Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Maricopa      
Party is a minor: name not published   Defendant  M   Walton, Michael   Palmer  CR2008-007753-001  
Party is a minor: name not published   Defendant  M   Wallin, D   Palmer  CR2008-007753-002  
Party is a minor: name not published   Defendant  M   Defender, Public   Hartsell  CR2008-007753-003  
Party is a minor: name not published   Defendant  M   Hindmarch, Jaime   Gentry  CR2008-007753-004  
Clerk Of The Court - (6)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Not Published  13-2321 (F3)  STREET GANG  5/1/2008  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  10/10/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  10/10/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  10/10/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  11/12/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  11/12/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  11/12/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  11/12/2008 
Not Published  13-2321 (F3)  STREET GANG  5/1/2008  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  10/9/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/9/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/9/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/9/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  12/9/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  10/9/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  10/9/2008 
Not Published  13-2321 (F3)  STREET GANG  5/1/2008  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  9/26/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  9/26/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  9/26/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Dismis Mental Incompeten  Dismissed Due To Mental Incompetence  10/24/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Dismis Mental Incompeten  Dismissed Due To Mental Incompetence  10/24/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Dismis Mental Incompeten  Dismissed Due To Mental Incompetence  10/24/2008 
Not Published  13-1202 (F3)  THREAT-INTIMIDATE  5/1/2008  Dismis Mental Incompeten  Dismissed Due To Mental Incompetence  10/24/2008 
Not Published  13-2321 (F3)  STREET GANG  5/1/2008  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  2/18/2009 
Not Published  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  5/1/2008  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  2/18/2009 
Not Published  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  5/1/2008  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  2/18/2009 
Not Published  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  5/1/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  3/19/2009 
Not Published  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  5/1/2008  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  3/19/2009 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
1/19/2017  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (002)  1/23/2017   
NOTE: COUNTS 8/13/14 DESIGNATED AS A FELONY 
7/18/2016  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  7/19/2016   
NOTE: COUNT 1,2,3/FELONY 
11/20/2014  049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (003)  11/20/2014   
11/14/2014  CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (003)  11/18/2014   
7/6/2012  DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (003)  7/10/2012   
7/3/2012  585 - ME: Disp Rev/Doc-Rev Arr/Hrg - Party (003)  7/3/2012   
6/28/2012  PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (003)  7/3/2012   
6/28/2012  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (003)  7/2/2012   
6/28/2012  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (003)  7/13/2012   
6/28/2012  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (003)  7/18/2012   
6/22/2012  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)  6/22/2012   
6/14/2012  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (004)  7/2/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 22 
6/11/2012  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (003)  6/11/2012   
6/5/2012  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (003)  6/5/2012   
5/21/2012  112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (003)  5/21/2012   
5/16/2012  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (003)  5/25/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 17 
5/16/2012  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (003)  5/25/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 15 
5/16/2012  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (003)  5/25/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 16 
5/8/2012  PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (004)  5/18/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 22 
11/23/2011  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (003)  11/25/2011   
11/22/2011  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (003)  11/29/2011   
NOTE: COUNT 15 
11/22/2011  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (003)  11/29/2011   
NOTE: COUNT 17 
11/22/2011  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (003)  11/29/2011   
NOTE: COUNT 16 
9/13/2011  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (003)  9/14/2011   
NOTE: COUNT 15 
9/13/2011  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (003)  9/14/2011   
NOTE: COUNT 17 
9/13/2011  MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (003)  9/14/2011   
