Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Hymas, Douglas      
Michael Arthur Wood - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Macias, Carolyn   Hopkins  CR2007-170473-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Michael Arthur Wood  13-3405 (M1)  MARIJUANA VIOLATION  2/15/2007  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  5/13/2008 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
2/6/2013  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  2/9/2013   
8/6/2009  ORD - Order - Party (001)  8/6/2009   
NOTE: DENIED CIVIL RIGHTS/DENIED VACATE JUDGMENT/DISMISS CHARGES 
7/8/2009  WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)  7/8/2009   
NOTE: CFO INFO 
6/17/2009  AVJ - Application to Vacate Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (001)  6/19/2009  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: TO RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS 
4/28/2009  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  5/7/2009   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
3/23/2009  PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)  3/25/2009   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
7/2/2008  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  7/2/2008   
6/27/2008  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  7/2/2008   
6/27/2008  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  7/3/2008   
NOTE: COUNT I 
5/19/2008  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  5/19/2008   
5/13/2008  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  5/16/2008   
5/12/2008  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  5/12/2008   
4/1/2008  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  4/1/2008   
NOTE:  
1/29/2008  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  1/29/2008   
1/28/2008  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  1/29/2008   
NOTE: QUASHED D12/11/07 
12/12/2007  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  12/12/2007   
12/12/2007  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  12/12/2007   
12/10/2007  WPH - Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)  12/14/2007   
12/10/2007  INF - Information - Party (001)  12/14/2007   
12/10/2007  ROR - Release Order - Party (001)  12/14/2007   
NOTE: OWN RECOGNIZANCE 12-10-07 
11/20/2007  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)  11/20/2007   
11/20/2007  SUM - Summons - Party (001)  11/20/2007   
11/1/2007  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  11/1/2007   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
12/3/2007  13:30   Initial Appearance 
12/10/2007  8:30   Initial Appearance / Wfa 
12/10/2007  8:30   Status Conference 
1/23/2008  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
5/7/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
5/13/2008  8:30   Status Conference 
6/27/2008  8:30   Sentencing