2013   
7/3/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/15/2013   
7/3/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/26/2013   
7/2/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/15/2013   
7/2/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/15/2013   
7/2/2013  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  7/2/2013   
7/1/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/15/2013   
6/21/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/15/2013   
NOTE: M.E. DATED 6/18/13 
6/21/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/25/2013   
NOTE: TO VACATE AGGRAVATION PHASE VERDICT PURSUANT TO RULE 24.2 ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 
6/20/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/15/2013   
6/20/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  6/20/2013   
6/20/2013  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/15/2013   
6/19/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  6/20/2013   
NOTE: VICTIMS’ OBJECTION TO ‘MOTION TO CONTINUE; PENALTY PHASE’ 
6/19/2013  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)  6/24/2013   
6/19/2013  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  6/24/2013   
NOTE: RE: DECLINING JURISDICTION OF SPECIAL ACTION PETITION/STAY 
6/17/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  6/17/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE; PENALTY PHASE 
6/13/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  6/13/2013   
6/12/2013  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  6/12/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE; PENALTY PHASE  
6/3/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
6/3/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/4/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE OF POTENTIAL WITNESSES FOR TRIAL (PENALTY PHASE) 
5/31/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/6/2013   
NOTE: #5 
5/31/2013  JNO - Jury Note - Party (001)  6/7/2013   
NOTE: JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE 
5/30/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  5/30/2013   
5/30/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  5/30/2013   
5/30/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  5/30/2013   
5/29/2013  WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)  10/24/2013   
5/23/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  5/23/2013   
5/23/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/24/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO UNSEAL JUROR QUESTIONS AND JUDICIAL RESPONSES 
5/23/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE:
5/23/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE:
5/23/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #4 
5/23/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #18 
5/23/2013  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: SENTENCING / SIGNED 
5/22/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #1 
5/22/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #2 
5/21/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  5/21/2013   
5/21/2013  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: FINAL 
5/20/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  5/23/2013   
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR MISTRIAL; SENTENCING PHASE 
5/20/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/23/2013   
NOTE: FOR MISTRIAL; SENTENCING PHASE 
5/20/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  5/20/2013   
5/20/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  5/20/2013   
NOTE: to motion for mistrial; sentencing phase 
5/19/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/20/2013   
NOTE: MOTION FOR MISTRIAL; SENTECING PHASE  
5/16/2013  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  5/16/2013   
5/16/2013  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: PRELIMINARY 
5/15/2013  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: SIGNED 
5/15/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/16/2013   
NOTE: Defendants Motion to Preclude States Penalty Phase Witnesses for Failure to Notice 
5/15/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  12/27/2013   
NOTE: #2 
5/15/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  12/27/2013   
NOTE: #1 
5/14/2013  RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)  5/14/2013   
NOTE: STATE'S REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (PENALTY PHASE) 
5/13/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  5/13/2013   
5/10/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  5/10/2013   
5/9/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  5/9/2013   
5/9/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  5/9/2013   
5/9/2013  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: AGGRAVATING FACTOR PHASE 
5/9/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #1 
5/8/2013  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: COUNT 1/SIGNED 
5/8/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  5/9/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REQUEST THAT VICTIM IMPACT EVIDENCE BE PRESENTED VIA VIDEOTAPE 
5/7/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  5/7/2013   
5/7/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  5/7/2013   
5/7/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  5/7/2013   
5/7/2013  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)  5/8/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY OF VICTIM IMPACT EVIDENCE 
5/3/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/3/2013   
5/3/2013  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  5/3/2013   
5/2/2013  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  5/7/2013   
NOTE: FINAL 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #402 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #404 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #406 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #410 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 400 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 407 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 401 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 409 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #405 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #397 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 408 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #399 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #395 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #403 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #396 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #394 
5/1/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #398 
5/1/2013  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  12/27/2013   
NOTE: STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY; SPEEDY TRIAL AND EFFECTIVE ASSISTANCE OF COUNSEL 
4/29/2013  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  4/30/2013   
NOTE: STATE'S SEVENTEENTH SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES 
4/27/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/29/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL TESTIMONY RE: SURREBUTTAL WITNESS 
4/26/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/26/2013   
4/26/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/26/2013   
4/26/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/26/2013   
4/25/2013  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  5/3/2013   
4/25/2013  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  5/3/2013   
4/25/2013  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  5/3/2013   
4/25/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #390 
4/25/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #393 
4/25/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #391 
4/25/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #392 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #381 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #377 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #373 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #389 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #384 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #388 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #380 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #383 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #386 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #379 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #375 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #387 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #385 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #382 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #378 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #374 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #376 
4/24/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #372 
4/24/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  4/24/2013   
4/23/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/23/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE'S REBUTTAL WITNESSES  
4/23/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #371 
4/23/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #368 
4/23/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #367 
4/23/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #370 
4/23/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #369 
4/22/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/22/2013   
4/22/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  4/22/2013   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR SURREBUTTAL TESTIMONY AND NOTICE OF SURREBUTTAL WITNESS 
4/22/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  4/22/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR SURREBUTTAL TESTIMONY AND NOTICE OF SURREBUTTAL WITNESS 
4/22/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/23/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE’S REBUTTAL WITNESSES 
4/21/2013  RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)  4/22/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS 
4/19/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/19/2013   
4/18/2013  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  4/19/2013   
NOTE: Request For Hearing 
4/18/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  4/18/2013   
4/18/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/18/2013   
4/18/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/18/2013   
4/18/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #366 
4/18/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #361 
4/18/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #362 
4/18/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #363 
4/18/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #359 
4/18/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #364 
4/18/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #353 
4/18/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #360 
4/18/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #354 
4/18/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #365 
4/18/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #357 
4/18/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #356 
4/18/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #358 
4/18/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #355 
4/16/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/16/2013   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF SENTENCING PHASE WITNESS 
4/15/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/15/2013   
4/15/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/15/2013   
4/15/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/15/2013   
4/15/2013  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  4/15/2013   
NOTE: STATE'S SIXTEENTH SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES 
4/15/2013  RES - Response - Party (001)  4/15/2013   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR MISTRIAL; INABILITY TO PROVIDE EFFECTIVE ASSISTANCE OF COUNSEL DUE TO PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT 
4/12/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #353 
4/12/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #350 
4/12/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #351 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #352 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #291 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #346 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #348 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #287 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #349 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #339 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #340 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #276 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #342 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #343 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #279 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #345 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #284 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #347 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #269 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #271 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #338 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #274 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #310 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #301 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #312 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #321 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #331 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #307 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #305 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #313 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #316 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #309 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #318 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #294 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #299 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #263 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #349 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 256 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #275 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #277 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #320 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #251 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #272 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 249 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #268 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 324 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #270 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #273 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #289 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #278 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #295 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #297 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 304 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #285 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #330 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #314 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #290 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 308 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #300 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 322 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 332 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #303 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 334 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #280 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 292 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #286 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 302 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #282 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #323 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #315 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #306 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 337 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #311 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #265 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 281 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #248 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #327 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #336 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #255 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #328 
4/11/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/11/2013   
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 267 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 266 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 262 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 264 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 257 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 261 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 260 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 258 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 335 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 319 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 325 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 326 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #288 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #253 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 329 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #252 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 333  
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #257 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 341 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 344 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 293 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 317 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 296 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 254 
4/11/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 250 
4/10/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/10/2013   
4/10/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/10/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL; JOURNALS SEIZED FROM MS. ARIAS’ JAIL CELL ON OR ABOUT APRIL 1, 2013 
4/9/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/9/2013   
4/8/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #283 
4/7/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/8/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE; ANY AND ALL EVIDENCE RELATED ANY WEIGHT ASSESSMENTS OR TESTING ON SHELVING AT PLACE OF DEATH 
4/7/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/8/2013   
NOTE: MOTION FOR MISTRIAL ; INABILITY TO PROVIDE EFFECTIVE ASSISTANCE OF COUNSEL DUE TO PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT 
4/4/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/4/2013   
4/4/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/4/2013   
4/3/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  4/3/2013   
3/31/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/1/2013   
NOTE: MOTION FOR MISTRIAL: JUROR MISCONDUCT  
3/31/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  4/1/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S OBJECTION TO ELICITING TESTIMONY OR MAKING ARGUMENT RELATED TO AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES FOR WHICH PROBABLE CAUSE HAS NOT BEEN FOUND 
3/29/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/29/2013   
3/28/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/28/2013   
3/28/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/28/2013   
3/28/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/28/2013   
3/28/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  3/28/2013   
3/26/2013  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  3/26/2013   
3/26/2013  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  3/26/2013   
NOTE: STATE'S FIFTEENTH SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES 
3/25/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/25/2013   
3/25/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/25/2013   
3/25/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #242 
3/25/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #248 
3/25/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #243 
3/25/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 241 
3/25/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #245 
3/25/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #244 
3/25/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #247 
3/25/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #246 
3/24/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/25/2013   
NOTE: FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER  
3/22/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/22/2013   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER 
3/21/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/21/2013   
3/21/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/21/2013   
3/21/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/25/2013   
NOTE: OF PUBLIC RECORD REQUEST 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #239 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #172 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #178 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #240 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #188 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #171 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #162 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #180 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #185 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #177 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #196 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #190 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #210 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #160 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #200 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 232 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 201 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 218 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 220 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 222 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 225 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 227 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #166 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #223 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #219 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #226 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 217 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #230 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #205 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #234 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #199 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 189 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 198 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 195 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 206 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 231 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 203 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #161 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 181 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 184 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 193 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 168 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #167 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #158 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 176 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 209 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #207 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 170 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 187 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 164 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 238 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 163 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #241 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #235 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 192 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #202 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #221 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 169 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #202  
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 174 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #183 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #186 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 156 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #212 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #191 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #179 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #221 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 159 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #182 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 211 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #237 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #215 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 157 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 214 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #165 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 236 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 175 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #224 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #197 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 208 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #197 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #233 
3/21/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #213 
3/18/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/18/2013   
3/18/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  3/18/2013   
3/15/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/15/2013   
3/14/2013  ORD - Order - Party (001)  3/18/2013   
NOTE: THAT TESORO COMPANIES INC PROVIDE TO COUNSEL FOR MS.ARIAS THE DAILY TRANSACTION RECORDS ASSOCIATED WITH ANY AND ALL TRANSACTIONS THAT TOOK PLACE 06/06/08 IN THEIR STORE LOCATED @ 1699 W NORTH TEMPLE, SALT LAKE CITY UTAH. 
