« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, Maricopa
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Jesse W Magana - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
DUMOND, SAMANTHA
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2008-006749-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2008-006749-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Jesse W Magana
Crime Date
11/1/2005
Date
7/20/2012
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Jesse W Magana
Crime Date
9/1/2006
Date
6/15/2012
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Jesse W Magana
Crime Date
9/19/2006
Date
6/15/2012
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Jesse W Magana
Crime Date
5/1/2007
Date
6/15/2012
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Limited Scope Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
7/23/2012
Description
189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2012
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
7/20/2012
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2012
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2012
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2012
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2012
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2012
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2012
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sentencing
Filing Date
5/8/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2012
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sentencing
Filing Date
4/19/2012
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2012
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING
Filing Date
3/30/2012
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2012
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2012
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE AND RESET SENTENCING
Filing Date
1/9/2012
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2011
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2011
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING
Filing Date
10/3/2011
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2011
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO TRANSPORT PRISONER
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Sentencing
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Transport Prisoner
Filing Date
8/26/2011
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2011
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Sentencing
Filing Date
7/14/2011
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2011
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING
Filing Date
6/6/2011
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2011
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING
Filing Date
5/16/2011
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2011
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
06/08/09 BY LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY
Filing Date
4/6/2011
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
06/30/09 BY LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY
Filing Date
4/5/2011
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2011
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPEAL DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION ACCEPTED, RELIEF DENIED
Filing Date
3/30/2011
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2011
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2011
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
6-9-09 LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY
Filing Date
3/2/2011
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
8-28-08 JUDY GIBBONS
Filing Date
3/2/2011
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
6-1-09 LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY
Filing Date
3/2/2011
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
6-2-09 LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY
Filing Date
3/2/2011
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
6-3-09 LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY
Filing Date
3/2/2011
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
6-8-09 LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY
Filing Date
3/2/2011
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
6-11-09 SALLY STEARMAN
Filing Date
3/2/2011
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
8-4-09 LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY
Filing Date
3/2/2011
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
7-20-09 LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY
Filing Date
3/2/2011
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
6-10-09 LYDIA ESTRADA-GRAY
Filing Date
3/2/2011
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONVICTIONS AFFIRMED; SENTENCES VACATED
Filing Date
3/2/2011
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2009
Description
ATR - Appeals Transmittal Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
10/26/2009
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER
Filing Date
9/25/2009
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2009
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2009
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2009
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
9/21/2009
Description
ATR - Appeals Transmittal Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUBLIC DEFENDER
Filing Date
9/17/2009
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
08/04/09 LUDIA ESTRADA-GRAY
Filing Date
9/16/2009
Description
DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2009
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUBLIC DEFENDER
Filing Date
8/26/2009
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2009
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
8/21/2009
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
8/21/2009
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2009
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2009
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
CROSS / AND REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
8/14/2009
Description
130 - ME: Counsel Appt For Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2009
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION TO COURT REPORTERS NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
8/10/2009
Description
130 - ME: Counsel Appt For Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2009
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM SUPERIOR COURT
Filing Date
8/7/2009
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/7/2009
Description
193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2009
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2009
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2009
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
8/4/2009
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL / FOR NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
7/23/2009
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2009
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CONFLICT
Filing Date
7/13/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION TO COURT REPORTERS NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
7/8/2009
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
7/8/2009
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2009
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
7/6/2009
Description
570 - ME: Sentence-Jail (no Monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2009
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
6/30/2009
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
6/30/2009
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2009
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
for New Trial
Filing Date
6/12/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2009
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL/HEARING
Filing Date
6/11/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2, SIGNED
Filing Date
6/11/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED COUNT 3
Filing Date
6/11/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED COUNT 1
Filing Date
6/11/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED COUNT 4
Filing Date
6/11/2009
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2009
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#12
Filing Date
6/9/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#4
Filing Date
6/9/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2009
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL
Filing Date
6/9/2009
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#9
Filing Date
6/9/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#9
Filing Date
6/9/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#11
Filing Date
6/9/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/8/2009
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/5/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2009
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/5/2009
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2009
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2009
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRELIMINARY
Filing Date
6/3/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/3/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2009
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRELIMINARY
Filing Date
6/1/2009
Description
NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2009
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2009
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2009
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/26/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/26/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Regarding Preclusion of States Witnesses
Filing Date
5/26/2009
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL/
Filing Date
5/26/2009
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
for use of Jury Questionaire for Voir Dire
Filing Date
5/14/2009
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/13/2009
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
5/11/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MAGANAS SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
4/23/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 04/22/09
Filing Date
4/16/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 04/15/09
Filing Date
4/10/2009
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MAGANA'S SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
4/6/2009
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2009
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2009
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2009
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO TRANSPORT DEFENDANT
Filing Date
1/13/2009
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO TRANSPORT DEFENDANT
Filing Date
1/9/2009
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2008
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2008
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2008
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
11/13/2008
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
to Suppress Confrontation Call as Hearsay
Filing Date
11/7/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DESIGNATE CASE COMPLEX
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2008
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT MCSO TRANSPORT INMATE MAGANA TO FAMILY TRANSITIONS
Filing Date
10/17/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO TRANSPORT DEFENDANT
Filing Date
10/9/2008
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2008
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2008
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2008
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/12/2008
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM/SERVED 09/09/2008
Filing Date
9/10/2008
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/8/2008
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/4/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2008
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2008
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 07/24/08
Filing Date
7/24/2008
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 07/17/08
Filing Date
7/17/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR HEARING RE: NON-BONDABLE DETERMINATION
Filing Date
7/14/2008
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT/
Filing Date
6/24/2008
Description
NDD - Notice of Discovery Disclosure/Witness/Interviews - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/24/2008
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
6/24/2008
Description
AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/24/2008
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/24/2008
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/20/2008
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/11/2008
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2008
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES/TRANSCRIPTS/EXHIBITS AND ORDER
Filing Date
6/10/2008
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ORDER
Filing Date
6/10/2008
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2008
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DEFENSES
Filing Date
6/4/2008
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
6/2/2008
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2008
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 5/17/08
Filing Date
5/14/2008
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2008
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2008
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/22/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/14/2008
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/21/2008
Time
8:45
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
8/28/2008
Time
9:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
9/10/2008
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/17/2008
Time
8:00
Event
Hearing Pending Motion
Date
9/18/2008
Time
10:45
Event
Trial
Date
9/29/2008
Time
8:45
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
10/6/2008
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/6/2008
Time
10:45
Event
Trial
Date
11/6/2008
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/4/2008
Time
8:45
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
12/11/2008
Time
10:45
Event
Trial
Date
1/6/2009
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/13/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/6/2009
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/3/2009
Time
8:45
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/18/2009
Time
8:45
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/2/2009
Time
8:45
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/7/2009
Time
8:45
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/26/2009
Time
8:45
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
6/1/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/1/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/1/2009
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/2/2009
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/3/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/8/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/9/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/10/2009
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/11/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/30/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/20/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/21/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/4/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
3/25/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/13/2011
Time
10:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
6/3/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/8/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/26/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
9/29/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
10/31/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
11/16/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/1/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/4/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/23/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
3/2/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
3/13/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/27/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/18/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/4/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/18/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/15/2012
Time
10:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
6/15/2012
Time
15:00
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
7/20/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing