Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Southeast  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Maricopa      
Robert Logan MyersIII - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Kazan, Lawrence   Hannah  CR2007-157712-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1103 (F2)  MANSLAUGHTER  7/19/2007  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  9/13/2007 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1103 (F2)  MANSLAUGHTER  7/19/2007  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  9/13/2007 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  7/19/2007  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  9/13/2007 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1103 (F2)  MANSLAUGHTER  7/19/2007  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  9/13/2007 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1103 (F2)  MANSLAUGHTER  7/19/2007  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  9/13/2007 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1103 (F2)  MANSLAUGHTER  7/19/2007  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  9/13/2007 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  7/19/2007  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  9/13/2007 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  7/19/2007  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  9/13/2007 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1102 (F4)  NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE  7/19/2007  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  2/25/2009 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1102 (F4)  NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE  7/19/2007  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  2/25/2009 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1102 (F4)  NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE  7/19/2007  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  2/25/2009 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1102 (F4)  NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE  7/19/2007  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  2/25/2009 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1102 (F4)  NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE  7/19/2007  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  2/25/2009 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  7/19/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/24/2009 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  7/19/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/24/2009 
Robert Logan Myers III  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  7/19/2007  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/24/2009 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/10/2016  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  3/17/2016   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
3/10/2016  CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)  3/28/2016   
5/22/2013  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  5/31/2013   
NOTE: COUNT 4 
5/22/2013  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  5/31/2013   
NOTE: COUNT 3 
5/22/2013  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  5/31/2013   
NOTE: COUNT 2 
5/22/2013  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  5/31/2013   
NOTE: COUNT 5 
4/9/2013  DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)  4/11/2013   
4/5/2013  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  4/5/2013   
4/3/2013  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)  4/9/2013   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
3/6/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/6/2013   
NOTE: / to be Heard With Respect to Modification and Extension of Terms of Probation 
7/28/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/28/2011   
7/27/2011  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  7/25/2011   
NOTE: TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF PROBATION 
6/29/2011  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/29/2011   
NOTE: to Modify Conditions of Probation 
5/20/2010  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  5/20/2010   
5/19/2010  ORD - Order - Party (001)  5/27/2010   
NOTE: TO MODIFY TERMS AND CONDITIONS OF WORK RELEASE 
4/30/2010  RES - Response - Party (001)  4/30/2010   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO MODIFY TERMS AND CONDITIONS OF WORK RELEASE 
1/21/2010  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/22/2010   
NOTE: TO MODIFY TERMS AND CONDITIONS OF WORK RELEASE  
5/8/2009  ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)  5/11/2009   
5/7/2009  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  5/8/2009   
4/29/2009  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  4/29/2009   
4/27/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/29/2009   
NOTE: SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION 
4/24/2009  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  4/30/2009   
4/24/2009  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  4/29/2009   
4/24/2009  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  4/27/2009   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
4/24/2009  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  4/27/2009   
NOTE: COUNT 2 
4/24/2009  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  4/27/2009   
NOTE: COUNT 3 
4/24/2009  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  4/27/2009   
NOTE: COUNT 4 
4/24/2009  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  4/27/2009   
NOTE: COUNT 5 
4/23/2009  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  4/23/2009   
NOTE: Defendants Sentencing Memorandum 
3/2/2009  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  3/2/2009   
2/27/2009  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  2/27/2009   
2/25/2009  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  2/26/2009   
2/18/2009  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  2/18/2009   
12/29/2008  STA - Statement - Party (001)  12/30/2008   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENDANTS RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE/ 
11/7/2008  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  11/7/2008   
11/4/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/4/2008   
10/31/2008  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/31/2008   
NOTE: TRIAL SET FOR 11/03/08 
10/29/2008  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  10/30/2008   
NOTE: RE: SEAT BELTS 
10/28/2008  REL - Reply - Party (001)  10/29/2008   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO STATES REQUEST TO RECONSIDER MOTION TO SUPPRESS 
10/28/2008  RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)  10/29/2008   
10/27/2008  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/27/2008   
10/27/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/28/2008   
NOTE: REQUESTED VOIR DIRE 
10/22/2008  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  10/22/2008   
NOTE: preclusion of evidence ordered by the court 
10/22/2008  RES - Response - Party (001)  10/23/2008   
NOTE: TO STATES MOTION TO RECONSIDER MOTION TO SUPPRESS 
9/25/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/25/2008   
NOTE: TO DEFENSE SEEKING WARRANT TO DOWNLOAD AIRBAG CONTROL MODULE 
9/8/2008  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  9/8/2008   
8/15/2008  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  8/15/2008   
8/7/2008  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  8/7/2008   
NOTE: TRIAL 
7/15/2008  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  7/15/2008   
7/10/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/11/2008   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
5/22/2008  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  5/22/2008   
3/21/2008  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  3/21/2008   
3/18/2008  REP - Report - Party (001)  3/19/2008   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
2/25/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/25/2008   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL / OF DISCLOSURE 
1/29/2008  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  1/29/2008   
1/14/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/14/2008   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL / OF DISCLOSURE 
1/8/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/9/2008   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
12/6/2007  STA - Statement - Party (001)  12/7/2007   
NOTE: RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE/ 
11/21/2007  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/21/2007   
11/19/2007  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  11/20/2007   
11/19/2007  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/20/2007   
11/19/2007  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/20/2007   
11/16/2007  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/16/2007   
11/9/2007  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/13/2007   
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS RE ILLEGAL SEARCH AND SEIZURE 
11/9/2007  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)  11/9/2007   
11/7/2007  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)  11/8/2007   
NOTE: TO FULE RULE 12.9 MOTION 
11/7/2007  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/9/2007   
11/6/2007  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  11/9/2007   
11/6/2007  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/9/2007   
11/6/2007  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/9/2007   
11/5/2007  NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001)  11/5/2007   
NOTE:  
10/16/2007  REQ - Request - Party (001)  10/17/2007   
NOTE: FOR DESIGNATION OF COMPLEX CRIMINAL CASE 
10/1/2007  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  10/1/2007   
9/24/2007  593 - ME: Case Location Change - Party (001)  9/24/2007   
9/19/2007  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  9/20/2007   
9/18/2007  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  9/18/2007   
9/12/2007  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  9/13/2007  Plaintiff (1)  
9/12/2007  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  9/13/2007   
9/12/2007  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  9/13/2007  Plaintiff (1)  
9/7/2007  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  9/7/2007   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/19/2007  8:30   Status Conference 
9/21/2007  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
9/25/2007  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
11/6/2007  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
1/10/2008  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/18/2008  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/15/2008  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/11/2008  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/28/2008  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/28/2008  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
8/29/2008  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
9/8/2008  10:30   Trial 
10/21/2008  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
10/30/2008  10:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
11/3/2008  10:30   Trial 
2/12/2009  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
2/24/2009  10:30   Trial 
2/25/2009  10:30   Change Of Plea 
4/24/2009  13:30   Sentencing 
4/3/2013  8:30   Status Conference