3/14/2013  ORD - Order - Party (001)  3/18/2013   
NOTE: THAT WAL-MART INC PROVIDE TO COUNSEL FOR MS.ARIAS THE DAILY TRANSACTION RECORDS ASSOCIATED WITH ANY AND ALL RETURN TRANSACTIONS THAT TOOK PLACE 06/03/08 IN THEIR STORE LOCATED AT 1800 N MAIN SALINAS CALIFORNIA 93906 
3/13/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #148 
3/13/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #151 
3/13/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #153 
3/13/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #154 
3/13/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 150 
3/13/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 152 
3/13/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #147 
3/13/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 146 
3/13/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #149 
3/13/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #155 
3/12/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  3/12/2013   
3/12/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/12/2013   
NOTE: TO COMPEL; BUSINESS RECORDS FROM WAL-MART AND TESORO 
3/12/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/12/2013   
NOTE: TO COMPEL CRIMINAL HISTORY OF TRAVIS ALEXANDER  
3/11/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/11/2013   
3/8/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/8/2013   
3/8/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/8/2013   
3/8/2013  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  3/8/2013   
NOTE: STATES FOURTEENTH SUPPLEMENTAL 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #123 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #122 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #113 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #121 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #145 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #115 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #116 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #118 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #119 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #46 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #47 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #48 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #49 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #51 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #65 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #52 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #53 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #54 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #55 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #57 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #58 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #59 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #61 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #96 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #87 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #126 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #82 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #111 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #79 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #77 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #134 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #120 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #127 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #125 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #73 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #73 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #42 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #135 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #132 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #143 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #133 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #131 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #124 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #128 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #129 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #135 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #144 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #136 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #137 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #56 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #141 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #144 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #139 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 66 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #140 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #142 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #106 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #101 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #63 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #45 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 108 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #69 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 64 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 104 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #99 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #78 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 76 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #97 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #109 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #71 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #130 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 88 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #84 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #107 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 112 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 117 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #72 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 114 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #91 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 110 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 97 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 74 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #98 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 94 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 81 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 68 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #86 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #85 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 44 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 105 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #80 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #103 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 102 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 62 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #93 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #67 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #95 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #70 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #138 
3/7/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #197 
3/6/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #60 
3/6/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #50 
3/6/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #43 
3/6/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #89 
3/6/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #75 
3/6/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #90 
3/6/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/6/2013   
3/5/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/5/2013   
3/4/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/4/2013   
3/4/2013  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/5/2013   
3/4/2013  LET - Letter - Party (001)  3/7/2013   
NOTE: RE:VOICEMAIL RECORDING ON JUDFE STEPHENS DIVISIONS PH 
3/1/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/1/2013   
2/27/2013  APL - Application - Party (001)  2/28/2013   
NOTE: FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF UNSEALING THE TRANSCRIPT OF THE FEBRUARY 20, 2013 CLOSED PROCEEDING AND ANY OTHER CLOSED HEARINGS DURING TRIAL 
2/26/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/26/2013   
2/25/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/25/2013   
2/25/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/25/2013   
2/25/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/25/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE ANY AND ALL EVIDENCE RELATED TO THE LETTERS WRITTEN BY TRAVIS ALEXANDER TO MS. ARIAS 
2/21/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/21/2013   
2/21/2013  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  2/21/2013   
NOTE: RULE 122 REQUEST OF PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC. FOR HEARING ON COURT’S ORDER EXCLUDING STILL PHOTOGRAPHIC COVERAGE OF THE TRIAL, AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION THEREOF 
2/20/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  2/20/2013   
2/19/2013  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  11/6/2013   
2/15/2013  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  2/25/2013   
2/15/2013  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  2/25/2013   
2/15/2013  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  2/25/2013   
2/15/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/15/2013   
2/14/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/14/2013   
2/13/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/13/2013   
2/13/2013  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  2/19/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 02/13/12 
2/11/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/11/2013   
2/11/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  2/11/2013   
2/6/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/6/2013   
2/6/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/6/2013   
2/4/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/4/2013   
2/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #40 
2/4/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #41 
2/1/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  2/1/2013   
2/1/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/1/2013   
2/1/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  2/1/2013   
1/31/2013  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  1/31/2013   
NOTE: DECLINING JURISDICTION OF SPECIAL ACTION PETITION/STAY 
1/31/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #39 
1/31/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #38 
1/31/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #35 
1/31/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #37 
1/31/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #36 
1/30/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #34 
1/30/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #31 
1/30/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #32 
1/30/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #30 
1/30/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #33 
1/30/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #29 
1/30/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #28 
1/30/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #27 
1/30/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #26 
1/30/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #25 
1/30/2013  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  1/30/2013   
1/29/2013  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  1/31/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 01/28/13 
1/29/2013  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  1/31/2013   
NOTE: SERVED 01/28/13 
1/29/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #24 
1/24/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/24/2013   
1/23/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/23/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE OF WITNESSES; PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT HEARING CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 28, 2013 
1/17/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/17/2013   
1/17/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/17/2013   
1/17/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/17/2013   
1/17/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #23 
1/17/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  12/27/2013   
NOTE: FOR OUT-OF-STATE SUMMONS PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-4093 
1/17/2013  CER - Certificate - Party (001)  12/27/2013   
NOTE: OF REQUESTING JUDGE 
1/17/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  12/27/2013   
NOTE: FOR OUT-OF-STATE SUMMONS PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-4093 
1/17/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  12/27/2013   
NOTE: FOR OUT-OF-STATE SUMMONS PURSUANT TO A.R.S § 13-4093 
1/16/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #22 
1/16/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #20 
1/16/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #21 
1/16/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #14 
1/16/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/4/2013   
NOTE: #13 
1/16/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/4/2013   
NOTE: #12 
1/16/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/4/2013   
NOTE: #11 
1/15/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/4/2013   
NOTE: #19 
1/15/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/15/2013   
1/15/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/15/2013   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF TRIAL PHASE WITNESSES  
1/14/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/14/2013   
1/14/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/14/2013   
1/14/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  1/14/2013   
NOTE: FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS 
1/14/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/4/2013   
NOTE: #18 
1/14/2013  REQ - Request - Party (001)  5/9/2013   
NOTE: FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS 
1/10/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 16 
1/10/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: 17 
1/9/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #3 
1/9/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE:
1/9/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE:
1/9/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE: #10 
1/9/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE:
1/9/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE:
1/9/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE:
1/9/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE:
1/8/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/8/2013   
1/4/2013  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  1/4/2013   
1/3/2013  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  6/3/2013   
NOTE:
12/24/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/24/2012   
12/21/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/21/2012   
12/21/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  12/21/2012   
12/21/2012  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)  12/21/2012   
12/20/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/20/2012   
12/20/2012  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)  6/4/2013   
12/20/2012  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)  6/4/2013   
12/20/2012  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)  6/4/2013   
12/20/2012  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)  6/4/2013   
12/20/2012  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)  6/4/2013   
12/20/2012  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  5/9/2013   
NOTE: PRELIMINARY 
12/19/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/19/2012   
12/19/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/19/2012   
12/19/2012  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  1/3/2013   
12/14/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/14/2012   
12/14/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/14/2012   
12/13/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  12/14/2012   
NOTE: TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF GUN THEFT 
12/13/2012  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  12/13/2012   
12/12/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  12/12/2012   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE FROM ADMITTING OR PUBLISHING MS. ARIAS' PRIOR INTERVIEWS 
12/11/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  12/11/2012   
12/11/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  12/12/2012   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE FROM PRESENTING EVIDENCE RELATED TO THE THEFT OF A GUN THAT OCURRED IN YREKA ON 05/28/2008 
12/10/2012  SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)  12/27/2012   
12/10/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  12/27/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 12/10/12 
12/9/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/10/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE FROM ADMITTING OR PUBLISHING MS. ARIAS' PRIOR INTERVIEWS 
12/7/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  12/7/2012   
12/5/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/6/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE FROM PRESENTING EVIDENCE RELATED TO THE THEFT OF A GUN THAT OCCURRED IN YREKA ON MAY 28, 2008 
12/3/2012  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  12/3/2012   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE DR. DEMARTE’S CONCLUSIONS PURSUANT TO “SARA” 
12/3/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  12/3/2012   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE FROM ARGUING THAT MS. ARIAS HAD A DUTY TO RETREAT 