NOTE: COUNT 16 
6/21/2011  MPL - Modification of Probation Level - Party (003)  6/22/2011   
4/11/2011  MPL - Modification of Probation Level - Party (003)  4/13/2011   
3/28/2011  MPL - Modification of Probation Level - Party (003)  3/31/2011   
3/3/2011  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (003)  3/9/2011   
4/6/2009  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (004)  4/8/2009   
3/25/2009  189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (004)  3/25/2009   
3/19/2009  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (004)  3/26/2009   
3/19/2009  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (004)  3/26/2009   
3/19/2009  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (004)  3/26/2009   
3/19/2009  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (004)  3/27/2009   
3/18/2009  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (004)  3/20/2009   
NOTE: OF LETTER 
3/11/2009  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  3/11/2009   
2/20/2009  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (004)  2/20/2009   
2/18/2009  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (004)  2/19/2009   
2/2/2009  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (004)  2/2/2009   
1/27/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  1/27/2009   
1/26/2009  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)  2/5/2009   
1/23/2009  123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (004)  1/23/2009   
1/20/2009  SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (004)  1/27/2009   
1/20/2009  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (004)  2/5/2009   
12/24/2008  122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (004)  12/24/2008   
12/22/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/22/2008   
NOTE: to amend sentencing minute entry 
12/11/2008  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (002)  12/11/2008   
12/10/2008  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (002)  12/11/2008   
12/9/2008  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)  12/12/2008   
12/9/2008  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)  12/11/2008   
12/9/2008  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)  12/11/2008   
NOTE: RELATED CASE: CR2008-006722-004DT 
11/26/2008  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (004)  11/26/2008   
11/26/2008  122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (004)  11/26/2008   
11/25/2008  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  11/26/2008   
11/20/2008  120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (004)  11/20/2008   
11/19/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (004)  11/21/2008   
NOTE: FOR FULL RULE 11 EVALUATION 
11/18/2008  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)  11/18/2008   
11/14/2008  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  11/14/2008   
11/14/2008  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  11/14/2008   
11/12/2008  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  11/14/2008   
NOTE: RELATED CASE: CR2008-006722-003DT 
11/12/2008  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  11/14/2008   
11/12/2008  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  11/14/2008   
11/4/2008  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (003)  11/4/2008   
10/30/2008  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (004)  10/30/2008   
10/29/2008  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (003)  10/29/2008   
10/29/2008  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (003)  10/29/2008   
10/28/2008  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (003)  10/28/2008   
10/24/2008  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (003)  10/29/2008   
NOTE: RELATED CASE: CR2008-006722-007DT 
10/24/2008  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (003)  10/30/2008   
10/24/2008  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (003)  10/29/2008   
10/14/2008  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  10/14/2008   
10/14/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (004)  10/14/2008   
10/14/2008  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)  10/14/2008   
10/14/2008  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (003)  10/14/2008   
10/10/2008  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  10/14/2008   
10/9/2008  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)  10/10/2008   
10/2/2008  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (003)  10/2/2008   
10/1/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/2/2008   
9/29/2008  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (004)  9/29/2008   
9/29/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)  9/29/2008   
9/29/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/29/2008   
9/29/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  9/29/2008   
9/26/2008  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (003)  9/29/2008   
9/26/2008  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  9/30/2008   
9/26/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/30/2008   
9/26/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/30/2008   
9/24/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (003)  9/24/2008   
9/23/2008  173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (003)  9/23/2008   
9/23/2008  ALP - State's Allegation Pursuant to ARS 13-702.02 - Party (001)  9/23/2008   
