Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | County Attorney, Maricopa | ||
Jose Angel Balcazar - (2) |
Defendant | M | Feldman, Adam | Nicholls | CR2007-117794-001 |
Juan Daniel Varela - (3) |
Defendant | M | Carr, Nathaniel | Nicholls | CR2007-117794-002 |
Clerk Of The Court - (4) |
In The Matter Of | N/A | To Be Determined |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Jose Angel Balcazar | 13-1204 (F3) | AGGRAVATED ASSAULT | 3/16/2007 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/10/2007 |
Juan Daniel Varela | 13-1204 (F3) | AGGRAVATED ASSAULT | 3/16/2007 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/10/2007 |
Jose Angel Balcazar | 13-1204A2 (F3) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 3/16/2007 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 9/19/2007 |
Juan Daniel Varela | 13-1204 (F3) | AGGRAVATED ASSAULT | 3/16/2007 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 5/5/2008 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
9/23/2010 | ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001) | 9/24/2010 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 | |||
7/2/2010 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (002) | 7/2/2010 | |
6/29/2010 | ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (002) | 7/6/2010 | |
NOTE: COUNT 2 | |||
6/29/2010 | CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (002) | 6/30/2010 | |
6/7/2010 | PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (002) | 6/11/2010 | |
NOTE: COUNT 2 | |||
3/17/2010 | MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001) | 3/25/2010 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 | |||
7/24/2008 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (002) | 7/28/2008 | |
7/15/2008 | 109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (002) | 7/15/2008 | |
7/10/2008 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002) | 7/17/2008 | |
7/10/2008 | REP - Report - Party (002) | 7/17/2008 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT REPORT | |||
7/10/2008 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002) | 7/10/2008 | |
7/10/2008 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002) | 7/16/2008 | |
7/10/2008 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002) | 7/16/2008 | |
6/10/2008 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002) | 6/10/2008 | |
5/8/2008 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002) | 5/8/2008 | |
5/5/2008 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002) | 5/7/2008 | |
5/2/2008 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002) | 5/2/2008 | |
4/24/2008 | 088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (002) | 4/24/2008 | |
4/22/2008 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002) | 4/22/2008 | |
4/21/2008 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002) | 4/21/2008 | |
NOTE: | |||
4/21/2008 | 085 - ME: Conference - Party (002) | 4/21/2008 | |
4/18/2008 | NOT - Notice - Party (002) | 4/21/2008 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL / OF WITNESSES | |||
4/17/2008 | AFF - Affidavit - Party (002) | 4/18/2008 | |
4/14/2008 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002) | 4/15/2008 | |
NOTE: FIRM TRIAL DATE | |||
3/14/2008 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002) | 3/14/2008 | |
3/4/2008 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002) | 3/5/2008 | |
NOTE: FIRM TRIAL DATE | |||
1/18/2008 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002) | 1/18/2008 | |
1/8/2008 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002) | 1/9/2008 | |
NOTE: FIRM TRIAL DATE | |||
12/14/2007 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 12/17/2007 | |
NOTE: DUCES TECUM SERVED 12/07/07 | |||
11/30/2007 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 11/30/2007 | |
11/1/2007 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 11/2/2007 | |
10/26/2007 | 109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001) | 10/26/2007 | |
10/23/2007 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 10/26/2007 | |
10/23/2007 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 10/31/2007 | |
10/23/2007 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 10/31/2007 | |
9/27/2007 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002) | 9/27/2007 | |
9/24/2007 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002) | 9/24/2007 | |
9/21/2007 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 9/21/2007 | |
9/20/2007 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002) | 9/20/2007 | |
9/19/2007 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 9/24/2007 | |
9/13/2007 | 085 - ME: Conference - Party (002) | 9/13/2007 | |
9/13/2007 | 085 - ME: Conference - Party (001) | 9/13/2007 | |
9/6/2007 | 081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001) | 9/6/2007 | |
8/23/2007 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002) | 8/24/2007 | |
NOTE: FIRM TRIAL DATE | |||
7/25/2007 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002) | 7/25/2007 | |
7/24/2007 | ORD - Order - Party (002) | 7/31/2007 | |
NOTE: THAT THE MOTION ORDER AND SUBPOENA BE SERVED ON YINNY VAREKA ELIZABETH VARELA AND IRENE VARELA FOR THE AUGUST 2 2007 DEPOSITION BE SERVED BY AN INVESTIGATOR OF THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE | |||
7/24/2007 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 7/31/2007 | |
NOTE: FOR DEPOSITION OF WITNESS | |||
7/13/2007 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002) | 7/13/2007 | |
7/13/2007 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 7/13/2007 | |