12/3/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/3/2012   
NOTE: OF POTENTIAL WITNESSES TO BE CALLED AT TRIAL 
12/2/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/3/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESSES  
12/2/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/3/2012   
NOTE: FOR INDIVIDUALIZED VOIR DIRE FOR BY COUNSEL (Voir Dire Pleading #1) 
11/27/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/27/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE FROM ARGUING THAT MS. ARIAS HAD A DUTY TO RETREAT  
11/27/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/28/2012   
NOTE: MOTION FOR PROCEDURES TO ENSURE THAT MS. ARIAS IS TRIED BY A FAIR AND IMPARTIAL JURY DURING ALL PHASES OF THESE PROCEEDINGS (Voir Dire pleading #2) 
11/27/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  11/28/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 11/27/12 
11/27/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  11/28/2012   
NOTE: REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S NOTICE REGARDING REVIEW OF HARD DRIVE BY DEFENDANT AND HER COUNSEL 
11/27/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/28/2012   
NOTE: REGARDING REVIEW OF HARD DRIVE BY DEFENDANT AND HER COUNSEL  
11/26/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  11/26/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO STATE'S NOTICE REGARDING REVIEW OF HARD DRIVE BY DEFENDANT AND HER COUNSEL  
11/21/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  11/21/2012   
11/21/2012  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  12/6/2012   
11/19/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  11/20/2012   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL (SIC) SCHEDULED FOR 11-19-12 
11/19/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  11/20/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S/ TO STATE’S RESPONSE: MOTION TO COMPEL; MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
11/16/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  11/16/2012   
11/16/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/16/2012   
NOTE: REGARDING REVIEW OF HARD DRIVE DATA BY DEFENSE COUNSEL 
11/16/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  11/16/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENT; MOTION TO CONTINUE TRAIL SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 19, 2012 
11/15/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/15/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S / TO COMPEL; RESULTS OF THE FORENSIC EXAMINATION CONDUCTED BY THE MESA POLICE DEPARTMENT CONDUCT UPON ITEM NUMBER 402873 SINCE IT WAS REPAIRED BY TLSI 
11/15/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  11/15/2012   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL RESULTS OF THE FORENSIC EXAMINATION CONDUCTED BY THE MESA POLICE DEPARTMENT CONDUCT (SIC) UPON ITEM NUMBER 402873 SINCE IT WAS REPAIRED BY TLSI 
11/14/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  11/14/2012   
11/13/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  11/13/2012   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANT'S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISS THE STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO CONTINUED BRADY VIOLATIONS AND CONTINUED PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT 
11/9/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/9/2012   
NOTE: FOR A GOOD FAITH LIST OF WITNESSES THE STATE INTENDS TO CALL 
11/7/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  11/7/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL/ TRIAL 
11/6/2012  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  11/6/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 11/06/12 
11/5/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  11/5/2012   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ALTERNATE VERDICT FORMS 
11/4/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/5/2012   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE OF MIRROR IMAGE HARD DRIVE FROM TLSI INCORPORATED (ITEM NO. 402873) 
11/2/2012  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/2/2012   
11/2/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  11/5/2012   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL; MIRROR IMAGE OF ITEM NUMBER 402873 MADE BY TLSI 
11/1/2012  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  11/2/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS RENEWED/ AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISS THE STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY DUE TO CONTINUED BRADY VIOLATIONS AND CONTINUED PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT 
11/1/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/1/2012   
NOTE: OF WITNESSES TO BE CALLED AT THE MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING SCHEDULED ON NOVEMBER 7, 2012 
11/1/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/1/2012   
NOTE: REGARDING RECEIPT OF THE MIRROR IMAGE HARD DRIVE FROM TLSI INCORPORATED 
10/31/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  10/31/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
10/30/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  10/30/2012   
10/30/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/31/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / TO COMPEL; MIRROR IMAGE OF ITEM NUMBER 402873 MADE BY TLSI 
10/29/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/29/2012   
NOTE: REGARDING RELEASE OF COMPUTER HARD DRIVE, ITEM NO. 402873 
10/29/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  10/29/2012   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 19, 2012 
10/25/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  11/29/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MEMO RELATED TO REDACTED NOTES, REDACTED NOTES AND UNREDACTED 
10/24/2012  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/24/2012   
10/23/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/24/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ TRIAL CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR 11-19-12 
10/19/2012  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/19/2012   
10/18/2012  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  10/18/2012   
NOTE: STATES THIRTEENTH SUPPLEMENTAL/ 
10/17/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  10/17/2012   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANT'S RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL; MIRROR IMAGE OF ITEM NUMBER 402873 AND FORENSIC TESTING CONDUCTED BY STATE UPON EVIDENCE ITEM NUMBER 402873 
10/17/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/17/2012   
NOTE: REGARDING CONTACT WITH TLSI INCORPORATED 
10/16/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/17/2012   
NOTE: REGARDING CONTACT WITH TLSI INCORPORATED 
10/16/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  10/17/2012   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL MIRROR IMAGE OF ITEM NUMBER 402873 AND FORENSIC TESTING CONDUCTED BY STATE UPON EVIDENCE ITEM NUMBER 402873 
10/14/2012  REQ - Request - Party (001)  10/15/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S /FOR ALTERNATE VERDICT FORMS  
10/14/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/15/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RENEWED / TO COMPEL; MIRROR IMAGE OF ITEM NUMBER 402873 AND FORENSIC TESTING CONDUCTED BY STATE UPON EVIDENCE ITEM NUMBER 402873 
10/2/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/2/2012   
NOTE: REGARDING RETURN OF COMPUTER HARD DRIVE, ITEM 402873 
10/1/2012  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  10/1/2012   
9/27/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  9/27/2012   
9/27/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/27/2012   
9/27/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  9/27/2012   
9/27/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  11/1/2012   
9/17/2012  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/17/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 09/17/12 
9/17/2012  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/17/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 09/17/12 
9/10/2012  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  9/10/2012   
9/10/2012  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  9/11/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE STATE FROM ARGUING LACK OF REMORSE DURING ANY POTENTIAL SENTENCING PHASE  
9/5/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/5/2012   
9/4/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  9/5/2012   
NOTE: TO SEAL DEFENSE TEAM BILLING LOGS 
9/4/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  9/5/2012   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE STATE FROM ARGUING LACK OF REMORSE DURING ANY POTENTIAL SENTENCING PHASE 
8/21/2012  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/27/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 08/17/12 
8/15/2012  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/15/2012   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE: MOTION FOR UNREDACTED COPIES OF EXPERT’S NOTES 
8/10/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  8/10/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE; MOTION FOR UNREDACTED COPIES OF EXPERT’S NOTES  
8/6/2012  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  8/6/2012   
8/2/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/3/2012   
NOTE: REGARDING TESTING OF COMPUTER HARD DRIVE, ITEM NUMBER 402873 
8/2/2012  LET - Letter - Party (001)  8/9/2012   
7/31/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/31/2012   
NOTE: FOR UNREDACTED COPY OF EXPERTS NOTES 
7/30/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  7/31/2012   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
7/26/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/26/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE STATE FROM ARGUING LACK OF REMORSE DURING ANY POTENTIAL SENTENCING PHASE  
7/26/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/26/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SEAL DEFENSE TEAM BILLING LOGS  
7/16/2012  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  7/16/2012   
7/13/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/13/2012   
7/13/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  7/13/2012   
7/9/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/9/2012   
NOTE: TRIAL 
7/2/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/12/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 07/02/12 
6/28/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  6/29/2012   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST THAT AN INTERPRETER BE PROVIDED FOR SPANISH ONLY SPEAKING JURORS 
6/26/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  6/26/2012   
6/25/2012  REQ - Request - Party (001)  6/25/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S/ THAT AN INTERPRETER BE PROVIDED FOR SPANISH ONLY SPEAKING JURORS  
6/25/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/25/2012   
NOTE: TO FOR DISCLOSURE DEADLINE; FORENSIC TESTING CONDUCTED BY STATE UPON EVIDENCE ITEM NUMBER 402873 
6/25/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/6/2012   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR ORDER TO ASSIST MITIGATION INVESTIGATION FILED 6/19/12 PROPOSED ORDER TO ASSIST MITIGATION INVESTIGATION FILED 6/19/12 
6/12/2012  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  6/12/2012   
NOTE: TO ALLOW JURY TO CONSIDER POLYGRAPH RESULTS DURING SENTENCING PHASE 
6/5/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/5/2012   
NOTE: REGARDING RELEASE OF ITEM OF DEFENDANT 
5/31/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/31/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S / TO ALLOW JURY TO CONSIDER POLYGRAPH RESULTS DURING SENTENCING PHASE  
5/31/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/31/2012   
NOTE: TO COMPEL; FORENSIC TESTING CONDUCTED BY STATE UPON EVIDENCE ITEM NUMBER 402873 
5/21/2012  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  5/21/2012   
5/17/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/17/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF TRIAL PHASE WITNESSES 
5/16/2012  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/16/2012   
NOTE: FOR INDEPENDENT TESTING OF COMPUTER EVIDENCE  
4/23/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/23/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL /OF TRIAL PHASE WITNESSES  
4/12/2012  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/12/2012   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF TRIAL PHASE WITNESSES  
3/27/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  4/19/2012   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 3/22/12 DATED 3/9/12 
3/21/2012  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)  3/21/2012   
3/16/2012  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  3/16/2012   
3/15/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  4/19/2012   
NOTE: STATES OBJECTION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FILED 3/14/12 NOTICE FILED BY DEFENSE COUNSEL FILED 3/14/12 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL FILED 3/14/12 
3/8/2012  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  3/12/2012   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM/ SERVED 02/29/12 
2/17/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  2/24/2012   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW FILED 12/16/11 
2/15/2012  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  3/1/2012   
NOTE: COMPLEX CAPITAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MINUTE ENTRY FILED 2/13/12 
2/8/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  2/8/2012   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES FROM THE COURTROOM AND FROM VIEWING MEDIA COVERAGE OF THE TRIAL 
1/13/2012  RES - Response - Party (001)  1/13/2012   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO DISMISS STATES NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY; SPEEDY TRIAL AND EFFECTIVE ASSISTANCE OF COUNSEL  
1/4/2012  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  1/4/2012   
12/29/2011  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  12/30/2011   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY;SPEEDY TRIAL AND EFFECTIVE ASSISTANCE OF COUNSEL 
12/23/2011  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  12/23/2011   
12/23/2011  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  12/23/2011   
12/22/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/3/2012   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 12/22/2011 
12/20/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  12/20/2011   
12/20/2011  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  12/20/2011   
12/20/2011  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  12/20/2011   
12/20/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  12/20/2011   
NOTE: In Sessions Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Reconsider Denial of Protective Order 
12/14/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/14/2011   
NOTE: IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF PROTECTIVE ORDER 
12/14/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  12/14/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO COMPEL EVIDENCE SEIZED PURSUANT TO SUBPOENA FILED ON NOVEMBER 4, 2011 
12/13/2011  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  12/13/2011   
12/13/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/13/2011   
NOTE: TO COMPEL EVIDENCE SEIZED PURSUANT TO SUBPOENA FILED ON NOVEMBER 4, 2011 
12/12/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/14/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS / TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF PROTECTIVE ORDER 
12/12/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  12/12/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE REFERENCES TO MR ALEXANDER AS THE VICTIM 
12/8/2011  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)  12/8/2011   
12/8/2011  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)  12/8/2011   
12/7/2011  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  12/7/2011   
NOTE: STATE'S TWELFTH SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES 
12/5/2011  REL - Reply - Party (001)  12/5/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S / TO THE OPPOSTION TO PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY IN SESSION AND THE MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFFS’ OFFICE 
12/2/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  12/2/2011   
NOTE: SHERIFF ARPAIO’S JOINDER IN IN SESSION'S/ IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER 
12/1/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  12/1/2011   
NOTE: In Sessions Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion for a Protective Order 
11/29/2011  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  11/29/2011   
11/29/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/29/2011   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES FROM THE COURTROOM AND FROM VIEWING MEDIA COVERAGE OF THE TRIAL 
11/29/2011  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  11/29/2011   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE REFERENCES TO MR. ALEXANDER AS THE “VICTIM”  
11/23/2011  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  11/23/2011   
11/18/2011  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  11/18/2011   
11/16/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/16/2011   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF TRIAL PHASE WITNESSES  
11/16/2011  ORD - Order - Party (001)  11/21/2011   
NOTE: THAT MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEYS AND HIS DESIGNEES; FROM MAKING FURTHER EXTRAJUDICIAL STATEMENTS CONCERNING THE FACTS OF THE INVESTIGATION AND/OR DEFENDANT CONDUCT WHILE INCARCERATED. 