NOTE:  
9/23/2008  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  9/23/2008   
NOTE:  
9/23/2008  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  9/23/2008   
NOTE:  
9/23/2008  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  9/23/2008   
NOTE: RULE 609 
9/23/2008  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  9/23/2008   
NOTE: DEFENDANT INTENDED TO PROMOTE, FURTHER OR ASSIST CRIMINAL CONDUCT BY CRIMINAL STREET GANG 
9/23/2008  REQ - Request - Party (001)  9/23/2008   
NOTE: FOR COURT INTERPRETER 
9/23/2008  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)  9/23/2008   
NOTE:  
9/23/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  9/23/2008   
NOTE:  
9/23/2008  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002)  9/23/2008   
NOTE:  
9/23/2008  ALP - State's Allegation Pursuant to ARS 13-702.02 - Party (002)  9/23/2008   
NOTE:  
9/23/2008  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002)  9/23/2008   
NOTE:  
9/23/2008  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002)  9/23/2008   
NOTE: RULE 609 
9/23/2008  ALG - Allegation - Party (002)  9/23/2008   
NOTE: DEFENDANT INTENDED TO PROMOTE, FURTHER, OR ASSIST CRIMINAL CONDUCT BY CRIMINAL STREET GANG 
9/23/2008  REQ - Request - Party (002)  9/23/2008   
NOTE: FOR COURT INTERPRETER 
9/23/2008  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (002)  9/23/2008   
NOTE:  
9/23/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)  9/23/2008   
NOTE:  
9/23/2008  ADN - Allegation of Dangerous Nature Felony - Party (004)  9/23/2008   
NOTE:  
9/23/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (004)  9/23/2008   
NOTE:  
9/23/2008  ALG - Allegation - Party (004)  9/23/2008   
NOTE: EFILING ID 243267 - STATE'S/DEFENDANT INTENDED TO PROMOTE, FURTHER, OR ASSIST CRIMINAL CONDUCT BY CRIMINAL STREET GANG 
9/23/2008  REQ - Request - Party (004)  9/23/2008   
NOTE: EFILING ID 243268 - FOR COURT INTERPRETER AND ORDER 
9/23/2008  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (004)  9/23/2008   
NOTE: EFILING ID 243270 
9/22/2008  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (004)  9/23/2008   
NOTE: TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
9/22/2008  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (004)  9/23/2008   
9/22/2008  RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (004)  9/23/2008   
9/22/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  9/22/2008   
9/22/2008  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)  9/22/2008   
9/19/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (004)  9/19/2008   
9/15/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (003)  9/15/2008   
9/12/2008  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (004)  9/12/2008   
NOTE: served 9/10/08 
9/12/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  9/12/2008   
9/12/2008  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)  9/12/2008   
9/10/2008  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (003)  9/11/2008   
NOTE: SERVED 9/8/08 
9/8/2008  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  9/8/2008   
NOTE: SERVED 9/6/08 
9/4/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (003)  9/11/2008   
9/4/2008  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (003)  9/11/2008   
9/4/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (004)  9/12/2008   
9/4/2008  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (004)  9/12/2008   
9/4/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (002)  9/8/2008   
9/4/2008  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (002)  9/8/2008   
9/4/2008  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (002)  9/8/2008   
NOTE: SERVED 9/6/08 
9/4/2008  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  9/8/2008   
9/4/2008  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  9/8/2008   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/11/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
9/11/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
9/15/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
9/17/2008  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
9/18/2008  8:30   Arraignment Hearing 
9/26/2008  11:1   Change Of Plea 
10/9/2008  8:30   Change Of Plea 
10/10/2008  8:30   Change Of Plea 
10/20/2008  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
10/20/2008  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
10/24/2008  19:59   Sentencing 
10/27/2008  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
10/27/2008  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
11/12/2008  8:30   Sentencing 
11/17/2008  8:30   Sentencing 
11/18/2008  10:45   Settlement Conference 
11/19/2008  13:30   Settlement Conference 
11/25/2008  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
12/9/2008  8:30   Sentencing 
12/23/2008  9:00   Rule 11 Hearing 
1/13/2009  8:30   Trial 
1/20/2009  9:00   Rule 11 Hearing 
1/27/2009  8:30   Status Conference 
2/18/2009  14:00   Settlement Conference 
2/26/2009  8:30   Status Conference 
3/19/2009  8:30   Sentencing 
4/6/2009  10:30   Trial 
11/18/2011  11:00   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
5/18/2012  10:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
6/1/2012  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
6/8/2012  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
6/21/2012  10:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
6/28/2012  10:31   Disposition Hearing 
6/28/2012  13:30   Witness Violation Hearing