7/3/2007 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 7/3/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 91433 -- FOR DEPOSITION OF WITNESS | |||
6/27/2007 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002) | 6/27/2007 | |
6/11/2007 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002) | 6/11/2007 | |
5/30/2007 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002) | 5/30/2007 | |
5/30/2007 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 5/30/2007 | |
5/21/2007 | STA - Statement - Party (002) | 6/1/2007 | |
NOTE: PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT/ | |||
5/21/2007 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 6/1/2007 | |
NOTE: PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT/ | |||
5/15/2007 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 5/15/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 75669 -- | |||
5/15/2007 | ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001) | 5/15/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 75670 -- | |||
5/7/2007 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002) | 5/7/2007 | |
5/4/2007 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 5/4/2007 | |
5/4/2007 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 5/4/2007 | |
5/4/2007 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002) | 5/4/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 72974 -- | |||
5/4/2007 | ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (002) | 5/4/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 72975 -- | |||
5/3/2007 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002) | 5/3/2007 | |
4/27/2007 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002) | 5/1/2007 | |
4/27/2007 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002) | 5/1/2007 | |
4/27/2007 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002) | 5/1/2007 | |
4/25/2007 | MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002) | 4/30/2007 | |
4/25/2007 | RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002) | 4/30/2007 | |
NOTE: TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS | |||
4/25/2007 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 4/30/2007 | |
NOTE: REQUESTING DESSUREAULT HEARING | |||
4/25/2007 | REQ - Request - Party (002) | 4/30/2007 | |
NOTE: FOR VOLUNTARINESS HEARING | |||
4/24/2007 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002) | 4/30/2007 | |
4/18/2007 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 4/23/2007 | |
4/18/2007 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002) | 4/23/2007 | |
4/16/2007 | DRO - Indigent Defense Reimbursement Order - Party (002) | 4/23/2007 | |
4/6/2007 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 4/9/2007 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/6/2007 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 4/9/2007 | |
4/6/2007 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 4/9/2007 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/6/2007 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002) | 4/9/2007 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/6/2007 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002) | 4/9/2007 | |
4/6/2007 | IND - Indictment - Party (002) | 4/9/2007 | Plaintiff (1) |
3/27/2007 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 3/30/2007 | |
3/27/2007 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 3/30/2007 | |
NOTE: FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
3/27/2007 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 3/28/2007 | |
3/22/2007 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002) | 3/29/2007 | |
3/22/2007 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 3/29/2007 | |
3/20/2007 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 3/21/2007 | |
3/20/2007 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002) | 3/21/2007 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
3/26/2007 | 8:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
4/2/2007 | 8:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
4/16/2007 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
4/16/2007 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
5/21/2007 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
5/21/2007 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
6/7/2007 | 8:15 | Hearing Pending Motion |
6/19/2007 | 8:15 | Status Conference |
6/19/2007 | 8:15 | Status Conference |
6/27/2007 | 10:00 | Hearing Pending Motion |
9/4/2007 | 8:00 | Hearing Pending Motion |
9/6/2007 | 8:15 | Trial Management Conference |
9/6/2007 | 8:15 | Trial Management Conference |
9/17/2007 | 10:30 | Trial |
9/17/2007 | 10:30 | Trial |
9/18/2007 | 8:00 | Hearing Pending Motion |
9/18/2007 | 8:30 | Trial |
9/19/2007 | 8:30 | Change Of Plea |
10/23/2007 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
11/28/2007 | 8:30 | Restitution Hearing |
1/15/2008 | 8:00 | Hearing Pending Motion |
1/15/2008 | 8:30 | Trial Management Conference |
1/22/2008 | 8:30 | Trial |
3/10/2008 | 8:00 | Hearing Pending Motion |
3/18/2008 | 8:30 | Trial Management Conference |
3/24/2008 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/15/2008 | 8:30 | Trial Management Conference |
4/21/2008 | 8:00 | Hearing Pending Motion |
4/22/2008 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/30/2008 | 15:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/5/2008 | 8:30 | Change Of Plea |
5/6/2008 | 9:30 | Trial |
5/7/2008 | 9:30 | Trial |
6/5/2008 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
7/8/2008 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
7/10/2008 | 8:30 | Sentencing |