11/15/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/15/2011   
NOTE: MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER. 
11/8/2011  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  11/8/2011   
11/4/2011  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  11/7/2011   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM/ SERVED 10/26/11 
10/31/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/31/2011   
10/26/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/27/2011   
NOTE: TRIAL CURRENTLY SCHEDULED TO BEGIN ON FEBRUARY 1, 2012 
10/3/2011  REL - Reply - Party (001)  10/3/2011   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE THE STATEMENTS  
9/26/2011  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  9/26/2011   
9/14/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  9/15/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE; MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OF HEARSAY STATEMENTS (TEXT MESSAGES, GOOGLE MAIL AND INSTANT MESSAGES) 
9/13/2011  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  9/13/2011   
9/9/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  11/7/2011   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATD 9/9/11 
9/6/2011  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  9/6/2011   
8/31/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/31/2011   
NOTE: STATE'S ELEVENTH SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES 
8/31/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  11/7/2011   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 8/31/11 
8/30/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/30/2011   
8/29/2011  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  8/29/2011   
8/29/2011  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  8/29/2011   
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OF HEARSAY STATEMENT  
8/26/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/26/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF DR. JANEEN DEMARTE'S REPORT, NOTES AND RAW DATA 
8/25/2011  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  8/25/2011   
NOTE: TRIAL/ IN SUPPORT OF ALL MOTIONS, OBJECTIONS, EXCEPTIONS, REQUESTS AND OTHER APPLICATIONS AND ISSUES OF ANY NATURE WHATSOEVER 
8/25/2011  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  11/7/2011   
8/24/2011  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  8/25/2011   
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OF HEARSAY STATEMENTS 
8/24/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/25/2011   
NOTE: MOTION TO VACATE TRIAL CURRENTLY SCHEDULED TO BEGIN ON AUGUST 29, 2011  
8/22/2011  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)  8/22/2011   
8/18/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/18/2011   
8/18/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/18/2011   
NOTE: PURPOSED ALTERNATIVE QUESTIONS RE: JURY QUESTIONNAIRE  
8/17/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/17/2011   
8/15/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/15/2011   
8/15/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/15/2011   
8/15/2011  WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)  10/31/2011   
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING 
8/12/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/12/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING DR JANEEN DEMARTES REPORT 
8/10/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  8/10/2011   
8/9/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  8/9/2011   
NOTE: TO SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR 08/02/11 
8/9/2011  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/9/2011   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Application for Leave to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of (1) Seeking the Courts Approval of In Sessions Camera Coverage Request and (2) Opposing Defendants Motion to Reconsider Media Access 
8/8/2011  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  8/16/2011   
NOTE: TRIAL / IN SUPPORT OF ALL MOTIONS, OBJECTIONS, EXCEPTIONS, REQUESTS AND OTHER APPLICATIONS AND ISSUES OF ANY NATURE WHATSOEVER 
8/8/2011  WAV - Waiver - Party (001)  8/16/2011   
NOTE: OF COUNSEL 
8/8/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/16/2011   
NOTE: FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS 
8/8/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/16/2011   
NOTE: EXPARTE MOTION 
8/7/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  8/8/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO APPLICATION TO INTERVENE  
8/7/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/8/2011   
NOTE: FOR INDIVIDUALIZED VOIR DIRE FOR BY COUNSEL 
8/5/2011  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/5/2011   
8/5/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  8/5/2011   
NOTE: EVIDENTIARY HEARING CURRENTLY SET FOR AUGUST 8TH AND 9TH, 2011 
8/4/2011  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  8/4/2011   
NOTE: STATES TENTH SUPPLEMENTAL/ 
8/3/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  8/5/2011   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS PROPOSED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE 
8/3/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  8/3/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO CLOSE PRETRIAL HEARINGS 
8/3/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  8/3/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO SEQUESTER JURY 
8/3/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  8/3/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY 
8/3/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  8/3/2011   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 2, 2011  
8/1/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/1/2011   
NOTE: FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY 
8/1/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/1/2011   
NOTE: motion to sequester jury 
8/1/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/1/2011   
NOTE: TO CLOSE PRETRIAL HEARINGS 
7/28/2011  APL - Application - Party (001)  7/28/2011   
NOTE: Application to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of (1) Seeking the Courts Approval of In Sessions Camera Coverage Request and (2) Opposing Defendants Motion to Reconsider Media Access 
7/28/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/28/2011   
NOTE: TO STATE’S MOTION TO PROHIBIT COUNSEL FROM ASKING VENIREPERSONS CASE SPECIFIC QUESTIONS ABOUT AGGRVATION/ MITIGATION 
7/28/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/28/2011   
NOTE: DEFENSE/ TO STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE LINGERING DOUBT AS A MITIGATING FACTOR 
7/28/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/29/2011   
NOTE: Defense Response Relating to Weight of Mitigation 
7/27/2011  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  7/28/2011   
NOTE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 2, 2011 AND EVIDENTIARY HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JULY 25, 2011 
7/25/2011  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  7/25/2011   
7/25/2011  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  7/25/2011   
7/25/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  8/16/2011   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED UNDER SEAL 
7/21/2011  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  7/21/2011   
NOTE: MEDIA ACCESS 
7/19/2011  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  7/19/2011   
7/18/2011  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  7/19/2011   
NOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER MEDIA ACCESS  
7/18/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/19/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 2, 2011 AND EVIDENTIARY HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JULY 25, 2011 
7/18/2011  REQ - Request - Party (001)  7/19/2011   
NOTE: PURPOSED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE  
7/15/2011  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  8/1/2011   
NOTE:  
7/13/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/13/2011   
7/11/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/11/2011   
NOTE: STATE'S NINTH SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES 
7/7/2011  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  7/7/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM 
7/6/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/6/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION IN LIMINE DISPLAY OF NUDE PHOTOGRAPHS 
7/5/2011  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  7/19/2011   
7/1/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/1/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION IN LIMINE: TESTIMONIAL STATEMENTS 
6/30/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/30/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING INTERVIEW OF DETECTIVE MANUEL FRESQUEZ 
6/29/2011  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)  6/29/2011   
6/28/2011  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  6/28/2011   
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE LINGERING DOUBT AS A MITIGATING FACTOR  
6/27/2011  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  6/28/2011   
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE CERTAIN TESTIMONY FROM DEFENSE EXPERTS AND TO PRECLUDE HEARSAY STATEMENTS OF VICTIM 
6/27/2011  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  6/28/2011   
NOTE: TO PROHIBIT DEFENSE COUNSEL FROM ASKING PROSPECTIVE JURORS THEIR VIEWS ON SPECIFIC TYPES OF MITIGATION OR AGGRAVATION, OR POSING 
6/27/2011  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  6/28/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING ARGUMENT RELATING TO WEIGHT OF MITIGATION EVIDENCE 
6/27/2011  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  6/28/2011   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE; TESTIMONAL STATEMENTS  
6/27/2011  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  6/28/2011   
NOTE: DISPLAY OF NUDE PHOTOGRAPHS  
6/27/2011  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  6/28/2011   
NOTE: MOTION(S) TO WITHDRAW  
6/23/2011  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)  6/23/2011   
6/22/2011  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  6/22/2011   
6/21/2011  CER - Certificate - Party (001)  6/22/2011   
NOTE: OF REQUESTING JUDGE 
6/20/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  6/22/2011   
NOTE: TO CERTIFICATE OF REQUESTING JUDGE 
6/20/2011  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  6/20/2011   
6/17/2011  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)  6/20/2011   
6/17/2011  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  6/20/2011   
NOTE: DECLINING JURISDICTION 
6/17/2011  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  6/17/2011   
6/16/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  6/16/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO EXTEND DISCLOSURE DEADLINE 
6/16/2011  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  6/21/2011   
6/15/2011  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  6/21/2011   
6/15/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/20/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING INTERVIEW OF MARIE HALL 
6/15/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/15/2011   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCLOSURE DEADLINE 
6/15/2011  REQ - Request - Party (001)  6/15/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR OUT-OF –STATE SUMMONS PURSUANT TO A.R.S § 13-4093  
6/15/2011  CER - Certificate - Party (001)  6/15/2011   
NOTE: CERTIFICATE OF REQUESTING JUDGE 
6/14/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  6/14/2011   
6/14/2011  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  6/14/2011   
NOTE: STATES EIGHTH SUPPLEMENTAL / 
6/10/2011  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  6/10/2011   
NOTE: SEVENTH SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES 
6/9/2011  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  6/9/2011   
6/9/2011  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  6/9/2011   
NOTE: CASE STATUS MEMORANDUM  
6/9/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/9/2011   
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL; ANY AND ALL MATERIALS RELATED TO THE STATE’S CONTACT WITH ANY AND ALL OF THE WITNESSES LISTED BY BOTH THE STATE AND MS. ARIAS 
6/9/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/9/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING INTERVIEW OF CRIMINALIST ALAN KREITL 
6/9/2011  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  6/10/2011   
NOTE: FOR COURTROOM DECORUM 
6/9/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/10/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING MOTIONS AND EVIDENTIARY ISSUES 
6/9/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/10/2011   
NOTE: NOTICE OF REJECTION OF INTERVIEW WITH CRIMINALIST ALAN KREITL AND REQUEST FOR RESCHEDULING 
6/9/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/10/2011   
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL; ANY AND ALL MATERIALS RELATED TO THE FINDINGS OF CRIMNALIST CRIMINALIST ALAN KREITL 
6/8/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  6/8/2011   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 10, 2011 
6/6/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/8/2011   
NOTE: OF OPPORTUNITY TO INTERVIEW 
6/6/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/8/2011   
NOTE: SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE; MOTION TO PRECLUDE LETTERS PURPORTEDLY WRITTEN B TRAVIS ALEXANDER TO DEFENDANT 
6/6/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/6/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR COURTROOM DECORUM  
6/6/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/6/2011   
NOTE: OF POTENTIAL WITNESSES FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING OF JUNE 10, 2011 
6/6/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/6/2011   
NOTE: NOTICE OF POTENTIAL TRIAL CONFLICT 
6/1/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/1/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING INTERVIEW OF DETECTIVE SCOTT MOLANDER 
5/31/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  5/31/2011   
5/31/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/31/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING INTERVIEWS OF FORENSIC CRIMINALIST ELIZABETH NORTHCUTT, FORENSIC CRIMINALIST LISA PERRY AND LATENT PRINT EXAMINER HEATHER CONNER 
5/31/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/31/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING INTERVIEW OF STEVE TAYLOR 
5/27/2011  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  6/2/2011   
5/26/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/26/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING INTERVIEWS OF CRIMINALIST RON NIES, RALPHEAL JOSEPH COLOMBO AND JAMIE COLOMBO 
5/25/2011  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  5/25/2011   
5/24/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/24/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING INTERVIEW OF OFFICER MICHAEL GALIETI  
5/24/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/24/2011   
NOTE: TO COMPEL; ANY AND ALL MATERIALS RELATED TO THE ATTEMPTED INTERROGATION OF MATT MCCARTNEY  
5/24/2011  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  6/2/2011   
NOTE: 04/04/11; SCOTT A KINDLE 
5/24/2011  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  6/2/2011   
NOTE: 03/21/11 SCOTT A KINDLE 
5/23/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/23/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING INTERVIEW OF CRIME SCENE TECHNICIAN LAURA ANZELONE 
5/23/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/23/2011   
NOTE: STATES SIXTH SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES 
5/18/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/18/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING INTERVIEWS OF OFFICER MANUEL FRESQUEZ, SERGEANT DOMINICK KAUFMAN 
5/13/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/13/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING INTERVIEWS OF RYAN BURNS, CLANCY TALBOT, MARK UDY AND LESLIE UDY 
5/10/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  5/10/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO COMPEL THE NOTES OF DETECTIVE FLORES 
5/10/2011  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  5/10/2011   
5/10/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/10/2011   
5/9/2011  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  5/9/2011   
5/9/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/9/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Compel the Notes of Detective Flores 
5/6/2011  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  5/6/2011   
5/5/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/9/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING INTERVIEW OF DETECTIVE ESTEBAN FLORES 
5/5/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/9/2011   
NOTE: REGARDING INTERVIEW OF KEVIN D. HORN 
5/2/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  5/4/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE WITNESSES NOT INTERVIEWED BY JUNE 30,2011 
4/29/2011  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  4/29/2011   
4/28/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/3/2011   
NOTE: TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO LIMIT DISCLOSURE 
4/27/2011  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  4/27/2011   
4/22/2011  REP - Report - Party (001)  4/22/2011   
NOTE: Case Management Plan 
4/22/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/22/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Limit Disclosure 
4/20/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/20/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Preclude Witnesses not Interviewed by June 30, 2011 
4/18/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/18/2011   
NOTE: Supplemental / of Guilt Phase Witnesses  
4/18/2011  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  4/21/2011   
4/13/2011  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  4/13/2011   
4/8/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/8/2011   
NOTE: Case Management Plan 
4/8/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/8/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Witnesses; Evidentiary Hearing Related to the Admissibility of the Letters Written by Mr. Alexander to Ms. Arias 
4/6/2011  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  4/6/2011   
3/29/2011  AFF - Affidavit - Party (001)  3/31/2011   
3/29/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  3/29/2011   
3/25/2011  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  3/25/2011   
3/23/2011  LET - Letter - Party (001)  3/29/2011   
3/22/2011  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  3/29/2011   
3/21/2011  LET - Letter - Party (001)  3/29/2011   
3/21/2011  LET - Letter - Party (001)  3/29/2011   
3/21/2011  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  3/22/2011   
NOTE: Renewed Motion to Withdraw 
3/18/2011  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  3/18/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw and/or Determine Counsel; Supplemental 
3/18/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  3/18/2011   
NOTE: Defendants Response; States Motion to Continue 
3/17/2011  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  3/17/2011   
3/15/2011  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  3/15/2011   
NOTE: STATES/ TRIAL 
3/14/2011  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  3/14/2011   
3/14/2011  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  3/14/2011   
3/14/2011  017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (001)  3/14/2011   
3/9/2011  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  3/9/2011   
NOTE: Motion To Withdraw and/or Determine Counsel 
3/9/2011  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  3/18/2011   
NOTE: 2-25-11 SCOTT A KINDLE 
3/4/2011  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  3/4/2011   
3/2/2011  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  3/2/2011   
2/25/2011  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  4/21/2011   
2/25/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  3/10/2011   
NOTE: MTN TO PRECLUDE LETTERS PURPORTEDLY WRITTEN BY TRAVIS ALEXANDER TO THE DEFENDANT AND LETTERS WITH ENVELOPE 
2/22/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/22/2011   
NOTE: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN  
2/16/2011  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  2/17/2011   
NOTE: FOR ORDER THAT A COMPLETE COPY OF THE STATE'S FILE BE MADE AND TURNED OVER TO THE COURT FOR REVIEW AND TO BE SEALED FOR APPELLATE REVIEW 
2/9/2011  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  2/9/2011   
NOTE: FOR STATE'S IMPEACHMENT EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO BRADY V. MARYLAND 
1/31/2011  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  1/31/2011   
1/27/2011  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  2/1/2011   
1/27/2011  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  2/1/2011   
1/26/2011  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  1/26/2011   
1/26/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/26/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR ORDER THAT A COMPLETE COPY OF THE STATE’S FILE BE MADE AND TURNED OVER TO THE COURT FOR REVIEW AND TO BE SEALED FOR APPELLATE REVIEW 
1/26/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/26/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ FOR STATES IMPEACHMENT EVIDENCE 
1/26/2011  REL - Reply - Party (001)  1/26/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY RE; DEFENDANT’S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS CHARGES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS DEATH DUE TO PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT AND RECENTLY DISCOVERED BRADY VIOLATIONS 
1/25/2011  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  2/1/2011   
1/18/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/18/2011   
1/18/2011  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  1/18/2011   
1/18/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/18/2011   
NOTE: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN  
1/18/2011  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  1/18/2011   
NOTE: TO DISMISS CHARGES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS DEATH DUE TO PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT AND RECENTLY DISCOVERED BRADY VIOLATIONS 
1/18/2011  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  1/21/2011   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSES; MOTION TO PRECLUDE LETTERS PURPORTEDLY WRITTEN BY TRAVIS ALEXANDER TO DEFENDANT FILED ON DECEMBER 22, 2010 
1/13/2011  ORD - Order - Party (001)  1/19/2011   
NOTE: THAT MESA POLICE DEPARMTNE PROVIDE MS ARIAS' WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO HAVE HER EXPERT CONDUCT HER INSPECTION UPON THE ITEM LISTED IN THE MESA POLICE DEPARTMENT IMPOUND RECORD 
1/13/2011  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  1/20/2011   
1/13/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  1/13/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION TIN LIMINE SINGING COMPETITION 
1/12/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  1/12/2011   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE; MOTION TO PRECLUDE LETTERS PURPORTEDLY WRITTEN BY TRAVIS ALEXANDER TO DEFENDANT 
1/12/2011  RES - Response - Party (001)  1/12/2011   
NOTE: TO MOTION IN LIMINE PRETRIAL MEDIA INTERVIEWS 
1/10/2011  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  1/10/2011   
1/7/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/7/2011   
NOTE: TO ALLOW EXPERT EXAMINATION OF EVIDENCE  
1/7/2011  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  1/12/2011   
1/5/2011  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  1/6/2011   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RENEWED / CHARGES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO DISMISS DEATH DUE TO PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT AND RECENTLY DISCOVERED VIOLATIONS 
12/30/2010  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  12/30/2010   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE; PRE-TRIAL MEDIA INTERVIEWS  
12/30/2010  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  1/3/2011   
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE; SINGING COMPETITION  
12/6/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/6/2010   
12/2/2010  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  12/2/2010   
11/29/2010  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)  11/29/2010   
NOTE: SPECIFIC  
11/24/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/24/2010   
11/23/2010  ORD - Order - Party (001)  11/30/2010   
NOTE: COUNSEL HAS CHOSEN CHROMOSOMAL LABS 1825 W CREST LANE PHOENIX AZ 85027 AS THE LABORATORY WHO WILL EXAMINE THE EVIDENCE FOR BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL AND DNA 
11/23/2010  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  12/1/2010   
11/19/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  11/19/2010   
11/18/2010  LET - Letter - Party (001)  11/22/2010   
NOTE:  
11/17/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/22/2010   
NOTE: FOR DNA TESTING 
11/15/2010  REP - Report - Party (001)  11/15/2010   
NOTE: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN  
11/15/2010  REQ - Request - Party (001)  11/16/2010   
NOTE: FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY RELATING TO ANY AND ALL TESTING PERFORMED UPON MS ARIAS JOURNAL BY THE STATE 
11/9/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  11/9/2010   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY RELATING TO THE ASSERTION THAT THE LETTERS SUBMITTED 
10/29/2010  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  11/3/2010   
10/28/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  10/28/2010   
10/27/2010  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  10/27/2010   
10/26/2010  REQ - Request - Party (001)  10/26/2010   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY RELATING TO THE ASSERTION THAT THE LETTERS SUBMITTED TO THE COURT ARE FORGED 
10/26/2010  REP - Report - Party (001)  10/26/2010   
NOTE: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
9/16/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  9/16/2010   
9/9/2010  REP - Report - Party (001)  9/9/2010   
NOTE: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN  
9/8/2010  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  9/8/2010   
8/16/2010  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  8/26/2010   
NOTE: 06/18/10 BY SCOTT A. KINDLE 
8/13/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  8/13/2010   
8/11/2010  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  8/16/2010   
8/11/2010  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  8/11/2010   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL 
8/9/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  8/9/2010   
8/5/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/6/2010   
NOTE: RENEWED NOTICE OF REQUESTED E-MAIL ACCOUNTS  
8/3/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/3/2010   
NOTE: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN  
7/23/2010  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  7/23/2010   
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE LETTERS PURPORTEDLY WRITTEN BY TRAVIS ALEXANDER TO DEFENDANT 
7/23/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/23/2010   
NOTE: MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE BY ORDER OF THE COURT OF ORIGINAL LETTERS PURPORTEDLY WRITTEN BY TRAVIS ALEXANDER, AND REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO STATES ORAL MOTION FOR DISCOVERY 
7/19/2010  025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)  7/19/2010   
7/15/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/15/2010   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO STATE’S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY  
7/15/2010  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  7/28/2010   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE LETTERS PURPORTEDLY WRITTEN BY TRAVIS ALEXANDER TO DEFENDANT 
7/14/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/14/2010   
NOTE: NOTICE OF WITNESS IN SUPPORT OF MITIGATING FACTORS 
7/7/2010  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  7/7/2010   
7/1/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  7/1/2010   
7/1/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/1/2010   
NOTE: TO REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER 
7/1/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/1/2010   
NOTE: OF DISCLOSURE REGARDING VICTIMS JOURNAL 
7/1/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/1/2010   
NOTE: NOTICE REGARDING TEXT MESSAGES STORED IN VICTIM TRAVIS ALEXANDER'S CELLULAR TELEPHONE 
6/30/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  6/30/2010   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY RELATING TO ANY AND ALL HANDWRITING ANALYSIS PERFORMED BY THE STATE 
6/29/2010  REQ - Request - Party (001)  6/29/2010   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER 
6/29/2010  REQ - Request - Party (001)  6/29/2010   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY RELATING TO ANY AND ALL HANDWRITING ANALYSIS PERFORMED BY THE STATE 
6/23/2010  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  6/23/2010   
6/22/2010  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)  6/22/2010   
6/22/2010  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  6/22/2010   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES 
6/16/2010  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  6/16/2010   
6/16/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/21/2010   
NOTE: FOR DEPOSITION 
6/15/2010  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  6/15/2010   
6/14/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/15/2010   
NOTE: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN  
6/14/2010  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)  6/14/2010   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME LIMIT TO RESPOND TO THE STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE LETTERS PURPORTEDLY WRITTEN BY TRAVIS ALEXANDER TO DEFENDANT AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING  
6/10/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/10/2010   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE LETTERS PURPORTEDLY WRITTEN BY TRAVIS ALEXANDER TO DEFENDANT  
6/9/2010  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  6/9/2010   
6/9/2010  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  6/10/2010   
NOTE: SERVED 06/07/10 
6/9/2010  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  6/10/2010   
NOTE: SERVED 06/07/10 
6/9/2010  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  6/10/2010   
NOTE: SERVED 06/07/10 
6/7/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/7/2010   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESSES FOR JUNE 18, 2010 EVIDENTIARY HEARING  
6/3/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/4/2010   
NOTE: MOTION TO ALLOW EXPERT EXAMINATION OF EVIDENCE  
6/2/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  6/2/2010   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO DISMISS CHARGES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS DEATH DUE TO BRADY VIOLATION 
5/26/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/26/2010   
NOTE: MOTION TO SET CAPITAL CASE FOR TRIAL BEYOND CURRENT LAST DAY OF AUGUST 31 ,2010 – TRIAL CONFLICT  
5/20/2010  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  5/21/2010   
NOTE: CHARGES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS DEATH DUE TO BRADY VIOLATION 
5/5/2010  REL - Reply - Party (001)  5/5/2010   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY; MOTION TO DISMISS THE ALTERNATIVE CHARGE OF FELONY MURDER 
4/26/2010  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  4/26/2010   
NOTE: THE ALTERNATIVE CHARGE OF FELONY MURDER 
4/26/2010  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  4/26/2010   
NOTE: 4TH SUPPLEMENTAL 
4/23/2010  CER - Certificate - Party (001)  4/26/2010   
NOTE: OF REQUESTING JUDGE 
4/23/2010  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  4/26/2010   
4/23/2010  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  4/23/2010   
4/22/2010  ORD - Order - Party (001)  4/26/2010   
NOTE: THAT THE MARICOPA COUNTY SHERRIFF'S DEPTARTMENT TRANSPORT THE DEFENDANT TO THE LIONS VISION CENTER AT 1016 N 32ND ST, PHOENIX, AZ 85008 WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER 
4/21/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/21/2010   
NOTE: TO TRANSPORT  
4/20/2010  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  4/20/2010   
4/19/2010  REQ - Request - Party (001)  4/20/2010   
NOTE: FOR OUT-OF –STATE SUMMONS PURSUANT TO A.R.S § 13-4093  
4/19/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/20/2010   
NOTE: OF WITNESSES AND REQUESTED E-MAIL ACCOUNTS FOR JUNE 18, 2010 EVIDENTIARY HEARING  
4/19/2010  CER - Certificate - Party (001)  4/26/2010   
NOTE: OF REQUESTING JUDGE 
4/15/2010  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  4/15/2010   
NOTE: THE ALTERNATIVE CHARGE OF FELONY MURDER 
4/7/2010  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  4/7/2010   
4/7/2010  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  4/7/2010   
4/7/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  4/7/2010   
NOTE: to motion to compel text messages and emails obtained from the victims phone and or any of his email accounts 
4/5/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/5/2010   
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPELTEXT MESSAGES AND E-MAILS OBTAINED FROM THE VICTIM’S PHONE AND OR ANY OF HIS E-MAIL ACCOUNTS  
3/31/2010  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/31/2010   
NOTE: OF UNDERLYING FELONY 
3/17/2010  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  3/17/2010   
3/11/2010  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  3/25/2010   
NOTE: 3 COPIES OF AGREEMENT 
3/10/2010  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  3/25/2010   
NOTE: E-MAIL COMMUNICATION 
3/10/2010  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  3/11/2010   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE; MOTION TO JOIN SUPERIOR COURT NOS: CR2009-175039-001DT; CR2009-131382-001DT 
3/10/2010  REQ - Request - Party (001)  3/11/2010   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS RENEWED / FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ORAL ARGUMENT 
3/5/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  3/5/2010   
3/4/2010  CER - Certificate - Party (001)  3/8/2010   
NOTE: OF REQUESTING JUDGE 
3/1/2010  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  3/1/2010   
2/24/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  2/24/2010   
NOTE: TO REQUEST FOR GREATER SPECIFICITY AS TO THE ALTERNATIVE CHARGE OF FELONY MURDER 
2/12/2010  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/12/2010   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR GREATER SPECIFICITY AS TO THE ALTERNATIVE CHARGE  
2/12/2010  STA - Statement - Party (001)  2/16/2010   
NOTE: PREHEARING 
2/9/2010  STA - Statement - Party (001)  2/9/2010   
NOTE: PRE-HEARING STATEMENT AND REQUEST FOR MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 
2/5/2010  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  2/19/2010   
NOTE: 01-12-2010 BY SCOTT A. KINDLE, RPR 
2/3/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/3/2010   
2/3/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  2/3/2010   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO DISMISS ALLEGATION OF DEATH PENALTY CONFLICT OF INTEREST  
2/2/2010  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)  2/2/2010   
2/2/2010  MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)  2/2/2010   
NOTE: DECISION ORDER 
1/22/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/22/2010   
1/21/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/21/2010   
1/19/2010  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  1/20/2010   
NOTE: ALLEGATION OF DEATH PENALTY CONFLICT OF INTEREST 
1/14/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  1/14/2010   
1/14/2010  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  1/27/2010   
NOTE: 11/13/09 SCOTT A KINDLE RPR 
1/12/2010  CER - Certificate - Party (001)  1/19/2010   
NOTE: OF REQUESTING JUDGE 
1/12/2010  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  1/21/2010   
1/12/2010  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  1/13/2010   
NOTE: TO ALLOW JURY TO CONSIDER METHOD OF EXECUTION LETHAL INJECTION AS A MITIGATING FACTOR 
1/11/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  1/11/2010   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO RENEWED REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY RELATING TO ANY AND ALL FORENSIC EXAMINATIONS CONDUCTED UPON ANY AND ALL ELECTRONIC MEDIA 
1/8/2010  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  1/8/2010   
1/8/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  1/8/2010   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE FINGERPRINT EVIDENCE 
1/8/2010  REP - Report - Party (001)  1/8/2010   
NOTE: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN  
1/7/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  1/7/2010   
1/7/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/7/2010   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO ALLOW JURY TO CONSIDER METHOD OF EXECUTION (LETHAL INJECTION) AS A MITIGATING FACTOR 
1/5/2010  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  1/5/2010   
1/5/2010  REQ - Request - Party (001)  1/5/2010   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR OUT-OF –STATE SUMMONS PURSUANT TO A.R.S § 13-4093  
1/4/2010  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  1/4/2010   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR HEARING; ADMISSIBILITY OF INTERVIEWS CONDUCTED BY “48 HOURS”  
12/22/2009  REQ - Request - Party (001)  12/28/2009   
NOTE: RENEWED / FOR DISCOVERY RELATING TO ANY AND ALL FORENSIC EXAMINATIONS CONDUCTED UPON ANY AND ALL ELECTRONIC MEDIA 
12/22/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/22/2009   
NOTE: TO EXCLUDE FINGERPRINT EVIDENCE 
12/2/2009  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  12/2/2009   
12/1/2009  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  12/10/2009   
12/1/2009  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  12/10/2009   
11/25/2009  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  11/25/2009   
11/25/2009  RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)  12/1/2009   
NOTE: RENEWED AND CLARIFIED / RELATING TO THE CELLULAR TELEPHONES SEIZED BY MESA POLICE DEPARTMENT 
11/24/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/24/2009   
NOTE: STATES THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES  
11/20/2009  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  11/24/2009   
11/19/2009  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  11/19/2009   
11/18/2009  RES - Response - Party (001)  11/18/2009   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO STRIKE STATES DEATH NOTICE SINCE DEATH BY LETHAL INJECTION WILL RESULT IN CRUEL AND UNUSUAL PUNISHMENT  
11/18/2009  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  11/18/2009   
11/17/2009  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  11/18/2009   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM/SERVED 11/16/09 
11/13/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/16/2009   
NOTE: PROOF OF SERVICE 
11/9/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/9/2009   
NOTE: TO STRIKE STATE’S DEATH NOTICE SINCE DEATH BY LETHA INJECTION WILL RESULT IN CRUEL AND UNUSUAL PUNISHMENT 
11/9/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/9/2009   
NOTE: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN  
11/6/2009  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  11/6/2009   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL 
10/28/2009  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  10/28/2009   
10/28/2009  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  10/28/2009   
10/26/2009  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  10/26/2009   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY RELATING TO ANY AND ALL FORENSIC EXAMINATIONS CONDUCTED UPON ANY AND ALL ELECTRONIC MEDIA 
10/26/2009  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  10/26/2009   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADDTIONAL DISCOVERY RELATING TO ANY AND ALL FORENSIC EXAMINATIONS CONDUCTED UPON ANY AND ALL ELECTRONIC MEDIA 
10/26/2009  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  11/6/2009   
NOTE: 08/07/09; SCOTT A. KINDLE 
10/15/2009  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  10/15/2009   
10/13/2009  REQ - Request - Party (001)  10/13/2009   
NOTE: FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY RELATING TO ANY AND ALL FORENSIC EXAMINATIONS CONDUCTED UPON ANY AND ALL ELECTRONIC MEDIA  
10/1/2009  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  10/1/2009   
10/1/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/1/2009   
9/24/2009  RES - Response - Party (001)  9/24/2009   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO PROHIBIT THE STATE FROM VIEWING AND/OR ACCESSING JAIL VISITATION RECORDS 
9/23/2009  REQ - Request - Party (001)  9/23/2009   
NOTE: FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY RELATING TO DNA EVIDENCE 
9/23/2009  REP - Report - Party (001)  9/24/2009   
NOTE: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN  
9/18/2009  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  9/18/2009   
9/18/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/21/2009   
NOTE: TO SET CAPITAL CASE FOR TRIAL BEYOND CURRENT LAST DAY OF MARCH 3,2009 
9/16/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/16/2009   
NOTE: TO PROHIBIT THE STATE FROM VIEWING AND/OR ACCESSING JAIL VISITATION RECORDS 
8/26/2009  017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (001)  8/26/2009   
8/19/2009  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  8/19/2009   
8/18/2009  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  8/24/2009   
8/17/2009  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  8/17/2009   
8/11/2009  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/11/2009   
8/5/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/7/2009   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
7/13/2009  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  7/13/2009   
7/8/2009  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  7/8/2009   
6/17/2009  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  6/17/2009   
6/11/2009  REQ - Request - Party (001)  6/12/2009   
NOTE: FOR DETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON ALLEGED AGGRAVATING FACTOR 
5/27/2009  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  5/27/2009   
5/22/2009  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  6/4/2009   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION (PRO PER) 
5/20/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/22/2009   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN  
5/19/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/19/2009   
4/23/2009  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  4/23/2009   
4/22/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/24/2009   
NOTE: NO OBJECTION TO STATE'S REQUEST TO MOVE MAY 1, 2009 STATUS CONFERENCE 
4/21/2009  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  4/21/2009   
NOTE: STATUS CONFERENCE 
3/26/2009  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  3/26/2009   
3/23/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/25/2009   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
3/18/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/20/2009   
NOTE: FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY 
3/9/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/9/2009   
2/23/2009  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  2/23/2009   
2/20/2009  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  3/4/2009   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 02/18/2009; MITIGATION REPORT DATED 02/18/2009 
2/12/2009  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  2/12/2009   
2/6/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/10/2009   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
1/14/2009  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  1/14/2009   
1/8/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/8/2009   
12/23/2008  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  12/23/2008   
12/18/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/29/2008   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
11/6/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/7/2008   
NOTE: AMENDED/ OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY AGGRAVATING FACTORS WITNESSES AND EVIDENCE 
10/31/2008  NID - Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty - Party (001)  10/31/2008   
NOTE: AGGRAVATING FACTORS, WITNESSES AND EVIDENCE 
10/24/2008  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  10/24/2008   
10/24/2008  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  10/24/2008   
NOTE: FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL 
10/14/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  10/14/2008   
NOTE:  
10/7/2008  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  10/7/2008   
10/7/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/8/2008   
9/26/2008  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  9/30/2008   
9/26/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/30/2008   
9/26/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/30/2008   
9/22/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  9/22/2008   
9/22/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/22/2008   
9/22/2008  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  9/22/2008   
9/22/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/23/2008   
9/19/2008  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  9/24/2008   
NOTE: AND ORDER 
9/19/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/24/2008   
NOTE: AND ORDER 
9/19/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/24/2008   
9/18/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/18/2008   
9/17/2008  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  9/24/2008   
NOTE: AND ORDER 
9/17/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/24/2008   
NOTE: AND ORDER 
9/17/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/24/2008   
9/17/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/18/2008   
NOTE: OF DEFENSES 
9/17/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/18/2008   
NOTE: TO RESCHEDULE TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 
9/16/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/16/2008   
NOTE: TO EXTEND RULE 12.9 DEADLINE 
9/15/2008  REQ - Request - Party (001)  9/15/2008   
NOTE: FOR DISCLOSURE 
9/15/2008  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)  9/15/2008   
NOTE: TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
9/15/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/15/2008   
NOTE: RULE 15.2 / OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE 
9/12/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  9/12/2008   
9/11/2008  593 - ME: Case Location Change - Party (001)  9/11/2008   
9/8/2008  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  9/8/2008   
NOTE: SERVED 9/5/08 
7/23/2008  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  9/8/2008   
NOTE: EXEMPT ONLY 
7/9/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  9/8/2008   
7/9/2008  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  9/8/2008   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/11/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
10/22/2008  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
10/28/2008  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
12/18/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
2/10/2009  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/18/2009  9:00   Complex / Capital Case 
3/25/2009  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/10/2009  9:00   Complex / Capital Case 
5/1/2009  11:00   Complex / Capital Case 
5/22/2009  10:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/15/2009  8:30   Status Conference 
7/17/2009  11:30   Status Conference 
8/7/2009  15:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
9/25/2009  11:30   Complex / Capital Case 
10/27/2009  9:30   Status Conference 
11/13/2009  8:30   Status Conference 
11/30/2009  8:30   Status Conference 
12/11/2009  10:00   Complex / Capital Case 
1/12/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/29/2010  9:00   Trial Management Conference 
2/2/2010  8:30   Trial 
3/4/2010  10:30   Status Conference 
3/11/2010  10:00   Status Conference 
3/12/2010  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
4/16/2010  10:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/18/2010  10:00   Oral Argument 
7/2/2010  13:30   Status Conference 
8/5/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/11/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/16/2010  11:00   Trial 
9/14/2010  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
9/14/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/15/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
10/26/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/18/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
12/7/2010  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/20/2011  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/25/2011  15:00   Complex / Capital Case 
3/8/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
3/15/2011  14:00   Status Conference 
3/21/2011  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/29/2011  14:00   Status Conference 
4/4/2011  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/11/2011  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/3/2011  8:30   Status Conference 
5/25/2011  8:30   Oral Argument 
6/8/2011  15:30   Oral Argument 
6/10/2011  9:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/21/2011  11:00   Status Conference 
6/21/2011  11:30   Status Conference 
7/15/2011  8:30   Settlement Conference 
7/22/2011  8:29   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/22/2011  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/25/2011  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
7/26/2011  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
7/29/2011  8:30   Oral Argument 
8/2/2011  8:00   Trial 
8/2/2011  10:30   Trial 
8/8/2011  10:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
8/8/2011  16:30   Status Conference 
8/9/2011  10:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
8/10/2011  10:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
8/15/2011  10:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
8/16/2011  10:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
8/19/2011  10:30   Status Conference 
8/25/2011  14:00   Status Conference 
8/31/2011  10:00   Status Conference 
9/16/2011  13:30   Status Conference 
9/27/2011  10:30   Trial 
11/4/2011  13:30   Oral Argument 
11/16/2011  8:25   Status Conference 
11/21/2011  10:30   Oral Argument 
12/5/2011  8:20   Oral Argument 
12/6/2011  8:20   Oral Argument 
12/21/2011  8:25   Status Conference 
12/22/2011  8:15   Status Conference 
1/3/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/4/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/1/2012  10:30   Trial 
2/9/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/21/2012  10:30   Trial 
3/9/2012  11:00   Oral Argument 
5/18/2012  11:00   Complex / Capital Case 
7/12/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/2/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/6/2012  10:00   Complex / Capital Case 
9/24/2012  10:00   Oral Argument 
9/27/2012  8:30   Status Conference 
10/16/2012  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
10/17/2012  10:30   Trial 
10/18/2012  9:30   Complex / Capital Case 
10/30/2012  9:00   Complex / Capital Case 
11/7/2012  14:00   Oral Argument 
11/13/2012  10:00   Oral Argument 
11/15/2012  10:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/19/2012  10:00   Oral Argument 
11/19/2012  10:30   Trial 
11/26/2012  10:30   Trial 
12/4/2012  9:30   Oral Argument 
12/7/2012  14:30   Oral Argument 
12/10/2012  10:30   Trial 
12/11/2012  10:30   Trial 
12/12/2012  10:30   Trial 
12/14/2012  9:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
12/17/2012  10:30   Trial 
12/18/2012  10:30   Trial 
12/19/2012  10:30   Trial 
12/20/2012  9:00   Trial 
12/20/2012  13:30   Trial 
1/2/2013  10:30   Trial 
1/3/2013  10:30   Trial 
1/8/2013  10:30   Trial 
1/9/2013  10:30   Trial 
1/10/2013  10:30   Trial 
1/14/2013  10:30   Trial 
1/15/2013  10:30   Trial 
1/16/2013  10:30   Trial 
1/17/2013  10:30   Trial 
1/28/2013  10:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
1/29/2013  10:30   Trial 
1/30/2013  10:30   Trial 
1/31/2013  10:30   Trial 
2/4/2013  10:30   Trial 
2/5/2013  10:30   Trial 
2/6/2013  10:30   Trial 
2/6/2013  10:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
2/7/2013  10:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
2/11/2013  10:30   Trial 
2/12/2013  10:30   Trial 
2/13/2013  10:00   Evidentiary Hearing 
2/13/2013  13:30   Trial 
2/14/2013  10:30   Trial 
2/19/2013  10:30   Trial 
2/20/2013  10:30   Trial 
2/21/2013  10:30   Trial 
2/25/2013  10:30   Trial 
2/26/2013  10:30   Trial 
2/27/2013  10:30   Trial 
2/28/2013  10:30   Trial 
3/4/2013  10:30   Trial 
3/5/2013  10:30   Trial 
3/6/2013  10:30   Trial 
3/7/2013  10:30   Trial 
3/13/2013  10:30   Trial 
3/14/2013  10:30   Trial 
3/15/2013  9:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
3/18/2013  10:15   Evidentiary Hearing 
3/18/2013  11:00   Trial 
3/19/2013  10:30   Trial 
3/20/2013  13:00   Trial 
3/21/2013  10:30   Trial 
3/25/2013  10:30   Trial 
3/26/2013  10:30   Trial 
3/27/2013  9:00   Oral Argument 
3/27/2013  10:30   Trial 
3/28/2013  9:20   Trial 
4/2/2013  9:15   Trial 
4/3/2013  9:30   Trial 
4/4/2013  9:30   Trial 
4/8/2013  9:30   Trial 
4/9/2013  9:30   Trial 
4/10/2013  9:30   Trial 
4/11/2013  9:30   Trial 
4/12/2013  9:30   Trial 
4/15/2013  11:00   Trial 
4/16/2013  9:30   Trial 
4/17/2013  9:30   Trial 
4/18/2013  9:30   Trial 
4/19/2013  10:00   Status Conference 
4/23/2013  9:30   Trial 
4/24/2013  9:30   Trial 
4/25/2013  9:30   Trial 
4/30/2013  10:30   Status Conference 
5/1/2013  9:00   Trial 
5/2/2013  9:00   Trial 
5/3/2013  9:00   Trial 
5/6/2013  9:00   Trial 
5/7/2013  10:00   Trial 
5/8/2013  10:00   Trial 
5/9/2013  13:00   Trial 
5/14/2013  10:00   Trial 
5/15/2013  10:00   Trial 
5/16/2013  10:00   Trial 
5/20/2013  10:00   Trial 
5/21/2013  9:30   Trial 
5/22/2013  10:00   Trial 
5/23/2013  10:00   Trial 
6/20/2013  8:30   Status Conference 
7/16/2013  10:30   Oral Argument 
7/18/2013  8:30   Oral Argument 
7/18/2013  10:00   Trial 
8/26/2013  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/13/2013  8:30   Telephonic Conference 
9/16/2013  9:15   Status Conference 
9/27/2013  14:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
10/4/2013  8:30   Oral Argument 
10/18/2013  10:00   Oral Argument 
10/24/2013  10:00   Settlement Conference 
11/1/2013  13:30   Oral Argument 
11/19/2013  8:30   Status Conference 
11/26/2013  8:00   Oral Argument 
12/3/2013  8:20   Oral Argument 
12/6/2013  11:15   Status Conference 
12/13/2013  13:15   Oral Argument 
1/3/2014  14:30   Oral Argument 
1/13/2014  9:30   Oral Argument 
1/28/2014  8:30   Oral Argument 
2/11/2014  15:30   Status Conference 
2/19/2014  9:30   Oral Argument 
2/19/2014  9:30   Status Conference 
3/17/2014  9:00   Trial 
3/17/2014  9:30   Oral Argument 
4/11/2014  11:00   Complex / Capital Case 
5/8/2014  8:15   Status Conference 
5/16/2014  10:00   Complex / Capital Case 
5/20/2014  13:30   Oral Argument 
5/21/2014  13:15   Oral Argument 
5/29/2014  13:15   Oral Argument 
6/5/2014  8:30   Oral Argument 
6/20/2014  13:30   Oral Argument 
7/1/2014  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/11/2014  13:30   Oral Argument 
7/30/2014  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/4/2014  11:00   Oral Argument 
8/4/2014  14:30   Oral Argument 
8/13/2014  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/20/2014  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
8/22/2014  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
9/2/2014  9:00   Complex / Capital Case 
9/3/2014  8:30   Status Conference 
9/4/2014  8:30   Status Conference 
9/8/2014  8:30   Trial 
9/15/2014  8:15   Complex / Capital Case 
9/15/2014  8:30   Oral Argument 
9/16/2014  10:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/22/2014  10:45   Oral Argument 
9/26/2014  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/29/2014  8:30   Trial 
10/1/2014  10:00   Oral Argument 
10/1/2014  10:30   Trial 
10/2/2014  8:30   Trial 
10/6/2014  9:30   Trial 
10/7/2014  9:30   Trial 
10/8/2014  9:30   Trial 
10/16/2014  10:00   Trial 
10/16/2014  10:00   Oral Argument 
10/20/2014  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
10/21/2014  9:30   Trial 
10/22/2014  9:30   Trial 
10/23/2014  9:30   Trial 
10/27/2014  9:30   Trial 
10/28/2014  9:30   Trial 
10/30/2014  9:30   Trial 
11/3/2014  9:30   Trial 
11/4/2014  13:00   Oral Argument 
11/5/2014  10:00   Trial 
11/12/2014  9:30   Trial 
11/13/2014  9:30   Trial 
11/14/2014  8:00   Oral Argument 
11/17/2014  9:30   Trial 
11/18/2014  9:30   Trial 
11/20/2014  9:30   Trial 
11/21/2014  10:29   Evidentiary Hearing 
11/24/2014  9:30   Trial 
11/25/2014  9:30   Trial 
12/2/2014  9:30   Trial 
12/3/2014  9:30   Trial 
12/4/2014  9:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
12/8/2014  9:30   Status Conference 
12/10/2014  9:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
12/11/2014  9:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
12/15/2014  9:30   Trial 
12/16/2014  9:30   Trial 
12/17/2014  9:30   Trial 
12/18/2014  9:30   Trial 
1/5/2015  9:30   Trial 
1/6/2015  9:30   Trial 
1/6/2015  16:00   Status Conference 
1/7/2015  9:30   Status Conference 
1/8/2015  8:30   Oral Argument 
1/8/2015  9:30   Trial 
1/9/2015  13:30   Oral Argument 
1/12/2015  9:30   Trial 
1/13/2015  9:30   Trial 
1/14/2015  9:30   Trial 
1/15/2015  9:30   Trial 
1/20/2015  9:30   Trial 
1/21/2015  8:30   Oral Argument 
1/21/2015  13:00   Trial 
1/22/2015  9:30   Trial 
1/23/2015  13:30   Status Conference 
1/26/2015  9:15   Trial 
1/27/2015  9:30   Trial 
1/28/2015  11:30   Trial 
2/2/2015  9:30   Trial 
2/3/2015  9:30   Trial 
2/4/2015  9:30   Trial 
2/5/2015  9:30   Trial 
2/6/2015  13:30   Oral Argument 
2/9/2015  9:30   Trial 
2/10/2015  9:30   Trial 
2/11/2015  9:30   Trial 
2/12/2015  9:30   Trial 
2/18/2015  9:30   Trial 
2/19/2015  9:30   Trial 
2/23/2015  9:30   Trial 
2/24/2015  9:30   Trial 
2/25/2015  9:30   Trial 
2/26/2015  9:30   Trial 
3/2/2015  9:30   Trial 
3/3/2015  9:30   Trial 
3/4/2015  9:30   Trial 
3/5/2015  9:30   Trial 
4/13/2015  8:30   Sentencing 
4/24/2015  13:30   Status Conference 
5/8/2015  13:30   Oral Argument 
6/1/2015  8:30   Restitution Hearing 
6/22/2015  8:30   Restitution Hearing 
10/11/2021  9:30   Status Conference 
12/15/2021  9:40   Status Conference 
3/15/2022  9:20   Status Conference 
6/14/2022  9:00   Status Conference 
8/15/2022  9:30   Status Conference 
10/17/2022  9:00   Status Conference 
12/16/2022  8:30   Status Conference 
1/27/2023  8:30   Status Conference 
3/31/2023  9:00   Status Conference 
5/19/2023  11:00   Status Conference 
5/19/2023  14:30   Status Conference 
7/7/2023  11:00   Status Conference 
10/3/2023  8:30   Status Conference 
1/17/2024  8:30   Status Conference